DOE v. GOSS et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-02122
District Judge Gladys Kessler, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo (P) DOE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roy W. Krieger +1 202 261 3576 +1 202 403 3763 kriegerr@att.net

Toggle Switch Represented by MARK S. ZAID, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/24/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Steven Zaid +1 202 454 2809 +1 202 330 5610 Mark@MarkZaid.com
v.
United States Central Intelligence Agency United States Central Intelligence Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth J. Shapiro +1 202 514 5302 +1 202 616 8470 Elizabeth.Shapiro@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED W. Scott Simpson +1 202 514 3495 +1 202 616 8470 scott.simpson@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 12/08/2008 Marcia N. Tiersky +1 202 514 1359 +1 202 318 0486 marcia.tiersky@usdoj.gov
No Logo JAMES PAVITT, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/06/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth J. Shapiro +1 202 514 5302 +1 202 616 8470 Elizabeth.Shapiro@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 01/06/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY W. Scott Simpson +1 202 514 3495 +1 202 616 8470 scott.simpson@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 12/08/2008 Marcia N. Tiersky +1 202 514 1359 +1 202 318 0486 marcia.tiersky@usdoj.gov
No Logo John Does, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY W. Scott Simpson +1 202 514 3495 +1 202 616 8470 scott.simpson@usdoj.gov
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "MICHAEL V. HAYDEN"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth J. Shapiro +1 202 514 5302 +1 202 616 8470 Elizabeth.Shapiro@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY W. Scott Simpson +1 202 514 3495 +1 202 616 8470 scott.simpson@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 12/08/2008 Marcia N. Tiersky +1 202 514 1359 +1 202 318 0486 marcia.tiersky@usdoj.gov
No Logo PORTER GOSS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY W. Scott Simpson +1 202 514 3495 +1 202 616 8470 scott.simpson@usdoj.gov
TERMINATED: 12/08/2008 Marcia N. Tiersky +1 202 514 1359 +1 202 318 0486 marcia.tiersky@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (118) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 118 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution; this case is hereby dismissed. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/11/09. (CL, ) (Entered: 08/11/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 118 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
    MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution by MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Simpson, W.) (Entered: 07/27/2009)
      LREF
      Blank 117 Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER denying 65 66 Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider and Vacate. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/3/09. (CL, ) (Entered: 06/03/2009)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER: A Status Conference is set for June 2, 2009 at 3:00 p.m.; see Order for details. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/26/09. (CL, ) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 115 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: None
          STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Simpson, W.) (Entered: 05/19/2009)
            LREF
            Legal Document 114 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
            MEMORANDUM OPINION to the Order denying Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/11/09. (CL, ) (Entered: 05/11/2009)
              LREF
              Blank 113 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER denying 64 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings; a Status Conference is hereby scheduled for May 20, 2009 at 11:30 a.m.; the parties shall file a Joint Status Report by May 19, 2009 at 4:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/11/09. (CL, ) (Entered: 05/11/2009)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None
                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay Costs of Service by MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Simpson, W.) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None
                  Memorandum in opposition to re 95 MOTION for Discovery To Partissify Second Amended Complaint // Supplemental Opposition // filed by MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Simpson, W.) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Lodging and Submission of Classified Declaration by MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Simpson, W.) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting in part and denying in part 78 Plaintiff's Motion to Impose Costs of Service Upon Plaintiff Pavitt; Plaintiff is entitled to $910 (see Order for details); Defendant is to pay Plaintiff $910 within 30 days of this Order.. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/29/09. (CL, ) (Entered: 01/29/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER denying 46 Plaintiff's Motion to Find that all Material Redacted from his Complaints by Defendants on the Grounds that it is Classified Constitutes an Admission of its Truth for Purposes of this Litigation. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/29/09. (CL, ) (Entered: 01/29/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 107 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER that no later than February 9, 2009 at 5:00 p.m. each party shall file a submission stating whether information must be declassified if it is in the public domain (see Order for more details). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/27/09. (CL, ) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER: The transcript of the Motions Hearing in this case on January 27, 2009, may be unsealed for the limited purpose of providing to the Court Security Officer a copy of said transcript; thereafter, the transcript will be re-sealed for one week. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/27/09. (CL, ) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None
                              Unopposed MOTION to Continue Hearing Scheduled for January 15, 2009 by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Shapiro, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: None
