Heebe et al v. United States of America

Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:10-cv-03452
District Judge Helen G. Berrigan, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Helen G. Berrigan
Last Updated December 6, 2017 at 4:09 PM EST (7.4 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo A. J. Ward, Petitioner

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert N. Habans, Jr. +1 225 757 0225 +1 225 757 0398 bobhab@bellsouth.net
No Logo Fred Heebe Investments, Petitioner

Represented by Schonekas, Evans, McGoey & McEachin, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William P. Gibbens +1 504 680 6050 billy@semmlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle D. Schonekas +1 504 680 6050 +1 504 680 6051 kyle@semmlaw.com
No Logo Frederick R. Heebe, Petitioner

Represented by Schonekas, Evans, McGoey & McEachin, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William P. Gibbens +1 504 680 6050 billy@semmlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle D. Schonekas +1 504 680 6050 +1 504 680 6051 kyle@semmlaw.com
No Logo Heebe & Heebe, P.L.C., Petitioner
No Logo Live Oak Homes Corporation, Petitioner

Represented by Schonekas, Evans, McGoey & McEachin, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William P. Gibbens +1 504 680 6050 billy@semmlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle D. Schonekas +1 504 680 6050 +1 504 680 6051 kyle@semmlaw.com
No Logo Riverbirch Inc., Petitioner

Represented by Crull, Castaing & Lilly

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward J. Castaing, Jr. +1 504 581 7700 +1 504 581 5523 ecastaing@cclhlaw.com
No Logo Shadowlake Management, LLC, Petitioner

Represented by Schonekas, Evans, McGoey & McEachin, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William P. Gibbens +1 504 680 6050 billy@semmlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle D. Schonekas +1 504 680 6050 +1 504 680 6051 kyle@semmlaw.com
No Logo Willow Inc., Petitioner
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. McMahon +1 202 305 3988 +1 202 514 0280 michael.j.mcmahon@usdoj.gov
Attributes
Citation Unknown
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Timeline
  Entries (125) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Intervene
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Joinder
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Joinder
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Joinder
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Joinder
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Substitute Party
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Order Setting/Resetting Hearing on Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Intervene
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Intervene
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Return of Exhibit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE by United States of America of Intent to Return All Seized Property and Correcting the Record. (Lichter, Brian) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 103 Motion to Enroll Richard B. Evans as Counsel of Record for United States of America. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 08/16/2012. (kac, ) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
Notice of Compliance by United States of America. (Evans, Richard) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Gregory) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 100 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Peter M Koski, J.P. Cooney, Brian A Lichter for United States of America. Attorney Salvador Robert Perricone terminated. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 07/31/2012. (kac, ) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 100 MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record; **Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Motion to Substitute Attorney. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event.** (plh, ) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Gregory) Modified on 7/31/2012 (plh, ). (Entered: 07/30/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: None
Appeal Record Returned (1 envelope - original exhibits and/or non-electronic documents) from U.S. Court of Appeals: 75 Notice of Appeal (plh, ) (Entered: 01/12/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: None
ORDER of USCA as to 75 Notice of Appeal - the appeal is dismissed as of 1/11/2012 by Clerk at the direction of the Court. (plh, ) (Entered: 01/12/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/30/2011, Entered: None
REPLY Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Fred Heebe Investments, Frederick R. Heebe, Live Oak Homes Corporation, Shadowlake Management, L.L.C. re 79 MOTION to Compel Compliance with the Court's Prior Orders. (plh, ) (Entered: 12/30/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 94 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memo. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 12/30/11. (plh, ) (Entered: 12/30/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/30/2011, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by Fred Heebe Investments, Frederick R. Heebe, Live Oak Homes Corporation, Shadowlake Management, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Pleading)(Romero, Tobin) (Entered: 12/30/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by United States of America re 79 MOTION to Compel Compliance with the Court's Prior Orders. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Kennedy, Gregory) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER that the motion noticed for submission/hearing on 12/21/2011 will be on the briefs re 79 MOTION to Compel Compliance with the Court's Prior Orders filed by Live Oak Homes Corporation, Shadowlake Management, L.L.C., Fred Heebe Investments, Frederick R. Heebe. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 12/15/11.(plh, ) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 89 MOTION to Continue Hearing on 79 MOTION to Compel Compliance with the Court's Prior Orders : Motion set for 12/21/2011 09:30 AM before Judge Helen G. Berrigan. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 12/6/11.