BECKER, et al v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-00811
District Judge Paul L. Friedman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 2, 2017 at 9:01 AM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ADAM R. EIDINGER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/01/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Merrilyn Anne Onisko +1 202 530 5630 +1 202 530 5634 monisko@justiceonline.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org

Toggle Switch Represented by PEOPLE'S LAW RESOURCE CENTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary J. Wolfe +1 202 265 5965 +1 202 250 6712 zwolfe@PeoplesLawResourceCenter.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Weinglass, Leonard I.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard I. Weinglass +1 212 242 2120
No Logo ALLIANCE FOR GLOBAL JUSTICE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org

Toggle Switch Represented by PEOPLE'S LAW RESOURCE CENTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary J. Wolfe +1 202 265 5965 +1 202 250 6712 zwolfe@PeoplesLawResourceCenter.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Weinglass, Leonard I.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard I. Weinglass +1 212 242 2120
No Logo ANN FLENER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/01/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Merrilyn Anne Onisko +1 202 530 5630 +1 202 530 5634 monisko@justiceonline.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org

Toggle Switch Represented by PEOPLE'S LAW RESOURCE CENTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary J. Wolfe +1 202 265 5965 +1 202 250 6712 zwolfe@PeoplesLawResourceCenter.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Weinglass, Leonard I.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard I. Weinglass +1 212 242 2120
No Logo BENJAMIN BECKER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/01/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Merrilyn Anne Onisko +1 202 530 5630 +1 202 530 5634 monisko@justiceonline.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org

Toggle Switch Represented by PEOPLE'S LAW RESOURCE CENTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary J. Wolfe +1 202 265 5965 +1 202 250 6712 zwolfe@PeoplesLawResourceCenter.org
No Logo BETTE J. HOOVER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/08/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org

Toggle Switch Represented by PEOPLE'S LAW RESOURCE CENTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/08/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary J. Wolfe +1 202 265 5965 +1 202 250 6712 zwolfe@PeoplesLawResourceCenter.org
No Logo BRIAN BECKER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/01/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Merrilyn Anne Onisko +1 202 530 5630 +1 202 530 5634 monisko@justiceonline.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org

Toggle Switch Represented by PEOPLE'S LAW RESOURCE CENTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary J. Wolfe +1 202 265 5965 +1 202 250 6712 zwolfe@PeoplesLawResourceCenter.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Weinglass, Leonard I.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard I. Weinglass +1 212 242 2120
No Logo BRIAN EDWARDS-TIEKERT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/01/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Merrilyn Anne Onisko +1 202 530 5630 +1 202 530 5634 monisko@justiceonline.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org

Toggle Switch Represented by PEOPLE'S LAW RESOURCE CENTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary J. Wolfe +1 202 265 5965 +1 202 250 6712 zwolfe@PeoplesLawResourceCenter.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Weinglass, Leonard I.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard I. Weinglass +1 212 242 2120
No Logo CARL DILLINGER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/01/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Merrilyn Anne Onisko +1 202 530 5630 +1 202 530 5634 monisko@justiceonline.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org

Toggle Switch Represented by PEOPLE'S LAW RESOURCE CENTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/06/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary J. Wolfe +1 202 265 5965 +1 202 250 6712 zwolfe@PeoplesLawResourceCenter.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Weinglass, Leonard I.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard I. Weinglass +1 212 242 2120
No Logo CHARLES E. SIPPEL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/01/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Merrilyn Anne Onisko +1 202 530 5630 +1 202 530 5634 monisko@justiceonline.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org

Toggle Switch Represented by PEOPLE'S LAW RESOURCE CENTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary J. Wolfe +1 202 265 5965 +1 202 250 6712 zwolfe@PeoplesLawResourceCenter.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Weinglass, Leonard I.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard I. Weinglass +1 212 242 2120
No Logo ELIZABETH T. BUTLER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/01/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Merrilyn Anne Onisko +1 202 530 5630 +1 202 530 5634 monisko@justiceonline.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org

Toggle Switch Represented by PEOPLE'S LAW RESOURCE CENTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary J. Wolfe +1 202 265 5965 +1 202 250 6712 zwolfe@PeoplesLawResourceCenter.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Weinglass, Leonard I.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard I. Weinglass +1 212 242 2120
No Logo FIFTY YEARS IS ENOUGH, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/18/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arthur B. Spitzer +2024 570 800 x113 +1 202 452 1868 artspitzer@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gaffney & Schember, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/18/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel McCrea Schember +1 202 328 2244 +1 202 797 2354 dclaw@radix.net

Toggle Switch Represented by KLIMASKI & ASSOCIATES, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/18/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Robert Klimaski +1 202 296 5600 +1 202 296 5601 Klimaski@Klimaskilaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org

Toggle Switch Represented by PEOPLE'S LAW RESOURCE CENTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/06/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary J. Wolfe +1 202 265 5965 +1 202 250 6712 zwolfe@PeoplesLawResourceCenter.org
No Logo HEATHER A. CHAPLIN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/01/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Merrilyn Anne Onisko +1 202 530 5630 +1 202 530 5634 monisko@justiceonline.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org

