Johnson v. Obama et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Missouri Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:10-cv-02303
District Judge Rodney W. Sippel, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 1, 2017 at 12:39 PM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jeffrey L.G. Johnson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Johnson, Jeffrey L.g.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey L.G. Johnson +1 314 337 0397
v.
No Logo Alberto Gonzales, Defendant
No Logo Angela D. Caesar, Defendant
No Logo Anthony M. Franks, Defendant
No Logo Anthony M. Kennedy, Defendant
No Logo Antonia Scalia, Defendant
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Defendant
Officially listed as "Barack H. Obama"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017
No Logo Bob Holden, Defendant
No Logo Charles A. Shaw, Defendant
No Logo Chris Koster, Defendant
No Logo Clarence Thomas, Defendant
No Logo David B. Sentelle, Defendant
No Logo David H. Souter, Defendant
No Logo Dennis Blair, Defendant
No Logo Dennis Hastert, Defendant
No Logo Donald H. Rumsfeld, Defendant
No Logo Donald Lay, Defendant
No Logo E. Richard Webber, Defendant
No Logo Edward L. Dowd, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Edward L. Filippine, Defendant
No Logo Edwin Meese, III, Defendant
Holder, Jr., Eric H. Holder, Jr., Eric H., Defendant
Officially listed as "Eric H. Holder"
No Logo Eve M. Riley, Defendant
No Logo Frank C. Carlucci, III, Defendant
No Logo Frederick R. Buckles, Defendant
No Logo Gabriel E. Depass, Defendant
No Logo Gen. Keith B. Alexander, Defendant
No Logo George H. W. Bush, Defendant
No Logo George J. Tenet, Defendant
No Logo GEORGE MITCHELL, Defendant
Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Defendant
Officially listed as "George W. Bush"
No Logo Glenn A. Fine, Defendant
No Logo H. Marshall Jarrett, Defendant
No Logo Harry Reid, Defendant
No Logo J. Pappenfus, Defendant
No Logo James C. Duff, Defendant
No Logo James C. Wright, Defendant
No Logo James E. Seiler, Defendant
No Logo James G. Woodward, Defendant
No Logo James R. Clapper, Defendant
No Logo Jane Rund, Defendant
No Logo Janet Reno, Defendant
No Logo Jean C. Hamilton, Defendant
No Logo Jeremiah W. Nixon, Defendant
No Logo John D. Ashcroft, Defendant
No Logo John D. Bates, Defendant
No Logo John E. Potter, Defendant
No Logo John G. Roberts, Jr., Defendant
No Logo John M. Deutch, Defendant
No Logo John M. McConnell, Defendant
No Logo John P. Stevens, Defendant
No Logo Julia D. Gibbs, Defendant
No Logo Karen Schroeder, Defendant
No Logo Katherine D. Perry, Defendant
No Logo Kenneth Minihan, Defendant
No Logo Kenneth W. Starr, Defendant
No Logo Kristi A. Schmidt, Defendant
No Logo Lanny Breuer, Defendant
No Logo Leon Panetta, Defendant
No Logo Leonidas Ralph Mecham, Defendant
No Logo Leslie Aspin, Defendant
No Logo Louis Freeh, Defendant
No Logo Mark J. Langer, Defendant
No Logo Mary Ann Medler, Defendant
No Logo Matt Blunt, Defendant
No Logo Mel Carnahan, Defendant
No Logo Michael Gans, Defendant
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Hayden"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.
No Logo Michael J. Astrue, Defendant
No Logo Michael Mukasey, Defendant
Pelosi, Nancy Pelosi, Nancy, Defendant
Officially listed as "Nancy Pelosi"
United States House of Representatives Speaker of the House, United States House of Representatives, January 4, 2007 - January 3, 2011
United States House of Representatives Speaker of the House, United States House of Representatives, January 3, 2019 - Present
No Logo Neal Katyal, Defendant
No Logo Newton L. Gingrich, Defendant
No Logo Patrick J. Herbst, Defendant
No Logo Porter Goss, Defendant
No Logo R. Craig Lawrence, Defendant
No Logo R. James Woolsey, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Rebecca Burke, Defendant
Cheney, Richard B. Cheney, Richard B., Defendant
Officially listed as "Richard B. Cheney"
No Logo Richard G. Callahan, Defendant
No Logo Richard J. Leon, Defendant
No Logo Richard Thornburgh, Defendant
No Logo Robert Gates, Defendant
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Defendant
Officially listed as "Robert M. Gates"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation
No Logo Robert Mueller, Defendant
No Logo Roger Wilson, Defendant
No Logo STEPHAN L. KING, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ronald W. Reagan"
No Logo Royce C. Lamberth, Defendant
No Logo Ruth B. Ginsberg, Defendant
No Logo S. Atkinson, Defendant
No Logo Samuel Alito, Defendant
No Logo Sandra D. O'Connor, Defendant
No Logo Sandra Moore, Defendant
No Logo Sean N. Stewart, Defendant
No Logo Sonia Sotomayor, Defendant
No Logo Stephan D. Hawke, Defendant
No Logo Stephan L. Limbaugh, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Stephen G. Breyer, Defendant
No Logo Thomas E Perez, Defendant
No Logo Thomas S. Foley, Defendant
No Logo Tom Daschle, Defendant
No Logo Unknown Colbert, Defendant
No Logo William A. Fauks, Defendant
No Logo William Barr, Defendant
No Logo William G. Stewart, II, Defendant
No Logo William H. Rehnquist, Defendant
No Logo William H. Webster, Defendant
No Logo William J. Clinton, Defendant
No Logo William J. Perry, Defendant
No Logo William K. Suter, Defendant
No Logo William L. Webster, Defendant
No Logo William Odom, Defendant
No Logo William S. Cohen, Defendant
No Logo William S. Sessions, Defendant
No Logo William Studeman, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
LETTER from USCA regarding writ of certiorari filed with the U.S. Supreme Court USCA Appeal #: 11-1088/10-3741. The Court today entered the following order in the above-entitled case: Because the Court lacks a quorum, 28 USC, Section 1 and since the only qualified Justice is of the opinion that the case cannot be heard and determined at the next Term of the Court, the judgment is affirmed under 28 USC, Section 2109, which provides that under these circumstances "the court shall enter its order affirming the judgment of the court from which the case was brought for review with the same effect as upon affimance by an equally divided court." The Chief Justice, Justice Scalia, Justice Kennedy, Justice Thomas, Justice Ginsburg, Justice Breyer, Justice Alito and Justice Sotomayor took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. (BAK) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 19 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
    LETTER from USCA regarding writ of certiorari filed with the U.S. Supreme Court USCA Appeal #: 11-1088/10-3741. The petition for a writ of certiorari in the above entitled case was filed on 5/23/11 and placed on the docket 5/24/11 as No. 10-10652(BAK) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
