Workers' Compensation Reinsurance Association, et al. v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., et al.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:09-cv-02291
District Judge Patrick J. Schiltz, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Minneapolis Foundation,, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Minneapolis Foundation, The"

Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

No Logo Minnesota Medical Foundation, Plaintiff

Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

No Logo Robins Kaplan Miller & Ciresi Foundation for Children, Plaintiff

Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

No Logo Workers' Compensation Reinsurance Association, Plaintiff

Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

v.
No Logo Robert G Smith, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin A Oglesbay +1 612 766 7527 +1 612 766 1600 eoglesbay@faegre.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Maslon Edelman Borman & Brand LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David F. Herr +1 612 672 8200 +6728 672 672 8397 david.herr@maslon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winthrop & Weinstine, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William A McNab +1 612 604 6652 +1 612 604 6852 wmcnab@winthrop.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brooks F Poley +1 612 604 6400 +1 612 604 6819 bpoley@winthrop.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert R Weinstine +1 612 604 6613 +1 612 604 6813 rweinstine@winthrop.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zelle, Hofmann, Voelbel, Mason & Gette LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R Cashman +1 612 339 2020 +1 612 336 9100 mcashman@zelle.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Michael Hagstrom +1 612 339 2020 +1 612 336 9100 rhagstrom@zelle.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence T Hofmann +1 612 339 2020 +1 612 336 9100 lhofmann@zelle.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan F Mack +1 612 339 2020 +1 612 336 9100 jmack@zelle.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rory D Zamansky +1 612 359 4280 +1 612 336 9100 rzamansky@zelle.com
Wells Fargo Bank, NA Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Defendant
Officer/Director, NORWEST CORP
Officer/Director, Day Runner, Inc.
Officer/Director, Yucca Uranium Inc
Officer/Director, Munienhanced Fund Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin A Oglesbay +1 612 766 7527 +1 612 766 1600 eoglesbay@faegre.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Maslon Edelman Borman & Brand LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David F. Herr +1 612 672 8200 +6728 672 672 8397 david.herr@maslon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winthrop & Weinstine, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William A McNab +1 612 604 6652 +1 612 604 6852 wmcnab@winthrop.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brooks F Poley +1 612 604 6400 +1 612 604 6819 bpoley@winthrop.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert R Weinstine +1 612 604 6613 +1 612 604 6813 rweinstine@winthrop.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zelle, Hofmann, Voelbel, Mason & Gette LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R Cashman +1 612 339 2020 +1 612 336 9100 mcashman@zelle.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Michael Hagstrom +1 612 339 2020 +1 612 336 9100 rhagstrom@zelle.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence T Hofmann +1 612 339 2020 +1 612 336 9100 lhofmann@zelle.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan F Mack +1 612 339 2020 +1 612 336 9100 jmack@zelle.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rory D Zamansky +1 612 359 4280 +1 612 336 9100 rzamansky@zelle.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 10/5/2009 before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. Court Reporter: Debra Beauvais (E-mail: Debra_Beauvais@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (651) 848-1223). Redaction Request due 11/5/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/16/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/13/2010. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (db) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. (db) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None
      LETTER from Clerk's Office to Ramsey County District Court enclosing Order of Remand. (kt) (Entered: 10/06/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 48 Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 15 Motion to Remand. This matter is hereby REMANDED to the Minnesota District Court, Second Judicial District. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 10/06/09. (bjs) (Entered: 10/06/2009)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz: Motion Hearing held on 10/5/2009 re 15 MOTION to Remand filed by the Plaintiffs. Matter taken under advisement. Written order will issue. (Court Reporter Debra Beauvais) (sf) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: None
            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Minneapolis Foundation, The, Minnesota Medical Foundation, Robins Kaplan Miller & Ciresi Foundation for Children, Workers' Compensation Reinsurance Association re 45 Declaration in Support, 44 Reply. (McElroy, Heather) (Entered: 09/30/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: None
              Supplemental Declaration of Roberta B. Walburn in Support of 15 MOTION to Remand filed by Minneapolis Foundation, The, Minnesota Medical Foundation, Robins Kaplan Miller & Ciresi Foundation for Children, Workers' Compensation Reinsurance Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 46 - 49)(McElroy, Heather) (Entered: 09/30/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: None
                REPLY re 15 MOTION to Remand filed by Minneapolis Foundation, The, Minnesota Medical Foundation, Robins Kaplan Miller & Ciresi Foundation for Children, Workers' Compensation Reinsurance Association. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Brief, # 2 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(McElroy, Heather) DOCUMENTS RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE on 9/30/2009 (VEM). (Entered: 09/30/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None
                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert G. Smith, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re 39 Exhibit, 37 Exhibit, 40 Exhibit, 41 Exhibit, 35 Exhibit, 31 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, 42 Exhibit, 36 Exhibit, 33 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 30 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 38 Exhibit. (Hagstrom, Richard) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None
                    EXHIBIT O-T re 33 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion filed by Robert G. Smith, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Hagstrom, Richard) Modified text on 9/28/2009 (kt). SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 9/25/09. (KT) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None
