Gordon v. Apple Computer Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:06-cv-05358
District Judge James Ware, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 28, 2016 at 1:49 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Brian F Gordon, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald Judah Aranoff +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 aranoff@bernlieb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan Collyer , +1 212 779 1414 collyer@bernlieb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith M. Fleischman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 fleischman@bernlieb.com
TERMINATED: 12/01/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MEL E. LIFSHITZ +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen I Zeldes +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 helenz@zhlaw.com
v.
Apple, Inc. Apple, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Apple Computer Inc."

Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 385 - Personal Property: Property Damage Product Liability
  Entries (97) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/15/2008, before Judge Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 3/13/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/23/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/21/2009. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 2/23/2009) (Entered: 02/23/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
    JUDGMENT re 95 Proposed Judgment. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/13/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2009) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None
      Letter from Andrew D. Muhlbach re Proposed Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Judgment)(Muhlbach, Andrew) (Filed on 1/13/2009) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
        Letter from Brian Ferguson to Judge James Ware dated 12/18/08. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2008) (Entered: 12/31/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None
          [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT by Apple Computer Inc., Brian F Gordon. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 12/23/2008) Modified text on 1/7/2009,(to conform with document posted by counsel.) (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/23/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
            Letter from Penny Preovolos dated 12/23/08 to Judge James Ware on behalf of parties re: submitting for review a 93 Proposed Judgment. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 12/23/2008) Modified on 1/7/2009 (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/23/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
              FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSING CLAIMS by Judge James Ware granting 75 Motion ; granting 77 Motion (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008) (Entered: 12/16/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/15/2008 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 12/15/2008) re 75 MOTION for entry of an Order granting final approval of the proposed settlement, 77 MOTION for entry of an Order approving the payment of Plaintiff's counsels' attorneys' fees, reimbursement of expenses, and incentive fee award to the named Plaintiff. The Court to issue further order. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/15/2008) (Entered: 12/16/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None
                  [Proposed] Final Judgment and Order Approving Settlement and dismissing claims [Amended] by Brian F Gordon. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Zeldes, Helen) (Filed on 12/15/2008) Modified text on 12/19/2008,(to conform with document posted by counsel.) (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None
                    [Proposed] Final Judgment and Order approving settlement and dismissing claims [AMENDED] by Brian F Gordon. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Zeldes, Helen) (Filed on 12/15/2008) Modified text on 12/19/2008,to conform with document posted by counsel.) (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Letter from B. J. Ferguson dated 12/9/08 by Via Federal Express Overnight Delivery to Judge James Ware re: Final Settlement Approval. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2008) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Computer Inc. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 12/12/2008) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                          Declaration of Anne M. Hunter in Support of 82 Final Settlement Approval filed by Apple Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 12/12/2008) Modified on 12/16/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                            Declaration of Patrick Ekstrand in Support of 82 Final Settlement Approval filed by Apple Computer Inc.. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 12/12/2008) Modified on 12/16/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                              Letter from Defendants Letter Brief Re: Brian Ferguson Submission. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 12/12/2008) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None
                                [Proposed]Final Judgment and Order Approving Settlement and dismissing claims by Brian F Gordon. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Zeldes, Helen) (Filed on 12/11/2008) Modified on 12/16/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/11/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None
                                  JOINT UPDATED CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Apple Computer Inc.. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 12/11/2008) Modified on 12/16/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/11/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                    [Proposed] Final Judgment and Order approving settlement and dismissing claims related document 75 by Brian F Gordon. (Zeldes, Helen) (Filed on 12/8/2008) Modified on 12/8/2008,***counsel failed to properly link to motion. )*** (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                      Declaration of Ronald J. Aranoff in Support of Unopposed 77 Motion for Fees and Expenses filed by Brian F Gordon. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Zeldes, Helen) (Filed on 12/8/2008) Modified on 12/9/2008,(***counsel failed to properly link to motion.***) (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                        Declaration of Helen I. Zeldes in Support of Unopposed 77 Motion for Fees & Expenses filed by Brian F Gordon. (Zeldes, Helen) (Filed on 12/8/2008) Modified on 12/9/2008,(***counsel failed to properly link to motion.