Meza, et al v. Galvin, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-10428

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (374) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Judgment*Court Filing
Judges Selya, Woodlock, and Ponsor: ORDER entered: RENEWED FINAL JUDGMENT entered for Defendant against Plaintiffs, in accordance with this Court's Memorandum and Order dated June 21, 2004.(Greenberg, Rebecca) (Entered: 06/21/2004)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
    Judges Selya, Woodlock and Ponsor: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered directing that a renewed final judgment be entered for the defendant.(Woodlock, Douglas) (Entered: 06/21/2004)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/18/2004 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
      NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance Attorney Michael D. Lurie terminated. (Lurie, Michael) (Entered: 06/18/2004)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
        Judges Selya, Woodlock and Ponsor : MEMORANDUM AND ORDER VACATING JUDGMENT entered: [Text of Order: Given (1) the pendency of proceedings related to entry of final judgment in the companion case of Black Political Task Force, et al., v. Galvin, Civil Action No. 02-11190-DPW, where we have approved a reconfiguration of several Massachusetts House of Representatives districts in the City of Boston through a plan which incorporates, inter alia, the configuration of the 2d Suffolk District separately challenged by plaintiffs in this case, and (2) this court's determination to issue its Memorandum in support of judgment in this case contemporaneously with the entry of judgment in Civil Action No. 02-11190-DPW, the court has determined to vacate judgment in this case in order that the final judgments and the full rationale for such judgments in both companion cases may be available at the same time. Accordingly, the judgment entered in this case on February 24, 2004 is hereby VACATED pending reentry contemporaneously with entry of final judgment in Civil Action No. 02-11190-DPW.](Greenberg, Rebecca) Modified on 5/20/2004 (Greenberg, Rebecca). (Entered: 05/20/2004)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Plaintiffs' application to Single Justice, Justice Souter, for extension of time to file jurisdictional statement, by Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 05/19/2004)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 4/1/2004, Entered: 4/1/2004 USCA Judgment
            USCA Judgment as to Notice of Appeal 366 filed by Angel Meza, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega, Chelsea's Commission On Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Oiste. The District Court having mistakenly certified to this Court plaintiffs' appeal to the U.S. Supreme Court from the judgment entered in Civil Action No. 02-10428. It is ordered that the above-captioned appeal be administratively closed and returned to the U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts. (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 04/01/2004)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004 USCA Case Number
              USCA Case Number 04-1448 for 366 Notice of Appeal, filed by Angel Meza, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., OISTE. (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 03/31/2004)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004 Full Record on Appeal Sent to USCA
                Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 366 Notice of Appeal, NOA #366 (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 03/31/2004)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: 3/26/2004 Declaration
                  DECLARATION of Barbara Van Gorder of proof of service re 366 Notice of Appeal, by Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Angel Meza, OISTE, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 03/26/2004)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: 8/4/2004 Notice of Appeal
                    NOTICE OF APPEAL to the US Supreme Court as to 365 Judgment by Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Angel Meza, OISTE, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. $ 255, receipt number 54822 (NOTE: Deleted from docket and re-entered 8/4/04 to correct errors on case management reports - this entry will be renumbered to orginal document number - #366)(Hurley, Virginia) (Entered: 08/04/2004)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 2/24/2004, Entered: 2/24/2004 Judgment*Court Filing
                      Judges Selya, Woodlock, and Ponsor : ORDER entered: JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants against Plaintiffs.(Greenberg, Rebecca) Modified on 2/24/2004 (Greenberg, Rebecca). (Entered: 02/24/2004)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 2/24/2004, Entered: 2/24/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                        Judges Selya, Ponsor, and Woodlock : ORDER entered: It is hereby ORDERED that the clerk shall enter Judgment for the Defendants in the above captioned matter. A Memorandum and Order shall issue shortly explaining the Court?s reasons for directing Judgment for the Defendants.(Greenberg, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/24/2004)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 12/19/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 Remark
                          Chelsea Plaintiffs' Supplemental proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/23/2003)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 12/19/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 Remark
                            Defendant's Post-Trial Request for Findings of Fact. (Attachments: # 1 Part II) (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/23/2003)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 12/19/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 Remark
                              Defendant's Post-Trial Request for Conclusions of Law. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/23/2003)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003 Stipulation
                                STIPULATION pursuant to oder dated December 3, 2003 by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/16/2003)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003 Affidavit
                                  Supplemental AFFIDAVIT of Liz Malia pursuant to order dated December 3, 2003. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/16/2003)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003 Affidavit
                                    Supplemental AFFIDAVIT of Thomas M. Finneran pursuant to order dated December 3, 2003. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/16/2003)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003 Affidavit
                                      Supplemental AFFIDAVIT of Eugene L. O'Flaherty pursuant to order dated December 3, 2003. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/16/2003)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003 Affidavit
                                        Supplemental AFFIDAVIT of Thomas Petrolati pursuant to order dated December 3, 2003. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/16/2003)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 12/9/2003, Entered: 12/12/2003 Trial Brief
                                          Chelsea Plaintiffs' POST-TRIAL BRIEF by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/12/2003)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/10/2003 Trial Brief
                                            Pre-Closing BRIEF by William Francis Galvin. (Folan, Karen) (Entered: 12/10/2003)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 12/5/2003 Designation of experts
                                              Defendant's designation of deposition testimony of Leonard Alkins as re-cross examination by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/05/2003)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: 12/4/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' exhibit S-1 by William Francis Galvin.(Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/04/2003)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: 12/4/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 345 MOTION to Strike affidavit of Jarret Barrios filed by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/04/2003)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Non Jury Trial Day Three held on November 14, 2003 before Judge Woodlock. Court Reporter: Pamela R. Owens. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/443-0008 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 12/03/2003)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                      Supplemental Filing in Support re 345 MOTION to Strike affidavit of Jarret Barrios filed by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/03/2003)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 Affidavit
                                                        ERRATA SHEET TO AFFIDAVIT of Harold W. Stanley. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/03/2003)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 Affidavit
                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Jarrett T. Barrios. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/03/2003)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 Designation of experts
                                                            Designation of deposition testimony of Frank Jones for re-direct examination by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/03/2003)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 11/19/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                              MOTION to Strike affidavit of Jarret Barrios by William Francis Galvin.(Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/03/2003)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 11/19/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                Designation of deposition testimony of George Pillsbury for re-direct examination by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/03/2003)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 Objection
