BLUMAN v. FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-01766

Tags
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 11:37 PM ST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 02 U.S.C. § 437
Nature of Suit 441 - Civil Rights: Voting
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION granting 15 the defendant's motion to dismiss; denying 19 the plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh, Judge Ricardo M. Urbina, and Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 8/8/11. (lcrmu1)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: 3/28/2011 Reply to opposition to Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: 3/1/2011 Reply to opposition to Motion
      REPLY to opposition to motion re 15 MOTION to Dismiss and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION. (Noti, Adav) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: 3/1/2011 Memorandum in Opposition
        Memorandum in opposition to re 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Noti, Adav) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: 2/23/2011 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nicholas J. Nelson, :Firm- KING & SPALDING LLP, :Address- 1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Washington, DC 20006. Phone No. - (202) 737-0500. Fax No. - (202) 626-3737 by ILLINOIS COALITION FOR IMMIGRANT AND REFUGEE RIGHTS (znmw, ) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: 2/23/2011 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Erin E. Murphy, :Firm- KING & SPALDING LLP, :Address- 1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Washington, DC 20006. Phone No. - (202) 737-0500. Fax No. - (202) 626-3737 by ILLINOIS COALITION FOR IMMIGRANT AND REFUGEE RIGHTS (znmw, ) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: 2/23/2011 Motion for Leave to File
              MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by ILLINOIS COALITION FOR IMMIGRANT AND REFUGEE RIGHTS (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amicus Brief)(znmw, ) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: 2/23/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary D. Tripp on behalf of ILLINOIS COALITION FOR IMMIGRANT AND REFUGEE RIGHTS (znmw, ) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: 1/31/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER scheduling oral argument in this matter for 5/12/2011 at 9:30 A.M. in the Ceremonial Courtroom 20, Sixth Floor, Main Building, before Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh, Judge Ricardo M. Urbina and Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. Any amicus curiae briefs in support of the plaintiffs shall be filed by 2/18/2011. Any amicus curiae briefs in support of the defendant shall be filed by 3/18/2011. Signed by Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh, Judge Ricardo M. Urbina, and Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 1/28/2011. (tg, ) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: 1/24/2011 Meet and Confer Statement
                    MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Postman, Warren) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: 1/24/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 15 MOTION to Dismiss, 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION. Signed by Judge Brett M. Kavanugh, Judge Ricardo M. Urbina, and Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 1/24/2011. (tg, ) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 22 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: 1/21/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 15 MOTION to Dismiss, 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment and to Set Briefing Schedule by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Noti, Adav) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: 1/20/2011 Designation of Judges to serve on Three Judge PanelCourt Filing
                          USCA ORDER filed in USCA on January 19, 2011 FOR DESIGNATION OF JUDGES TO SERVE ON THREE-JUDGE DISTRICT COURT;designating Brett M. Kavanaugh and Judge Rosemary M. Collyer to hear and determine this case with Judge Ricardo M. Urbina. The U.S. Circuit Court Judge to preside over this case. (Signed by Chief Judge of DC Circuit, David B. Sentelle, (jeb, ) Modified on 1/20/2011 (jeb, ). (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: 1/18/2011 Memorandum in Opposition
                            Memorandum in opposition to re 15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by BENJAMIN BLUMAN, ASENATH STEIMAN. (Roth, Jacob) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: 1/18/2011 Motion for Summary Judgment
                              MOTION for Summary Judgment by BENJAMIN BLUMAN, ASENATH STEIMAN (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Benjamin Bluman, # 3 Declaration of Asenath Steiman)(Roth, Jacob) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part the plaintiffs' application for a three-judge court. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 1/7/11.(lcrmu1) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part 2 the plaintiffs' application for a three-judge court. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on 1/7/11.(lcrmu1) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: 12/28/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and to Set Partial Briefing Schedule by BENJAMIN BLUMAN, ASENATH STEIMAN (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Postman, Warren) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: 12/21/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                      MOTION to Dismiss by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Noti, Adav) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Reply to opposition to MotionCourt Filing
                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re 2 MOTION for Three-Judge Court filed by BENJAMIN BLUMAN, ASENATH STEIMAN. (Postman, Warren) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. Date of Service Upon U.S. Attorney 10/22/2010. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/21/2010. (Roth, Jacob) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 10/22/2010. (Roth, Jacob) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION served on 10/22/2010 (Roth, Jacob) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: 11/5/2010 Memorandum in OppositionCourt Filing
                                                Memorandum in opposition to re 2 MOTION for Three-Judge Court filed by FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hajjar, Steve) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: 11/5/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Steve Nicholas Hajjar on behalf of FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION (Hajjar, Steve) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: 11/5/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by David Brett Kolker on behalf of FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION (Kolker, David) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: 11/5/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Adav Noti on behalf of FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION (Noti, Adav) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: 11/5/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Deeley on behalf of FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION (Deeley, Kevin) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: 10/20/2010 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
                                                          ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. (Roth, Jacob) Modified on 10/21/2010 (znmw, ). (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: 10/20/2010 Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
                                                            ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 10/19/2010. (Roth, Jacob) Modified on 10/21/2010 (znmw, ). (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: 10/20/2010 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                              ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION served on 10/19/2010 (Roth, Jacob) Modified on 10/21/2010 (znmw, ). (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: 10/20/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                MOTION for Three-Judge Court by BENJAMIN BLUMAN, ASENATH STEIMAN. (jf, ) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: 10/20/2010 Complaint
                                                                  COMPLAINT against FEDERAL ELECTION COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616033470) filed by ASENATH STEIMAN, BENJAMIN BLUMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, ) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                    Space Space

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 35 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?