(plh, ) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 88 Motion to Adopt Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 12/6/11. (plh, ) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion to Compel Compliance by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Gregory) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION EX PARTE MOTION AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM TO ADOPT MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT'S PRIOR ORDERS by Heebe & Heebe, P.L.C., Willow, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Walsh, Michael) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER that the motion noticed for submission/hearing on 12/7/2011 will be on the briefs re 79 MOTION to Compel Compliance with the Court's Prior Orders filed by Live Oak Homes Corporation, Shadowlake Management, L.L.C., Fred Heebe Investments, Frederick R. Heebe. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 12/1/11.(plh, ) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 85 Motion to Adopt Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 12/1/2011. (mm, ) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Adopt Motion to Compel by River Birch, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Castaing, Edward) Modified text on 11/16/2011 (plh, ). (Entered: 11/15/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 83 Motion To Adopt plaintiff Frederick R. Heebe's Motion to Compel Compliance with Court's Prior Orders. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 11/8/2011. (mm, ) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Adopt Plaintiff Heebe's Motion to Compel Compliance with Court's Prior Orders by A. J. Ward. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Habans, Robert) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 79 MOTION to Compel Compliance with the Court's Prior Orders. **The title of the attached Notice should reflect Notice of Submission instead of Notice of Hearing on the actual document, pursuant to the Local Rules. ALSO Filing attorney incorrectly selected Notice of Hearing instead of Notice of Submission when attaching the Notice of Submission to the main document. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm, ) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 75 Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 11-30708. (mm, ) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Fred Heebe Investments, Frederick R. Heebe, Live Oak Homes Corporation, Shadowlake Management, L.L.C. regarding 79 MOTION to Compel Compliance with the Court's Prior Orders (Gibbens, William) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION to Compel Compliance with the Court's Prior Orders by Fred Heebe Investments, Frederick R. Heebe, Live Oak Homes Corporation, Shadowlake Management, L.L.C.. Motion set for 12/7/2011 09:30 AM before Judge Helen G. Berrigan. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Notice of Submission)(Gibbens, William) Modified on 11/3/2011 to edit docket text (mm, ). (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 78 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
APPEAL TRANSCRIPT of Evidentiary Hearing held on February 24, 2011 before Judge Helen G. Berrigan. Court Reporter/Recorder Jodi Simcox, Telephone number (504) 589-7780. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/24/2012. (clu, ) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None
APPEAL TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by United States of America re 75 Notice of Appeal. (Kennedy, Gregory) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL by United States of America as to 74 Order on Motion for Hearing, Order on Motion to Enforce Judgment. (Filed on behalf of USA - Filing Fee not required) (Kennedy, Gregory) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER & REASONS denying 31 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing; denying 36 Motion to Enforce Judgment. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 7/1/11. (plh, ) Modified doc type on 7/1/2011 (plh, ). (Entered: 07/01/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 69 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Tobin J. Romero. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 6/22/11. (plh, ) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 68 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert M. Cary. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 6/22/11. (plh, ) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 67 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Brendan V. Sullivan. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 6/22/11. (plh, ) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 67 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brendan V. Sullivan, 68 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert Cary, 69 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Tobin J. Romero; **Filing attorney did not include a proposed order for each motion. Proposed Orders subsequently provided to Clerk and have now been attached to each motion.** (plh, ) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Tobin J. Romero (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-3085116) by Frederick R. Heebe. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gibbens, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2011: # 2 Proposed Order) (plh, ). (Entered: 06/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert Cary (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-3085105) by Frederick R. Heebe. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gibbens, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2011: # 2 Proposed Order) (plh, ). (Entered: 06/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brendan V. Sullivan (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-3085087) by Frederick R. Heebe. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gibbens, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2011: # 2 Proposed Order) (plh, ). (Entered: 06/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 99 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER & REASONS granting in part and denying in part 79 Motion to Compel Defendant to Comply with the Court's Prior Orders as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 07/27/2012. (kac, )
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
