Carpenter, ex rel. v. Abbott Laboratories
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10918
District Judge Richard G. Stearns, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Patrick Carpenter, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary L. Azorsky +1 215 875 3000 +8754 875 875 4604
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joy P. Clairmont +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4604 jclairmont@bm.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeanne A. Markey +1 215 875 3000 +8755 875 875 5715

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenspun Shapiro Davis & Leary PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Shapiro +1 703 684 1700 +1 703 591 7268 js@greenspunlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stern, Shapiro, Weissberg & Garin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexandra H. Deal +1 617 742 5800 +1 617 742 5858 adeal@sswg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lynn G. Weissberg +1 617 742 5800 +1 617 742 5858 lweissberg@sswg.com
v.
Abbott Laboratories, Inc. Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Francis Hurst +1 312 558 5230 +1 312 558 5700

Toggle Switch Represented by Donnelly, Conroy & Gelhaar, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael S. D'Orsi +1 617 720 2880 +1 617 720 3554 msd@dcglaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter E. Gelhaar +1 617 720 2880 +1 617 720 3554 peg@dcglaw.com

Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

No Logo Commonwealth of Virginia, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Commonwealth of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tracey D Stith +1 804 786 3870 +1 804 786 0807
No Logo State of California, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carlotta R Hivoral +1 619 688 6073 +1 619 688 4200 carlotta.hivoral@doj.ca.gov
No Logo STATE OF FLORIDA, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Concourse Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donna R. Rohwer +1 813 287 7940 donna.rohwer@myfloridalegal.com
No Logo State of Michigan, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Michigan Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MARK MATUS +1 517 241 6500 +1 517 241 6515 matusm@michigan.gov
No Logo State of New York, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by New York State Department Of Health

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sherrie Brown +1 212 417 5386 +4175 417 417 5335 sherrie.brown@ag.ny.gov
No Logo State of Texas, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Texas Medicaid Fraud Control Unit

