Jonathan Lopez v. Kelly G. Candaele

Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:09-cv-00995
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 12:17 PM EST (6.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Jonathan Lopez, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sam Kim +1 714 736 5501 +1 714 736 9901 samkimesq@hotmail.com

Represented by Alliance Defending Freedom - Scottsdale, AZ

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY David Jonathan Hacker +1 916 932 2850 +1 916 932 2851 dhacker@alliancedefendingfreedom.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Heather Gebelin Hacker +1 916 932 2850 hghacker@alliancedefendingfreedom.org

Represented by Alliance Defense Fund

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Benjamin W Bull +1 480 444 0020 +1 480 444 0028 bbull@telladf.org

Represented by American Center for Law & Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/03/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 05/03/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY David A. French +1 800 296 5429 +1 615 599 5189 dfrench@aclj.org

Represented by Liebert Cassidy Whitmore APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/20/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD AT David A Urban +1 310 981 2045 +1 310 337 0837 durban@lcwlegal.com

Represented by Sam Kim & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael L. Parker +1 714 736 5501 +1 714 736 9901 michaelparker@sklaw.org
v.
No Logo Allison Jones, Defendant

Represented by Haight Brown & Bonesteel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED Morton Rosen +1 310 215 7511 +1 310 215 7300 mrosen@hbblaw.com

Represented by Liebert Cassidy Whitmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Mary L Dowell +1 310 981 2000

Represented by Liebert Cassidy Whitmore APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/20/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD AT David A Urban +1 310 981 2045 +1 310 337 0837 durban@lcwlegal.com
No Logo Angela J. Reddock, Defendant

Represented by Haight Brown & Bonesteel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED Morton Rosen +1 310 215 7511 +1 310 215 7300 mrosen@hbblaw.com

Represented by Liebert Cassidy Whitmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Mary L Dowell +1 310 981 2000

Represented by Liebert Cassidy Whitmore APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/20/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD AT David A Urban +1 310 981 2045 +1 310 337 0837 durban@lcwlegal.com
No Logo Cristy Passman, Defendant

Represented by Haight Brown & Bonesteel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED Morton Rosen +1 310 215 7511 +1 310 215 7300 mrosen@hbblaw.com

Represented by Liebert Cassidy Whitmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Mary L Dowell +1 310 981 2000

Represented by Liebert Cassidy Whitmore APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/20/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD AT David A Urban +1 310 981 2045 +1 310 337 0837 durban@lcwlegal.com
No Logo Gene Little, Defendant

Represented by Haight Brown & Bonesteel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED Morton Rosen +1 310 215 7511 +1 310 215 7300 mrosen@hbblaw.com

Represented by Liebert Cassidy Whitmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Mary L Dowell +1 310 981 2000

Represented by Liebert Cassidy Whitmore APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/20/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD AT David A Urban +1 310 981 2045 +1 310 337 0837 durban@lcwlegal.com
No Logo Georgia L. Mercer, Defendant

Represented by Haight Brown & Bonesteel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED Morton Rosen +1 310 215 7511 +1 310 215 7300 mrosen@hbblaw.com

Represented by Liebert Cassidy Whitmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Mary L Dowell +1 310 981 2000

Represented by Liebert Cassidy Whitmore APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/20/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD AT David A Urban +1 310 981 2045 +1 310 337 0837 durban@lcwlegal.com
No Logo Jamillah Moore, Defendant

Represented by Haight Brown & Bonesteel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED Morton Rosen +1 310 215 7511 +1 310 215 7300 mrosen@hbblaw.com

Represented by Liebert Cassidy Whitmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Mary L Dowell +1 310 981 2000

Represented by Liebert Cassidy Whitmore APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/20/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD AT David A Urban +1 310 981 2045 +1 310 337 0837 durban@lcwlegal.com
No Logo John Matteson, Defendant
No Logo Kelly G. Candaele, Defendant

Represented by Haight Brown & Bonesteel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED Morton Rosen +1 310 215 7511 +1 310 215 7300 mrosen@hbblaw.com

Represented by Liebert Cassidy Whitmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Mary L Dowell +1 310 981 2000

Represented by Liebert Cassidy Whitmore APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/20/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD AT David A Urban +1 310 981 2045 +1 310 337 0837 durban@lcwlegal.com
No Logo Miguel Santiago, Defendant

Represented by Haight Brown & Bonesteel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED Morton Rosen +1 310 215 7511 +1 310 215 7300 mrosen@hbblaw.com

Represented by Liebert Cassidy Whitmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Mary L Dowell +1 310 981 2000

Represented by Liebert Cassidy Whitmore APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/20/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD AT David A Urban +1 310 981 2045 +1 310 337 0837 durban@lcwlegal.com
No Logo Mona Field, Defendant

Represented by Haight Brown & Bonesteel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED Morton Rosen +1 310 215 7511 +1 310 215 7300 mrosen@hbblaw.com

Represented by Liebert Cassidy Whitmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Mary L Dowell +1 310 981 2000

Represented by Liebert Cassidy Whitmore APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/20/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD AT David A Urban +1 310 981 2045 +1 310 337 0837 durban@lcwlegal.com
No Logo Nancy Pearlman, Defendant

Represented by Haight Brown & Bonesteel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED Morton Rosen +1 310 215 7511 +1 310 215 7300 mrosen@hbblaw.com

Represented by Liebert Cassidy Whitmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Mary L Dowell +1 310 981 2000

Represented by Liebert Cassidy Whitmore APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/20/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD AT David A Urban +1 310 981 2045 +1 310 337 0837 durban@lcwlegal.com
No Logo Sylvia Scott-Hayes, Defendant

Represented by Haight Brown & Bonesteel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED: 07/27/2009, TERMINATED Morton Rosen +1 310 215 7511 +1 310 215 7300 mrosen@hbblaw.com

Represented by Liebert Cassidy Whitmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Mary L Dowell +1 310 981 2000