                                NOTICE OF LODGING AND SUBMISSION OF CLASSIFIED PLEADING by MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY re 101 Order, (Simpson, W.) (Entered: 01/08/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting 80 Defendant Pavitt's Motion to Dismiss; this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice as to Defendant Pavitt. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/6/09. (CL, ) Modified on 1/6/2009 (CL, ). (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER denying 79 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/5/09. (CL, ) (Entered: 01/05/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER that a Status Conference and Motions Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Partially Declassify the Second Amended Complaint shall be held on January 15, 2009 at 11:30 a.m.; an unredacted version of the Second Amended Complaint shall be filed in camera by January 8, 2009. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/5/09. (CL, ) (Entered: 01/05/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by W. Scott Simpson on behalf of all defendants Substituting for attorney Marcia N. Tiersky (Simpson, W.) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: None
                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re 95 MOTION for Discovery To Partissify Second Amended Complaint filed by (P) DOE. (Krieger, Roy) (Entered: 08/07/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: None
                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by (P) DOE (Krieger, Roy) (Entered: 07/28/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: None
                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply by (P) DOE (Krieger, Roy) (Entered: 07/17/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                Memorandum in opposition to re 95 MOTION for Discovery To Partissify Second Amended Complaint filed by MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tiersky, Marcia) (Entered: 07/10/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION for Discovery To Partissify Second Amended Complaint by (P) DOE (Krieger, Roy) (Entered: 06/27/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION to Withdraw 93 MOTION for Disclosure of Classified Information by MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, (P) DOE, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Tiersky, Marcia) (Entered: 03/18/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                      WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO ORDER DATED 3/18/08 MOTION for Disclosure of Classified Information by (P) DOE (Krieger, Roy) Modified on 4/7/2008 (tth, ). (Entered: 03/03/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re 80 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint filed by JAMES PAVITT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit One)(Tiersky, Marcia) (Entered: 10/15/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re 79 MOTION to Compel Defendant CIA to Accept Service of Process on Doe Defendants filed by (P) DOE. (Krieger, Roy) (Entered: 10/12/2007)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Compel Defendant CIA to accept Service Under the APA by (P) DOE (Krieger, Roy) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                              REPLY to opposition to motion re 78 MOTION for Taxation of Costs For Personal Service of Summons and Complaint filed by (P) DOE. (Krieger, Roy) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                REPLY to opposition to 77 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Pavitt filed by (P) DOE. (tg, ) (See Docket Entry 87 to view document). (Entered: 10/03/2007)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                  Memorandum in opposition to 80 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint Reply in Support of Motion for Default Judgment as to Defendant Pavitt and Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Pavit filed by (P) DOE. (Krieger, Roy) Modified on 10/3/2007 (tg, ). (Entered: 10/02/2007)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Replies by (P) DOE (Krieger, Roy) (Entered: 09/28/2007)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re 79 MOTION to Compel Defendant CIA to Accept Service of Process on Doe Defendants filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tiersky, Marcia) (Entered: 09/24/2007)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to (P) DOE. Attorney Mark S. Zaid terminated. (Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 09/24/2007)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Time to File Replies by (P) DOE (Krieger, Roy) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re 78 MOTION for Taxation of Costs For Personal Service of Summons and Complaint filed by JAMES PAVITT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tiersky, Marcia) (Entered: 09/14/2007)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to re 77 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Pavitt filed by JAMES PAVITT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tiersky, Marcia) (Entered: 09/14/2007)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint by JAMES PAVITT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tiersky, Marcia) (Entered: 09/13/2007)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                  MOTION to Compel Defendant CIA to Accept Service of Process on Doe Defendants by (P) DOE (Krieger, Roy) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION for Taxation of Costs For Personal Service of Summons and Complaint by (P) DOE (Krieger, Roy) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Pavitt by (P) DOE (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Krieger, Roy) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JAMES PAVITT served on 7/31/2007, answer due 8/20/2007 (Krieger, Roy) (Entered: 08/08/2007)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address by Roy W. Krieger (Krieger, Roy) (Entered: 05/31/2007)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re 65 First MOTION for Reconsideration and to Vacate Court's Dismissal of Counts I, III & V filed by (P) DOE. (Krieger, Roy) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                              RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File filed by MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Email)(Tiersky, Marcia) (Entered: 03/29/2007)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Motion For Partial Judgment on the Pleadings by (P) DOE (Krieger, Roy) (Entered: 03/28/2007)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re 64 First MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by (P) DOE. (Krieger, Roy) (Entered: 03/27/2007)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Memorandum in opposition to re 65 First MOTION for Reconsideration and to Vacate Court's Dismissal of Counts I, III & V filed by MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Tiersky, Marcia) (Entered: 03/16/2007)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re 64 First MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Tiersky, Marcia) (Entered: 03/16/2007)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE Praecpie by (P) DOE (Krieger, Roy) (Entered: 03/16/2007)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTIFICATION OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by (P) DOE (Krieger, Roy) (Entered: 03/08/2007)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MOTION to Vacate Court's Dismissal of Counts I, III and V by (P) DOE. (Please see Document No. 64 for scanned image). (nmw, ) (Entered: 03/07/2007)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                              First MOTION for Reconsideration and to Vacate Court's Dismissal of Counts I, III & V by (P) DOE. (Krieger, Roy) (Entered: 03/06/2007)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                First MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by (P) DOE. (Krieger, Roy) (Entered: 03/06/2007)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Government Defendants' ANSWER to Amended Complaint by MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. Related document: 30 Amended Complaint filed by (P) DOE,.(Tiersky, Marcia) (Entered: 02/28/2007)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE regarding Service of Doe Defendants by JAMES PAVITT, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Tiersky, Marcia) (Entered: 02/26/2007)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re 46 MOTION for Limited Admission of Redacted Averments in Complaint filed by (P) DOE. (Krieger, Roy) (Entered: 02/21/2007)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE Rule 4(d) Request of Waiver of Summons by (P) DOE (Krieger, Roy) (Entered: 02/21/2007)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply In Support of Motion to Find Material Redacted From Complaint as Admitted by Defendants by (P) DOE. (Krieger, Roy) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 44 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff from Status Conference filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, PORTER GOSS. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/8/07. (ORDER UNSEALED 2/9/07 PURSUANT TO ORDER) (tth) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/9/2007 (tth, ). Modified on 2/9/2007 (tth, ). (Entered: 02/08/2007)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER: The Government shall file, no later than February 26, 2007, a praecipe informing the Court of its position regarding the process for notification and service of the two unserved Doe Defendants; Plaintiff's written discovery requests shall be due March 15, 2007 . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/9/07. (CS, ) (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Memorandum in opposition to re 46 MOTION for Limited Admission of Redacted Averments in Complaint filed by MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Tiersky, Marcia) (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Second Amended Complaint by MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Tiersky, Marcia) (Entered: 02/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in opposition to re 53 MOTION to Strike 51 Reply to opposition to Motion to Exclude Plaintiff From Status Conference filed by MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Tiersky, Marcia) (Entered: 02/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike 51 Reply to opposition to Motion to Exclude Plaintiff From Status Conference by (P) DOE. (Krieger, Roy) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Lodging by MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Tiersky, Marcia) (Entered: 02/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re 44 MOTION Exclude Plaintiff from Status Conference filed by MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Marilyn Dorn)(Tiersky, Marcia) (Entered: 02/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Defendants shall file their reply in support of their Motion to Exclude Plaintiff from the Status Conference on February 2, 2007; a Status Conference will be held in this case on February 9, 2007 at 10:30 a.m . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/29/07. (CS, ) (Entered: 01/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to re 47 MOTION to Reschedule Status Conference filed by (P) DOE. (Krieger, Roy) (Entered: 01/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 47 Defendants' Motion to Reschedule the Status Conference; the Status Conference set for January 31, 2007 is hereby cancelled; a new date will be set as soon as Plaintiff's Opposition is received . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/29/07. (CS, ) (Entered: 01/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Reschedule Status Conference by MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Tiersky, Marcia) (Entered: 01/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Limited Admission of Redacted Averments in Complaint by (P) DOE. (Krieger, Roy) (Entered: 01/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re 44 MOTION Exclude Plaintiff from Status Conference filed by (P) DOE. (Krieger, Roy) (Entered: 01/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION Exclude Plaintiff from Status Conference by PORTER GOSS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum# 2 Exhibit)(Tiersky, Marcia) (Entered: 01/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 43 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OPINION on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/12/07. (CS, ) (Entered: 01/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part and denying in part 31 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; a Status Conference is hereby set for January 31, 2007 at 10:15 a.m . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/12/07. (CS, ) (Entered: 01/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to opposition to motion re 31 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint filed by PORTER GOSS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Tiersky, Marcia) (Entered: 04/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by PORTER GOSS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Tiersky, Marcia) (Entered: 03/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion for Leave to File Response filed by PORTER GOSS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Tiersky, Marcia) (Entered: 03/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by (P) DOE. (Krieger, Roy) (Entered: 03/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re 31 Motion to Dismiss filed by (P) DOE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Krieger, Roy) (Entered: 03/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 34 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time; please note that this will be the last extension of time granted . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 2/14/06. (CS, ) (Entered: 02/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re 34 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time filed by PORTER GOSS, JAMES PAVITT, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Tiersky, Marcia) (Entered: 02/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by (P) DOE. (Krieger, Roy) (Entered: 02/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by (P) DOE. (Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 01/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying as moot 20 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint, and denying as moot 21 Plaintiff's Motion to Declassify Improperly Classified Portions of the Amended Complaint; the October 7, 2005 stay is hereby lifted and briefing of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint shall now proceed as provied by the Local Rules and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/20/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 12/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint by PORTER GOSS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Tiersky, Marcia) (Entered: 12/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                    SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against PORTER GOSS, JOHN DOES, JAMES PAVITT, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCYfiled by (P) DOE.(tg, ) (Entered: 11/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Stay re 20 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint, 21 MOTION Declassify Improperly Classified Portions of Amended Complaint and to Set Deadlines by (P) DOE, PORTER GOSS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Tiersky, Marcia) (Entered: 10/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to motion re 20 to dismiss filed by (P) DOE. (Krieger, Roy) (Entered: 10/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to oppose motion to dismiss by (P) DOE. (Krieger, Roy) (Entered: 09/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by (P) DOE. (Krieger, Roy) (Entered: 08/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT of telephone conference held on 5/13/05 before Judge Kessler. Court Reporter: Susan Page Tyner. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m., Monday through Friday. (rje, ) (Entered: 08/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/3/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Declassify by (P) DOE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 08/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in opposition to motion re 21 Declassification filed by PORTER GOSS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tiersky, Marcia) (Entered: 07/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION Declassify Improperly Classified Portions of Amended Complaint by (P) DOE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 07/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by PORTER GOSS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Tiersky, Marcia) (Entered: 07/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive Motions due by 7/1/2005. Opposition to Dispositive Motions due by 7/31/2005. Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2005. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/16/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 05/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 05/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to motion re 11 Plaintiff's Motion to Attend Scheduling Conference filed by PORTER GOSS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Tiersky, Marcia) (Entered: 05/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/3/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 05/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT against JOHN DOES, JAMES PAVITT, PORTER GOSS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCYfiled by (P) DOE.(nmw, ) (Entered: 04/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying as moot without prejudice 8 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, in light of Plaintiff's filing of an Amended Complaint; if necessary, Defendants may re-file a complete responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, but Defendants may not incorporate by reference their prior pleadings . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 4/29/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 04/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER that Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiff's Motion to Permit Him to Attend Scheduling Conference no later than May 6, 2005 . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 4/28/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 04/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing of Amended Complaint by (P) DOE (Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 04/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff by (P) DOE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 04/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and to Continue Scheduling Conference by (P) DOE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 03/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER setting an Initial Scheduling Conference for April 15, 2005 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 19 . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/24/05. (CS, ) (Entered: 03/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss by PORTER GOSS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Tiersky, Marcia) (Entered: 03/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by PORTER GOSS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Tiersky, Marcia) (Entered: 02/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by PORTER GOSS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Tiersky, Marcia) (Entered: 02/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by PORTER GOSS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Tiersky, Marcia) (Entered: 01/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Marcia N. Tiersky on behalf of PORTER GOSS, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Tiersky, Marcia) (Entered: 01/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, PORTER GOSS (Filing fee $ 150) filed by (P) DOE.(rje, ) (Entered: 12/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to File complaint and proceed under a pseudonym.. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/6/04. (rje, ) (Entered: 12/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File complaint and proceed under pseudony; "LET this be filed"(Fiat)Judge Hogan,Chief Judge. by (P) DOE. (rje, ) (Entered: 12/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 131 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?