Bd Trst of Leland, et al v. Corning Inc, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:00-cv-10584
District Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 4, 2017 at 12:38 AM DT (4.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bracewell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mateo Z Fowler +1 713 221 1574 +1 713 221 2173 mateo.fowler@bgllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED A J Bedel +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 ajbedel@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sidford Lewis Brown +1 213 443 6336 sidfordbrown@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Diane Cafferata Hutnyan +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 dianehutnyan@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick Alan Lorig +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 fredericklorig@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce R. Zisser brucezisser@quinnemanuel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity AG

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/05/2004 David M Kleiman +1 818 884 0949 +1 818 332 4373 davidkleiman@lapatents.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wagner Anderson and Bright PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick F.bright +1 818 249 9300 +1 818 249 9335 PBright@patentattorney.us
No Logo Litton Systems, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bracewell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mateo Z Fowler +1 713 221 1574 +1 713 221 2173 mateo.fowler@bgllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED A J Bedel +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 ajbedel@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sidford Lewis Brown +1 213 443 6336 sidfordbrown@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Diane Cafferata Hutnyan +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 dianehutnyan@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick Alan Lorig +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 fredericklorig@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Salsig +1 213 443 3307 +1 213 443 3100
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Greta Lisa Wick +1 213 443 3000 lisawick@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce R. Zisser brucezisser@quinnemanuel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity AG

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/05/2004 David M Kleiman +1 818 884 0949 +1 818 332 4373 davidkleiman@lapatents.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wagner Anderson and Bright PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick F.bright +1 818 249 9300 +1 818 249 9335 PBright@patentattorney.us
No Logo Agere Systems, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ekwan E Rhow +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 erhow@birdmarella.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Call, Jensen & Ferrell, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wayne W Call +1 949 717 3000 +1 949 717 3100 wcall@calljensen.com
TERMINATED: 08/19/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James B Hardin +1 949 717 3000 +1 949 717 3100 jhardin@calljensen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/11/2008 Steven D Chin +1 212 506 1907 schin@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GREGORY S. AROVAS , +1 212 446 4781 +1 212 446 4900 greg.arovas@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M Desmarais +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 4900 jdesmarais@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne Hassett +1 212 446 4800
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Scott Shukan +1 213 680 8400 +1 213 680 8500 dshukan@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lerner David Littenberg Krumholz & Mentilk, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/08/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Jophn Botos +1 908 654 5000

Toggle Switch Represented by Robinson Calcagnie & Robinson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scot D Wilson +1 949 720 1288 +1 949 720 1292 swilson@rcrlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jane Politz Brandt +1 214 969 1105 +1 214 969 1751 jane.brandt@tklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Max Ciccarelli +1 214 969 1599 max@tklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Michael Heinlen +1 214 969 2539 +1 214 969 1751 michael.heinlen@tklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gerald W Roberts +1 214 969 1700 gerald.roberts@tklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce S Sostek +1 214 969 1237 +1 214 969 1751 bruce.sostek@tklaw.com
No Logo Ciena Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Allcock +JohnAllcockd lap ipercom

Toggle Switch Represented by Emrich & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/20/2007 Susan E Emrich +1 619 688 0550 +1 619 688 0560 susan@emrichlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/21/2008 Todd Miller +1 858 678 5070 +1 858 678 5099 miller@fr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian T Rancilla +1 202 783 5070

Toggle Switch Represented by Gray, Cary, Ware & Freidenrich, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maria R Acker +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/11/2008 Steven D Chin +1 212 506 1907 schin@kasowitz.com
No Logo Ericson Microelectronics AB, Optoelectronic Products, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Emrich & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan E Emrich +1 619 688 0550 +1 619 688 0560 susan@emrichlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John E. Gartman +1 858 678 5070 +1 858 678 5099 gartman@fr.com
TERMINATED: 11/22/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Jude McKeon +1 202 783 5070 +1 202 783 2331 mckeon@fr.com
TERMINATED: 07/21/2008 Todd Miller +1 858 678 5070 +1 858 678 5099 miller@fr.com
TERMINATED: 11/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shelley K. Wessels +1 415 322 5070

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/11/2008 Steven D Chin +1 212 506 1907 schin@kasowitz.com
No Logo Ericsson, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Emrich & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan E Emrich +1 619 688 0550 +1 619 688 0560 susan@emrichlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John E. Gartman +1 858 678 5070 +1 858 678 5099 gartman@fr.com
TERMINATED: 07/21/2008 Todd Miller +1 858 678 5070 +1 858 678 5099 miller@fr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian T Rancilla +1 202 783 5070
TERMINATED: 11/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shelley K. Wessels +1 415 322 5070

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/11/2008 Steven D Chin +1 212 506 1907 schin@kasowitz.com
No Logo Jds Uniphase Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Henry B. Gutman +1 212 455 2000

Toggle Switch Represented by Barger & Wolen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Henry Weinstein +1 213 680 2800 +1 213 614 7399 sweinstein@bargerwolen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher J Burrell +1 612 766 7000 +1 612 766 1600 christopher.burrell@faegreBD.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Natalie Marie Hanlon-Leh +1 303 607 3500 +1 303 607 3600 natalie.hanlonleh@faegrebd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven D Chin +1 212 506 1907 schin@kasowitz.com
TERMINATED: 07/21/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence B Goodwin +1 212 506 1795 lgoodwin@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Eric Ostrow +1 650 251 5030 +1 650 251 5002 jostrow@stblaw.com
TERMINATED: 02/01/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy S Pitcock +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 jpitcock@stblaw.com
No Logo Lucent Technologies, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Unknown Role, Comm/scope, Inc.
Unknown Role, Agere Systems, Inc.
Unknown Role, Lucent En Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/11/2008 Steven D Chin +1 212 506 1907 schin@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GREGORY S. AROVAS , +1 212 446 4781 +1 212 446 4900 greg.arovas@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M Desmarais +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 4900 jdesmarais@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Colleen M. Garlington +1 312 862 2000 +1 312 862 2200 colleen.garlington@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne Hassett +1 212 446 4800
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian W Lee +1 212 446 4800 brian.lee@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jordan N Malz +1 212 446 4800 jmalz@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A. Shimota +1 312 861 2336 +1 312 861 2200 jshimota@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Scott Shukan +1 213 680 8400 +1 213 680 8500 dshukan@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Spaccarotella +1 212 446 4997 +1 212 446 4900 Jspaccarotella@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas Whitelaw & Tyler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian G. Arnold +1 949 679 6400 +1 949 679 6405 barnold@twtlaw.com
No Logo Pirelli S.p.a., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Donald Glazer +1 212 310 8426
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GARLAND T. STEPHENS +1 212 790 9090

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/11/2008 Steven D Chin +1 212 506 1907 schin@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kneafsey & Friend LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean M Kneafsey +1 213 892 1200 +1 213 892 1208 skneafsey@kneafseyfriend.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven W Green +1 212 310 8000
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Etai Lahav etai.lahav@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel J Melman +1 212 310 8000 daniel.melman@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patricia Young , +1 212 310 8458 patricia.young@weil.com
Telefonaktiebolaget L. M. Ericsson AB Telefonaktiebolaget L. M. Ericsson AB, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, -"

Toggle Switch Represented by Emrich & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan E Emrich +1 619 688 0550 +1 619 688 0560 susan@emrichlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John E. Gartman +1 858 678 5070 +1 858 678 5099 gartman@fr.com
TERMINATED: 07/21/2008 Todd Miller +1 858 678 5070 +1 858 678 5099 miller@fr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian T Rancilla +1 202 783 5070
TERMINATED: 11/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shelley K. Wessels +1 415 322 5070

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/11/2008 Steven D Chin +1 212 506 1907 schin@kasowitz.com
Tyco International, Ltd. Tyco International, Ltd., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/11/2008 Steven D Chin +1 212 506 1907 schin@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/23/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Howard Diamond +1 213 892 4000 mdiamond@milbank.com
TERMINATED: 06/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Lynne Miremadi +1 213 892 4000 +1 213 629 5063 jmiremadi@milbank.com
TERMINATED: 06/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark C Scarsi +1 213 892 4000 +1 213 629 5063 mscarsi@milbank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Millbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chris L. Holm +1 212 530 5734 +1 212 530 5219

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C. Kiernan +1 202 434 5191 +1 202 434 5029 dkiernan@wc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly D Perrotta +1 202 434 5298 kperrotta@wc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kendra P Robins +1 202 434 5854 +1 202 434 5029 krobins@wc.com
No Logo Tyco Networks (U.S.) Inc, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/11/2008 Steven D Chin +1 212 506 1907 schin@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/23/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Howard Diamond +1 213 892 4000 mdiamond@milbank.com
TERMINATED: 06/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Lynne Miremadi +1 213 892 4000 +1 213 629 5063 jmiremadi@milbank.com
TERMINATED: 06/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark C Scarsi +1 213 892 4000 +1 213 629 5063 mscarsi@milbank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C. Kiernan +1 202 434 5191 +1 202 434 5029 dkiernan@wc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly D Perrotta +1 202 434 5298 kperrotta@wc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kendra P Robins +1 202 434 5854 +1 202 434 5029 krobins@wc.com
No Logo TYCO TELECOMMUNICATIONS (US) Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/11/2008 Steven D Chin +1 212 506 1907 schin@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/23/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Howard Diamond +1 213 892 4000 mdiamond@milbank.com
TERMINATED: 06/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Lynne Miremadi +1 213 892 4000 +1 213 629 5063 jmiremadi@milbank.com
TERMINATED: 06/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark C Scarsi +1 213 892 4000 +1 213 629 5063 mscarsi@milbank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Millbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chris L. Holm +1 212 530 5734 +1 212 530 5219

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C. Kiernan +1 202 434 5191 +1 202 434 5029 dkiernan@wc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly D Perrotta +1 202 434 5298 kperrotta@wc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kendra P Robins +1 202 434 5854 +1 202 434 5029 krobins@wc.com
No Logo Tyco Telecommunications Ltd, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/11/2008 Steven D Chin +1 212 506 1907 schin@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/23/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Howard Diamond +1 213 892 4000 mdiamond@milbank.com
TERMINATED: 06/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Lynne Miremadi +1 213 892 4000 +1 213 629 5063 jmiremadi@milbank.com
TERMINATED: 06/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark C Scarsi +1 213 892 4000 +1 213 629 5063 mscarsi@milbank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Millbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chris L. Holm +1 212 530 5734 +1 212 530 5219

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C. Kiernan +1 202 434 5191 +1 202 434 5029 dkiernan@wc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly D Perrotta +1 202 434 5298 kperrotta@wc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kendra P Robins +1 202 434 5854 +1 202 434 5029 krobins@wc.com
v.
No Logo Agere Systems, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/04/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ekwan E Rhow +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 erhow@birdmarella.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Call, Jensen & Ferrell, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wayne W Call +1 949 717 3000 +1 949 717 3100 wcall@calljensen.com
TERMINATED: 08/19/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James B Hardin +1 949 717 3000 +1 949 717 3100 jhardin@calljensen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/11/2008 Steven D Chin +1 212 506 1907 schin@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GREGORY S. AROVAS , +1 212 446 4781 +1 212 446 4900 greg.arovas@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M Desmarais +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 4900 jdesmarais@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne Hassett +1 212 446 4800
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Scott Shukan +1 213 680 8400 +1 213 680 8500 dshukan@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lerner David Littenberg Krumholz & Mentilk, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/08/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Jophn Botos +1 908 654 5000

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sidford Lewis Brown +1 213 443 6336 sidfordbrown@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Diane Cafferata Hutnyan +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 dianehutnyan@quinnemanuel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robinson Calcagnie & Robinson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scot D Wilson +1 949 720 1288 +1 949 720 1292 swilson@rcrlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jane Politz Brandt +1 214 969 1105 +1 214 969 1751 jane.brandt@tklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Max Ciccarelli +1 214 969 1599 max@tklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Michael Heinlen +1 214 969 2539 +1 214 969 1751 michael.heinlen@tklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gerald W Roberts +1 214 969 1700 gerald.roberts@tklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce S Sostek +1 214 969 1237 +1 214 969 1751 bruce.sostek@tklaw.com
No Logo Ciena Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Allcock +JohnAllcockd lap ipercom

Toggle Switch Represented by Emrich & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan E Emrich +1 619 688 0550 +1 619 688 0560 susan@emrichlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/22/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Jude McKeon +1 202 783 5070 +1 202 783 2331 mckeon@fr.com
TERMINATED: 07/21/2008 Todd Miller +1 858 678 5070 +1 858 678 5099 miller@fr.com
TERMINATED: 08/09/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian T Rancilla +1 202 783 5070

Toggle Switch Represented by Gray, Cary, Ware & Freidenrich, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/16/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maria R Acker +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/11/2008 Steven D Chin +1 212 506 1907 schin@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sidford Lewis Brown +1 213 443 6336 sidfordbrown@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Diane Cafferata Hutnyan +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 dianehutnyan@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Ericson Microelectronics AB, Optoelectronic Products, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Emrich & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan E Emrich +1 619 688 0550 +1 619 688 0560 susan@emrichlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John E. Gartman +1 858 678 5070 +1 858 678 5099 gartman@fr.com
TERMINATED: 11/22/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Jude McKeon +1 202 783 5070 +1 202 783 2331 mckeon@fr.com
TERMINATED: 07/21/2008 Todd Miller +1 858 678 5070 +1 858 678 5099 miller@fr.com
TERMINATED: 11/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shelley K. Wessels +1 415 322 5070

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/11/2008 Steven D Chin +1 212 506 1907 schin@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sidford Lewis Brown +1 213 443 6336 sidfordbrown@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Diane Cafferata Hutnyan +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 dianehutnyan@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Ericsson, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Emrich & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan E Emrich +1 619 688 0550 +1 619 688 0560 susan@emrichlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John E. Gartman +1 858 678 5070 +1 858 678 5099 gartman@fr.com
TERMINATED: 07/21/2008 Todd Miller +1 858 678 5070 +1 858 678 5099 miller@fr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian T Rancilla +1 202 783 5070
TERMINATED: 11/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shelley K. Wessels +1 415 322 5070

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/11/2008 Steven D Chin +1 212 506 1907 schin@kasowitz.com
No Logo Jds Uniphase Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Henry B. Gutman +1 212 455 2000