Toggle Switch Represented by PEOPLE'S LAW RESOURCE CENTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary J. Wolfe +1 202 265 5965 +1 202 250 6712 zwolfe@PeoplesLawResourceCenter.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Weinglass, Leonard I.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard I. Weinglass +1 212 242 2120
No Logo INTERNATIONAL ACTION CENTER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org

Toggle Switch Represented by PEOPLE'S LAW RESOURCE CENTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary J. Wolfe +1 202 265 5965 +1 202 250 6712 zwolfe@PeoplesLawResourceCenter.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Weinglass, Leonard I.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard I. Weinglass +1 212 242 2120
No Logo ISAAC HENRY GITTLEN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/01/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Merrilyn Anne Onisko +1 202 530 5630 +1 202 530 5634 monisko@justiceonline.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org

Toggle Switch Represented by PEOPLE'S LAW RESOURCE CENTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary J. Wolfe +1 202 265 5965 +1 202 250 6712 zwolfe@PeoplesLawResourceCenter.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Weinglass, Leonard I.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard I. Weinglass +1 212 242 2120
No Logo JAMES ERICH KELLER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/01/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Merrilyn Anne Onisko +1 202 530 5630 +1 202 530 5634 monisko@justiceonline.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org

Toggle Switch Represented by PEOPLE'S LAW RESOURCE CENTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary J. Wolfe +1 202 265 5965 +1 202 250 6712 zwolfe@PeoplesLawResourceCenter.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Weinglass, Leonard I.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard I. Weinglass +1 212 242 2120
No Logo JOSEPH CATRON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org

Toggle Switch Represented by PEOPLE'S LAW RESOURCE CENTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary J. Wolfe +1 202 265 5965 +1 202 250 6712 zwolfe@PeoplesLawResourceCenter.org
No Logo JULIE FRY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/01/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Merrilyn Anne Onisko +1 202 530 5630 +1 202 530 5634 monisko@justiceonline.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org

Toggle Switch Represented by PEOPLE'S LAW RESOURCE CENTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary J. Wolfe +1 202 265 5965 +1 202 250 6712 zwolfe@PeoplesLawResourceCenter.org
No Logo JUSTIN JONES, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org

Toggle Switch Represented by PEOPLE'S LAW RESOURCE CENTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary J. Wolfe +1 202 265 5965 +1 202 250 6712 zwolfe@PeoplesLawResourceCenter.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Weinglass, Leonard I.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard I. Weinglass +1 212 242 2120
No Logo KIMBERLY GRIER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/01/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Merrilyn Anne Onisko +1 202 530 5630 +1 202 530 5634 monisko@justiceonline.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org

Toggle Switch Represented by PEOPLE'S LAW RESOURCE CENTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary J. Wolfe +1 202 265 5965 +1 202 250 6712 zwolfe@PeoplesLawResourceCenter.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Weinglass, Leonard I.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard I. Weinglass +1 212 242 2120
No Logo LAWRENCE HOLMES, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/01/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Merrilyn Anne Onisko +1 202 530 5630 +1 202 530 5634 monisko@justiceonline.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org

Toggle Switch Represented by PEOPLE'S LAW RESOURCE CENTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary J. Wolfe +1 202 265 5965 +1 202 250 6712 zwolfe@PeoplesLawResourceCenter.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Weinglass, Leonard I.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard I. Weinglass +1 212 242 2120
No Logo MARSHA KAY DILLINGER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/01/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Merrilyn Anne Onisko +1 202 530 5630 +1 202 530 5634 monisko@justiceonline.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org

Toggle Switch Represented by PEOPLE'S LAW RESOURCE CENTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/06/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary J. Wolfe +1 202 265 5965 +1 202 250 6712 zwolfe@PeoplesLawResourceCenter.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Weinglass, Leonard I.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard I. Weinglass +1 212 242 2120
No Logo MARTIN F. THOMAS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org

Toggle Switch Represented by PEOPLE'S LAW RESOURCE CENTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/06/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary J. Wolfe +1 202 265 5965 +1 202 250 6712 zwolfe@PeoplesLawResourceCenter.org
No Logo MITRA MOHAMMADI, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/01/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Merrilyn Anne Onisko +1 202 530 5630 +1 202 530 5634 monisko@justiceonline.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org

Toggle Switch Represented by PEOPLE'S LAW RESOURCE CENTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary J. Wolfe +1 202 265 5965 +1 202 250 6712 zwolfe@PeoplesLawResourceCenter.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Weinglass, Leonard I.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard I. Weinglass +1 212 242 2120
No Logo MOBILIZATION FOR GLOBAL JUSTICE, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org

Toggle Switch Represented by PEOPLE'S LAW RESOURCE CENTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary J. Wolfe +1 202 265 5965 +1 202 250 6712 zwolfe@PeoplesLawResourceCenter.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Weinglass, Leonard I.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard I. Weinglass +1 212 242 2120
No Logo MONICA MOOREHEAD, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/01/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Merrilyn Anne Onisko +1 202 530 5630 +1 202 530 5634 monisko@justiceonline.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org

Toggle Switch Represented by PEOPLE'S LAW RESOURCE CENTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary J. Wolfe +1 202 265 5965 +1 202 250 6712 zwolfe@PeoplesLawResourceCenter.org
No Logo NADINE BLOCH, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org

