Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.
Page 1 Page 2 Page 3 Page 4 Page 5 Page 6 Page 7 Page 8 Page 9 Page 10 Page 11 Page 12 Page 13
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
5842 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14258 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer of Claim Other Than For Security, Notice of Transfer of Claim Other Than For Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Antin Epargne Penson(former Dexia Epargne Pension)(Claim No.41223, Amount 9,322,350.00). To Illiquidx Ltd. filed by Jeff J. Friedman on behalf of Illiquidx Ltd..(Friedman, Jeff) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14257 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Yorvik Partners LLP(Claim No.66792, Amount 807,800.00). To OCM Opportunities Fund VIIb, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of OCM Opportunities Fund VIIb, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14256 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Yorvik Partners LLP(Claim No.66792, Amount 96,600.00). To OCM Opportunities Fund VIIb (Parallel), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of OCM Opportunities Fund VIIb (Parallel), L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14255 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Yorvik Partners LLP(Claim No.66792, Amount 1,055,600.00). To Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14254 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Yorvik Partners LLP(Claim No.66792, Amount 165,200.00). To Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII (Parallel), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII (Parallel), L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14253 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Yorvik Partners LLP(Claim No.66792, Amount 49,000.00). To Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII (Parallel 2), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII (Parallel 2), L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14252 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Phoenix Partners II, L.P.(Claim No.49983, Amount 508,252.60). To Tejas Securities Group, Inc.. filed by Eric J. Taube on behalf of Tejas Securities Group, Inc..(Taube, Eric) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14251 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Phaeton International (BVI), Limited(Claim No.49982, Amount 2,229,914.00). To Tejas Securities Group, Inc.. filed by Eric J. Taube on behalf of Tejas Securities Group, Inc..(Taube, Eric) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14250 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Phoenix Partners, L.P.(Claim No.49981, Amount 3,975,160.00). To Tejas Securities Group, Inc.. filed by Eric J. Taube on behalf of Tejas Securities Group, Inc..(Taube, Eric) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14249 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Yorvik Partners LLP(Claim No.66792, Amount 337,400.00). To Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14248 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Tranfer Agreement (Claim No. 59483). To Acta Asset Management ASA. filed by Andrew T. Solomon on behalf of Acta Asset Management ASA.(Solomon, Andrew) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14247 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Tranfer Agreement (Claim No. 56956). To Acta Asset Management ASA. filed by Andrew T. Solomon on behalf of Acta Asset Management ASA.(Solomon, Andrew) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14246 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Tranfer Agreement (Claim No. 59482). To Acta Asset Management ASA. filed by Andrew T. Solomon on behalf of Acta Asset Management ASA.(Solomon, Andrew) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14245 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Tranfer Agreement (Claim No. 59438). To Acta Asset Management ASA. filed by Andrew T. Solomon on behalf of Acta Asset Management ASA.(Solomon, Andrew) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14244 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Tranfer Agreement (Claim No. 59435). To Acta Asset Management ASA. filed by Andrew T. Solomon on behalf of Acta Asset Management ASA.(Solomon, Andrew) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14243 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Tranfer Agreement (Claim No. 59481). To Acta Asset Management ASA. filed by Andrew T. Solomon on behalf of Acta Asset Management ASA.(Solomon, Andrew) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14242 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Tranfer Agreement (Claim No. 56952). To Acta Asset Management ASA. filed by Andrew T. Solomon on behalf of Acta Asset Management ASA.(Solomon, Andrew) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14241 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Tranfer Agreement (Claim No. 59477). To Acta Asset Management ASA. filed by Andrew T. Solomon on behalf of Acta Asset Management ASA.(Solomon, Andrew) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14240 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Lauren Rodriguez of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 7592 , 7591 , 7590 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14239 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Tranfer Agreement (Claim No. 59441). To Acta Asset Management ASA. filed by Andrew T. Solomon on behalf of Acta Asset Management ASA.(Solomon, Andrew) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14238 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Tranfer Agreement (Claim No. 59474). To Acta Asset Management ASA. filed by Andrew T. Solomon on behalf of Acta Asset Management ASA.(Solomon, Andrew) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14237 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Tranfer Agreement (Claim No. 56961). To Acta Asset Management ASA. filed by Andrew T. Solomon on behalf of Acta Asset Management ASA.(Solomon, Andrew) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14236 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Tranfer Agreement (Claim No. 56958). To Acta Asset Management ASA. filed by Andrew T. Solomon on behalf of Acta Asset Management ASA.(Solomon, Andrew) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14235 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Tranfer Agreement (Claim No. 56957). To Acta Asset Management ASA. filed by Andrew T. Solomon on behalf of Acta Asset Management ASA.(Solomon, Andrew) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14234 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Tranfer Agreement (Claim No. 59442). To Acta Asset Management ASA. filed by Andrew T. Solomon on behalf of Acta Asset Management ASA.(Solomon, Andrew) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14233 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Lauren Rodriguez of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 14175 , 14177 , 14174 , 14173 , 14162 , 14163 , 14171 , 14176 , 14178 , 14172 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14232 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on January 13, 2011 10:20 AM Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 4/14/2011. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext, LLC.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 1/21/2011. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 2/4/2011. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 2/14/2011. Transcript access will be restricted through 4/14/2011. (Richards, Beverly) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14231 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit / Second Amended Supplemental Affidavit of Theodore A. Krebsbach, Esq. on behalf of Krebsbach & Snyder, P.C. (related document(s) 7543 ) filed by Richard P. Krasnow on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14230 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Merrill Lynch International(Claim No.20168, Amount 13,573,487.50). To Banc of America Securities LLC. filed by Banc of America Securities LLC.(Reynolds, Meredith) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14229 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation and Order Signed on 2/1/2011 Governing the Production of Discovery Materials. (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14228 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Bridge Order Signed on 2/1/2011 Extending the Exclusive Periods within which Merit, LLC, LB Somerset LLC and LB Preferred Somerset LLC May File Chapter 11 Plans and Solicit Acceptances Thereof. (related document(s) 14164 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14151 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Amended Disclosure Statement : Debtors' Disclosure Statement for First Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. and its Affiliated Debtors Pursuant to Section 1125 of the Bankruptcy Code filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Perez, Alfredo) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14150 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Amended Chapter 11 Plan : First Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. and its Affiliated Debtors filed by Lori R. Fife on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Fife, Lori) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14149 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Intesa Sanpaolo S.p.A.(Claim No.11021, Amount 33,673,833.01). To Goldman Sachs Lending Partners, LLC. filed by John R. Ashmead on behalf of Goldman Sachs Lending Partners, LLC.(Ashmead, John) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14148 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Intesa Sanpaolo S.p.A.(Claim No.11020, Amount 1,694,353.02). To Goldman Sachs Lending Partners, LLC. filed by John R. Ashmead on behalf of Goldman Sachs Lending Partners, LLC.(Ashmead, John) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14147 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Intesa Sanpaolo S.p.A.(Claim No.11018, Amount 10,182.00). To Goldman Sachs Lending Partners, LLC. filed by John R. Ashmead on behalf of Goldman Sachs Lending Partners, LLC.(Ashmead, John) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14146 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Banca CR Firenze S.p.A.(Claim No.37190, Amount 21,226,500.00). To Goldman Sachs & Co.. filed by John R. Ashmead on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Ashmead, John) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14145 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Status Report : Quarterly Report Pursuant to Order Establishing Procedures for the Debtors to Compromise and Settle Prepetition Claims Asserted by the Debtors Against Third Parties filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14144 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Amount: CHF 10'000 Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Credit Suisse AG, Zurich / Switzerland(Claim No. 55829). To Bank Vontobel AG, Zurich / Switzerland. filed by Credit Suisse AG, Zurich/Switzerland.(Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14143 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:AXA Aurora Vida S.A. de Segueros y Reasegueros(Claim No.59348, Amount 458,692.30). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Jessica Fainman on behalf of Barclays Bank PLC.(Fainman, Jessica) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14142 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation, Agreement and Order Signed on 1/25/2011 Between Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. and Lehman Brothers Finance Asia Pte Ltd (in Creditors' Voluntary Liquidation). (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14141 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Sabretooth Master Fund, LP(Claim No. 42540, Amount $22,000,000.00); Sabretooth Master Fund, LP(Claim No. 42541, Amount $22,000,000.00). To Deutsche Bank AG, London. filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch.(Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14140 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Instituto Bancario Sammarinese S.p.A.(Claim No.66792, Amount 2,511,600.00). To Yorvik Partners LLP. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Yorvik Partners LLP.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14139 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Hawaii 2PEA Fund(Claim No.66880, Amount 1,597,309.94). To CVF Lux Master S.a.r.l. filed by Primeshares.(Wilson, Charmaine) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14138 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Hawaii 2 Fund(Claim No.66883, Amount 4,354,701.94). To CVF Lux Master S.a.r.l. filed by Primeshares.