Toggle Switch Represented by Barger & Wolen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Pirapat S Sindhuphak +1 213 614 7313 psindhuphak@barwol.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Henry Weinstein +1 213 680 2800 +1 213 614 7399 sweinstein@bargerwolen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher J Burrell +1 612 766 7000 +1 612 766 1600 christopher.burrell@faegreBD.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Natalie Marie Hanlon-Leh +1 303 607 3500 +1 303 607 3600 natalie.hanlonleh@faegrebd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/22/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven D Chin +1 212 506 1907 schin@kasowitz.com
TERMINATED: 07/21/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence B Goodwin +1 212 506 1795 lgoodwin@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sidford Lewis Brown +1 213 443 6336 sidfordbrown@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Diane Cafferata Hutnyan +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 dianehutnyan@quinnemanuel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Eric Ostrow +1 650 251 5030 +1 650 251 5002 jostrow@stblaw.com
TERMINATED: 02/01/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy S Pitcock +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 jpitcock@stblaw.com
No Logo Lucent Technologies, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Comm/scope, Inc.
Unknown Role, Agere Systems, Inc.
Unknown Role, Lucent En Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/11/2008 Steven D Chin +1 212 506 1907 schin@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GREGORY S. AROVAS , +1 212 446 4781 +1 212 446 4900 greg.arovas@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M Desmarais +1 212 446 4800 +1 212 446 4900 jdesmarais@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Colleen M. Garlington +1 312 862 2000 +1 312 862 2200 colleen.garlington@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne Hassett +1 212 446 4800
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian W Lee +1 212 446 4800 brian.lee@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jordan N Malz +1 212 446 4800 jmalz@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A. Shimota +1 312 861 2336 +1 312 861 2200 jshimota@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Scott Shukan +1 213 680 8400 +1 213 680 8500 dshukan@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Spaccarotella +1 212 446 4997 +1 212 446 4900 Jspaccarotella@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sidford Lewis Brown +1 213 443 6336 sidfordbrown@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Diane Cafferata Hutnyan +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 dianehutnyan@quinnemanuel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas Whitelaw & Tyler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian G. Arnold +1 949 679 6400 +1 949 679 6405 barnold@twtlaw.com
No Logo Pirelli S.p.a., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Donald Glazer +1 212 310 8426
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven J Rizzi
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GARLAND T. STEPHENS +1 212 790 9090
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Donald Glazer +1 212 310 8426
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GARLAND T. STEPHENS +1 212 790 9090

Toggle Switch Represented by Barger & Wolen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pirapat S Sindhuphak +1 213 614 7313 psindhuphak@barwol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/11/2008 Steven D Chin +1 212 506 1907 schin@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kneafsey & Friend LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean M Kneafsey +1 213 892 1200 +1 213 892 1208 skneafsey@kneafseyfriend.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean M Kneafsey +1 213 892 1200 +1 213 892 1208 skneafsey@kneafseyfriend.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sidford Lewis Brown +1 213 443 6336 sidfordbrown@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Diane Cafferata Hutnyan +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 dianehutnyan@quinnemanuel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven W Green +1 212 310 8000
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Etai Lahav etai.lahav@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel J Melman +1 212 310 8000 daniel.melman@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patricia Young , +1 212 310 8458 patricia.young@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven W Green +1 212 310 8000
Telefonaktiebolaget L. M. Ericsson AB Telefonaktiebolaget L. M. Ericsson AB, Defendant
Officially listed as "Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, -"

Toggle Switch Represented by Emrich & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan E Emrich +1 619 688 0550 +1 619 688 0560 susan@emrichlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John E. Gartman +1 858 678 5070 +1 858 678 5099 gartman@fr.com
TERMINATED: 11/22/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Jude McKeon +1 202 783 5070 +1 202 783 2331 mckeon@fr.com
TERMINATED: 07/21/2008 Todd Miller +1 858 678 5070 +1 858 678 5099 miller@fr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian T Rancilla +1 202 783 5070
TERMINATED: 11/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shelley K. Wessels +1 415 322 5070

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/11/2008 Steven D Chin +1 212 506 1907 schin@kasowitz.com
Tyco International, Ltd. Tyco International, Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/11/2008 Steven D Chin +1 212 506 1907 schin@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher E. Chalsen, Esq. +1 212 530 5380 +1 212 530 5219 jnici@milbank.com
TERMINATED: 01/23/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Howard Diamond +1 213 892 4000 mdiamond@milbank.com
LEAD ATTORNEY John Michael Griem +1 212 530 5429 +1 212 530 5429 jgriem@milbank.com
TERMINATED: 06/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Robert Klaiber +1 212 530 5219 +1 212 822 5019 jklaiber@milbank.com
TERMINATED: 06/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Lynne Miremadi +1 213 892 4000 +1 213 629 5063 jmiremadi@milbank.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Martin Murray +1 212 530 5424 +1 212 822 5424 MMurray@milbank.com
TERMINATED: 06/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark C Scarsi +1 213 892 4000 +1 213 629 5063 mscarsi@milbank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Millbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chris L. Holm +1 212 530 5734 +1 212 530 5219

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sidford Lewis Brown +1 213 443 6336 sidfordbrown@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Diane Cafferata Hutnyan +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 dianehutnyan@quinnemanuel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C. Kiernan +1 202 434 5191 +1 202 434 5029 dkiernan@wc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly D Perrotta +1 202 434 5298 kperrotta@wc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kendra P Robins +1 202 434 5854 +1 202 434 5029 krobins@wc.com
No Logo Tyco Networks (U.S.) Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/11/2008 Steven D Chin +1 212 506 1907 schin@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher E. Chalsen, Esq. +1 212 530 5380 +1 212 530 5219 jnici@milbank.com
TERMINATED: 01/23/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Howard Diamond +1 213 892 4000 mdiamond@milbank.com
LEAD ATTORNEY John Michael Griem +1 212 530 5429 +1 212 530 5429 jgriem@milbank.com
TERMINATED: 06/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Robert Klaiber +1 212 530 5219 +1 212 822 5019 jklaiber@milbank.com
TERMINATED: 06/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Lynne Miremadi +1 213 892 4000 +1 213 629 5063 jmiremadi@milbank.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Martin Murray +1 212 530 5424 +1 212 822 5424 MMurray@milbank.com
TERMINATED: 06/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark C Scarsi +1 213 892 4000 +1 213 629 5063 mscarsi@milbank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C. Kiernan +1 202 434 5191 +1 202 434 5029 dkiernan@wc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly D Perrotta +1 202 434 5298 kperrotta@wc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kendra P Robins +1 202 434 5854 +1 202 434 5029 krobins@wc.com
No Logo TYCO SUBMARINE SYSTEMS LTD., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Millbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chris L. Holm +1 212 530 5734 +1 212 530 5219
No Logo TYCO TELECOMMUNICATIONS (US) Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/11/2008 Steven D Chin +1 212 506 1907 schin@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher E. Chalsen, Esq. +1 212 530 5380 +1 212 530 5219 jnici@milbank.com
TERMINATED: 01/23/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Howard Diamond +1 213 892 4000 mdiamond@milbank.com
LEAD ATTORNEY John Michael Griem +1 212 530 5429 +1 212 530 5429 jgriem@milbank.com
TERMINATED: 06/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Robert Klaiber +1 212 530 5219 +1 212 822 5019 jklaiber@milbank.com
TERMINATED: 06/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Lynne Miremadi +1 213 892 4000 +1 213 629 5063 jmiremadi@milbank.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Martin Murray +1 212 530 5424 +1 212 822 5424 MMurray@milbank.com
TERMINATED: 06/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark C Scarsi +1 213 892 4000 +1 213 629 5063 mscarsi@milbank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Millbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chris L. Holm +1 212 530 5734 +1 212 530 5219

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C. Kiernan +1 202 434 5191 +1 202 434 5029 dkiernan@wc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly D Perrotta +1 202 434 5298 kperrotta@wc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kendra P Robins +1 202 434 5854 +1 202 434 5029 krobins@wc.com
No Logo Tyco Telecommunications Ltd, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/11/2008 Steven D Chin +1 212 506 1907 schin@kasowitz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher E. Chalsen, Esq. +1 212 530 5380 +1 212 530 5219 jnici@milbank.com
TERMINATED: 01/23/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Howard Diamond +1 213 892 4000 mdiamond@milbank.com
LEAD ATTORNEY John Michael Griem +1 212 530 5429 +1 212 530 5429 jgriem@milbank.com
TERMINATED: 06/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Robert Klaiber +1 212 530 5219 +1 212 822 5019 jklaiber@milbank.com
TERMINATED: 06/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Lynne Miremadi +1 213 892 4000 +1 213 629 5063 jmiremadi@milbank.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Martin Murray +1 212 530 5424 +1 212 822 5424 MMurray@milbank.com
TERMINATED: 06/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark C Scarsi +1 213 892 4000 +1 213 629 5063 mscarsi@milbank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Millbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/17/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chris L. Holm +1 212 530 5734 +1 212 530 5219

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C. Kiernan +1 202 434 5191 +1 202 434 5029 dkiernan@wc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly D Perrotta +1 202 434 5298 kperrotta@wc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kendra P Robins +1 202 434 5854 +1 202 434 5029 krobins@wc.com
Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED A J Bedel +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 ajbedel@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sidford Lewis Brown +1 213 443 6336 sidfordbrown@quinnemanuel.com
TERMINATED: 03/06/2006 Frederick Alan Lorig +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 fredericklorig@quinnemanuel.com
TERMINATED: 03/06/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce R. Zisser brucezisser@quinnemanuel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity AG

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/05/2004 David M Kleiman +1 818 884 0949 +1 818 332 4373 davidkleiman@lapatents.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wagner Anderson and Bright PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick F.bright +1 818 249 9300 +1 818 249 9335 PBright@patentattorney.us
No Logo Litton Systems, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bracewell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mateo Z Fowler +1 713 221 1574 +1 713 221 2173 mateo.fowler@bgllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED A J Bedel +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 ajbedel@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sidford Lewis Brown +1 213 443 6336 sidfordbrown@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frederick Alan Lorig +1 213 443 3000 +1 213 443 3100 fredericklorig@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Salsig +1 213 443 3307 +1 213 443 3100
TERMINATED: 03/06/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce R. Zisser brucezisser@quinnemanuel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity AG