Represented by Liebert Cassidy Whitmore APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/20/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD AT David A Urban +1 310 981 2045 +1 310 337 0837 durban@lcwlegal.com
Attributes
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Timeline
  Entries (101) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER re: Motion for Attorneys' Fees against John Matteson; 97 by Judge George H. King granting 97 Motion for Attorney Fees: This matter is before the Court on Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez's ("Plaintiff") Motion for Attorneys' Fees against Defendant John Matteson ("Motion"). We have considered the papers filed in support of this Motion, and deem this matter appropriate for resolution without oral argument. L.R. 7-15. As the Parties are familiar with the facts, we will repeat them only as necessary. Accordingly, we rule as follows. The July 11, 2011 hearing date for this matter is hereby VACATED and this matter is taken off calender. Plaintiff's Motion is GRANTED; attorneys' fees are awarded in the amount of $7,697.50. (see document for further details) (bm) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in amount of $ 443.00 in favor of Jonathan Lopez, et al. and against John Matteson. RE: 96 (mb) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge George H. King, ORDERING Response to Plaintiff motion for Default Judgment against Defendant Matteson submitted by Defendant John Matteson received on 6/6/2011 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Local Rule 11-3.8 - Lacking name, address, phone, facimile numbers and email address; Local Rule 11-4.1 - No copy provided for judge; FRCvP Rule 5(d) - No proof of service attached to document. NOT IN PROPER FORMAT. CASE CLOSED AS OF MAY 19, 2011.. (lw) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Attorney Fees Against Defendant John Matteson 97 filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez. (Hacker, David) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees Against Defendant John Matteson filed by plaintiff Jonathan Lopez. Motion set for hearing on 7/11/2011 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. King. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Itemized Fee Statement, # 2 Declaration of David J. Hacker, Esq., # 3 Declaration of Heather Gebelin Hacker, Esq., # 4 Declaration of Michele L. Schmidt, CP, # 5 Declaration Robert H. Tyler, Esq., # 6 Declaration Andrew W. Zepeda, Esq.)(Hacker, David) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Defendant John Matteson(in his individual capacities) filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez. Application set for hearing on 6/23/2011 at 09:00 AM before Clerk of Court. (Attachments: # 1 Bill of Costs and Supporting Documentation)(Hacker, David) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
JUDGMENT by Judge George H. King: Based on our November 6, 2009 72 and May 19, 2011 94 Orders, IT IS HEREBY ADJUDGED THAT Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez shall have judgment against Defendant John Matteson, in his individual capacity, in the amount of $5,000.00, along with post-judgment interest pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ?? 1961. IT IS FURTHER ADJUDGED THAT all of Plaintiff Jonathan Lopezs claims against Defendants Kelly G. Candaele, Mona Field, Allison Jones, Gene Little, Georgia L. Mercer, Jamillah Moore, Cristy Passman, Nancy Pearlman, Angela J. Reddock, Miguel Santiago, and Sylvia Scott-Hayes are DISMISSED. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (ir) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES: (In Chambers) Order re: Motion for Default Judgment 89 is GRANTED; judgment SHALL be entered against Matteson in his individual capacity in the amount of $5,000. Post-judgment interest SHALL accrue on the judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ?? 1961.4 IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge George H. King. (ir) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney David J Hacker counsel for Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez. Changing Address and Firm Name to American Center for Law & Justice; 230 Franklin Road, Building 2A-First Floor; Franklin, Tennessee 37064. Changing email to dfrench@aclj.org.David A. French is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez (Hacker, David) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Jonathan Lopez in Support of Renewed MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant John Matteson 89 filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez. (Hacker, David) (Entered: 04/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of David J. Hacker in Support of Renewed MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant John Matteson 89 filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez. (Hacker, David) (Entered: 04/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM in Support of Renewed MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant John Matteson 89 filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez. (Hacker, David) (Entered: 04/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND Renewed MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant John Matteson filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez. Motion set for hearing on 5/23/2011 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. King. (Hacker, David) (Entered: 04/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES: Mandate from the Ninth Circuit; Motion for Default Judgment: The Clerk is hereby directed to file and spread the mandate of the Ninth Circuit Court ofAppeals, dated December 27, 2010, on the record. If Plaintiff wishes to pursue default judgment against Defendant John Matteson, Plaintiff shall refile such a motion with the Court within fourteen (14) days hereof. The currently pending Motion for Default Judgment 13, is DENIED without prejudice by Judge George H. King. (ir) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/27/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MANDATE of 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 55, CCA # 09-56238. The Decision of the district court is REVERSE, VACATED AND REMAND. Mandate received in this district on 12/27/2010. (lr) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 55 filed by Jamillah Moore, Angela J. Reddock, Gene Little, Georgia L. Mercer, Allison Jones, Miguel Santiago, Nancy Pearlman, Kelly G. Candaele, Mona Field, Cristy Passman, Sylvia Scott-Hayes, CCA # 09-56238. Order received in this district on 12/16/10. The panel has voted to deny the petition for rehearing and the petition for rehearing en banc. The petition for rehearing is DENIED and the petition for rehearing en banc is DENIED. (cbr) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,, 55 filed by Jamillah Moore, Angela J. Reddock, Gene Little, Georgia L. Mercer, Allison Jones, Miguel Santiago, Nancy Pearlman, Kelly G. Candaele, Mona Field, Cristy Passman, Sylvia Scott-Hayes, CCA # 09-56238. Appellants are directed to file a response to the petition for rehearing en banc filed with this Court on October 1, 2010. The response shall not exceed 15 pages or 4200 words and shall be filed within 21 days of the date of this order. Parties who are registered for ECF must file the response electronically. Parties who are not registered ECF filers must file the original response plus 50 paper copies. Order received in this district on 10/21/2010. (lr) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 55 filed by Jamillah Moore, Angela J. Reddock, Gene Little, Georgia L. Mercer, Allison Jones, Miguel Santiago, Nancy Pearlman, Kelly G. Candaele, Mona Field, Cristy Passman, Sylvia Scott-Hayes, CCA # 09-56238. The motion for leave to file brief as Amicus Curiae by the Foundation for Individual Rights in Education is GRANTED and the brief which was lodged is ordered filed. Order received in this district on 10/18/2010. (lr) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 55 filed by Jamillah Moore, Angela J. Reddock, Gene Little, Georgia L. Mercer, Allison Jones, Miguel Santiago, Nancy Pearlman, Kelly G. Candaele, Mona Field, Cristy Passman, Sylvia Scott-Hayes, CCA # 09-56238. The supplemental brief submitted on February 12, 2010 is filed. No paper copies of this brief are required. Order received in this district on 10/18/2010. (lr) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,, 55 filed by Jamillah Moore, Angela J. Reddock, Gene Little, Georgia L. Mercer, Allison Jones, Miguel Santiago, Nancy Pearlman, Kelly G. Candaele, Mona Field, Cristy Passman, Sylvia Scott-Hayes, CCA # 09-56238. The amicus brief submitted by Foundation for Individual Rights in Education on January 13, 2010 is filed. No paper copies of this brief are required. Order received in this district on 9/27/2010. (lr) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,,, 55 filed by Jamillah Moore, Angela J. Reddock, Gene Little, Georgia L. Mercer, Allison Jones, Miguel Santiago, Nancy Pearlman, Kelly G. Candaele, Mona Field, Cristy Passman, Sylvia Scott-Hayes, CCA # 09-56238. The motion for leave to file brief as Amicus Curiae by the Foundation for Individual Rights in Education is GRANTED and the brief which was lodged is ordered filed. The motion for leave to file a supplemental brief by Appellants to respond to the Amicus Curiae's brief is GRANTED and the brief which was lodged is ordered filed. Order received in this district on 9/27/2010. (lr) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,, 55 filed by Jamillah Moore, Angela J. Reddock, Gene Little, Georgia L. Mercer, Allison Jones, Miguel Santiago, Nancy Pearlman, Kelly G. Candaele, Mona Field, Cristy Passman, Sylvia Scott-Hayes, CCA # 09-56238. This is a preliminary injunction appeal. The motion for leave to become amicus curiae submitted by the Foundation for Individual Rights in Education and any reply thereto are referred to the panel that will hear the merits of this appeal for whatever consideration the panel deems appropriate. Order received in this district on 9/27/2010. (lr) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,, 55 filed by Jamillah Moore, Angela J. Reddock, Gene Little, Georgia L. Mercer, Allison Jones, Miguel Santiago, Nancy Pearlman, Kelly G. Candaele, Mona Field, Cristy Passman, Sylvia Scott-Hayes, CCA # 09-56238. This a preliminary injunction appeal. The unopposed oral motion for a 7-day extension of time to file the reply brief is granted. The reply brief is now due February 1, 2010. Order received in this district on 9/27/2010. (lr) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/11/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