Memorandum by United States of America re 62 Evidentiary Hearing, Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Kennedy, Gregory) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
Memorandum by Fred Heebe Investments, Frederick R. Heebe, Heebe & Heebe, P.L.C., Live Oak Homes Corporation, River Birch, Inc., Shadowlake Management, L.L.C., A. J. Ward, Willow, Inc. re 62 Evidentiary Hearing, Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Gibbens, William) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 64 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
Memorandum by All Plaintiffs re 62 Evidentiary Hearing, Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Plaintiffs' Memorandum Regarding the Court's Review of the Search Warrant Affidavit (Gibbens, William) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
LREF
Blank 63 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE for Removal of Exhibits by Clerk. (plh, ) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Helen G. Berrigan: Evidentiary Hearing held on 2/24/2011. Taken under submission. (Court Reporter Jodi Simcox.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List) (plh, ) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None
Supplemental Memorandum filed by Fred Heebe Investments, Frederick R. Heebe, Heebe & Heebe, P.L.C., Live Oak Homes Corporation, River Birch, Inc., Shadowlake Management, L.L.C., A. J. Ward, Willow, Inc., in Opposition of 31 MOTION for Hearing. (plh, ) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 54 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 2/23/11. (plh, ) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by United States of America re 31 MOTION for Hearing. (plh, ) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 53 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 2/22/11. (plh, ) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 57 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER that by 10:00 am on 2/23/11, plaintiffs' shall provide the government a copy of the surveillance video that was submitted to the court on 2/22/11. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 2/22/11.(plh, ) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Motion to Compel Production by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Gregory) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None Motion to CompelCourt Filing
MOTION to Compel Production by United States of America. Motion set for 3/16/2011 09:30 AM before Judge Helen G. Berrigan. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Notice of Submission, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2)(Kennedy, Gregory) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Response to the Government's Reply Memorandum by Fred Heebe Investments, Frederick R. Heebe, Heebe & Heebe, P.L.C., Live Oak Homes Corporation, River Birch, Inc., Shadowlake Management, L.L.C., A. J. Ward, Willow, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Pleading)(Gibbens, William) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum to Petitioners' Opposition to Governments Motion for Reconsideration by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Pleading)(Kennedy, Gregory) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed; United States of America through U.S. Attorney general served on 11/23/10; answer due 1/24/11. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gibbens, William) Modified text on 2/17/2011 (plh, ). (Entered: 02/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
Memorandum by Fred Heebe Investments, Frederick R. Heebe, Heebe & Heebe, P.L.C., Live Oak Homes Corporation, River Birch, Inc., Shadowlake Management, L.L.C., A. J. Ward, Willow, Inc. re 45 Order,,,, Memorandum Regarding What Siezed Items Should Be Returned (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Gibbens, William) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None
**DEFICIENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed; (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Atkinson, Ian) Modified on 2/16/2011 (plh, ). (Entered: 02/15/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
Manual Attachment Received re 47 Memorandum, filed by River Birch, Inc., Live Oak Homes Corporation, Willow, Inc., Shadowlake Management, L.L.C., Fred Heebe Investments, A. J. Ward, Frederick R. Heebe, Heebe & Heebe, P.L.C.. (plh, ) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
Memorandum by United States of America re 45 Order,,,, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Kennedy, Gregory) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
Memorandum by Fred Heebe Investments, Frederick R. Heebe, Heebe & Heebe, P.L.C., Live Oak Homes Corporation, River Birch, Inc., Shadowlake Management, L.L.C., A. J. Ward, Willow, Inc. re 45 Order,,,, Requesting Floor Plan (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Manual Attachment)(Gibbens, William) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 46 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
Memorandum by Fred Heebe Investments, Frederick R. Heebe, Heebe & Heebe, P.L.C., Live Oak Homes Corporation, River Birch, Inc., Shadowlake Management, L.L.C., A. J. Ward, Willow, Inc. re 45 Order,,,, Regarding File Cabinets (Gibbens, William) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
LREF
Blank 45 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER that Plaintiffs provide the Court with a floor plan of the third floor of 2000 Belle Chasse Highway by 2/14/11 by 10:00 a.m. If the Government has a floorplan of the third floor of 2000 Belle Chasse Highway, it shall also provide a copy to the Court by 2/14/11 by 10:00 a.m. FURTHER ORDERED that the Government provide a detailed inventory of what it seized from the premises of 2000 Belle Chasse Highway as set forth in document by 2/14/11 by 10:00 a.m. Plaintiffs shall submit a memorandum as set forth in document by 2/16/11 by 12:00 p.m. FURTHER ORDERED that the Government provide the Court with a status update as set forth in document by 2/14/11 by 10:00 a.m. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs shall submit a memorandum explaining the presence of several filing cabinets and file folders containing River Birch, Inc. materials as set forth in document by 2/14/11 by 10:00 a.m. FURTHER ORDERED that the Government shall submit a memorandum explaining why a "clean team" was present during the initial search as set forth in document by 2/14/11 by 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 2/9/11.(plh, ) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
