EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC et al v. United States Cellular Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit West Virginia Northern District Court, Case No. 3:09-cv-00007

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2017 at 2:42 PM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Emsat Advanced Geo-location Technology, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BACHMANN HESS BACHMANN & GARDEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul T. Tucker +1 304 233 3511 +1 304 233 3199 ptucker@bhbglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hahn Loeser & Parks LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J Diaz +1 216 621 0150 +1 216 241 8151 rjdiaz@hahnlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. Eric Gaum +1 330 864 5550 +1 330 864 7986 regaum@hahnlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder mjgarvin@hahnlaw.com
No Logo Location Based Services LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BACHMANN HESS BACHMANN & GARDEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul T. Tucker +1 304 233 3511 +1 304 233 3199 ptucker@bhbglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hahn Loeser & Parks LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J Diaz +1 216 621 0150 +1 216 241 8151 rjdiaz@hahnlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. Eric Gaum +1 330 864 5550 +1 330 864 7986 regaum@hahnlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder mjgarvin@hahnlaw.com
United States Cellular Corporation United States Cellular Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bowles Rice McDavid Graff & Love, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Douglas Lorensen +1 304 264 4224 +1 304 267 3822 mlorensen@bowlesrice.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles F. Printz, Jr. +1 304 264 4222 +1 304 267 3822 cprintz@bowlesrice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dale Bruce Nixon +1 214 981 3300 +1 214 981 3400 dnixon@sidley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 312 853 7000 robrien@sidley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel D. Sher +1 312 853 3772 rsher@sidley.com
v.
United States Cellular Corporation United States Cellular Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bowles Rice McDavid Graff & Love, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Douglas Lorensen +1 304 264 4224 +1 304 267 3822 mlorensen@bowlesrice.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles F. Printz, Jr. +1 304 264 4222 +1 304 267 3822 cprintz@bowlesrice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dale Bruce Nixon +1 214 981 3300 +1 214 981 3400 dnixon@sidley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 312 853 7000 robrien@sidley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel D. Sher +1 312 853 3772 rsher@sidley.com
No Logo Emsat Advanced Geo-location Technology, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by BACHMANN HESS BACHMANN & GARDEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul T. Tucker +1 304 233 3511 +1 304 233 3199 ptucker@bhbglaw.com
No Logo Location Based Services LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by BACHMANN HESS BACHMANN & GARDEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul T. Tucker +1 304 233 3511 +1 304 233 3199 ptucker@bhbglaw.com
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 35 Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 33 Motion to Transfer Case to the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by Chief Judge John Preston Bailey on 10/06/09. (jko) (Entered: 10/06/2009)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None
    Proposed Order re 33 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services, LLC, United States Cellular Corporation. (Tucker, Paul) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None
      Joint MOTION to Transfer Case by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services, LLC, United States Cellular Corporation. (Tucker, Paul) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
        STIPULATED SUSPENSION OF THE THIRTY DAY LIMITATION FOR FILING A MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY. Signed by Chief Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/16/2009. (cmd) (Entered: 09/16/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None
          STIPULATION Stipulated Suspension of the Thirty Day Limitation for Filing a Motion to Compel Discovery by United States Cellular Corporation. (Printz, Charles) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: None
            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services, LLC of Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures. (Tucker, Paul) (Entered: 07/27/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: None
              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States Cellular Corporation United States Cellular Corporation's Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Printz, Charles) (Entered: 07/27/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR TRANSFER OF VENUE 17 Motion to Transfer Case. Additionally, this Court elects to hold all proceedings at it WHEELING point of holding Court Signed by Chief Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/27/09. (jko) (Entered: 07/27/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/2011 02:00 PM in Martinsburg District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before Chief Judge John Preston Bailey. Amended Pleadings due by 2/26/2010. Discovery due by 8/13/2010. Joinder of Parties due by 2/26/2010. Jury Selection and Trial set for 3/15/2011 08:30 AM in Martinsburg District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before Chief Judge John Preston Bailey. Motions due by 12/29/2010. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/11/2011. Signed by Chief Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/17/09. (jko) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER APPROVING APPLICATIONS FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting 20 21 22 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Richard J OBrien, Rachel D Sher, Dale B Nixon for United States Cellular Corporation added. Signed by Chief Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/13/2009. (cmd) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None
                      REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Tucker, Paul) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None
                        Memorandum in Support re 17 MOTION to Transfer Case Defendant United States Cellular Corporation's Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of Illinois United States Cellular Corporation's Reply Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of Illinois filed by United States Cellular Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Declaration of Jeff Baenke)(Printz, Charles) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: None
                          Pro Hace Vice Filing fee: $ 150.00, receipt number 057404, for O'Brien, Sher, and Nixon. (cmd) (Entered: 06/23/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Dale B. Nixon by United States Cellular Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Application)(Lorensen, Michael) (Entered: 06/23/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: None
                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rachel Sher by United States Cellular Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Application)(Lorensen, Michael) (Entered: 06/23/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: None
                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Richard O'Brien by United States Cellular Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Application)(Lorensen, Michael) (Entered: 06/23/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: None
                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 17 MOTION to Transfer Case Defendant United States Cellular Corporation's Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of Illinois filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit a, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Envelope 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Envelope 6)(Tucker, Paul) (Entered: 06/22/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None
                                    Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 14 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of United States Cellular Corporation by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services, LLC.(Tucker, Paul) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None
                                      MOTION to Transfer Case Defendant United States Cellular Corporation's Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of Illinois by United States Cellular Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue, # 2 Exhibit A to Memorandum - Baenke Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A to Baenke Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B to Memorandum, # 5 Exhibit C to Memorandum)(Printz, Charles) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: None
                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by United States Cellular Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Telephone & Data Systems, Inc. for United States Cellular Corporation.. (Printz, Charles) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 6/26/2009. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/10/2009. Scheduling Conference set for 7/17/2009 01:30 PM in Martinsburg District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before Chief Judge John Preston Bailey. Discovery due by 7/27/2009. Signed by Chief Judge John Preston Bailey on 5/27/09. (jko) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                            ANSWER to 3 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by United States Cellular Corporation.(Printz, Charles) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: None
                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States Cellular Corporation. (Tucker, Paul) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER-granting admission pro hac vice 7 Robert J. Diaz. Signed by Chief Judge John Preston Bailey on 2/2/09. (jko) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER-granting admission pro hac vice 6 Michael J. Garvin. Signed by Chief Judge John Preston Bailey on 02/02/09. (jko) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER-granting admission pro hac vice 8 R. Eric Gaum. Signed by Chief Judge John Preston Bailey on 02/02/09. (jko) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                      Fee for admission pro hac vice - Michael Garvin 6 ; Robert Diaz 7 ; R. Eric Gaum: $ 150.00, receipt number 057300 (jko) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                        Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of R. Eric Gaum Other Document filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services, LLC. (Tucker, Paul) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                          Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert J. Diaz Other Document filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services, LLC. (Tucker, Paul) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                            Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael J. Garvin Other Document filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services, LLC. (Tucker, Paul) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE-Notice of Filing Patent Case form mailed to USPTO. (jko) (Entered: 01/29/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against United States Cellular Corporation, filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services, LLC.(Tucker, Paul) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number 057296 (jko) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    CIVIL COVER SHEET. Filing fee paid and case opened as of this date. Attorney directed to electronically file case opening documents. (jko) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?