20 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Defendants Mona Field(in their individual capacities), Mona Field(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees), Georgia L. Mercer(in their individual capacities), Georgia L. Mercer(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees), Nancy Pearlman(in their individual capacities), Nancy Pearlman(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees), Angela J. Reddock(in their individual capacities), Angela J. Reddock(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees), Miguel Santiago(in their individual capacities), Miguel Santiago(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees), Scott Scott-Hayes, Sylvia Scott-Hayes, Gene Little(in his individual capacities), Gene Little(in his official capacities as Director of the Los Angeles Community College District Office of Diversity Programs), Jamillah Moore(in her individual capacities), Jamillah Moore(in her official capacities as President of Los Angeles City College), Allison Jones(in her individual capacities), Allison Jones(in her official capacities as Dean of Academic Affairs at Los Angeles City College), Christy Passman, Cristy Passman, John Matteson(in his individual capacities), John Matteson(in his official capacities as Professor of Speech at Los Angeles City College), Kelly G. Candaele, Candaele Kelly. (car)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 78 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: 1/22/2010 Order on Motion to VacateCourt Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge George H. King granting 77 Joint Motion to Vacate and Re-Set Scheduling Conference: This matter is presently calendared for Scheduling Conference on Monday, February 22, 2010. The court has reviewed the Parties' Joint Motion to Vacate and Re-Set the Scheduling Conference, noticed for hearing on February 22, 2010. The Joint Motion is hereby GRANTED. We hereby take the parties' motion and Scheduling Conference off calendar. We will re-calendar the Scheduling Conference after issuance of a mandate by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. (bm)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: 1/20/2010 Motion to VacateCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION to Vacate Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,,, 75 filed by plaintiff Jonathan Lopez. Motion set for hearing on 2/22/2010 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. King. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hacker, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 76 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: 12/16/2009 USCA order
ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 55 filed by Jamillah Moore, Angela J. Reddock, Gene Little, Georgia L. Mercer, Allison Jones, Miguel Santiago, Nancy Pearlman, Kelly G. Candaele, Mona Field, Cristy Passman, Sylvia Scott-Hayes, CCA # 09-56238. This is a preliminary injunction appeal. The unopposed oral motion for a 14-day extension of time to file the answering brief is granted. Answering brief is now due January 6, 2010. (cbr)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: 12/15/2009 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. King: THIS MATTER IS SET FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON: MONDAY, FEBRUARY 22, 2010 AT 1:30 P.M., at the Roybal Federal Building and Courthouse, 255 E. Temple Street, Suite 650, Los Angeles, California. Counsel primarily responsible for the conduct of this litigation and who has the authority to enter into stipulations and to make admissions regarding all matters that the participants may reasonably anticipate may be discussed, or the party if unrepresented, SHALL ATTEND IN PERSON. By no later than JANUARY 22, 2010, counsel for all appearing parties and all unrepresented appearing parties, if any, shall meet, in person, and discuss the matters set forth in Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) as well as those items identified in Part III, below. By no later than FEBRUARY 8, 2010, counsel for all appearing parties and all unrepresented appearing parties, if any, shall file a joint "REPORT OF PARTIES' PLANNING MEETING" which shall (1) be so labeled, (2) state the date of the Scheduling Conference set above by this Order, and (3) address not only those subjects in Rule 26(f), but also the following: (see document for further details). (bm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: 12/7/2009 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Mona Field(in their individual capacities), Mona Field(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees), Georgia L. Mercer(in their individual capacities), Georgia L. Mercer(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees), Nancy Pearlman(in their individual capacities), Nancy Pearlman(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees), Angela J. Reddock(in their individual capacities), Angela J. Reddock(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees), Miguel Santiago(in their individual capacities), Miguel Santiago(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees), Jonathan Lopez, Sylvia Scott-Hayes(in their individual capacities), Sylvia Scott-Hayes(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees), Gene Little(in his individual capacities), Gene Little(in his official capacities as Director of the Los Angeles Community College District Office of Diversity Programs), Jamillah Moore(in her individual capacities), Jamillah Moore(in her official capacities as President of Los Angeles City College), Allison Jones(in her individual capacities), Allison Jones(in her official capacities as Dean of Academic Affairs at Los Angeles City College), Cristy Passman(in her individual capacities), Cristy Passman(in her official capacities as Compliance Officer at Los Angeles City College), Kelly G. Candaele(in their individual capacities), Kelly G. Candaele(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees), (Urban, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: 12/7/2009 Answer
ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendants Mona Field(in their individual capacities), Mona Field(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees), Georgia L. Mercer(in their individual capacities), Georgia L. Mercer(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees), Nancy Pearlman(in their individual capacities), Nancy Pearlman(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees), Angela J. Reddock(in their individual capacities), Angela J. Reddock(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees), Miguel Santiago(in their individual capacities), Miguel Santiago(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees), Sylvia Scott-Hayes(in their individual capacities), Sylvia Scott-Hayes(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees), Gene Little(in his individual capacities), Gene Little(in his official capacities as Director of the Los Angeles Community College District Office of Diversity Programs), Jamillah Moore(in her individual capacities), Jamillah Moore(in her official capacities as President of Los Angeles City College), Allison Jones(in her individual capacities), Allison Jones(in her official capacities as Dean of Academic Affairs at Los Angeles City College), Cristy Passman(in her individual capacities), Cristy Passman(in her official capacities as Compliance Officer at Los Angeles City College), Kelly G. Candaele(in their individual capacities), Kelly G. Candaele(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees).(Urban, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: 11/9/2009 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge George H. King: Proceedings: Defendants' 12 Motion for Dismissal. Defendants' Motion for Dismissal is GRANTED in part. Claims one, two, and three are DISMISSED as to all moving Defendants. If Plaintiff wishes to file an amended complaint as to claims one, two, or three, he SHALL do so within twenty-one (21) days hereof. Failure to timely file an amendment as to these claims will result in their dismissal against the moving Defendants with prejudice. Claim four, insofar as it alleges a claim for money damages against Defendants in their individual capacities, is barred by the Defendants' qualified immunity and is thus DISMISSED with prejudice without leave to amend. The Motion is DENIED on claim four as to Defendants Candaele, Field, Little, Mercer, Moore, Passman, Pearlman, Reddock, Santiago, and Scott-Hayes (Administrative Defendants) in their official capacities. Should Plaintiff decline to file an amended Complaint in compliance with this Order, the Administrative Defendants SHALL answer the fourth claim in their official capacities within ten (10) days thereafter. (mg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: 10/30/2009 Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B)