                                                                  Defendant's objections to plaintffs' designation of deposition testimony of Dianne Wilkerson for re-direct examination and designation of deposition testimony of Dianne Wilkerson as re-cross examination. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/03/2003)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 Objection
                                                                    Defendant's objections to plaintffs' designation of deposition testimony of Juan Vega for re-direct examination and designation of deposition testimony of Juan Vega as re-cross examination. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/03/2003)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 Objection
                                                                      Defendant's objections to plaintffs' designation of deposition testimony of Gladys Vega for re-direct examination and designation of deposition testimony of Gladys Vega as re-cross examination. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/03/2003)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 Objection
                                                                        Defendant's objections to plaintffs' designation of deposition testimony of Gavriel Valerio for re-direct examination and designation of deposition testimony of Gabriel Valerio as re-cross examination. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/03/2003)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 Objection
                                                                          Defendant's objection to plaintiffs' designation of deposition testimony of Councilor Charles Turner for re-direct examination.(Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/03/2003)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                            Defendant's re-direct of Harold W. Stanley by deposition designation by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/03/2003)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 Objection
                                                                              Defendant's objections to plaintiffs' designation of deposition testimony of Marta Rosa for re-direct examination and designation of deposition testimony of Marta Rosa as re-cross examination. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/03/2003)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 Order on Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER entered by Judge Selya, Judge Woodlock and Judge Ponsor in CA 02-10428-DPW and CA 02-11190-DPW denying 26 Motion for Protective Order, granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion to Compel: Summary of Order: The defendant's Motion for a Protective Order is DENIED and the plaintiffs' Motion to Compel evidence withheld by defendant pursuant to legislative privilege is ALLOWED to the extent that on or before December 8, 2003:1.Each of the Protected Persons the defendant offered as a witness at trial -- Representatives Finneran, Malia, O'Flaherty and Petrolati -- shall file an affidavit identifying by name and address any non-Protected Person with whom each initiated communications concerning the Redistricting Act during the course of development and enactment of the Redistricting Act. This identification need not include those communications which are reflected in transcripts of public meetings or written communications previously disclosed to the plaintiffs in discovery. As to each such non-Protected Person identified by affidavit, the affidavits shall specify the date(s), time(s) and place(s) of such communications.2.In addition to any non-Protected Persons disclosed in response to para.1 supra, the defendant shall by stipulation identify all persons, including Protected Persons, who participated in meetings, apart from the public meetings previously disclosed, concerning the Redistricting Act.3.The defendant shall by stipulation state the population statistics upon which the Redistricting Act was based.A memorandum concerning the disposition of these motions will issue in due course. (Greenberg, Rebecca) Modified on 12/3/2003 (Greenberg, Rebecca). (Entered: 12/03/2003)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003 Objection
                                                                                  Defendant's objections to plaintiffs' designation of deposition tesimony of Rev. Richard Richardson for re-direct examination. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/01/2003)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003 Objection
                                                                                    Defendant's objections to plaintiffs' designation of deposition testimony of Guillermo Quinteros for re-direct examination and designation of deposition testimony of Guillermo Quinteros as re-cross examination. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/01/2003)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                      Re-Cross of Giovanna Negretti by Deposition Designation by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/01/2003)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                        RE-DIRECT Peter Morison by DEPOSITION DESIGNATION by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/01/2003)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003 Objection
                                                                                          Defendant's objections to Plaintiffs' designation of deposition testimony of Angel Meza for re-direct examination and designation of deposition testimony of Angel Meza as re-cross examination. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/01/2003)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003 Objection
                                                                                            Defendant's objections to plaintiffs' designation of deposition testimony of Nelson Merced for re-direct examination. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/01/2003)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003 Objection
                                                                                              Defendant's objections to plaintiffs' designation of deposition testimony of Melvin King for re-direct examination. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/01/2003)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003 Objection
                                                                                                Defendant's objection to Plaintiffs' designation of deposition testimony of Eddie Jenkins for re-direct examination and designation of deposition testimony of Eddie Jenkinsas re-cross examination. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/01/2003)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003 Objection
                                                                                                  Defendant's objection to Plaintiffs' designation of deposition testimony of Carol Hardy-Fanta, Ph.D. for re-direct examination and designation of deposition testimony of Carol Hardy-Fanta as re-cross examination. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/01/2003)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003 Objection
                                                                                                    Defendant's objections to plaintiffs' designation of deposition testimony of Louis Elisa for re-direct examination. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 12/01/2003)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 11/25/2003 Objection
                                                                                                      Defendant's Objection to plaintiffs' designation of deposition testimony of Felix Arroyo for re-direct examination and designation of deposition testimony of Felix Arroyo as re-cross examination. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/25/2003)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                        DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF LEONARD ALKINS FOR RE-DIRECT EXAMINATION by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                          DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF NELSON MERCED FOR RE-DIRECT EXAMINATION by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                            DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF EDDIE JENKINS FOR RE-DIRECT EXAMINATION by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                              DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF SEN. DIANNE WILKERSON FOR RE-DIRECT EXAMINATION by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF LOUIS ELISA FOR RE-DIRECT EXAMINATION by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                  DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF FELIX ARROYO FOR RE-DIRECT EXAMINATION by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                    DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF JAMES COFIELD FOR RE-DIRECT EXAMINATION by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                      DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF JAMES COFIELD FOR RE-DIRECT EXAMINATION by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                        DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF REV. RICHARD RICHARDSON FOR RE-DIRECT EXAMINATION by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                          DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF CHARLES TURNER FOR RE-DIRECT EXAMINATION by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                            DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF WILLIE M. HURD FOR RE-DIRECT EXAMINATION by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 11/20/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Non-Jury Trial Day Three held on November 14, 2003 before Judge Woodlock. Court Reporter: Pamela R. Owens. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/443-0008 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 11/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by William Francis Galvin.(Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003 Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM on the issue of assertion of legislative privilege at trial by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                    MOTION to call a live witness in rebuttal by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega.(Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT of Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 308 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/14/2003 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered re: 50 Motion by William Francis Galvin for summary judgment: Given the decision in Metts v. Murphy, 2003 WL 22434637 (1st Cir. Oct. 28, 2003), the court deems it the better practice to resolve the issues raised by the defendant's motion for summary judgment (No. 50) through the Findings and Conclusions to be issued following trial on the merits.Accordingly, the defendant's motion is hereby DENIED without prejudice to consideration of the issues in light of the evidence and arguments at trial. (Greenberg, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/14/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                          CROSS-EXAMINATION BY DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF EUGENE O'FLAHERTY by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/14/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                            CROSS-EXAMINATION BY DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF PETER MORRISON by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/14/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                              CROSS-EXAMINATION BY DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF HAROLD STANLEY by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/14/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                REDIRECT BY DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF GLADYS VEGA by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/14/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                  REDIRECT BY DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF ANGEL MEZA by Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/14/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                    REDIRECT BY DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF GUILLERMO QUINTEROS by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/14/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                      REDIRECT BY DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF JUAN VEGA by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/14/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                        REDIRECT BY DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF GABRIEL VALERIO by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/14/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                          REDIRECT BY DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF GIOVANNA NEGRETTI by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/14/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                            REDIRECT BY DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF MARTA ROSA by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/14/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                              REDIRECT BY DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF JAMES CAMPEN by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/14/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                                REDIRECT BY DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF CAROL HARDY-FANTA, by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/14/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                                  REDIRECT BY DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF THOMAS PATTERSON, by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Pretrial Conference held on October 24, 2003 before Judge Woodlock. Court Reporter: Lee A. Marzilli. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/345-6787 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 11/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Pretrial Conference held on October 21, 2003 before Judge Woodlock. Court Reporter: Pamela R. Owens. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/443-0008 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 11/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                                        DESIGNATION OF deposition testimony of Dianne Wilkerson for cross examination by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                                          DESIGNATION OF deposition testimony of Juan Vega for cross examination by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                                            DESIGNATION OF deposition testimony of Gladys Vega for cross examination by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                                              DESIGNATION OF deposition testimony of Gabriel Valerio for cross examination by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                                                DESIGNATION OF deposition testimony of Charles H. Turner for cross examination by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                                                  DESIGNATION OF deposition testimony of Marta T. Rosa for cross examination by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                                                    DESIGNATION OF deposition testimony of Jaime Rodriguez for cross examination by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                                                      DESIGNATION OF deposition testimony of Reverend Richard Richardson for cross examination by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                                                        DESIGNATION OF deposition testimony of Guillermo Quinteros for cross examination by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                                                          DESIGNATION OF deposition testimony of Thomas Patterson, Ph.D. for cross examination by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                                                            DESIGNATION OF deposition testimony of Giovanna Negretti for cross examination by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                                                              DESIGNATION OF deposition testimony of Angel Meza for cross examination by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                                                                DESIGNATION OF deposition testimony of Nelson Merced for cross examination by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                                                                  DESIGNATION of deposition testimony of Melvin H. King for cross examination by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                                                                    DESIGNATION of deposition testimony of Eddie Jenkins for cross examination by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                                                                      DESIGNATION of deposition testimony of Willie M. Hurd for cross examination by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                                                                        DESIGNATION of deposition testimony of Louis Elisa for cross examination by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                                                                          DESIGNATION of deposition testimony of James E. Cofield for cross examination by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                                                                            DESIGNATION of deposition testimony of James Campen for cross examination by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                                                                              DESIGNATION of deposition testimony of Mukiya Baker-Gomez for cross examination by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                DESIGNATION of deposition testimony of Leonard Alkins for cross examination by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DESIGNATION of deposition testimony of Felix Arroyo for cross examination by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT of Jay Ash filed by William Francis Galvin. (Greenberg, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Affidavit of Jay Ash.(Greenberg, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Pretrial Conference held on October 22, 2003 before Judge Woodlock. Court Reporter: Pamela R. Owens. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/443-0008 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 11/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 10/30/2003, Entered: 10/30/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for a view by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega.(Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: 10/30/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COUNTERDESIGNATION of deposition testimony of Nancy Lo by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: 10/30/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COUNTERDESIGNATION of deposition testimony of Michelle Tassinari by William Francis Galvin.(Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: 10/30/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COUNTERDESIGNATION of deposition testimony of Robert Bishop by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: 10/30/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COUNTERDESIGNATION of deposition testimony of John K. McCarthy by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: 10/30/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COUNTERDESIGNATION of deposition testimony of Lawrence S. DiCara by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: 10/30/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COUNTERDESIGNATION of deposition testimony of John A. Stefanini by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: 10/30/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COUNTERDESIGNATION of deposition testimony of Maryanne C. Calia by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: 10/30/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COUNTERDESIGNATION of deposition testimony of Thomas M. Petrolati by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: 10/30/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COUNTERDESIGNATION of deposition testimony of Franics Shea. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: 10/30/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COUNTERDESIGNATION of deposition testimony of Thomas M. Finneran by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 10/30/2003, Entered: 10/30/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COUNTERDESIGNATION of deposition testimony of Eugene L. O'Flaherty by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: 10/30/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COUNTERDESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF Elizabeth A. Malia by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on October 23, 2003 before Judge Woodlock. Court Reporter: Debra M. Joyce. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/737-4110 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 10/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 10/17/2003, Entered: 10/20/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Lay Witnesss AFFIDAVITS bearing mark-ups occasioned by Court Order of 10/14/03 of Leonard Alkins, Felix Arroyo, Mukiya Baker-Gomez, James E. Cofield, Louis Elisa, Willie Maud Hurd, Eddie Jenkins, Frank Jones, Hubert E. Jones, Melvin H. King, Nelson Merced, George Pillsbury, Rev. Richard Richardson, Jaime Rodriguez, Charles H. Turner and Dianne Wilkerson, by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 10/17/2003, Entered: 10/20/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 245 MOTION to Compel filed by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 10/17/2003, Entered: 10/20/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 244 MOTION to Strike 234 Affidavit of David J. Harris filed by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 10/17/2003, Entered: 10/20/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Strike certain portions of defendant's affidavits and to preclude use of that testimony at trial by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega.(Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: 10/17/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Lay witness affidavits bearing mark-ups occasioned by Court Order of 10/14/03 of Angel Meza, Giovanna Negretti, Guillermo Quinteros, Marta Rosa, Gabriel Valerio, Gladys Vega and Juan Vega, filed by William Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: 10/17/2003 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiffs' Objection to 240 Affidavit of Jay Ash. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on June 2, 2003 before Judge Selya, Judge Ponsor and Judge Woodlock. Court Reporter: Pamela R. Owens. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 10/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Pretrial Conference held on October 14, 2003 before Judge Woodlock. Court Reporter: Pamela R. Owens. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 10/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel and MOTION for Sanctions by William Francis Galvin.(Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Strike 234 Affidavit of David J. Harris by William Francis Galvin.(Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 203 MOTION to Strike the affidavit of Melvin H. King and to preclude use of testimony at trial filed by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 195 MOTION to Strike 141 Affidavit of David Viera and to Preclude Use of His Testimony at Trial filed by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File reply memoranda in support of particular motions to strike previously filed by William Francis Galvin.(Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Jay Ash. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Affidavit of Jay Ash by William Francis Galvin.(Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 178 MOTION in Limine to exclude affidavit testimony of eight witnesses filed by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 174 MOTION to Strike 116 Affidavit and 117 Supplemental Affidavit of Harold Stanley filed by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 180 MOTION to Strike affidavits of Representatives Thomas Petrolati, Eugene O'Flaherty, Elizabeth Malia and Thomas Finneran, and response to plaintiffs' objections, filed by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 175 MOTION to Strike 115 SUPPLEMENTAL Affidavit, and 88 Affidavit of Peter Morrison filed by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of David J. Harris. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 195 MOTION to Strike 141 Affidavit of David Viera and to Preclude Use of His Testimony at Trial filed by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 203 MOTION to Strike the affidavit of Melvin H. King and to preclude use of testimony at trial filed by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega.(Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 202 MOTION to Strike 125 Affidavit of Guillermo Quinteros and to Preclude Testimony at Trial filed by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 187 MOTION in Limine to exclude testimony of Professor Thomas E. Patterson filed by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition to defendant's motions to strike, filed by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 189 MOTION in Limine to exclude testimony of Dr. Carol Hardy-Fanta filed by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 188 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Professor James T. Campen filed by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 186 MOTION in Limine to exclude Testimony of Professor Engstrom filed by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 193 MOTION to Strike 163 Affidavit of George Pillsbury and 194 MOTION to Strike 162 Expert Affidavit George Pillsbury filed by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 9/25/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's supplemental filing concerning evidentiary motions filed on 9/8/03. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter/request (non-motion) from Mitchell J. Matorin re: electronic copies on attached CD. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 9/19/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 9/29/03 to File Response to evidentiary motions by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, William Francis Galvin, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega.(Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 9/16/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 219 Emergency MOTION to Strike motions filed by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 9/12/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Emergency MOTION to Strike motions by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega.(Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Magaly Camacho by William Francis Galvin.(Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 10/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/24/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Strike 140 Affidavit of Eddie Jenkins and to preclude use of testimony at trial by William Francis Galvin.(Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/24/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Strike Portions of the Affidavit of Hubert E. Jones and to preclude use of testimony at trial by William Francis Galvin.(Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/24/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike portions of the 148 Affidavit of Reverend Richard Richardson and to preclude testimony at trial by William Francis Galvin.(Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/24/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike portions of the 157 Affidavit of Louis Elisa and to preclude use of testimony at trial by William Francis Galvin.(Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/24/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike portions of the 149 Affidavit of Leonard Alkins and to preclude use of testimony at trial by William Francis Galvin.(Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/24/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Strike portions of 135 Affidavit of Mukiya Baker-Gomez and to preclude use of testimony at trial by William Francis Galvin.(Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/24/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike Portions of the Affidavit of Felix D. Arroyo and to preclude use of testimony at trial by William Francis Galvin.(Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/22/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Strike Portions of the Affidavit of Jaime Rodriguez and to Preclude Use of Testimony at Trial, by William Francis Galvin, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 09/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/19/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Strike Portions of [143 the Affidavit of Nelson Merced and to Preclude Use of Testimony at Trial, by William Francis Galvin, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 09/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/19/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Strike Portions of the 122 Affidavit of Marta Rosa and to Preclude Testimony at Trial, by William Francis Galvin, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 09/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/19/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike Portions of the 142 Affidavitof Frank Jones and to Preclude Use of Testimomy at Trial, by William Francis Galvin, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 09/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/19/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike Portions of the 127 Affidavit of Juan Vega and to Preclude Use of Testimony at Trial, by William Francis Galvin, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 09/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/19/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike Portions of the 150 Affidavit of Diane Wilkerson and to Preclude Use of Testimony at Trial, by William Francis Galvin, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 