Toggle Switch Represented by PEOPLE'S LAW RESOURCE CENTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/06/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary J. Wolfe +1 202 265 5965 +1 202 250 6712 zwolfe@PeoplesLawResourceCenter.org
No Logo NISHA M. ANAND, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org

Toggle Switch Represented by PEOPLE'S LAW RESOURCE CENTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary J. Wolfe +1 202 265 5965 +1 202 250 6712 zwolfe@PeoplesLawResourceCenter.org
No Logo PATRICIA DOYLE MOHAMMADI, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/01/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Merrilyn Anne Onisko +1 202 530 5630 +1 202 530 5634 monisko@justiceonline.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org

Toggle Switch Represented by PEOPLE'S LAW RESOURCE CENTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary J. Wolfe +1 202 265 5965 +1 202 250 6712 zwolfe@PeoplesLawResourceCenter.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Weinglass, Leonard I.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard I. Weinglass +1 212 242 2120
No Logo Fish & Associates, PC, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "ROBERT FISH"

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/01/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Merrilyn Anne Onisko +1 202 530 5630 +1 202 530 5634 monisko@justiceonline.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org

Toggle Switch Represented by PEOPLE'S LAW RESOURCE CENTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary J. Wolfe +1 202 265 5965 +1 202 250 6712 zwolfe@PeoplesLawResourceCenter.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Weinglass, Leonard I.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard I. Weinglass +1 212 242 2120
No Logo SARAH SLOAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/01/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Merrilyn Anne Onisko +1 202 530 5630 +1 202 530 5634 monisko@justiceonline.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org

Toggle Switch Represented by PEOPLE'S LAW RESOURCE CENTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary J. Wolfe +1 202 265 5965 +1 202 250 6712 zwolfe@PeoplesLawResourceCenter.org
No Logo SASHA KELLER WRIGHT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/01/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Merrilyn Anne Onisko +1 202 530 5630 +1 202 530 5634 monisko@justiceonline.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org

Toggle Switch Represented by PEOPLE'S LAW RESOURCE CENTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary J. Wolfe +1 202 265 5965 +1 202 250 6712 zwolfe@PeoplesLawResourceCenter.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Weinglass, Leonard I.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard I. Weinglass +1 212 242 2120
No Logo SEEDS OF PEACE, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/01/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Merrilyn Anne Onisko +1 202 530 5630 +1 202 530 5634 monisko@justiceonline.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org

Toggle Switch Represented by PEOPLE'S LAW RESOURCE CENTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary J. Wolfe +1 202 265 5965 +1 202 250 6712 zwolfe@PeoplesLawResourceCenter.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Weinglass, Leonard I.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard I. Weinglass +1 212 242 2120
No Logo STEVEN R. OLSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PARTNERSHIP FOR CIVIL JUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mara E. Verheyden-Hilliard +1 202 232 1180 +1 202 747 7747 mvh@JusticeOnline.org

Toggle Switch Represented by PEOPLE'S LAW RESOURCE CENTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary J. Wolfe +1 202 265 5965 +1 202 250 6712 zwolfe@PeoplesLawResourceCenter.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Weinglass, Leonard I.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard I. Weinglass +1 212 242 2120
v.
No Logo BRADLEY A. BUCKLES, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Homeland Security

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edith Margeurita Shine +1 202 307 1249 +1 202 514 8780 edith.shine@usss.dhs.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
No Logo BRIAN L. STAFFORD, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Homeland Security

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edith Margeurita Shine +1 202 307 1249 +1 202 514 8780 edith.shine@usss.dhs.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
No Logo CHARLES H. RAMSEY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2009 Thomas Louis Koger +1 202 724 6598

Toggle Switch Represented by District of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/21/2007 Aaishah Hashmi +1 202 724 6623 aaishah.hashmi@dc.gov
TERMINATED: 04/06/2006, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lori S. Parris +1 202 442 8404 +1 202 727 3625 lori.parris@dc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Vorys Sater Seymour & Pease, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Ellen A. Efros +1 202 467 8800
No Logo DENIS GALVIN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Homeland Security

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edith Margeurita Shine +1 202 307 1249 +1 202 514 8780 edith.shine@usss.dhs.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
No Logo DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GOVERNMENT, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2009 Thomas Louis Koger +1 202 724 6598

Toggle Switch Represented by District of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad Wayne Copeland +1 202 724 6623 chad.copeland@dc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shana Lyn Frost +1 202 724 6534 +1 202 741 8934 shana.frost@dc.gov
TERMINATED: 06/21/2007 Aaishah Hashmi +1 202 724 6623 aaishah.hashmi@dc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard S. Love +1 202 724 6635 +1 202 727 0431 richard.love@dc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martha J. Mullen +1 202 724 6612 +1 202 727 0431 martha.mullen@dc.gov
TERMINATED: 04/06/2006 Lori S. Parris +1 202 442 8404 +1 202 727 3625 lori.parris@dc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Monique Daniel Pressley +1 202 724 6594 +1 202 727 0431 monique.pressley@dc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Utiger +1 202 724 6532 +1 202 727 0431 robert.utiger@dc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Vorys Sater Seymour & Pease, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Ellen A. Efros +1 202 467 8800
No Logo DONNIE R. MARSHALL, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Homeland Security