                      EXHIBIT N, part 2 of 2 re 33 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion filed by Robert G. Smith, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Hagstrom, Richard) Modified text on 9/28/2009 (kt). SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 9/25/09. (KT) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None
                        EXHIBIT N, Part 1 of 2 re 33 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion filed by Robert G. Smith, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Hagstrom, Richard) Modified on 9/28/2009 (kt). SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 9/25/09. (KT) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None
                          EXHIBITS I-M re 33 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion filed by Robert G. Smith, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Hagstrom, Richard) Modified on 9/28/2009 (kt). SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 9/25/09. (KT) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None
                            EXHIBIT F, G, and H re 33 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion filed by Robert G. Smith, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Hagstrom, Richard) Modified on 9/28/2009 (kt). SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 9/25/09. (KT) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None
                              EXHIBIT E re 33 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion filed by Robert G. Smith, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Hagstrom, Richard) Modified text on 9/28/2009 (kt). SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 9/25/09. (KT) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None
                                DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: DUPLICATE ENTRY. EXHIBIT re 33 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion to Remand by Robert G. Smith, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. filed by Robert G. Smith, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Hagstrom, Richard) Modified on 9/28/2009 (kt). (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None
                                  EXHIBIT D re 33 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion to Remand by Robert G. Smith, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Hagstrom, Richard) Modified text on 9/28/2009 (kt). SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 9/25/09. (KT) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None
                                    EXHIBIT B and C by Robert G. Smith, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Hagstrom, Richard) Modified text on 9/28/2009 (kt). SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 9/25/09. (KT) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None
                                      AFFIDAVIT of Michael Jacobs in OPPOSITION TO 15 MOTION to Remand filed by Robert G. Smith, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s))(Hagstrom, Richard) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER re 29 Stipulation filed by Minnesota Medical Foundation, Robins Kaplan Miller & Ciresi Foundation for Children, Minneapolis Foundation, The, Workers' Compensation Reinsurance Association. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 9/25/09. (kt) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None
                                          LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE re 30 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Robert G. Smith, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Hagstrom, Richard) Modified on 9/28/2009 (kt). (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None
                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 15 MOTION to Remand filed by Robert G. Smith, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Hagstrom, Richard) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 9/25/09. (KT) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None
                                              STIPULATION Stipulated Order by all parties. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Rahne, Denise) Modified text on 9/25/2009 (kt). (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER Cancelling pretrial conference scheduled for 10/13/09. The conference will be rescheduled, if necessary, after a ruling has been issued on the Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 9/18/09. (LPH) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron: Telephone Conference held on 9/14/2009. Order to issue. (LPH) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                    EXHIBIT INDEX re 1 Notice of Removal, by Robert G. Smith, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. filed by Robert G. Smith, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits C-L, # 2 Exhibits N)(Hofmann, Lawrence) DOCUMENTS RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE on 9/17/2009 (vem). (Entered: 09/17/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The time period for appeal of the Amended Report/Order of Master: August 29, 2009 issued by Special Master Richard Solum (hereafter referred to as the "Special Master Report and Order") in state court is stayed as of September 14, 2009. This stay shall expire ten business days after the decision on plaintiffs' motion for remand of case to state court is filed in federal court. 2. The rights and arguments of the parties to any challenge to the Special Master Report and Order or to seek relief from this decision by the Special Master, including the timing of any appeal of the Special Master Report and Order, are preserved as of September 14, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 09/16/2009. (TSS) (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Minneapolis Foundation, The, Minnesota Medical Foundation, Robins Kaplan Miller & Ciresi Foundation for Children, Workers' Compensation Reinsurance Association re 22 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, 21 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, 23 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, 20 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement. (McElroy, Heather) Modified text on 9/17/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                          RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Workers' Compensation Reinsurance Association that there is no such parent or publicly held corporation to report. (McElroy, Heather) (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                            RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Robins Kaplan Miller & Ciresi Foundation for Children that there is no such parent or publicly held corporation to report. (McElroy, Heather) (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                              RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Minnesota Medical Foundation that there is no such parent or publicly held