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF Deficiencies in Electronically filed documents: The document is accepted as filed RE: Transcript Designation and Order form 68 (ir)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: 10/27/2009 Transcript Designation and Order Form to the 9th CCA (A-9)
TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM For Dates: 06/10/2009; Court Reporter: Anne Kielwasser; Court of Appeals Case Number: 09-56238; Re: 55 (Urban, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: 10/27/2009 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112)
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Transcript Designation and Order Form 68 . Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Transcript Designation and Order Form to the 9th CCA (A-9). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (bm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: 10/26/2009 Miscellaneous Document
Transcript Designation and Ordering Form filed by Defendants Mona Field, Georgia L. Mercer, Nancy Pearlman, Angela J. Reddock, Miguel Santiago, Sylvia Scott-Hayes, Gene Little, Jamillah Moore, Allison Jones, Cristy Passman, Kelly G. Candaele (Urban, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: 10/14/2009 Amended Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals
First AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th CIRCUIT filed by Defendants Mona Field(in their individual capacities), Georgia L. Mercer(in their individual capacities), Nancy Pearlman(in their individual capacities), Angela J. Reddock(in their individual capacities), Miguel Santiago(in their individual capacities), Sylvia Scott-Hayes(in their individual capacities), Gene Little(in his individual capacities), Jamillah Moore(in her individual capacities), Allison Jones(in her individual capacities), Cristy Passman(in her official capacities as Compliance Officer at Los Angeles City College), Kelly G. Candaele(in their individual capacities). Amending Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,,, 55 Filed On: August 7, 2009; (Urban, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: 9/25/2009 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
MEMORANDUM in Opposition of Plaintiff's Request for Publication filed by Defendants Mona Field, Georgia L. Mercer, Nancy Pearlman, Angela J. Reddock, Miguel Santiago, Sylvia Scott-Hayes, Gene Little, Jamillah Moore, Allison Jones, Cristy Passman, Kelly G. Candaele. (Urban, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: 9/25/2009 Notice of Lodging
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Miscellaneous Document 62 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Request for Publication of Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Order Denying Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration)(Hacker, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: 9/25/2009 Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B)
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER of Deficiencies in Electronically filed documents: Counsel to e-file a Notice of Lodging and submit the Proposed Order as an attachment by no later than Tuesday, September 29, 2009 RE: Miscellaneous Document 62 (ir)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: 9/24/2009 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112)
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Request for Publication 62 . Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Requests-Order. Proposed order was not submitted as a separate attachment to the Request. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (bm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 62 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: 9/23/2009 Miscellaneous Document
Request for Publication of Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Order Denying Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez (Hacker, David)
LREF
Blank 61 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: 9/17/2009 Order on Motion for reconsiderationCourt Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER re: Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of Ruling on Preliminary Injunction 52 by Judge George H. King: Defendants have shown no valid reason for disturbing our previous Order. Accordingly, Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. See attached order for further details. (es)
LREF
Blank 59 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: 8/19/2009 USCA order
ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 55 filed by Jamillah Moore, Angela J. Reddock, Gene Little, Georgia L. Mercer, Allison Jones, Miguel Santiago, Nancy Pearlman, Kelly G. Candaele, Mona Field, Cristy Passman, Sylvia Scott-Hayes, CCA # 09-56238. The appeal filed August 7, 2009 is a preliminary injunction appeal. The court's records reflect that the notice of appeal was filed during the pendency of a timely filed motion listed in FRAP 4(a)(4). The notice of appeal is therefore ineffective until entry of the order disposing of the last such motion outstanding. Accordingly, proceedings in this court shall be held in abeyance pending the district court's resolution of the pending motion. (cbr)
LREF
Blank 58 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: 8/13/2009 Order on Motion for reconsiderationCourt Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge George H. King: On the Court's own motion, Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration of Ruling on MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 52, noticed for hearing on 8/17/09, is TAKEN OFF CALENDAR and will be taken UNDER SUBMISSION without oral argument on that date. F.R.Civ.P. 78; Local Rule 7-15 (formerly 7.11). No appearance by counsel shall be necessary. The hearing date is vacated. Further briefing, if any, shall be filed in accordance with Local Rules as if the noticed hearing date had not been vacated. (mg)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: 8/10/2009 memorandum in support of motion
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion for Reconsideration of Ruling on Motion For Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant Kelly G. Candaele. (Urban, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: 8/10/2009 9th CCA Assigned Case Number Notice
NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 09-56238, 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 55 as to Defendants Mona Field(in their individual capacities), Georgia L. Mercer(in their individual capacities), Nancy Pearlman(in their individual capacities), Angela J. Reddock(in their individual capacities), Miguel Santiago(in their individual capacities), Sylvia Scott-Hayes(in their individual capacities), Gene Little(in his individual capacities), Jamillah Moore(in her individual capacities), Allison Jones(in her individual capacities), Cristy Passman(in her official capacities as Compliance Officer at Los Angeles City College), Kelly G. Candaele(in their individual capacities). (lr)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/7/2009, Entered: 8/7/2009 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Defendants/Appellants Mona Field(in their individual capacities), Georgia L. Mercer(in their individual capacities), Nancy Pearlman(in their individual capacities), Angela J. Reddock(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees), Miguel Santiago(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees), Sylvia Scott-Hayes(in their individual capacities), Gene Little(in his individual capacities), Jamillah Moore(in her individual capacities), Allison Jones(in her individual capacities), Cristy Passman(in her official capacities as Compliance Officer at Los Angeles City College), Kelly G. Candaele(in their individual capacities). (Filing fee $455, receipt number 09730000000005704612.) (Attachments: # 1 Representation Statement, # 2 Civil Docketing Statement)(Urban, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: 8/3/2009 response in opposition to motion
OPPOSITION to Joint MOTION for Reconsideration 52 of Ruling on Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez. (Hacker, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: 7/27/2009 Order on Request to Substitute AttorneyCourt Filing
ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Judge George H. King: granting 50 Request. The Court hereby orders that the request of defendants Kelly G. Candaele, Mona Field, Georgia L. Mercer, Nancy Pearlman, Angela J. Reddock, Miguel Santiago, Sylvia Scott-Hayes, Gene Little, Jamillah Moore, Allison Jones and Christy Passman to substitute Mary Dowell/David Urban, who is Retained Counsel, as attorney of record in place and stead of Morton G. Rosen. (bm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: 7/24/2009 Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Defendants Mona Field(in their individual capacities), Georgia L. Mercer(in their individual capacities), Nancy Pearlman(in their individual capacities), Angela J. Reddock(in their individual capacities), Miguel Santiago(in their individual capacities), Jonathan Lopez, Sylvia Scott-Hayes(in their individual capacities), Gene Little(in his individual capacities), Jamillah Moore(in her individual capacities), Allison Jones(in her individual capacities), Cristy Passman(in her official capacities as Compliance Officer at Los Angeles City College), Kelly G. Candaele(in their individual capacities). Motion set for hearing on 8/17/2009 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. King. (Attachments: # 1 order)(Urban, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: 7/24/2009 Declaration (non-motion)