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/05/2004 David M Kleiman +1 818 884 0949 +1 818 332 4373 davidkleiman@lapatents.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wagner Anderson and Bright PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick F.bright +1 818 249 9300 +1 818 249 9335 PBright@patentattorney.us
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (765) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Sealed Legal Document 770 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT - STIPULATED Judgment as to Claims Against Defendant Pirelli S.p.A. (lra) (Entered: 09/25/2008)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 769 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER RE UNDER SEAL STIPULATED JUDGMENT as to claims against Defendant Pirelli S.p.A. 764 by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr : The Court finds that there being no just reason for delay in entry of a final judgment between Plaintiffs and Defendant Pirelli S.p.A., judgment is hereby entered by the Court pursuant to the terms set forth in the stipulation filed on September 15, 2008 by andbetween the parties. All pending motions are hereby moot. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (lom) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 768 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr, granted APPLICATION for Order for to file under seal stipulaed Judgment as to claims against defendant Pirelli S.p.A. 765 (lra) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 767 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE REMOVING THE HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EVIDENTIARY SANCTIONS FROM CALENDAR by Magistrate Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the hearing on the Ex Parte Application of Defendant Pirelli for Evidentiary Sanctions is removed from the Court's Calendar on September 19, 2008. (pcl) (Entered: 09/18/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 766 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: None
          STIPULATION RE REMOVING THE HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EVIDENTIARY SANCTIONS FROM CALENDAR re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exclude Expert Report of Shaoul Ezekiel 673 filed by Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation Removing Hearing)(Brown, Sidford) (Entered: 09/18/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 765 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
            APPLICATION to file under seal stipulaed Judgment as to claims against defendant Pirelli S.p.A. filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. Lodged Prop Order. (lom) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 764 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc of Stipulated Judgment as to Claims Against Defendant Pirelli S.p.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order re Stipulated Judgment as to Claims Against Defendant Pirelli S.p.A.)(Lorig, Frederick) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 763 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER re Stipulation to Dismiss Party, 762 by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr that this case be dismissed with prejudice as to Defendants JDS Uniphase and SDL, with each side bearing its own costs and attorneys' fees. This dismissal is pursuant to a settlement agreement between the parties and is not intended to nor will it affect Plaintiffs' claims against the remaining defendant, Pirelli S.p.A. JDS Uniphase Corporation; SDL Inc terminated. (lom) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 762 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                  STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants JDS Uniphase Corporation(a Delaware corporation), SDL Inc(a Delaware corporation), JDS Uniphase Corporation filed by Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Re Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice)(Brown, Sidford) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Sealed Legal Document 761 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None
                    SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of RALPH JACOBS, filed (lra) (Entered: 09/03/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Sealed Legal Document 760 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None
                      SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of DAVID YURKERWUCH, filed (lra) (Entered: 09/03/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Sealed Legal Document 759 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None
                        SEALED DOCUMENT - EXHIBITS TO DECLARATION OF SIDFORD L. BROWN In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Filed as to Declaration (Motion related) 736 . (lra) (Entered: 09/03/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Sealed Legal Document 758 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None
                          SEALED DOCUMENT - ERRATA TO DECLARATION of PROFESSOR SHAOUL EZEKIEL, filed (lra) (Entered: 09/03/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Sealed Legal Document 757 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None
                            SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of PROFESSOR SHAOUL EZEKIEL filed (lra) (Entered: 09/03/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Sealed Legal Document 756 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None
                              SEALED DOCUMENT - EXHIBIT B-F AND I-M to DECLARATION OF METEO FOWLER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Infringement 741 . (lra) (Entered: 09/03/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Sealed Legal Document 755 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None
                                SEALED DOCUMENT - STATEMENT of UNCONTROVERTED FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INFRINGEMENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to INFRINGEMENT 754 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Infringement 741 . (lra) (Entered: 09/03/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Sealed Legal Document 754 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None
                                  SEALED DOCUMENT - PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to INFRINGEMENT filed (lra) (Entered: 09/03/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Sealed Legal Document 753 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None
                                    SEALED DOCUMENT - STATEMENT of OF GENUINE ISSUES IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Infringement 741 . (lra) (Entered: 09/03/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Sealed Legal Document 752 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None
                                      SEALED DOCUMENT - PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO Defendants' MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Infringement 741 . (lra) (Entered: 09/03/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 751 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Frederick A Lorig counsel for Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc. Adding Frederick A. Lorig as attorney as counsel of record for Litton Systems, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Litton Systems, Inc. (Lorig, Frederick) (Entered: 09/02/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 750 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Sidford L Brown counsel for Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc. Adding Sidford Lewis Brown as attorney as counsel of record for Litton Systems, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Litton Systems, Inc. (Brown, Sidford) (Entered: 09/02/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 749 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr, granting APPLICATION for Order for to file under seal Plaintiffs' Moton for 745 (lra) (Entered: 09/02/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 748 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr, granting APPLICATION for Order for File Under Seal Palintiffs' Oppositon to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, Statement of Genuine Issues and E#xhibits to Declaration of Sidford L. Brown 740 (lra) (Entered: 09/02/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 747 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: CASE CAPTIONING DOES NOT MATCH CASE NUMBER. ATTORNEY BAR NUMER IS INCORRECT ON G6 FORM RE: Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06), Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06) 746 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (vh) (Entered: 08/29/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 746 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Sidford L Brown counsel for Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc. Adding Sidford L. Brown as attorney as counsel of record for Litton Systems, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Litton Systems, Inc. (Brown, Sidford) (Entered: 08/28/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 745 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                    APPLICATION to file under seal Plaintiffs' Moton for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement and Accompanying Documents filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. Lodged [Prop] Order. (lom) (Entered: 08/28/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 744 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman: IT IS SO ORDERED that the hearing on the Ex Parte Application of Defendants Pirelli and JDS Uniphase Corporation for Evidentiary Sanctions is continued from August 29, 2008 to September 19, 2008 at 9:00 a.m. (pcl) (Entered: 08/27/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Sealed Legal Document 743 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT - EXHIBIT A to The Delcaration of Christopher j. Burrell in Support of reply to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exclude Expert Report of Shaoul Ezekiel 673 filed (lra) (Entered: 08/27/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Sealed Legal Document 742 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exclude Expert Report of Shaoul Ezekiel 673 filed(lra) (Entered: 08/27/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank 741 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Infringement filed by Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc. Motion set for hearing on 10/20/2008 at 10:00 PM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Mateo Fowler)(Brown, Sidford) (Entered: 08/26/2008)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 740 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                              APPLICATION for Order for File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, Statement of Genuine Issues and Exhibits to Declaration of Sidford L. Brown filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. Lodged [Prop] Order. (lom) (Entered: 08/26/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 739 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement and Accompanying Documents. (Brown, Sidford) (Entered: 08/26/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 738 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr, GRANTING APPLICATION for Order for to File Under Seal 709 (lra) (Entered: 08/26/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 737 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    JOINT STIPULATION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exclude Expert Report of Shaoul Ezekiel 673 filed by Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Sidford) (Entered: 08/26/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 736 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      DECLARATION of Sidford L. Brown In Opposition To Corrected MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Non-infringement or, in the alternative, Summary Judgment of Invalidity 679 filed by Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc. (Brown, Sidford) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 735 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (Brown, Sidford) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 734 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr Granting APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY Benjamin L. Singer for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE PAID 402 , [407 ] by Benjamin Singer to appear on behalf of Plaintiff/Counter Defendant Litton Systems Inc. Diane Hutnyan is designated as local counsel. Fee pd on 8/22/08. (lom) Modified on 8/22/2008 (lom). (Entered: 08/22/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 733 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Notice of Change of Attorney Info (G-06) RE: Notice (Other) 724 . There is a specific event for this form. See Other Filings: Notices for Change of Attorney Information (G-06). Also, by using the correct event, the person reviewing this document will get notified. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lom) (Entered: 08/20/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 732 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              REPLY filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc to Objections - non-motion 723 (Brown, Sidford) (Entered: 08/20/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 731 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Notice of Lodging RE: Statement (Motion related) 701 . When filing the [Prop] Statement by itself, please file a Notice of Lodging document and attach the [Prop] Statement as the separate document. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lom) (Entered: 08/20/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 730 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Please do not re-file this document (face page). Once the documents are manually filed, the documents are reviewed and docketed by the department who handles Under Seal documents RE: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Against Defendants' Standing Defense 694 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lom) (Entered: 08/20/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 728 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman: A hearing on defendants' ex parte application to exclude the untimely report of Shaoul Ezekiel as a discovery sanction will be held on Friday, August 29, 2008, at 9:00 a.m., Courtroom 23, Third Floor, United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. (pcl) (Entered: 08/19/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 727 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Pirelli S p A of Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion to Exclude Expert Report of Shauol Ezekiel and Exhibit A to Burrell's Declaration. (Kneafsey, Sean) (Entered: 08/19/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 726 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                        APPLICATION to Seal Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related) 725 filed by Defendant Pirelli S p A. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Pirelli's Application to File Under Seal)(Kneafsey, Sean) (Entered: 08/19/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 725 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                          REPLY in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exclude Expert Report of Shaoul Ezekiel 673 filed by Defendant Pirelli S p A. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Christopher J. Burrell, # 2 Exhibit Christopher J. Burrell Declaration, # 3 Declaration Patricia Young, # 4 Exhibit Patricia Young Declaration)(Kneafsey, Sean) (Entered: 08/19/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 724 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE filed by Defendant Agere Systems Inc, Agere Systems Inc. of Change of Attorney Information (Hardin, James) (Entered: 08/19/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 723 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                              OBJECTIONS to Sealed Document 652 PIRELLIS OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED MEMORANDUM OF CONTENTIONS OF FACTS AND LAW filed by Defendant Pirelli S p A. (Kneafsey, Sean) (Entered: 08/19/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 722 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman: ORDER VACATING: (1) ORDER DECLINING TO HEAR EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS PIRELLI AND JDS UNIPHASE CORPORATION FOR EVIDENTIARY SANCTIONS; AND (2) ORDER TO FILE CERTAIN DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL, AND ORDERING DEFENDANTS TO RELODGE THOSE DOCUMENTS. (See document for further details.) (pcl) (Entered: 08/18/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 721 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT - EXHIBIT to MOTION for Summary Judgment as AGAINST DEFENDANTS' STANDING DEFENSE 719 filed (lra) (Entered: 08/15/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 720 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT - PROPOSED STATMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED FEACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE DEFENDANTS' STANDING DEFENSE MOTION for Summary Judgment as to AGAINST DEFENDANTS' STANDING DEFENSE 719 filed (lra) Modified on 8/15/2008 (lra). (Entered: 08/15/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 719 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to AGAINST DEFENDANTS' STANDING DEFENSE filed (lra) (Entered: 08/15/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 718 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT - EXHIBITS to Declaration of Sidford L.Brown in support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to ON JDS UNIPHASE CORPORATION'S LICENSE DEFENSE 716 filed(lra) (Entered: 08/15/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 717 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of BRUCE ZISSER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to ON JDS UNIPHASE CORPORATION'S LICENSE DEFENSE 716 filed (lra) (Entered: 08/15/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 716 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to ON JDS UNIPHASE CORPORATION'S LICENSE DEFENSE filed (lra) (Entered: 08/15/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 715 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT - STATEMENT of UNCONTROVERTED FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to JDS Uniphase Corporation's License Defense 698 filed(lra) (Entered: 08/15/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 714 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr, granting APPLICATION for Order for to file Under Seal Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motionfor partial Summary Judgment on JDS Uniphase Corporation's License Defense and Supporting 712 (lra) (Entered: 08/15/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 713 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr, granting APPLICATION for Order for File Under Seal Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment against Defendants' Standing Defense and Exhibits to Declarations of Sidford L. Brown and Harold Gillmann 711 (lra) (Entered: 08/15/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 712 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to file Under Seal Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on JDS Uniphase Corporation's License Defense and supporting documents filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. Lodged Order. (lom) (Entered: 08/13/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 711 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      APPLICATION for Order for File Under Seal Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment against Defendants' Standing Defense and Exhibits to Declarations of Sidford L. Brown and Harold Gillmann filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. Lodged Oreder. (lom) (Entered: 08/13/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 710 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation, Pirelli S p A, on August 8, 2008 the following documents: Notice of Manual Filing; Application to File Under Seal and [Proposed] Order; Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Untimely Expert Report of Shaoul Ezekiel As a Discovery Sanction; Exhbit A to Declaration of Chstopher J. Burrell; and Proof of Service was electtronically mailed and by mailed by US Postal Service to Frederick Lorig and Patrick F. Bright and Steven D. Glazer.