Securities and Exchange Commission v. Madoff et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-10791
District Judge Louis L. Stanton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 11, 2017 at 6:40 AM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

United States Securities and Exchange Commission United States Securities and Exchange Commission, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Securities and Exchange Commission"

Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

v.
Madoff, Bernard L. Madoff, Bernard L., Defendant
Officially listed as "Bernard L. Madoff"

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickstein Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicole Pappas De Bello +1 212 835 1446 +1 212 997 9880 wrobleskin@dsmo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel James Horwitz +1 212 835 1400 +1 212 997 9880 horwitzd@dsmo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ira Lee Sorkin +1 212 277 6576 +1 212 997 9880 sorkini@dicksteinshapiro.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mauro Michael Wolfe +1 212 277 6726 +1 212 277 6501 wolfem@dicksteinshapiro.com
No Logo Blumenthal & Associates Florida General Partnership, ADR Provider

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Gluck +1 212 859 8015 +1 212 859 4000 mgluck@milberg.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan M. Landers +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 jlanders@milberg.com
No Logo Esq. Alan Nisselson, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by braunerbaron.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Regina Griffin +1 212 797 9100 +1 212 797 9161 rgriffin@braunerbaron.com
No Logo Horowitz Family Trust, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Gluck +1 212 859 8015 +1 212 859 4000 mgluck@milberg.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan M. Landers +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 jlanders@milberg.com
No Logo Judith Goldman, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Gluck +1 212 859 8015 +1 212 859 4000 mgluck@milberg.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan M. Landers +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 jlanders@milberg.com
No Logo Marc Cherno, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Gluck +1 212 859 8015 +1 212 859 4000 mgluck@milberg.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan M. Landers +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 jlanders@milberg.com
No Logo Martin Rappaport, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Gluck +1 212 859 8015 +1 212 859 4000 mgluck@milberg.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan M. Landers +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 jlanders@milberg.com
No Logo Martin Rappaport Charitable Remainder Unitrust, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Gluck +1 212 859 8015 +1 212 859 4000 mgluck@milberg.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan M. Landers +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 jlanders@milberg.com
No Logo Stephen Morganstern, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Gluck +1 212 859 8015 +1 212 859 4000 mgluck@milberg.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan M. Landers +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 jlanders@milberg.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 77
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (58) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 59 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ORDER PURSUANT TO MEMORANDUM FROM THE ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. COURTS, DATED JUNE 15TH, 1973....Case Closed administratively pursuant to Memorandum from the Administrative Office of the United States Courts dated June 15th, 1973.... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/9/2015) (kko) (Entered: 03/18/2015)
    LREF
    Blank 58 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: 6/25/2009 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
    ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION, granting 57 Motion for James A. Clarkson to Appear Pro Hac Vice.. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 6/24/09) (pl) Modified on 6/25/2009 (pl). (Entered: 06/25/2009)
      LREF
      Blank 57 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: 6/12/2009 motion to appear pro hac vice
      MOTION for James A. Clarkson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission.(mbe) (Entered: 06/12/2009)
        LREF
        Blank 56 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: 4/29/2009 Notice of Appearance/
        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Regina Griffin on behalf of Regina Griffin, Alan Nisselson (Griffin, Regina) (Entered: 04/29/2009)
          LREF
          Blank 55 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: 4/29/2009 Notice of Appearance/
          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Howard L. Simon on behalf of Howard L. Simon, Alan Nisselson (Simon, Howard) (Entered: 04/29/2009)
            LREF
            Blank 54 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: 4/27/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 3/23/2009 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (jmi) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
              LREF