corporation to report. (McElroy, Heather) (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Minneapolis Foundation, The that there is no such parent or publicly held corporation to report. (McElroy, Heather) (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Minneapolis Foundation, The, Minnesota Medical Foundation, Robins Kaplan Miller & Ciresi Foundation for Children, Workers' Compensation Reinsurance Association re 16 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 15 MOTION to Remand, 18 Declaration in Support, 17 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (McElroy, Heather) Modified text on 9/17/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    Declaration of Roberta B. Walburn in Support of 15 MOTION to Remand filed by Minneapolis Foundation, The, Minnesota Medical Foundation, Robins Kaplan Miller & Ciresi Foundation for Children, Workers' Compensation Reinsurance Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1 (part 1), # 2 Exhibit(s) 1 (part 2), # 3 Exhibit(s) 2A - 2I, # 4 Exhibit(s) 3, # 5 Exhibit(s) 4, # 6 Exhibit(s) 5, # 7 Exhibit(s) 6, # 8 Exhibit(s) 7A, # 9 Exhibit(s) 7B, # 10 Exhibit(s) 7C, # 11 Exhibit(s) 7D, # 12 Exhibit(s) 7E, # 13 Exhibit(s) 7F, # 14 Exhibit(s) 8, # 15 Exhibit(s) 9, # 16 Exhibit(s) 10, # 17 Exhibit(s) 11A, # 18 Exhibit(s) 11B, # 19 Exhibit(s) 11C, # 20 Exhibit(s) 11D, # 21 Exhibit(s) 12 - 15, # 22 Exhibit(s) 16A, # 23 Exhibit(s) 16B, # 24 Exhibit(s) 16C, # 25 Exhibit(s) 16D, # 26 Exhibit(s) 17 - 27, # 27 Exhibit(s) 28 - 30, # 28 Exhibit(s) 31 - 34, # 29 Exhibit(s) 35, # 30 Exhibit(s) 36 - 45)(McElroy, Heather) RECEIVED SEALED DOCUMENTS IN CLERK'S OFFICE 9/16/09 Modified on 10/5/2009 (jam). (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 15 MOTION to Remand filed by Minneapolis Foundation, The, Minnesota Medical Foundation, Robins Kaplan Miller & Ciresi Foundation for Children, Workers' Compensation Reinsurance Association. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 2 Placeholder for Memorandum of Law)(McElroy, Heather) RECEIVED SEALED DOCUMENT IN CLERK'S OFFICE 9/16/09 Modified on 10/5/2009 (jam). (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 15 MOTION to Remand : Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (McElroy, Heather) (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION to Remand by Minneapolis Foundation, The, Minnesota Medical Foundation, Robins Kaplan Miller & Ciresi Foundation for Children, Workers' Compensation Reinsurance Association. (McElroy, Heather) (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 9/15/09. (LPH) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                              STIPULATION for Protective Order by Minneapolis Foundation, The, Minnesota Medical Foundation, Robins Kaplan Miller & Ciresi Foundation for Children, Robert G. Smith, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Workers' Compensation Reinsurance Association. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Zamansky, Rory) (Entered: 09/10/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Minneapolis Foundation, The, Minnesota Medical Foundation, Robins Kaplan Miller & Ciresi Foundation for Children, Workers' Compensation Reinsurance Association. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(McElroy, Heather) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER. Hearing set for 10/5/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. See order for details. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 9/2/09. (BJS) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert G. Smith, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re 7 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, 1 Notice of Removal, 4 Exhibit, 3 Exhibit,, 2 Index filed. (Jacobs, Michael) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      LETTER TO ALL COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 09/02/09. (bjs) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 10/13/2009 01:30 PM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 632 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 9/1/09. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(LPH) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                          RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. of Wells Fargo & Company as corporate parent and/or publicly held company. (VEM) QC'd on 9/22/2009 (vem ). (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                            ANSWER and affirmative defenses of Defendants to First Amended Complaint by Robert G. Smith, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (VEM) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                              ANSWER and affirmative defenses of defendants to Complaint by Robert G. Smith, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (VEM) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                EXHIBIT #26 July 29, 2009 Report of Master to the Court re 1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: # 1 Report/Order of Master: August 10, 2009, # 2 Report/Order of Master: August 14, 2009, # 3 Report/Order of Master: August 21, 2009, # 4 Ramsey County Court Docket Sheet, # 5 Notice of filing Notice of Removal)(VEM) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                  EXHIBIT #13 Report and Order of Master: Master 17, 2009 Hearing re 1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: # 1 Addendum to Protective Order, # 2 Report and Order of Master: March 24th, 2009 Hearing, # 3 April 21, 2009 Report/Order of Master, # 4 May 7, 2009 Report/Order of Master, # 5 Report and Order of Master: May 18th Hearing, # 6 Report and Order of Master: June 1, 2009 Stipulation, # 7 Amended Protective Order, # 8 June 6, 2009 Report/Order of Master, # 9 Order and Commissions Authorizing Depositions, # 10 Report/Order of Master: June 28, 2009, # 11 Report/Order of Master: July 8, 2009, # 12 Report/Order of Master: July 20, 2009)(VEM) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                    EXHIBIT INDEX filed re 1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: # 1 Protective Order, # 2 Order Regarding Plaintiffs' First Motion to Compel, # 3 Rule 16 and Case Management Order, # 4 Nondestruct Order, # 5 Order Appointing Special Master, # 6 Order Directing Clerk to File Exhibit B to docket entry 35 Under Seal, # 7 March 3, 2009, Report of Special Master, # 8 March 11, 2009 Report/Order of Master)(VEM) (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Robert G. Smith, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. from Ramsey County Court, case number 62-cv-08-10825 (SDW). ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 03-36171) assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Master referred to Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron. (Attachments: # 1 Summons & Complaint, # 2 First Amended Complaint # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) (vem). Modified on 9/1/2009 (vem). QC'd on 9/22/2009 (vem ). (Entered: 09/01/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 161 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?