Jenzabar, Inc. v. Campus Management Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-11117
District Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 5, 2019 at 11:25 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jenzabar Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/08/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel K. Hampton +1 617 305 2041 +5236 523 523 6850
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward J. Naughton +1 617 856 8567 +61728078 617 728 0783
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth A. Ritvo +1 617 330 9000

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown Rudnick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Monica R. Cafaro +1 617 856 8200 mcafaro@brownrudnick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenzabar

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/20/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jamison J. Barr +61781222 617 781 2225 jamison.barr@jenzabar.net
No Logo Campus Management Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven M. Cowley, Patrick J. Concannon +1 617 239 0100 scowley@eapdlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua William Gardner +1 617 239 0100 +1 888 325 9417 jgardner@edwardswildman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patricia M. Mullen +1 617 239 0100 +1 617 316 8294 pmullen@eapdlaw.com
No Logo Jenzabar Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/08/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel K. Hampton +1 617 305 2041 +5236 523 523 6850
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward J. Naughton +1 617 856 8567 +61728078 617 728 0783
v.
No Logo Campus Management Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven M. Cowley, Patrick J. Concannon +1 617 239 0100 scowley@eapdlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua William Gardner +1 617 239 0100 +1 888 325 9417 jgardner@edwardswildman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patricia M. Mullen +1 617 239 0100 +1 617 316 8294 pmullen@eapdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/30/2009, PRO HAC VICE Judith L. Grubner +1 312 222 0800 +1 312 222 0818 jlgrubner@michaelbest.com
No Logo Campus Management Corporation, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven M. Cowley, Patrick J. Concannon +1 617 239 0100 scowley@eapdlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua William Gardner +1 617 239 0100 +1 888 325 9417 jgardner@edwardswildman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patricia M. Mullen +1 617 239 0100 +1 617 316 8294 pmullen@eapdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/30/2009, PRO HAC VICE Judith L. Grubner +1 312 222 0800 +1 312 222 0818 jlgrubner@michaelbest.com
No Logo Jenzabar Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/08/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel K. Hampton +1 617 305 2041 +5236 523 523 6850
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward J. Naughton +1 617 856 8567 +61728078 617 728 0783
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1051
Nature of Suit 840 - Property Rights: Trademark
  Entries (71) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by Jenzabar, Inc.. (Cafaro, Monica) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to July 23, 2010 to for the deadline in the Court's dismissal nisi order by Campus Management Corporation.(Gardner, Joshua) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
      Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL (Nicewicz, Craig) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None
        Joint MOTION for Discovery Joint Motion Requesting Scheduling Conference by Jenzabar, Inc..(Cafaro, Monica) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
          MOTION for Discovery -- Motion Requesting Scheduling Conference by Campus Management Corporation.(Gardner, Joshua) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: None
            STATUS REPORT of Plaintiff Jenzabar Concerning Schedule for Remainder of Case by Jenzabar, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Naughton, Edward) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: None
              NOTICE by Campus Management Corporation -- Report Concerning Schedule for Remainder of Case (Gardner, Joshua) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                Third Joint Report Concerning Mediation and Request for Further Stay (Cafaro, Monica) Modified text on 3/17/2010 (Duong, Diep). (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None
                  NOTICE by Jenzabar, Inc. Second Joint Report Concerning Mediation and Request for Further Stay (Cafaro, Monica) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
                    NOTICE by Campus Management Corporation Joint Report Concerning Mediation And Request for Further Stay (Gardner, Joshua) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None
                      Joint MOTION to Stay by Campus Management Corporation.(Mullen, Patricia) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: None
                        MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by Jenzabar, Inc..(Cafaro, Monica) (Entered: 10/23/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
                          Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Supplemental Memorandum by Jenzabar, Inc..(Cafaro, Monica) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Sealed Legal Document 58 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: None
                            Sealed AFFIDAVIT of Joshua W. Gardner (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Duong, Diep) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Sealed Legal Document 57 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: None
