USA v. XTO Energy Inc
Criminal Case Wyoming District Court, Case No. 1:08-cr-00091
District Judge R Michael Shickich, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Xto Energy Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Thomas L. Sansonetti +1 202 514 2738

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Hart LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hadassah Marie Reimer +1 307 778 4200 +1 307 778 8175 hmreimer@hollandhart.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: None
DOCKET IN WRONG CASE SHOULD BE 08-CV-91-Letter from Ira Tucker (sjs, ) Modified on 12/18/2008 (sjs, ). (Entered: 12/18/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
    Avian Protection Plan by defendant XTO Energy Inc. (sds, ) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: None
      SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT as to monetary imposition filed by USA as to defendant XTO Energy Inc (Sharpe, Steven) (Entered: 07/10/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
        JUDGMENT and COMMITMENT Order by the Honorable Judge R Michael Shickich as to XTO Energy Inc as to Count 1 of the Information: Sentenced to pay 10,000 Fine; 10,000 Restitution; 25.00 Special Assessment and 1 Year Probation with special conditions. (sds, ) (Entered: 05/22/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: None
          CERTIFICATE by XTO Energy that Stewart Phillips is duly authorized to enter into plea agreement and to represent Defendant Corporation, by Senior VP and General Counsel Frank McDonald and XTO Energy Inc. (sds, ) (Entered: 05/22/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
            CONSENT TO TRIAL BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by defendant XTO Energy Inc. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge R. Michael Shickich. (sds, ) (Entered: 05/22/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
              Minute Entry: Initial Appearance, Enterance of Guilty Plea and Sentencing as to XTO Energy Inc held on 5/15/2008. (Case unsealed) Proceedings held before Judge R Michael Shickich. Defendant Corporation pled guilty to Count 1 of the Information and was Sentenced to 10,000 fine, 10,000 restitution and 25.00 special assesment and 1 year probation with special conditions. (Tape FTR Gold 159.)(sds, ) (Entered: 05/22/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None
                NON-PUBLIC DOCUMENT pursuant to the Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy and Public Access - ELEMENTS OF THE CRIME AND PROSECUTOR'S STATEMENT filed by USA as to Defendant XTO Energy Inc (Barksdale, John) (Entered: 05/06/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                  NOTICE OF HEARING as to XTO Energy Inc,: Initial Appearance, Entry of Guilty Plea and Sentencing RESET for 5/15/2008 01:30 PM in Casper before Judge R Michael Shickich. (previously set for 3:00 pm on the same day.) (sds, ) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: None
                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Hadassah Marie Reimer appearing for defendant XTO Energy Inc (Reimer, Hadassah) (Entered: 05/01/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                      NOTICE OF HEARING as to XTO Energy Inc, Initial Appearance, Entry of Guilty Plea and Sentencing set for 5/15/2008 03:00 PM in Casper before Judge R Michael Shickich. (sds, ) (Entered: 04/30/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                        NON-PUBLIC DOCUMENT pursuant to the Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy and Public Access - Summons Issued as to XTO Energy Inc. Initial Appearance, Arraignment and Sentencing set for 5/12/2008 03:00 PM in Casper before Judge R Michael Shickich. (sds, ) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None
                          NON-PUBLIC DOCUMENT pursuant to the Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy and Public Access - Praecipe for Summons by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant(s) XTO Energy Inc. (sds, ) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None
                            NON-PUBLIC DOCUMENT pursuant to the Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy and Public Access - PLEA AGREEMENT as to XTO Energy Inc (sds, ) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None
                              INFORMATION as to XTO Energy Inc (1) Count(s) 1. (sds, ) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 47 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?