(lom) (Entered: 08/13/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 709 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          APPLICATION for Order for to File Under Seal 1) Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants JDS Uniphase and Pirelli's Motion for Ex Parte Application to Exclude the Untimely Expert Report of Shauol Ezekiel as a Discovery Sanction; and 2) Exhibit A to the Declaration of Christopher J. Burrell in Support ofReply Memorandum filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation, Pirelli S p A. Lodged Order. (lom) (Entered: 08/13/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 708 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman: Since this Court has declined to consider defendant Pirelli's request for discovery sanctions as an ex parte application, it denies defendant Pirelli's request to file certain documents under seal, and hereby Orders the Clerk to return those documents to defendant Pirelli. (pcl) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 707 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman: The Court declines to hear defendant Pirelli's ex parte application, or, alternatively, denies it without prejudice to renewal as a noticed motion. (See document for further details.) (pcl) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 706 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of A.J. BEDEL IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exclude Expert Report of Shaoul Ezekiel 673 . (lra) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 705 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr, GRANTING APPLICATION for Order for to File Under Seal Exhibits 673 (lra) (lra). Modified on 8/12/2008 (lra). (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 704 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Amendment to MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to JDS Uniphase Corporation's License Defense 698 filed by Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc. (Brown, Sidford) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 703 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Amendment to MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Against Defendants' Standing Defense 694 filed by Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc. (Brown, Sidford) (Entered: 08/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 702 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Plaintiffs re MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Against JDSU's and Pirelli's Affirmative Defense of Anticipation 699 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Re Anticipation)(Zisser, Bruce) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 701 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          STATEMENT of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Against JDSU's and Pirelli's Affirmative Defense of Anticipation 699 filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. (Zisser, Bruce) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 700 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Mateo Z. Fowler In support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Against JDSU's and Pirelli's Affirmative Defense of Anticipation 699 filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Fowler Declaration Exhibits 1-5, # 2 Exhibit Fowler Declaration Exhibits 6-9)(Zisser, Bruce) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 699 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Against JDSU's and Pirelli's Affirmative Defense of Anticipation filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. Motion set for hearing on 10/20/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Zisser, Bruce) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 698 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to JDS Uniphase Corporation's License Defense filed by Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc. Motion set for hearing on 10/20/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiffs' Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law In Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on JDS Uniphase Corporation's License Defense, # 2 Proposed Order)(Brown, Sidford) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 697 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Sidford L. Brown In Support Of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Against Defendants' Standing Defense 694 filed by Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Redacted), # 2 Exhibit B (Unredacted), # 3 Exhibit C (Redacted), # 4 Declaration D (Redacted), # 5 Exhibit E (Redacted), # 6 Exhibit F (Unredacted), # 7 Exhibit G (Unredacted), # 8 Exhibit H (Unredacted))(Brown, Sidford) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 696 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Harold Gillmann In Support Of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Against Defendants' Standing Defense 694 filed by Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Redacted), # 2 Exhibit B (Redacted), # 3 Exhibit C (Redacted), # 4 Exhibit D (Redacted), # 5 Exhibit E (Redacted), # 6 Exhibit F (Redacted), # 7 Exhibit G (Redacted), # 8 Exhibit H (Redacted), # 9 Exhibit I (Redacted), # 10 Exhibit J (Redacted), # 11 Exhibit K (Unredacted), # 12 Exhibit L (Unredacted), # 13 Exhibit M (Unredacted), # 14 Exhibit N (Redacted), # 15 Exhibit O (Redacted), # 16 Exhibit P (Redacted), # 17 Exhibit Q (Redacted), # 18 Exhibit R (Redacted))(Brown, Sidford) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 695 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Against Defendants' Standing Defense 694 filed by Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Brown, Sidford) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 694 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Against Defendants' Standing Defense filed by Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc. Motion set for hearing on 10/20/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Defendants' Standing Defense (Unredacted), # 2 Proposed Order)(Brown, Sidford) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 693 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc of Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for PSJ on JDS Uniphase Corp.'s License Defense; Plaintiffs' Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law; Declaration of Bruce Zisser In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for PSJ on JDS Uniphase Corporation's License Defense. (Brown, Sidford) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 692 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc of Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for SJ Against Defendants' Standing Defense; [Proposed] Statement of Uncontroverted Facts; Exhibits A-J and N-R to Declaration of Harold Gillmann; Exhibits A and C-E to Declaration of Sidford Brown. (Brown, Sidford) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 691 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to file Under Seal Exhibits to Declaration of A.J. Bedel in support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Ex Parte Application dated 8/6/08 filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. Lodged order. (lom) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 690 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                REPLY in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exclude Expert Report of Shaoul Ezekiel 673 (Under Seal) filed by Defendants JDS Uniphase Corporation, Pirelli S p A. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christoper J. Burrell, # 2 Exhibit A to Burrell Declaration (Under Seal), # 3 Declaration of Patricia Young, # 4 Exhibit A to Young Declaration)(Sindhuphak, Pirapat) (Entered: 08/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 689 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT - EXHIBIT S TO DECLARATION OF PROFESSOR DAVID J. PAYNE ( EXHIBITS A AND B )Filed (lra) (Entered: 08/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 688 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT - EXHIBITS TO DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER J. BURRELL(EXHIBITS F, AH, AI, AP, AQ, BA,BB,BD,BE,BF,BG, AND BH Filed (lra) (Entered: 08/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 687 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants JDS Uniphase Corporation, Pirelli S p A of Application to File Under Seal; Proposed Order; Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Untimely Expert Report of Shaoul Ezekiel As a Discovery Sanction; Exhibit A to the Declaration of Christopher J. Burrell; Proof of Service. (Sindhuphak, Pirapat) (Entered: 08/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 686 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT - STATEMENT of DEFENDANTS JDS UNIPHASES AND PIRELLI S.p.A.'S STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY Corrected MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Non-infringement or, in the alternative, Summary Judgment of Invalidity 679 filed(lra) (Entered: 08/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 685 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT - MEMORANDUM in Support of Corrected MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Non-infringement or, in the alternative, Summary Judgment of Invalidity 679 filed (lra) (Entered: 08/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 684 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr, GRANTING APPLICATION for Order for to File Under Seal 669 (lra) (Entered: 08/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 683 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc, re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) 682 served on August 8, 2008. (Bedel, A) (Entered: 08/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 682 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc of [HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL] DECLARATION OF A.J. BEDEL IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXCLUDE THE SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT OF PROF. EZEKIEL; APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL; [PROPOSED] ORDER. (Bedel, A) (Entered: 08/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 681 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc of EXHIBITS 4 AND 7 TO DECLARATION OF A.J. BEDEL IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXCLUDE THE SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT OF PROF. EZEKIEL; APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL; [PROPOSED] ORDER; PROOF OF SERVICE. (Bedel, A) (Entered: 08/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 680 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION In Opposition To re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exclude Expert Report of Shaoul Ezekiel 673 filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Bedel, A) (Entered: 08/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 679 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND Corrected MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Non-infringement or, in the alternative, Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Defendants JDS Uniphase Corporation(a Delaware corporation), Pirelli S p A. Motion set for hearing on 9/22/2008 at 01:30 PM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Redacted Version), # 2 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law (Redacted Version), # 3 Proposed Order)(Sindhuphak, Pirapat) (Entered: 08/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 678 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: On the court's own motion, the Final Pretrial Conference hearing date of August 11, 2008 is hereby ordered continued to October 6, 2008 at 10am. (ys) (Entered: 08/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 677 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr, re Stipulation for Settlement 656 : Plaintiffs Litton Systems, Inc. and The Board of Trustees of Leland Stanford Junior University and Defendant Pirelli S.p.A. shall have until September 7, 2008, to complete the settlement process required by Central District Local Rule 16. (lom) (Entered: 08/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 676 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr, Granting Request to Remove filed items from the Court's CM/ECF System 668 , re JDS Uniphase's MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Non-Infringment or in the alternative, Summary Judgment of Invalidity 658 . It is Ordered that the following documents shall be removed from the CM/ECF system: JDSU and Defendant Pirelli S.p.A.'s ("Pirelli") Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Redacted Version), filed as D.I. 658-2; and JDSU and Pirelli's Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law (Redacted Version), filed as D.I. 658-3. (lom) (Entered: 08/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 675 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Patricia Young In Support Of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exclude Expert Report of Shaoul Ezekiel 673 filed by Defendants JDS Uniphase Corporation, Pirelli S p A. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Sindhuphak, Pirapat) (Entered: 08/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 674 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Natalie Hanlon-Leh In Support Of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exclude Expert Report of Shaoul Ezekiel 673 filed by Defendants JDS Uniphase Corporation, Pirelli S p A. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Sindhuphak, Pirapat) (Entered: 08/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 673 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exclude Expert Report of Shaoul Ezekiel filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation(a Delaware corporation), Pirelli S p A. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude, # 2 Proposed Order)(Sindhuphak, Pirapat) (Entered: 08/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 672 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc. correcting Exhibit List 654 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Amended Joint Exhibit Lisst and Objections)(Brown, Sidford) (Entered: 08/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 671 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Request. Please do not use Miscellaneous event for Requests, Motions, Applications. There are specific events for these types of documents. For right event, see Motions and Related Filings: Request for Order, etc RE: Miscellaneous Document, 668 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lom) (Entered: 08/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 670 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proof OF SERVICE re Notice of Manual Filing; Defendants JDS Uniphase Corporation and Pirelli's Application to File Under Seal; [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants JDS Uniphase Corporation's and Pirelli's Application to File Under Seal; Memorandum in Support of Defendants JDS Uniphase and Pirelli's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement or In the Alternative, Summary Judgment of Invalidity (Unredacted Version); etc by mail and electronic mail transmission to Frederick Lorig, Patrick F. Bright, Gregory S. Arovas, Steven D. Glazer and Bruce Sostek on 8/5/08 filed by Defendants JDS Uniphase Corporation, Pirelli S p A. (lom) (Entered: 08/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 669 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION for Order to File Under Seal filed by Defendants JDS Uniphase Corporation, Pirelli S p A. Lodged Order. (lom) (Entered: 08/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 668 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request to Remove Filed Items from the Court's CM/ECF System filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation re: MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Non-Infringment or in the alternative, Summary Judgment of Invalidity 658 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sindhuphak, Pirapat) (Entered: 08/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 667 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation. correcting MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Non-Infringment or in the alternative, Summary Judgment of Invalidity 658 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Redacted Version), # 3 Exhibit Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law (Redacted Version))(Sindhuphak, Pirapat) (Entered: 08/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 666 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION for Settlement STIPULATION RE EXTENSION OF TIME TO PARTICIPATE IN FURTHER SETTLEMENT PROCEEDINGS filed by Defendant Pirelli S p A.(Kneafsey, Sean) (Entered: 08/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 665 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Document filed is not signed by the other parties, see General Order No. 08-02 regarding Multiple CM/ECF User Signatures. Also, second page of your declaration is not clear in appearance. It may be the way you are attaching the document. RE: Declaration (Motion related) 659 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lom) (Entered: 08/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 664 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Document filed is not signed by the other parties, see General Order No. 08-02 regarding Multiple CM/ECF User Signatures RE: Exhibit List 654 ; MOTION for Summary Judgment 658 , Stipulation for Settlement 656 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lom) (Entered: 08/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 663 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re Stipulation to Dismiss Party 653 by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: This case is dismissed with prejudice as to Defendants Lucent and Agere, with each side bearing its own costs and attorneys' fees. This dismissal is pursuant to a settlement agreement between the parties and is not intended to nor will it affect Plaintiffs' claims against any of the remainingdefendants: Pirelli S.p.A., and JDS Uniphase Corporation. (lom) (Entered: 08/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 662 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        IN CHAMBERS- ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr Granting REQUEST to Substitute attorney Wayne W. Call, James B. Hardin, and Scot D. Wilson of Call, Jensen & Ferrell in place of attorney Ekwan E. Rhow of Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg 561 . (lom) (Entered: 08/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 661 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Christopher J. Burrell in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Non-Infringment or in the alternative, Summary Judgment of Invalidity 658 filed by Defendants JDS Uniphase Corporation, Pirelli S p A. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D (1 of 3), # 5 Exhibit D (2 of 3), # 6 Exhibit D (3 of 3), # 7 Exhibit E (1 of 2), # 8 Exhibit E (2 of 2), # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K, # 15 Exhibit L, # 16 Exhibit M, # 17 Exhibit N, # 18 Exhibit O, # 19 Exhibit P, # 20 Exhibit Q, # 21 Exhibit R, # 22 Exhibit S, # 23 Exhibit T, # 24 Exhibit U, # 25 Exhibit V, # 26 Exhibit W, # 27 Exhibit X, # 28 Exhibit Y, # 29 Exhibit Z, # 30 Exhibit AA, # 31 Exhibit AB, # 32 Exhibit AC, # 33 Exhibit AD, # 34 Exhibit AE, # 35 Exhibit AF, # 36 Exhibit AG, # 37 Exhibit AH, # 38 Exhibit AI, # 39 Exhibit AJ, # 40 Exhibit AK, # 41 Exhibit AL, # 42 Exhibit AM, # 43 Exhibit AN, # 44 Exhibit O, # 45 Exhibit AP, # 46 Exhibit AQ, # 47 Exhibit AR, # 48 Exhibit AS (1 of 2), # 49 Exhibit AS (2 of 2), # 50 Exhibit AT (1 of 3), # 51 Exhibit AT (2 of 3), # 52 Exhibit AT (3 of 3), # 53 Exhibit AU, # 54 Exhibit AV, # 55 Exhibit AW, # 56 Exhibit AX (1 of 2), # 57 Exhibit AX (2 of 2), # 58 Exhibit AY, # 59 Exhibit AZ, # 60 Exhibit BA, # 61 Exhibit BB, # 62 Exhibit BC, # 63 Exhibit BD, # 64 Declaration BE, # 65 Exhibit BF, # 66 Exhibit BG, # 67 Exhibit BH)(Sindhuphak, Pirapat) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 660 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of David N. Payne in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Non-Infringment or in the alternative, Summary Judgment of Invalidity 658 filed by Defendants JDS Uniphase Corporation, Pirelli S p A. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal), # 2 Exhibit B (Filed Under Seal))(Sindhuphak, Pirapat) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 659 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Giorgio Grasso in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Non-Infringment or in the alternative, Summary Judgment of Invalidity 658 filed by Defendants JDS Uniphase Corporation, Pirelli S p A. (Sindhuphak, Pirapat) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 658 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Non-Infringment or in the alternative, Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Defendants JDS Uniphase Corporation(a Delaware corporation), Pirelli S p A. Motion set for hearing on 9/22/2008 at 01:30 PM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Redacted Version), # 2 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law (Redacted Version), # 3 Proposed Order)(Sindhuphak, Pirapat) (Document stricken, re order 676 . (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 657 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation of Application to File Under Seal; Proposed Order; Memorandum in Support of JDSU and Pirelli's Motion for Summary Judgment (Unredacted Version); Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law (Unredacted Version); Exhibits to the Declarations of Christopher J. Burrell and Professor David J. Payne; Proof of Service. (Sindhuphak, Pirapat) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 656 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION for Settlement Stipulation re Extension of Time to Participate in Settlement Discussions filed by Defendant Pirelli S p A. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration)(Kneafsey, Sean) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 655 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Pretrial Conference Order)(Zisser, Bruce) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 654 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint Amended Exhibit List and Objections filed by plaintiff Litton Systems Inc.. (Zisser, Bruce) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 653 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants Agere Systems Inc, Lucent Technologies Inc filed by Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lorig, Frederick) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 652 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT - Regarding CORRECTED MEMORANDUM OF CONTENTIONS OF LAW AND FACT, (lra) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 651 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr, granting Stipulation 649 : Therebymoving the pretrial conference date to August 11, 2008 at 10:00 a.m. (lom) (Entered: 07/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 650 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr, granting APPLICATION for Order for to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Corrected Memorandum of Contentions of Law and Fact 645 (lra) (Entered: 07/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 649 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION to Continue Pretrial Conference from 05 August 2008 to 12 August 2008 filed by Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed order continuing pretrial conference)(Brown, Sidford) (Entered: 07/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 648 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Granting Stipulation 637 by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs Litton Systems, Inc. and The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University and Defendants Lucent Technologies, Inc. and Agere Systems, Inc., have until August 4, 2008 to complete the settlement process required by Central District Local Rule 16. (lom) (Entered: 07/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 647 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Pirapat S Sindhuphak counsel for Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation.Peter J. Toren is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation (Sindhuphak, Pirapat) (Entered: 07/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 646 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Pirapat S Sindhuphak counsel for Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation.Steven D. Chin is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation (Sindhuphak, Pirapat) (Entered: 07/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 645 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION for Order to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Corrected Memorandum of Contentions of Law and Fact filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. Lodged Order and Documents under seal. (lom) (Entered: 07/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 644 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc of Plaintiffs' Corrected Memorundum of Contentions of Law and Fact. (Brown, Sidford) (Entered: 07/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 643 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT - PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF CONTENIONS OF LAW AND FACT,, filed. (lra) (Entered: 07/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 642 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr, granting Application to File Under Seal, Plaintiffs' Memoramdum of Contenions of Law and Fact (lra) (Entered: 07/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 641 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr that the request 526 of Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation to substitute David Gross of Faegre & Benson, LLP as its counsel of record in place of Lawrence B. Goodwin, of Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP IS HEREBY GRANTED. (lom) (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 640 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr, GRANTING APPLICATION for Order for To File Under SEal Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Contentions of Law and Fact 638 621 (lra) (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 639 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Todd G Miller counsel for Defendants Ericsson Inc, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Ericson Microelectronics AB, Optoelectronic Products. Todd G. Miller will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Todd G. Miller is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants Ericsson, Inc., Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Ericsson Micro Components AB, Ericsson Microelectronic AB, Optoelectronic Products (Miller, Todd) (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 638 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Contentions of Law and Fact filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. (lom) (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 637 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION to Continue Date for Completion of Settlement Proceedings between Plaintiffs and Defendant Lucent and Defendant Agere from July 19, 2008 to August 4, 2008 filed by Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lorig, Frederick) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 636 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation. correcting Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law 622 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Corrected Memorandum of Contentions)(Sindhuphak, Pirapat) (Entered: 07/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 635 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc of Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Contentions of Law and Fact. (Brown, Sidford) (Entered: 07/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 634 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION to Strike Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law 621 filed by Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation Regarding Docket Item No. 621)(Brown, Sidford) (Entered: 07/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 633 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by J Michael Heinlen attorney for Defendant Agere Systems Inc, Counter Claimant Agere Systems Inc, changing Address to 1722 Routh Street, Suite 1500, Dallas, Texas 75201-2533. Filed by Defendant Agere Systems Inc. (Heinlen, J) (Entered: 07/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 632 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Address by J Michael Heinlen attorney for Defendant Agere Systems Inc, Counter Claimant Agere Systems Inc, changing Address to 1722 Routh Street, Suite 1500, Dallas, Texas 75201-2533. Filed by Defendant Agere Systems Inc. (Heinlen, J) (Entered: 07/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 631 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address by J Michael Heinlen attorney for Defendant Agere Systems Inc, Counter Claimant Agere Systems Inc, changing Address to 1722 Routh Street, Suite 1500, Dallas, Texas 75201-2533. Filed by Defendant Agere Systems Inc. (Heinlen, J) (Entered: 07/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 630 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by J Michael Heinlen attorney for Defendant Agere Systems Inc, Counter Claimant Agere Systems Inc, changing Address to 1722 Routh Street, Suite 1500, Dallas, Texas 75201-2533. Filed by Defendant Agere Systems Inc. (Heinlen, J) (Entered: 07/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 629 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address by J Michael Heinlen attorney for Defendant Agere Systems Inc, Counter Claimant Agere Systems Inc, changing Address to 1722 Routh Street, Suite 1500, Dallas, Texas 75201-2533. Filed by Defendant Agere Systems Inc. (Heinlen, J) (Entered: 07/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 628 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address by J Michael Heinlen attorney for Defendant Agere Systems Inc, Counter Claimant Agere Systems Inc, changing Address to 1722 Routh Street, Suite 1500, Dallas, Texas 75201-2533. Filed by Defendant Agere Systems Inc. (Heinlen, J) (Entered: 07/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 627 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant Lucent Technologies Inc. (Malz, Jordan) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 626 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Witness List filed by Defendant Lucent Technologies Inc.. (Malz, Jordan) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 625 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Witness List filed by Defendant Pirelli S p A.. (Kneafsey, Sean) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 624 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant Pirelli S p A. (Kneafsey, Sean) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 623 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint Exhibit List filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Agere Systems Inc, JDS Uniphase Corporation(a Delaware corporation), Pirelli S p A, Litton Systems Inc, Lucent Technologies Inc.. (Brown, Sidford) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 622 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation(a Delaware corporation). (Sindhuphak, Pirapat) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 620 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Witness List filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation(a Delaware corporation).. (Sindhuphak, Pirapat) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 619 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Witness List filed by Defendant Agere Systems Inc.. (Heinlen, J) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 618 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant Agere Systems Inc. (Heinlen, J) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 617 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Witness List filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc.. (Brown, Sidford) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 616 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr, Stipulation Re extension 613 of time to participate in settlement proceedings as to defendant Pirelli S. p. A., parties have until August 5, 2008 (ys) (Entered: 07/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 615 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr, Stipulation re extension, 614 of time to participate in settlement proceedings,parties have until July 19, 2008. (ys) (Entered: 07/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 614 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION to Continue Date for Completion of Settlement Proceedings between Plaintiffs and Defendant Lucent Technologies Inc. and Defendant Agere Systems, Inc. from July 3, 2008 to July 19, 2008 filed by Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lorig, Frederick) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 613 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION to Continue Date for Completion of Settlement Proceedings between Plaintiffs and Defendant Pirelli S.p.A. from July 3, 2008 to August 5, 2008 filed by Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Steven D. Glazer)(Lorig, Frederick) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 612 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman: REQUEST of Litton Systems, Inc. for approval of substitution of lead discovery counsel 603 is hereby DENIED as moot. (pcl) (Entered: 06/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 611 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re Stipulation to Continue, 604 that Plaintiffs Litton Systems, Inc. and The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University and Defendants Lucent Technologies, Inc., Agere Systems, Inc., and Pirelli S.p.A. shall have until July 3, 2008 to complete the settlement process required by Central District Local Rule 16. by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. (lom) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 610 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Jennifer Lynne Miremadi counsel for Defendants Tyco International (US) Inc, Tyco Telecommunications Ltd, Tyco Telecommunications (U.S.) Inc, Tyco Networks (U.S.) Inc, Tyco International Ltd, Counter Claimants Tyco International Ltd, Tyco International (US) Inc, Tyco Telecommunications Ltd, Tyco Telecommunications (U.S.) Inc, Tyco Networks (U.S.) Inc.Mark C. Scarsi is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants and Counterclaimants Tyco International Ltd., Tyco International (US) Inc., Tyco Telecommunications Ltd., Tyco Telecommunications (US) Inc. and Tyco Networks (US) Inc. (Miremadi, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 609 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Jennifer Lynne Miremadi counsel for Defendants Tyco International (US) Inc, Tyco Telecommunications Ltd, Tyco Telecommunications (U.S.) Inc, Tyco Networks (U.S.) Inc, Tyco International Ltd, Counter Claimants Tyco International Ltd, Tyco International (US) Inc, Tyco Telecommunications Ltd, Tyco Telecommunications (U.S.) Inc, Tyco Networks (U.S.) Inc.Michael M. Murray is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants and Counterclaimants Tyco International Ltd., Tyco International (US) Inc., Tyco Telecommunications Ltd., Tyco Telecommunications (US) Inc. and Tyco Networks (US) Inc. (Miremadi, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 608 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Jennifer Lynne Miremadi counsel for Defendants Tyco International (US) Inc, Tyco Telecommunications Ltd, Tyco Telecommunications (U.S.) Inc, Tyco Networks (U.S.) Inc, Tyco International Ltd, Counter Claimants Tyco International Ltd, Tyco International (US) Inc, Tyco Telecommunications Ltd, Tyco Telecommunications (U.S.) Inc, Tyco Networks (U.S.) Inc.Jennifer Miremadi is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants and Counterclaimants Tyco International Ltd., Tyco International (US) Inc., Tyco Telecommunications Ltd., Tyco Telecommunications (US) Inc. and Tyco Networks (US) Inc. (Miremadi, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 607 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Jennifer Lynne Miremadi counsel for Defendants Tyco International (US) Inc, Tyco Telecommunications Ltd, Tyco Telecommunications (U.S.) Inc, Tyco Networks (U.S.) Inc, Tyco International Ltd, Counter Claimants Tyco International Ltd, Tyco International (US) Inc, Tyco Telecommunications Ltd, Tyco Telecommunications (U.S.) Inc, Tyco Networks (U.S.) Inc.James R. Klaiber is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants and Counterclaimants Tyco International Ltd., Tyco International (US) Inc., Tyco Telecommunications Ltd., Tyco Telecommunications (US) Inc. and Tyco Networks (US) Inc. (Miremadi, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 606 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Jennifer Lynne Miremadi counsel for Defendants Tyco International (US) Inc, Tyco Telecommunications Ltd, Tyco Telecommunications (U.S.) Inc, Tyco Networks (U.S.) Inc, Tyco International Ltd, Counter Claimants Tyco International Ltd, Tyco International (US) Inc, Tyco Telecommunications Ltd, Tyco Telecommunications (U.S.) Inc, Tyco Networks (U.S.) Inc.Chris Holm is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants and Counterclaimants Tyco International Ltd., Tyco International (US) Inc., Tyco Telecommunications Ltd., Tyco Telecommunications (US) Inc. and Tyco Networks (US) Inc. (Miremadi, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 605 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Jennifer Lynne Miremadi counsel for Defendants Tyco International (US) Inc, Tyco Telecommunications Ltd, Tyco Telecommunications (U.S.) Inc, Tyco Networks (U.S.) Inc, Tyco International Ltd, Counter Claimants Tyco International Ltd, Tyco International (US) Inc, Tyco Telecommunications Ltd, Tyco Telecommunications (U.S.) Inc, Tyco Networks (U.S.) Inc.Christopher E. Chalsen is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants and Counterclaimants Tyco International Ltd., Tyco International (US) Inc., Tyco Telecommunications Ltd., Tyco Telecommunications (US) Inc. and Tyco Networks (US) Inc. (Miremadi, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION to Continue Date for Completion for Settlement Proceedings from June 20, 2008 to July 3, 2008 filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hutnyan, Diane) (Entered: 06/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST for Appointment of Counsel Substitution of Lead Discovery Counsel filed by Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hutnyan, Diane) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 602 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COUNTERCLAIM against Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc; Jury Demand, filed by Counter Claimant JDS Uniphase Corporation.(lom) (lom). (Entered: 06/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 601 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr, Denying Plaintiffs ex parte application for review of the Magistrate Judges May 28, 2008, order denying the request for partial modification of the order re: Discovery Plan, 577 . (lom) (Entered: 06/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr, Denying Plaintiffs ex parte application to file under seal exhibits to the declaration of Mateo Z. Fowler in support of Plaintiffs ex parte application for review of the Magistrate Judges order denying the request for partial modification of the order re: Discovery Plan, 577 , 585 . (lom) (Entered: 06/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 599 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Counter Claimant JDS Uniphase Corporation of Defendant/Counterclaimant JDS Uniphase Corporation's Counterclaims to First Amended Complaint for Infringement of United States Patent No. 4,859,016. (Sindhuphak, Pirapat) (Entered: 06/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: There is no Counterclaim that has been manually filed with the District Court on 6/03/08. RE: Answer to Complaint 595 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lom) (Entered: 06/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 597 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER on REQUEST for APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OF LEAD DISCOVERY COUNSEL 579 by Magistrate Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman: The Court hereby orders that the request of Lucent Technologies Inc. to substitute Jamal M. Edwards, for Brian G. Aronld as lead discovery counsel for Lucent pursuant to Paragraph 1 of the October 10, 2007 General Discovery Order is hereby GRANTED. (pcl) (Entered: 06/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to JDSU Counterclaims (manually filed on June 3, 2008) filed by Counter-Defendants Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc.(Bedel, A) (Entered: 06/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation of Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation's First Amended Answer and Counterclaims to First Amended Complaint for Infringement of United States Patent No. 4,859,016. (Sindhuphak, Pirapat) (Entered: 06/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Amended Answer to Complaint, 590 : See General Order 08-02. All initiating documents such as counterclaims are to be manually filed. The Counterclaim portion of this document is striken from the record. (lom) (Entered: 06/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: See General Order 08-02. All initiating documents, such as counterclaims, etc., are to be manually filed. RE: Amended Answer to Complaint, 590 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lom) (Entered: 06/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Review of Magistrate Judge's May 28, 2008 Order 577 Denying Plaintiffs' Request for Modification of December 18, 2007 Order re Discovery Plan filed by Defendant Pirelli S p A. (Kneafsey, Sean) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED ANSWER and Counterclaims to Amended Complaint, 35 Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation's First Amended Answer and Counterclaims to First Amended Complaint for Infringement of United States Patent No. 4,859,016 filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation(a Delaware corporation). (Sindhuphak, Pirapat) Modified on 6/3/2008 (lom). (Counterclaim to be manually filed, see G08-02) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr, ORDERING Amended Proof of Service submitted by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University received on 5/28/08 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Pursuant to GO 08-02, case is designated for electronic filing. (lom) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. correcting Response in Support of Motion, 586 (Fowler, Mateo) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Review of Magistrate Judge's May 28, 2008 Order 577 filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation. (Sindhuphak, Pirapat) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Review of Magistrate Judge's May 28, 2008 Order 577 filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mateo Z. Fowler)(Fowler, Mateo) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiffs' APPLICATION to file under Seal Exhibits to Declaration of Mateo Z. Fowler in support of Plaintiffs' EX PARTE APPLICATION for Review of Magistrate Judge's Order Denying Request for Partial Modification of ORder re Discovery Plan 577 filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University. Lodged Order and Documents. (lom) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 584 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Review of Magistrate Judge's May 28, 2008 Order 577 filed by Counter Claimant Lucent Technologies Inc, Defendant Lucent Technologies Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Edwards, Jamal) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROOF OF SERVICE filed by PLAINTIFFS Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc, re Exhibits 2-5 to the Declaration of Mateo Z. Fowler in Support of Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for an Order Modifying the Order Re Discovery Plan served on 5/27/2008. (pcl) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION for Order to File Under Seal Exhibits to Declaration of Mateo Z. Fowler in Support of Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Partial Modification of December 18, 2007 Order Re Discovery Plan filed by plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. Lodged Proposed Order. (pcl) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Review of Magistrate Judge's May 28, 2008 Order 577 Agere's Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Review of Magistrate Judge's May 28 Order Denying Request for Partial Modification of Order re Discovery Plan filed by Defendant Agere Systems Inc. (Hardin, James) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc, Re Documents Associated to Plaintiffs' Application to File Under Seal Exhibits to Decl. of Mateo Z. Fowler In Supp. of Plaintiffs' Ex Parte for Review served on May 30, 2008. (Fowler, Mateo) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 579 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST for Order for APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OF LEAD DISCOVERY COUNSEL filed by Defendant Lucent Technologies Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Arnold, Brian) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 578 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc of Exhibits B-E to Declaration of Mateo Z. Fowler. (Fowler, Mateo) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EX PARTE APPLICATION for Review of Magistrate Judge's May 28, 2008 Order filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mateo Z. Fowler, # 2 Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan, # 3 Proposed Order)(Fowler, Mateo) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party, 563 that this case be dismissed without prejudice as to the Tyco Defendants, with each side bearing its own costs and attorneys fees. This dismissal without prejudice is pursuant to a settlement agreement between the partiesand is not intended to nor will it affect the Stipulated Judgment against Tyco Telecommunications (U.S.), Inc. or Plaintiffs' claims against any of the remaining defendants: Pirelli S.p.A., JDS niphase Corporation, Lucent Technologies Inc. and Agere Systems Inc. (lom) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 575 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT - EXHIBIT 2-5 TO The Declaration of Mateo Z. Fowler In Support of Plainitiffs' Ex Parte Application for an Order Modifying The Order Re Discovery Plan. Filed (lra) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 574 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROOF OF SERVICE filed by