(Wilson, Charmaine) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14137 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 14094 , 14095 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14136 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13981 , 13980 , 13984 , 13986 , 13982 , 13983 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14135 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.60865, Amount 133,200.00); Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.25354, Amount 133,200.00). To Varde Investment Partners, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Varde Investment Partners, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14134 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.60865, Amount 62,400.00); Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.25354, Amount 62,400.00). To Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14133 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 1/25/2011 Admitting David R. Seligman to Practice Pro Hac Vice in this Court. (Related Doc # 13905 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14132 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.60865, Amount 72,000.00); Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.25354, Amount 72,000.00). To The Varde Fund, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14131 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.60865, Amount 472,800.00); Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.25354, Amount 472,800.00). To The Varde Fund X (Master), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund X (Master) L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14130 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.60865, Amount 108,000.00); Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.25354, Amount 108,000.00). To The Varde Fund VIII, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund VIII, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14129 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.60865, Amount 13,200.00); Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.25354, Amount 13,200.00). To The Varde Fund V-B, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund V-B, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14128 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.60865, Amount 438,000.00); Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.25354, Amount 438,000.00). To The Varde Fund IX, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14127 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response In re: Claim No. 15690 filed by Christopher A. Statham. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14126 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.60865, Amount 56,400.00); Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.25354, Amount 56,400.00). To The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14125 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Debeka Krankenversicherungsverein a. G.(Claim No. 21443, Amount $14,544,830.33); Debeka Lebensversicherungsverein a. G.(Claim No. 21444, Amount $29,158,389.35); Deutsche Hypothekenbank (Actien-Gesellschaft)(Claim No. 21895, Amount $7,049,012.48); Keshet Debentures Limited(Claim No. 50504, Amount $81,518,861.00); Matbeot Olam (World Currencies) Ltd.(Claim No. 50505, Amount $25,165,500.00). To Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch. filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch.(Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14124 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Banca Intermobiliare Di Investimenti E Gestioni Sp(Claim No.20770, Amount 3,431,855.99). To CVI GVF Luxembourg twelve S.a.r.l. filed by Carval Investors UK Limited.(Jacobsen, Annemarie) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14123 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:UBS AG(Claim No.28160, Amount 2,772,294.88); UBS AG(Claim No.28161, Amount 2,772,294.88); UBS AG(Claim No.28162, Amount 1,403,713.17); UBS AG(Claim No.28163, Amount 1,403,713.17); UBS AG(Claim No.28164, Amount 1,910,539.92); UBS AG(Claim No.28165, Amount 1,910,539.92). To CVF LUX Master S.a.r.l.. filed by Carval Investors UK Limited.(Jacobsen, Annemarie) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14122 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Glodman Sachs Lending Partners LLC(Claim No.66653, Amount 25000000). To CVI GVF Luxembourg Twelve S.a.r.l. filed by Carval Investors UK Limited.(Jacobsen, Annemarie) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14121 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC(Claim No.66655, Amount 25000000). To CVI GVF Luxembourg Twelve S.a.r.l. filed by Carval Investors UK Limited.(Jacobsen, Annemarie) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14008 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on January 20, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 1/20/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14007 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Banco Espirito Santo S.A., Sucursal en Espana(Claim No.56014, Amount 2,830,200.00). To Yorvik Partners LLP. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Yorvik Partners LLP.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14006 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Sosgardel, S.A.(Claim No.56014, Amount 2,830,200.00). To Banco Espirito Santo S.A., Sucursal en Espana. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Banco Espirito Santo S.A., Sucursal en Espana.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14005 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Monthly Operating Report for the Period of December 2010 filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14004 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP (Claim No.45941, Amount 946,342.38); SMBC Friend Securities Co., Ltd.(Claim No.45942, Amount 961,853.08); SMBC Friend Securities Co., Ltd.(Claim No.45943, Amount 956,754.85); SMBC Friend Securities Co., Ltd.(Claim No.45944, Amount 961,374.82); SMBC Friend Securities Co., Ltd.(Claim No.45945, Amount 4,258,540.74); SMBC Friend Securities Co., Ltd.(Claim No.45946, Amount 3,785,369.52); SMBC Friend Securities Co., Ltd.(Claim No.45947, Amount 821,584.80); SMBC Friend Securities Co., Ltd.(Claim No.45948, Amount 1,514,147.81); SMBC Friend Securities Co., Ltd.(Claim No.45880, Amount 1,027,609.04); SMBC Friend Securities Co., Ltd.(Claim No.45881, Amount 999,784.44). To Nikko Cordial Securities Inc.. filed by Ira A. Reid on behalf of Nikko Cordial Securities Inc..(Reid, Ira) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14003 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Restated Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:CC Arbitrage, Inc.(Claim No.66337, Amount 11,256,426.00). To Barclays Bank PLC.(related document(s) 14001 ) filed by Jessica Fainman on behalf of Barclays Bank PLC.(Fainman, Jessica) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14002 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:European Aeronautic Defence and Space Company EADS(Claim No.15365, Amount 45,500,000.00). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Jessica Fainman on behalf of Barclays Bank PLC.(Fainman, Jessica) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14001 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:CC Arbitrage, Ltd.(Claim No.66377, Amount 11,256,426.00). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Jessica Fainman on behalf of Barclays Bank PLC.(Fainman, Jessica) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14000 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP (Claim No.45879, Amount 946,342.38). To Nikko Cordial Securities Inc.. filed by Ira A. Reid on behalf of Nikko Cordial Securities Inc..(Reid, Ira) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13999 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP (Claim No.45878, Amount 946,342.38). To Nikko Cordial Securities Inc.. filed by Ira A. Reid on behalf of Nikko Cordial Securities Inc..(Reid, Ira) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13998 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:SMBC Friend Securities Co., Ltd.(Claim No.45877, Amount 1,898,928.88). To Nikko Cordial Securities Inc.. filed by Ira A. Reid on behalf of Nikko Cordial Securities Inc..(Reid, Ira) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13997 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:SMBC Friend Securities Co., Ltd.(Claim No.45876, Amount 2,271,221.72). To Nikko Cordial Securities Inc.. filed by Ira A. Reid on behalf of Nikko Cordial Securities Inc..(Reid, Ira) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13996 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:SMBC Friend Securities Co., Ltd.(Claim No.45875, Amount 1,703,416.29). To Nikko Cordial Securities Inc.. filed by Ira A. Reid on behalf of Nikko Cordial Securities Inc..(Reid, Ira) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13995 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' Objection to Certain Claims of Ore Hill Credit Hub Fund Ltd. filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 3/3/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13994 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' Objection to Certain Claims of Advanced Graphic Printing, Inc. filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 3/3/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13993 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:VisionGain China Absolute Return Master Fund(Claim No.33604, Amount 23,155,004.94). To CVI GVF Luxembourg Fourteen S.a.r.l.. filed by Primeshares.(Wilson, Charmaine) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13992 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP /Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than For Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Taipei Fubon Commercial Bank Co., Ltd.(Claim No.25155, Amount 10,020,742.00). To Macquarie Bank Limited. filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of Macquarie Bank Limited.(Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13991 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:Ente di Previdenza e Assistenza Pluricategoriale(Claim No. 58999). To Nomura International PLC. filed by Douglas P. Bartner on behalf of Nomura International plc.(Bartner, Douglas) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13990 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on January 20, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 1/20/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13989 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:Ente di Previdenza e Assistenza Pluricategoriale(Claim No. 58993). To Nomura International PLC. filed by Douglas P. Bartner on behalf of Nomura International plc.(Bartner, Douglas) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13988 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Withdrawal of Claim(s): of Sara Nase regarding Claim Nos. 34377 and 34378 filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13987 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:IRCEM Retraite(Claim No.55842, Amount 18,030,796). To JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA. filed by Howard J. Grossman on behalf of JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A..