09/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/18/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Strike 121 Affidavit of Gladys Vega and to Preclude Use of testimony at trial, by William Francis Galvin, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 09/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/18/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike the affidavit of Melvin H. King and to preclude use of testimony at trial, by William Francis Galvin, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 09/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/17/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Strike 125 Affidavit of Guillermo Quinteros and to Preclude Testimony at Trial, by William Francis Galvin, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 09/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/17/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Strike Portions of the 124 Affidavit of Angel Meza and to Preclude Use of Testimony at Trial, by William Francis Galvin, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 09/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/17/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Strike Portions of the 123 Affidavit of Gabriel Valerio and to Preclude Testimony at Trial, by William Francis Galvin, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 09/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/17/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike Portions of the 144 Affidavit of Giovanna Negretti and to Preclude Use of Testimony at Trial, by William Francis Galvin, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 09/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/17/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike Portions of the 155 Affidavit of James E. Cofield and to Preclude Use of Testimony at Trial by William Francis Galvin, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 09/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/17/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike 132 Affidavit of City Councilor Charles H. Turner and to Preclude Use of Testimony at Trial, by William Francis Galvin, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 09/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/17/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Strike Portions of the 156 Affidavit of Willie Maud Hurd and to Preclude Use of Testimony at Trial by William Francis Galvin, filed, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 09/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/17/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike 141 Affidavit of David Viera and to Preclude Use of His Testimony at Trial by William Francis Galvin, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 09/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/17/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert 162 Affidavit of George Pillsbury and to Preclude Use of Testimony at Trial, by William Francis Galvin, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 09/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/17/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Strike Portions of the 163 Affidavit of George Pillsbury and to Preclude Testimomy at Trial by William Francis Galvin, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 09/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/17/2003 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of 20 Pages in support of Deft's Motion in Limine To Preclude Testimony of Pltf's Expert, Carol Hardy-Fanta, Ph.D., by William Francis Galvin, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 09/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/17/2003 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of 189 MOTION in Limine to preclude the testimony of pltfs' expert Carol Hardy-Fanta, Ph.D., filed by William Francis Galvin, c/s. (Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 09/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/16/2003 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine to preclude the testimony of pltfs' expert, Carol Hardy-Fanta, Ph.D., by William Francis Galvin, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 09/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/16/2003 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Professor James T. Campen, by William Francis Galvin, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 09/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/16/2003 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Professor Thomas E. Patterson by William Francis Galvin, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 09/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/16/2003 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Professor Engstrom, by William Francis Galvin, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 09/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/16/2003 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 09/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/16/2003 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRIAL Memorandum by William Francis Galvin, FILED. (Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 09/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/16/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Lloyd King on behalf of pltfs by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega, FILED. (Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 09/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/16/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Carolyn Ray on behalf of pltfs Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega, FILED. (Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 09/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/16/2003 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Pltfs' List of Agreed-Upon Exhibits by Magaly Camacho, Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega, FILED.(Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 09/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/16/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Pltfs' Significant Objections to and MOTION to Strike 94 Affidavit, 95 Affidavit, 96 Affidavit, 89 Affidavit by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega, FILED, c/s.(Boyce, Kathy) (Entered: 09/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/10/2003 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff's Joint Marked Response to Defendant's proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/10/2003 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine to exclude affidavit testimony of eight late-identified witnesses by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega.(Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/10/2003 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiff's marked response to Defendant's Request for Findings of Fact by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) Attachments: Pages 1-50, Pages 51-100, and Pages 101-161. (Entered: 09/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/10/2003 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's Marked response to defendant's Request for Conclusions of Law by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/10/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Strike 115 SUPPLEMENTAL Affidavit, and 88 Affidavit of Peter Morrison by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega.(Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/10/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike 116 Affidavit and 117 Supplemental Affidavit of Harold Stanley by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega.(Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/10/2003 Pretrial Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 9/5/2003, Entered: 9/8/2003 Motion to Amend
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT MOTION to Amend sections II.(6)(a), II.(9) and III.(2)(b) of June 10, 2003 73 Procedural Order re pretrial/trial as amended by order dated July 10, 2003 by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, William Francis Galvin, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega.(Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 26 Motion for Protective Order and 45 Motion to Compel production of information as to which legislative privilege has been asserted, filed by Thomas M. Petrolati. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response in letter form by Michael Lurie to 87 Letter/request (non-motion) from Mitchell J. Matorin re: recent decision in USDC SDNY. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter/request (non-motion) from Mary L. Cataudella re: defendant's intent to respond to letter of 8/8/03. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Letter/request (non-motion)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter/request (non-motion) from Jeanne M. Luchette re: copies sent to Judge Selya and Judge Ponsor. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter/request (non-motion) from Mitchell J. Matorin re: CD containing electronic copies of the materials filed by plaintiffs on 8/15/03. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Designation of experts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITIONS by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Barbara Salfity. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Guillermo Quinteros. (Signed Original). (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of George Pillsbury. (Signed Original). (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Expert AFFIDAVIT of George Pillsbury. (Signed Original) (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Carol Hardy-Fanta, Ph.D. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of John R. Logan, Ph.D. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of James T. Campen, Ph.D. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Expert AFFIDAVIT of George Pillsbury. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Louis Elisa. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Willie Maud Hurd. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of James E. Cofield, Jr. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Lloyd King. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Carolyn Ray. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Thomas E. Patterson, Ph.D. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 151 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Richard L. Engstrom, Ph.D. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of State Senator Dianne Wilkerson. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Leonard Aklins. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Reverend Richard Richardson. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Nancy Cook. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Brenda Lopes. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Horace Small. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Giovanna Negretti. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Nelson Merced. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Frank Jones. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of David Vieira. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Eddie Jenkins. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Enid Bailey. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Dorothea Jones. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Carmen Pola. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Roscoe Morris. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Mukiya Baker-Gomez. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Flora Jean Howard. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of George Pillsbury. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Charles H. Turner. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 09/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of John R. Logan. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Dr. John E. Harmon. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Robert Fitzpatrick. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT of Professor John E. Harmon. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 126 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Richard Engstrom. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Guillermo Quinteros. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Angel Meza. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Gabriel Valerio. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Marta T. Rosa. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Gladys Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT of Kimball William Brace. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT of Kimball William Brace. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Kimball William Brace. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT of Harold W. Stanley. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Harold W. Stanley. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Peter A. Morrison, Ph.D. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT of Kimball William Brace (filed by William Francis Galvin). (Greenberg, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Donald Gorton (filed by William Francis Galvin). (Greenberg, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Richard W. Cole, Esq. (filed by William Francis Galvin). (Greenberg, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Peter Wilson, Esq. (filed by William Francis Galvin). (Greenberg, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Barbara Ferrer, Ph.D. (filed by William Francis Galvin). (Greenberg, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Monserrate Quinones (filed by William Francis Galvin). (Greenberg, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of John L. LaCroix, Esq. (filed by William Francis Galvin). (Greenberg, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of John Corbin (filed by William Francis Galvin). (Greenberg, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Mary Logalbo, Esq. (filed by William Francis Galvin). (Greenberg, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT of Hollis Young (filed by William Francis Galvin). (Greenberg, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Hollis Young (filed by William Francis Galvin). (Greenberg, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Suzanne Condon (filed by William Francis Galvin). (Greenberg, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Martha Goldsmith (filed by William Francis Galvin). (Greenberg, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Deborah Klein Walker (filed by William Francis Galvin). (Greenberg, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Neal Michaels (filed by William Francis Galvin). (Greenberg, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Howard Haywood (filed by William Francis Galvin). (Greenberg, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Charles Baker (filed by William Francis Galvin). (Greenberg, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Thomas J. O'Malley (filed by William Francis Galvin). (Greenberg, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Thomas M. Finneran (filed by William Francis Galvin). (Greenberg, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Liz Malia (filed by William Francis Galvin). (Greenberg, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Eugene L. O'Flaherty (filed by William Francis Galvin). (Greenberg, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Robert Bishop (filed by William Francis Galvin). (Greenberg, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Nancy Lo (filed by William Francis Galvin). (Greenberg, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of John K. McCarthy (filed by William Francis Galvin). (Greenberg, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Michelle Tassinari (filed by William Francis Galvin). (Greenberg, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Thomas Petrolati (filed by William Francis Galvin). (Greenberg, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT of Peter A. Morrison, PH.D. (filed by William Francis Galvin) (Greenberg, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: 8/11/2003 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter/request (non-motion) from Mitchell J. Matorin re: recent decision in USDC SDNY. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 08/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/6/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supplemental Exhibit List by William Francis Galvin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 08/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/1/2003, Entered: 8/5/2003 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit List by William Francis Galvin.(Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 08/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/1/2003, Entered: 8/5/2003 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Exhibit List by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 08/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/15/2003, Entered: 7/18/2003 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance: Attorney Kenneth A. Sansone terminated. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 07/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: 7/14/2003 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FURTHER JOINT STATUS REPORT regarding stipulations on census data by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, William Francis Galvin, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 07/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on January 17, 2003 before Judge Woodlock. Court Reporter: Pamela R. Owens. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 07/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Scheduling Conference held on January 9, 2003 before Judge Woodlock. Court Reporter: Pamela R. Owens. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 07/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on January 7, 2003 before Judge Woodlock. Court Reporter: Pamela R. Owens. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 07/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: 7/9/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to extend dates in Order Regulating Non-Jury Trial by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega.(Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 07/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT regarding stiulations on census data by Thomas F. Birmingham, Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, William Francis Galvin, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 07/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Trial Witness List by William Francis Galvin.(Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 06/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Pre-trial Witness List by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega.(Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 06/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 74 Filed: 6/17/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE 68 MOTION to Strike 61 Declaration,, 62 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion,, 63 Declaration,, 64 Declaration,, 65 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 66 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 67 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, filed by Plaintiffs. (Greenberg, Rebecca) (Entered: 06/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: 6/10/2003 Procedural Order re pretrial/trialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered PROCEDURAL ORDER REGULATING NON-JURY TRIAL, Motions terminated: 58 MOTION to Continue trial to 9/22/03 filed by Magaly Camacho, Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., OISTE. Bench Trial set for 11/10/2003 10:00 AM before Three judge panel of Selya, Woodlock and Ponsor, JJ..(Woodlock, Douglas) (Entered: 06/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 6/9/2003 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reply to supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re 45 Motion to Compel filed by Thomas M. Petrolati. (Rynne, Michelle) Modified on 6/10/2003 (Rynne, Michelle). (Entered: 06/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Corrected and signed AFFIDAVIT of Carol Hardy-Fants, Ph.D. in Opposition re 50 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 06/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/29/2003, Entered: 6/2/2003 Recommendations for Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's comments on possibility of trial date being continued to 11/10/03. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 06/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/29/2003, Entered: 6/2/2003 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Document(s) submitted by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, William Francis Galvin, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Thomas M. Petrolati, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega received for filing. Document received: proposed order regulating non-jury trial. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 06/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: 6/2/2003 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike 61 Declaration, 62 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 63 Declaration, 64 Declaration, 65 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 66 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 67 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, by William Francis Galvin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit b# 3 Exhibit c# 4 Exhibit d)(Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 06/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 67 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Richard L. Engstrom, Ph.D. in Opposition re 50 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega.(BOUND DOCUMENT - NOT SCANNED) (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 05/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Kenneth A. Sonsome, Esq. in Opposition re 50 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega.(BOUND DOCUMENT - NOT SCANNED) (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 05/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 65 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Juan Vega in Opposition re 50 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 05/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Carol Hardy-Fanta, Ph.D. re 50 Motion for Summary Judgment by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 05/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of John R. Logan, Ph.D. re 50 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega.(BOUND DOCUMENT - NOT SCANNED) (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 05/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Professor John Harmon in Opposition re 50 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (BOUND DOCUMENT - NOT SCANNED) (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 05/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Thomas E. Patterson re 50 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Thomas M. Petrolati, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (BOUND DOCUMENT - NOT SCANNED) (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 05/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 60 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003 Statement of Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiffs' STATEMENT of facts re 50 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 05/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 59 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 50 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 05/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Continue trial to 9/22/03 by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega.(Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 05/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of William DeVaul, Esq in Support re 45 Motion to Compel production of information as to which legislative privilege has been asserted . (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 05/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re 45 Motion to Compel production of information as to which legislative privilege has been asserted filed by Magaly Camacho, Chelsea's Commission on Hispanic Affairs, Inc., Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, OISTE, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 05/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: 5/13/2003 Set DeadlinesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. Amended Notice of Hearing/conference: set status conference for 10:00 5/19/03 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock . cc/cl (mr) (Entered: 05/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: 5/13/2003 Set DeadlinesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Douglas P. Woodlock . Notice of Hearing/conference: Motion hearing before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock set for 10:00 5/19/03 for [26-1] motion for protective order , set further scheduling conference for 10:00 5/19/03 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock . cc/cl (mr) (Entered: 05/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit of Kimball William Brace, re: [50-1] motion for summary judgment , filed. (mr) (Entered: 05/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statement of Facts by William Francis Galvin re: [50-1] motion for summary judgment , filed. (mr) (Entered: 05/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum by William Francis Galvin in support of [50-1] motion for summary judgment , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 05/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion by William Francis Galvin for summary judgment , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 05/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to Motion by Magaly Camacho, Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega, Chelsea's Commission, OISTE to extend time to 3/21/03 to serve expert disclosures and reports and to 4/4/03 to serve revised/amended reports , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 03/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of change of address filed by Brenda Wright . (mr) (Entered: 03/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response by Thomas M. Petrolati in opposition to [45-1] motion to compel production of information as to which legislative privilege has been asserted , filed. c/s (mr) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/21/2003 (Greenberg, Rebecca). (Entered: 02/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Assented to Motion by Thomas M. Petrolati to extend time to 2/19/03 to file opposition to motion to compel , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 02/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion by Magaly Camacho, Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega, Chelsea's Commission, OISTE to compel production of information as to which legislative privilege has been asserted , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 02/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/28/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. Scheduling Order entered, motion to compel by 1/31/03, response by 2/14/03; by 1/24/03 firm dates for depositions of the remaining 13 plaintiffs to be completed by 2/7/03; non-expert discovery by 4/29/03; plaintiff to identify witnesses by 1/21/03; deft to identify witnesses by 2/4/03; experts by 3/14/03; expert depositions by 4/29/03; request for admissions by 3/17/03, response by 4/15/03; summary judgment motions by 5/5/03, oppositions by 5/27/03; no replies; set hearing on any motions for summary judgment for 2:00 6/2/03 before Judge Seyla, Ponsor and Woodlock , set bench trial for 8/18/03 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock . cc/cl [EOD Date 1/28/03] (mr) (Entered: 01/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Douglas P. Woodlock . Clerk's Notes: re: scheduling conference; scheduling order issued; Court Reporter: Pam Owens (mr) (Entered: 01/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental Memorandum by Thomas M. Petrolati re: legislative privilege filed. c/s (kf) (Entered: 01/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 Set DeadlinesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Douglas P. Woodlock . Notice of Hearing/conference: set scheduling conference for 8:00 1/17/03 and bench trial for 8/18/03 at 9:00 . cc/cl (kf) (Entered: 01/15/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Douglas P. Woodlock . Clerk's Notes: re: scheduling conference, All non-expert discovery (2/3/03 enlarged to 4/15/03). Plaintiff's witnesses to be ID by: 1/21 ID by plaintiff of witness, 2/4 ID by defendant of witnesses, 3/1/03 ID all other witnesses who have become known; 3/9/03 to disclose any opposiing witnesses, 3/14 for expert disclosures, expert depo discovery by 4/29/03; req. for admissions 3/15, responses 4/15. Defendant to file further brief by 1/14/03. set scheduling conference for 8:00 1/17/03 , set bench trial for 8/18/03 Court Reporter: Owens (kf) (Entered: 01/15/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Status report re: motion for protective order by Thomas M. Petrolati , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 01/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Seyla, Judge Ponsor, Judge Woodlock . Clerk's Notes: re: motion hearing with three-judge panel; 15 minutes per side; [26-1] motion for protective order taken under advisement, set scheduling conference for 11:00 1/9/03 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock ; plaintiff should provide narrower requests for discovery; Court Reporter: Pam Owens (mr) (Entered: 01/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Brief re: respondents' assertions of legislative privilege by Magaly Camacho, Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega, Chelsea's Commission, OISTE , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 01/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/23/2002 Set DeadlinesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Douglas P. Woodlock . Notice of Hearing/conference: Motion hearing before Judge Seyla, Judge Ponsor and Judge Woodlock set for 1:30 1/7/03 for [26-1] motion for protective order , and set scheduling conference for 1:30 1/7/03 . cc/cl (mr) (Entered: 12/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sur reply by Magaly Camacho, Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega, Chelsea's Commission, OISTE, Black Political Task Force et al, to reply to [26-1] motion for protective order filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 12/02/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion by Magaly