Unknown

Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-00209
District Judge John F. Grady, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge John F. Grady
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Lightspeed Media Corporation, Plaintiff

Represented by Jackson Lewis LLP

v.
No Logo DOE, Defendant
Attributes
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 501
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
Timeline
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: 2/10/2011 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lightspeed Media Corporation (Steele, John) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: 1/13/2011 mailed
MAILED request for copyright information letter to John Steele. (tlm) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: 1/12/2011 Certificate
CERTIFICATE of Disclosure (Steele, John) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: 1/12/2011 Attorney Appearance
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lightspeed Media Corporation by John Steele (Steele, John) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: 1/12/2011 Civil Cover Sheet
CIVIL Cover Sheet (Steele, John) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: 1/12/2011 Complaint
COMPLAINT filed by Lightspeed Media Corporation; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-5602276. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Steele, John) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 79 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?