(Grossman, Howard) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13790 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Lauren Rodriguez of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13692 , 13709 , 13699 , 13593 , 13697 , 13723 , 13693 , 13700 , 13711 , 13707 , 13716 , 13696 , 13708 , 13702 , 13695 , 13710 , 13717 , 13687 , 13698 , 13722 , 13689 , 13684 , 13701 , 13715 , 13718 , 13688 , 13713 , 13714 , 13706 , 13690 , 13686 , 13705 , 13685 , 13683 , 13691 , 13712 , 13704 , 13721 , 13703 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13789 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Lauren Rodriguez of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13684 , 13683 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13788 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 245,131.70); Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 363,202.40); Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 497,765.38); Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 353,010.85); Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 359,810.13); Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 1,125,362.99); Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 214,019.72); Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 237,032.81); Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 416,744.00); Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 669,049.33). To OCM Opportunities Fund VIIb (Parallel), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of OCM Opportunities Fund VIIb (Parallel), L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 continuation)(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13787 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 148,564.67); Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 192,719.64); Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 260,026.69); Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 191,214.21); Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 190,919.66); Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 588,092.92); Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 112,641.96); Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 121,150.10); Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 218,790.60); Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 349,964.27). To Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII (Parallel 2), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII (Parallel 2), L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 continuation)(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13786 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC(Claim No.56932, Amount 445,694.00); Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC(Claim No.56932, Amount 637,457.27); Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC(Claim No.56932, Amount 869,232.07); Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC(Claim No.56932, Amount 617,768.98); Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC(Claim No.56932, Amount 631,503.50); Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC(Claim No.56932, Amount 1,974,830.54); Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC(Claim No.56932, Amount 360,454.27); Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC(Claim No.56932, Amount 411,910.35); Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC(Claim No.56932, Amount 738,678.74); Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC(Claim No.56932, Amount 1,181,644.05). To Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII (Parallel), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII (Parallel), L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Continuation)(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13785 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 2,874,726.30); Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 4,098,998.47); Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 5,564,571.14); Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 3,972,245.66); Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 4,053,371.31); Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 12,647,627.95); Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 2,342,952.77); Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 2,637,911.83); Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 4,725,876.96); Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 7,557,169.54). To Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 continuation)(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13784 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC(Claim No.56932, Amount 794,820.97); Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC(Claim No.56932, Amount 1,134,080.95); Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC(Claim No.56932, Amount 1,545,301.47); Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC(Claim No.56932, Amount 1,088,450.11); Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC(Claim No.56932, Amount 1,123,488.79); Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC(Claim No.56932, Amount 3,506,776.29); Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC(Claim No.56932, Amount 653,323.37); Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC(Claim No.56932, Amount 732,168.02); Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC(Claim No.56932, Amount 1,312,743.60); Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC(Claim No.56932, Amount 2,099,785.60). To Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 continuation)(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13783 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 2,124,474.73); Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 3,046,452.75); Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 4,130,709.69); Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 2,912,339.48); Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 3,010,656.23); Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 9,394,965.88); Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 1,745,950.38); Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 1,964,738.65); Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 3,511,068.20); Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc(Claim No.56932, Amount 5,620,014.40). To OCM Opportunities Fund VIIb, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of OCM Opportunities Fund VIIb, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 continuation)(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13782 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Banca Popolare di Sondrio S.c.p.a.(Claim No.64062, Amount 5,744,110.88). To UBS AG, London Branch. filed by Joshua Dorchak on behalf of UBS AG, London Branch.(Dorchak, Joshua) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13781 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Of Hearing Of Motion By Factiva, Inc., Factiva Limited And Dow Jones & Company, Inc. For An Order (A) Compelling Immediate Payment Of Post-Petition Administrative Expense Claims And (B) Compelling The Debtors To Assume Or Reject Executory Contracts Or Alternatively Modifying The Automatic Stay To Permit Movants To Terminate The Executory Contracts (related document(s) 7102 ) filed by Ira M. Levee on behalf of Factiva, Inc., Factiva Limited and Dow Jones & Company, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 2/16/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 2/9/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Levee, Ira) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13780 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Dover Master Fund L.P.; Dover Master Fund II L.P.(Claim No.25805, Amount 3,663,900.00). To Stone Lion Portfolio L.P.. filed by Nickolas Karavolas on behalf of Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP.(Karavolas, Nickolas) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13779 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Longacre Institutional Opportunity Fund, L.P.(Claim No.25804, Amount 2,576,100.00). To Permal Stone Lion Fund Ltd.. filed by Nickolas Karavolas on behalf of Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP.(Karavolas, Nickolas) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13778 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Dover Master Fund L.P.; Dover Master Fund II L.P.(Claim No.25621, Amount 3,663,900.00). To Stone Lion Portfolio L.P.. filed by Nickolas Karavolas on behalf of Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP.(Karavolas, Nickolas) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13777 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 12/22/2010 10:04AM RE: Debtors' Thirty-First Omnibus Objection to Claims( Insufficient Documentation Claims); Debtors' Thirty-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Debtors' Fiftty-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (Duplicate of Indenture Trustee Claims); Debtors's Fifty-Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims ( Duplicate of Indenture Trustee Claims)....et al........ Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 3/30/2011. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Reporting Company.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 1/6/2011. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 1/20/2011. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 1/31/2011. Transcript access will be restricted through 3/30/2011. (Villegas, Carmen) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13776 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Longacre Institutional Opportunity Fund L.P.(Claim No.25615, Amount 2,576,100.00). To Permal Stone Lion Fund Ltd.. filed by Nickolas Karavolas on behalf of Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP.(Karavolas, Nickolas) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
13775 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Avatar Finance PTY Ltd.(Claim No. 51133, Amount $4,561,195.00). To Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch. filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch.(Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13676 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13675 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13674 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13673 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Kommunivest I Sverige AB(Claim No.2072, Amount 9,560,763.85). To CVI GVF Luxembourg Twelve S.a.r.l.. filed by Primeshares.(Wilson, Charmaine) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13672 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security, Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 3001(e)(2) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.45658, Amount 770,000). To Silver Point Capital Offshore Master Fund, L.P.. filed by Arvin Abraham on behalf of Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P. and Silver Point Capital Offshore Fund, Ltd..(Abraham, Arvin) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13671 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security, Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 3001(e)(2) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.45658, Amount 330,000). To Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P.. filed by Arvin Abraham on behalf of Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P. and Silver Point Capital Offshore Fund, Ltd..(Abraham, Arvin) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13670 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Banco Espirito Santo S.A., Sucursal en Espana(Claim No.56018, Amount 2,830,200.00); Banco Espirito Santo S.A., Sucursal en Espana(Claim No.56013, Amount 849,060.00); Banco Espirito Santo S.A., Sucursal en Espana(Claim No.56012, Amount 707,550.00); Banco Espirito Santo S.A., Sucursal en Espana(Claim No.56011, Amount 106,132.50); Banco Espirito Santo S.A., Sucursal en Espana(Claim No.56015, Amount 283,020.00); Banco Espirito Santo S.A., Sucursal en Espana(Claim No.56016, Amount 212,265.00); Banco Espirito Santo S.A., Sucursal en Espana(Claim No.56017, Amount 212,265.00). To Yorvik Partners LLP. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Yorvik Partners LLP.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13669 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Banco Espirito Santo S.A., Sucursal en Espana(Claim No.55934, Amount 4,457,565.00). To Yorvik Partners LLP. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Yorvik Partners LLP.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13668 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Poligono Interior, S.L.(Claim No.56018, Amount 2,830,200.00). To Banco Espirito Santo S.A., Sucursal en Espana. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Yorvik Partners LLP.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13667 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Victoria Arechabala Fernandez(Claim No.56017, Amount 212,265.00). To Banco Espirito Santo S.A., Sucursal en Espana. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Yorvik Partners LLP.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13666 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement / Affidavit and Disclosure Statement of AKD Prinsen Van Wijmen N.V. filed by Richard P. Krasnow on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13665 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Christine Morch Thevenard(Claim No.56016, Amount 212,265.00). To Banco Espirito Santo S.A., Sucursal en Espana. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Yorvik Partners LLP.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13664 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Rafael Rubio Rubio(Claim No.56015, Amount 283,020.00). To Banco Espirito Santo S.A., Sucursal en Espana. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Yorvik Partners LLP.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13663 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Aurora Rubio Eguride(Claim No.56013, Amount 849,060.00). To Banco Espirito Santo S.A., Sucursal en Espana. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Yorvik Partners LLP.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13662 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Luis Bueno Gil(Claim No.56012, Amount 707,550.00). To Banco Espirito Santo S.A., Sucursal en Espana. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Yorvik Partners LLP.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13661 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement / Notice of Sixty-Fifth Supplemental List of Ordinary Course Professionals filed by Richard P. Krasnow on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13660 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Natalia Inmaculada Rubio Rubio(Claim No.56011, Amount 106,132.50). To Banco Espirito Santo S.A., Sucursal en Espana. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Yorvik Partners LLP.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13659 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter / Letter to Chambers Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7007-1(b) filed by Benjamin Rosenblum on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part 1# 2 Exhibit A Part 2# 3 Exhibit A Part 3# 4 Exhibit A Part 4)(Rosenblum, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13658 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13638 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13657 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 12/23/2010 Granting Application for the Allowance of Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses for the Period of June 1, 2009 to January 31, 2010, for Richard Sheldon, fees awarded: $134,985.04, expense awarded: $19.83. (Related Doc # 8327 ) (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13656 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Lauren Rodriguez of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13589 , 13582 , 13577 , 13574 , 13592 , 13581 , 13586 , 13579 , 13561 , 13587 , 13576 , 13585 , 13575 , 13588 , 13578 , 13583 , 13591 , 13580 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13655 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13590 , 13584 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13654 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13564 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13653 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Manners of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13543 , 13552 , 13544 , 13548 , 13546 , 13549 , 13551 , 13545 , 13550 , 13542 , 13547 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13652 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13570 , 13572 , 13571 , 13569 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13651 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13568 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13650 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13559 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13649 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13541 , 13540 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13648 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13554 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13647 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:TPG Credit Opportunities Investors, L.P.(Claim No.16062, Amount 3,619,825.90). To Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC. filed by Nickolas Karavolas on behalf of Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC.(Karavolas, Nickolas) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13646 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:TPG Credit Opportunities Fund, L.P.(Claim No.16062, Amount 3,609,920.20). To Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC. filed by Nickolas Karavolas on behalf of Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC.(Karavolas, Nickolas) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13645 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:TPG Credit Strategies Fund, L.P.(Claim No.16062, Amount 7,339,131.91). To Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC. filed by Nickolas Karavolas on behalf of Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC.(Karavolas, Nickolas) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13496 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Sixth Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Sixth Application of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP, as Attorneys for the Debtors, for Interim Allowance of Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred from June 1, 2010 through September 30, 2010 for Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP, Debtor's Attorney, period: 6/1/2010 to 9/30/2010, fee:$42,626,600., expenses: $1,043,188.9. filed by Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13495 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Sections 105(a), 362, and 365 of the Bankruptcy Code for Authorization to Assume Certain Aircraft Lease Agreements and to Consummate Certain Related Transactions (related document(s) 3218 ) filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 1/13/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Perez, Alfredo) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13494 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Agenda : Notice of Amended Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on December 15, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Lori R. Fife on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/15/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Fife, Lori) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13493 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Sixth Application Of Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP, Counsel To Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors, For Interim Approval And Allowance Of Compensation For Services Rendered And For Reimbursement Of Expenses During Period From June 1, 2010 Through And Including September 30, 2010 for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Creditor Comm. Aty, period: 6/1/2010 to 9/30/2010, fee:$18,359,367.7, expenses: $792,924.64. filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Dunne, Dennis) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13492 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Third Application Of Richard Sheldon, Queen's Counsel Special U.K. Counsel To Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors, For Interim Approval And Allowance Of Compensation For Services Rendered And For Reimbursement Of Expenses During Period From June 1, 2010 Through And Including September 30, 2010 for Richard Sheldon, Special Counsel, period: 6/1/2010 to 9/30/2010, fee:$5107.70, expenses: $0.0. filed by Richard Sheldon. (Fleck, Evan) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13491 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Fourth Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Fourth Interim Fee Statement of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Tax Advisors to the Debtors and Debtors-in-Possession, for Compensation for Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of Expenses for PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Other Professional, period: 6/1/2010 to 9/30/2010, fee:$157,753.00, expenses: $2,484.23. filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2 of 4# 2 Part 3 of 4# 3 Part 4 of 4) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13490 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Sixth Application for Interim Professional Compensation for Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP, Creditor Comm. Aty, period: 6/1/2010 to 9/30/2010, fee:$3,187,890.63, expenses: $259,395.28. filed by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G) (Tecce, James) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13489 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Sixth Interim Application Of Houlihan Lokey Howard & Zukin Capital, Inc., Investment Banker To The Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors, For Interim Allowance Of Compensation For Professional Services Rendered And Reimbursement Of Actual And Necessary Expenses Incurred From June 1, 2010 Through September 30, 2010 for Houlihan Lokey Howard & Zukin Capital, Inc., Other Professional, period: 6/1/2010 to 9/30/2010, fee:$1,600,000.00, expenses: $27,042.78. filed by Houlihan Lokey Howard & Zukin Capital, Inc.. (O'Donnell, Dennis) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13488 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Interim Professional Compensation for SNR Denton US LLP, Debtor's Attorney, period: 1/1/2010 to 9/30/2010, fee:$675,258.00, expenses: $2,829.61. filed by SNR Denton US LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certification# 2 Exhibit B - Expense Summary# 3 Exhibit C - Compensation by Work Task# 4 Exhibit D - Part 1 SNR Denton's Monthly Fee Statements# 5 Exhibit D - Part 2# 6 Exhibit D - Part 3# 7 Proposed Order) (McDonald, Hugh) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13487 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Sixth Application for Interim Professional Compensation for Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle LLP, Debtor's Attorney, period: 6/1/2010 to 9/30/2010, fee:$4,727,258.00, expenses: $198,520.63. filed by Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle LLP. (Reisman, Steven) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13486 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Sixth Application for Interim Professional Compensation for Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP, Debtor's Attorney, period: 6/1/2010 to 9/30/2010, fee:$56,705.35, expenses: $1,628.29. filed by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP. (McGarry, Mary) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13485 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Interim Professional Compensation FIFTH INTERIM APPLICATION OF PACHULSKI STANG ZIEHL & JONES LLP FOR COMPENSATION FOR SERVICES RENDERED AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES AS SPECIAL COUNSEL TO THE DEBTORS FOR THE PERIOD FROM JUNE 1, 2010 THROUGH SEPTEMBER 30, 2010 for Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP, Special Counsel, period: 6/1/2010 to 9/30/2010, fee:$421,357.98, expenses: $11,077.86. filed by Maria A. Bove. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E) (Bove, Maria) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13484 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP / Transfer of Claim other than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Horizon II International Limited(Claim No.67227, Amount 4,500,000). To Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. filed by Douglas R. Davis on behalf of Citigroup Global Markets Inc..(Davis, Douglas) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13483 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP / Transfer of Claim other than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Horizon II International Limited(Claim No.67226, Amount 4,500,000). To Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. filed by Douglas R. Davis on behalf of Citigroup Global Markets Inc..(Davis, Douglas) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13482 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP / Notice of Partial Transfer of Claims other than for Security Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 3001(E)(2) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Bank Julius Bar & Co, Ltd(Claim No. 59233). To Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. filed by Douglas R. Davis on behalf of Citigroup Global Markets Inc..(Davis, Douglas) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13481 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