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edith Margeurita Shine +1 202 307 1249 +1 202 514 8780 edith.shine@usss.dhs.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
No Logo JAMES J. VAREY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Homeland Security

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edith Margeurita Shine +1 202 307 1249 +1 202 514 8780 edith.shine@usss.dhs.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
No Logo JAMES LEE WITT, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Homeland Security

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edith Margeurita Shine +1 202 307 1249 +1 202 514 8780 edith.shine@usss.dhs.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
No Logo Louis J. Freeh, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Homeland Security

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edith Margeurita Shine +1 202 307 1249 +1 202 514 8780 edith.shine@usss.dhs.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
No Logo TERRANCE W. GAINER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2009 Thomas Louis Koger +1 202 724 6598

Toggle Switch Represented by District of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/21/2007 Aaishah Hashmi +1 202 724 6623 aaishah.hashmi@dc.gov
TERMINATED: 04/06/2006, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lori S. Parris +1 202 442 8404 +1 202 727 3625 lori.parris@dc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Vorys Sater Seymour & Pease, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ellen A. Efros +1 202 467 8800
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Homeland Security

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edith Margeurita Shine +1 202 307 1249 +1 202 514 8780 edith.shine@usss.dhs.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
No Logo UNKNOWN FEDERAL AGENTS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (852) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 852 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: 11/23/2010 ~Notice (other)
Supplemental Index of Sealed Orders re: [848] (jeb, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Sealed Legal Document 851 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: 11/22/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
    SEALED ORDER NO. 480 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 11/22/2010.(zmm, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Sealed Legal Document 850 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: 11/18/2010 Sealed Document +
      SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BENJAMIN BECKER, BRIAN BECKER, ELIZABETH T. BUTLER, HEATHER A. CHAPLIN, CARL DILLINGER, MARSHA KAY DILLINGER, BRIAN EDWARDS-TIEKERT, ADAM R. EIDINGER, ROBERT FISH, ANN FLENER, JULIE FRY, ISAAC HENRY GITTLEN, KIMBERLY GRIER, LAWRENCE HOLMES, JAMES ERICH KELLER, MITRA MOHAMMADI, MONICA MOOREHEAD, SEEDS OF PEACE, INC., CHARLES E. SIPPEL, SARAH SLOAN, SASHA KELLER WRIGHT. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 849 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: 11/17/2010 ~Notice (other)
        NOTICE of Filing of Document Under Seal by BENJAMIN BECKER, BRIAN BECKER, ELIZABETH T. BUTLER, HEATHER A. CHAPLIN, CARL DILLINGER, MARSHA KAY DILLINGER, BRIAN EDWARDS-TIEKERT, ADAM R. EIDINGER, ROBERT FISH, ANN FLENER, JULIE FRY, ISAAC HENRY GITTLEN, KIMBERLY GRIER, LAWRENCE HOLMES, JAMES ERICH KELLER, MITRA MOHAMMADI, PATRICIA DOYLE MOHAMMADI, MONICA MOOREHEAD, SEEDS OF PEACE, INC., CHARLES E. SIPPEL, SARAH SLOAN, SASHA KELLER WRIGHT re [598] Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Messineo, Carl)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 848 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: 11/15/2010 Sealed Document +
          INDEX OF SEALED ORDERS 1 THROUGH 479 FILED IN THIS CASE. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(jeb, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Sealed Legal Document 847 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
            SEALED ORDER NO. 125 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Sealed Legal Document 846 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
              SEALED ORDER NO. 479 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Sealed Legal Document 845 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                SEALED ORDER NO. 478 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Sealed Legal Document 844 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                  SEALED ORDER NO. 477 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Sealed Legal Document 843 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                    SEALED ORDER NO. 476 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Sealed Legal Document 842 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                      SEALED ORDER NO. 475 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Sealed Legal Document 841 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                        SEALED ORDER NO. 474 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Sealed Legal Document 840 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                          SEALED ORDER NO. 473 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Sealed Legal Document 839 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                            SEALED ORDER NO. 472 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Sealed Legal Document 838 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                              SEALED ORDER NO. 471 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Sealed Legal Document 837 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                SEALED ORDER NO. 470 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Sealed Legal Document 836 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 469 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Sealed Legal Document 835 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 468 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Sealed Legal Document 834 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 467 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Sealed Legal Document 833 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 466 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Sealed Legal Document 832 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 465 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Sealed Legal Document 831 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 464 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Sealed Legal Document 830 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 463(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Sealed Legal Document 829 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 462 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Sealed Legal Document 828 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 461 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Sealed Legal Document 827 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 460 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Sealed Legal Document 826 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 455 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Sealed Legal Document 825 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 459 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Sealed Legal Document 824 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 458 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Sealed Legal Document 823 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 457 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Sealed Legal Document 822 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 456 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Sealed Legal Document 821 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 454 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 820 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 453 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 819 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 452 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 818 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 451 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 817 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 450 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 816 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 449 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 815 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 448 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 814 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 447 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 813 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 446 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 812 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 445 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 811 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 444 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 810 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 443 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 809 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 442 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 808 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 441 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 807 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 440 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 806 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 439 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 805 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 438 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 804 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 437 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 803 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 436 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 802 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 435(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 801 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 434 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 800 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 433 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 799 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 432 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 798 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 431 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 797 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 430 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 796 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 429 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 795 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 428 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 794 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 427 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 793 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 426 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 792 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 425 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 791 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 424 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 790 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 423 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 789 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 422 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 788 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 421 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 787 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 420 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 786 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 419 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 785 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 418 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 784 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 417 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 783 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 416 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 782 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 415 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 781 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 414 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 780 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 413 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 779 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 412 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 778 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 411 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 777 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 410 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 776 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 409 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 775 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 408 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 774 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 407 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 773 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 406 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 772 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 405 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 771 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 404 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 770 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 403 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 769 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 402 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 768 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 401 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 767 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 400 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 766 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 399 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 765 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 398 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 764 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 397 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 763 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 396 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 762 