Ernesto Diaz
Bankruptcy Case California Eastern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 07-28426
District Judge Christopher M. Klein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 9:13 PM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Ernesto Diaz, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Timothy J. Walsh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
419 Banning
Vallejo, CA 94591
SSN / ITIN: xxx-xx-2807dbaValley Diaz Construction and DevelopmentfdbaValley Diaz Barba constructionfdbaDiaz and Sons inc Timothy James Walsh +1 707 429 1990 +8943 894 894 3210 fflaw@sbcglobal.net
Space Timothy James Walsh +1 707 429 1990 +8943 894 894 3210 fflaw@sbcglobal.net
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "Office of the U.S. Trustee"
No Logo Sara L. Kistler, U.S. Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Allen C. Massey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allen C. Massey +1 916 930 2100
No Logo Richard J. Hanf, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of J. Russell Cunningham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Russell Cunningham +1 916 443 2051 +1 916 443 2651 rcunningham@dnlc.net
  Entries (116) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 680 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service of 678 Notice of Withdrawal [DNL-18] (fdis) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 679 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
    Certificate/Proof of Service of 674 Motion/Application to Sell [DNL-21], 675 Notice of Hearing, 676 Declaration, 677 Exhibit(s) (kwis) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 678 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
      Notice of Withdrawal Re: 655 Motion/Application for Turnover of Property [DNL-18] (jrus) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 677 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None
        Exhibit(s) to 676 Declaration [DNL-21] (fdis) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 676 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None
          Declaration of Richard J. Hanf in support of 674 Motion/Application to Sell [DNL-21] (fdis) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 675 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None
            Notice of Hearing Re: 674 Motion/Application to Sell [DNL-21] to be held on 12/14/2010 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (fdis) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 674 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None
              Motion/Application to Sell [DNL-21] Filed by Trustee Richard J. Hanf (fdis) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 673 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None
                Certificate/Proof of Service of 669 Motion/Application to Sell [DNL-20], 670 Notice of Hearing, 671 Declaration, 672 Exhibit(s) (fdis) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 672 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None
                  Exhibit(s) to 671 Declaration [DNL-20] (fdis) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 671 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None
                    Declaration of Richard J. Hanf in support of 669 Motion/Application to Sell [DNL-20] (fdis) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 670 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None
                      Notice of Hearing Re: 669 Motion/Application to Sell [DNL-20] to be held on 12/7/2010 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (fdis) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 669 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None
                        Motion/Application to Sell [DNL-20] Filed by Trustee Richard J. Hanf (fdis) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 668 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
                          Certificate/Proof of Service (fdis) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 667 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                            Certificate/Proof of Service of 666 Notice of Unpaid Quarterly Fees/Statement of Non-Payment of U.S. Trustee Quarterly Fees (smis) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 666 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                              Notice of Unpaid Quarterly Fees/Statement of Non-Payment of U.S. Trustee Quarterly Fees (smis) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 659 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None
                                Certificate/Proof of Service of 655 Motion/Application for Turnover of Property [DNL-18], 656 Notice of Hearing, 657 Declaration, 658 Exhibit(s) (fdis) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 658 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None
                                  Exhibit(s) to 657 Declaration [DNL-18] (fdis) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 657 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None
                                    Declaration of Richard J. Hanf in support of 655 Motion/Application for Turnover of Property [DNL-18] (fdis) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 656 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None
                                      Notice of Hearing Re: 655 Motion/Application for Turnover of Property [DNL-18] to be held on 8/3/2010 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (fdis) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 655 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None
                                        Motion/Application for Turnover of Mexico Property [DNL-18] Filed by Trustee Richard J. Hanf (fdis) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 652 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                          Civil Minute Order Granting 639 Motion/Application for Compensation [RJH-26] (fdis) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 651 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: None
                                            Certificate/Proof of Service of 650 Notice of Entry [DNL-17] (fdis) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 650 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: None