First Application for Interim Professional Compensation / First Interim Application of Reed Smith LLP, Special Counsel to the Debtors and Debtors in Possession, for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period June 1, 2010 through November 30, 2010 for Reed Smith LLP, Other Professional, period: 6/1/2010 to 11/30/2010, fee:$418,202.00, expenses: $4,832.33. filed by Reed Smith LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C - Part 1# 4 Exhibit C - Part 2# 5 Exhibit C - Part 3# 6 Exhibit D# 7 Proposed Order) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13480 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Samuel Garcia of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13391 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13479 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13384 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13478 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13387 , 13393 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13477 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13371 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13476 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Samuel Garcia of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13302 , 13303 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13475 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13105 , 13106 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13474 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13390 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13473 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13383 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13472 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Samuel Garcia of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13329 , 13328 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13471 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Sixth Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Sixth Interim Application of Lazard Freres & Co. LLC, Debtors' Investment Banker for Allowance of Compensation and for the Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expense Incurred for the Period from June 1, 2010 through September 30, 2010 for Lazard Freres & Co. LLC, Other Professional, period: 6/1/2010 to 9/30/2010, fee:$800,000.00, expenses: $1,851.82. filed by Lazard Freres & Co. LLC. (Waisman1, Shai) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13470 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Second Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Second Interim Application of Deloitte Tax LLP for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Tax Services Provider to the Debtors for the Period from June 1, 2010 through and Including September 30, 2010 for Deloitte Tax LLP, Other Professional, period: 6/1/2010 to 9/30/2010, fee:$61,810.29, expenses: $68.85. filed by Deloitte Tax LLP. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13469 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Second Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Second Interim Application of Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP, Special Counsel to the Debtors and Debtors in Possession, for Interim Allowance of Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred from June 1, 2010 through September 30, 2010 for Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP, Other Professional, period: 6/1/2010 to 9/30/2010, fee:$203,130.00, expenses: $7,221.58. filed by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13468 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Fifth Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Fifth Interim Fee Application of Duff & Phelps LLC, as Financial Advisors to the Examiner, Anton R. Valukas, for Interim Allowance of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred from June 1, 2010 through July 12, 2010 for Duff & Phelps LLC, Other Professional, period: 6/1/2010 to 7/12/2010, fee:$55,009.35, expenses: $0.00. filed by Duff & Phelps LLC. (Waisman1, Shai) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13467 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
First Application for Interim Professional Compensation / First Interim Fee Application of MMOR Consulting Inc. for Allowance of Compensation for Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of Expenses for Tax Services Providers to the Debtors and Debtors-In-Possession for the Period from July 1, 2010 through September 30, 2010 for MMOR Consulting Inc., Other Professional, period: 7/1/2010 to 9/30/2010, fee:$146,025.00, expenses: $11,719.00. filed by MMOR Consulting Inc.. (Waisman1, Shai) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13466 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Application of Windels Marx Lane & Mittendorf, LLP, for an Interim Award of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period June 1, 2010 through September 30, 2010 for Windels Marx Lane & Mittendorf, LLP, Other Professional, period: 6/1/2010 to 9/30/2010, fee:$336,613.72, expenses: $8,854.48. filed by Windels Marx Lane & Mittendorf, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C - Part 1# 2 Exhibit C - Part 2) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13465 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Third Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Third Application of Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP, as a 327(e) Professional, for Allowance of Interim Compensation for Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred from June 1, 2010 through September 30, 2010 for Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP, Other Professional, period: 6/1/2010 to 9/30/2010, fee:$793,428.99, expenses: $4,060.21. filed by Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP. (Waisman1, Shai) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13464 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Third Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Third Interim Application of Kleyr Grasso Associes, Special Counsel to the Debtors and Debtors in Possession, for Allowance of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from June 1, 2010 through September 30, 2010 for Kleyr Grasso Associes, Other Professional, period: 6/1/2010 to 9/30/2010, fee:$65,871.59, expenses: $2,138.00. filed by Kleyr Grasso Associes. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13463 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security, Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 3001(e)(2) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC(Claim No.1122, Amount 17,349,437.00). To SPCP Group, L.L.C., as agent for Silver Point Cap. filed by Scott A. Zuber on behalf of SPCP Group, L.L.C., as Agent for Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P. and Silver Point Capital Offshore Fund, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Zuber, Scott) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13462 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Sixth Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Sixth Interim Fee Application of the Examiner and Jenner & Block LLP for Allowance of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for Jenner & Block LLP, Other Professional, period: 6/1/2010 to 7/12/2010, fee:$114,663.15, expenses: $10,057.12. filed by Jenner & Block LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13461 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Second Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Second Interim Fee Application of Sutherland Asbill & Brennan LLP, as a Section 327(e) Professional, for Allowance of Compensation for Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred During the Period from June 1, 2010 through September 30, 2010 for Sutherland Asbill & Brennan LLP, Other Professional, period: 6/1/2010 to 9/30/2010, fee:$108,358.00, expenses: $833.42. filed by Sutherland Asbill & Brennan LLP. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13460 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Brand Hosford in Connection with the Motion of the Debtors Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 9019(b) for Authorization and Approval of the Settlement Between Lehman Brothers Financial Products Inc., Madison Avenue Structured Finance CDO I Ltd., Madison Avenue Structured Finance CDO I, Corp., Metlife Investment Advisors Company LLC, and U.S. Bank National Association (related document(s) 12996 ) filed by James M. Heiser on behalf of US Bank, National Association, as Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Certificate of Service) (Heiser, James) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13459 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Amy Byrnes in Connection With the Motion Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 9019 for Approval of the Termination and Settlement of Certain Prepetition Derivatives Contracts with Trusts for Which U.S. Bank National Association Serves as Indenture Trustee and Related Relief (related document(s) 12786 ) filed by James M. Heiser on behalf of US Bank, National Association, as Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Certificate of Service) (Heiser, James) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13458 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on December 15, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Harvey R. Miller on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/15/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Miller, Harvey) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13457 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration of Jeffrey Fitts in Support of Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Sections 105(a), 363 and 365 of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 9019 for Approval of Settlement Agreement Between LB Somerset LLC, LB Preferred Somerset LLC, KBIA Somerset Investments, LLC, KBIA Preferred, LLC, Falls of Neuse Investments, LLC, Somerset Properties SPE, LLC, Somerset Associates, LLC, and Kevin Wilk (related document(s) 12439 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13456 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Second Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Second Interim Application of Momo-o, Matsuo & Namba, as 327(e) Special Counsel to the Debtors and Debtors in Possession, for Allowance and Payment of Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from June 1, 2010 to September 30, 2010 for Momo-o, Matsuo & Namba, Other Professional, period: 6/1/2010 to 9/30/2010, fee:$87,156.82, expenses: $700.46. filed by Momo-o, Matsuo & Namba. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13455 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Sixth Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Sixth Interim Application of Jones Day, Special Counsel to the Debtors and Debtors in Possession, Seeking Allowance and Payment of Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses for the Period From June 1, 2010 Through September 30, 2010 for Jones Day, Special Counsel, period: 6/1/2010 to 9/30/2010, fee:$11570294.70, expenses: $369641.54. filed by Jones Day. (Barr, Ross) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13454 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Stipulation, Agreement, and Order signed on 12/14/2010 Between Lehman Commercial Paper Inc. and Citibank N.A. Providing for Limited Relief from the Automatic Stay with Respect to Certain Foreign Exchange Hedging Transactions. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13453 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service of ADR Objection (related document(s) 13311 ) filed by Mark N. Berman on behalf of Wellington Management Company, LLP. (Berman, Mark) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13452 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Stipulation, Agreement, and Order signed on 12/14/2010 Between the Debtors and the Internal Revenue Service. (related document(s) 13161 ) (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13451 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Sixth Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Sixth Application of Bortstein Legal LLC, Special Counsel to the Debtors and Debtors in Possession, for Interim Allowance of Compensation for Bortstein Legal LLC, Other Professional, period: 6/1/2010 to 9/30/2010, fee:$241,890.00, expenses: $0. filed by Bortstein Legal LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13450 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement of No Objection : Debtors' Certificate of No Objection Under 28 U.S.C. § 1746 Regarding Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Section 363(b) of the Bankruptcy Code for Authorization to Enter into and Perform Under a Services Agreement with Lehman Europe (related document(s) 12994 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13449 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Sixth Application for Interim Professional Compensation for McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP, Special Counsel, period: 6/1/2010 to 9/30/2010, fee:$460318.50, expenses: $25608.10. filed by Christopher F. Graham. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E1# 6 Exhibit E2# 7 Exhibit E3# 8 Exhibit E4# 9 Exhibit F) (Graham, Christopher) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13448 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal of Limited Objection of Liquidators of Lehman Brothers Australia Limited to Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Rule 9019 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for Approval of a Settlement Among Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc., BNY Corporate Trustee Services Limited, Perpetual Trustee Company Limited, and Others, Relating to Certain Swap Transactions with Saphir Finance Public Limited Company (related document(s) 13051 , 13309 ) filed by James H.M. Sprayregen on behalf of Liquidators of Lehman Brothers Australia Limited. (Sprayregen, James) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13447 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Sixth Application for Interim Professional Compensation for Bingham McCutchen LLP (Successor in Interest to McKee Nelson LLP), Special Counsel, period: 6/1/2010 to 9/30/2010, fee:$2,042,918.90, expenses: $188,198.37. filed by Bingham McCutchen LLP (Successor in Interest to McKee Nelson LLP). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit C1# 5 Exhibit C2# 6 Exhibit C3# 7 Exhibit C4# 8 Exhibit D) (Greer, Stefanie) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13446 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Adversary case 10-05428. Complaint against Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., Alvarez & Marsal, Robert Hershan . Nature(s) of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)), (91 (Declaratory judgment)) Filed by Avrum J. Rosen, Wendy M Uvino, Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. on behalf of Wendy M Uvino. (Rosen, Avrum) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13445 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 13442 ) filed by Christopher M. Desiderio on behalf of DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS. (Desiderio, Christopher) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13444 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Withdrawal of Claim(s): of Erhard Thoemel Regarding Claim No. 24985 filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13443 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Withdrawal of Claim(s): of Herbert and Christiane Sickmuller Regarding Claim Nos. 12430 and 57820 filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13442 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement of Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company Relative to Debtors' Motion for Authorization, Pursuant to Sections 363 and 365 of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 6006, to Assume and Assign Interest Rate Swap Agreements with Certain Trust Counterparties, Including Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Indenture Trustee, and to Enter into New Interest Rate Swap Agreements filed by Lori R. Fife on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. (related document(s) 12706 ) filed by Christopher M. Desiderio on behalf of DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS. (Desiderio, Christopher) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13441 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Proposed Order : Notice of Filing of Revised Order Authorizing LBSF and LBFP, Pursuant to Sections 363 and 365 of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 6006, to Assume and Assign Interest Rate Swap Agreements with Certain Trust Counterparties, Including Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Indenture Trustee, and to Enter into New Interest Rate Swap Agreements (related document(s) 12706 ) filed by Lori R. Fife on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Fife, Lori) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13440 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing : Notice of Status Report on Plan Process filed by Lori R. Fife on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 1/13/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Fife, Lori) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13439 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP /Partial Transfer of Claim/ Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Satellite Credit Opportunities Fund, Ltd.(Claim No.331360, Amount 128,000). To PMT Credit Opportunities Fund Ltd.,. filed by Timothy Bennett on behalf of PMT Credit Opportunities Fund Ltd..(Bennett, Timothy) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13438 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.58806, Amount 25,000.00). To Varde Investment Partners, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Varde Investment Partners, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13437 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.58806, Amount 12,000.00). To Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13436 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.58806, Amount 76,000.00). To The Varde Fund X (Master), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund X (Master) L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13435 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP /Partial Transfer of Claim/ Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Satellite Credit Opportunities Fund, Ltd.(Claim No.33160, Amount 1,572,000). To Ore Hill Hub Fund Ltd.. filed by Timothy Bennett on behalf of Ore Hill Hub Fund Ltd..(Bennett, Timothy) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13434 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.58806, Amount 11,000.00). To The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13433 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.58806, Amount 82,000.00). To The Varde Fund IX, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13432 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.58806, Amount 20,000.00). To The Varde Fund VIII, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund VIII, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13431 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.58806, Amount 3,000.00). To The Varde Fund V-B, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund V-B, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13430 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.58806, Amount 11,000.00). To The Varde Fund, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
13429 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13271 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13428 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13291 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13427 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13296 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13426 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.58822, Amount 130,869.91). To The Varde Fund VIII, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund VIII, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13425 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.58822, Amount 16,422.89). To The Varde Fund V-B, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund V-B, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13424 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors in Connection with Motion of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. and Lehman Commercial Paper, Inc. Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 9019(a) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for Authority to Enter into Settlement Agreement with Respect to Heritage Fields Property and Consummate Transactions in Connection Therewith (related document(s) 12997 ) filed by Dennis F. Dunne on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Dunne, Dennis) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13423 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.58822, Amount 73,646.40). To The Varde Fund, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13422 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.58822, Amount 161,277.92). To Varde Investment Partners, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Varde Investment Partners, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13421 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.58822, Amount 75,057.74). To Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13420 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.58822, Amount 486,784.74). To The Varde Fund X (Master), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund X (Master) L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13419 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.58822, Amount 68,001.03). To The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13418 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.58822, Amount 527,585.36). To The Varde Fund IX, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13417 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement /Fifth Omnibus Notice of Resolution of Objections Relating to the Assumption and Assignment of Purchased Contracts, Dated December 13, 2010 (related document(s) 628 , 258 ) filed by Lindsee Paige Granfield on behalf of Barclays Capital, Inc.. (Granfield, Lindsee) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13416 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.46193, Amount 46,443.83). To Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13415 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:Valiant Privatbank AG(Claim No. 39101); Valiant Privatbank AG(Claim No. 39102). To Nomura International plc. filed by Douglas P. Bartner on behalf of Nomura International plc.(Bartner, Douglas) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13414 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.46193, Amount 300,965.84). To The Varde Fund X (Master), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund X (Master) L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13413 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement / Joinder of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors in Debtors' Response to Motion of Prudence Waltz for Relief from Stay and an Order Directing the Abandonment of Claims Against the Real Property Commonly Known as 844-846 West 57th Street, Los Angeles, California (related document(s) 13384 ) filed by Dennis F. Dunne on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Dunne, Dennis) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13412 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.46193, Amount 42,076.10). To The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13411 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.46193, Amount 326,158.44). To The Varde Fund IX, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13410 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.46193, Amount 80,911.93). To The Varde Fund VIII, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund VIII, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13409 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.46193, Amount 10,109.25). To The Varde Fund V-B, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund V-B, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13408 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration of Jeffrey Fitts in Support of Motion of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. and Lehman Commercial Paper, Inc. Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 9019(a) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for Authority to Enter into Settlement Agreement with Respect to Heritage Fields Property and to Consummate Transactions in Connection Therewith (related document(s) 12997 ) filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Perez, Alfredo) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13407 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.46193, Amount 45,553.23). To The Varde Fund, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13406 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.46193, Amount 99,680.84). To Varde Investment Partners, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Varde Investment Partners, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13405 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors in Support of Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Section 363(b) of the Bankruptcy Code For Authorization to Enter Into and Perform Under a Services Agreement With Lehman Europe (related document(s) 12994 ) filed by Dennis F. Dunne on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. with hearing to be held on 12/15/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Dunne, Dennis) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13404 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors in Support of the Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Sections 105(a), 363 and 365 of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 9019 For Approval of Settlement Agreement Between LB Somerset LLC, LB Preferred Somerset LLC, KBIA Somerset Investments, LLC, KBIA Preferred, LLC, Falls of Neuse Investments, LLC, Somerset Properties SPE, LLC, Somerset Associates, LLC, and Kevin Wilk (related document(s) 12439 ) filed by Dennis F. Dunne on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. with hearing to be held on 12/15/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Dunne, Dennis) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13403 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration of Jeffrey Fitts in Support of Motion of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. and Lehman Commercial Paper, Inc. Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 9019(a) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for Authority to Enter into Settlement Agreement with Respect to Heritage Fields Property and to Consummate Transactions in Connection Therewith (related document(s) 10516 ) filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Perez, Alfredo) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13402 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion /Response of Nexstar Developing Opportunities Master Fund, Ltd. to Debtors' Sixty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) (related document(s) 12533 ) filed by Ronald L. Cohen on behalf of Nexstar Developing Opportunities Master Fund, Ltd.. (Cohen, Ronald) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13401 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response : Debtors' Reply to Objections to the Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Rule 9019 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for Approval of a Settlement Among Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc., BNY Corporate Trustee Services Limited, Perpetual Trustee Company Limited, and Others, Relating to Certain Swap Transactions with Saphir Finance Public Limited Company (related document(s) 13051 ) filed by Jacqueline Marcus on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Marcus, Jacqueline) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13400 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and General Order M-390 for Authorization to Implement Alternative Dispute Resolution Procedures for Affirmative Claims of the Debtors Under Derivatives Transactions with Special Purpose Vehicle Counterparties (related document(s) 13009 ) filed by Richard W. Slack on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 1/13/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Slack, Richard) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13399 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Clarium L.P. c/o Clarium Capital Management, LLC(Claim No.67001, Amount 1,674,171.53). To Longacre Institutional Opportunity Fund, L.P.. filed by Longacre Institutional Opportunity Fund, L.P..(Skowronski, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13398 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Clarium L.P. c/o Clarium Capital Management, LLC(Claim No.67000, Amount 1,674,171.53). To Longacre Institutional Opportunity Fund, L.P.. filed by Longacre Institutional Opportunity Fund, L.P..(Skowronski, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13371 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Third Interim Fee Application of The O'Neil Group, LLC for Allowance of Compensation for Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of Expenses as Tax Services Providers to the Debtors and Debtors-In-Possession for the Period from June 1, 2010 to September 30, 2010 for The O'Neil Group, LLC, Other Professional, period: 6/1/2010 to 9/30/2010, fee:$886,566.50, expenses: $64,251.10. filed by The O'Neil Group, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13370 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.46185, Amount 39,610.64). To The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13369 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.46185, Amount 307,075.06). To The Varde Fund IX, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13368 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.46185, Amount 76,182.35). To The Varde Fund VIII, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund VIII, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13367 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion for Authorization to Implement Alternative Dispute Resolution Procedures for Affirmative Claims of the Debtors Under Derivatives Transactions with Special Purpose Vehicle Counterparties (related document(s) 13009 ) filed by Michael G. Burke on behalf of Principal Global Investors (Europe) and Prinicipal Global Investors, LLC. with hearing to be held on 12/15/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Burke, Michael) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13366 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.46185, Amount 9,525.17). To The Varde Fund V-B, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund V-B, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13365 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.46185, Amount 50,246.92). To The Varde Fund, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13364 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.46185, Amount 43,722.70). To Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13363 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.46185, Amount 93,855.66). To Varde Investment Partners, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Varde Investment Partners, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13362 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.46185, Amount 332,013.34). To The Varde Fund X (Master), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund X (Master) L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13361 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Seventh Declaration Seventh Supplemental Declaration of Rajiv Madan on Behalf of Bingham McCutchen filed by Stefanie Birbrower Greer on behalf of Bingham McCutchen LLP (Successor in Interest to McKee Nelson LLP). (Greer, Stefanie) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13360 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP /Notice of Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Westley Capital Master Fund, Ltd.(Claim No.19679, Amount 2,178,221.60); Westley Capital, LP(Claim No.19680, Amount 373,182.03); Wesley Capital QP, LP(Claim No.19689, Amount 1,235,695.48). To TPG Credit Strategies Fund, L.P.. filed by Timothy Bennett on behalf of TPG Credit Strategies Fund, L.P..(Bennett, Timothy) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13359 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.46194, Amount 97,057.27). To Varde Investment Partners, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Varde Investment Partners, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13358 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.46194, Amount 45,219.31). To Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13357 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.46194, Amount 343,350.94). To The Varde Fund X (Master), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund X (Master) L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13356 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.46194, Amount 40,969.34). To The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13355 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.46194, Amount 317,558.68). To The Varde Fund IX, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13354 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.46194, Amount 78,780.44). To The Varde Fund VIII, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund VIII, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13353 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.46194, Amount 9,845.12). To The Varde Fund V-B, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund V-B, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13352 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.46194, Amount 51,964.68). To The Varde Fund, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13351 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.46192, Amount 81,330.64). To The Varde Fund VIII, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund VIII, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13350 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.46192, Amount 327,855.46). To The Varde Fund IX, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13349 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.46192, Amount 42,294.99). To The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13348 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.46192, Amount 45,793.29). To The Varde Fund, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13347 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.46192, Amount 302,535.82). To The Varde Fund X (Master), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund X (Master) L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13346 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.46192, Amount 100,208.06). To Varde Investment Partners, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Varde Investment Partners, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13345 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.46192, Amount 10,169.91). To The Varde Fund V-B, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund V-B, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13344 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.46192, Amount 46,682.20). To Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13343 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection /Limited Objection of Bank of America, National Association Successor by Merger to LaSalle Bank National Association, Solely in its Capacity as Trustee under Certain Pooling and Servicing Agreements to the Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and General Order M-390 for Authorization to Implement Alternative Dispute Resolution Procedures for Affirmative Claims of the Debtors under Derivatives Transactions with Special Purpose Vehicle Counterparties (related document(s) 13009 ) filed by Michael E. Johnson on behalf of Bank of America, National Association successor by merger to LaSalle Bank National Association, in its capacity as the Libra Trustee. (Johnson, Michael) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13342 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:J.P. Morgan Securities LLC(Claim No.59202, Amount 1,000,000.00). To Serengeti Rapax MM L.P.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Serengeti Rapax MM L.P..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13341 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Illiquidx Ltd(Claim No.62783, Amount 410,501.59); Illiquidx Ltd(Claim No.62783, Amount 607,775.15); Illiquidx Ltd(Claim No.62783, Amount 607,775.15). To The Varde Fund X (Master), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund X (Master) L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13340 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Illiquidx Ltd(Claim No.62783, Amount 192,362.50); Illiquidx Ltd(Claim No.62783, Amount 284,805.60); Illiquidx Ltd(Claim No.62783, Amount 284,805.60). To The Varde Fund VIII, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund VIII, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13339 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Illiquidx Ltd(Claim No.62783, Amount 108,300.08); Illiquidx Ltd(Claim No.62783, Amount 160,345.55); Illiquidx Ltd(Claim No.62783, Amount 160,345.55). To Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13338 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Illiquidx Ltd(Claim No.62783, Amount 106,953.55); Illiquidx Ltd(Claim No.62783, Amount 158,351.91); Illiquidx Ltd(Claim No.62783, Amount 158,351.91). To The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13337 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Illiquidx Ltd(Claim No.62783, Amount 811,192.66); Illiquidx Ltd(Claim No.62783, Amount 1,201,025.22); Illiquidx Ltd(Claim No.62783, Amount 1,201,025.22). To The Varde Fund IX, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13336 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Illiquidx Ltd(Claim No.62783, Amount 231,796.81); Illiquidx Ltd(Claim No.62783, Amount 343,190.75); Illiquidx Ltd(Claim No.62783, Amount 343,190.75). To Varde Investment Partners, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Varde Investment Partners, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13335 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Illiquidx Ltd(Claim No.62783, Amount 62,517.81); Illiquidx Ltd(Claim No.62783, Amount 92,561.82); Illiquidx Ltd(Claim No.62783, Amount 92,561.82). To The Varde Fund, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13334 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing (related document(s) 11513 ) filed by Joshua W. Cohen on behalf of Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. with hearing to be held on 1/13/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 1/6/2011, (Cohen, Joshua) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13333 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:York Capital Management, L.P.(Claim No.055530, Amount 2,434,120.85). To Jorvik Multi-Strategy Master Fund, L.P.. filed by Thomas T. Janover on behalf of Jorvik Multi-Strategy Master Fund, L.P..(Janover, Thomas) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13332 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:York Investment Master Fund, L.P.(Claim No.055540, Amount 113,909,543.21). To York Multi-Strategy Master Fund, L.P.. filed by Thomas T. Janover on behalf of York Multi-Strategy Master Fund, L.P..(Janover, Thomas) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13331 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:York Investment Master Fund, L.P.(Claim No.055540, Amount 11,461,443.21). To Jorvik Multi-Strategy Master Fund, L.P.. filed by Thomas T. Janover on behalf of Jorvik Multi-Strategy Master Fund, L.P..(Janover, Thomas) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13330 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:York Credit Opportunities Master Fund, L.P.