DECLARATION of Kevin Jeter re Compliance with July 10, 2009 Order filed by Defendants Mona Field, Georgia L. Mercer, Nancy Pearlman, Angela J. Reddock, Miguel Santiago, Sylvia Scott-Hayes, Gene Little, Jamillah Moore, Allison Jones, Cristy Passman, Kelly G. Candaele. (Urban, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: 7/21/2009 Request to Substitute Attorney (G-01)
REQUEST to Substitute attorney David A. Urban in place of attorney Morton G. Rosen filed by Defendants Atty Mona Field(in their individual capacities), Georgia L. Mercer(in their individual capacities), Nancy Pearlman(in their individual capacities), Angela J. Reddock(in their individual capacities), Miguel Santiago(in their individual capacities), Sylvia Scott-Hayes(in their individual capacities), Gene Little(in his official capacities as Director of the Los Angeles Community College District Office of Diversity Programs), Jamillah Moore(in her individual capacities), Allison Jones(in her official capacities as Dean of Academic Affairs at Los Angeles City College), Cristy Passman(in her official capacities as Compliance Officer at Los Angeles City College), Kelly G. Candaele(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Urban, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: 7/13/2009 Order on Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge George H. King: Proceedings: Order Re: Plaintiff's 17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED. Defendants, their officers, agents, servants, employees, and attorneys, and other persons who are in active participation with such people, who receive actual notice by personal service or otherwise, are hereby ENJOINED from enforcing or publicizing the purported existence of the Policy during the pendency of these proceedings. In aid of this injunction, the Policy, along with any partial quotation, paraphrase, explanation, or other reference to the Policy that violates this Order, SHALL be removed from the District's and LACC's websites, including but not limited to the webpages referenced in exhibits 10 and 11 to the Complaint. Within fourteen (14) days hereof, Defendants SHALL submit a declaration under penalty of perjury from an individual with personal knowledge attesting that such references have been removed from the websites. The declarant SHALL specify the actions taken to comply with this Order. (mg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: 6/19/2009 Order on Application for OrderCourt Filing
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): Order regarding Defendants' Application to Supplement the Evidence 42 is DENIED IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge George H. King. (ir)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: 6/17/2009 Order on Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER: Hearing held before Judge George H. King: Matter called. Parties present. The Court hears oral argument from counsel regarding MOTION BY PLAINTIFF FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 17 . The Court having read and considered the papers in support of and opposition to and oral argument of counsel, takes Plaintiffs Motion UNDER SUBMISSION.Court Reporter: Ann Kielwasser. (wm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: 6/17/2009 Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B)
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically filed document: The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by corrected 6/12/09 RE: Supplement(Motion related) 38 (ir)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: 6/12/2009 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of David J. Hacker in Opposition to APPLICATION for Order for Granting Defendants' Application For Permission To Supplement The Evidence Submitted And Considered In Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction 42 filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez. (Hacker, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: 6/12/2009 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Jonathan Lopez in Opposition to APPLICATION for Order for Granting Defendants' Application For Permission To Supplement The Evidence Submitted And Considered In Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction 42 filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez. (Hacker, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: 6/12/2009 response in opposition to motion
OPPOSITION to APPLICATION for Order for Granting Defendants' Application For Permission To Supplement The Evidence Submitted And Considered In Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction 42 filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Application for Permission to Supplement the Evidence Submitted and Considered for Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Hacker, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: 6/12/2009 Application for OrderCourt Filing
APPLICATION for Order for Granting Defendants' Application For Permission To Supplement The Evidence Submitted And Considered In Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction filed by defendants Mona Field(in their individual capacities), Mona Field(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees), Georgia L. Mercer(in their individual capacities), Georgia L. Mercer(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees), Nancy Pearlman(in their individual capacities), Nancy Pearlman(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees), Angela J. Reddock(in their individual capacities), Angela J. Reddock(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees), Miguel Santiago(in their individual capacities), Miguel Santiago(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees), Sylvia Scott-Hayes(in their individual capacities), Sylvia Scott-Hayes(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees), Gene Little(in his individual capacities), Gene Little(in his official capacities as Director of the Los Angeles Community College District Office of Diversity Programs), Jamillah Moore(in her individual capacities), Jamillah Moore(in her official capacities as President of Los Angeles City College), Allison Jones(in her individual capacities), Allison Jones(in her official capacities as Dean of Academic Affairs at Los Angeles City College), Cristy Passman(in her individual capacities), Cristy Passman(in her official capacities as Compliance Officer at Los Angeles City College), Kelly G. Candaele(in their individual capacities), Kelly G. Candaele(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees). Application set for hearing on 7/19/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge George H. King. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Application For Permission To Supplement The Evidence Submitted And Considered In Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction)(Rosen, Morton)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: 6/12/2009 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112)
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Application for Permission to Supplement 38 . Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Applications-Order. Proposed order was not submitted as a separate attachment to the Application. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (bm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: 6/11/2009 Supplement (Motion related)
SUPPLEMENT Declaration of Morton Rosen In Support Of Application For Permission To Supplement The Evidence Submitted And Considered In Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For A Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Mona Field, Mona Field, Georgia L. Mercer, Georgia L. Mercer, Nancy Pearlman, Nancy Pearlman, Angela J. Reddock, Angela J. Reddock, Miguel Santiago, Miguel Santiago, Sylvia Scott-Hayes, Sylvia Scott-Hayes, Gene Little, Gene Little, Jamillah Moore, Jamillah Moore, Allison Jones, Allison Jones, Cristy Passman, Cristy Passman, Kelly G. Candaele, Kelly G. Candaele. (Rosen, Morton)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: 6/11/2009 Supplement (Motion related)
SUPPLEMENT Declaration of Kevin Jeter In Support Of Application For Permission To Supplement The Evidence Submitted And Considered In Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For A Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Mona Field, Mona Field, Georgia L. Mercer, Georgia L. Mercer, Nancy Pearlman, Nancy Pearlman, Angela J. Reddock, Angela J. Reddock, Miguel Santiago, Miguel Santiago, Sylvia Scott-Hayes, Sylvia Scott-Hayes, Gene Little, Gene Little, Jamillah Moore, Jamillah Moore, Allison Jones, Allison Jones, Cristy Passman, Cristy Passman, Kelly G. Candaele, Kelly G. Candaele. (Rosen, Morton)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: 6/11/2009 Supplement (Motion related)
SUPPLEMENT Application For Permission To Supplement The Evidence Submitted And Considered In Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For A Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Mona Field, Mona Field, Georgia L. Mercer, Georgia L. Mercer, Nancy Pearlman, Nancy Pearlman, Angela J. Reddock, Angela J. Reddock, Miguel Santiago, Miguel Santiago, Sylvia Scott-Hayes, Sylvia Scott-Hayes, Gene Little, Gene Little, Jamillah Moore, Jamillah Moore, Allison Jones, Allison Jones, Cristy Passman, Cristy Passman, Kelly G. Candaele, Kelly G. Candaele. (Rosen, Morton) **STRICKEN PURSUANT TO RESPONSE BY COURT FILED 06/16/09*** Modified on 6/17/2009 (ir).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: 6/3/2009 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