PLAINTIFF Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, served on 5/27/2008. (lra) (lra). (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 573 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' Application To File Under Seal Exhibits to Declaration of Mateo Z. Fowler in Support of Plaintiffs' Exp[arte Application for Partial Modification of December 18, 2007 Order re Discovery Plan, by Magistrate Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman,filed (lra) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman: DENYING Plaintiffs' EX PARTE APPLICATION for Partial Modification of December 18, 2007 Order Re Discovery Plan 566 . (See document for further details.) (pcl) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Modifying the December 18, 2007 Order Re Discovery Plan 566 filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation. (Sindhuphak, Pirapat) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 570 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Modifying the December 18, 2007 Order Re Discovery Plan 566 and Proof of Service filed by Defendant Agere Systems Inc. (Hardin, James) (Entered: 05/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc of Exhibits to Declaration of Mateo Z. Fowler ISO Ex Parte Application for Partial Modification of December 18, 2007 Order. (Hutnyan, Diane) (Entered: 05/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Modifying the December 18, 2007 Order Re Discovery Plan 566 filed by Defendant Pirelli S p A. (Kneafsey, Sean) (Entered: 05/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Under Seal Filing filed Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc (Bedel, A) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Modifying the December 18, 2007 Order Re Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum ISO Application# 2 Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan# 3 Declaration of Mateo Z. Fowler# 4 Exhibit to Declaration of Mateo Z. Fowler# 5 Proposed Order)(Bedel, A) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr, that JDS Uniphase Co.s motion for summary judgment be, and hereby is, Denied. It is Ordered that JDS Uniphase Co.s motion for leave to file an amended answer be,and hereby is, Granted 460 . It is Ordered that the Plaintiffs motion for partial summary judgment be, and hereby is, Denied. (lom) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice 562 by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr: that this case be dismissed with prejudice as to these Ericssondefendants only and with each side bearing their own costs and attorneys fees. Ericsson Inc; Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson; Ericson Microelectronics AB, Optoelectronic Products terminated. (lom) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Tyco International (US) Inc, Tyco Telecommunications Ltd, Tyco Telecommunications (U.S.) Inc, Tyco Networks (U.S.) Inc, Tyco International Ltd, Tyco International (US) Inc, Tyco Telecommunications Ltd, Tyco Telecommunications (U.S.) Inc, Tyco Networks (U.S.) Inc, Tyco International Ltd filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lorig, Frederick) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Ericsson Inc, Ericson Microelectronics AB, Optoelectronic Products, Ericsson Inc, Ericson Microelectronics AB, Optoelectronic Products filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lorig, Frederick) (Entered: 05/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST to Substitute attorney Wayne W. Call, James B. Hardin, and Scot D. Wilson of Call, Jensen & Ferrell in place of attorney Ekwan E. Rhow of Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg filed by defendant Agere Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Heinlen, J) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Ryan R. Salsig counsel for Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Litton Systems, Inc. (Salsig, Ryan) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Mateo Z Fowler counsel for Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Litton Systems (Fowler, Mateo) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION for Reconsideration re Order 556 filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Agere Systems Inc, JDS Uniphase Corporation(a Delaware corporation), Pirelli S p A, Litton Systems Inc, Lucent Technologies Inc. (Hutnyan, Diane) (Entered: 05/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Stipulation re Continuance of the Final Pretrial Conference 553 by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr: It is Ordered that the Final Pretrial Conference is continued from June 23, 2008 to August 5, 2008 at 10:00 a.m. (lom) (Entered: 05/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman: IT IS ORDERED that the Stipulation Re Modification of Discovery Order 554 is DENIED. (pcl) (Entered: 05/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: [Prop Order] should be attached as a separate document to your Motion. Also, there is a court form for substitution of Attorney. See General Forms for G-01 RE: APPLICATION 549 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lom) (Entered: 05/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF LODGING filed (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation Re Modification of Discovery Order)(Hutnyan, Diane) (Entered: 05/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF LODGING filed (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation of Continuance of Final Pretrial Conference)(Hutnyan, Diane) (Entered: 05/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 552 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to AGAINST LUCENT FOR INFRINGEMENT VALIDITY AND ENFORCEABILITY OF U.S. PATENT 4,859,016 filed (lra) (Entered: 04/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER On Request For Approval Of Substitution Of Lead Discovery Counsel 527 by Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman: The Court hereby orders that the request of JDS Uniphase Corporation (JDSU") to substitute Natalie Hanlon-Leh of Faegre & Benson LLP for Steven D. Chin of Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP as lead discovery counsel for JDSU pursuant to Paragraph 1 of the October 10, 2007 General Discovery Order is hereby GRANTED. (pcl) (Entered: 04/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Substitute attorney Wayne W. Call, James B. Hardin, and Scot D. Wilson of Call, Jensen & Ferrell in place of attorney Ekwan E. Rhow of Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg filed by Defendant Agere Systems Inc. (Heinlen, J) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Sidford L. Brown in support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES, INC. FOR INFRINGEMENT, VALIDITY AND ENFORCEABILITY OF U.S. PATENT 4,859,016 482 (supplemental) filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. (Hutnyan, Diane) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT of Uncontroverted Facts and Proposed Conclusions of Law in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment Against Lucent for Infringement, Validity and Enforceability of U.S. Patent 4,859,016 (Consolidated Statement) filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc re: Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related) 546 . (Hutnyan, Diane) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY In Support Of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES, INC. FOR INFRINGEMENT, VALIDITY AND ENFORCEABILITY OF U.S. PATENT 4,859,016 482 filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. (Hutnyan, Diane) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr Granting APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY Mary V. Sooter for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE PAID 525 by Mary V. Sooter to appear on behalf of Defendant /Counter Claimant JDS Uniphase Corporation. Steven H. Weinstein is designated as local counsel. Fee Paid on 4/17/08. (lom) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr Granting APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY Natalie Hanlon-Leh for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE PAID 524 by Natalie Hanlon-Leh to appear on behalf of Defendant/ Counter Claimant JDS Uniphase Corporation. Steven H Weinstein is designated as local counsel. Fee Paid on 4/17/08. (lom) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr Granting APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY Christopher J. Burrell for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE PAID 523 by Christopher J. Burrell to appear on behalf of Defendant / Counter Claimant JDS Uniphase Corporation. Steven H. Weinstein, is designated as local counsel. Fee Paid. (lom) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr Granting APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY David J.F. Gross for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE PAID 522 by David J.F. Gross to appear on behalf of Defendant/ Counter Claimant JDS Uniphase Corporation. Steven H. Weinstein is designated as local counsel. Fee Paid. (lom) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is amendment RE: Notice (Other) 510 . For all motion related documents, please see Motion and Related Filings: Responses/Replies/Other Motion Related Documents for Amendment &/or Notice of Motion. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lom) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of JORDAN N. MALZ IN SUPPORT OF LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST LUCENT FOR INFRINGEMENT, VALIDITY AND ENFORCEABILITY OF U.S. PATENT 4,859,016 filed by Defendant Lucent Technologies Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I)(Arnold, Brian) (Entered: 04/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE filed by Defendant Lucent Technologies Inc TO PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS AND PROPOSED CONCLUSIONS OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST LUCENT FOR INFRINGEMENT, VALIDITY AND ENFORCEABILITY OF U.S. PATENT 4,859,016 (Arnold, Brian) (Entered: 04/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment Against Lucent for Infringement filed by Defendant Lucent Technologies Inc. (Arnold, Brian) (Entered: 04/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: 1) The Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is manually filed when you are filing the document under seal RE: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 482 . Please do not docket this under Motion for Summary Judgment. This will be a duplicate entry when document is entered by the under seal dept; Part 2 and 4 attachments does not have a description. The Request for Judicial Notice should be filed separately. There is a specific event for Request for Judicial Notice. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lom) (Entered: 04/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Missing attorney's information on the G-92 form. RE: Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) 483 , 481 , 484 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lom) (Entered: 04/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 535 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of STEVEN D. CHIN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15 460 filed. (lra) (Entered: 04/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 534 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT - REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15 460 filed (lra) (Entered: 04/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REGRADING DEFENDANT JDS UNIPHASE CORPORATION'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 15 AND DECLARATION OF STEVEN D. CHIN, INCLUDING EXHIBIT A, IN SUPPORT OF ITS RELPY. GRANTED by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr, re APPLICATION to Seal 531 (lra) (Entered: 04/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT JDS Uniphase Corporation(a Delaware corporation), served on 04/14/2008. (lra) (Entered: 04/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DEFENDANT JDS Uniphase Corporation's APPLICATION to File under Seal Reply in Further Support of its Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15 and Decl;aration of Steven D. Chin, including Exhibit A in Support of its Reply. filed by DEFENDANT JDS Uniphase Corporation(a Delaware corporation). (lra) (Entered: 04/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 530 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of THOMAS J. HUTCHINGS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES, INC. FOR INFRINGEMENT, VALIDITY AND ENFORCEABILITY OF U.S. PATENT 4,859,016 482 filed (lra) (Entered: 04/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to File Under Seal Supplemental Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan in Support of Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for an Order Compelling Agere Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition and Exhibits Thereto filed by plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University. Lodged Proposed Order. (pcl) (Entered: 04/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to File Under Seal Exhibits to Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan in Support of Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for an Order Compelling JDSU on Certain Discovery Issues filed by plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University. Lodged Proposed Order. (pcl) (Entered: 04/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST for Appointment of Counsel Natalie Hanlon-Leh, Faegre & Benson LLP as Lead Discovery Counsel filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sindhuphak, Pirapat) (Entered: 04/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Substitute attorney David Gross, Faegre & Benson LLP in place of attorney Lawrence B. Goodwin, Kasowitz Benson Torres & Friedman LLP filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sindhuphak, Pirapat) (Entered: 04/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY Mary V. Sooter for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE NOT PAID. filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sindhuphak, Pirapat) (Entered: 04/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY Natalie Hanlon-Leh for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE NOT PAID. filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sindhuphak, Pirapat) (Entered: 04/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY Christopher J. Burrell for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE NOT PAID. filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation(a Delaware corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sindhuphak, Pirapat) (Entered: 04/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY David J.F. Gross for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE NOT PAID. filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation(a Delaware corporation).Application set for hearing on 4/17/2008 at 01:30 PM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sindhuphak, Pirapat) (Entered: 04/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBIT Filed filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University. as to MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES, INC. FOR INFRINGEMENT, VALIDITY AND ENFORCEABILITY OF U.S. PATENT 4,859,016 482 , Declaration (non-motion) 520 . (lra) (Entered: 04/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 520 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of SIDFORD L. BROWN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES, INC. FOR INFRINGEMENT, VALIDITY AND ENFORCEABILITY OF U.S. PATENT 4,859,016 482 filed (lra) (Entered: 04/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 519 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT - EXHIBITS TO DECLARATION OF DIANE HUTNYAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING JDSU ON CERTAIN DISCOVERY ISSUES TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL Filed (lra) (Entered: 04/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 518 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of DIANE C. HUTNYAN re Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 471 filed (lra) (Entered: 04/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 517 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT - HUANG DECLARATION filed (lra) (Entered: 04/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 516 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of GOODWIN filed (lra) (Entered: 04/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman, re APPLICATION for Order for to file under seal Exhibit L of Lawrence Goodwin's Declaration and Exhibit A of Koa-Yang Huang's Declaration in support of its oppostion to Plaintiff Ex Parte Application 502 (lra) (Entered: 04/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re Plaintiffs' Application to File Under Seal Supplemental Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan in Support of Plaintiff Ex parte Application for an Order Compelling Agere Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition and Exhibits thereto granted by Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman, (lra) (Entered: 04/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re Plaintiffs' Application to File Under Seal Exhbit to Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan In Support of Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for An Order Compelling JDSU On Certain Discovery Issues, granted by Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman, (lra) Modified on 4/15/2008 (lra, ). (Entered: 04/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr, re APPLICATION for Order for To file under SEal Exhibits A and B 497 (lra) (Entered: 04/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr, granting APPLICATION for Order for to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment against Lucent Technologies, Inc for Infringement, validity and Enforceability of US Patent 4,859,016 and Related Documents 501 (lra) (Entered: 04/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing Date filed by plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. (Hutnyan, Diane) (Entered: 04/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation of Application to File Under Seal; Reply in Further Support of Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporations Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer; Declaration of Steven D. Chin; [Proposed] Order; and Proof of Service. (Sindhuphak, Pirapat) (Entered: 04/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman: ORDER GRANTING, IN PART, AND DENYING, IN PART, Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for an Order Enforcing the October 10, 2007 Discovery Order and Compelling JDSU on Certain Discovery Issues 472 . (See document for further details.) (pcl) (Entered: 04/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES OF Telephone Conference Re Rule 30(b)(6) Pirelli Deposition held before Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman: The Court discusses the Rule 30(b)(6) deposition with counsel. (pcl) (Entered: 04/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman: ORDER DENYING Without Prejudice Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation's Application for Clarification of the Court's March 25, 2008 ORDERS 479 . (See document for further details.) (pcl) (Entered: 04/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION Regarding Docket No. 469 by Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The Clerk is directed to stike and remove Docket No. 469-1 through 469-2 in Case No. 00-10584, filed on April 3, 2008, in their entirety, from the Court's Electronic Case Filing system, return the documents to Plaintiff Litton Systems, Inc. and confirm that any subsequent re-filing of the same with the Court occur under seal. (pcl) (Entered: 04/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY In Support Of Amended EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel AN ORDER ENFORCING THE OCTOBER 10, 2007 DISCOVERY ORDER AND COMPELLING JDSU ON CERTAIN DISCOVERY ISSUES 473 filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. (Hutnyan, Diane) (Entered: 04/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proof OF SERVICE filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation re Notice of Manual Filing : APPLICATION for Order for to file under seal Exhibit L of Lawrence Goodwin's Declaration and Exhibit A of Koa-Yang Huang's Declaration in support of its oppostion to Plaintiff Ex Parte Application 502 ; Exhibit L of Lawrence Goodwin's declaration; Exhibit A to Koa-Yan Huang's Declaration in support; [Prop] Order served on Patrick F. Bright, et al., by mail on 4/8/08.