BlueGem Security, Inc. v. Trend Mirco Incorporated et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:09-cv-01492
District Judge Otis D Wright, II, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 28, 2017 at 9:31 PM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BlueGem Security, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/13/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Edward Bronson +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 eb@birdmarella.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc E Masters +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 mem@birdmarella.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ekwan E Rhow +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 erhow@birdmarella.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lurie & Park LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raffi Kassabian +1 818 380 3022 +1 818 380 3023 raffi@lurieparklawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa Marie Lawrence +1 818 360 3022 +1 818 380 3023 lisa@lurieparklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel E Park +1 818 380 3022 +1 818 380 3023 dpark@lurieparklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sonia J Taylor +1 818 380 3022 +1 818 380 3023 sonia@lurieparklawfirm.com
No Logo Trend Mirco Incorporated, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carr & Ferrell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James William Lucey +1 650 812 3400 +1 650 812 3444 jlucey@carr-ferrell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth B Wilson +1 650 812 3400 +1 650 812 3444 kwilson@carrferrell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Joseph Yorio +1 650 812 3400 +1 650 812 3444 yorio@carrferrell.com
v.
No Logo Trend Mirco Incorporated, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carr & Ferrell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James William Lucey +1 650 812 3400 +1 650 812 3444 jlucey@carr-ferrell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth B Wilson +1 650 812 3400 +1 650 812 3444 kwilson@carrferrell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Joseph Yorio +1 650 812 3400 +1 650 812 3444 yorio@carrferrell.com
No Logo BlueGem Security, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/13/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Edward Bronson +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 eb@birdmarella.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc E Masters +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 mem@birdmarella.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ekwan E Rhow +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 erhow@birdmarella.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lurie & Park LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raffi Kassabian +1 818 380 3022 +1 818 380 3023 raffi@lurieparklawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa Marie Lawrence +1 818 360 3022 +1 818 380 3023 lisa@lurieparklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel E Park +1 818 380 3022 +1 818 380 3023 dpark@lurieparklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sonia J Taylor +1 818 380 3022 +1 818 380 3023 sonia@lurieparklawfirm.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (241) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None
REQUEST for Order for Release of the Transcript of Sealed Proceedings filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Yorio, Robert) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
    FINAL TRIAL Witness List (mg) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
      RECEIPT FOR RELEASE OF EXHIBITS to Counsel Upon Verdict/Judgment at Trial; Pursuant to stip of counsel and/or by Order of the Court, all exhibits listed on Joint exhibits list are returned to counsel for respective party(ies). (mg) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
        QUESTIONS FROM THE JURY (mg) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 237 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
          MINUTE OF (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER Continuing OSC re Settlement Hearing by Judge Otis D Wright II. At the request of counsel, the OSC re Settlement hearing scheduled for October 14, 2010 at 1:30 p.m. is hereby CONTINUED to Thursday, October 21, 2010 at 1:30 p.m. The hearing will be automatically vacated upon the filing of a stipulation and proposed order of dismissal. (sch) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
            Final Trial Exhibit List (mg) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
              MINUTES of Jury Trial - 10th Day held before Judge Otis D Wright, II: Filed Witness and Exibit Lists. Settlement reached and placed on the record. Counsel stipulate to the return of exhibits upon the conclusion of trial. Exhibit Release Form prepared and filed. Court sets an Order to Show Cause re Settlement Hearing for Thursday 10/14/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D Wright II. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber / Victoria Valine. (mg) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                MINUTES of Jury Trial - 9th Day held before Judge Otis D Wright, II: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified. Defendants rest. Jury Trial continued to 9/29/2010 at 08:30 AM before Judge Otis D Wright II. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber / Victoria Valine. (mg) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Change of address by Kenneth B Wilson attorney for Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated, Counter Claimant Trend Mirco Incorporated. Changing attorneys address to 120 Constitution Drive, Menlo Park, California 94025. Filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated, Counter Claimant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (Wilson, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                    MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 8th Day held before Judge Otis D Wright, II: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Further Jury Trial continued to Tuesday 9/28/2010 08:30 AM. Parties ordered to appear on Monday, September 27, 2010 at 3:00 p.m. for Settlement of Jury Instruction.Court Recorder: Leandra Amber / Victoria Valine. (lc) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                      MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 7th Day held before Judge Otis D Wright, II: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified. Plaintiff(s) rest. Motion for Judgment/Directed Verdict by DEFENDANT submitted. Case continued to 9/24/2010 at 8:30 AM. Court hears oral argument re defendant's motion. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber/Victoria Valine. (jp) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                        MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 6TH Day held before Judge Otis D Wright, II: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Further Jury Trial continued to 9/23/2010 08:00 AM. Court Reporter: Victoria Valine (a.m.) / Leandra Amber (p.m.). (lc) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                          MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 5th Day held before Judge Otis D Wright, II: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Further Jury Trial continued to 9/22/2010 08:30 AM.Court Reporter: Victoria Valine. (lc) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                            MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 4th Day held before Judge Otis D Wright, II: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Further Jury Trial set for 9/21/2010 08:30 AM.Court Reporter: Leandra Amber (a.m.) / Victoria Valine (p.m.). (lc) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                              MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 3rd Day held before Judge Otis D Wright, II: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Further Jury Trial continued to 9/17/2010 08:30 AM.Court Reporter: Victoria Valine (a.m.) / Leandra Amber (p.m.). (lc) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 2nd Day held before Judge Otis D Wright, II: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Jury Trial continued to 9/16/2010 08:30 AM. Court Reporter: Victoria Valine (a.m.) / Leandra Amber (p.m.). (lc) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 1st Day held before Judge Otis D Wright, II: Jury empanelled and sworn. Opening statements made. Jury Trial continued to 9/15/2010 08:30 AM before Judge Otis D Wright II.Court Reporter: Leandra Amber (a.m.) / Victoria Valine (p.m.). (lc) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document 222 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event: statement. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
                                      Joint Exhibit List filed by Plaintiff and Defendant BlueGem Security, Inc., Trend Mirco Incorporated.. (Rhow, Ekwan) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
                                        Joint Statement of the Case filed by Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc., Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated (Masters, Marc) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II: granting 219 plaintiffs Ex Parte Application: Defendant Trend Micro Incorporated is hereby ORDERED (i) to make Arthur Vardanyan, Eva Chen, and Carol Carpenter available for examination by BlueGem during the first week of trial, (ii) to make Mr. Vardanyan available on the first day of trial, (iii) to make Ms. Chen and Ms. Carpenter available immediately following Mr. Vardanyan, and (iv) to make available during the first week the following: Richard Ku, Yuji Yamasaki and Mark Painter.Should Trend Micro fail to make the above-named witnesses available asordered, Trend Micro will be subject to sanctions including, but not limited to, the preclusion of the presentation of these witnesses testimony during Trend Micros own case-in-chief. (lc) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None
                                            TREND MICRO INCORPORATEDS MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO BLUEGEMS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING TREND MICRO INCORPORATED TO PRODUCE CERTAIN OF ITS WITNESSES IN THE FIRST WEEK OF TRIAL IN OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Compelling Defendant Trend Micro Incorporated to Make Its Witnesses Available at Trial 219 filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (Grewe, Christopher) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None