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 395 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 761 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 394 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 760 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 393 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 759 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 392 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 758 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 391 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 757 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 390 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 756 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 389 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 755 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 388 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 754 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 387 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 753 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 386 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 752 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 385 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 751 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 384 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 750 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 383 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 749 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 382 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 748 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 381 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 747 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 380 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 746 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 379 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 745 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 378 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 744 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 377 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 743 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 376 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 742 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 375 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 741 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 374 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 740 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 373 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 739 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 372 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 738 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 371 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 737 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 370 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 736 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 369 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 735 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 368 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 734 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 367 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 733 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 366 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 732 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 365 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 731 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 364 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 730 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 363 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 729 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 362 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 728 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 361 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 727 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 360 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 726 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 359 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 725 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 358 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 724 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 357 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 723 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 356 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 722 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 355 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 721 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 354 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 720 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 353 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 719 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 352 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 718 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 351 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 717 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 350 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 716 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 349 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 715 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 348 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 714 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 347 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 713 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 346 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 712 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 345 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 711 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 344 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 710 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 343(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 709 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 342 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 708 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 341 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 707 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 340 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 706 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 339 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 705 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 338 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 704 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 337 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 703 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 336 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 702 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 335 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 701 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 334 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 700 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 333 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 699 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 332 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 698 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 331 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 697 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 330 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 696 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 329 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 695 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 328 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 694 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 327 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 693 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 326 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 692 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 325 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 691 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 324 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 690 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 323(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 689 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 322 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 688 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 321 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 687 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 320 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 686 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 319 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 685 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 318 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 684 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 317 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 683 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 316 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 682 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 315 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 681 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 314 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 680 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 313 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 679 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 312 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 678 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 311 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 677 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 310 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 676 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 309 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 675 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 308 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 674 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER N0. 307 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 673 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 306 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 672 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 305 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 671 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 304 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 670 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 303 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 669 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 302 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 668 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 301 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 667 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 300 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 666 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 299 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 665 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 298 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 664 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 297 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 663 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 296 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 662 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 295 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 661 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 294 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 660 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 293 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 659 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 292 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 658 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 291 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 657 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 290 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 656 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 289 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 655 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 288 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 654 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 287 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 653 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 286 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 652 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 285 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 651 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 284 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 650 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 283 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 649 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 282 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 648 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 281 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 647 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 280 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 646 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 279 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 645 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 278 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 644 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 277(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 643 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 276 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 642 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 275 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 641 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 274 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 640 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 273 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 639 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 272 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 638 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 271 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 637 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 270 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 636 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 269 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 635 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 268 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 