Memorandum by Fred Heebe Investments, Frederick R. Heebe, Heebe & Heebe, P.L.C., Live Oak Homes Corporation, River Birch, Inc., Shadowlake Management, L.L.C., A. J. Ward, Willow, Inc. re 38 Order,, Set Hearings, (Gibbens, William) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
Memorandum by United States of America re 38 Order Regarding Court's Inspection of 2000 Belle Chasse Highway, Gretna, LA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit A - Part 3, # 4 Exhibit A - Part 4, # 5 Exhibit A - Part 5, # 6 Exhibit A - Part 6, # 7 Exhibit A - Part 7, # 8 Exhibit A - Part 8, # 9 Exhibit A - Part 9, # 10 Exhibit A - Part 10, # 11 Exhibit A - Part 11, # 12 Exhibit A - Part 12, # 13 Exhibit A - Part 13, # 14 Exhibit A - Part 14, # 15 Exhibit A - Part 15, # 16 Exhibit A - Part 16, # 17 Exhibit A - Part 17, # 18 Exhibit A - Part 18, # 19 Exhibit A - Part 19, # 20 Exhibit A - Part 20, # 21 Exhibit A - Part 21, # 22 Exhibit A - Part 22, # 23 Exhibit A - Part 23, # 24 Exhibit A - Part 24, # 25 Exhibit A - Part 25, # 26 Exhibit A - Part 26, # 27 Exhibit A - Part 27, # 28 Exhibit A - Part 28, # 29 Exhibit A - Part 29)(Kennedy, Gregory) Modified on 1/28/2011 to edit text (rll, ). (Entered: 01/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Fred Heebe Investments, Frederick R. Heebe, Heebe & Heebe, P.L.C., Live Oak Homes Corporation, River Birch, Inc., Shadowlake Management, L.L.C., A. J. Ward, Willow, Inc. re 31 MOTION for Hearing in Reconsideration of Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gibbens, William) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion filed by United States of America re 36 MOTION to Enforce Judgment. (Kennedy, Gregory) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 39 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Salvador Robert Perricone for United States of America. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 1/24/11. (plh, ) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Gregory) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER that an Evidentiary Hearing is set for 2/24/2011 10:00 AM before Judge Helen G. Berrigan re 36 MOTION to Enforce Judgment, 31 MOTION for Reconsideration. FURTHER ORDERED that the premises of 2000 Belle Chasse Highway, Gretna, Louisiana be made available for a visit by the Court on 2/4/2011 as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 1/21/11.(plh, ) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Fred Heebe Investments, Frederick R. Heebe, Heebe & Heebe, P.L.C., Live Oak Homes Corporation, River Birch, Inc., Shadowlake Management, L.L.C., A. J. Ward, Willow, Inc. regarding 36 MOTION to Enforce Judgment (Gibbens, William) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION to Enforce Judgment by Fred Heebe Investments, Frederick R. Heebe, Heebe & Heebe, P.L.C., Live Oak Homes Corporation, River Birch, Inc., Shadowlake Management, L.L.C., A. J. Ward, Willow, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/2/2011 09:30 AM before Judge Helen G. Berrigan. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Notice of Hearing)(Gibbens, William) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 35 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None
*SEALED* Opposition by plaintiffs to government's motion to submit evidence ex parte (plh, ) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 34 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None
*SEALED* Order to file opposition under seal (plh, ) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 33 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None
*SEALED* Motion by plaintiffs to file opposition under seal (plh, ) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None
Notice of Compliance by United States of America re 28 Order. (plh, ) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 31 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION for Rule 41(g) Evidentiary Hearing by United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 2/2/2011 09:30 AM before Judge Helen G. Berrigan. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Notice of Hearing, # 3 Exhibits)(plh, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/7/2011: # 4 Exhibit C (sealed)) (plh, ). (Entered: 01/07/2011)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 30 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
**SEALED** ORDER to seal exhibit (plh, ) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 29 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None
**SEALED** Motion by USA to seal exhibit (plh, ) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER re: 25 Motion to Stay; ORDERED that the defendants motion for stay, treated as a motion for extension of time, is PARTIALLY GRANTED and PARTIALLY DENIED. The previously set deadlines are CONTINUED to January 5, 2011. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 12/23/10. (plh, ) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Parties re 25 MOTION to Stay Return of Property. (Gibbens, William) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Motion to Stay Return of Property by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Gregory) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION to Stay Return of Property by United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2011 09:30 AM before Judge Helen G. Berrigan. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Notice of Hearing)(Kennedy, Gregory) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None
**DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Stay Return of Property by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Gregory) Modified on 12/23/2010 (plh, ). (Entered: 12/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT - ORDERED that the Government immediately return all seized property of tenants other than River Birch, Inc. In the case of property sharedbetween River Birch, Inc. and other tenants, the Government shall provide to petitioners copies of all documents it intends to retain by Monday, December 27, 2010. Likewise, the Government shall complete its clean team review and return all privileged documents to the petitioners by Monday, December 27, 2010. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 12/20/10.(plh, ) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER & REASONS granting 3 Motion for Return of Property. FURTHER ORDERED that the Government immediately return all seized property of tenants other than River Birch, Inc. In the case of property shared between River Birch, Inc. and other tenants, the Government shall provide to petitioners copies of all documents it intends to retain by Monday, December 27, 2010. Likewise, the Government shall complete its clean team review and return all privileged documents to the petitioners by Monday, December 27, 2010. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 12/20/10. (plh, ) Modified doc type on 12/21/2010 (plh, ). (Entered: 12/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 21 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None
**SEALED** Order re: motion to file exhibit for in camera review (plh, )(Schonekas, Kennedy) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 20 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None
**SEALED** Motion to file exhibit for in camera review by Frederick R. Heebe. (plh, ) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER finding as moot 18 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum to Government's Opposition to defendant's Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 11/24/10. (plh, ) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum to Government's Opposition to defendant's Motion to Seal by Fred Heebe Investments, Frederick R. Heebe, Live Oak Homes Corporation, Shadowlake Management, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading)(plh, ) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None
REPLY Memorandum to Motion filed by Fred Heebe Investments, Frederick R. Heebe, Heebe & Heebe, P.L.C., Live Oak Homes Corporation, River Birch, Inc., Shadowlake Management, L.L.C., A. J. Ward, Willow, Inc. re 3 MOTION for Return of Property. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)(plh, ) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 15 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 11/24/10. (plh, ) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by Fred Heebe Investments, Frederick R. Heebe, Live Oak Homes Corporation, Shadowlake Management, L.L.C.. (plh, ) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 14 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by United States of America re 3 MOTION for Return of Property. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Kennedy, Gregory) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 11 MOTION to Seal Case filed by Live Oak Homes Corporation, Shadowlake Management, L.L.C., Fred Heebe Investments, Frederick R. Heebe. FURTHER ORDERED that the case be unsealed. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 11/18/10.(plh, ) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by United States of America re 11 MOTION to Seal Case. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(kac, ) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Seal Case by Fred Heebe Investments, Frederick R. Heebe, Live Oak Homes Corporation, Shadowlake Management, L.L.C.. (kac, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/23/2010: # 1 Proposed Order) (kac, ). (Entered: 11/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed; United States of America through U.S. Attorney served on 11/19/2010, answer due 1/18/2011. (plh, ) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Ian L. Atkinson of Notice of Hearing and Request for Oral Argument served on United States Attorney's Office on 10/18/2010. (plh, ) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Service by William P. Gibbens of Motion to File document under Seal, Notice of filing under Seal, Motion for Return of Property served on United States Attorney's Office on 10/13/2010. (plh, ) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None Summons Issued
Summons Issued as to United States of America. (plh, ) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER re 3 MOTION for Return of Property. ORDERED that the Motion shall be converted to an equitable action akin to replevin and treated as a civil complaint as set forth in document. FURTHER ORDERED that the United States of America shall be made a named defendant and service shall issue to the United States Government. FURTHER ORDERED that the government shall file any opposition to petitioners' motion by 4:00 pm on 11/24/10 at which time the motion will be taken under advisement on the briefs, without oral argument. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 11/18/10.(copy: Gibbens, Kennedy)(plh, ) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Fred Heebe Investments, Frederick R. Heebe, Heebe & Heebe, P.L.C., Live Oak Homes Corporation, River Birch, Inc., Shadowlake Management, L.L.C., A. J. Ward, Willow, Inc. regarding 3 MOTION for Return of Property. (plh, ) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of filing under seal by Fred Heebe Investments, Frederick R. Heebe, Heebe & Heebe, P.L.C., Live Oak Homes Corporation, River Birch, Inc., Shadowlake Management, L.L.C., A. J. Ward, Willow, Inc.. (plh, ) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
COMPLAINT per record doc 6 MOTION for Return of Property by Fred Heebe Investments, Frederick R. Heebe, Heebe & Heebe, P.L.C., Live Oak Homes Corporation, River Birch, Inc., Shadowlake Management, L.L.C., A. J. Ward, Willow, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/24/2010 09:30 AM before Judge Helen G. Berrigan. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Notice of Hearing, # 3 Exhibit)(plh, ) Modified on 11/18/2010 (plh, ). (Entered: 10/19/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to File Motion under seal. Signed by Judge Helen G. Berrigan on 10/15/10. (plh, ) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Return of Property under seal by Fred Heebe Investments, Frederick R. Heebe, Heebe & Heebe, P.L.C., Live Oak Homes Corporation, River Birch, Inc., Shadowlake Management, L.L.C., A. J. Ward, Willow, Inc.. (plh, ) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 164 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?