                                              EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Compelling Defendant Trend Micro Incorporated to Make Its Witnesses Available at Trial filed by Plaintiff and Counterdefendant BlueGem Security, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Masters, Marc) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                MINUTES OF Pretrial Conference held before Judge Otis D Wright II. Court and counsel confer re case status. Defendant Trend Micros Motion in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Testimony by Bluegems Expert Mr. Jino W. Kim 185 (Filed 6-14-10) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Trial date to remain on calendar. Court Reporter: None. (sch) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  MINUTES OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE HEARING held before Judge Otis D Wright, II: Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1 to Preclude Defendant from Introducing Evidence Which it Failed to Produce or Disclose Before the Discovery Cutoff Date 176 (Filed 6/14/10) is DENIED, as noted on the record. Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 2 to Preclude Defendant from Introducing LegalConclusions Through its Expert Witness 177 (Filed 6/14/10) is GRANTED, as noted on the record. Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 3 to Preclude Defendant from Introducing Any Evidence Pertaining to the Msn Chat Logs or Other Related Evidence 178 (Filed 6/14/10) is GRANTED IN PART, as noted on the record.Defendant Trend Micro's Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence about Potential Patent Design Around 179 (Filed 6/14/10) is DENIED, as noted on the record. Defendant Trend Micro's Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Evidence of Defendant's Non-u.s. Sales 186 (Filed 6/14/10) is DENIED, as noted on the record. Defendant Trend Micro's Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Evidence of Lost Profits 181 (Filed 6/14/10) is DENIED, as noted on the record.Defendant Trend Micro's Motion in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Testimony by Bluegem'sExpert Mr. Jino W. Kim 185 (Filed 6/14/10) STANDS SUBMITTED, as noted on therecord. Defendant Trend Micro's Motion in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Evidence of Trade Secret Misappropriation 183 (Filed 6/14/10) is DENIED, as noted on the record. Defendant Trend Micro's Motion in Limine No. 6 to Exclude Certain Evidence of the Content of the Licensed Software and the Copyrighted Work 180 (Filed 6/14/10) is DENIED, as noted on the record. Defendant Trend Micro's Motion in Limine No. 7 to Exclude Evidence of Certain Types of Damages 184 (Filed 6/14/10) is DENIED, as noted on the record. The Pretrial Conference scheduled for August 30, 2010 at 3:00 p.m. is CONTINUED to Tuesday, August 31, 2010 at 1:30 p.m. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (lc) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Sealed Legal Document 216 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT- Plaintiff Bluegem Security, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendant Trend Micro Incorporated's Motion in Limine #4 to Preclude Expert Testimony; Declaration of Ekwan E. Rhow. (mat) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 8/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                      Witness List filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated.. (Grewe, Christopher) (Entered: 08/29/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Sealed Legal Document 214 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT- Plaintiff Bluegem Security, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendant Trend Micro Incorporated's Motion IN LIMINE 3 to Exclude Evidence of Lost Profits; Declaration of Ekwan E. Rhow. (mat) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                          STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report re Amended Pretrial Conference Order filed by Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc., Counter Defendant BlueGem Security, Inc., Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated, Counter Claimant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (Wilson, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER GRANTING Bluegem Security, Inc.'s 210 Application to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Defendant Trend Micro Incorporated's Motion In Limine #4 to Exclude Expert Testimony and the Supporting Declaration of Ekwan E. Rhow by Judge Otis D Wright II. (sch) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER GRANTING Bluegem Security, Inc.'s 209 Application to File Under Seal Its Opposition to Defendant Trent Micro Incorporated's Motion In Limine # 3 to Exclude Evidence of Lost Profits and the Supporting Declaration of Ekwan E. Rhow by Judge Otis D Wright II. (sch) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                APPLICATIONto file under seal its opposition to defendant Trend Mircro Incorporateds Motion in limine No. 4 to exclude ex pert testimony and supporting declaration of Ekwan E Rhow filed by plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc.. Lodged order. (lc) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  APPLICATION to file under seal its opposition to defendant Trend Mircro Incorporateds Motion in limine No. 3 to exclude evidence of lost profits and supporting declaration of Ekwan E Rhow filed by plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc.. Lodged order. (lc) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    AMENDED MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (Wilson, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE No. 3 to Preclude Defendant From Introducing Any Evidence Pertaining to The MSN Chat Logs or Other Related Evidence; Declaration of Ekwan E. Rhow 178 filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated, Counter Claimant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Wilson Declaration ISO of Opposition to Motion in Limine #3 to Preclude Defendant From Introducing Any Evidence Pertaining to the MSN Chat Logs or Other Related Evidence)(Wilson, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE No. 1 to Preclude Defendant from Introducing Evidence Which It Failed to Produce or Disclose Before The Discovery Cutoff Date; Declaration of Ekwan E. Rhow 176 filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated, Counter Claimant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (Yorio, Robert) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          OPPOSITION to MOTION IN LIMINE No. 2 to Preclude Defendant From Introducing Legal Conclusions Through Its Expert Witness; Declaration of Ekwan E. Rhow 177 filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated, Counter Claimant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (Wilson, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc., Counter Defendant BlueGem Security, Inc. of BLUEGEM SECURITY, INC.S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL ITS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT TREND MICRO INCORPORATEDS MOTION IN LIMINE #4 TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY AND THE SUPPORTING DECLARATION OF EKWAN E. RHOW; [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING BLUEGEM SECURITY, INC.S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL ITS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT TREND MICRO INCORPORATEDS MOTION IN LIMINE #4 TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY AND THE SUPPORTING DECLARATION OF EKWAN E. RHOW; PLAINTIFF BLUE GEM SECURITY, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT TREND MICRO INCORPORATED'S MOTION IN LIMINE #4 TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY AND THE SUPPORTING DECLARATION OF EKWAN E. RHOW. (Masters, Marc) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc., Counter Defendant BlueGem Security, Inc. of BLUEGEM SECURITY, INC.S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL ITS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT TREND MICRO INCORPORATEDS MOTION IN LIMINE #3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF LOST PROFITS AND THE SUPPORTING DECLARATION OF EKWAN E. RHOW; [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING BLUEGEM SECURITY, INC.S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL ITS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT TREND MICRO INCORPORATEDS MOTION IN LIMINE #3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF LOST PROFITS AND THE SUPPORTING DECLARATION OF EKWAN E. RHOW ; PLAINTIFF BLUEGEM SECURITY, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT TREND MICRO INCORPORATED'S MOTION IN LIMINE #3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF LOST PROFITS; DECLARATION OF EKWAN E. RHOW. (Masters, Marc) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                OPPOSITION re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Evidence About Potential Patent Design Around MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Evidence About Potential Patent Design Around 179 filed by Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc., Counter Defendant BlueGem Security, Inc.. (Masters, Marc) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                  OPPOSITION re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#7) to Exclude Evidence of Certain Types of Damages ; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Supporting Declaration of Kenneth B. Wilson MOTION IN LIMINE (#7) to Exclude Evidence of Certain Types of Damages ; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Supporting Declaration of Kenneth B. Wilson 184 filed by Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc., Counter Defendant BlueGem Security, Inc.. (Masters, Marc) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    OPPOSITION re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Evidence of Trade Secret Misappropriation ; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Supporting Declaration of Kenneth B. Wilson MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Evidence of Trade Secret Misappropriation ; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Supporting Declaration of Kenneth B. Wilson 183 filed by Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc., Counter Defendant BlueGem Security, Inc.. (Masters, Marc) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      OPPOSITION re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Evidence of Defendant's Non-U.S. Sales 186 filed by Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc., Counter Defendant BlueGem Security, Inc.. (Masters, Marc) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        OPPOSITION re: MOTION IN LIMINE 6 to Exclude Certain Evidence of the Content of the License Software and the Copyrighted Work ; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Supporting Declaration of Kenneth B. Wilson 180 filed by Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc., Counter Defendant BlueGem Security, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ekwan E. Rhow, # 2 Exhibit 1 through 6)(Masters, Marc) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc., Counter Defendant BlueGem Security, Inc. of PLAINTIFF BLUEGEM SECURITY, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT TREND MICRO INCORPORATED'S MOTION IN LIMINE #4 TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY; DECLARATION OF EKWAN E. RHOW. (Masters, Marc) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc., Counter Defendant BlueGem Security, Inc. of PLAINTIFF BLUEGEM SECURITY, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT TREND MICRO INCORPORATED'S MOTION IN LIMINE #3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF LOST PROFITS; DECLARATION OF EKWAN E. RHOW. (Masters, Marc) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 195 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Kenneth B. Wilson in Support of Defendant Trend Micro Incorporated's Motion in Limine #4 to Exclude Testimony by Bluegem's Expert, Mr. Jino W. Kim. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3)(mat) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 194 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Kenneth B. Wilson in Support of Defendant Trend Micro Incorporated's Motion in Limine #3 to Exclude Evidence of Lost Profits. (mat) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER Granting 192 Application to Seal Certain Documents Filed in Support of Defendant Trend Micro Incorporated's Motions in Limine by Judge Otis D Wright II. (sch) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                    APPLICATION for Order for to file under seal declarations of Kenneth B Wilson in support of Motions in limine #3 and #4 filed by defendant Trend Micro Incorporated. Lodged order. (lc) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated, Counter Claimant Trend Mirco Incorporated of Application to Seal Certain Documents Filed in Support of Defendant Trend Micro Incorporated's Motion in Limine; [Proposed] Order Granting Application to Seal Certain Documents Filed in Support of Defendant Trend Micro Incorporated's Motion in Limine; Declaration of Kenneth B. Wilson in Support of Defendant Trend Micro Incoporated's Motion in Limine #3 to Exclude Evidence of Lost Profits; Declaration of Kenneth B. WIlson in Support of Defendant Trend Micro Incorporated's Motion in Limine #4 to Exclude Testimony by BlueGem's Expert, Mr. Jino W. Kim.. (Wilson, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge Otis D Wright, II:The Court confers with counsel regarding issues related to upcoming trial. Parties are ordered to work out the issues stated on the record, and redo the pretrialconference order. The Court hereby continues the Pretrial Conference to Monday, August 30, 2010 at 3:00 p.m. Jury Trial date is continued from June 29, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. to Tuesday, September 14, 2010 at 9:00 a.m.. The Court also orders all the Motions in Limine 176 , 177 , 178 , 179 , 180 , 181 , 182 , 183 , 184 , 185 , 186 currently filed by both parties on 6-14-10, currently scheduled for hearing on Monday, June 28, 2010 at 3:00 p.m., continued to Monday, August 30, 2010 at 3:00 p.m.Court Reporter: Katie E. Thibodeaux. (lc) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) 187 . The following error(s) was found in this second attempt: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Notice: Manual Filing (G-92). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) 182 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Notice: Manual filing (G-92). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Trend Mirco Incorporated. AMENDING Notice of Manual Filing D.I. 182 (Wilson, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Evidence of Defendant's Non-U.S. Sales filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. Motion set for hearing on 6/28/2010 at 03:00 PM before Judge Otis D Wright II.(Wilson, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Testimony By BlueGem's Expert, Mr. Jino W. Kim ; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Trend Mirco Incorporated. Motion set for hearing on 6/28/2010 at 03:00 PM before Judge Otis D Wright II.(Wilson, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#7) to Exclude Evidence of Certain Types of Damages ; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Supporting Declaration of Kenneth B. Wilson filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Trend Mirco Incorporated. Motion set for hearing on 6/28/2010 at 03:00 PM before Judge Otis D Wright II.(Wilson, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Evidence of Trade Secret Misappropriation ; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Supporting Declaration of Kenneth B. Wilson filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Trend Mirco Incorporated. Motion set for hearing on 6/28/2010 at 03:00 PM before Judge Otis D Wright II.(Wilson, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. of (1) Declaration of Kenneth B. Wilson in Support of Trend Micro Incorporated's Motion in Limine #3 to Exclude Evidence of Lost Profits; 2) Declaration of Kenneth B. Wilson in Support of Trend Micro Incorporated's Motion in Limine #4 to Exclude Testimony by BlueGem's Expert, Mr. Jino W. Kim; 3) Declaration of Kenneth B. Wilson in Support of Trend Micro Incorporated's Motion in Limine #7 to Exclude Evidence of Certain Types of Damages (Wilson, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE 3 to Exclude Evidence of Lost Profits ; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Trend Mirco Incorporated. Motion set for hearing on 6/28/2010 at 03:00 PM before Judge Otis D Wright II.(Wilson, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE 6 to Exclude Certain Evidence of the Content of the License Software and the Copyrighted Work ; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Supporting Declaration of Kenneth B. Wilson filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Trend Mirco Incorporated. Motion set for hearing on 6/28/2010 at 03:00 PM before Judge Otis D Wright II.(Wilson, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Evidence About Potential Patent Design Around filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Trend Mirco Incorporated. Motion set for hearing on 6/28/2010 at 03:00 PM before Judge Otis D Wright II.(Wilson, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE No. 3 to Preclude Defendant From Introducing Any Evidence Pertaining to The MSN Chat Logs or Other Related Evidence; Declaration of Ekwan E. Rhow filed by Plaintiff and Counterdefendant BlueGem Security, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/28/2010 at 03:00 PM before Judge Otis D Wright II. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1, # 2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order on Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 3)(Rhow, Ekwan) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE No. 2 to Preclude Defendant From Introducing Legal Conclusions Through Its Expert Witness; Declaration of Ekwan E. Rhow filed by Plaintiff and Counterdefendant BlueGem Security, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/28/2010 at 03:00 PM before Judge Otis D Wright II. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order on Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 2)(Rhow, Ekwan) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE No. 1 to Preclude Defendant from Introducing Evidence Which It Failed to Produce or Disclose Before The Discovery Cutoff Date; Declaration of Ekwan E. Rhow filed by Plaintiff and Counterdefendant BlueGem Security, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/28/2010 at 03:00 PM before Judge Otis D Wright II. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit No. 1, # 2 Exhibit No. 2, # 3 Exhibit No. 3, # 4 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order on Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1)(Rhow, Ekwan) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II: Trend Micros Motion for Summary Adjudication Based on Limitation of Liability 75 is DENIED, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs Fifth Claim for Intentional Interference with Prospective Economic Advantage and Sixth Claim for Negligent Interference with Prospective Economic Advantage 77 is GRANTED, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs Breach of Contract Claim 81 is GRANTED IN PART, and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as Copyright Infringement and Misappropriation of Intellectual Property Claims 83 is DENIED. Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 89 is DENIED. (lc) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc.. (Rhow, Ekwan) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Pre-Trial Conference Order)(Rhow, Ekwan) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated.. (Grewe, Christopher) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Final PRETRIAL STIPULATION regarding Exhibits Final Joint Exhibit List. (Rhow, Ekwan) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (Yorio, Robert) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED SPECIAL JURY VERDICT filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (Yorio, Robert) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Proper Names, Unusual Terms, and Other Uncommon Words Likely to be Used During the Final Pretrial Conference and the Trial filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (Yorio, Robert) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Witness List filed by Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc... (Rhow, Ekwan) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Plaintiff's Disputed Jury Instructions set) filed by Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc... (Rhow, Ekwan) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS filed by Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc... (Rhow, Ekwan) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED JURY VERDICT filed by Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc.. (Rhow, Ekwan) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Otis D Wright, II: Case called, appearances made. The Court informs counsel of its tentative rulings, asnoted on the record. The Court confers with counsel and hears oral argument.The matters stand submitted. An order will issue.Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (lc) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II: granting 158 Ex Parte Application to Continues the following dates: (1) The date to (a) lodge the Pretrial Conference Order and Pretrial Exhibit Stipulation, (b) file the Memoranda of Contentions of Fact and Law, (c) file the Exhibit and Witness Lists, (d) file the Status Report Regarding Settlement, (e) file the Agreed Upon Set of Instructions and Verdict Forms, and (f) file the Joint Statement Regarding Disputed Instructions, Verdicts, etc., is continued from June 1, 2010 to June 7, 2010; (2) The date to (a) conduct the Final Pretrial Conference, (b) file the Motions in Limine, and (c) file the Proposed Voir Dire Questions and Agreed Upon Statement of the Case, is continued from June 7, 2010 to June 14, 2010, and the Final Pretrial Conference shall take place at 3:00 p.m. (3) The date for the hearing on the Motions in Limine is continued from June 21, 2010 to June 28, 2010 at 3:00 p.m. (4) The date to file the Final Trial Exhibit Stipulation is continued from June 24, 2010 to June 28, 2010; and (5) The trial date and time remain the same. (lc) (Entered: 05/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION to Continue CERTAIN PRETRIAL DATES Re: Scheduling Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,, 30 filed by Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant BlueGem Security, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Masters, Marc) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Continue certain pretrial dates 159 was docketed after ex parte application seek same relief which had proposed ex parte order, #158, however stipulation was missing it own Proposed order which should have been submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION to Continue Certain Pretrial Dates Re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Certain Pretrial Dates Re: Scheduling Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,, 30 158 filed by Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant BlueGem Security, Inc..