Roy Westerlink et al v. Riverhawk Property Management, LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:11-cv-01559
District Judge Otis D Wright, II, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 19, 2017 at 3:21 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Rhonda Ridehour Westerlink, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 262 West Aliso Street

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rhonda Ridehour Westerlink +1 951 684 2425
No Logo Roy Westerlink, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 262 West Aliso Street

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roy Westerlink +1 951 684 2425
v.
No Logo American Financial Network, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Cal-Western Reconveyance Corp."
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Deutsche Bank National Trust Co."
No Logo Does, Defendant
No Logo John Kennerty, Defendant
Morgan Stanley & Company Inc. Morgan Stanley & Company Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I, Inc."
No Logo Morgan Stanley Capital Services Inc., Defendant
No Logo Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Inc., Defendant
No Logo Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Orange Coast Title Co., Defendant
No Logo Riverhawk Property Management, LLC, Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, NA Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Defendant
Unknown Role, NORWEST CORP
Unknown Role, Day Runner, Inc.
Unknown Role, Yucca Uranium Inc
Unknown Role, Munienhanced Fund Inc
No Logo Wmc Mortgage Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "WMC Mortgage Corp."
No Logo Yvonne J Wheeler, Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1692
Nature of Suit 480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned addressed to Roy Westerlink re Order, Terminated Case 5 (lc) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
    Mail Returned addressed to Rhonda Ridelhour Westerlink re Order, Terminated Case 5 (lc) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER that this action is dismissed without prejudice for lack of prosecution. by Judge Otis D Wright, II. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
        SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II: One or more of the parties to this action has elected to appear pro se. (rne) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
          STANDING ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright, II: READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (rne) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
            CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Rhonda Ridehour Westerlink, Roy Westerlink. (et) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
              COMPLAINT against Defendants American Financial Network, Inc., Cal-Western Reconveyance Corp., Deutsche Bank National Trust Co., Does 1-10, inclusive, John Kennerty, Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I, Inc., Morgan Stanley Capital Services Inc., Morgan Stanley Mortgage Capital Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Orange Coast Title Co., Riverhawk Property Management, LLC, WMC Mortgage Corp., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Yvonne J Wheeler. Case assigned to Judge Otis D Wright, II for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs Rhonda Ridehour Westerlink, Roy Westerlink. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 CV-18 Notice to US Magistrate Judge for discovery, # 3 Summons)(et) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 207 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?