***) (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                          Motion for entry of an Order approving the payment of Plaintiff's counsels' attorneys' fees, reimbursement of expenses, and incentive fee award to the named Plaintiff. and Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Unopposed Motion for Fees & Expenses (Zeldes, Helen) (Filed on 12/8/2008) Modified on 12/8/2008,***counsel used incorrect event, correct event is motion, not notice.)*** (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                            Declaration of Helen I. Zeldes in Support of 75 Final Approval of Settlement filed by Brian F Gordon. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Zeldes, Helen) (Filed on 12/8/2008) Modified on 12/9/2008,(***counsel failed to properly link to motion.***)(cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                              MOTION for entry of an Order granting final approval of the proposed settlement set forth in the Stipulation 47 dated 1/25/08. and Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Final Approval of Settlement (Zeldes, Helen) (Filed on 12/8/2008) Modified on 12/8/2008,***counsel used incorrect event, correct event is motion, not notice.)*** (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Computer Inc. re 70 Notice (Other) in Support of Final Settlement Approval (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 12/8/2008) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                  Declaration of Kelly Fitzgerald in Support of 70 Notice (Other) Regarding Final Settlement Approval filed byApple Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 70 ) (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 12/8/2008) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                    Declaration of Nancy Laxson-Highton in Support of 70 Notice (Other) Regarding Final Settlement Approval filed byApple Computer Inc.. (Related document(s) 70 ) (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 12/8/2008) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                      Declaration of Penelope A. Preovolos in Support of 70 Notice (Other) Regarding Final Settlement Approval filed byApple Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 70 ) (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 12/8/2008) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                        MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF 75 MOTION FINAL SETTLEMENT APPROVAL (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 12/8/2008) Modified on 12/8/2008,***counsel used incorrect event, correct event is memorandum, not notice.)*** (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE by Brian F Gordon Notice of Firm Name Change (Aranoff, Ronald) (Filed on 12/4/2008) (Entered: 12/04/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                            Letter from Ronald J. Aranoff dated 11/25/08 notice of withdrawal on Mr. Lifshitz's behalf. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2008) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER Granting 66 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mel E. Lifshitz. Attorney Mel E. Lifshitz terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/1/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2008) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of record for plaintiff and the Class. Mel E. Lifshitz is no longer with Bernstein Liebhard & Lifshitz, LLP (Aranoff, Ronald) (Filed on 11/25/2008) Modified on 11/25/2008,Counsel used incorrect event, correct event is motion not, notice.) (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/25/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  Letter from Brian Ferguson. (Attachments: # 1 envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE by Apple Computer Inc. of change in Counsel Attorney Johanna W. Roberts is NO longer with Morrison & Foerster LLP. (Roberts, Johanna) (Filed on 10/20/2008) Modified on 10/23/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address by Helen I. Zeldes (Zeldes, Helen) (Filed on 10/15/2008) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Computer Inc. re 61 Notice (Other) (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 9/3/2008) (Entered: 09/03/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE by Apple Computer Inc. of New Date for Fairness Hearing (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 9/3/2008) (Entered: 09/03/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER Re Notice program as set forth in the 59 Amended Order Granting Approval of Forms and Methods of Notice re 58 Stipulation filed by Brian F Gordon, Apple Computer Inc.. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/3/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2008) (Entered: 09/03/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              AMENDED ORDER Granting Approval of Forms and Methods of Notice by Apple Computer Inc re 57 Proposed Order filed by Apple Computer Inc. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/3/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2008) (Entered: 09/03/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                STIPULATION Re Notice program as set forth in the [Proposed] 57 Amended order Granting Approval of Forms and Methods of Notice by Apple Computer Inc., Brian F Gordon. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 8/27/2008) Modified text on 8/28/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/27/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                  AMENDED [Proposed] Order Granting Approval of Forms and Methods of Notice by Apple Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 8/27/2008) Modified text on 8/28/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/27/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    Letter from Penelope A. Preovolos to Judge Ware Regarding 57 Amended Order Approving the Forms and Methods of Notice.. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 8/27/2008) Modified text on 8/28/2008, link (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/27/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      Letter to Judge Ware from David Levy of Grandparent Marketing Group. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2008) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER Granting 47 Motion for Preliminary Approval of class action settlement. Motion Hearing for Final Approval of Class Settlement set for 9/8/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/24/2008 (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2008) Modified docket text on 3/24/2008 (ecg, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/24/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/24/2008 before Judge James Ware (Date Filed: 3/24/2008) re 47 MOTION for Preliminary approval of class action settlement filed by Brian F Gordon. Motion Hearing for Final Approval of Class Settlement set for 9/8/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Summer Clanton.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/24/2008) (Entered: 03/24/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Computer Inc. re 51 Notice (Other) (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 2/8/2008) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE by Apple Computer Inc. of Class Settlement Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1715 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 2/8/2008) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brian F Gordon re 49 Declaration in Support, 48 Declaration in Support, 47 MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion and Motion & P's and A's in Support of Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval (Zeldes, Helen) (Filed on 1/25/2008) (Entered: 01/25/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Declaration of Ronald J. Aranoff in Support of 47 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of class action settlement filed by Brian F Gordon. (Related document(s) 47 ) (Zeldes, Helen) (Filed on 1/25/2008) Modified text on 1/31/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/25/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Declaration of Helen I. Zeldes in Support of 47 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of class action settlement filed by Brian F Gordon. (Related document(s) 47 ) (Zeldes, Helen) (Filed on 1/25/2008) Modified text on 1/31/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/25/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 47 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND Motion for Preliminary Approval of class action settlement and Memorandum in support thereof. filed by Brian F Gordon. Motion Hearing set for 3/24/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation of Settlement, # 2 Exhibit 1 - List of Configuration Codes Covered by Settlement, # 3 Exhibit A - Class Notice, # 4 Exhibit B - Summary Notice, # 5 Exhibit C - Postcard Notice, # 6 Exhibit D - Claim Form, # 7 Exhibit E - [PROPOSED] Order Granting Preliminary Approval, # 8 Exhibit F - [PROPOSED] Final Judgment)(Zeldes, Helen) (Filed on 1/25/2008) Modified text on 1/28/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/25/2008)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Letter from Defendant Apple and Plaintiff Brian Gordon Updating the Court Re Status of Finalizing Settlement. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 11/16/2007) (Entered: 11/16/2007)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER to Vacate 9/24/2007 Case Management Conference re 43 Case Management Statement (Joint) filed by Apple Computer Inc. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/10/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2007) (Entered: 09/11/2007)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Computer Inc. re 43 Case Management Statement (Joint), 42 Letter (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 9/7/2007) (Entered: 09/07/2007)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by parties to notify the Court that they have reached an agreement to settle this matter. and REQUEST that the CMC set for 9/24/07 be taken OFF calendar filed by Apple Computer Inc.. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 9/7/2007) Modified text on 9/20/2007,(counsel used incorrect event) correct event is status report, not case management statement. (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/07/2007)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Letter from Counsel to Hon. James Ware re: Parties have reached a settlement in this matter. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 9/7/2007) Modified text on 9/20/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/07/2007)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Continuance of Case Management Conference from 8/6/2007 to 9/24/2007 re 40 Stipulation filed by Apple Computer Inc. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2007 10:00 AM before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 8/3/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2007) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    STIPULATION to Continuance of Case Management Conference by Apple Computer Inc.. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 8/2/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                      JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Updated filed by Apple Computer Inc.. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 7/23/2007) (Entered: 07/23/2007)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Continuance of Case Management Conference from 6/25/2007 to 8/6/2007 re 36 Stipulation filed by Brian F Gordon. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/6/2007 10:00 AM Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/22/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2007) (Entered: 06/22/2007)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brian F Gordon re. Stipulation to Continuance of Case Management Conference (Zeldes, Helen) (Filed on 6/21/2007) (Entered: 06/21/2007)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            STIPULATION and [proposed order] to Continuance of Case Management Conference by Brian F Gordon. (Zeldes, Helen) (Filed on 6/21/2007) Modified text on 6/21/2007,(Counsel failed to attach a PDF copy of proposed order as an (Attachment: #) (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/21/2007)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Computer Inc. re 34 Case Management Statement (Joint) (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 6/15/2007) (Entered: 06/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Updated filed by Apple Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Proposed Order Proposed Orders)(Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 6/15/2007) (Entered: 06/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/14/2007 before James Ware (Date Filed: 5/14/2007). The Court set a Further Case Management Conference for 6/25/2007 10:00 AM, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, before Hon. James Ware. The parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Statement by 6/15/2007.(Court Reporter Not Reported.