634 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 267 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 633 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 266 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 632 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 265 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 631 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 264 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 630 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 263(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 629 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 262 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 628 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 261 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 627 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 260 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 626 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 259 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 625 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 258 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 624 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 257 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 623 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 256 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 622 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 255(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 621 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 254 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 620 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 253 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 619 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 252(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 618 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 251 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 617 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 250 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 616 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 249 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 615 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 248 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 614 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 247(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 613 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 246 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 612 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 246 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 611 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 244 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 610 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 243 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 609 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 242 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 608 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 241 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 607 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 240 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 606 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 239 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 605 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 238(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 604 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 237 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 603 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 236(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 602 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 235 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 601 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER N0. 234(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 600 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 233 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 599 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 232(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [491] Joint Motion for Expungement and Annulment Relief and Related Order for Elizabeth Butler Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 11/1/2010. (zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 597 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 231 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 596 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 230 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 595 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 229 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 594 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 228 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 593 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 227 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 592 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 226 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 591 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 225 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 590 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 224 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 589 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 223 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 588 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 222 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 587 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 221 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/27/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 586 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 220 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 585 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 219 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 584 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 218 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 583 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 217 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 582 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 216 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 581 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 215 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 580 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 214 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 579 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 213 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 578 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 212 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 577 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 211 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 576 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 210 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 575 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 209 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 574 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 208 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 573 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 207 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 572 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 206 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 571 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 205 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 570 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 204 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 569 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 203 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 568 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 202 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 567 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 201 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 566 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 200 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 565 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 199 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 564 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 198 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 563 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 197 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 562 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 196(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 561 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 195 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 560 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 194 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 559 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 193(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 558 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 192 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 557 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 191(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 556 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 190(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 555 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 189 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 554 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 188(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 553 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 187, (DUPLICATE OF NO. 184) (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 552 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 186(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 551 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 185 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 550 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 184 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 549 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 183 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 548 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 182 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 547 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 181(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 546 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 180 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 545 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 179 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 544 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 178 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 543 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 177 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 542 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 176 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 541 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 175 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 540 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 174 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 539 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 173 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 538 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 172 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 537 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 171(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 536 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 170 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 535 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 169 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 534 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 168 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 533 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 167 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 532 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO 166 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 531 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 165 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 530 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 164 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 529 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 163 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 528 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 162(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 527 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 161 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 526 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 160 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 525 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 159 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 524 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 158 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 523 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 157 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 522 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 156 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 521 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/3/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 155 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 520 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 154 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 519 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 153 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 518 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 152 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 517 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 151 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 516 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 150 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 515 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER N0. 