      ORDER OF DISMISSAL pursuant to 28USC1915(e)(2)(B) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED, without prejudice IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this dismissal would not be taken in good faith pursuant to 28USC1915(a)(3). Signed by Honorable Rodney W. Sippel on 6/3/11. (LGK) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 17 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
        MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. 2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall not issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint because the complaint is frivolous. An appropriate Order of Dismissal shall accompany this Memorandum and Order.. Signed by Honorable Rodney W. Sippel on 6/3/11. (LGK) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
          REASSIGNMENT ORDER (jgw). IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the above styled cause is randomly reassigned to the Honorable Rodney W. Sippel. Case reassigned to Judge Honorable Rodney W. Sippel for all further proceedings. In all future documents filed with the Court, please use the following case number4:10CV02303 RWS. (MGK) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: None
            MANDATE of USCA as to 8 Notice of Appeal filed by Jeffrey L.G. Johnson, USCA #:11-1088. In accordance with the judgment of 03/25/2011, and pursuant to the provisions of Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 41(a), the formal mandate is hereby issued in the above-styled matter. (KLH, case reopened, cc:OSU for reassignment) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None
              ORDER of USCA as to 8 Notice of Appeal filed by Jeffrey L.G. Johnson Regarding: Upon consideration of the record of the district court, the order of the district court is hereby reversed and remanded for assignment to a district court judge not named as a defendant in the complaint. Appellant's motion for the clerk to reinstate parties has been considered by the court and is denied. Appellant's motion for leave to proceed in this appeal in forma pauperis is granted. USCA Appeal #: 11-1088 (KLH) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
                ORDER of USCA as to 8 Notice of Appeal filed by Jeffrey L.G. Johnson USCA Appeal #: 11-1088. If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files within 10 days.(MGK) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
                  Initial Notification from USCA for 8 Notice of Appeal filed by Jeffrey L.G. Johnson USCA Appeal Number: 11-1088 (MGK) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None
                    NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL AND NOA SUPPLEMENT by clerk to USCA regarding 8 Notice of Appeal. Notice of Appeal filed on 12/28/2010 by Plaintiff Jeffrey L.G. Johnson. NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTY: FILE REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT WITH DISTRICT COURT CLERKS OFFICE. SUBMIT FORM A & B TO EIGHTH CIRCUIT CLERKS OFFICE(JMW) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None
                      MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Johnsons motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal [#9] is denied. Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on 1/5/2011. (KMS) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None
                        MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on appeal under 42:1983 (prisoner) by Plaintiff Jeffrey L.G. Johnson. (KLH) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 6 Memorandum & Order, 7 Order of Dismissal pursuant to 28USC1915(e)(2)(B), by Plaintiff Jeffrey L.G. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Form A, # 2 Form 4)(KLH) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None
                            ORDER OF DISMISSAL pursuant to 28USC1915(e)(2)(B) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED, without prejudice. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this dismissal would not be taken in good faith pursuant to 28USC1915(a)(3). Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on 12/14/2010. (KMS) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 6 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None
                              MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. #2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall not issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint because the complaint is frivolous. An appropriate Order of Dismissal shall accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on 12/14/2010. (KMS) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                REASSIGNMENT ORDER (JAMES G. WOODWARD,CLERK OF COURT) - At the direction of the Court, the above styled cause must be reassigned to another Judge. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the above styled cause is randomly reassigned to the Honorable Catherine D. Perry. (MRC) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Due to conflict of interest, this Court hereby recuses itself from this case. This case will be reassigned to another Judge. Case reassigned to Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig for all further proceedings. Honorable Jean C. Hamilton no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable Jean C. Hamilton on 12/8/10. (CEL) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None
                                    FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Jeffrey L.G. Johnson. (KCM) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None
                                      MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jeffrey L.G. Johnson. (KCM) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        COMPLAINT against defendant Samuel Alito, Stephen G. Breyer, George W. Bush, George H. W. Bush, William J. Clinton, Ruth B. Ginsberg, Anthony M. Kennedy, Sandra D. O'Connor, Barack H. Obama, Ronald W. Reagan, William H. Rehnquist, John G. Roberts, Jr, Antonia Scalia, Sonia Sotomayor, David H. Souter, John P. Stevens, William K. Suter, Clarence Thomas, et al., Jury Demand, filed by Jeffrey L.G. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Envelope, # 4 Judge Assignment Label)(KCM) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 121 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?