Cody Laboratories Inc et al v. U S Department of Heath and Human Services Secretary et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Wyoming District Court, Case No. 2:10-cv-00147
District Judge Alan B. Johnson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cody Laboratories, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas L. Sansonetti +1 202 514 2738

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Hart LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew C Emrich +1 307 778 4200 +1 307 778 8175 ACEmrich@hollandhart.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew J Kelly +1 307 778 4236 +1 307 778 8175 mjkelly@hollandhart.com
No Logo Lannett Co Inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas L. Sansonetti +1 202 514 2738

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Hart LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew C Emrich +1 307 778 4200 +1 307 778 8175 ACEmrich@hollandhart.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew J Kelly +1 307 778 4236 +1 307 778 8175 mjkelly@hollandhart.com
v.
No Logo U S Department of Heath and Human Services Secretary, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Zachary +1 202 307 0821 +1 202 514 8780 jennifer.zachary@usdoj.gov
No Logo U S Food and Drug Administration Commissioner, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Zachary +1 202 307 0821 +1 202 514 8780 jennifer.zachary@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 706(1)
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (48) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Blank 35 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Motion for Reconsideration
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: 7/27/2010 Transcript - Unrestricted and Non Public
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: 7/26/2010 Order on Motion for TRO
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 32 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010 Motion Hearing
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 31 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 30 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010 Order on motion to file excess pages
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 27 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: 7/22/2010 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: 7/22/2010 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages-Dispositive
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: 7/22/2010 Notice of Complexity (Non)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: 7/22/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: 7/22/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: 7/22/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: 7/22/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: 7/22/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: 7/22/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: 7/21/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                              REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. MOTION for Brian D. Frey to appear pro hac vice; Check tendered; filed by Plaintiffs Cody Laboratories Inc, Lannett Co Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (sal) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: 7/21/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. MOTION for Robert N. Driscoll to appear pro hac vice; Check tendered; filed by Plaintiffs Cody Laboratories Inc, Lannett Co Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (sal) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: 7/21/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support of 12 Motion for TRO filed by Plaintiffs Cody Laboratories Inc, Lannett Co Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Exhibit, # 27 Exhibit, # 28 Exhibit, # 29 Exhibit, # 30 Exhibit, # 31 Exhibit) (sal) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: 7/21/2010 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by Plaintiffs Cody Laboratories Inc, Lannett Co Inc In Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Cody Laboratories Inc, Lannett Co Inc. (Kelly, Matthew) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: 7/21/2010 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing: In court Hearing on Application for TRO RESET for 7/23/2010 03:00 PM before Judge Alan B Johnson. (slb, ) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: 7/21/2010 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                        NOTICE of Hearing: In court Hearing on Application for TRO set for 7/22/2010 03:00 PM before Judge Alan B Johnson. (slb, ) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: 7/21/2010 Motion for TRO
                                                                          MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiffs Cody Laboratories Inc, Lannett Co Inc. (sal) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: 7/21/2010 Order on motion to file excess pagesCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER by the Honorable Judge Alan B Johnson granting 10 Motion to File Excess Pages. (sal) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: 7/21/2010 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages-Dispositive
                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Plaintiffs Cody Laboratories Inc, Lannett Co Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (sal) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: 7/21/2010 Notice of Complexity (Non)
                                                                                NOTICE of complexity by Plaintiffs Cody Laboratories Inc, Lannett Co Inc; this case is non-complex. (sal) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: 7/21/2010 Praecipe
                                                                                  Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiffs Cody Laboratories Inc, Lannett Co Inc, 1 issued. (sal) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: 7/21/2010 Praecipe
                                                                                    Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiffs Cody Laboratories Inc, Lannett Co Inc, 1 issued. (sal) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: 7/21/2010 Corporate Disclosure
                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Lannett Co Inc. (sal) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: 7/21/2010 Corporate Disclosure
                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Cody Laboratories Inc identifying Corporate Parent Lannett Co Inc for Cody Laboratories Inc. (sal) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: 7/21/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas L Sansonetti on behalf of Cody Laboratories Inc, Lannett Co Inc. (sal) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: 7/21/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew C Emrich on behalf of Cody Laboratories Inc, Lannett Co Inc. (sal) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: 7/21/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew J Kelly on behalf of Cody Laboratories Inc, Lannett Co Inc. (sal) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: 7/21/2010 Complaint
                                                                                                COMPLAINT (summonses issued) (Filing fee $350 - receipt #CHY009590), filed by Cody Laboratories Inc, Lannett Co Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet) (sal) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 65 times.

                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                   
                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                  Need Password Help?