              Blank 53 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: 4/14/2009 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER: My April 10, 2009 Opinion is amended by adding, as a footnote following the last word "lntermediaries ln the final full paragraph on page two: Each such investor may receive through his intermediary his full share of the proceeds of the BLMIS liquidation. Each direct customer of BLMIS may also receive a supplemental distribution from SIPC reserve funds for the remainder of his loss up to $500,000 per direct customer ($100,000 per customer for cash claims). The corresponding distribution to the intermediary as a direct customer is similarly limited in amount, but must be shared among the intermediary's member investors. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 4/14/2009) (tve) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
                LREF
                Blank 52 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: 4/14/2009 LetterCourt Filing
                LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from David J. Sheenan dated 4/13/2009 re: Counsel to Irving H. Picard, the trustee for the liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, writes with respect to the Court's Opinion dated 4/10/2009 and requests that the Court direct that this letter be docketed. (tve) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
                  LREF
                  Blank 50 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: 4/10/2009 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Sharon E. Frase dated 4/8/2009 re: For the reasons set forth within counsel request that the motion should be denied. ENDORSEMENT: Please docket and place this document in the public file. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 4/9/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                    LREF
                    Blank 49 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: 4/10/2009 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from David J. Sheehan dated 4/8/2009 re: The trustee respectfully request that the Court direct that this letter be docketed. ENDORSEMENT: Please docket and place this document in the public file. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 4/9/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                      LREF
                      Blank 48 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: 4/10/2009 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Mr. Dassin from Richard Weber re: This letter is in response to a request from Assistant United States Attorney Barbar A. Ward concerning the deposition of property and assets that are expected to be forfeited to the United States in this case. ENDORSEMENT: Please docket and place this document in the public file. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 4/9/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                        LREF
                        Blank 47 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: 4/10/2009 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                        OPINION #97403: The motion for relief from the Preliminary injunction will be granted by separate order. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 4/10/2009) (jfe) Modified on 4/13/2009 (mro). (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                          LREF
                          Blank 46 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: 4/10/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER: Sufficient reason appearing, and the Court having rendered its Opinion dated April 10, 2009, article V of the December 18, 2008 Order on Consent Imposing Preliminary Injunction, Freezing Assets and Granting Other Relief Against Defendants, which provides that Defendants and their partners, agents, employees, attorneys, or other professionals, anyone acting in concert with them or on their behalf, and any third party, are preliminarily enjoined from filing a bankruptcy proceeding against Defendants without filing a motion on at least three (3) days' notice to the Plaintiff, and approval of this Court after a hearing and its incorporation by reference in article IV of the February 9, 2009 Partial Judgment on Consent Imposing Permanent Injunction and Continuing Other Relief, are vacated and shall have no further force or effect. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 4/10/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                            LREF
                            Blank 45 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: 4/9/2009 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 36 MOTION for Leave to File Involuntary Bankruptcy Petition NOTICE OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL RELIEF FROM INJUNCTION.. Document filed by Marc Cherno, Judith Goldman, Horowitz Family Trust, Stephen Morganstern, Martin Rappaport Charitable Remainder Unitrust, Martin Rappaport, Blumenthal & Associates Florida General Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Landers, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                              LREF
                              Blank 44 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: 4/8/2009 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 36 MOTION for Leave to File Involuntary Bankruptcy Petition NOTICE OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL RELIEF FROM INJUNCTION.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Vasilescu, Alexander) (Entered: 04/08/2009)
                                LREF