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/14/2007) (Entered: 05/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Mel E. Lifshitz (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2007) (Entered: 05/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Mel E. Lifshitz ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 5461100962.) filed by Brian F Gordon. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2007) (Entered: 05/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                        JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Updated filed by Apple Computer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 5/2/2007) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Computer re 28 Notice (Other) Corporate Name Change (Muhlbach, Andrew) (Filed on 4/17/2007) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Apple Computer Inc.,of Corporate Name Change to Apple Inc. (Muhlbach, Andrew) (Filed on 4/17/2007) Modified on 4/20/2007 (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM 4/16/2007 TO 5/14/2007 re 26 Stipulation filed by Apple Computer. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/14/2007 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/23/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2007) (Entered: 03/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/23/2007
                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION to Continuance of Case Management Conference by Apple Computer. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 3/22/2007) (Entered: 03/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM 3/19/2007 TO 4/16/2007. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/16/2007 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/15/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2007) (Entered: 03/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO 3/19/2007. THE PARTIES SHALL FILE A JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT NO LATER THAN 3/19/2007 re 23 Stipulation filed by Apple Computer. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/09/2007 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/26/2007. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2007) Modified on 1/29/2007 (ecg, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: None, Terminated: 1/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION to Continuance of Case Management Conference by Apple Computer. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 1/25/2007) (Entered: 01/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ronald J. Aranoff. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2006) (Entered: 12/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING EXCHANGE OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES re 19 Stipulation filed by Apple Computer. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/18/2006. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2006) (Entered: 12/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ronald J. Aranoff (fee paid) receipt number 5461100089 filed by Brian F Gordon. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2006) (Entered: 12/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/18/2006
                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION Regarding Exchange of Initial Disclosures by Apple Computer. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 12/15/2006) (Entered: 12/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 17 Stipulation filed by Apple Computer. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/5/2007 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/14/2006. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2006) (Entered: 12/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/14/2006
                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION to Continuance of Case Management Conference by Apple Computer. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 12/13/2006) (Entered: 12/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Computer re 15 Case Management Statement (Joint) (Muhlbach, Andrew) (Filed on 12/11/2006) (Entered: 12/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Joint Rule 26(f) Report and Proposed Orders filed by Apple Computer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Muhlbach, Andrew) (Filed on 12/11/2006) (Entered: 12/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 12/13/06 at 1:30 p.m. Please take note that plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2006) (Entered: 12/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options (Zeldes, Helen) (Filed on 11/27/2006) (Entered: 11/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Computer re 10 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b)of discussion of ADR options, 11 Notice of need of ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Muhlbach, Andrew) (Filed on 11/27/2006) (Entered: 11/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Muhlbach, Andrew) (Filed on 11/27/2006) (Entered: 11/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options (Muhlbach, Andrew) (Filed on 11/27/2006) (Entered: 11/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byApple Computer. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 10/20/2006) (Entered: 10/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge James Ware for all further proceedings and Magistrate Howard R. Lloyd remains the Referral Judge for this case. Signed by the Executive Committee on 10/12/06. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2006) (Entered: 10/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2006) (Entered: 10/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Apple Computer and Request for Reassignment to a U.S. District Judge. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 10/11/2006) (Entered: 10/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 9/22/2006) Text modified on 9/25/2006 to conform to document post by counsel (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Apple Computer. (Preovolos, Penelope) (Filed on 9/15/2006) (Entered: 09/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/28/2006. Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2006 01:30 PM. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2006) (Entered: 08/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit of Helen I. Zeldes by Brian F Gordon (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/1/2006 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Apple Computer (SUMMONS ISSUED); jury demand; ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 3389507.). Filed by Brian F Gordon. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/1/2006 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 167 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?