                              Sealed SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Support 35 Motion to Compel by Campus Management Corporation. (Duong, Diep) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Sealed Legal Document 56 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None
                                Sealed AFFIDAVIT of Joshua W. Gardner in support 35 Motion to compel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Duong, Diep) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Sealed Legal Document 55 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None
                                  Sealed Supplemental Memorandum in Support 35 Motion to compel (Duong, Diep) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Sealed Legal Document 54 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None
                                    Sealed Motion for leave to file Supplemental Memorandum in support 35 Motion to compel (Duong, Diep) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None
                                      Assented to MOTION to Seal by Campus Management Corporation. (Duong, Diep) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None
                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Take Depositions by Jenzabar, Inc..(Cafaro, Monica) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER "Pending before the Court are the Defendant's motion for sanctions (Docket No. 45 ) and Plaintiffs motion to extend discovery (Docket No. 47 ), both of which are opposed. Upon consideration, the Plaintiff's motion to extend discovery is ALLOWED and Defendant's motion for sanctions is DENIED. All discovery, including depositions of the individuals identified in Defendant's motion for sanctions, shall be completed on or before Friday, September 18, 2009...." See Order for details (Duong, Diep) (Entered: 08/20/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: None
                                            Opposition re 47 MOTION for Extension of Time to 08/31/09 to Complete Discovery filed by Campus Management Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Mullen, Patricia) (Entered: 08/12/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: None
                                              Opposition re 45 MOTION for Sanctions for Repeated Failures to Appear at Noticed Depositions filed by Jenzabar, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Monica Rose Cafaro, # 2 Declaration of Edward J. Naughton, # 3 Declaration of Sam Burgio, # 4 Declaration of Lawrence R. Kulig)(Cafaro, Monica) (Entered: 08/11/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 47 MOTION for Extension of Time to 08/31/09 to Complete Discovery filed by Jenzabar, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A , # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C t, # 4 Exhibit D , # 5 Exhibit E , # 6 Exhibit F )(Cafaro, Monica) Modified on 7/30/2009 (Duong, Diep). (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to 08/31/09 to Complete Discovery by Jenzabar, Inc..(Cafaro, Monica) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 45 MOTION for Sanctions for Repeated Failures to Appear at Noticed Depositions filed by Campus Management Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21)(Mullen, Patricia) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/29/2009: # 22 Corrected Memo, # 23 Corrected Exhibit 14) (Duong, Diep). (Entered: 07/27/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: None Motion for Sanctions
                                                      MOTION for Sanctions for Repeated Failures to Appear at Noticed Depositions by Campus Management Corporation.(Mullen, Patricia) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/29/2009: # 1 Corrected motion) (Duong, Diep). (Entered: 07/27/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Jamison J. Barr (Barr, Jamison) (Entered: 07/20/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Harold W. Potter, Jr of Daniel K. Hampton and Elizabeth R. Burkhard (Potter, Harold) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered re 28 . PROTECTIVE ORDER. Subject, specifically, to the provisions of Local Rule 7.2. (Duong, Diep) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                              REPLY to Response to 35 MOTION to Compel (leave to file granted on 6/25/09) filed by Campus Management Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Gardner, Joshua) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 30 Days to Complete Discovery by Jenzabar, Inc..(Cafaro, Monica) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A. Ritvo on behalf of Jenzabar, Inc. (Ritvo, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/22/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by Campus Management Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Reply Memorandum))(Mullen, Patricia) (Entered: 06/10/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      Opposition re 35 MOTION to Compel filed by Jenzabar, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Cafaro, Monica) (Entered: 06/03/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 35 MOTION to Compel filed by Campus Management Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Gardner, Joshua) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                          MOTION to Compel by Campus Management Corporation.