                                Blank 43 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/3/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan M. Landers on behalf of Marc Cherno, Judith Goldman, Horowitz Family Trust, Stephen Morganstern, Martin Rappaport Charitable Remainder Unitrust, Martin Rappaport, Blumenthal & Associates Florida General Partnership (Landers, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/03/2009)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 42 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: 4/2/2009 Court Filing
                                  ORDER: Responses to Movants' April 1, 2009 Motion for Partial Relief from the February 9, 2009 Partial Judgment on Consent and its predecessors must be served and filed, with a courtesy copy to chambers, on or before noon Wednesday, April 8, 2009. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 4/2/2009) (tve)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 41 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: 4/2/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER: Responses to Movants' April 1, 2009 Motion for Partial Relief from the February 9, 2009 Partial Judgment on Consent and its predecessors must be served and filed, with a courtesy copy to chambers, on or before noon Wednesday, April 8, 2009. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 4/2/2009) (tve) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: 4/2/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 3/23/09 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (tro) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 39 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: 4/1/2009 Notice of Change of Address
                                        NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Matthew Gluck on behalf of Marc Cherno, Judith Goldman, Horowitz Family Trust, Stephen Morganstern, Martin Rappaport Charitable Remainder Unitrust, Martin Rappaport, Blumenthal & Associates Florida General Partnership. New Address: Milberg LLP, One Pennsylvania Plaza, New York, NY, 10119-0165, 212-594-5300. (Gluck, Matthew) (Entered: 04/01/2009)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 38 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: 4/1/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Gluck on behalf of Marc Cherno, Judith Goldman, Horowitz Family Trust, Stephen Morganstern, Martin Rappaport Charitable Remainder Unitrust, Martin Rappaport, Blumenthal & Associates Florida General Partnership (Gluck, Matthew) (Entered: 04/01/2009)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 37 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: 4/1/2009 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 36 MOTION for Leave to File Involuntary Bankruptcy Petition NOTICE OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL RELIEF FROM INJUNCTION.. Document filed by Marc Cherno, Judith Goldman, Horowitz Family Trust, Stephen Morganstern, Martin Rappaport Charitable Remainder Unitrust, Martin Rappaport, Blumenthal & Associates Florida General Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Gluck, Matthew) (Entered: 04/01/2009)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 36 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: 4/1/2009 Motion for Leave to File Document
                                              MOTION for Leave to File Involuntary Bankruptcy Petition NOTICE OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL RELIEF FROM INJUNCTION. Document filed by Blumenthal & Associates Florida General Partnership, Marc Cherno, Judith Goldman, Horowitz Family Trust, Stephen Morganstern, Martin Rappaport Charitable Remainder Unitrust, Martin Rappaport.(Gluck, Matthew) (Entered: 04/01/2009)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 35 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: 3/24/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER: (1) For the reasons stated in the March 9, 2009 letter from David J. Sheehan, Esq., counsel for Mr. Picard, to the Court and his statements upon the record in court, and it appearing provident and expedient for this to be done now, Mr. Richards shall pursuant to item 1.2 thereof appoint Irving Picard, as the SIPA Trustee, as substitute Attorney under the December 15, 2008 Power of Attorney granted by Mr. Bernard L. Madoff (in his individual capacity) to act thereunder as Mr. Picard considers desirable in connection with all of the issued shares of MSIL registered in Mr. Bernard L Madoff's name; (2) Mr. Richards's Report and Application is accepted and his receivership discharged and terminated with the thanks of the Court on behalf of the public; and (3) Mr. Richards may serve and file his application for payment of fees and expenses as receiver, in accordance with the requirements of applicable law and procedures. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 3/23/2009) (tve) (Entered: 03/24/2009)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 3/19/2009, Entered: 3/19/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mauro Michael Wolfe on behalf of Bernard L. Madoff (Wolfe, Mauro) (Entered: 03/19/2009)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: 3/18/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicole Pappas De Bello on behalf of Bernard L. Madoff (De Bello, Nicole) (Entered: 03/18/2009)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: 3/18/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel James Horwitz on behalf of Bernard L. Madoff (Horwitz, Daniel) (Entered: 03/18/2009)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: 3/18/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ira Lee Sorkin on behalf of Bernard L. Madoff (Sorkin, Ira) (Entered: 03/18/2009)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: 3/17/2009 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Marc Litt dated 3/16/2009 re: The U.S. Attorney respectfully requests that the Court direct that this letter be docketed. ENDORSEMENT: To The Clerk of the Court: Please docket and place this document in the public file. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 3/16/2009) (jpo) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: 3/11/2009 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                            STIPULATED ORDER PARTIALLY LIFTING THE FREEZE ON DEFENDANT BERNARD L. MADOFF'S ASSETS It is hereby agreed and stipulated, that, notwithstanding any prior law of this case or prior order of this Court, Madoff, and each of his financial and brokerage institutions, agents, servants, employees, attorneys and those persons in active concert or participation with him, are hereby relieved from the Asset Freeze to the extent needed to cooperate with the Trustee in transferring, pledging or assigning, or causing to be transferred, pledged or assigned, to or for the benefits of the trustee, assets, funds or other property (including money, real or personal property, territories, securities commodities, choses in action or other property of any kind whatsoever) of, held by, or under the direct control of, Madoff, whether held in the name of Madoff, BLMIS, Madoff International, or Madoff Ltd., or for the direct or indirect beneficial interest of Madoff, wherever situated, in whatever form such assets may presently exist and wherever located. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 3/2/09) (mme) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: 3/11/2009 LetterCourt Filing
                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from David J. Sheenan dated 3/9/09 re: Counsel writes this letter as a response of Irving H. Picard, the Trustee for the liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC ("BLMIS"), to the Courts Order of March 2, 2009. For the reasons set forth in this letter, counsel agrees with the Receiver that his continued role is not required. (mme) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: 3/11/2009 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Marc Lin dated 3/9/09 re: Counsel writes this letter in response to the February 26, 2009 Report of the Receiver Lee S. Richards and Application to Terminate the Receivership (the "Receiver's Report & Application"). Accordingly, the U.S. Attorney requests that that the Court direct that this letter be docketed. (mme) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: 3/9/2009 Memorandum of Law in Support
                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 20 Status Report, 21 Order, Set Deadlines,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Vasilescu, Alexander) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from John J. Carney dated 3/2/09 re: Counsel writes on behalf of Irving Picard, trustee for the liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities, LLC (the "Trustee"). Counsel requests that this Court order relief from its freeze orders entered in the above referenced matter as described in this letter. (mme) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Sharon E. Frase dated 3/1/09 re: Counsel asks that the Court issue the enclosed proposed order (the Relief Order) finding that actions taken under the federal forfeiture laws by the USAO, the Federal Bureau of Investigation ("FBI"), the U.S. Marshals Service ("USMS"), and their employees and agents (collectively, the "Prosecutor"), with respect to Madoff's property as defined in this letter, shall not constitute a violation of any of the following restraints set forth in the December 12, 2008 Order to Show Cause, Temporary Restraining Order and Order Freezing Assets and Granting Other Relief ("TRO"); the December 18, 2008 Order on Consent Imposing Preliminary Injunction, Freezing Assets and Granting Order Relief Against Defendants ("Preliminary Injunction"); and the February 9, 2009 Partial Judgment on Consent Imposing Permanent Injunction and Continuing Other Relief ("Permanent Injunction") entered by the Court in the above-captioned civil action against Madoff and BLMIS. USAO requests that the Prosecutor be exempted from those provisions with respect to any and all of the Madoff Property. The actions excluded from the Restraints would include, but not be limited to, the location, restraint, seizure, forfeiture, sale, transfer, encumbrance, disposal, management, maintenance, containment, negotiation, preservation, removal, storage, distribution, or dissipation of the Madoff Property. As part of the Relief Order, the USAO also requests the Court to direct that the Madoffs and their counsel shall be relieved from the Restraints to the extent needed to cooperate with the Prosecutor regarding the restraint, seizure, and disposition of forfeitable property in accordance with federal law. The USAO also requests, notwithstanding any other provisions of this Order, that the Restraints continue to apply to Ruth Madoff's New York City apartment, her home in Palm Beach. Florida, and the Madoffs' home in Montauk, New York (the "Madoff Homes"), without prejudice to a future application from the USAO for an order excluding from the Restraints any actions taken by the Prosecutor under the forfeiture with respect to the Madoff Homes. (mme) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: 3/2/2009 Consent OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER ON CONSENT For the reasons set forth in this order, it is hereby ordered, that the Prosecutor's forfeiture-related activity with respect to the Madoff Property shall not constitute a violation of the Restraints; and it is further ordered that Madoff, Ruth Madoff, and their counsel are relieved from Restraints to the extent needed to cooperate with the Prosecutor regarding the restraint, seizure, and disposition of the Madoff property in accordance with federal law; and it is further ordered that, notwithstanding any other provisions of this Order, the Restraints will continue to apply to the Madoff Homes without prejudice to a future application from the USAO for an order excluding from the Restraints any actions taken by the Prosecutor under the forfeiture with respect to the Madoff homes. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 3/2/09) (mme) (Entered: 03/02/2009)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: 3/2/2009 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          STIPULATED ORDER PARTIALLY LIFTING THE FREEZE ON DEFENDANT BERNARD L. MADOFF'S ASSETS It is hereby agreed and stipulated, that, notwithstanding any prior law of this case or prior order of this Court, Madoff, and each of his financial and brokerage institutions, agents, servants, employees, attorneys and those persons in active concert or participation with him, are hereby relieved from the Asset Freeze to the extent needed to cooperate with the Trustee in transferring, pledging or assigning, or causing to be transferred, pledged or assigned, to or for the benefit of the Trustee, assets, funds or other property (including money, real or personal property, securities, commodities, choses in action or other property of any kind whatsoever) of, held by, or under the direct control of, Madoff, whether held in the name of Madoff, BLMIS, Madoff International, or Madoff Ltd., or for the direct or indirect beneficial interest of Madoff, wherever situated, in whatever form such assets may presently exist and wherever located. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 3/2/09) (mme) (Entered: 03/02/2009)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: 3/2/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER re: 20 Status Report, filed by Lee Richards, On or before noon Monday, March 9, 2009, each of the Securities and Exchange Commission, the SIPA Trustee, the United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York and defendants in this action, or their attorneys, shall serve and file responses to the February 26, 2009 Report of the Receiver Lee S. Richards and Application to Terminate the Receivership ("Report & Application") including whether they support or oppose relief requested by the Receiver, their agreement or disagreement that "(1) the preservation and protection of the assets of MSIL and investigation into the affairs of MSIL would be most efficiently carried out by and through the JPLs, with the active participation of the UK Authorities and the SEC, and (2) the role of the Receiver is no longer necessary," Report & Application at 13-14, and their view, if any, of the effect termination of the receivership will have on the cooperation directed by paragraph two and three of the December 19, 2008 Order of the High Court of Justice, Chancery Division, Companies Court, in the Matter of Madoff Securities International Limited and In the Matter of the Insolvency Act of 1986, annexed as Exhibit B to the Report & Application. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 3/2/09) (mme) (Entered: 03/02/2009)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: 2/26/2009 Status Report
                                                                              STATUS REPORT. : Report Of The Receiver Lee S. Richards And Application To Terminate The Receivership Document filed by Lee Richards. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Zinman, Daniel) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009 Remark
                                                                                Consent of Defendant Bernard L. Madoff To Partial Judgment (re document #18). Document filed by Bernard L. Madoff. (cd) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: 2/9/2009 Consent JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                  PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON CONSENT IMPOSING PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND CONTINUING OTHER RELIEF in favor of Securities and Exchange Commission against Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities, LLC, Bernard L. Madoff. Defendant Madoff, and each of his partners, agents, servants et al are permanently enjoined from directly or indirectly, singly or in concert, in the offer, purchase or sale of any security by use of any means or instruments of transportation or communication in interstate commerce or by use of the mails re employing any device, scheme or artifice to defraud, and as further set forth in this document....That the Consent of Defendant Bernard L. Madoff to a Partial Judgment, filed herewith is incorporated herein with the same force and effect as if fully set forth herein, and that Defendant Madoff shall comply with all of the undertakings and agreements set forth therein. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 2/9/09) (cd) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: 1/26/2009 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Joon P. Hong dated 1/23/2009 re: Requesting that the Court grant a one month extension with respect to receivers report. ENDORSEMENT: On consent of the SEC, this application is granted. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 1/26/2009) (jpo) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: 1/26/2009 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Bernard L. Madoff waiver sent on 12/11/2008, answer due 2/9/2009. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Krishnamurthy, Preethi) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: 1/8/2009 Memorandum of Law in Support