                                              Notice of Entry of 649 Order on Motion/Application for Compensation [DNL-17] (fdis) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 649 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                Order Granting Interim Compensation Re: 633 Motion/Application for Compensation [DNL-17] (bres) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 648 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                  Civil Minutes -- Hearing Held Under Advisement Re: 633 Motion/Application for Compensation [DNL-17] for J. Russell Cunningham, Trustee's Attorney, Fee: $12,210.00, Expenses: $380.83. SUBMITTED (tjas) (Entered: 03/30/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 647 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                    Certificate/Proof of Service of 646 Notice of Entry [RJH-25] (bres) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 646 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                      Notice of Entry of 638 Order on Motion/Application for Compensation, Order on Amended Motion/Application [RJH-25] (bres) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 645 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                        Certificate/Proof of Service of 644 Report of Sale [DNL-15] (bres) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 644 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                          Report of Sale by Trustee [DNL-15] (bres) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 643 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                            Certificate/Proof of Service of 639 Motion/Application for Compensation [RJH-26] for Gonzales and Sisto, LLP, Accountant, Fee: $6342.50, Expenses: $4.95., 641 Exhibit(s) (bres) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 642 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                              Certificate/Proof of Service of 640 Notice of Hearing [RJH-26] (bres) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 641 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                Exhibit(s) in support of 639 Motion/Application for Compensation [RJH-26] for Gonzales and Sisto, LLP, Accountant, Fee: $6342.50, Expenses: $4.95. (bres) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 640 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  Notice of Hearing Re: 639 Motion/Application for Compensation [RJH-26] for Gonzales and Sisto, LLP, Accountant, Fee: $6342.50, Expenses: $4.95. to be held on 4/13/2010 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (bres) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 639 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    Motion/Application for Compensation [RJH-26] for Gonzales and Sisto, LLP, Accountant, Fee: $6342.50, Expenses: $4.95. Filed by Trustee Richard J. Hanf (bres) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 638 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      Civil Minute Order Granting 628 Amended Motion/Application [RJH-25] Re: 623 Motion/Application for Compensation [RJH-25] (bres) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 637 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        Certificate/Proof of Service of 633 Motion/Application for Compensation [DNL-17] for J. Russell Cunningham, Trustee's Attorney, Chapter 11 Fees: $12,210.00, Expenses: $380.83 and Chapter 7 Fees: $66,697.50, Expenses: $3,221.56, 634 Notice of Hearing, 635 Declaration, 636 Exhibit(s) (bres) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 636 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          Exhibit(s) in support of 635 Declaration [DNL-17] (bres) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 635 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            Declaration of J. Russell Cunningham in support of 633 Motion/Application for Compensation [DNL-17] for J. Russell Cunningham, Trustee's Attorney, Chapter 11 Fees: $12,210.00, Expenses: $380.83 and Chapter 7 Fees: $66,697.50, Expenses: $3,221.56 (bres) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 634 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              Notice of Hearing Re: 633 Motion/Application for Compensation [DNL-17] for J. Russell Cunningham, Trustee's Attorney Chapter 11 Fees: $12,210.00, Expenses: $380.83 and Chapter 7 Fees: $66,697.50, Expenses: $3,221.56 to be held on 3/30/2010 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (bres) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 633 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                Motion/Application for Compensation [DNL-17] for J. Russell Cunningham, Trustee's Attorney, Chapter 11 Fees: $12,210.00, Expenses: $380.83., Chapter 7 Fees: $66,697.50, Expenses: $3,221.56 Filed by Attorney J. Russell Cunningham (bres) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 632 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                  Certificate/Proof of Service of 631 Notice of Entry [DNL-15] (bres) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 631 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    Notice of Entry of 630 Order on Motion/Application to Sell [DNL-15] (bres) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 630 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      Order Granting 594 Motion/Application To Sell [DNL-15] (bres) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 629 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        Certificate/Proof of Service of 628 Amended Motion/Application [RJH-25] Re: (bres) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 628 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          Amended Motion/Application [RJH-25] Re: 623 Motion/Application for Compensation Filed by Trustee Richard J. Hanf (bres) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 627 Filed: 2/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            Certificate/Proof of Service of 623 Motion/Application for Compensation [RJH-25] for West Auctions, LLC, Auctioneer, Fee: $13,402.79, Expenses: $0.00., 625 Exhibit(s) (msws) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 626 Filed: 2/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                              