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Noelle C. Letteri +1 512 936 1365 +1 512 495 9518
United States of America United States of America, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer C. Boal +1 617 748 3100 jennifer.boal@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald J. Savery +1 617 748 3336 +1 617 748 3971 donald.savery@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 31 U.S.C. § 3729
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (56) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER allowing in part and denying in part 42 MOTION to Dismiss by Abbott Laboratories, Inc.(RGS, law2) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
    Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER (re: USA having declined to intervene and re: seal remaining on case) entered. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
      NOTICE by United States of America of Election to Decline Intervention (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Savery, Donald) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
        NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
          Transcript of Motion Hearing held on January 20, 2010, before Judge Stearns. Court Reporter: Debra M. Joyce at joycedebra@gmail.com. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 3/16/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/26/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/24/2010. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None Amended Complaint
            Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Abbott Laboratories, Inc. / PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO THE FEDERAL FALSE CLAIMS ACT, 31 U.S.C. §§ 3729 ET SEQ. AND PENDENT STATE FALSE CLAIMS ACTS, filed by Patrick Carpenter.(Azorsky, Gary) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 52 Filed: 1/12/2010, Entered: None
              SUR-REPLY to Motion re 42 MOTION to Dismiss / Plaintiff's Sur-Reply Memorandum Of Law In Opposition To Defendant Abbott's Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Patrick Carpenter. (Azorsky, Gary) (Entered: 01/12/2010)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/12/2010, Entered: None
                Consent MOTION to Amend / Consent Motion For Leave To Amend Complaint For Limited Purpose Of Changing Defendant's Name To Abbott Laboratories, Inc. by Patrick Carpenter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A. Proposed Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Azorsky, Gary) (Entered: 01/12/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/5/2010, Entered: None
                  NOTICE by Abbott Laboratories re Order on Motion for Leave to File, Supplemental Authorities (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Hopper v. Soloway, # 2 Exhibit In re Zyprexa)(Frederick, Thomas) (Entered: 01/05/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 49 Filed: 1/5/2010, Entered: None
                    REPLY to Response to 42 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Abbott Laboratories. (Frederick, Thomas) (Entered: 01/05/2010)
                      LREF
                      Blank 48 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None
                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 45 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss (CORRECTED) PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Patrick Carpenter. (Azorsky, Gary) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: None
                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 42 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S CORRECTED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ABBOTT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Patrick Carpenter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Azorsky, Gary) (Entered: 12/22/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: None
                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 42 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ABBOTT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Patrick Carpenter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Azorsky, Gary) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None
                            AMENDED MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss (CORRECTED) by Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Frederick, Thomas) Modified on 12/16/2009 (RGS, law2). (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None
                              MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority in Support of its Motion to Dismiss by Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Frederick, Thomas) Modified to term motion on 12/16/2009, refiled as 45 . (RGS, law2). (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 43 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None
                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 42 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Abbott Laboratories. (Frederick, Thomas) (Entered: 11/13/2009)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 42 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                  MOTION to Dismiss by Abbott Laboratories.(Frederick, Thomas) (Entered: 11/13/2009)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None
                                    JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (D'Orsi, Michael) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None
                                      CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Abbott Laboratories.(D'Orsi, Michael) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None
                                        CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Patrick Carpenter.(Shapiro, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          NOTICE of Scheduling Conference/Status Conference: Scheduling/Status Conference set for 11/2/2009 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Seelye, Terri) (Entered: 10/16/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None
                                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time (Extending Time to Respond to Complaint and Setting Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss) by Abbott Laboratories.(D'Orsi, Michael) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: None
                                              Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Kathleen B. Barry Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000002622959. by Abbott Laboratories.(D'Orsi, Michael) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Thomas J. Frederick Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000002622929. by Abbott Laboratories.(D'Orsi, Michael) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                  Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John W. Moss Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000002622861. by Abbott Laboratories.(D'Orsi, Michael) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                    Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of James F. Hurst Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000002622832. by Abbott Laboratories.(D'Orsi, Michael) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Abbott Laboratories. (D'Orsi, Michael) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Peter E. Gelhaar on behalf of Abbott Laboratories (Gelhaar, Peter) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. D'Orsi on behalf of Abbott Laboratories (D'Orsi, Michael) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Patrick Carpenter. Abbott Laboratories waiver sent on 8/20/2009, answer due 10/19/2009. (Clairmont, Joy) (Entered: 08/24/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT against Abbott Laboratories, filed by Patrick Carpenter.(Clairmont, Joy) (Entered: 08/20/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                State of Tennessee Notice of Non-Intervention (York, Steve) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  State of New York Notice of Non-Intervention (York, Steve) (Entered: 06/04/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    Commonwealth of Virginia Sealed Notice of Non-Intervention (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(York, Steve) (Entered: 06/03/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      State of Florida sealed Notice of Non-Intervention (York, Steve) (Entered: 06/03/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                        State of California sealed Notice of Non-Intervention (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(York, Steve) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jeanne A. Markey Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000002443864. by Patrick Carpenter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Jeanne A. Markey, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Joy P. Clairmont Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000002443837. by Patrick Carpenter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Joy P. Clairmont, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Gary L. Azorsky Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000002443806. by Patrick Carpenter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Gary L. Azorsky, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shapiro, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                State of Michigan's Notice of none Intervening by State of Michigan (York, Steve) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                  State of Texas sealed Notice of Non-Intervention. (York, Steve) . (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                    Notice of the United States that it is not Intervening at this time (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(York, Steve) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                      Unopposed Motion to Continue Seal of Complaint and request for a Conference by Abbott Laboratories.(York, Steve) (Entered: 03/18/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 12 MOTION Ex Parte Motion for a partial lifting of the seal filed by United States of America. (York, Steve) (Entered: 02/12/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                          Ex Parte Motion for a partial lifting of the seal by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(York, Steve) (Entered: 02/12/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 10 Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to 10/16/2009 to determine whether to Intervene filed by United States of America. (York, Steve) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                              Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to 10/16/2009 to determine whether to Intervene by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(York, Steve) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Donald J. Savery on behalf of United States of America (York, Steve) (Entered: 12/18/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Memorandum re 7 Second Motion For Extension of Time to determine whether to Intervene (York, Steve) (Entered: 04/14/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Second Motion For Extension of Time to determine whether to Intervene by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(York, Steve) (Entered: 04/14/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Michigan Attorney General's Notice of Reliance on Extension of Seal (York, Steve) (Entered: 09/27/2007)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to 4/18/2008 to to Intervene filed by United States of America. (York, Steve) (Entered: 07/11/2007)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to 4/18/2008 to determine whether to Intervene by United States of America.(York, Steve) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/11/2007 (York, Steve). (Entered: 07/11/2007)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Motion to with hold issuance of summons by Patrick Carpenter.(York, Steve) Modified on 5/23/2007 (York, Steve). (Entered: 05/15/2007)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Relator's Motion to file Complaint in Camera and to place Complaint and all other papers in this matter under seal and to impound by Patrick Carpenter.(York, Steve) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2007 (York, Steve). (Entered: 05/15/2007)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against Abbott Laboratories, filed by State of Michigan, State of Nevada, State of New York, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, Commonwealth of Virginia, Patrick Carpenter, United States of America, State of California, State of Delaware, District of Columbia, State of Florida, State of Illinois, State of Indiana, Commonwealth of Massachusetts. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint part 2)(York, Steve) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2007 (York, Steve). (Entered: 05/15/2007)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 230 times.

                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?