USA v. Trinh et al
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cr-10048

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (273) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 771 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT as to Hung Van Le (5), Count(s) 1, 1s, 1ss, Disposed upon filing of superseding indictment; Count(s) 1sss, The defendant is sentenced to time served with no Supervised Release. No Fine. Special Assessment of $100 (Attachments: # 1 Transcript) (Smith, Bonnie)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: None
    MOTION for Reconsideration re 286 Memorandum Opinion, Terminate Motions as to Stephanie Hong Trinhby USA. (Hoffman, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/3/2009: # 1 Signed Motion for Reconsideration) (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 08/14/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
      Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM and ORDER: Trinh's motion to dismiss is DENIED (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 07/31/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: None
        RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Tai Trinh re 284 MOTION for Extension of Time to 8/17/09 and 2/2/10 to File File dispositive motions and continue trial (Hoffman, Richard) (Entered: 07/15/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: None
          MOTION for Extension of Time to 8/17/09 and 2/2/10 to File File dispositive motions and continue trial as to Tai Trinh. (Cooper, Howard) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
            Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING MOTION as to Anna Trinh 282 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release filed by Anna Trinh (Paine, Matthew) Motions referred to Leo T. Sorokin. (Entered: 07/01/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None
              MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release as to Anna Trinh. (Parker, E.) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING MOTION as to Tiem Trinh 280 Fourth MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release filed by Tiem Trinh (Paine, Matthew) Motions referred to Leo T. Sorokin. (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None
                  Fourth MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release as to Tiem Trinh. (George, Robert) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: None
                    AFFIDAVIT (FILED UNDER SEAL) (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 06/17/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: None
                      AFFIDAVIT (FILED UNDER SEAL) (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 06/17/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: None
                        Opposition (FILED UNDER SEAL) re 274 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, to Suppress. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - A, # 2 Exhibit B - Part 1, # 3 Exhibit B - Part 2)(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 06/17/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: None
                          MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal (FILED UNDER SEAL) as to Stephanie Hong Trinhby USA. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 06/17/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None
                            Ex Parte MOTION (FILED UNDER SEAL) as to Quang Chien Do. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                              MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, to suppress as to Stephanie Hong Trinh. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Shapiro, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/03/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None
                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Howard M. Cooper appearing for Tai Trinh (Cooper, Howard) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to 7/15/2009 to File File 12(b)(3)(B) Motions and continue any existing motion days by thirty days as to Tai Trinh. (Salvucci, Carla) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Carla A. Salvucci appearing for Tai Trinh (Salvucci, Carla) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ElectronicORDER entered. CJA 20 as to Tai Trinh: Appointment of Attorney Howard M. Cooper for Tai Trinh. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: None
                                        RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Tai Trinh re 267 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney And to Appoint New Counsel by Lenore Glaser. (Hoffman, Richard) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 268 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: None
                                          INFORMATION TO ESTABLISH PRIOR CONVICTION as to Tai Trinh (Hoffman, Richard) (Entered: 05/14/2009)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: None
                                            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney And to Appoint New Counsel by Lenore Glaser. as to Tai Trinh. (Glaser, Lenore) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: None
                                              Memorandum from Pretrial Services regarding Bail Violation as to Lam Hong Chau. Requested action: None (Brown, September) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of change of address or firm. Change of address for Bernard Grossberg as to Jeremy Katz (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                  Opposition by USA as to Hung Van Le re 261 MOTION for Reconsideration Detention Order (Hoffman, Richard) (Entered: 04/08/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION for Reconsideration Detention Order as to Hung Van Le. (Weinstein, Elliot) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 2/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION for Interim Compensation as to Tai Trinh. (Glaser, Lenore) (Entered: 02/11/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                        Assented to MOTION to Continue Sentencing as to Tan Dinh Phung, Quang Chien Do, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chaoby USA. (Hoffman, Richard) (Entered: 02/04/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File dispositive motions Assented by defense counsel and government as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh, Tai Trinh, Jeremy Katz, Stephanie Hong Trinhby Tai Trinh. (Glaser, Lenore) (Entered: 12/16/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING MOTION as to Jeremy Katz 256 MOTION to Vacate Motion Of Defendant Jeremy Katz To Vacate A Condition Of Release filed by Jeremy Katz (Paine, Matthew) Motions referred to Leo T. Sorokin. (Entered: 12/11/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION to Vacate A Condition Of Release as to Jeremy Katz. (Grossberg, Bernard) Modified on 12/15/2008 (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION to Continue to reschedule trial as to Hung Van Le. (Weinstein, Elliot) (Entered: 12/02/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. CJA 20 as to Jeremy Katz: Appointment of Attorney Bernard Grossberg for Jeremy Katz. Appointment as of 9/11/08. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 253 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    ATTORNEY ASSIGNMENT Request as to Jeremy Katz forwarded to Noreen Russo. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 11/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      Transcript Redaction Request in case as to Quoc Boa Trinh re 248 Transcript, 247 Transcript, filed by attorney Richard L. Hoffman. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING MOTION as to Quoc Boa Trinh 250 MOTION to Redact 248 Transcript, 247 Transcript,, filed by USA (Paine, Matthew) Motions referred to Robert B. Collings. (Entered: 11/12/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 11/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION to Redact 248 Transcript, 247 Transcript,, as to Quoc Boa Trinhby USA. (Hoffman, Richard) (Entered: 11/11/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding as to Quoc Boa Trinh has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              REDACTED Transcript of Detention Hearing - Day Two as to Quoc Boa Trinh held on February 23, 2007, before Judge Collings. Court Reporter Transcribed by Maryann Young at 508/384-2003. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 11/11/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/21/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2008: # 1 Redacted) (Scalfani, Deborah). Modified on 12/3/2008 (Scalfani, Deborah). (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                REDACTED Transcript of Detention Hearing - Day One as to Quoc Boa Trinh held on February 15, 2007, before Judge Collings. Court Reporter Transcribed by Maryann Young at 508/384-2003. The Transcript may be purchased through Maryann Young, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 11/11/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/21/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah) Modified on 10/24/2008 (Scalfani, Deborah). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2008: # 1 Redacted) (Scalfani, Deborah). Modified on 12/3/2008 (Scalfani, Deborah). (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING MOTION as to Jeremy Katz 245 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release to Temporarily Amend Conditions of Release filed by Jeremy Katz (Paine, Matthew) Motions referred to Leo T. Sorokin. (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release to Temporarily Amend Conditions of Release as to Jeremy Katz. (Grossberg, Bernard) Modified on 10/23/2008 to Update Docket Text As the Motion Was Filed Under the Incorrect Event in CM/ECF (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                      Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on June 4, 2008, as to Jeremy Katz. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 10/09/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT in Support by Hoang Pham re 242 MOTION for Funds for an Interpreter. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION for Funds for an Interpreter as to Hoang Pham. (Hayden, Edward) . (Entered: 10/02/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                            RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Anna Trinh (Parker, E.) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING MOTION as to Tiem Trinh 239 Third MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release filed by Tiem Trinh (Paine, Matthew) Motions referred to Leo T. Sorokin. (Entered: 09/22/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                Third MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release as to Tiem Trinh. (George, Robert) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/18/08 to File discovery letters Assented as to Tai Trinh. (Glaser, Lenore) (Entered: 09/18/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                    PLEA AGREEMENT (FILED UNDER SEAL) as to Tan Dinh Phung. Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 09/16/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MOTION to Seal (FILED UNDER SEAL) as to Tan Dinh Phungby USA. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Ex Parte MOTION to Appoint Counsel as to Jeremy Katz. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT as to Hoang Pham (3), Count(s) 1, Dismissed upon the filing of the superseding indictment; Count(s) 1s, Dismissed upon the filing of the second superseding indictment; Count(s) 1ss, The defendant is committed to the BOP for 18 months on count 1 of the second superseding indictment to be followed by a period of 3 years of Supervised Release with special conditions. No Fine. Special Assessment of $100. (Attachments: # 1 Transcript) (Smith, Bonnie) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE as to Hoang Pham. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Objection as to Rescheduled Trial Date of March 2, 2009 by Lam Hong Chau (Murray, Robert) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                PROPOSED ORDER(S) submitted by USA as to Hoang Pham (Hoffman, Richard) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Forfeiture of Property as to Hoang Phamby USA. (Hoffman, Richard) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Hoang Pham (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Det. Robert A. Fratalia)(Moran, Timothy) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to September 22, 2008 to File Objections to Probation Pre Sentence Report as to Wylun J. Chao. (Budreau, James) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION to Continue Sentencing to April 14, 2009 as to Quang Chien Do, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chaoby USA. (Hoffman, Richard) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER as to Tai Trinh, Jeremy Katz, Stephanie Hong Trinh (Smith, Bonnie) (Entered: 09/04/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            Judge William G. Young: ElectronicORDER entered. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Hung Van Le, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh, Tai Trinh, Jeremy Katz, Stephanie Hong Trinh Time excluded from 9/3/08 until 3/2/09. (Smith, Bonnie) Modified on 9/16/2008 (Paine, Matthew) (DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER ASSIGNED IN ERROR - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED TO ENTRY). (Entered: 09/04/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Hoang Pham (Hayden, Edward) (Entered: 08/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 222 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Hearing Motion Of Defendant Jeremy Katz For Status Hearing as to Jeremy Katz. (Grossberg, Bernard) (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. CJA 20 as to Tai Trinh: Appointment of Attorney Lenore Glaser for Tai Trinh. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 07/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to Tiem Trinh (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 07/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued as to Lam Hong Chau (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 07/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to Antwon Trinh (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 07/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to Anna Trinh (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 07/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Ex Parte MOTION (FILED UNDER SEAL) as to Tiem Trinh. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 07/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal (FILED UNDER SEAL) as to Tiem Trinh. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 07/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                Judge William G. Young: ElectronicORDER entered. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Stephanie Hong Trinh Time excluded from June 4, 2008 until November 3, 2008. (Paine, Matthew) Modified on 7/21/2008 (Paine, Matthew)(DOCUMENT NUMBER ASSIGNED IN ERROR, NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED TO ENTRY). (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 212 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document (Letter). (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Attorney Debra A. DelVecchio as to Tiem Trinh (DelVecchio, Debra) (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 7/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Robert A. George appearing for Tiem Trinh (George, Robert) (Entered: 07/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Excludable Delay from June 4, 2008 to November 3, 2008 as to Tai Trinh, Jeremy Katz, Stephanie Hong Trinhby USA. (Hoffman, Richard) (Entered: 07/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on June 4, 2008 as to Tai Trinh. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Seal as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hung Van Le, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh, Tai Trinh, Jeremy Katz, Stephanie Hong Trinhby USA. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 07/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Tai Trinh (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 06/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 204 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on June 4, 2008, as to Jeremy Katz. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 06/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on June 4, 2008, as to Stephanie Hong Trinh. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 06/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on June 4, 2008, as to Tai Trinh. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 06/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Unseal Document (Forfeiture Restraining Order) as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh, Tai Trinh, Jeremy Katz, Stephanie Hong Trinhby USA. (Hoffman, Richard) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        appearance Bond Entered as to Jeremy Katz in amount of $ 50,000 unsecured, (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Jeremy Katz (13) 50,000. unsecured bond as to Jeremy Katz. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. CJA 20 as to Stephanie Hong Trinh: Appointment of Attorney Jonathan Shapiro for Stephanie Hong Trinh. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              appearance Bond Entered as to Stephanie Hong Trinh in amount of $ 50,000, (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Stephanie Hong Trinh (14) 50,000. unsecured as to Stephanie Hong Trinh. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Unseal Second and Third Superseding Indictments as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hung Van Le, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh, Tai Trinh, Jeremy Katz, Stephanie Hong Trinhby USA. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 06/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Continue Hearing as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tiem Trinh, and Antwon Trinh. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. RESTRAINING ORDER as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh, Tai Trinh, Stephanie Hong Trinh. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 191 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh, Tai Trinh, and Stephanie Hong Trinh. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 190 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED MOTION as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh, Tai Trinh, and Stephanie Hong Trinhby USA. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Seal (FILED UNDER SEAL) as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh, Tai Trinh, and Stephanie Hong Trinhby USA. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal Document as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hung Van Le, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh, Tai Trinh, Jeremy Katz, Stephanie Hong Trinhby USA. (Smith3, Dianne) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                THIRD SUPERSEDING SEALED INDICTMENT as to Quoc Boa Trinh (1) count(s) 1sss, 2sss-3sss, 11sss, 19sss-20sss, 21sss-22sss, Tan Dinh Phung (2) count(s) 1sss, Hung Van Le (5) count(s) 1sss, Lam Hong Chau (8) count(s) 1sss, Tiem Trinh (9) count(s) 1sss, 11sss, 12sss-14sss, 15sss-17sss, 19sss-20sss, 21sss-22sss, 23sss, Anna Trinh (10) count(s) 1sss, 11sss, 18sss, Antwon Trinh (11) count(s) 1sss, Tai Trinh (12) count(s) 1s,4s, 5s-7s, 8s-10s, 11s, 17s, Jeremy Katz (13) count(s) 1s, Stephanie Hong Trinh (14) count(s) 11, 12-14, 15-16, 18. (Attachments: # 1 js45's)(Smith3, Dianne) Modified on 5/12/2008 (Catino3, Theresa) to edit counts. (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Margaret E. Fox appearing for Antwon Trinh (Fox, Margaret) (Entered: 04/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition by USA as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tiem Trinh, Antwon Trinh re 176 MOTION to Suppress (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Application and Affidavit for Search Warrant, # 2 Exhibit Search Warrant as Returned, # 3 Exhibit Photo 1Electrical Wiring, # 4 Exhibit photo 2 Electrical Outlets, # 5 Exhibit photo 3 grow-lights, # 6 Exhibit photo 4 Grow-light Hoods, # 7 Exhibit photo 5 Bloom Boosters, # 8 Exhibit photo 6 Seed Starters, # 9 Exhibit photo 7 Buckets and Pots, # 10 Exhibit photo 8 Dirty Cups, # 11 Exhibit photo 9 Buckets with mj, # 12 Exhibit photo 10 Bucket with mj close-up 1, # 13 Exhibit photo 11 Bucket with mj close-up 2, # 14 Exhibit photo 12 MJ)(Hoffman, Richard) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Reconsideration detention as to Hung Van Le. (Weinstein, Elliot) (Entered: 04/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Second Ex Parte MOTION (FILED UNDER SEAL) as to Anna Trinh. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 04/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          First Ex Parte MOTION (FILED UNDER SEAL) as to Anna Trinh. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 04/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge William G. Young: ElectronicORDER entered. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hung Van Le, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh Time excluded from 4/7/08 until 11/3/08. (Smith, Bonnie) (Entered: 04/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by Quoc Boa Trinh, USA, Tan Dinh Phung, Hung Van Le, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hung Van Le, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh (Moran, Timothy) (Entered: 04/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Assented to MOTION to Continue Sentencing as to Quang Chien Do, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chaoby USA. (Hoffman, Richard) (Entered: 04/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MEMORANDUM in Support by Antwon Trinh as to Tiem Trinh, Antwon Trinh re 176 MOTION to Suppress (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Salsberg, John) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Suppress as to Tiem Trinh, Antwon Trinhby Antwon Trinh. (Salsberg, John) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions as to Antwon Trinh. (Salsberg, John) (Entered: 03/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 31, 2008 to File Substantive Motions as to Tiem Trinh. (DelVecchio, Debra) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re sentencing hearing as to Hoang Pham Sentencing set for 9/9/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Smith, Bonnie) (Entered: 03/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION Regarding Upcoming Change of Plea Hearing as to Hoang Phamby USA. (Moran, Timothy) (Entered: 03/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to March 27, 2008 to File Response/Reply as to Tan Dinh Phung. (Rosenthal, Peter) (Entered: 03/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Bail Hearing as to Hung Van Le held on July 11, 2007 before Judge Sorokin. Digital Recording: Transcribed by Maryann Young. The original transcripts are maintained by the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting Maryann Young at 508/384-2003 at or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 03/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions as to Antwon Trinh. (Salsberg, John) (Entered: 02/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to 3/13/08 to File Substantive Motions as to Tiem Trinh. (DelVecchio, Debra) (Entered: 02/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Interim Compensation as to Tiem Trinh. (DelVecchio, Debra) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re sentencing hearing as to Quang Chien Do, Wylun J. Chao Sentencing set for 5/13/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Smith, Bonnie) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Wylun J. Chao (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin Reason for referral: pretrial proceedings as to Wylun J. Chao (Diskes, Sheila) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPERSEDING INFORMATION (Felony) as to Wylun J. Chao (7) count(s) 1ss, 2ss. (Attachments: # 1 JS45)(Diskes, Sheila) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal (FILED UNDER SEAL) as to Quang Chien Doby USA. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Seal (FILED UNDER SEAL)as to Wylun J. Chaoby USA. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin Reason for referral: for bail and arraignment only as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Hung Van Le, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh, Tai Trinh, Jeremy Katz (Catino3, Theresa) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SECOND SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to Quoc Boa Trinh (1) count(s) 1ss, 2ss, 3ss, Tan Dinh Phung (2) count(s) 1ss, Hoang Pham (3) count(s) 1ss, Hung Van Le (5) count(s) 1ss, Lam Hong Chau (8) count(s) 1ss, Tiem Trinh (9) count(s) 1ss, Anna Trinh (10) count(s) 1ss, Antwon Trinh (11) count(s) 1ss, Tai Trinh (12) count(s) 1, Jeremy Katz (13) count(s) 1. (Attachments: # 1 js45's)(Catino3, Theresa) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Seal as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Hung Van Le, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh, Tai Trinh, Jeremy Katzby USA. (Catino3, Theresa) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Interim Compensation as to Lam Hong Chau. (Murray, Robert) (Entered: 02/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Ex Parte MOTION (FILED UNDER SEAL) as to Tiem Trinh. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 01/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal (FILED UNDER SEAL) as to Tiem Trinh. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 01/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Peter H. Rosenthal appearing for Tan Dinh Phung (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 01/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING MOTION as to Wylun J. Chao 152 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release for January 26 and 27 2008 filed by Wylun J. Chao (Paine, Matthew) Motions referred to Leo T. Sorokin. (Entered: 01/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release for January 26 and 27 2008 as to Wylun J. Chao. (Budreau, James) (Entered: 01/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re sentencing hearing as to Vinh Dung Diep Sentencing set for 4/16/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Smith, Bonnie) (Entered: 01/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPERSEDING INFORMATION (Felony) as to Vinh Dung Diep (6) count(s) 1ss. (Attachments: # 1 js45)(Diskes, Sheila) (Entered: 01/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Vinh Dung Diep (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to Hoang Pham for 1/24/08 cert # 1141 on 1/16/08 (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 147 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Document (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal (FILED UNDER SEAL) as to Vinh Dung Diepby USA. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons Issued as to Wylun J. Chao for 1/24/08 cert # 1158 (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 01/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to Lam Hong Chau for 1/24/08 cert # 1165 (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 01/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued as to Tiem Trinh for 1/24/08 cert # 1172 (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 01/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to Anna Trinh for 1/24/08 cert # 1189 (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 01/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to Antwon Trinh for 1/24/08 cert # 1196 (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 01/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Peter Elikann. as to Tan Dinh Phung. (Elikann, Peter) (Entered: 01/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED ORDER(S) submitted by Quang Chien Do (Fine, Kevin) (Entered: 01/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Second MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release as to Quang Chien Do. (Fine, Kevin) (Entered: 01/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING MOTION as to Wylun J. Chao 136 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release For Christmas Eve and Day filed by Wylun J. Chao (Paine, Matthew) Motions referred to Leo T. Sorokin. (Entered: 12/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release For Christmas Eve and Day as to Wylun J. Chao. (Budreau, James) (Entered: 12/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin Reason for referral: FOR BAIL AND ARRAIGNMENT ONLY as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh (Catino2, Theresa) ...Modified on 12/14/2007 (Catino3, Theresa)...to edit filing date of referral... (Entered: 12/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        INDICTMENT as to Quoc Boa Trinh (1) count(s) 1s, Tan Dinh Phung (2) count(s) 1s, Hoang Pham (3) count(s) 1s, Quang Chien Do (4) count(s) 1s, Hung Van Le (5) count(s) 1s, Vinh Dung Diep (6) count(s) 1s, Wylun J. Chao (7) count(s) 1s, Lam Hong Chau (8) count(s) 1s, Tiem Trinh (9) count(s) 1s, Anna Trinh (10) count(s) 1s, Antwon Trinh (11) count(s) 1s. (Attachments: # 1 js45's)(Catino2, Theresa) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition by USA as to Tan Dinh Phung re 130 MOTION Motion to Reconsider Detention Order (Hoffman, Richard) (Entered: 12/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING MOTION as to Quang Chien Do 131 First MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release filed by Quang Chien Do. (Paine, Matthew) Motions referred to Leo T. Sorokin. (Entered: 12/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              First MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release as to Quang Chien Do. (Fine, Kevin) (Entered: 12/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION Motion to Reconsider Detention Order as to Tan Dinh Phung. (Elikann, Peter) (Entered: 11/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING MOTION as to Wylun J. Chao 128 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release to attend Thanksgiving Dinner filed by Wylun J. Chao (Paine, Matthew) Motions referred to Leo T. Sorokin. (Entered: 11/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release to attend Thanksgiving Dinner as to Wylun J. Chao. (Budreau, James) (Entered: 11/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Richard L. Hoffman appearing for USA. (Hoffman, Richard) (Entered: 11/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING MOTION as to Wylun J. Chao 124 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release For November 1, 2007 filed by Wylun J. Chao (Paine, Matthew) Motions referred to Leo T. Sorokin. (Entered: 10/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Counsel by Wylun J. Chao 124 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release For November 1, 2007 filed by Wylun J. Chao (Budreau, James) (Entered: 10/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release For November 1, 2007 as to Wylun J. Chao. (Budreau, James) (Entered: 10/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. ORDER to maintain custody of certain property pending conclusion of criminal forfeiture proceedings in this case as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 10/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                EX PARTE MOTION, as to Tiem Trinh. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 10/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Seal (FILED UNDER SEAL), as to Tiem Trinh. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 10/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Forfeiture of Property United States' Second Application and Proposed Order to Maintain Property in Custody for Criminal Forfeiture as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinhby USA. (Hoffman, Richard) (Entered: 10/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE United States' Second Forfeiture Bill of Particulars by USA as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh (Hoffman, Richard) (Entered: 10/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defense Counsel's Letter (non-motion) regarding Missing Discovery Items as to Tiem Trinh to AUSA (DelVecchio, Debra) (Entered: 10/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING MOTION as to Tiem Trinh 116 Assented to MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release filed by Tiem Trinh. (Paine, Matthew) Motions referred to Leo T. Sorokin. (Entered: 10/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release as to Tiem Trinh. (DelVecchio, Debra) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING MOTION as to Tiem Trinh 113 Assented to MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release filed by Tiem Trinh (Paine, Matthew) Motions referred to Leo T. Sorokin. (Entered: 09/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on March 19, 2007, as to Quang Chien Do. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Assented to MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release as to Tiem Trinh. (DelVecchio, Debra) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING MOTION as to Wylun J. Chao 111 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release (unapposed) for September 5 filed by Wylun J. Chao. (Paine, Matthew) Motions referred to Leo T. Sorokin. (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release (unapposed) for September 5 as to Wylun J. Chao. (Budreau, James) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition by USA as to Hung Van Le re 108 MOTION for Reconsideration Second Memorandum and Order of Detention (Moran, Timothy) (Entered: 08/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Timothy E. Moran appearing for USA. (Moran, Timothy) (Entered: 07/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Reconsideration Second Memorandum and Order of Detention as to Hung Van Le. (Weinstein, Elliot) (Entered: 07/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBIT/WITNESS LIST for 7/11/07 detention hearing as to Hung Van Le (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 07/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : SECOND MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF DETENTION; In accordance with the foregoing memorandum, IT IS ORDERED: 1. That Hung Van Le be committed to the custody of the Attorney General or his designated representative, for confinement in a corrections facility separate, to the extent practicable, from persons awaiting or serving sentences or being held in custody pending appeal; 2. That Hung Van Le be afforded a reasonable opportunity for private consultation with counsel; and 3. That on order of a court of the United States or on request by an attorney for the Government, the person in charge of the corrections facility in which Hung Van Le is detained and confined shall deliver Hung Van Le to an authorized Deputy United States Marshal for the purpose of any appearance in connection with a court proceeding. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 07/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release as to Hung Van Le. (Weinstein, Elliot) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2007 (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 07/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EX Parte MOTION as to Hoang Pham. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support)(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 06/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING MOTION as to Wylun J. Chao 101 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release For Surgery on June 28th filed by Wylun J. Chao (Paine, Matthew) Motions referred to Leo T. Sorokin. (Entered: 06/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPENDIX/EXHIBIT by Wylun J. Chao 101 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release For Surgery on June 28th filed by Wylun J. Chao (Budreau, James) (Entered: 06/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release For Surgery on June 28th as to Wylun J. Chao. (Budreau, James) (Entered: 06/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING MOTION as to Hoang Pham 97 MOTION terms of release filed by Hoang Pham. (Paine, Matthew) Motions referred to Leo T. Sorokin. (Entered: 06/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : Copy of ORDER Setting Conditions of Release issued by the USDC in the Dist of NY as to Hoang Pham ;The Court adopted these conditions in open court as an order in this district and are in full force and effect. They can also be found attached to the rule 5 documents (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 06/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; On May 4, 2007, defendant filed a Motion to Reconsider Detention Order (Docket #85). On May 16, 2007, the Court held a hearing on the Motion. Unfortunately, at this point, the record is incomplete through no fault of the parties. Defense counsel indicated that he would be away for a substantial period of time, accordingly, the Court is not now scheduling a hearing date. The Court will schedule the further hearing upon defense counsels request. The Motion remains under advisement (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 06/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION terms of release as to Hoang Pham. (Hayden, Edward) (Entered: 06/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. ORDER Authorizing the United States and Its Agencies to Maintain Custody of Certain Property Pending the Conclusion of Criminal Forfeiture Proceedings as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 06/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Forfeiture of Property United States' Application and Proposed Order to Maintain Property in Custody for Criminal Forfeiture as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinhby USA. (Hoffman, Richard) (Entered: 06/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE United States' First Forfeiture Bill of Particulars by USA as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh (Hoffman, Richard) (Entered: 06/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : CJA 20 as to Hoang Pham: Appointment of Attorney Edward L. Hayden for Hoang Pham. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 06/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            INFORMATION TO ESTABLISH PRIOR CONVICTION as to Hung Van Le (Herbert, James) (Entered: 05/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition by USA as to Hung Van Le re 85 MOTION for Reconsideration of Detention Order (Herbert, James) (Entered: 05/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING MOTION as to Wylun J. Chao 88 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release For Mother's Day filed by Wylun J. Chao, (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 05/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release For Mother's Day as to Wylun J. Chao. (Budreau, James) (Entered: 05/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Hoang Pham. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 05/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING MOTION as to Hung Van Le re: 85 MOTION for Reconsideration of Detention Order filed by Hung Van Le. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 05/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Reconsideration of Detention Order as to Hung Van Le. (Weinstein, Elliot) (Entered: 05/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Peter T. Elikann appearing for Tan Dinh Phung (Elikann, Peter) (Entered: 05/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Albert F. Cullen, Jr.. as to Quoc Boa Trinh. (Cullen, Albert) (Entered: 05/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: James H. Budreau appearing for Wylun J. Chao (Budreau, James) (Entered: 05/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 81 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document (Letter) re 80 Motion to Seal. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 04/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Seal attached Letter, as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinhby USA. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 04/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Elliot M. Weinstein appearing for Hung Van Le (Weinstein, Elliot) (Entered: 04/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE USMS Process Receipt and Return for Restraining Order (Zahzouhi - Pet Store owner) by Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh (Barclay, Kristina) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE USMS Process Receipt and Return for Restraining Order (Allen Leavens) by Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh (Barclay, Kristina) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE USMS Process Receipt and Return for Restraining Order (S. Elliott/T. Bauersfeld-tenants) by Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh (Barclay, Kristina) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE USMS Process Receipt and Return for Restraining Order (Edward Ciszek, Jr. "Junk Store" owner) by Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh (Barclay, Kristina) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE United States Marshals Service Process Receipt and Return for Restraining Order (427 Elmwood Ave, Buffalo, NY) by Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh (Barclay, Kristina) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Charles A. Clifford appearing for Quoc Boa Trinh. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 04/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EX PARTE MOTION (FILED UNDER SEAL) as to Hung Van Le. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 04/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge William G. Young : Electronic ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING MOTION as to Wylun J. Chao 69 Assented to MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release filed by Wylun J. Chao. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh, ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh Time excluded from 4/4/07 until 9/1/08. Jury Trial set for 5/5/2008 09:00 AM before Judge William G. Young. Pretrial Conference set for 4/7/2008 02:00 PM before Judge William G. Young. (Smith, Bonnie) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release as to Wylun J. Chao. (Fried, Syrie) (Entered: 04/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition by USA as to Antwon Trinh re 63 MOTION for Preparation of Pre-Plea Presentence Report (Herbert, James) (Entered: 04/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            appearance and compliance Bond Entered as to Quang Chien Do in amount of $ 100,000, (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 03/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Quang Chien Do (4) 100,000 unsecured bond as to Quang Chien Do. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 03/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh Scheduling Conference set for 4/4/2007 02:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Smith, Bonnie) (Entered: 03/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION Lift Travel Restriction as to Wylun J. Chao. (Fried, Syrie) (Entered: 03/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Preparation of Pre-Plea Presentence Report as to Antwon Trinh. (Salsberg, John) (Entered: 03/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EX PARTE MOTION as to Antwon Trinh. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 03/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings : ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF DETENTION PURSUANT TO 18 U.S.C. s. 3142(e) as to Quoc Boa Trinh (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 03/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Unseal Document as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinhby USA. (Hoffman, Richard) (Entered: 03/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Employment Status by Wylun J. Chao (Fried, Syrie) (Entered: 03/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Updated EXHIBIT List as to Detention Hearing(s) held before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings as to Quoc Boa Trinh (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 02/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Initial Automatic Discovery as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinhby USA. (Herbert, James) (Entered: 02/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Leslie Feldman-Rumpler appearing for Quang Chien Do Notice of Appearance of Kevin Fine as lead counsel (Feldman-Rumpler, Leslie) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin Fine Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1421403. as to Quang Chien Do. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Feldman-Rumpler, Leslie) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Leslie Feldman-Rumpler appearing for Quang Chien Do as local counsel (Feldman-Rumpler, Leslie) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : ORDER entered. CJA 20 as to Hung Van Le: Appointment of Attorney George F. Gormley for Hung Van Le. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RECORDED MORTGAGE as to Lam Hong Chau (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Agreement to Forfeit Property as to Lam Hong Chau located at 7 Everdeen Street, Dorchester (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              appearance and compliance Bond Entered as to Lam Hong Chau in amount of $ 100,000, (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Lam Hong Chau; 100,000 secured bond (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBIT/WITNESS LIST as to Tan Dinh Phung (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RECORDED MORTGAGE as to Wylun J. Chao (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Agreement to Forfeit Property as to Wylun J. Chao located at 46 Draper Street, (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Appearance and Compliance Bond Entered as to Wylun J. Chao in amount of $ 100,000., (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Wylun J. Chao (7) 100,000. as to Wylun J. Chao. (Simeone, Maria) Modified on 2/16/2007 (Simeone, Maria). Modified on 2/16/2007 (Simeone, Maria). (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBIT List as to Detention Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings as to Quoc Boa Trinh. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : ORDER entered. CJA 20 as to Tiem Trinh: Appointment of Attorney Debra A. DelVecchio for Tiem Trinh. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Michael Andrews. as to Quoc Boa Trinh. (Andrews, Michael) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : ORDER entered. CJA 20 as to Antwon Trinh: Appointment of Attorney John Salsberg for Antwon Trinh. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : ORDER entered. CJA 20 as to Quoc Boa Trinh: Appointment of Attorney Albert F. Cullen, Jr for Quoc Boa Trinh. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : ORDER entered. CJA 20 as to Quoc Boa Trinh: Appointment of Attorney Michael C. Andrews for Quoc Boa Trinh. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : ORDER OF DETENTION as to Tan Dinh Phung (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          appearance Bond Entered as to Vinh Dung Diep (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Vinh Dung Diep. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              appearance Bond Entered as to Tiem Trinh in amount of $ 25,000, (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : Electronic ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Tiem Trinh (9) (Simeone, Maria) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/15/2007 (Simeone, Maria). (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  appearance Bond Entered as to Antwon Trinh (Simeone, Maria) Modified on 2/15/2007 (Simeone, Maria). (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin : ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Antwon Trinh (11) 25,000 as to Antwon Trinh. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED ORDER(S) submitted by Wylun J. Chao (Fried, Syrie) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on February 2, 2007, as to Anna Trinh. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on February 2, 2007, as to Wylun J. Chao. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on February 2, 2007, as to Antwon Trinh. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on February 2, 2007, as to Tan Dinh Phung. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on February 2, 2007, as to Lam Hong Chau. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on February 2, 2007, as to Hung Van Le. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on February 2, 2007, as to Vinh Dung Diep. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on February 2, 2007, as to Tiem Trinh. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBIT/WITNESS LIST as to Hung Van Le, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau 2/6/07 detention hearing (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Quang Chien Do. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Magistrate Judge Joyce London Alexander : ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Anna Trinh. (Lovett, Jarrett) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 11 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED MOTION as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinhby USA. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 10 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 9 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED MOTION as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinhby USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinhby USA. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unsecured Bond Entered as to Anna Trinh in amount of $ 25,000. (Lovett, Jarrett) (Entered: 02/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Magistrate Judge Joyce London Alexander : ORDER entered. CJA 20 as to Anna Trinh: Appointment of Attorney E. Peter Parker for Anna Trinh provisionally. (Lovett, Jarrett) (Entered: 02/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Magistrate Judge Joyce London Alexander : ORDER entered. CJA 20 as to Lam Hong Chau: Appointment of Attorney Robert Y. Murray for Lam Hong Chau provisionally. (Lovett, Jarrett) (Entered: 02/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Unseal Case as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinhby USA. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 02/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge William G. Young : ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin Reason for referral: for bail and arraignment only as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinh (Catino3, Theresa) (Entered: 02/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal Case as to Quoc Boa Trinh, Tan Dinh Phung, Hoang Pham, Quang Chien Do, Hung Van Le, Vinh Dung Diep, Wylun J. Chao, Lam Hong Chau, Tiem Trinh, Anna Trinh, Antwon Trinhby USA. (Catino3, Theresa) (Entered: 02/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED INDICTMENT as to Quoc Boa Trinh (1) count(s) 1, Tan Dinh Phung (2) count(s) 1, Hoang Pham (3) count(s) 1, Quang Chien Do (4) count(s) 1, Hung Van Le (5) count(s) 1, Vinh Dung Diep (6) count(s) 1, Wylun J. Chao (7) count(s) 1, Lam Hong Chau (8) count(s) 1, Tiem Trinh (9) count(s) 1, Anna Trinh (10) count(s) 1, Antwon Trinh (11) count(s) 1. (Attachments: # 1 js45) (Catino3, Theresa) (Entered: 02/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 26 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?