MINUTES: TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE; The court conducts telephonic status conference with counsel. The Court informs counsel that the court issued an order May 20, 2009, placing the Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction on calendar for June 1, 20009. However, counsel of record were never served with the Courts order. With the concurrence of the court and counsel, Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction 17 is RE-CALENDARED for oral argument on June 10, 2009 at 9:30 a.m. The Courts previous order of May 20, 2009 is hereby VACATED. Counsel of record shall appear on date and time specified herein IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge George H. King Judge George H. King.Court Reporter: N/A. (ir)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: 6/3/2009 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
MINUTES: (In Chambers) Order re: Hearing on Defendants Motion to Dismiss;Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Defendants Kelly G. Candaele, Mona Field, Georgia L. Mercer, Nancy Pearlman, Angela J. Reddock, Miguel Santiago, Sylvia Scott-Hayes, Gene Little, Jamillah Moore, Allison Jones, and Cristy Passmans Motion to Dismiss 12, and Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction 17 are hereby CALENDARED for oral argument on Monday, June 1, 2009 at 9:30 a.m. Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment against John Matteson is not recalendared at this time IT IS SO ORDERED by Judge George H. King. (ir)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: 5/4/2009 Reply (Motion related)
REPLY in support of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re: Defendants' policies Board Rule 15001 and 15003, District Office of Diversity Programs Sexual Harassment and Overview policies, and College Compliance Office Sexual Harassment and Overview policies etc.17 filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez. (Hacker, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: 5/4/2009 Reply (Motion related)
REPLY opposition to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike as to Punitive Damages filed by Defendants Mona Field, Mona Field, Georgia L. Mercer, Georgia L. Mercer, Nancy Pearlman, Nancy Pearlman, Angela J. Reddock, Angela J. Reddock, Miguel Santiago, Miguel Santiago, Sylvia Scott-Hayes, Sylvia Scott-Hayes, Gene Little, Gene Little, Jamillah Moore, Jamillah Moore, Allison Jones, Allison Jones, Cristy Passman, Cristy Passman, Kelly G. Candaele, Kelly G. Candaele. (Rosen, Morton)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: 4/27/2009 response in opposition to motion
OPPOSITION to MOTION to Dismiss dismissal of all claims and the action and/or to strike the punitive damages allegations and prayer, against defendants Kelly G. Candaele, Mona Field, Georgia L. Mercer, Nancy Pearlman, Angela J. Reddock, Miguel Santiago, Sylvia Scot 12 filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez. (Hacker, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: 4/23/2009 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Allison Jones in opposition to MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re: Defendants' policies Board Rule 15001 and 15003, District Office of Diversity Programs Sexual Harassment and Overview policies, and College Compliance Office Sexual Harassment and Overview policies etc.17 filed by Defendants Mona Field, Mona Field, Georgia L. Mercer, Georgia L. Mercer, Nancy Pearlman, Nancy Pearlman, Angela J. Reddock, Angela J. Reddock, Miguel Santiago, Miguel Santiago, Scott Scott-Hayes, Sylvia Scott-Hayes, Gene Little, Gene Little, Jamillah Moore, Jamillah Moore, Allison Jones, Allison Jones, Christy Passman, Cristy Passman, Kelly G. Candaele, Candaele Kelly. (Rosen, Morton)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: 4/23/2009 Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition opposition re: MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re: Defendants' policies Board Rule 15001 and 15003, District Office of Diversity Programs Sexual Harassment and Overview policies, and College Compliance Office Sexual Harassment and Overview policies etc.17 filed by Defendants Mona Field, Mona Field, Georgia L. Mercer, Georgia L. Mercer, Nancy Pearlman, Nancy Pearlman, Angela J. Reddock, Angela J. Reddock, Miguel Santiago, Miguel Santiago, Scott Scott-Hayes, Sylvia Scott-Hayes, Gene Little, Gene Little, Jamillah Moore, Jamillah Moore, Allison Jones, Allison Jones, Christy Passman, Cristy Passman, Kelly G. Candaele, Candaele Kelly. (Rosen, Morton)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: 4/21/2009 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)Court Filing
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez, upon Cristy Passman served on 4/15/2009, answer due 5/5/2009. Civil Cover Sheet; Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [David A. French]; [Proposed] Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [David A. French]; Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [Benjamin W. Bull]; [Proposed] Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [Benjamin W. Bull]; L.R. 7.1-1 Certification as to Interested Parties (4 pages); Order re Case Management; Notice to Counsel; Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge for Discovery; Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [Benjamin W. Bull]; Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [David A. French]; Plaintiffs Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant John Matteson; Default by Clerk F.R.Civ.P. 55(a); and The Summons and Complaint were served by Personal service, by FRCP 4(e)(2)(C) statute, upon Morton Rosen, Esq., Attorney of Record by Serving James Eng, Authorized to Accept. Due Dilligence declaration n/a. Original Summons No. (Hacker, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: 4/21/2009 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)Court Filing
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez, upon Gene Little(in his individual capacities) served on 4/15/2009, answer due 5/5/2009; Gene Little(in his official capacities as Director of the Los Angeles Community College District Office of Diversity Programs) served on 4/15/2009, answer due 5/5/2009. Civil Cover Sheet; Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [David A. French]; [Proposed] Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [David A. French]; Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [Benjamin W. Bull]; [Proposed] Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [Benjamin W. Bull]; L.R. 7.1-1 Certification as to Interested Parties (4 pages); Order re Case Management; Notice to Counsel; Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge for Discovery; Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [Benjamin W. Bull]; Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [David A. French]; Plaintiffs Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant John Matteson; Default by Clerk F.R.Civ.P. 55(a); and The Summons and Complaint were served by Personal service, by FRCP 4(e)(2)(C) statute, upon Morton Rosen, Esq., Attorney of Record by Serving James Eng, Authorized to Accept. Due Dilligence declaration n/a. Original Summons No. (Hacker, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/16/2009, Entered: 4/20/2009 Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B)
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS 27 by Clerk of Court that the document is accepted as filed. RE: Proofs of service 18, 19, 20, 21, 22, 23, 24, 25, 26 . (bm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: 4/15/2009 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112)Court Filing
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Proofs of Service 18, 19, 20, 21, 22, 23, 24, 25, 26 . Judge's initials are not indicated in caption of attached documents. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (bm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: 4/14/2009 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)Court Filing
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez, upon Sylvia Scott-Hayes served on 4/6/2009, answer due 4/26/2009. Civil Cover Sheet; Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [David A. French]; [Proposed] Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [David A. French]; Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [Benjamin W. Bull]; [Proposed] Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [Benjamin W. Bull]; L.R. 7.1-1 Certification as to Interested Parties (4 pages); Order re Case Management; Notice to Counsel; Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge for Discovery; Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [Benjamin W. Bull]; Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [David A. French]; Plaintiffs Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant John Matteson; Default by Clerk F.R.Civ.P. 55(a); and The Summons and Complaint were served by Personal service, by FRCP 4(e)(2)(C) statute, upon Morton Rosen, Esq., Attorney of Record by Serving Curtis Nash, Authorized to Accept. Due Dilligence declaration n/a. Original Summons No. (Hacker, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: 4/14/2009 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)Court Filing