149 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 514 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 148 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 513 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 147 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 512 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 146 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 511 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 145 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 510 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 144 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 509 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 143 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 508 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 142 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 507 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 141 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 506 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 140 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 505 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 139 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 504 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 138 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 503 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 137 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 502 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 136 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 501 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 135 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 500 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 134 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 499 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 133 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 498 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 132 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 497 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 131 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 496 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 130 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 495 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 129 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 494 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 128 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 493 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 127 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 492 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 126 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: 10/22/2010, Terminated: 11/2/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Expungement and Annulment Relief and Related Order for Elizabeth Butler, an Individual Plaintiff who was Arrested at the Convergence Center by BENJAMIN BECKER, BRIAN BECKER, ELIZABETH T. BUTLER, HEATHER A. CHAPLIN, CARL DILLINGER, MARSHA KAY DILLINGER, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GOVERNMENT, BRIAN EDWARDS-TIEKERT, ADAM R. EIDINGER, ROBERT FISH, ANN FLENER, JULIE FRY, ISAAC HENRY GITTLEN, KIMBERLY GRIER, LAWRENCE HOLMES, JAMES ERICH KELLER, MITRA MOHAMMADI, MONICA MOOREHEAD, SEEDS OF PEACE, INC., CHARLES E. SIPPEL, SARAH SLOAN, SASHA KELLER WRIGHT (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Ex. 1 - Settlement Agreement)(Verheyden-Hilliard, Mara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 490 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER no. 124 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 489 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 123 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 488 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 122 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 487 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 121 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 486 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 120 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 485 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 119 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 484 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 118 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 483 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 117 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 482 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 116 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 481 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 115 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 480 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 114 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 479 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 113 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 478 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 112 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 477 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 111(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 476 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 110 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 475 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 109 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 474 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 108 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 473 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 107 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 472 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 106 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 471 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 105 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 470 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 104 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 469 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 103 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 468 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 102 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 467 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 101 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 466 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 100 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 465 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 99 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 464 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 98 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 463 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 97 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 462 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 96 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 461 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 95 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 460 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 94 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 459 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 93 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 458 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 92 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 457 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 91 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 456 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 90 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 455 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 89 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 454 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 88 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 453 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 87 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 452 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 86 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 451 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 85 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 450 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 84 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 449 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 83 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 448 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 82 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 447 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 81 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 446 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 80 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 445 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 79 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 444 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 78 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 443 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 77 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 442 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 76 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 441 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 75 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 440 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 74 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 439 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 73 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 438 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 72 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 437 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 71 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 436 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 70 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 435 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 69 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 434 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 68 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 433 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 67 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 432 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 66 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 431 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 65 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 430 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 64 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 429 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 63 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 428 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 62 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 427 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 61 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 426 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 60 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 425 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 59 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 424 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 58 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 423 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 57 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 422 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 56 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 421 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 55 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 420 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 54 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 419 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 53 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 418 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 52 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 417 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 51 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 416 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 50 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 415 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 49 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 414 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 48 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 413 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 47 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks) (Main Document 413 replaced on 10/15/2010) (jeb, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 412 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 46 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 411 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 45 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 410 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 44 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 409 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 43 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 408 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 42 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 407 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 41 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 406 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 40 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 405 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 39 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 404 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 38 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 403 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 37 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 402 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 36 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 401 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 35 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 400 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 34 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 399 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 33 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 398 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 32 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 397 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 31 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 396 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 30 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 395 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 29 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 394 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 28 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 393 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 27 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 392 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 26. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(ks)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 391 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: 10/14/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 25 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 390 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: 10/14/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 24 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 389 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: 10/14/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 23 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 388 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: 10/14/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 22 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 387 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: 10/14/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 21 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 386 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: 10/14/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 20 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 385 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: 10/14/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 19 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 384 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: 10/14/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 18 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 383 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: 10/14/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 17 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 382 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: 10/14/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 16(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 381 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: 10/14/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 15(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 380 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: 10/14/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 14 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 379 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: 10/14/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 13(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 378 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: 10/14/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 12 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/2010.(zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 377 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: 10/13/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 11 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 376 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: 10/13/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 10 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 375 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: 10/13/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 9 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 374 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: 10/13/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER NO. 8 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 373 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: 10/13/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORDER NO. 7 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 372 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: 10/13/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED ORDER NO. 6(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 371 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: 10/13/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER NO. 5 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 370 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: 10/13/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ORDER NO. 4 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 369 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: 10/13/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED ORDER NO. 3 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 368 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: 10/13/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ORDER NO. 2 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 367 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: 10/13/2010 Sealed OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORDER NO. 1 (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/7/10.(jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: 9/21/2010 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [365] Joint Motion for Court Order Authorizing Disbursement of Funds. Ordered that the Class Administrator is authorized to disburse settlement funds to the Class Representatives, the Claimants and to Class Counsel in accordance with the Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 9/20/2010. (zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010, Terminated: 9/20/2010 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Order Authorizing Disbursement of Funds by BENJAMIN BECKER, BRIAN BECKER, HEATHER A. CHAPLIN, CARL DILLINGER, MARSHA KAY DILLINGER, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GOVERNMENT, ANN FLENER, JULIE FRY, TERRANCE W. GAINER, ISAAC HENRY GITTLEN, LAWRENCE HOLMES, JAMES ERICH KELLER, MITRA MOHAMMADI, PATRICIA DOYLE MOHAMMADI, MONICA MOOREHEAD, CHARLES H. RAMSEY, SARAH SLOAN (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Messineo, Carl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: 8/4/2010 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [363] Joint Motion to Allow Certain Claims Filed by the Date of the Fairness Hearing as Recommended by the Claims Administrator. The five late claims filed by the date of the Fairness Hearing and recommended by the Claims Administrator shall be allowed to participate as class members in the settlement of claims in this matter. As reflected in the July 15, 2010 Final Approval Order, the record is deemed closed with and upon the disclosure of the disposition of the previously open claims, as did occur on July 30, 2010 with the filing of the final disclosure of the Class Administrator placing on the record the numeric breakdown of the final disposition of all claims. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 8/3/2010. (mm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010, Terminated: 8/4/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION and Notice Submitting Resolution and Disposition of Open Claims from Class Administrator by BENJAMIN BECKER, BRIAN BECKER, HEATHER A. CHAPLIN, CARL DILLINGER, MARSHA KAY DILLINGER, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GOVERNMENT, ANN FLENER, JULIE FRY, TERRANCE W. GAINER, ISAAC HENRY GITTLEN, LAWRENCE HOLMES, JAMES ERICH KELLER, MITRA MOHAMMADI, PATRICIA DOYLE MOHAMMADI, MONICA MOOREHEAD, CHARLES H. RAMSEY, SARAH SLOAN (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Supplemental Declaration of the Class Administrator)(Messineo, Carl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: 7/16/2010 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [358] Joint Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Class Settlement and Payment Distribution; Joint Motion for Orders Nullifying Arrests and to Authorize Filing Under Seal Copies of Individual Orders of Arrest Nullification for Each Class Member. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 7/14/2010. (zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: 7/13/2010 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Paul L. Friedman held on June 30, 2010; Page Numbers: 1 - 37. Date of Issuance:July 13, 2010. Court Reporter/Transcriber Rebecca Stonestreet, Telephone number 202-354-3249, Court Reporter Email Address : kingreporter2@verizon.net.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/13/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/12/2010.(Stonestreet, Rebecca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: 7/8/2010 Notice of Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Proposed Order Joint Notice of Submission of Proposed Order by BENJAMIN BECKER, BRIAN BECKER, ELIZABETH T. BUTLER, HEATHER A. CHAPLIN, CARL DILLINGER, MARSHA KAY DILLINGER, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GOVERNMENT, BRIAN EDWARDS-TIEKERT, ADAM R. EIDINGER, ROBERT FISH, ANN FLENER, JULIE FRY, ISAAC HENRY GITTLEN, KIMBERLY GRIER, LAWRENCE HOLMES, JAMES ERICH KELLER, MITRA MOHAMMADI, MONICA MOOREHEAD, SEEDS OF PEACE, INC., CHARLES E. SIPPEL, SARAH SLOAN, SASHA KELLER WRIGHT re Fairness Hearing, [358] Joint MOTION for Final Approval of Proposed Class Settlement and Payment Distribution; Joint Motion for Orders Nullifying Arrests and to Authorize Filing Under Seal Copies of Individual Orders of Arrest Nullification for Each Class Member re [357] OrderJoint MOTION for Final Approval of Proposed Class Settlement and Payment Distribution; Joint Motion for Orders Nullifying Arrests and to Authorize Filing Under Seal Copies of Individual Orders of Arrest Nullification for Each Class Member re [357] OrderJoint MOTION for Final Approval of Proposed Class Settlement and Payment Distribution; Joint Motion for Orders Nullifying Arrests and to Authorize Filing Under Seal Copies of Individual Orders of Arrest Nullification for Each Class Member re [357] OrderJoint MOTION for Final Approval of Proposed Class Settlement and Payment Distribution; Joint Motion for Orders Nullifying Arrests and to Authorize Filing Under Seal Copies of Individual Orders of Arrest Nullification for Each Class Member re [357] OrderJoint MOTION for Final Approval of Proposed Class Settlement and Payment Distribution; Joint Motion for Orders Nullifying Arrests and to Authorize Filing Under Seal Copies of Individual Orders of Arrest Nullification for Each Class Member re [357] Order (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Messineo, Carl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: 6/30/2010 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter to the Court from Daniel K. Nazer regarding proposed settlement. (jth, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: 6/24/2010, Terminated: 7/15/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Final Approval of Proposed Class Settlement and Payment Distribution; Joint Motion for Orders Nullifying Arrests and to Authorize Filing Under Seal Copies of Individual Orders of Arrest Nullification for Each Class Member re [357] Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, granting [354] Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Settlement by BENJAMIN BECKER, BRIAN BECKER, ELIZABETH T. BUTLER, HEATHER A. CHAPLIN, CARL DILLINGER, MARSHA KAY DILLINGER, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GOVERNMENT, BRIAN EDWARDS-TIEKERT, ADAM R. EIDINGER, ROBERT FISH, ANN FLENER, JULIE FRY, TERRANCE W. GAINER, ISAAC HENRY GITTLEN, KIMBERLY GRIER, LAWRENCE HOLMES, JAMES ERICH KELLER, MITRA MOHAMMADI, PATRICIA DOYLE MOHAMMADI, MONICA MOOREHEAD, CHARLES H. RAMSEY, SEEDS OF PEACE, INC., CHARLES E. SIPPEL, SARAH SLOAN, SASHA KELLER WRIGHT (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Ex. 1 - Cozzi Decl., # (3) Ex. 2 - Messineo Decl., # (4) Ex. 3 - Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval and Memorandum in Support, # (5) Ex. 4 - Settlement Agreement, as amended, # (6) Ex. 5 - Order of Final Approval in Burgin v. DC)(Messineo, Carl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: 2/4/2010 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [354] Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Settlement. Ordered that the proposed Settlement Agreement is preliminarily approved pending further consideration at a fairness hearing. Fairness hearing scheduled for 6/30/2010 @ 9:30 a.m. See Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 2/4/2010. (zmm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: 2/2/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing of Corrected Proposed Notice to Class by BENJAMIN BECKER, BRIAN BECKER, ELIZABETH T. BUTLER, HEATHER A. CHAPLIN, CARL DILLINGER, MARSHA KAY DILLINGER, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GOVERNMENT, BRIAN EDWARDS-TIEKERT, ADAM R. EIDINGER, ROBERT FISH, ANN FLENER, JULIE FRY, TERRANCE W. GAINER, ISAAC HENRY GITTLEN, KIMBERLY GRIER, LAWRENCE HOLMES, JAMES ERICH KELLER, MITRA MOHAMMADI, MONICA MOOREHEAD, CHARLES H. RAMSEY, SEEDS OF PEACE, INC., CHARLES E. SIPPEL, SARAH SLOAN, SASHA KELLER WRIGHT re [354] Joint MOTION Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Settlement, Notice to Class and Notice of Fairness Hearing (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 1)(Messineo, Carl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: 2/1/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing of Bulky Exhibit by BENJAMIN BECKER, BRIAN BECKER, ELIZABETH T. BUTLER, HEATHER A. CHAPLIN, CARL DILLINGER, MARSHA KAY DILLINGER, BRIAN EDWARDS-TIEKERT, ROBERT FISH, ANN FLENER, JULIE FRY, ISAAC HENRY GITTLEN, KIMBERLY GRIER, LAWRENCE HOLMES, JAMES ERICH KELLER, MITRA MOHAMMADI, MONICA MOOREHEAD, SEEDS OF PEACE, INC., CHARLES E. SIPPEL, SARAH SLOAN, SASHA KELLER WRIGHT re [354] Joint MOTION Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Settlement, Notice to Class and Notice of Fairness Hearing (Messineo, Carl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: 1/29/2010, Terminated: 2/4/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Settlement, Notice to Class and Notice of Fairness Hearing by BENJAMIN BECKER, BRIAN BECKER, ELIZABETH T. BUTLER, HEATHER A. CHAPLIN, CARL DILLINGER, MARSHA KAY DILLINGER, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GOVERNMENT, BRIAN EDWARDS-TIEKERT, ADAM R. EIDINGER, ROBERT FISH, ANN FLENER, JULIE FRY, TERRANCE W. GAINER, ISAAC HENRY GITTLEN, KIMBERLY GRIER, LAWRENCE HOLMES, JAMES ERICH KELLER, MITRA MOHAMMADI, MONICA MOOREHEAD, CHARLES H. RAMSEY, SEEDS OF PEACE, INC., CHARLES E. SIPPEL, SARAH SLOAN, SASHA KELLER WRIGHT (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Text of Proposed Order, # (3) Ex. 1 - Proposed Settlement Agreement, # (4) Ex. 1a - First Amendment to Settlement Agreement, # (5) Ex. 2 - Proposed Notice to Class, # (6) Ex. 3 - Proof of Claim Form, # (7) Ex. 4 - First Amendment Rights and Police Standards Act of 2004, # (8) Ex. 5 - Gilardi Firm Materials)(Messineo, Carl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: 1/8/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to Court of Execution, and Filing Herein, of Proposed Settlement Agreement Between the Becker Class and teh District of Columbia Defendants by BENJAMIN BECKER, BRIAN BECKER, ELIZABETH T. BUTLER, HEATHER A. CHAPLIN, CARL DILLINGER, MARSHA KAY DILLINGER, BRIAN EDWARDS-TIEKERT, ADAM R. EIDINGER, ROBERT FISH, ANN FLENER, JULIE FRY, ISAAC HENRY GITTLEN, KIMBERLY GRIER, LAWRENCE HOLMES, JAMES ERICH KELLER, MITRA MOHAMMADI, MONICA MOOREHEAD, CHARLES E. SIPPEL, SARAH SLOAN, SASHA KELLER WRIGHT (Attachments: # (1) Executed Settlement Agreement)(Messineo, Carl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 149 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?