(lom) (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation's Application to file under seal Exhibit L of Lawrence Goodwin's Declaration and Exhibit A of Koa-Yang Huang's Declaration in support of its oppostion to Plaintiff Ex Parte Application filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation(a Delaware corporation). Lodged Order. (lom) (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION for Order to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment against Lucent Technologies, Inc for Infringement, Validity and Enforceability of US Patent 4,859,016 and Related Documents filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University. Lodged Lodged Order. (lom) (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proof of Service filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, re Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES, INC. FOR INFRINGEMENT, VALIDITY AND ENFORCEABILITY OF U.S. PATENT 4,859,016 482 ; Declaration of Thomas J. Hutychings in support; Declaration of Sidford L. Brown in support served by personal service to Kneafsey Tostado & Associates LLP, et al., on 4/7/08. (lom) (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proof of Service filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, served by personal service to Kneafsey Tostado & Associates LLP, et al., re [Prop] Order granting plaiantiff's application; Application to file under seal plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment on 4/7/08. (lom) (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proof of Service filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, re APPLICATION for Order for To file under Seal Exhibits A and B 497 ; Exhibits A & B; Confidential Document; [prop] order served by personal service on 4/8/08. (lom) (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to file under seal Exhibits A and B to the Declaration of Sidford L. Brown in support of Plaintiffs' Oppostion to JDS Uniphase Corporation's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15 filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University. Lodged Order. (lom) (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc, re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) 470 Re Application to File Under Seal and Proposed Order served on April 8, 2008. (Hutnyan, Diane) (Entered: 04/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc, re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) 474 Re Application to File Under Seal and Proposed Order served on April 8, 2008. (Hutnyan, Diane) (Entered: 04/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc, re MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES, INC. FOR INFRINGEMENT, VALIDITY AND ENFORCEABILITY OF U.S. PATENT 4,859,016 482 [Amended] Re Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against Lucent served on 04/07/08. (Hutnyan, Diane) (Entered: 04/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc, re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) 484 [Amended] Re Application to File Under Seal and Proposed Order served on 04/08/2008. (Hutnyan, Diane) (Entered: 04/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation of Application to File Under Seal; Exhibit L to Declaration of Lawrence B. Goodwin and Exhibit A to the Declaration of Koa-Yang Huang in Support of Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporations Opposition to Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application; Proposed Order; Proof of Service. (Sindhuphak, Pirapat) (Entered: 04/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Kao-Yang Huang in opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel AN ORDER ENFORCING THE OCTOBER 10, 2007 DISCOVERY ORDER AND COMPELLING JDSU ON CERTAIN DISCOVERY ISSUES 472 , Amended EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel AN ORDER ENFORCING THE OCTOBER 10, 2007 DISCOVERY ORDER AND COMPELLING JDSU ON CERTAIN DISCOVERY ISSUES 473 filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation, Counter Claimant JDS Uniphase Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Goodwin, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Jeremiah Chan in opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel AN ORDER ENFORCING THE OCTOBER 10, 2007 DISCOVERY ORDER AND COMPELLING JDSU ON CERTAIN DISCOVERY ISSUES 472 , Amended EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel AN ORDER ENFORCING THE OCTOBER 10, 2007 DISCOVERY ORDER AND COMPELLING JDSU ON CERTAIN DISCOVERY ISSUES 473 filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation, Counter Claimant JDS Uniphase Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Goodwin, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Lawrence B. Goodwin in opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel AN ORDER ENFORCING THE OCTOBER 10, 2007 DISCOVERY ORDER AND COMPELLING JDSU ON CERTAIN DISCOVERY ISSUES 472 , Amended EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel AN ORDER ENFORCING THE OCTOBER 10, 2007 DISCOVERY ORDER AND COMPELLING JDSU ON CERTAIN DISCOVERY ISSUES 473 filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation, Counter Claimant JDS Uniphase Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-H# 2 Exhibit I-N)(Goodwin, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel AN ORDER ENFORCING THE OCTOBER 10, 2007 DISCOVERY ORDER AND COMPELLING JDSU ON CERTAIN DISCOVERY ISSUES 472 , Amended EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel AN ORDER ENFORCING THE OCTOBER 10, 2007 DISCOVERY ORDER AND COMPELLING JDSU ON CERTAIN DISCOVERY ISSUES 473 filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation, Counter Claimant JDS Uniphase Corporation. (Goodwin, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Bruce R Zisser counsel for Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Litton Sytems, Inc. (Zisser, Bruce) (Entered: 04/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found with your electronically filed document entitled Application for Clarification, filed on 4/7/2008, Document Number 479 : Incorrect event selected. Correct event is "Order re Discovery Matter" which is found under the category of Discovery Applications. (pcl) (Entered: 04/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15 460 filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Brown Declaration)(Hutnyan, Diane) (Entered: 04/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc of Plaintiffs' Application to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' MSJ Against Lucent Technologies, Inc. and Proposed Order. (Hutnyan, Diane) (Entered: 04/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc of JDSU Interrogatory Responses. (Hutnyan, Diane) (Entered: 04/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES, INC. FOR INFRINGEMENT, VALIDITY AND ENFORCEABILITY OF U.S. PATENT 4,859,016 filed by PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 Proposed Order # 3)(Hutnyan, Diane) (Entered: 04/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against Lucent Technologies, Inc. and Related Documents. (Hutnyan, Diane) (Entered: 04/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman : Order Denying Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for an Order Compelling Agere Rule 30 (b) (6) Deposition (SEE MINUTES FOR DETAILS). (kca) (Entered: 04/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application for Clarification of the Courts March 25, 2008 Orders filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation, Counter Claimant JDS Uniphase Corporation re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held 456 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, 455 (Goodwin, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found with your electronically filed document: Amended Ex Parte Application 473 . Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Amendment (Motion related), which is under the category of Responses/Reples/Other Motion Related Documents. (pcl) (Entered: 04/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Request for Judicial Notice: RE Miscellaneous Document 464 . See Motions and Related Filings: Requests for Judicial Notice. (lom) (Entered: 04/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Request for Judicial Notice: RE Miscellaneous Document 457 . Please do not use Miscellaneous Document for Request. See Motions and Related Filings: Requests for Judicial Notice. Also, see GO 08-02 regarding Multiple CM/ECF User Signatures, pages 23/24. (lom) (Entered: 04/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION to Strike Reply (Motion related), Reply (Motion related) 469 filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hutnyan, Diane) (Entered: 04/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc of Under Seal Exhibits to Hutnyan Declaration. (Bedel, A) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel AN ORDER ENFORCING THE OCTOBER 10, 2007 DISCOVERY ORDER AND COMPELLING JDSU ON CERTAIN DISCOVERY ISSUES filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities# 2 Proposed Order # 3 Declaration Hutnyan Declaration ISO Ex Parte Application# 4 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5 to Hutnyan Declaration# 5 Exhibit Exhibits 6-28 of Hutnyan Declaration)(Bedel, A) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel AN ORDER ENFORCING THE OCTOBER 10, 2007 DISCOVERY ORDER AND COMPELLING JDSU ON CERTAIN DISCOVERY ISSUES filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. (Bedel, A) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Diane C. Hutnyan In Support Of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Deposition of Agere 30(b)(6) EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Deposition of Agere 30(b)(6) 463 Public Redacted [Supplemental] filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Public Redacted Exhibits A through H to Hutnyan Suppl. Declaration)(Hutnyan, Diane) (Entered: 04/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc of Notice of Manual Filing. (Hutnyan, Diane) (Entered: 04/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY In Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Deposition of Agere 30(b)(6) EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Deposition of Agere 30(b)(6) 463 filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan (Supplemental)# 2 Exhibit A through H to Suppl. Hutnyan Declaration)(Hutnyan, Diane) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/10/2008 (sm, ). (Entered: 04/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Jane Politz Brandt in opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Deposition of Agere 30(b)(6) EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Deposition of Agere 30(b)(6) 463 filed by Defendant Agere Systems Inc. (Heinlen, J) (Entered: 04/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Max Ciccarelli in opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Deposition of Agere 30(b)(6) EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Deposition of Agere 30(b)(6) 463 filed by Defendant Agere Systems Inc. (Heinlen, J) (Entered: 04/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Bryan Rothermel in opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Deposition of Agere 30(b)(6) EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Deposition of Agere 30(b)(6) 463 filed by Defendant Agere Systems Inc. (Heinlen, J) (Entered: 04/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Deposition of Agere 30(b)(6) EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Deposition of Agere 30(b)(6) 463 filed by Defendant Agere Systems Inc. (Heinlen, J) (Entered: 04/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request For An Opportunity To Be Heard Concerning Plaintiffs Request For Judicial Notice filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation, Counter Claimant JDS Uniphase Corporation re: Miscellaneous Document 457 (Goodwin, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Deposition of Agere 30(b)(6) filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Ex Parte Application# 2 Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan# 3 Exhibit A through E to Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan# 4 Exhibit F through Y to Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan# 5 Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Application)(Hutnyan, Diane) (Entered: 04/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Lawrence B. Goodwin in support of MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15 460 filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation, Counter Claimant JDS Uniphase Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit s A-F)(Goodwin, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15 460 filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation, Counter Claimant JDS Uniphase Corporation. (Goodwin, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15 filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation(a Delaware corporation), JDS Uniphase Corporation.Motion set for hearing on 4/21/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Goodwin, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re Stipulated Judgment as to claims against defendant Ciena Corporation by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr: re 454 : That judgment is hereby entered by the Court pursuant to the terms set forth in the stipulation filed on 3/25/08. (lom) (Entered: 03/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re Stipulated Judgment filed on 3/25/08 as to claims against Defendant Tyco Telecomuunications (US), Inc by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr: re 453 : That the Court enter final judgment as to Defendant Tyco Telecommunications (U.S.), Inc only. (lom) (Entered: 03/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request for Judicial Notice re: MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, 422 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Hutnyan, Diane) (Entered: 03/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman : Second Order Following Remand of Plaintiffs' Motion for Review and Modification of the Order Dated 10/10/07 (SEE MINUTES FOR DETAILS). (kca) (Entered: 03/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman : Order Supplementing Order re Discovery Plan dated 12/18/07; and Setting New Pretrial Conference Date; This Court has discussed the pretrial conference date with Sendior District Judge Terry J. Hatter, and he has agreed to continue the pretrial conference date to June 23, 2008 at 10:00 a.m. (SEE MINUTES FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (kca) (Entered: 03/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF LODGING filed (Attachments: # 1 Stipulated Judgment as to Claims Against Defendant Ciena Corp.)(Lorig, Frederick) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF LODGING filed (Attachments: # 1 Stipulated Judgment as to Claims Against Defendant Telecommunications (U.S.), Inc.)(Lorig, Frederick) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Incorrect document format: Missing page number lines and page numbers on Stipulated Judgment: RE Notice of Lodging 450 , 451 . (lom) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF LODGING filed (Attachments: # 1 Stipulated Judgment as to Claims Against Defendant Tyco Telecommunications (U.S.) Inc.)(Lorig, Frederick) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF LODGING filed (Attachments: # 1 Stipulated Judgment as to Claims Against Defendant Ciena Corporation)(Lorig, Frederick) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to of the Expiration Date of U.S. Patent No. 4,859,016 401 filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation, Counter Claimant JDS Uniphase Corporation. (Goodwin, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Order Revising Certain Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Revising Certain Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines)(Bedel, A) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Regarding Deposition of Matthew Fawcett by Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the deposition of Matthew Fawcett will take place on April 3, 2008. (pcl) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation, Counter Claimant JDS Uniphase Corporation. correcting MOTION for Review of Order Following Remand 437 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Chin, Steven) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Todd G. Miller in support of MOTION for Review of Order Following Remand 437 filed by Defendants Ericsson Inc, Ericson Microelectronics AB, Optoelectronic Products, Counter Claimants Ericsson Inc, Ericson Microelectronics AB, Optoelectronic Products. (Chin, Steven) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Sydney Firestone in support of MOTION for Review of Order Following Remand 437 filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation, Counter Claimant JDS Uniphase Corporation. (Chin, Steven) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Max Ciccarelli in support of MOTION for Review of Order Following Remand 437 filed by Defendant Agere Systems Inc, Counter Claimant Agere Systems Inc. (Chin, Steven) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Steven D. Chin in support of MOTION for Review of Order Following Remand 437 filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation, Counter Claimant JDS Uniphase Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B# 2 Exhibit B Part 2# 3 Exhibit B Part 3# 4 Exhibit B part 4, C and D)(Chin, Steven) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBIT Filed filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. to Hutnyan Declaration as to Declaration (non-motion), Declaration (non-motion) 438 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 2# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Bedel, A) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Jamie W McGloin-King in support of MOTION for Review of Order Following Remand 437 filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation, Counter Claimant JDS Uniphase Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit s A-D)(Chin, Steven) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Peter J. Toren in support of MOTION for Review of Order Following Remand 437 filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation, Counter Claimant JDS Uniphase Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Chin, Steven) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION re Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support (non-motion) 436 Of Plaintiffs' Proposed Modification Of The Discovery Schedule In Response To The Court's March 11 Order filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. (Bedel, A) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Review of Order Following Remand filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation(a Delaware corporation), JDS Uniphase Corporation. (Chin, Steven) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support Of Plaintiffs' Proposed Modification Of The Discovery Schedule In Response To The Court's March 11 Order (Bedel, A) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman : Order Granting in Part, Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for an Order Compellilng Pirelli Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions (SEE MINUTES FOR DETAILS). (kca) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF LODGING filed (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Regarding Deposition of Matthew Fawcett)(Sindhuphak, Pirapat) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found with your electronically filed document number 432 the [Proposed] Order attached to Joint Stipulation Re The Deposition of Matthew Fawcett: Title page is missing. (pcl) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint STIPULATION for Order that Matthew Fawcetts deposition will take place on April 3, 2008. filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation(a Delaware corporation), JDS Uniphase Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order that Matthew Fawcetts deposition will take place on April 3, 2008.)(Chin, Steven) (Entered: 03/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Defendant Pirelli Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Defendant Pirelli Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions 420 ERRATA filed by Defendant Pirelli S p A. (Kneafsey, Sean) (Entered: 03/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found with your electronically filed document 429 entitled Reply in Support of Ex Parte Application for an Order Compelling Pirelli Rule 30(B)(6) Depositions, filed on 3/19/2008: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is "Reply (Motion related)" which can be found under the category of "Responses/Replies/Other Motion Related Documents." (pcl) (Entered: 03/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Defendant Pirelli Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions Reply Memorandum filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of E.J. Smith# 2 Exhibit 1-14)(Hutnyan, Diane) (Entered: 03/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Withdrawal of JDS Uniphase Corporation's Motion for Review of Magistrate Judge's Discovery Order and Objections to Same filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation(a Delaware corporation). (Sindhuphak, Pirapat) (Entered: 03/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman : Amended Order (1) Granting, in Part, and Denying, in Part, Defendant Pirelli's Motion to Compel Discovery; and (2) Denying Defendant Pirelli's Request for Attorney's fees (SEE MINUTES FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (kca) (Entered: 03/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman: ORDER (1) GRANTING, IN PART, AND DENYING, IN PART, Defendant Pirelli's MOTION to Compel Discovery 386 ; and (2) DENYING Defendant Pirelli's Request for Attorney's Fees. (See document for further details.) (pcl) (Entered: 03/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman: 1. Defendant Lucent Technologies Inc.'s motion to compel 392 IS GRANTED, and plaintiffs are ordered to produce to Lucent the Ciena agreement (as defined herein), no later than 10 days from the date of this Order. 2. Defendant Lucent Technologies Inc's request for reasonable expenses IS DENIED. (See document for further details.) (pcl) (Entered: 03/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Daniel J. Melman in opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Defendant Pirelli Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Defendant Pirelli Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions 420 filed by Defendant Pirelli S p A. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6# 7 # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10)(Kneafsey, Sean) (Entered: 03/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Defendant Pirelli Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Defendant Pirelli Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions 420 filed by Defendant Pirelli S p A. (Kneafsey, Sean) (Entered: 03/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to of the Expiration Date of U.S. Patent No. 4,859,016 401 filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Malloy Declaration and Exhibits)(Hutnyan, Diane) (Entered: 03/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman: ORDER TAKING OFF CALENDAR: (1) Defendant Lucent Technologies Inc.'s MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS 392 ; and (2) Defendant Pirelli's MOTION to Compel Discovery 386 . The hearings on the above motions ARE ORDERED TAKEN OFF CALENDAR and, pursuant to LR 7-15, the matters will be decided in Chambers without oral argument. (pcl) (Entered: 03/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Defendant Pirelli Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities# 2 Declaration of E.J.Smith# 3 Exhibit 1-15# 4 Exhibit 16# 5 Exhibit 17# 6 Exhibit 18-37# 7 Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan (with Exh. 1)# 8 Declaration of F.A.Lorig# 9 Proposed Order)(Hutnyan, Diane) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman : Court conferred with the parties regarding the Order of Remand from Judge Hatter. (kca) (Entered: 03/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Discovery regarding Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents 386 (corrected) filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Hutnyan Declaration# 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Hutnyan Declaration# 3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Hutnyan Declaration)(Hutnyan, Diane) (Entered: 03/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Discovery regarding Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents 387 filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Hutnyan Declaration# 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Hutnyan Declaration# 3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Hutnyan Declaration)(Hutnyan, Diane) (Entered: 03/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENT In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Lucent's Motion to Compel filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc. (Hutnyan, Diane) (Entered: 03/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Discovery regarding Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents 386 filed by Defendant Pirelli S p A. (Kneafsey, Sean) (Entered: 03/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS 392 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW RE: DEFENDANT LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS filed by Defendant Lucent Technologies Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brian G. Arnold (Supplemental))(Arnold, Brian) (Entered: 03/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman : In light of the Court's Order Following Remand issued y esterday, plaintiffs' ex parte application for an order continuing discovery motion hearing cut-off date to April 17, 2008, is denied without prejudice. (kca) (Entered: 03/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman : Order Following Remand of the Plaintiffs' Motion for Review and Modification of the Order dated 10/10/07 (SEE MINUTES FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (kca) (Entered: 03/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FAX number for Attorney Colleen M Garlington is 312-861-2200. (lom) (Entered: 03/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr Granting APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY Colleen M. Garlington for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice 400 , on behalf of Counter Claimant Lucent Technologies Inc, Defendant Lucent Technologies Inc. Brian G. Arnold is designated as local counsel. Fee Paid. (lom) (Entered: 03/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Discovery Motion Hearing Cut-Off Date from April 1, 2008 to April 17, 2008 filed by Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities# 2 Declaration of Diane C. Hutnyan# 3 Exhibit 1-3# 4 Exhibit 4-9# 5 Exhibit 10-13# 6 Proposed Order)(Hutnyan, Diane) (Entered: 03/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Statement: RE Motion Related Document, 404 . (lom) (Entered: 03/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: None, Terminated: 8/21/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Corrected APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY Benjamin L. Singer for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE NOT PAID. Corrected application filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc.Application set for hearing on 3/10/2008 at 09:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Proof of Service)(Hutnyan, Diane) (Entered: 03/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Steven D. Chin in Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to of the Expiration Date of U.S. Patent No. 4,859,016 401 filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation, Counter Claimant JDS Uniphase Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Declaration G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M)(Goodwin, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Peter J. Toren in Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to of the Expiration Date of U.S. Patent No. 4,859,016 401 filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation, Counter Claimant JDS Uniphase Corporation. (Goodwin, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to of the Expiration Date of U.S. Patent No. 4,859,016 401 filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation, Counter Claimant JDS Uniphase Corporation. (Goodwin, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to of the Expiration Date of U.S. Patent No. 4,859,016 401 filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation, Counter Claimant JDS Uniphase Corporation. (Goodwin, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY Benjamin L. Singer for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE NOT PAID. filed by plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University, Litton Systems Inc.Application set for hearing on 3/10/2008 at 09:00 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Applicaiton)(Hutnyan, Diane) (Entered: 03/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to of the Expiration Date of U.S. Patent No. 4,859,016 filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation(a Delaware corporation), JDS Uniphase Corporation.Motion set for hearing on 3/31/2008 at 09:30 AM before Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporations Motion for Summary Judgment of the Expiration Date of U.S. Patent No. 4,859,016)(Goodwin, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY Colleen M. Garlington for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Defendant Lucent Technologies Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Arnold, Brian) (Entered: 03/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry: RE MOTION for Discovery regarding Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents 387 . (pcl) (Entered: 03/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr Granting APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY Brian W. Lee for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice 381 by Brian W. Lee to appear on behalf of Defendant Lucent Technologies Inc. Brian G. Arnold is designated as local counsel. Fee Paid on 2/28/08. (lom) (Entered: 03/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr Granting APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY Jamal M. Edwards for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice 380 by James M. Edward to appear on behalf of Counter Claimant Lucent Technologies Inc, Defendant Lucent Technologies Inc. Brian G. Arnold is designated as local counsel. Fee Paid on 2/28/08. (lom) (Entered: 03/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr Granting APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY James A. Shimota for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice 379 by James A. Shimota to appear on behalf of Defendant Lucent Technologies Inc. Brian G. Arnold is designated as local counsel. Fee Paid. (lom) (Entered: 03/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Diane C. Hutnyan in Opposition to MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS 392 filed by Defendant Lucent Technologies Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Arnold, Brian) (Entered: 03/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Brian G. Arnold in Support of MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS 392 filed by Defendant Lucent Technologies Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Arnold, Brian) (Entered: 03/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS 392 filed by Defendant Lucent Technologies Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5)(Arnold, Brian) (Entered: 03/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS filed by Defendant Lucent Technologies Inc.Motion set for hearing on 3/26/2008 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Arnold, Brian) (Entered: 03/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Diane C. Hutnyan in opposition to MOTION for Discovery regarding Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents 386 filed by Defendant Pirelli S p A. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 -3# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Part 1# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Part 2# 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Part 3# 5 Exhibit Exhibits 5-9# 6 Exhibit Exhibits 10-17)(Kneafsey, Sean) (Entered: 03/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Daniel J. Melman in support of MOTION for Discovery regarding Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents 386 filed by Defendant Pirelli S p A. (Kneafsey, Sean) (Entered: 03/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Daniel J. Melman in support of MOTION for Discovery regarding Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents 386 filed by Defendant Pirelli S p A. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A - I# 2 Exhibit Exhibits J - M# 3 Exhibit Exhibits M - Q)(Kneafsey, Sean) (Entered: 03/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION for Discovery regarding Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents 386 filed by Defendant Pirelli S p A. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Part 1# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Part 2# 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit Exhibits 4-8# 6 Exhibit Exhibits 9-13# 7 Exhibit Exhibits 14-15)(Kneafsey, Sean) (Entered: 03/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Discovery regarding Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents filed by Defendant Pirelli S p A.Motion set for hearing on 3/26/2008 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Part 1# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Part 2# 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit Exhibits 4-8# 6 # 7 Exhibit Exhibits 14-15)(Kneafsey, Sean) (Entered: 03/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Discovery regarding Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents filed by Defendant Pirelli SpA.Motion set for hearing on 3/26/2008 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman. (Kneafsey, Sean) (Entered: 03/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr, re Plaintiffs motion for review and modification of the Magistrates October 10, 2007 order 290 : It is Ordered that the motion be, and hereby is, Remanded to the Magistrate for consideration. It is further Ordered that Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporations application for leave to file a surreply 312 in opposition to Plaintiffs request is DENIED. It is further Ordered that Plaintiffs motion to strike Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporations proposed surreply be, and hereby is, Denied as moot. (lom) (Entered: 03/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr Granting First APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY Patricia Young for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice 377 to appear on behalf of Defendant Pirelli S p A, Counter Claimant Pirelli S p A. Sean M. Kneafsey is designated as local counsel. (ps) (Entered: 02/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr, re Defendant JDS Uniphase Co's EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Reexamination Of The Patent-In-Suit 360 is DENIED. (lom) (Entered: 02/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Incorrect event selected: RE First APPLICATION for Order for Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case 378 . If the order is not attached with the Application, please file a Notice of Lodging and attach the [Prop] order. (lom) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY Brian W. Lee for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Defendant Lucent Technologies Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Arnold, Brian) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY Jamal M. Edwards for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Defendant Lucent Technologies Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Arnold, Brian) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY James A. Shimota for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Defendant Lucent Technologies Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Arnold, Brian) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First APPLICATION for Order for Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case filed by defendant Pirelli S p A. (Kneafsey, Sean) (Entered: 02/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            First APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY Patricia Young for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by defendant Pirelli S p A. (Kneafsey, Sean) (Entered: 02/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY Patricia Young for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, designating Sean M. Kneafsey as local counsel. FEE PAID, filed by Defendant Pirelli S p A. (lom) (Entered: 02/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found. Incorrect Event. Corrent event is Applications. See Motions & Related Filings: Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice : RE Notice of Appearance 374 . Also, the Order is missing from the Application. See G-64 for Order (form). (lom) (Entered: 02/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sean M Kneafsey on behalf of Defendant Pirelli S p A (Kneafsey, Sean) (Entered: 02/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY in opposition EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Reexamination Of The Patent-In-Suit 360 filed by Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc. (Brown, Sidford) (Entered: 02/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Reexamination Of The Patent-In-Suit 360 filed by Defendants Tyco International (US) Inc, Tyco Telecommunications Ltd, Tyco Telecommunications (U.S.) Inc, Tyco Networks (U.S.) Inc, Agere Systems Inc, JDS Uniphase Corporation, Pirelli S p A, Ericsson Inc, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Ericson Microelectronics AB, Optoelectronic Products, Lucent Technologies Inc, Tyco International Ltd, Counter Claimants Tyco International Ltd, Tyco International (US) Inc, Tyco Telecommunications Ltd, Tyco Telecommunications (U.S.) Inc, Tyco Networks (U.S.) Inc, Ericsson Inc, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Ericson Microelectronics AB, Optoelectronic Products, JDS Uniphase Corporation, Agere Systems Inc, Lucent Technologies Inc, Pirelli S p A. (Chin, Steven) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to Withdraw Jeremy S. Pitcock as Attorney of Record filed by Defendant JDS Uniphase Corporation(a Delaware corporation), JDS Uniphase Corporation. (Chin, Steven) (Entered: 02/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Steven S Cherensky counsel for Defendants Pirelli S p A, Pirelli SpA, Counter Claimant Pirelli S p A.Steven S. Cherensky is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Pirella S.p.A. (Cherensky, Steven) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER On Request For Approval Of Substitution Of Lead Discovery Counsel 365 by Judge Rosalyn M. Chapman: The Court hereby orders that the request of Lucent Technologies Inc. to substitute Brian G. Arnold for Jordan N. Malz as lead discovery counsel for Lucent pursuant to Paragraph 1 of the October 10, 2007, General Discovery Order is hereby GRANTED. (pcl) (Entered: 01/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Jennifer Lynne Miremadi counsel for Defendants Tyco International (US) Inc, Tyco Telecommunications Ltd, Tyco Telecommunications (U.S.) Inc, Tyco Networks (U.S.) Inc, Tyco International Ltd, Counter Claimants Tyco International Ltd, Tyco International (US) Inc, Tyco Telecommunications Ltd, Tyco Telecommunications (U.S.) Inc, Tyco Networks (U.S.) Inc.Michael H. Diamond is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants and Counterclaimants Tyco International Ltd., Tyco International (US) Inc., Tyco Telecommunications Ltd., Tyco Telecommunications (US) Inc., and Tyco Networks (US) Inc. (Miremadi, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter Jr Granting MOTION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY Lawrence B. Goodwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. FEE PAID. 366 by Lawrence B. Goodwin to appear on behalf of Defendant/Counter Claimant JDS Uniphase Corporation. Steven H. Weinstein is designated as local counsel. Fee Paid $185 366 . (lom) (Entered: 01/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST for Order for APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OF LEAD DISCOVERY COUNSEL filed by Defendant Lucent Technologies Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Malz, Jordan) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Sidford L. Brown In Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Reexamination Of The Patent-In-Suit 360 filed by Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc. (Brown, Sidford) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Reexamination Of The Patent-In-Suit 360 filed by Plaintiff Litton Systems Inc. (Brown, Sidford) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Jamie W. McGloin-King In Support Of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Reexamination Of The Patent-In-Suit 360 filed by Defendants Tyco International (US) Inc, Ciena Corporation, Tyco Telecommunications Ltd, Tyco Telecommunications (U.S.) Inc, Tyco Networks (U.S.) Inc, Agere Systems Inc, JDS Uniphase Corporation, Ciena Corporation, Pirelli S p A, Ericsson Inc, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Ericson Microelectronics AB, Optoelectronic Products, Lucent Technologies Inc, Tyco International Ltd, Counter Claimants Tyco International Ltd, Tyco International (US) Inc, Tyco Telecommunications Ltd, Tyco Telecommunications (U.S.) Inc, Tyco Networks (U.S.) Inc, Ciena Corporation, Ericsson Inc, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Ericson Microelectronics AB, Optoelectronic Products, JDS Uniphase Corporation, Agere Systems Inc, Lucent Technologies Inc, Pirelli S p A. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D Part 1# 5 Exhibit D Part 2# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H# 10 Exhibit I# 11 Exhibit J# 12 Declaration K# 13 Exhibit L# 14 Exhibit M# 15 Exhibit N# 16 Exhibit O# 17 Declaration P# 18 Exhibit Q)(Chin, Steven) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Reexamination Of The Patent-In-Suit 360 filed by Defendants Tyco International (US) Inc, Ciena Corporation, Tyco Telecommunications Ltd, Tyco Telecommunications (U.S.) Inc, Tyco Networks (U.S.) Inc, Agere Systems Inc, JDS Uniphase Corporation, Ciena Corporation, Pirelli S p A, Ericsson Inc, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Ericson Microelectronics AB, Optoelectronic Products, Lucent Technologies Inc, Tyco International Ltd, Counter Claimants Tyco International Ltd, Tyco International (US) Inc, Tyco Telecommunications Ltd, Tyco Telecommunications (U.S.) Inc, Tyco Networks (U.S.) Inc, Ciena Corporation, Ericsson Inc, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Ericson Microelectronics AB, Optoelectronic Products, JDS Uniphase Corporation, Agere Systems Inc, Lucent Technologies Inc, Pirelli S p A. (Chin, Steven) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Reexamination Of The Patent-In-Suit filed by Defendants Tyco International (US) Inc, Ciena Corporation(a Delaware corporation), Tyco Telecommunications Ltd, Tyco Telecommunications (U.S.) Inc, Tyco Networks (U.S.) Inc, Agere Systems Inc, JDS Uniphase Corporation(a Delaware corporation), Pirelli S p A, Ericsson Inc, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Ericson Microelectronics AB, Optoelectronic Products, Tyco International Ltd, Tyco International (US) Inc, Tyco Telecommunications Ltd, Tyco Telecommunications (U.S.) Inc, Tyco Networks (U.S.) Inc, Ciena Corporation, Ericsson Inc, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, Ericson Microelectronics AB, Optoelectronic Products, JDS Uniphase Corporation, Agere Systems Inc, Lucent Technologies Inc, Pirelli S p A, Lucent Technologies Inc, Tyco International Ltd.(Chin, Steven) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. ORDERING Notice of Change of Attorney Information filed by Michael Diamond received on 1/16/2008 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Pursuant to G.O. 07-08, this case is designated for e-filing. (ps) (Entered: 01/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information: adding Jennifer Miremadi as attorney as counsel of record for Tyco International Ltd, Tyco International (US) Inc., Tyco Telecommunications Ltd., Tyco Telecommunications (US) Inc., and Tyco Networks(US) Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendants Tyco International (US) Inc, Tyco Telecommunications Ltd, Tyco Telecommunications (U.S.) Inc, Tyco Networks (U.S.) Inc, Tyco International Ltd (cbr) (Entered: 01/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Incorrect Document Type selected, See Other Filings: Notices for Change of Attorney Information (G-06): RE Notice of Appearance 334 . (lom) (Entered: 01/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error, Incorrect Event used for Docket entry Re: Notice of Clerical Error (G-11) 355 . (lom) (Entered: 01/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Incorrect Document Type Selecte, See Other Filings: Notices for Change of Attorney Information (G-06) Re: Notice of Appearance 334 . (lom) (Entered: 01/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Proof of Service is missing for non-electronically served parties: RE Declaration (non-motion) 329 . (lom) (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Incorrect Document Type Selected. See other Filings: Miscellaneous Filings (Non-Motion): RE Notice (Other) 326 . (lom) (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Proof of Service is missing for non-electronically served parties. Some of the parties have requested other than electronic filing. See mail and fax list: RE Notice (Other) 328 . (lom) (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Proof of Service is missing for non-electronically served parties. Some of the parties have requested other than electronic filing. See mail and fax list: RE Declaration (non-motion), Declaration (non-motion) 324 . (lom) (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Proof of Service is missing for non-electronically served parties: Some of the parties have requested other than electronic filing. See mail and fax list: RE Notice (Other), Notice (Other) 323 . (lom) (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following deficiency was found Proof of Service is missing for non-electronically served parties: APPLICATION for Leave to File Surreply 312 . (lom) (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Jennifer Lynne Miremadi counsel for Defendants Tyco International (US) Inc, Tyco Telecommunications Ltd, Tyco Telecommunications (U.S.) Inc, Tyco Networks (U.S.) Inc, Tyco International Ltd, Counter Claimants Tyco International Ltd, Tyco International (US) Inc, Tyco Telecommunications Ltd, Tyco Telecommunications (U.S.) Inc, Tyco Networks (U.S.) Inc. Adding Jennifer L. Miremadi as attorney as counsel of record for Tyco International Ltd., Tyco International (US) Inc., Tyco Telecommunications Ltd., Tyco Telecommunications (