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez, upon Miguel Santiago(in their individual capacities) served on 4/6/2009, answer due 4/26/2009; Miguel Santiago(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees) served on 4/6/2009, answer due 4/26/2009. Civil Cover Sheet; Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [David A. French]; [Proposed] Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [David A. French]; Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [Benjamin W. Bull]; [Proposed] Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [Benjamin W. Bull]; L.R. 7.1-1 Certification as to Interested Parties (4 pages); Order re Case Management; Notice to Counsel; Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge for Discovery; Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [Benjamin W. Bull]; Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [David A. French]; Plaintiffs Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant John Matteson; Default by Clerk F.R.Civ.P. 55(a); and The Summons and Complaint were served by Personal service, by FRCP 4(e)(2)(C) statute, upon Morton Rosen, Esq., Attorney of Record by Serving Curtis Nash, Authorized to Accept. Due Dilligence declaration n/a. Original Summons No. (Hacker, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: 4/14/2009 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)Court Filing
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez, upon Angela J. Reddock(in their individual capacities) served on 4/6/2009, answer due 4/26/2009; Angela J. Reddock(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees) served on 4/6/2009, answer due 4/26/2009. Civil Cover Sheet; Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [David A. French]; [Proposed] Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [David A. French]; Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [Benjamin W. Bull]; [Proposed] Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [Benjamin W. Bull]; L.R. 7.1-1 Certification as to Interested Parties (4 pages); Order re Case Management; Notice to Counsel; Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge for Discovery; Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [Benjamin W. Bull]; Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [David A. French]; Plaintiffs Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant John Matteson; Default by Clerk F.R.Civ.P. 55(a); and The Summons and Complaint were served by Personal service, by FRCP 4(e)(2)(C) statute, upon Morton Rosen, Esq., Attorney of Record by Serving Curtis Nash, Authorized to Accept. Due Dilligence declaration n/a. Original Summons No. (Hacker, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: 4/14/2009 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)Court Filing
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez, upon Nancy Pearlman(in their individual capacities) served on 4/6/2009, answer due 4/26/2009; Nancy Pearlman(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees) served on 4/6/2009, answer due 4/26/2009. Civil Cover Sheet; Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [David A. French]; [Proposed] Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [David A. French]; Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [Benjamin W. Bull]; [Proposed] Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [Benjamin W. Bull]; L.R. 7.1-1 Certification as to Interested Parties (4 pages); Order re Case Management; Notice to Counsel; Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge for Discovery; Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [Benjamin W. Bull]; Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [David A. French]; Plaintiffs Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant John Matteson; Default by Clerk F.R.Civ.P. 55(a); and The Summons and Complaint were served by Personal service, by FRCP 4(e)(2)(C) statute, upon Morton Rosen, Esq., Attorney of Record by Serving Curtis Nash, Authorized to Accept. Due Dilligence declaration n/a. Original Summons No. (Hacker, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: 4/14/2009 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)Court Filing
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez, upon Jamillah Moore(in her individual capacities) served on 4/6/2009, answer due 4/26/2009; Jamillah Moore(in her official capacities as President of Los Angeles City College) served on 4/6/2009, answer due 4/26/2009. Civil Cover Sheet; Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [David A. French]; [Proposed] Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [David A. French]; Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [Benjamin W. Bull]; [Proposed] Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [Benjamin W. Bull]; L.R. 7.1-1 Certification as to Interested Parties (4 pages); Order re Case Management; Notice to Counsel; Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge for Discovery; Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [Benjamin W. Bull]; Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [David A. French]; Plaintiffs Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant John Matteson; Default by Clerk F.R.Civ.P. 55(a); and The Summons and Complaint were served by Personal service, by FRCP 4(e)(2)(C) statute, upon Morton Rosen, Esq., Attorney of Record by Serving Curtis Nash, Authorized to Accept. Due Dilligence declaration n/a. Original Summons No. (Hacker, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: 4/14/2009 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)Court Filing
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez, upon Georgia L. Mercer(in their individual capacities) served on 4/6/2009, answer due 4/26/2009; Georgia L. Mercer(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees) served on 4/6/2009, answer due 4/26/2009. Civil Cover Sheet; Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [David A. French]; [Proposed] Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [David A. French]; Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [Benjamin W. Bull]; [Proposed] Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [Benjamin W. Bull]; L.R. 7.1-1 Certification as to Interested Parties (4 pages); Order re Case Management; Notice to Counsel; Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge for Discovery; Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [Benjamin W. Bull]; Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [David A. French]; Plaintiffs Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant John Matteson; Default by Clerk F.R.Civ.P. 55(a); and The Summons and Complaint were served by Personal service, by FRCP 4(e)(2)(C) statute, upon Morton Rosen, Esq., Attorney of Record by Serving Curtis Nash, Authorized to Accept. Due Dilligence declaration n/a. Original Summons No. (Hacker, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: 4/14/2009 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)Court Filing
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez, upon Allison Jones(in her individual capacities) served on 4/6/2009, answer due 4/26/2009; Allison Jones(in her official capacities as Dean of Academic Affairs at Los Angeles City College) served on 4/6/2009, answer due 4/26/2009. Civil Cover Sheet; Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [David A. French]; [Proposed] Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [David A. French]; Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [Benjamin W. Bull]; [Proposed] Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [Benjamin W. Bull]; L.R. 7.1-1 Certification as to Interested Parties (4 pages); Order re Case Management; Notice to Counsel; Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge for Discovery; Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [Benjamin W. Bull]; Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [David A. French]; Plaintiffs Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant John Matteson; Default by Clerk F.R.Civ.P. 55(a); and The Summons and Complaint were served by Personal service, by FRCP 4(e)(2)(C) statute, upon Morton Rosen, Esq., Attorney of Record by Serving Curtis Nash, Authorized to Accept. Due Dilligence declaration n/a. Original Summons No. (Hacker, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: 4/14/2009 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)Court Filing
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez, upon Mona Field(in their individual capacities) served on 4/6/2009, answer due 4/26/2009; Mona Field(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees) served on 4/6/2009, answer due 4/26/2009. Civil Cover Sheet; Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [David A. French]; [Proposed] Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [David A. French]; Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [Benjamin W. Bull]; [Proposed] Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [Benjamin W. Bull]; L.R. 7.1-1 Certification as to Interested Parties (4 pages); Order re Case Management; Notice to Counsel; Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge for Discovery; Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [Benjamin W. Bull]; Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [David A. French]; Plaintiffs Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant John Matteson; Default by Clerk F.R.Civ.P. 55(a); and The Summons and Complaint were served by Personal service, by FRCP 4(e)(2)(C) statute, upon Morton Rosen, Esq., Attorney of Record by Serving Curtis Nash, Authorized to Accept. Due Dilligence declaration n/a. Original Summons No. (Hacker, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: 4/14/2009 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)Court Filing