Certificate/Proof of Service of 624 Notice of Hearing [RJH-25] (msws) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 625 Filed: 2/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                Exhibit(s) in support of 623 Motion/Application for Compensation [RJH-25] for West Auctions, LLC, Auctioneer, Fee: $13,402.79, Expenses: $0.00. (msws) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 624 Filed: 2/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Notice of Hearing Re: 623 Motion/Application for Compensation [RJH-25] for West Auctions, LLC, Auctioneer, Fee: $13,402.79, Expenses: $0.00. to be held on 3/9/2010 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (msws) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 623 Filed: 2/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Motion/Application for Compensation [RJH-25] for West Auctions, LLC, Auctioneer, Fee: $13,402.79, Expenses: $0.00. Filed by Trustee Richard J. Hanf (msws) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 622 Filed: 2/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Certificate/Proof of Service of 621 Document (msws) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 621 Filed: 2/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Document - Auctioneer's Statement Filed by Auctioneer West Auctions, LLC (msws) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 620 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Civil Minutes -- Hearing Re: 601 Motion/Application to Compel [RJH-20]. MOTION/APPLICATION/OBJECTION WITHDRAWN (tjas) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 619 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Certificate/Proof of Service of 617 Declaration, 618 Declaration [RJH-20] (bres) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 618 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Declaration of Felipe Curiel in support of 601 Motion/Application to Compel [RJH-20] (bres) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 617 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Declaration of John Dobles in support of 601 Motion/Application to Compel [RJH-20] (bres) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 616 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Civil Minutes -- Hearing Held/Concluded Re: 594 Motion/Application to Sell [DNL-15] GRANTED (tjas) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 615 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Certificate/Proof of Service of 614 Declaration [RJH-20] (bres) INCORRECT DCN ON PLEADING (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 614 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Declaration of Ernesto Diaz in opposition to 601 Motion/Application to Compel [RJH-20] (bres) INCORRECT DCN ON PLEADING (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 613 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Certificate/Proof of Service of 612 Notice of Trustee Filing an Estate California Income Tax Return [RJH-24] (avos) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 612 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Notice of Trustee Filing an Estate California Income Tax Return [RJH-24] (avos) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 611 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Certificate/Proof of Service of 610 Notice of Trustee Filing an Estate Federal Income Tax Return [RJH-23] (avos) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 610 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Notice of Trustee Filing an Estate Federal Income Tax Return [RJH-23] (avos) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 609 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Certificate/Proof of Service of 608 Notice of Trustee Filing an Estate California Income Tax Return [RJH-22] (avos) Modified on 1/19/2010 (avos). (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 608 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Notice of Trustee Filing an Estate California Income Tax Return [RJH-22] (avos) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 607 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Certificate/Proof of Service of 606 Notice of Trustee Filing an Estate Federal Income Tax Return [RJH-21] (avos) Modified on 1/19/2010 (avos). (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 606 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Notice of Trustee Filing an Estate Federal Income Tax Return [RJH-21] (avos) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 605 Filed: 1/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Certificate/Proof of Service of 601 Motion/Application to Compel [RJH-20], 602 Notice of Hearing, 603 Declaration, 604 Exhibit(s) (avos) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604 Filed: 1/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Exhibit(s) in support of 601 Motion/Application to Compel [RJH-20] (avos) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603 Filed: 1/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Richard J. Hanf in support of 601 Motion/Application to Compel [RJH-20] (avos) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 602 Filed: 1/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Notice of Hearing Re: 601 Motion/Application to Compel [RJH-20] to be held on 1/27/2010 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (avos) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 601 Filed: 1/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Motion/Application to Compel [RJH-20] Filed by Trustee Richard J. Hanf (avos) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Certificate/Proof of Service of 594 Motion/Application for Sale of Property Under Section 363(b) [DNL-15], 595 Notice of Hearing, 596 Declaration, 597 Exhibit(s), 598 Exhibit(s), 599 Exhibit(s) (avos) (Entered: 12/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 599 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit(s) Re: 594 Motion/Application for Sale of Property Under Section 363(b) [DNL-15] (avos) (Entered: 12/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Exhibit(s) Re: 594 Motion/Application for Sale of Property Under Section 363(b) [DNL-15] (avos) (Entered: 12/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 597 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit(s) to 594 Motion/Application for