(Gardner, Joshua) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua W. Gardner on behalf of Campus Management Corporation (Gardner, Joshua) (Entered: 05/19/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                              Answer Response by Campus Management Corporation to 31 Amended Document First Amended Counterclaims. (Mullen, Patricia) (Entered: 05/08/2009)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Judith Grubner for Defendant Campus Management Corporation. (Grubner, Judith) . Modified on 5/4/2009 to correct event. (Entered: 04/30/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                  First AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS by Jenzabar, Inc. (Cafaro, Monica) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION to Withdraw 14 MOTION to Strike 10 Answer to Counterclaim, by Campus Management Corporation.(Mullen, Patricia) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 60 days to Complete Discovery by Jenzabar, Inc..(Cafaro, Monica) (Entered: 04/15/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                        Proposed Stipulated for Protective Order by Jenzabar, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Cafaro, Monica) Modified on 3/31/2009 to correct event (Duong, Diep). (Entered: 03/30/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                          REPLY to Response to 14 MOTION to Strike 10 Answer to Counterclaim, Leave to File Granted on March 13, 2009 filed by Campus Management Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Mullen, Patricia) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Monica R. Cafaro on behalf of Jenzabar, Inc. (Cafaro, Monica) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance of Jamison Barr on behalf of Jenzabar, Inc. (Naughton, Edward) Modified on 1/28/2009: Clerk added atty and notified atty to use his own login in the future (Duong, Diep). (Entered: 01/27/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                Opposition re 23 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum In Support of Its Motion to Strike filed by Jenzabar, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Naughton, Edward) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by Campus Management Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1Reply Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit A)(Mullen, Patricia) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Opposition re 14 MOTION to Strike 10 Answer to Counterclaim, filed by Jenzabar, Inc.. (Naughton, Edward) (Entered: 10/28/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/29/08 to File Response/Reply as to 14 MOTION to Strike 10 Answer to Counterclaim, by Jenzabar, Inc..(Naughton, Edward) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                        CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Campus Management Corporation.(Mullen, Patricia) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Stating that Initital Disclosures were made on October 17, 2008 Letter/request (non-motion) from Edward Naughton. (Naughton, Edward) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION CONFERENCE UNDER RULE 16.1(D)(3). (Naughton, Edward) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 24, 2008 to File Response/Reply as to 14 MOTION to Strike 10 Answer to Counterclaim, by Jenzabar, Inc..(Naughton, Edward) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Mullen, Patricia) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 14 MOTION to Strike 10 Answer to Counterclaim, filed by Campus Management Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Mullen, Patricia) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike 10 Answer to Counterclaim, by Campus Management Corporation.(Mullen, Patricia) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      STIPULATION re 10 Answer to Counterclaim, by Campus Management Corporation. (Mullen, Patricia) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia M. Mullen on behalf of Campus Management Corporation (Mullen, Patricia) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 10/21/2008 02:30 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Nicewicz, Craig) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Jenzabar's ANSWER to 5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, COUNTERCLAIM against Campus Management Corporation by Jenzabar, Inc..(Naughton, Edward) (Entered: 09/16/2008)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME IN WHICH PLAINTIFF JENZABAR, INC. HAS TO RESPOND TO CAMPUS MANAGEMENT CORPORATION'S COUNTERCLAIM by Jenzabar, Inc.. (Naughton, Edward) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Edward J. Naughton on behalf of Jenzabar, Inc. (Naughton, Edward) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Judith L. Grubner by Campus Management Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Judith L. Grubner Certificate of Admission in Support of Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice)(Cowley, Steven) (Entered: 08/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Campus Management Corporation. (Cowley, Steven) (Entered: 08/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against Jenzabar, Inc. by Campus Management Corporation.(Cowley, Steven) (Entered: 08/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth R. Burkhard on behalf of Jenzabar, Inc. (Burkhard, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          REPORT on the filing/termination of patent/trademark case. (Hampton, Daniel) (Entered: 06/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jenzabar, Inc.. (Hampton, Daniel) (Entered: 06/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against Campus Management Corporation Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 01010000000002020811, filed by Jenzabar, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 4, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hampton, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/1/2008: # 3 Category Sheet) (Seelye, Terri). (Entered: 06/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 570 times.

                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?