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez, upon Kelly G. Candaele served on 4/6/2009, answer due 4/26/2009. Civil Cover Sheet; Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [David A. French]; [Proposed] Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [David A. French]; Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [Benjamin W. Bull]; [Proposed] Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [Benjamin W. Bull]; L.R. 7.1-1 Certification as to Interested Parties (4 pages); Order re Case Management; Notice to Counsel; Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge for Discovery; Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [Benjamin W. Bull]; Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case [David A. French]; Plaintiffs Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant John Matteson; Default by Clerk F.R.Civ.P. 55(a); and The Summons and Complaint were served by Personal service, by FRCP 4(e)(2)(c) statute, upon Morton Rosen, Esq., Attorney of Record by Serving Curtis Nash, Authorized to Accept. Due Dilligence declaration n/a. Original Summons No. (Hacker, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: 4/13/2009 Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re: Defendants' policies Board Rule 15001 and 15003, District Office of Diversity Programs Sexual Harassment and Overview policies, and College Compliance Office Sexual Harassment and Overview policies etc. filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez. Motion set for hearing on 5/11/2009 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. King. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities)(Hacker, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: 4/8/2009 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of David J. Hacker, Esq. in support of MOTION for Default Judgment against defendant John Matteson 13 filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez. (Hacker, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: 4/8/2009 Declaration (Motion related)
DECLARATION of Jonathan Lopez in support of MOTION for Default Judgment against defendant John Matteson 13 filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez. (Hacker, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: 4/8/2009 memorandum in support of motion
MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Default Judgment against defendant John Matteson 13 filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez. (Hacker, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: 4/8/2009 Motion for Default JudgmentCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against defendant John Matteson filed by plaintiff Jonathan Lopez. Motion set for hearing on 5/11/2009 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. King. (Hacker, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: 4/8/2009 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss dismissal of all claims and the action and/or to strike the punitive damages allegations and prayer, against defendants Kelly G. Candaele, Mona Field, Georgia L. Mercer, Nancy Pearlman, Angela J. Reddock, Miguel Santiago, Sylvia Scott-Hayes, Gene Little, Jamillah Moore, Allison Jones, and Cristy Passman filed by defendants Mona Field(in their individual capacities), Mona Field(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees), Georgia L. Mercer(in their individual capacities), Georgia L. Mercer(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees), Nancy Pearlman(in their individual capacities), Nancy Pearlman(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees), Angela J. Reddock(in their individual capacities), Angela J. Reddock(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees), Miguel Santiago(in their individual capacities), Miguel Santiago(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees), Scott Scott-Hayes, Sylvia Scott-Hayes, Gene Little(in his individual capacities), Gene Little(in his official capacities as Director of the Los Angeles Community College District Office of Diversity Programs), Jamillah Moore(in her individual capacities), Jamillah Moore(in her official capacities as President of Los Angeles City College), Allison Jones(in her individual capacities), Allison Jones(in her official capacities as Dean of Academic Affairs at Los Angeles City College), Christy Passman, Cristy Passman, Kelly G. Candaele, Candaele Kelly. Motion set for hearing on 5/11/2009 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. King. (Rosen, Morton)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: 4/1/2009 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Jonathan Lopez, re Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) 10 served on 04/01/2009. (Hacker, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: 4/1/2009 Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37)
DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED as to Defendant John Matteson, in his individual and official capacities as a professor of Speech at Los Angeles City College. (ab) Modified on 4/1/2009 (ab).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: 3/31/2009 Request for Clerk to Enter Default
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant John Matteson(in his individual capacities), John Matteson(in his official capacities as Professor of Speech at Los Angeles City College) filed by plaintiff Jonathan Lopez. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David J. Hacker, Esq., # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of David J. Hacker, Esq.)(Hacker, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: 3/4/2009 Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)Court Filing
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez, upon John Matteson(in his individual capacities) served on 3/2/2009, answer due 3/22/2009; John Matteson(in his official capacities as Professor of Speech at Los Angeles City College) served on 3/2/2009, answer due 3/22/2009. App of Non-Res Atty to Appear in a Specific Case re David A. French; Order on App of Non-Res Atty to Appear in a Specific Case re David A. French; App of Non-Res Atty to Appear in a Specific Case re Benjamin W. Bull; Order on App of Non-Res Atty to Appear in a Specific Case re Benjamin W. Bull; L.R. 7.1-1 Certification as to Interested Parties; Order re Case Mgmt; Notice to Counsel; Notice of Assignment to US Magistrate Judge for Discovery; and The Summons and Complaint were served by Personal service, by CCP 415.10 statute, upon John Matteson, Professor of Speech at Los Angeles City College. Due Dilligence declaration n/a. Original Summons N. (Hacker, David)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: 2/19/2009 Order APPROVING Application (G-64) of Non-Resident Attorney to AppearCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge George H. King Granting APPLICATION for attorney David A. French to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE PAID.) 2 to appear on behalf of Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez. Michael L. Parker is designated as local counsel. (bm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: 2/19/2009 Order APPROVING Application (G-64) of Non-Resident Attorney to AppearCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge George H. King Granting APPLICATION for attorney Benjamin W. Bull to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE PAID.) 3 to appear on behalf of Plaintiff Jonathan Lopez. Michael L. Parker is designated as local counsel. (bm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/11/2009, Entered: 2/19/2009 Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
CERTIFICATION of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Jonathan Lopez. (car) (ds).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: 2/18/2009 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT by Judge George H. King: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge George H. King. See document regarding special requirements. (bm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/11/2009, Entered: 2/12/2009 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
APPLICATION for attorney Benjamin W. Bull to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV FEE PAID.) filed by plaintiff Jonathan Lopez. Lodged Proposed Order. (car)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/11/2009, Entered: 2/12/2009 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
APPLICATION for attorney David A. French to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV FEE PAID.) filed by plaintiff Jonathan Lopez. Lodged Proposed Order. (car)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/11/2009, Entered: 2/12/2009 Complaint - (Discovery)
COMPLAINT against Defendants Mona Field(in their individual capacities), Mona Field(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees), Georgia L. Mercer(in their individual capacities), Georgia L. Mercer(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees), Nancy Pearlman(in their individual capacities), Nancy Pearlman(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees), Angela J. Reddock(in their individual capacities), Angela J. Reddock(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees), Miguel Santiago(in their individual capacities), Miguel Santiago(in their official capacities as members of the Los Angeles Community College District Board of Trustees), Scott Scott-Hayes, Sylvia Scott-Hayes, Gene Little(in his individual capacities), Gene Little(in his official capacities as Director of the Los Angeles Community College District Office of Diversity Programs), Jamillah Moore(in her individual capacities), Jamillah Moore(in her official capacities as President of Los Angeles City College), Allison Jones(in her individual capacities), Allison Jones(in her official capacities as Dean of Academic Affairs at Los Angeles City College), Christy Passman, Cristy Passman, John Matteson(in his individual capacities), John Matteson(in his official capacities as Professor of Speech at Los Angeles City College), Kelly G. Candaele, Candaele Kelly.(Filing fee $ 350 PAID) Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Jonathan Lopez.(car) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/18/2009: # 1 Exhibits 1 - 7, # 2 Exhibits 8 - 14) (ds).
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 2 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?