Camacho, Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega, Chelsea's Commission, OISTE, Black Political Task Force et al for leave to file sur-reply , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 12/02/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Reply by Thomas M. Petrolati to response to [26-1] motion for protective order , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 10/30/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Assented to Motion by Thomas M. Petrolati for leave to file reply to motion for protective order , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 10/30/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum by Magaly Camacho, Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega, Chelsea's Commission, OISTE in opposition to [26-1] motion for protective order , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 10/16/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Assented to Motion by Magaly Camacho, Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega, Chelsea's Commission, OISTE to extend time to 10/15/02 to file opposition , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 10/16/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/27/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of appearance of attorney for William Francis Galvin by Michael D. Lurie, Mary L. Cataudella, Elizabeth C. Sackett, filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 09/27/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum by Thomas M. Petrolati in support of [26-1] motion for protective order , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 09/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion by Thomas M. Petrolati for leave to file brief in excess of 20 pages , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 09/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion by Thomas M. Petrolati for protective order , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 09/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/13/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to Motion by William Francis Galvin to extend time to 9/20/02 to file motion for protective order and to 10/7/02 for opposition , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 09/16/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of appearance of attorney for William Francis Galvin by Steven P. Perlmutter, filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 08/13/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/1/2002, Entered: 8/2/2002 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer by William Francis Galvin to substituted first amended complaint, filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 08/02/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/25/2002, Entered: 7/25/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. Order re: filing of documents with Three Judge Panel, entered. All pleadings/material filed in this Court to date, and any future filinds shall be emailed to Judge Selya; Original pleadings/material to be filed in the Clerk's Office in Boston and copies mailed to Judge Ponsor in Springfield. cc/cl.[EOD Date 7/25/02] (mr) (Entered: 07/25/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/16/2002 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Substituted Amended complaint and request for three-judge court by Magaly Camacho, Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega, Chelsea's Commission, OISTE filed. . Amended amends [2-1] complaint. c/s (mr) Modified on 07/16/2002 (Entered: 07/16/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/9/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Chief Judge Michael Boudin, United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit. Order entered. For the purpose of establishing a three-judge district court above-captioned cases, I hereby designate, pursuant to 28 USC section 2285, Circuit Judge Bruce M. Selya and District Judge Michael A. Ponsor, to serve with Judge Douglas P. Woodlock as members that court. cc/cl [EOD Date 7/9/02] (mr) (Entered: 07/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/9/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Douglas P. Woodlock . Order and notice of transfer entered. The initial erroneous treatment of 02-11190 as not related to 02-10428 is hereby corrected by the transfer of 02-1190 to Judge Woodlock for further proceedings. cc/cl [EOD Date 7/9/02] (mr) (Entered: 07/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/27/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 Amended ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First Amended complaint and request for Three-Judge Court by Magaly Camacho, Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega, Chelsea's Commission, OISTE filed. . Amended complaint amends [2-1] complaint. (mr) (Entered: 07/01/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/27/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Douglas P. Woodlock . Scheduling Order entered setting motion to amend allowed, however, plaintiff shall file second amended complaint; non-expert Discovery cutoff 12/20/02 Expert witness list due on 2/28/03, depositions by 3/30/03; interrogatories re: intentional discrimination asap, deft's shall repons via motion for protective order by 9/17/02, plaintiff's opposition by 10/1/02, hearing will be set. cc/cl [EOD Date 7/1/02] (mr) (Entered: 07/01/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/27/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. Notice to the Chief Judge of the United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit pursuant to 28 USC 2284 entered. (Three Judge Panel) cc/cl [EOD Date 7/1/02] (mr) (Entered: 07/01/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/27/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Douglas P. Woodlock . Clerk's Notes: re: scheduling conference; motion to amend complaint allowed - parties shall submit a 2nd amended complaint that reflects only the Secretary of State as the defendant; 3 Judge Panel to be appointed; case before Judge Young 02-11190 is related on certain issues (remedial) but Cohen & Pierce take position cases should not be consolidated at this time; decision needed by 3/30/04 in both cases; re: intentional discrimination claim - discovery needed; issue of legislative privilege addressed; provisional schedule set; Court Reporter: Pam Owens (mr) (Entered: 07/01/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/20/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint statement by Magaly Camacho, Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega, Chelsea's Commission, OISTE, William Francis Galvin for scheduling conference . (eaf) (Entered: 06/24/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/20/2002, Entered: 6/24/2002 Certificate of Consultation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Pltf's Certificate of Consultation re: budget for costs, adr, filed. (eaf) (Entered: 06/24/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/20/2002, Entered: 6/24/2002 Joint statement re scheduling conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended Joint statement by Magaly Camacho, Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega, Chelsea's Commission, OISTE, William Francis Galvin for scheduling conference . (eaf) (Entered: 06/24/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/13/2002, Entered: 6/17/2002 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to Motion by Magaly Camacho, Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega, Chelsea's Commission, OISTE to amend [2-1] substituted complaint , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 06/17/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/8/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer by William Francis Galvin to complaint , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 05/08/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Stipulation of dismissal of certain defendants by Magaly Camacho, Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega, Chelsea's Commission, OISTE without prejudice as to Thomas M. Finneran, Thomas F. Birmingham, and Jane Swift, filed. (mr) (Entered: 05/07/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: 4/26/2002 Set DeadlinesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Douglas P. Woodlock . Notice of Hearing/conference: set scheduling conference for 3:00 6/27/02 . cc/cl (kf) (Entered: 04/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: 4/26/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. Order for Briefing entered . [EOD Date 4/26/02] cc/cl (kf) (Entered: 04/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/22/2002, Entered: 3/27/2002 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Brenda Wright , re: [5-1] motion for Brenda Wright to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: $50 Receipt #: 37922 , filed. (mr) (Entered: 03/27/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/22/2002, Entered: 3/27/2002 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to Motion by Magaly Camacho, Francisco Dominguez, Angel Meza, Karen Pazos, Gabriel Valerio, Juan Vega, Chelsea's Commission, OISTE for Brenda Wright to appear pro hac vice fee status: paid fee amt: $50 Receipt #: 37922 , filed. c/s (mr) (Entered: 03/27/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 Acknowledgment of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Acknowledgement of service as to Thomas M. Finneran, Thomas F. Birmingham, Jane Swift, William Francis Galvin on 3/19/02 , Answer due on 4/8/02 for William Francis Galvin, for Jane Swift, for Thomas F. Birmingham, for Thomas M. Finneran filed. (mr) (Entered: 03/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of appearance of attorney for Thomas M. Finneran, Thomas F. Birmingham, Jane Swift, William Francis Galvin by Peter Sacks, Lawrence S. DiCara, filed. (mr) (Entered: 03/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/13/2002 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Substituted Complaint filed. (mr) (Entered: 03/13/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/13/2002 ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Complaint filed. Case assigned to Judge: Woodlock. Receipt #: 37596 Amount:$ 150. Fee Status: paid (mr) (Entered: 03/13/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 10 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?