Sale of Property Under Section 363(b) [DNL-15] (avos) (Entered: 12/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Richard J. Hanf in support of 594 Motion/Application for Sale of Property Under Section 363(b) [DNL-15] (avos) (Entered: 12/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Hearing Re: 594 Motion/Application for Sale of Property Under Section 363(b) [DNL-15] to be held on 1/27/2010 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (avos) (Entered: 12/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 594 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Motion/Application for Sale of Property Under Section 363(b) [DNL-15] Filed by Trustee Richard J. Hanf (avos) (Entered: 12/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Certificate/Proof of Service of 36 Notice (smis) (Entered: 12/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Unavailability of Counsel (smis) (Entered: 12/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate/Proof of Service of 34 Request for Special Notice (smis) (Entered: 12/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditor William Corbett (smis) (Entered: 12/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Report of Trustee at 341 Meeting. Continued Meeting of Creditors to be held on 1/17/2008 at 09:00 AM at Office of the U.S. Trustee. (mfrs) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate/Proof of Service (cmcs) (Entered: 12/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Service of 30 Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 12/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment as Transmitted to BNC for Service Re: 29 Order Denying 17 Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Documents (mfrs) (mfrs) (Entered: 12/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Order Denying 17 Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Documents (mfrs) (Entered: 12/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate/Proof of Service of 27 Document (mfrs) (Entered: 12/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Document - Statement of Creditors Non-Interest in Solicitation to Appoint Committee of Unsecured Creditors Filed by U.S. Trustee Sara L. Kistler (mfrs) (Entered: 12/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Ernesto Diaz Re: 25 Response/Reply (bres) (Entered: 11/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Response/Reply Filed by Debtor Ernesto Diaz Re: 17 Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Documents (bres) (Entered: 11/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Tax Documents for the Year(s) 2005 (bres) (Entered: 11/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditor Capital Finance (mfrs) (Entered: 11/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re: 1 Voluntary Petition, ; Status Conference now to be held on 1/29/2008 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (mfrs) (Entered: 11/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Report of Trustee at 341 Meeting. Continued Meeting of Creditors to be held on 12/14/2007 at 09:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (mfrs) (Entered: 11/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate/Proof of Service of 19 Status Report (mfrs) (Entered: 11/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Status Report Filed by Debtor Ernesto Diaz (mfrs) (Entered: 11/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Service of Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Documents as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 11/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Documents as Transmitted to BNC for Service. Hearing to be held on 12/4/2007 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (bres) (Entered: 10/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate/Proof of Service of 15 Declaration (fdis) (Entered: 10/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Timothy J. Walsh (fdis) (Entered: 10/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate/Proof of Service of 8 Order Scheduling Deadlines (fdis) (Entered: 10/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Timothy J. Walsh in support of 12 Motion/Application for Compensation [TJW-1] for Timothy J. Walsh, Debtor's Attorney, Fee: $5,000.00, Expenses: $., 12 Motion/Application to Employ Timothy J. Walsh as Attorney For Debtor [TJW-1] (fdis) (Entered: 10/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion/Application for Partial Disbursement Of The Initial Fee [TJW-1] for Timothy J. Walsh, Debtor's Attorney, In The Amount Of $5,000.00 Filed by Attorney Timothy J. Walsh (fdis) (Entered: 10/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate/Proof of Service of 10 Request for Special Notice (mfrs) (Entered: 10/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request for Special Notice Filed by Creditor America's Servicing Company (mfrs) (Entered: 10/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Service of Notice of Meeting of Creditors as served by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 10/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Scheduling Deadlines: Disclosure of Single Asset Real Estate; Filing Preliminary Status Report; and Preliminary Status Conference; Status Conference to be held on 11/20/2007 at 10:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (bres) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Meeting of Creditors as Transmitted to BNC (bres) (Entered: 10/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice Re: Meeting of Creditors (bres) (Entered: 10/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Credit Counseling as to Debtor (bres) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statement of Social Security Number(s) (sges) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Master Address List (auto) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Incomplete Filing (sges) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Missing Document(s): Exhibit D w/Certificate for Debtor; List of Equity Security Holders; Balance Sheet due by 10/25/2007. Cash Flow Statement due by 10/25/2007. Tax Return; Statement of Operations due by 10/25/2007. Document(s) due by 10/25/2007. Chapter 11 Plan (Small Business) due by 4/7/2008. (sges) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 68 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?