(Masters, Marc) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Certain Pretrial Dates Re: Scheduling Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,, 30 filed by Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant BlueGem Security, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Masters, Marc) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Otis D Wright, II:, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings:( Motion set for hearing on 5/26/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D Wright II.)The hearing will be on the motions appearing at docket entries 75 , 77 , 81 , 83 and 89 . (rne) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Terminating Santions or, in the Alternative, Issue Sanctions 90 by Judge Otis D Wright, II: Plaintiffs Motion for Terminating Sanctions or, in the Alternative, Issue Sanctions is DENIED. denying 90 (PLEASE REVIEW DOCUMENT FOR FULL AND COMPLETE DETAILS) (lw) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION 153 FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE MAY 5, 2010 ORDER 150 by Judge Otis D Wright, II: After considering the papers submitted in support thereof, and GOOD CAUSE appearing, it is hereby ORDERED that BlueGems ex parte application is GRANTED. The Court VACATES its Order Striking Motions 150 . BlueGems motion for partial summary judgment 89 and motion for terminating sanctions 90 are REINSTATED. The hearing date on both motions, noticed for May 10, 2010 at 1:30p.m., is VACATED. The matters stand submitted. (yl) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated, Counter Claimant Trend Mirco Incorporatedto EX PARTE APPLICATION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Order,,,, 150 153 (Yorio, Robert) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  EX PARTE APPLICATION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Order,,,, 150 filed by Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant BlueGem Security, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Masters, Marc) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Otis D Wright, II: re: MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Based On Contractual Limitation Of Liability 75 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Copyright Infringement And Misappropriation Of Intellectual Property Claims 83 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs Breach Of Contract Claim 81 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs Fifth Claim For Intentional Interference With Prospective Economic Relations And Sixth Claim For Negligent Interference With Prospective Economic Relations 77 . Motions hearing set for 5/10/2010 at 01:30 PM is hereby VACATED. The matters stand submitted. An order will issue. (rne) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II: denying 148 APPLICATION for Order permitting the filing under seal of evidentiary objections to plaintiffs evidence submitted in support of Bluegem motion for terminating sanction or alternative issue sanctions, request for sanctions, declaration and evidentiary objections to Bluegems evidence submitted in support of Bluegems reply re plaintiffs motion for partial summary judgment (lc) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        *[VACATED pursuant to Order entered on 5/7/10]* MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D Wright, II: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt. # 89)and Motion for Terminating Sanctions or, in the Alternative, Issue Sanctions (Dkt. # 90), both filed April 14, 2010. However, pursuant to Local Rule 6, notice of [any] motion shall be filed with the Clerk not later than twenty-eight (28) days before the date set for hearing. Plaintiffs Motions were filed only twenty-six (26) days before the date set for hearing. Accordingly, the Court hereby STRIKES both Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Motion for Terminating Sanctions or, in the Alternative, Issue Sanctions as untimely 89 , 90 . (lc) Modified on 5/7/2010 (yl). (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document forthwith. RE: Notice (Other) 145 (Notice of dissociation of counsel) by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION for Order permitting the filing under seal of evidentiary objections to plaintiffs evidence submitted in support of Bluegem motion for terminating sanction or alternative issue sanctons, request for sanctions, declaration and evdenitary objections to Bluegems evidence submited in support of Bluegems reply re plaintiffs motion for partial summary judgment filed by defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. Lodged order. (lc) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) 145 Pdf is notice of dissassociation of law firm, but only mentions certain attorneys and not the out of state branch, no details of reasons for dissassociation, therefore requires a proposed order which should have been submitted as a separate attachment. Note: There is a form (G-06) and correct event is: Notice of change of attorney information (G-06) which prompts for required information missing on the entry. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 05/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated of (1) Trend Micro Incorporateds Evidentiary Objections To Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc.s Evidence Submitted In Support Of BlueGem Security, Inc.s Reply To Trend Micro Incorporateds To Plaintiffs Motion For Partial Summary Judgment; (2) Trend Micro Incorporateds Evidentiary Objections To Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc.s Evidence Submitted In Support Of BlueGem Security, Inc.s Motion For Terminating Sanctions Or, In The Alternative, Issue Sanctions; (3) Declaration Of Matthew Peterson In Support Of Trend Micro Incorporateds Evidentiary Objections To Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc.s Evidence Submitted In Support Of BlueGem Security, Inc.s Motion For Terminating Sanctions Or, In The Alternative, Issue Sanctions; (4) Application To Seal Certain Documents Filed In Support Of Defendant Trend Micro Incorporateds Objections To Evidence Submitted By BlueGem In Support Of BlueGems Motion For Partial Summary Judgment And Motion For Terminating Sanctions; and (5) [Proposed] Order Granting Application To Seal Certain Documents Filed In Support Of Defendant Trend Micro Incorporateds Objections To Evidence Submitted By BlueGem In Support Of BlueGems Motion For Partial Summary Judgment And Motion For Terminating Sanctions.. (Grewe, Christopher) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE filed by plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc.. Notice of Dissociation of Counsel (Park, Daniel) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to seal certain documents filed in support of defendant Trend Micro incorporated reply briefs in support of motions for partial summary judgment filed by defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. Lodged order. (lc) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 143 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT- Supplemental Declaration of Marc E. Masters in Support of Bluegem's Reply to Trend's Opposition to Bluegem's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (mat) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 142 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT- Bluegem Security, Inc.'s Evidentiary Objections to Declarations of Christine S. Watson and Kenneth B. Wilson Re: Bluegem Security, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (mat) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 141 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT- Bluegem Security, Inc.'s Reply Statement Re: Trend Micro Inc.'s Statement of Genuine Issue of Material Fact in Response to Bluegem Security, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (mat) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 140 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT- Bluegem's Reply to Trend's Opposition to Bluegem's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (mat) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 139 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT- Plaintiff Bluegem Security, Inc.'s Reply Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Terminating Sanctions or, In the Alternative, Issue Sanctions.(mat) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 138 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT- Appendix of Concealed Documents and Supplemental Declaration of Lisa M. Lawrence in Support of Bluegem's Motion for Terminating Sanctions or, in the Alternative, Issue Sanctions. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3)(mat) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 137 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Joe Park and Lisa M. Lawrence in Opposition to Trend Micro Incorporated's Motion for Summary Judgment on Breach of Contract Claim. (Attachments: Part 2,Part 3, Part 4, Part 5, Part 6, Part 7, Part 8, Part 9, Part 10, Part 11, Part 12, Part 13, Part 14, Part 15)(mat) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 136 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT- Plaintiff Bluegem Security, Inc.'s Statement of Genuine Issues in Opposition to Trend Micro's Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff Blugem Security, Inc.'s Breach of Contract Claim. (Attachments: Part 2)(mat) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING Bluegem Security, Inc.'s Application to File Under Seal Re: Bluegem's Reply to Trend's Opposition to Bluegem's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 131 by Judge Otis D Wright II. (sch) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING Bluegem Security, Inc.'s Application to File Under Seal Re: Bluegem Security, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion for Terminating Sanctions or, in the Alternative, issue Sanctions 130 by Judge Otis D Wright II. (sch) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 133 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT- Plaintiff Bluegem Security, Inc.'s Opposition to Trend Micro Incorporated's Motion for Summary Judgment on Breach of Contract Claim. (mat) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING Bluegem Security, Inc.'s Application to File Under Seal Re: Opposition to Trend Micro Incorporated's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Breach of Contact Claim 110 by Judge Otis D Wright II. (sch) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to file under seal re reply to Trend Micro Incs opposition to Bluegems motion for partial summary judgment filed by plaintiff: BlueGem Security, Inc. Lodged order. (lc) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to file under seal re Bluegem Security, Inc. reply in support of its motion for terminating sanctions ro in the alternative issue sanctions filed by plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc.. Lodged order. (lc) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 129 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Joe Park and Lisa M. Lawrence in Opposition to Trend Micro Incorporated's Motion for Summary Judgment on Bluegem's Fifth and Sixth Claims. (Attachments: Part 2)(mat) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 128 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT- Plaintiff Bluegem Security, Inc.'s Opposition to Trend Micro Incorporated's Motion for Summary Judgment on Bluegem's Fifth and Sixth Claims for International and Negligent Interference with Prospective Economic Advantage.(mat) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 127 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT- Plaintiff Bluegem Security, Inc.'s Statement of Genuine Issues in Opposition to Trend Micro Incorporated's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs Fifth Claim For Intentional Interference With Prospective Economic Relations And Sixth Claim For Negligent Interference With Prospective Economic Advantage. (mat) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 126 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Joe Park and Marc E. Masters in Opposition to Trend's Motion for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication Based on Limitation of Liability. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4)(mat) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 125 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT- Bluegem Security, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendant's Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication Based on Limitation of Liability.(mat) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 124 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT- Bluegem's Opposition to Trend's Motion for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication Based on Limitation of Liability. (mat) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated of (1) Trend Micro Incorporateds Reply Memorandum In Support Of Its Motion For Summary Judgment Or Summary Adjudication Based On Limitation Of Liability; (2) Defendant Trend Micro Incorporateds Evidentiary Objections To Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc.s Evidence Submitted In Opposition To Defendants Uncontroverted Facts And Conclusions Of Law In Support Of Defendants Motion For Summary Judgment Or Summary Adjudication Based On Limitiation Of Liability; (3) Trend Micro Incorporateds Reply To BlueGem Securitys Statement Of Geninue Issues In Opposition To Defendants Motion For Summary Judgment Or Summary Adjudication Based On Limitation Of Liability; (4) Trend Micro Incorporateds Reply Memorandum In Support Of Its Motion For Summary Judgment, Or In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication Of BlueGem Security, Inc.s Fifth Claim For Intentional Interference With Prospective Economic Advantage And Sixth Claim For Negligent Interference With Prospective Economic Advantage; (5) Defendant Trend Micro Incorporateds Evidentiary Objections To Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc.s Evidence Submitted In Support Of Plaintiffs Statement Of Genuine Issues In Opposition To Defendants Motion For Summary Judgment On Plaintiffs Fifth And Sixth Claims For Prospective Economic Advantage; (6) Trend Micro Incorporateds Reply Memorandum In Support Of Its Motion For Summary Judgment, Or In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication Of Issues, On Breach Of Contract Claim; (7) Trend Micro Incorporateds Evidentiary Objections To Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc.s Evidence Submitted In Opposition To Trend Micro Incorporateds Motion For Summary Judgment On Breach Of Contract Claim; (8) Trend Micro Incorporateds Reply Memorandum In Support Of Its Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Of Copyright Infringement And Misappropriation Of Intellectual Property Claims; (9) Defendant Trend Micro Incorporateds Evidentiary Objections To Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc.s Evidence Submitted In Support Of Plaintiffs Statement Of Genuine Issues In Opposition To Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Re Copyright Infringement And Missapropriation Of Intellectual Property Claims; (10) Trend Micro Incorporateds Reply To BlueGem Security, Inc.s Statement Of Genuine Issues In Opposition To Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Of Copyright Infringement And Misappropriation Of Intellectual Property Claims; (11) Declaration Of Kenneth B. Wilson In Support Of Trend Micro Incorporateds Motions For Summary Judgment And/Or Summary Adjudication; (12) Application To Seal Certain Documents Filed In Support Of Defendant Trend Micro Incorporateds Motions For Summary Judgment And/Or Summary Adjudication; and (13) [Proposed] Order Granting Application To Seal Certain Documents Filed In Support Of Defendant Trend Micro Incorporateds Motions For Summary Judgment And/Or Summary Adjudication.. (Yorio, Robert) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY in Support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Copyright Infringement And Misappropriation Of Intellectual Property Claims 83 filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (Yorio, Robert) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY in Support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs Breach Of Contract Claim 81 filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (Yorio, Robert) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY in Support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs Fifth Claim For Intentional Interference With Prospective Economic Relations And Sixth Claim For Negligent Interference With Prospective Economic Relations 77 filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (Yorio, Robert) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY in Support of MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Based On Contractual Limitation Of Liability 75 (REDACTED) filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (Yorio, Robert) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING Bluegem Security, Inc.'s Application to File Under Seal Re: Opposition to Trend Micro Incorporated's Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Fifth and Sixth Claims 109 by Judge Otis D Wright II. (Note Changes Made by the Court). (sch) Modified on 4/26/2010 (sch). (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING Bluegem Security, Inc.'s Application to File Under Seal Re: Opposition to Trend Micro Incorporated's Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Limitation of Liability 108 by Judge Otis D Wright II. (Note Changes Made by the Court). (sch) Modified on 4/26/2010 (sch). (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc., Counter Defendant BlueGem Security, Inc. of BlueGem Security, Inc.'s Reply to Trend's Opposition to BlueGem's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; BlueGem's Evidentiary Objections to Declarations of Christine Watson and Kenneth Wilson Re BlueGem's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; BlueGem's Reply Statement Re Trend's Statment of Genuine Issue of Material Fact in Response to BlueGem Security, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Supplemental Declaration of Marc Masters In Support of BlueGem's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; BlueGem's Application to File Under Seal Re Reply To Trend Micro Inc's Opposition to BlueGem's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and [Proposed] Order. (Rhow, Ekwan) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc. of BlueGem Security, Inc.'s Reply ISO its Motion for Terminating Sanctions, on in the Alternative, Issue Sanctions; Appendix of Concealed Documents and Supplemental Decl. of Lisa M. Lawrence ISO BlueGem's Motion for Terminating Sanctions. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lawrence, Lisa) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 114 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT- Declarations of Joe Park and Daniel E. Park in Support of Bluegem Security, Inc.'s Opposition to Trend Micro Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Copyright Infringement And Misappropriation Of Intellectual Property Claims. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5, Part 6, Part 7, Part 8, Part 9, Part 10)(mat) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 113 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT- Bluegem Security, Inc.'s Opposition to Trend Micro Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, or in of Copyright Infringement and Misappropriation of Intellectual Property Claims. (mat) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 112 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT- Bluegem Security, Inc.'s Statement of Genuine Issues in Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Copyright Infringement and Misappropriation of Intellectual Property Claims. (mat) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING Bluegem Security, Inc.'s Application to File Under Seal Re: Bluegem Security, Inc.'s Opposition to Trend Micro Incorporated's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Copyright Infringement and Misappropriation of Intellectual Property Claims 107 by Judge Otis D Wright II. (sch) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to file under seal re opposition to Trend motion for summary judgment on the breach of contact claim filed by plaintiffs BlueGem Security, Inc. Lodged order. (lc) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to file under seal re opposition Trend motion for summary judgment on plaintiffs fifth and sixth claims filed by plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc. Lodged order. (lc) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to file under seal re: opposition to Trend motion for summary judgment based on limitation of liability filed by plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc.. Lodged order. (lc) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to file under seal: re opposition to Trend motion for summary judgment of copyright infringement and misappropriation of intellectual property claims filed by plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc. Lodged order. (lc) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II: granting 105 Trends application to seal certain documents in support of Trends motion for partial summary judgment. (lc) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to seal certain documents in support of Trends motion for partial summary judgment (see document for list) filed by defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (lc) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated of (1) Trend Micro Incorporateds Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Opposition To BlueGem Security, Inc.s Motion For Partial Summary Judgment; (2) Trend Micro Incorporateds Statement Of General Issues Of Material Fact In Response To BlueGem Security, Inc.s Motion For Partial Summary Judgment; (3) Declaration Of Christine S. Watson In Opposition To BlueGem Security, Inc.s Motion For Partial Summary Judgment; (4) Declaration Of Kenneth B. Wilson In Opposition To BlueGem Security, Inc.s Motion For Partial Summary Judgment; (5) Trend Micro Incorporateds Evidentiary Objections To Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc.s Evidence Submitted In Support Of Plaintiffs Motion For Partial Summary Judgment; (6) [Proposed] Statement Of Decision Denying BlueGem Security Incorporateds Motion For Partial Summary Judgment; (7) Trend Micros Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Opposition To BlueGems Motion For Terminating Sanctions Or, In The Alternative, Issue Sanctions; (8) Declaration Of Christine S. Watson In Opposition To BlueGem Security, Inc.s Motion For Terminating Sanctions, Or In The Alternative, Issue Sanctions; (9) Declaration Of John Chen In Support Of Trend Micro Incorporateds Opposition To BlueGems Motion For Termination Sanctions, Or In The Alternative, Issue Sanctions; (10) Application To Seal Certain Documents Filed In Support Of Defendant Trend Micro Incorporateds Oppositions To BlueGems Motion For Partial Summary Judgment And Motion For Terminating Sanctions; and (11) [Proposed] Order Granting Application To Seal Certain Documents Filed In Support Of Defendant Trend Micro Incorporateds Oppositions To BlueGems Motion For Partial Summary Judgment And Motion For Terminating Sanctions.. (Yorio, Robert) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Order 90 (REDACTED) filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (Yorio, Robert) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment 89 (REDACTED) filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (Yorio, Robert) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc. of Four Oppositions to Defendant's Four MSJs; Decls ISO of MSJs; Statements of Genuine Issues Re MSJs; Apps to File Under Seal; Proposed Orders Re Apps to File Under Seal. (Lawrence, Lisa) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 100 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Christine S. Watson in Support of Trend Micro Incorporated's Motions for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5, Part 6, Part 7, Part 8, Part 9)(mat) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 99 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT- Trend Micro Incorporated's Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of its Motion Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication or Copyright Infringement And Misappropriation Of Intellectual Property Claims. (mat) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 98 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT- Trend Micro Incorporated's Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment or, In the Alternative, Summary Adjudication of Breach of Contract Claim. (mat) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 97 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT- Trend Micro Incorporated's Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff Bluegem Security, Inc.'s Fifth Claim for Intentional Interference with Prospective Economic Advantage and Sixth Claim for Negligent Interference with Prospective Economic Advantage. (mat) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 96 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT- Trend Micro Incorporated's Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Judgment or Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication Based on Limitation of Liability. (mat) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER DENYING Ex Parte Application to Compel Deposition, 70 by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: On April 8, 2010, plaintiff Bluegem Security, Inc. filed an ex parte application to compel the deposition of Eva Chen, the Chief Executive Officer of defendant Trend Micro Incorporated. Defendant filed an opposition to the ex parte application on the following day. After having reviewed the documents filed in support of and in opposition to the application, the Court denies the application for the following reasons: Plaintiffs ex parte application fails to demonstrate that plaintiff exercised the requisite diligence in bringing this matter to the Courts attention. Moreover, the Court finds that plaintiff has failed to demonstrate irreparable injury or prejudice, given that plaintiff has not demonstrated that defendants Chief Executive Officer has direct knowledge of any relevant facts. IT IS SO ORDERED. (sl) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 94 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Lisa M. Lawrence in Support of Plaintiff Bluegem Security, Inc.'s Motion for Terminating Sanctions, or, In the Alternative, Issue Sanctions. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5, Part 6, Part 7)(mat) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 93 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT- Declarations of Joe Park and Marc E. Masters in Support of Bluegem Security, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5, Part 6, Part 7, Part 8, Part 9, Part 10, Part 11, Part 12, Part 13, Part 14)(mat) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 92 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT- Order Granting Bluegem Security, Inc's Application to file Under Seal Plaintiff Bluegem's Notice of Motion and Motion for Terminating Sanction and Memorandum and Points and Authorities. (mat) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 91 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT- Plaintiff Bluegem Security, Inc.'s Application to file Under seal Plaintiff Bluegem's Notice of Motion and Motion for Terminating Sanction and Memorandum and Points and Authorities. (mat) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 90 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT- Plaintiff Bluegem Security, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Terminating Sanctions or, in the Alternative, Issue Sanctions; Memorandum of Points and Authorities. (mat) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 89 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT- Plaintiff Bluegem Security, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities. (mat) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 88 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT- Order Granting Bluegem Security, Inc.'s Application to file Under Seal Plaintiff Bluegem's Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Supporting Documents. (mat) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 87 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT- Plaintiff Bluegem Security, Inc.'s Application to File Under Seal the Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Supporting Documents.(mat) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION for Order for to seal certain documents filed in support of motions for Trend Micro Incoporateds Motion for partial summary judgment filed by defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. Lodged order. (lc) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated of (1) Trend Micro Incorporateds Statement Of Uncontroverted Facts And Conclusions Of Law In Support Of Its Motion For Summary Judgment Or Summary Adjudication Based On Limitation Of Liability; (2) Trend Micro Incorporateds Statement Of Uncontroverted Facts And Conclusions Of Law In Support Of Its Motion For Summary Judgment On Plaintiff Bluegem Security, Inc.S Fifth Claim For Intentional Interference With Prospective Economic Advantage And Sixth Claim For Negligent Interference With Prospective Economic Advantage; (3) Trend Micro Incorporateds Statement Of Uncontroverted Facts And Conclusions Of Law In Support Of Its Motion For Summary Judgment Or, In The Aternative, Summmary Adjudication Of Breach Of Contract Claim; (4) Trend Micro Incorporateds Statement Of Undisputed Facts In Support Of Its Motion For Summary Adjudication Of Copyright Infringement And Misappropriation Of Intellectual Property Claims; (5) Declaration Of Christine S. Watson In Support Of Trend Micro Incorporateds: (a) Motion For Summary Judgment Or Summary Adjudication Based On Limitation Of Liability, (b) Motion For Summary Judgment On Plaintiff Bluegem Security, Inc.S Fifth Claim For Intentional Interference With Prospective Economic Advantage And Sixth Claim For Negligent Interference With Prospective Economic Advantage, (c) Motion For Summary Judgment Or, In The Aternative, Summmary Adjudication Of Breach Of Contract Claim, and (d) Motion For Summary Adjudication Of Copyright Infringement And Misappropriation Of Intellectual Property Claims; (6) Defendants Application to File Under Seal; and (7) [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants Application to File Under Seal.. (Yorio, Robert) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Copyright Infringement And Misappropriation Of Intellectual Property Claims 83 filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (Yorio, Robert) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Copyright Infringement And Misappropriation Of Intellectual Property Claims filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. Motion set for hearing on 5/10/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D Wright II. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Yorio, Robert) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs Breach Of Contract Claim 81 filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (Yorio, Robert) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs Breach Of Contract Claim filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. Motion set for hearing on 5/10/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D Wright II. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Yorio, Robert) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Alain Collins in Support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs Fifth Claim For Intentional Interference With Prospective Economic Relations And Sixth Claim For Negligent Interference With Prospective Economic Relations 77 filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (Yorio, Robert) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Robert J. Yorio in Support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs Fifth Claim For Intentional Interference With Prospective Economic Relations And Sixth Claim For Negligent Interference With Prospective Economic Relations 77 filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (Yorio, Robert) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs Fifth Claim For Intentional Interference With Prospective Economic Relations And Sixth Claim For Negligent Interference With Prospective Economic Relations 77 filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (Yorio, Robert) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs Fifth Claim For Intentional Interference With Prospective Economic Relations And Sixth Claim For Negligent Interference With Prospective Economic Relations filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. Motion set for hearing on 5/10/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D Wright II. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Yorio, Robert) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Based On Contractual Limitation Of Liability 75 filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (Yorio, Robert) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Based On Contractual Limitation Of Liability filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. Motion set for hearing on 5/10/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D Wright II. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Yorio, Robert) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc. of Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Terminating Sanctions, or, in the Alternative, Issue Sanctions; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Lisa M. Lawrence; Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Terminating Sanctions, or, in the Alternative, Issue Sanctions. (Lawrence, Lisa) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc. of Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Statement of Uncontroverted Facts; Declarations of Joe Park and Marc E. Masters; Proposed Order Grating Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Lawrence, Lisa) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Christine S. Watson in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Deposition of Eva Chen 70 filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (Watson, Christine) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Deposition of Eva Chen 70 filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (Watson, Christine) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Deposition of Eva Chen filed by Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Proposed Order)(Lawrence, Lisa) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II, re Stipulation 68 continues the following dates: last day to designate Rebuttal Experts to be called at trial and to provide Expert Reports: March 30, 2010; Fact Discovery Cut-Off as to Depositions Only: April 26, 2010. (lc) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to April 26, 2010 filed by Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lawrence, Lisa) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER DENYING EX PARTES by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: denying 61 Ex Parte Application for Sanctions; denying 62 Ex Parte Application to Compel Deposition: Plaintiff has failed to demonstrate good cause for not complying with Local Rule 37. Therefore, plaintiff's applications are denied without prejudice. (jm) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Marc E. Masters and Ekwan E. Rhow on behalf of Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc., Counter Defendant BlueGem Security, Inc.. Filed by Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc., Counter Defendant BlueGem Security, Inc. (Masters, Marc) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Deposition of Eva Chen and Request for Expenses 62 filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Watson)(Watson, Christine) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Sanctions Automatic Sanctions for Failure to Comply with Rule 26 Mandatory Disclosures ; To Compel Defendant's Production of Documents; and Request for Expenses 61 filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Watson Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Watson, Christine) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amendment to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Deposition of Eva Chen and Request for Expenses 62 Declaration of Joe Park in Support of Ex Parte Application to Compel the Deposition of Eva Chen filed by Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc.. (Lawrence, Lisa) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Deposition of Eva Chen and Request for Expenses filed by plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Proposed Order)(Lawrence, Lisa) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EX PARTE APPLICATION for Sanctions Automatic Sanctions for Failure to Comply with Rule 26 Mandatory Disclosures ; To Compel Defendant's Production of Documents; and Request for Expenses filed by plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Proposed Order)(Lawrence, Lisa) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER upon Stipulation 59 extends dicovery cutoff dates: Last day to designate Affirmative Experts to be called at trial and to provide Expert Reports: 3/1/10; Last day to designate Rebuttal Experts and to provide Rebuttal Expert Reports: 3/22/10 by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint STIPULATION for Discovery as to Experts filed by Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc..(Lawrence, Lisa) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D Wright, II: Court grants in part 40 Defendant Trend Micro Incorporateds Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings.The Court GRANTS Defendants Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as to the Third Claim on preemption grounds and GRANTS Defendants Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as to the Fourth Claim for failure to state a claim for which relief can be granted. Defendants Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as to the Fourth Claim on preemption grounds is DENIED as moot. (lc) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II: Vacating Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 40 set for 12/7/09 at 1:30 p.m. and order will issue. (tad) (Entered: 12/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS)by Judge Otis D Wright, II: Due to the Court's granting of Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Strike Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 47 , Defendant's instant Ex Parte Application for Protective Order and Sanctions is DENIED as moot. Further, to protect any sensitive information that may still remain in the file, the court clerk is instructed to remove from the docket any documents pertaining to Plaintiff's stricken Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 43 and 44 . In addition, going forward the parties are instructed to strictly adhere to their stipulated protective order filed July 14, 2009 31 . Furthermore, the hearing on Defendants Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 40 (Filed 10/15/09), presently scheduled for November 16, 2009 at 1:30 p.m., is hereby CONTINUED to Monday, December 7, 2009 at 1:30 p.m. (lc) (Entered: 11/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY in support of MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc.'s Third and Fourth Claims 40 filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (Wilson, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Protective Order and Sanctions re 43 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Protective Order and Sanctions re 43 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 50 filed by Counter Defendant BlueGem Security, Inc., Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc.. (Lawrence, Lisa) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D Wright, II: The Court, having considered Defendants Ex Parte Application, and deeming a hearing on the matter unnecessary, hereby rules as follows: Defendants Application is GRANTED 47 . The Court VACATES Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 43 . The motion hearing scheduled for November 16, 2009 at 1:30 p.m. is alsoVACATED.Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is continued until a time of Plaintiffs choosing, but no earlier than April 12, 2010 and no later than May 10, 2010. If Plaintiff so chooses, it may re-file the motion presently on file, or may file a new motion incorporating whatever evidence further discovery may yield. Finally, it is worth reminding Defendants counsel of their Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 obligations. If further discovery proves to be pointless in light of the arguments currently raised by Plaintiff, amotion for Rule 11 sanctions will most certainly be considered. (lc) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike BlueGem's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Statement (Motion related), Statement (Motion related) 44 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to First Cause of Action for Breach of Contract 43 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike BlueGem's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Statement (Motion related), Statement (Motion related) 44 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to First Cause of Action for Breach of Contract 43 47 filed by Counter Defendant BlueGem Security, Inc., Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc.. (Lawrence, Lisa) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Christine S. Watson in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Protective Order and Sanctions re 43 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Protective Order and Sanctions re 43 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 50 filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (Watson, Christine) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Protective Order and Sanctions re 43 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Motion for Protective Order and Sanctions, # 2 Proposed Order)(Watson, Christine) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Robert J. Yorio in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike BlueGem's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Statement (Motion related), Statement (Motion related) 44 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to First Cause of Action for Breach of Contract 43 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike BlueGem's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Statement (Motion related), Statement (Motion related) 44 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to First Cause of Action for Breach of Contract 43 47 filed by Counter Claimant Trend Mirco Incorporated, Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (Wilson, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike BlueGem's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Statement (Motion related), Statement (Motion related) 44 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to First Cause of Action for Breach of Contract 43 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike BlueGem's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Statement (Motion related), Statement (Motion related) 44 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to First Cause of Action for Breach of Contract 43 47 filed by Counter Claimant Trend Mirco Incorporated, Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (Wilson, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EX PARTE APPLICATION to Strike BlueGem's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Statement (Motion related), Statement (Motion related) 44 , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to First Cause of Action for Breach of Contract 43 filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Trend Micro's Ex Parte Application to Strike or Continue Hearing on Plaintiff BlueGem's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Wilson, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Otis D Wright, II:Hearing on Motion of Defendant Trend Micro Incorporated for Judgment on the Pleadings 40 presently scheduled for November 9, 2009 at 1:30 p.m., is hereby CONTINUED to Monday, November 16, 2009 at 1:30 p.m. (lc) (Entered: 10/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: proposed statement of uncontroverted facts are proposed documents to be approved by the Judge and should have been submitted as a separate attachment to main document. RE: Statement (Motion related), Statement (Motion related) 44 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lc) (Entered: 10/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 44 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT-STATEMENT of Proposed Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to First Cause of Action for Breach of Contract 43 filed by Counter Defendant BlueGem Security, Inc., Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc.. (Lawrence, Lisa) Modified on 11/13/2009 (lc). Modified on 11/13/2009 (lc). (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 43 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT-NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to First Cause of Action for Breach of Contract filed by plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/16/2009 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D Wright II. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order BlueGem's Proposed Order Granting Partial Summary Judgment, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Scott Weiss in Support of Bluegem's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits to the Declaration of Scott Weis in Support of Bluegem's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 4 Declaration Declaration of Joe Park in Support of Bluegem's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 5 Exhibit Exhibits to Declaration of Joe Park in Support of Bluegems Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 6 Declaration Declaration of Andy Parng in Support of Bluegems Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 7 Exhibit Exhibits to Declaration of Andy Parng in Support of Bluegems Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Lawrence, Lisa) Modified on 11/13/2009 (lc). Modified on 11/13/2009 (lc). (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc.'s Third and Fourth Claims 40 filed by Counter Defendant BlueGem Security, Inc., Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc.. (Lawrence, Lisa) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc.'s Third and Fourth Claims 40 filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (Watson, Christine) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc.'s Third and Fourth Claims filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. Motion set for hearing on 11/9/2009 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D Wright II. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Watson, Christine) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Trend Micro's First Amended Counterclaim filed by plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc..(Lawrence, Lisa) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint 15 and First Amended COUNTERCLAIM against BlueGem Security, Inc. filed by defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated.(lc) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Re: Filing of First Amended Counterclaim 35 by Judge Otis D Wright II. The Court grants Defendant and Counterclaimant Trend Micro Incorporated leave to file its First Amended Counterclaim. Defendant shall file its First Amended Counterclaim in compliance with General Order 08-02 and Local Rule 3-2. (sch) (Entered: 09/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Stipulation to Amend/Correct 35 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Watson, Christine) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION to AMEND Answer to Complaint 17 filed by defendant and counterclaimant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Watson, Christine) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: PDF is Notice of errata regarding exhibit A to second amended complaint. 1) Wrong event as to the errata portion: Notice (Other), of which the Correct event is Errata (find event under Miscellaneous Filings (Non-Motion). 2) However, as to the new executed exhibit A: Court does not insert or replace this exhibit to the second amended complaint. Since this is an exhibit to an initiating document, Per G.O. 08-02 as the Exhibit A to the initiating second amended complaint, it is to have its own formal title page, and is Not e-filed but to be Separately and Manually filed with civil intake: RE: Notice (Other) 33 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lc) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Notice of Errata filed by Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc.. (Lawrence, Lisa) (Entered: 08/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to CounterClaim.(Lawrence, Lisa) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (See attached) (jm) (Entered: 07/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright II: Jury trial: 6/29/10 9:00 AM; File final trial exhibit stipulation: 6/24/10; hearing on motions in limine: 6/21/10/10 4:00 PM; Final Pretrial Conference: 6/7/10 3:30 PM; motions in limine, proposed voir dire questions and proposed voir dire questions and agreed to statement of case: 6/7/10; lodge Pretrial conference order and pretrial exhibit stipulation, file contentions of fact and law, exhibit and witness lists, status report regarding settlement, agreed upon set of instructions and verdict forms, joint statement regarding disputed instructions verdicts etc: 6/1/10; last date to conduct settlement conference: 5/3/10; last day for hearing motions: 5/10/10; discovery cutoff: 4/12/10 last date to amend pleadings or add parties: 9/28/09. (lc) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II Approving the NOTICE AND REQUEST of Settlement Procedure Selection (Sp3) requiring the parties to appear before a retired judicial officer or other private or non-profit dispute resolution body. (lc) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES OF (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Vacating Scheduling Conference by Judge Otis D Wright II. The Court is in receipt of the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report. The Court has reviewed the report and deems a scheduling conference unnecessary. Accordingly, the scheduling conference presently scheduled for July 6, 2009 is hereby VACATED, and no appearances are necessary. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. (sch) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: striking No. 23 Request for Protective Order filed 06/22/09: 1)Proposed document was not submitted as separate attachment; 2) Stipulation filed before the Court signed. (jm) (Entered: 07/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Watson, Christine) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer filed. The previously assigned Magistrate Judge is no longer available. Pursuant to directive of the Chief Magistrate Judge and in accordance with the rules of this Court, the case has been returned to the Clerk for reassignment. This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for any discovery matters that may be referred. Case number will now read CV 09-01492 ODW (FFMx). (rn) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Wrong event: Misc(report); Correct Specific Event:Joint Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan RE: Report 22 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lc) (Entered: 06/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST for Protective Order filed by defendant and counterclaimant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (Watson, Christine) (Entered: 06/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RULE 26 JOINT REPORT filed by Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc.. (Lawrence, Lisa) (Entered: 06/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Lisa Marie Lawrence counsel for Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc.. Changing e-mail to lisa@lurieparklaw.com. Filed by plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc. (Lawrence, Lisa) (Entered: 06/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kenneth B Wilson on behalf of Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated (Wilson, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christine S. Watson on behalf of Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated (Watson, Christine) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER setting Scheduling Conference set for 7/6/2009 at 01:30 PM; compliance of FRCP 26(f) and filing of report and other instructions. Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright II. (sch) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWERJURY DEMAND. TREND MICRO INCORPORATTED'S ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM; JURY TRIAL DEMAND filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Trend Mirco Incorporated.(Yorio, Robert) (Entered: 05/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge Otis D Wright, II: Pursuant to General Order 08-02 and L.R. 3-2, all manually filed civil initiating documents shall be submitted in electronic form (.pdf format only) within twenty four hours of the date the civil initiating document was filed.Plaintiff is hereby ordered to submit the electronic form (.pdf format only) of its filed stamped Second Amended Complaint 15 (Filed 5/5/09) forthwith. Failure to do so will result in a hearing before this Court and imposition of sanctions pursuant to Local Rule 83-7(a). (lc) Modified on 5/8/2009 (lc). (Entered: 05/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated amending Amended Complaint, 10 ,filed by plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc. (lc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/14/2009: # 1 exhibits to second amended complaint) (lc). (Entered: 05/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER RE: Filing of Second Amended Complaint and Defendant's Response Thereto 12 by Judge Otis D Wright II. Pursuant to the Parties' Stipulation to File Second Amended Complaint and Response thereto: The Court grants plaintiff leave to file its Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall file its Second Amended Complaint in compliance with General Order 08-02 and Local Rule 3-2. Defendant Trend Micro Incorporated (Defendant) shall have the statutory period prescribed in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to answer or otherwise respond to the Second Amended Complaint. (Note: Changes Made by the Court). (sch) (Entered: 04/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Stipulation to Amend/Correct 12 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint Exhibits)(Park, Daniel) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION to AMEND Amended Complaint, 10 filed by plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Re Filing of Second Amended Complaint)(Park, Daniel) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II: granting 8 Request to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Daniel E Park of Lurie & Park LLP for BlueGem Security, Inc.. Attorney Eric E Bronson terminated (lc) Modified on 4/21/2010 (lc). (Entered: 04/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated; Party Does terminated amending complaint within Notice of Removal, 1 ; JURY DEMAND,filed by plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc. (lc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/14/2009: # 1 amended complaint part 2, # 2 amended complaint part 3, # 3 amended complaint part 4, # 4 exhibits) (lc). (Entered: 04/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS AND ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II: striking 6 Request to Substitute Attorney. A second request for substitution with deficiency cured was filed and appears as docket 8 . (lc) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Second REQUEST to Substitute attorney Daniel E. Park in place of attorney Eric E. Bronson filed by Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney)(Bronson, Eric) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Request and proposed order forms shared 1 PDF; all proposed orders are to be submitted as a Separate Attachment to main document. RE: First REQUEST to Substitute attorney Daniel E. Park in place of attorney Eric E. Bronson 6 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (lc) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        First REQUEST to Substitute attorney Daniel E. Park in place of attorney Eric E. Bronson filed by Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc.. (Park, Daniel) Modified on 4/13/2009 (lc). (STRICKEN PER 4/10/09 ORDER) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Trend Mirco Incorporated answer now due 4/10/2009, filed by Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc..(Bronson, Eric) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FIRST STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by Plaintiff BlueGem Security, Inc..(Bronson, Eric) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Otis D Wright II. Read This Order Carefully. It Controls This Case And Differs In Some Respects From The Local Rules. (sch) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated. (ghap) (ds). (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles, case number BC406717 with conformed copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge Otis D Wright, II, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey W. Johnson. (Filing fee $ 350: FEE PAID.), filed by defendant Trend Mirco Incorporated.(ghap) (ds). (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 217 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?