Boston Duck Tours v. Super Duck Tours, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-11222

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 5, 2017 at 8:16 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (59) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/5/2010, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Super Duck Tours, LLC. (Dalton, Joshua) (Entered: 01/05/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Appearance by Edward V. Colbert, III on behalf of Boston Duck Tours (Colbert, Edward) (Entered: 11/02/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: None
      USCA No. 07-2078, 07-2246 TAXATION OF COSTS: Costs in favor of defendant-appellant, cross-appellee Super Duck Tours, LLC are taxed as follows: Docket Fee...$450.00 Reproduction of opening brief for defendant-appellant...$107.90 Reproduction of reply brief for defendant-appellant...$88.40 Reproduction of appendix...$369.20 TOTAL...$1,015.50 Pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 39 (d)(3), the district court is directed to add this taxation of costs to the mandate issued on July 10, 2008. Taxation of Costs issued in the USCA 8/21/2008 (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 08/22/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: None
        MANDATE of USCA as to 35 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by Boston Duck Tours, 23 Notice of Appeal, filed by Super Duck Tours, LLC. Mandate issued in the USCA 7/10/2008 (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 07/10/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: None
          OPINION of USCA. Opinion issued in the USCA 6/18/2008 (Attachments: # 1 part2, # 2 part 3)(Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 06/19/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: None
            USCA Judgment as to 35 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by Boston Duck Tours, 23 Notice of Appeal, filed by Super Duck Tours, LLC. Upon consideration whereof, it is now here ordered, adjudged and decreed as follows: The district court's order is reversed and the matter is remanded to the district court for further proceedings consistent with the opinion issued this day. Costs are awarded in favor of Appellant Super Duck Tours. Judgment issued in the USCA 6/18/2008 (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 06/19/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Lawrence T. Stanley, Jr (Stanley, Lawrence) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Victor H. Polk, Jr (Polk, Victor) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: None
                  ANSWER to Counterclaim by Boston Duck Tours(Limited Partnership).(Kenney, Thomas) (Entered: 12/11/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER"In accordance with the foregoing, the defendant's motion for clarification of the preliminary injunction (Docket No. 29) is ALLOWED. So ordered."(Sonnenberg, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/05/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: None
                      Assented to MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kerry L. Timbers, Julia Huston, Peter J. Karol and Courtney M. Quish by Boston Duck Tours.(Karol, Peter) (Entered: 12/04/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D. Engebretson on behalf of Boston Duck Tours(Limited Partnership) (Engebretson, Christopher D.) (Entered: 12/04/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Kenney on behalf of Boston Duck Tours(Limited Partnership) (Kenney, Thomas) (Entered: 12/04/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Robert R. Pierce on behalf of Boston Duck Tours(Limited Partnership) (Pierce, Robert) (Entered: 12/04/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: None
                              Second MOTION for Extension of Time to December 9, 2007 to File Answer re 42 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Discover Boston by Boston Duck Tours.(Karol, Peter) (Entered: 10/29/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: None
                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 29 Emergency MOTION to Determine Compliance with Injunction Entered by Court re 21 Memorandum & ORDER, 36 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File A Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion to Determine Compliance with Injunction Entered by Court filed by Super Duck Tours, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Polk, Victor) (Entered: 10/18/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: None
                                  Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to November 9, 2007 to FILE AN ANSWER TO DEFENDANT DISCOVER BOSTONS COUNTERCLAIMS AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Boston Duck Tours(Limited Partnership).(Quish, Courtney) (Entered: 09/28/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: None
                                    Discover Boston's ANSWER to Amended Complaint of Boston Duck Tours, COUNTERCLAIM against Boston Duck Tours by Discover Boston Multi-Lingual Trolley Tours, Inc..(Sales, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/24/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                                      ANSWER to Counterclaim and Affirmative Defenses by Boston Duck Tours.(Karol, Peter) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: None
                                        USCA Case Number 07-2246 for 35 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by Boston Duck Tours. (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 08/20/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: None
                                          ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Boston Duck Tours by Super Duck Tours, LLC.(Dalton, Joshua) (Entered: 08/16/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None
                                            Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 35 Notice of Cross Appeal, (Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 08/13/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: None
                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed Discover Boston Multi-Lingual Trolley Tours, Inc. served on 8/6/2007, answer due 8/27/2007. (Karol, Peter) (Entered: 08/10/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                Assented to MOTION for Leave to File A Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion to Determine Compliance with Injunction Entered by Court by Super Duck Tours, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Defendant's Reply Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Determine Compliance with Injunction Entered by Court# 2 Exhibit A to Reply Brief)(Polk, Victor) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to 21 Memorandum & ORDER by Boston Duck Tours. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 1621020. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/clerks/transcript.htm MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals.Appeal Record due by 8/27/2007. (Karol, Peter) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT against Discover Boston Multi-Lingual Trolley Tours, Inc., Super Duck Tours, LLC, filed by Boston Duck Tours.(Karol, Peter) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                      Opposition re 29 Emergency MOTION to Determine Compliance with Injunction Entered by Court re 21 Memorandum & ORDER filed by Boston Duck Tours. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H)(Karol, Peter) (Entered: 08/01/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                        Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re 23 Notice of Appeal, Documents included: 31 (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 07/30/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Motion for Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on Jul;y 11, 2007 before Judge Gorton. Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom. The original transcripts are maintained by the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/951-4555 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 07/30/2007)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                            USCA Case Number 07-2078 for 23 Notice of Appeal, filed by Super Duck Tours, LLC. (Gawlik, Cathy) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/27/2007 (Gawlik, Cathy). (Entered: 07/27/2007)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                              Emergency MOTION to Determine Compliance with Injunction Entered by Court re 21 Memorandum & ORDER by Super Duck Tours, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Polk, Victor) (Entered: 07/26/2007)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 23 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: # 1)(Ramos, Jeanette) (Entered: 07/20/2007)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                  Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 6, 2007 to File Response/Reply as to 1 Complaint by Super Duck Tours, LLC.(Stanley, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/20/2007)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Super Duck Tours, LLC for proceedings held on July 11, 2007 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton, re 23 Notice of Appeal, (Stanley, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/18/2007)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                      BOND in the amount of $ 100,000 posted by Boston Duck Tours (Nici, Richard) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                        Letter/request (non-motion) from Courtney Quish. (Nici, Richard) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 21 Memorandum & ORDER by Super Duck Tours, LLC Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 1592069 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/clerks/transcript.htm MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals.Appeal Record due by 8/2/2007. (Dalton, Joshua) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION to Stay re 21 Memorandum & ORDER by Super Duck Tours, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Dalton, Joshua) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton : ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: ORDER and PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Please see order for details.)(Sonnenberg, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Victor H. Polk, Jr on behalf of Super Duck Tours, LLC (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/11/2007)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Dalton on behalf of Super Duck Tours, LLC (Sonnenberg, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/11/2007)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Boston Duck Tours. (Quish, Courtney) (Entered: 07/11/2007)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Alan Johnson re 14 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Further Support of Its Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Super Duck Tours, LLC. (Stanley, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/11/2007)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                        DECLARATION re 14 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Further Support of Its Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Courtney M. Quish by Boston Duck Tours. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Errata B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Errata K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N# 15 Exhibit O# 16 Exhibit P# 17 Exhibit Q# 18 Exhibit R)(Quish, Courtney) (Entered: 07/10/2007)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                          DECLARATION re 14 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Further Support of Its Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Cynthia L. Brown by Boston Duck Tours. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Quish, Courtney) (Entered: 07/10/2007)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                            Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Further Support of Its Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Boston Duck Tours. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Quish, Courtney) (Entered: 07/10/2007)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Stephanie Corley re 9 Opposition to Motion by Super Duck Tours, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Dalton, Joshua) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Sara Cable re 9 Opposition to Motion by Super Duck Tours, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2a# 3 Exhibit 2b# 4 Exhibit 2c# 5 Exhibit 2d# 6 Exhibit 3a# 7 Exhibit 3b# 8 Exhibit 4# 9 Exhibit 5# 10 Exhibit 6# 11 Exhibit 7)(Dalton, Joshua) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Donald Fraser re 9 Opposition to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Super Duck Tours, LLC. (Stanley, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Dennis Kraez re 9 Opposition to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Super Duck Tours, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1A# 2 Exhibit 1B# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4# 6 Exhibit 5# 7 Exhibit 6# 8 Exhibit 7# 9 Exhibit 8# 10 Exhibit 9# 11 Exhibit 10# 12 Exhibit 11)(Stanley, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Opposition re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Super Duck Tours, LLC. (Dalton, Joshua) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Super Duck Tours, LLC.(Stanley, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed Super Duck Tours, LLC served on 7/3/2007, answer due 7/23/2007. (Karol, Peter) (Entered: 07/05/2007)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Duck Tours re 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (Quish, Courtney) (Entered: 07/03/2007)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Boston Duck Tours. (Quish, Courtney) (Entered: 07/03/2007)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Cynthia L. Brown re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Boston Duck Tours. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 4# 4 Exhibit 5# 5 Exhibit 7# 6 Exhibit 8) (Unable to scan Exhibit 3 and Exhibit 6, filed in hard copy in the clerk's office)(Folan, Karen) (Entered: 07/03/2007)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM of Law in Support re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Boston Duck Tours. (Folan, Karen) (Entered: 07/03/2007)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Boston Duck Tours.(Folan, Karen) (Entered: 07/03/2007)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007
                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Super Duck Tours, LLC, filed by Boston Duck Tours. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet # 2 Category Sheet)(Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?