                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3 Order to Show Cause,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Krishnamurthy, Preethi) (Entered: 01/08/2009)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: 1/8/2009 Declaration in Support
                                                                                          DECLARATION of Alexander M. Vasilescu in Support re: 3 Order to Show Cause,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Krishnamurthy, Preethi) (Entered: 01/08/2009)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 12/29/2008, Entered: 12/29/2008 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                            NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Israel E. Friedman on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. New Address: Securities and Exchange Commission, New York Regional Office, 3 World Financial Center, Room 400, New York, New York, USA 10281, 212-336-0090. (Friedman, Israel) (Entered: 12/29/2008)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 12/29/2008, Entered: 12/29/2008 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Walter Burberry dated undated re: seeks advisement as to application process for said recovery of funds. (djc) (Entered: 12/29/2008)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 12/29/2008, Entered: 12/29/2008 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L.Stanton from Daniel R. and Suzanne K. Goldenson dated 12/17/08 re: Extension of SIPC Protection to Madoff "Feeder Fund" Investors. (djc) (Entered: 12/29/2008)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 12/29/2008, Entered: 12/29/2008 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Mr. Burberry from Matthew Daly, Law Clerk to Judge Louis L. Stanton, dated 12/24/08 re: in response to letter of Decemer 16, 2008. (djc) (djc). (Entered: 12/29/2008)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 12/29/2008, Entered: 12/29/2008 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Mr. & Mrs. Goldenson from Chambers of Judge Louis L. Stanton dated 12/24/08 re: Extension of SIPC Protection to Madoff" Feeder Fund" Investors. (djc) (Entered: 12/29/2008)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: 12/19/2008 Consent OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER ON CONSENT IMPOSING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, FREEZING ASSETS AND GRANTING OTHER RELIEF AGAINST DEFENDANTS: Pending a final disposition of this action, Defendants, and each of their partners, agents, servants, employees, and attorneys, and those persons in active concert or participation with them who receive actual notice of this Order by personal service, facsimile service, telephonic notice, notice by e-mail or otherwise, are preliminarily enjoined from, directly or indirectly, singly or in concert, in the offer, purchase or sale of any security, by use of any means or instruments of transportation or communication in interstate commerce or by use of the mails, as set forth herein. It is further ordered that Lee Richards. Esq., of Richards Kibbe & Orbe LLP, continues as the appointed receiver for the assets of Madoff Securities International Ltd. ("Madoff International"), Madoff Ltd., and any other broker-dealer, market making, or investment advisory businesses (the "Foreign Entities") not located in the United States of America that are owned or controlled, in whole or in part, by Madoff, BMIS and their partners, agents, employees, attorneys, or other professionals, anyone acting in concert with them or on their behalf, and any third party, as set forth herein. Consent of Defendants to Preliminary Injunction Order filed herewith is incorporated herein with the same force and effect as if fully set forth herein, and that Defendants shall comply with all of the undertakings and agreements set forth therein. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 12/18/2008) (jpo) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/19/2008: # 1 CONSENT OF DEFENDANT BERNARLD L. MADOFF TO PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER, # 2 Consent of SIPC Trustee to Preliminary Injunction Order) (jpo). (Entered: 12/19/2008)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: 12/15/2008 Consent
                                                                                                        CONSENT of Defendant, Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC,admits to the jurisdiction of this Court over it and over the subject matter of this action. (rw) (rw). (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: 12/15/2008 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 5 MOTION The Securities Investor Protection Corporation. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (rw) (rw). (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: 12/15/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                            MOTION Of The Securities Investor Protection Corporation. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission.(rw) (rw). (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: 12/15/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER; ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that the customers of the Defendant, Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, are in need of the protection afforded by the Securities Investor Protection Act of 1970, as amended ("SIPA", 15 U.S.C. §78aaa et seq.); that pursuant to 15 U.S.c. §78eee(b)(3), Irving H. Picard, Esquire is appointed trustee for the liquidation of the business of the Defendant with all the duties and powers of a trustee as prescribed in SIPA, and the law firm of Baker & Hostetler LLP is appointed counsel for the trustee. The trustee shall file a fidelity bond satisfactory to the Court in the amount of $250,000.00; that all persons and entities are stayed, enjoined and restrained from directly or indirectly removing, transferring, setting off, receiving, retaining, changing, selling, pledging, assigning or otherwise disposing of, withdrawing or interfering with any assets or property owned, controlled or in the possession of the Defendant, including but not limited to the books and records of the Defendant, and customers' securities and credit balances, except for the purpose of effecting possession and control of said property by the trustee; that pursuant to 15 U.S.C. §78eee(b)(2)(B)(i), any pending bankruptcy, mortgage foreclosure, equity receivership or other proceeding to reorganize, conserve or liquidate the Defendant or its property and any other suit against any receiver, conservator or trustee of the Defendant or its property, is stayed; that pursuant to 15 U.S.C. §78eee(b)(4), this liquidation proceeding is removed to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of New York; that the trustee is authorized to take immediate possession of the property of the Defendant, wherever located, including but not limited to the books and records of the Defendant, and to open accounts and obtain a safe deposit box at a bank or banks to be chosen by the trustee, and the trustee may designate such of his representatives who shall be authorized to have access to such property. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 12/15/08) (ae) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: 12/12/2008 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, AND ORDER FREEZING ASSETS AND GRANTING OTHER RELIEF filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Defendants Madoff and BMIS shall show cause: 1. directing Madoff and BMIS to show cause why an order should not be entered pending a final disposition of this action:(a) preliminarily enjoining Defendants from violating Sections 206( 1) and 206(2) of the Investment Advisers Act of 1940 ("Advisers Act"), 15 USC § 80b-6(l) and (2); Section 17(a) of the Securities Act of 1933 ("Securities Act"), 15 USC §§ 77q(a): Section 10(b) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 ("Exchange Act"), 15 USC §§ 78j(b), and Exchange Act Rule 10b-5, 17 CFR § 240.10b-5. (b) directing Defendants to provide a verified accounting immediately, including, but not limited to, a verified written accounting of Madoffs interests in BMIS and all other entities owned, in whole or in part, or controlled by, related to, or associated or affiliated with, Madoff or BMIS; (c) freezing the assets of the Defendants; (d) appointing Lee Richards as receiver for BMIS' assets: (e) prohibiting the destruction, concealment, or alteration of documents by Defendants; and (f) preliminarily enjoining Defendants and their partners, owners, agents, employees, attorneys, or other professionals, anyone acting in concert with them, and any third party from filing a bankruptcy proceeding against the Defendants without filing a motion on at least three (3) days' notice to the Plaintiff, and approval of this Court after a hearing; and (2) pending adjudication of the foregoing, an Order (a) temporarily restraining Defendants from violating the aforementionedstatutes and rules; (b) directing Defendant Madoff to provide a verified accounting immediately, including, but not limited to, a verified written accounting of Madoffs interests in BMIS and all other entities owned, in whole or in part, or controlled by, related to, or associated or affiliated with, Madoff or BMIS; (c) freezing the assets of the Defendants, including, without limitation, the accounts listed on the attached Exhibit A. (d) appointing Lee Richards, Esq., of Richard., Kibbe & Orbe LLP as receiver for the Defendants' asscts, including without limitation Madoff Securities International Ltd. ("Madoff International") and Madoff Ltd. As further set forth in said Order. Show Cause Hearing set for 12/19/2008 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 21C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. Show Cause Response due by 12/16/2008. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 12/12/08) (db) Modified on 12/12/2008 (db). (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: 12/12/2008 Order Appointing ReceiverCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER. Lee Richards of Richards Kibbe & Orbe LLP is appointed Receiver over all the assets and accounts of defendant Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and as further set forth in this document. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 12/11/08, 6:42 pm ) (cd) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: 12/12/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against Bernard L. Madoff, Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities, LLC. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission.(rdz) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 238 times.

                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?