(Claim No.55534, Amount 4,674,055.81). To York Credit Opportunities Fund, L.P.. filed by Thomas T. Janover on behalf of York Credit Opportunities Fund, L.P..(Janover, Thomas) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13271 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) : Debtors' Seventy-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Amended and Superseded Claims) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 1/20/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Responses due by 1/5/2011, (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13270 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service filed by Ira A. Reid on behalf of Pentwater Growth Fund Ltd.. (Reid, Ira) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13269 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service filed by Ira A. Reid on behalf of E-Capital Profits Limited. (Reid, Ira) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13268 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service filed by Ira A. Reid on behalf of Lincore Limited. (Reid, Ira) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13267 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 13247 ) filed by Brian Trust on behalf of National Bank of Canada. (Trust, Brian) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13266 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13160 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13265 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion and Resistance to Objection to Claim (related document(s) 12530 ) filed by Stephen P Wing on behalf of Charles L. Kuykendall. (Wing, Stephen) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13264 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13076 , 13077 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13263 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13107 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13262 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13112 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13261 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13111 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13260 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Samuel Garcia of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13105 , 13106 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13259 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13161 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13258 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13109 , 13110 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13257 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.38512, Amount 97,029.08). To The Varde Fund IX, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13256 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.38512, Amount 24,151.34). To The Varde Fund VIII, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund VIII, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13255 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13080 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13254 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.38512, Amount 11,440.00). To The Varde Fund, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13253 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.38512, Amount 29,659.54). To Varde Investment Partners, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Varde Investment Partners, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13252 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.38512, Amount 12,570.00). To The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13251 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.38512, Amount 2,965.95). To The Varde Fund V-B, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund V-B, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13250 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.38512, Amount 75,984.93). To The Varde Fund X (Master), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund X (Master) L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13249 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.38512, Amount 13,841.12). To Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13248 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.38516, Amount 4,190.00). To The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13247 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response Of National Bank Of Canada To Debtors' Sixty-Seventh Omnibus Objection To Claims (Valued Derivatives Claims) (related document(s) 12533 ) filed by Brian Trust on behalf of National Bank of Canada. (Trust, Brian) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13246 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.38516, Amount 988.65). To The Varde Fund V-B, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund V-B, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
13245 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Legg Mason Western Asset US Core Plus Bond Fund(Amount 79,404.85).. To Western Asset US Core Plus Bond Fund. filed by Western Asset US Core Plus Bond Fund.(White, Greg) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13244 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.38516, Amount 25,328.31). To The Varde Fund X (Master), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund X (Master) L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13243 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.38516, Amount 4,613.71). To Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13242 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion (related document(s) 12533 ) filed by Richard C. Tisdale on behalf of Commonwealth Bank of Australia. with hearing to be held on 12/22/2010 (check with court for location) (Tisdale, Richard) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13241 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.38516, Amount 32,343.02). To The Varde Fund IX, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13240 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.38516, Amount 8,050.45). To The Varde Fund VIII, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund VIII, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13239 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance filed by Richard C. Tisdale on behalf of Commonwealth Bank of Australia. (Tisdale, Richard) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13238 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.38516, Amount 3,813.37). To The Varde Fund, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13237 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 13226 ) filed by Joshua Dorchak on behalf of ICM Business Trust. (Dorchak, Joshua) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13236 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.38516, Amount 9,886.51). To Varde Investment Partners, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Varde Investment Partners, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13235 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:IlliquidX Ltd.(Claim No.60348, Amount 212,625.00); IlliquidX Ltd.(Claim No.60349, Amount 141,750.00); IlliquidX Ltd.(Claim No.60350, Amount 191,362.50); IlliquidX Ltd.(Claim No.60351, Amount 70,845.00); IlliquidX Ltd.(Claim No.60353, Amount 3,047,625.00). To JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. filed by Howard J. Grossman on behalf of JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A..(Grossman, Howard) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13234 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:IlliquidX Ltd.(Claim No.48858, Amount 1,420,000.00); IlliquidX Ltd.(Claim No.48859, Amount 1,420,000.00). To JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. filed by Howard J. Grossman on behalf of JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A..(Grossman, Howard) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13233 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement / Notice of Filing Designated Deposition Testimony and Exhibit Chart filed by Jonathan D. Schiller on behalf of Barclays Capital, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K) (Schiller, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13232 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion /Notice of ROSS FINANCIAL CORPORATION To The Debtors' Sixty-Seventh Omnibus Objection To Claims (related document(s) 12533 ) filed by Michael E. Wiles on behalf of Ross Financial Corporation. (Wiles, Michael) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13231 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Rashida J. Adams (related document(s) 13196 ) filed by Abraham L. Zylberberg on behalf of Pohjola Bank plc. (Zylberberg, Abraham) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13230 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) : Debtors' Seventy-First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 1/20/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Responses due by 1/5/2011, (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13229 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response of Merrill Lynch Credit Products LLC to Debtors' Sixty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) (related document(s) 12533 ) filed by Juliana P. Oliveira on behalf of Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC. (Oliveira, Juliana) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13228 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing On Motion Of Cascade Investment, L.L.C. For Leave To Conduct Discovery Of (1) The Debtors, And (2) JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Bankruptcy Procedure 2004 filed by David B. Shemano on behalf of Cascade Investment, L.L.C.. with hearing to be held on 1/13/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Shemano, David) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13227 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response and Reservation of Rights of Canyon Balanced Master Fund, Ltd, Canyon Capital Arbitrage Master Fund, Ltd., Canyon Value Realization Fund (Cayman), Ltd., and Canyon Value Realization Fund, L.P., to the Debtors' Sixty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s) 12533 ) filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of Canyon Capital Advisors LLC. with hearing to be held on 12/22/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13226 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response of ICM Business Trust to Debtors' Sixty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) (related document(s) 12533 ) filed by Joshua Dorchak on behalf of ICM Business Trust. (Dorchak, Joshua) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13225 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 13220 ) filed by William S. Sugden on behalf of Aozora Bank, Ltd.. (Sugden, William) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13224 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion /Response to Debtors' Sixty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) (related document(s) 12533 ) filed by David Neier on behalf of Mariner-Tricadia Credit Strategies Master Fund Ltd.. (Neier, David) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13223 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion /Response to Debtors' Sixty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) (related document(s) 12533 ) filed by David Neier on behalf of Tricadia Capital Management, LLC. (Neier, David) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13222 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion /Response to Debtors' Sixty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) (related document(s) 12533 ) filed by David Neier on behalf of Mariner Investment Group, LLC. (Neier, David) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13221 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC(Claim No.3584, Amount 228,880,046.91). To BEINT, LLC. filed by Edward P. Grosz on behalf of BEINT, LLC.(Grosz, Edward) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13220 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response of Aozora Bank, Ltd. to the Debtors' Sixty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) (related document(s) 12533 ) filed by William S. Sugden on behalf of Aozora Bank, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (Sugden, William) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13219 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Motion By Factiva, Inc., Factiva Limited and Dow Jones & Company, Inc. for an Order (a) Compelling Immediate Payment of Post-Petition Administrative Expense Claims and (b) Compelling the Debtors to Assume or Reject Executory Contracts or Alternatively Modifying the Automatic Stay to Permit Movants to Terminate the Executory Contracts (related document(s) 7102 ) filed by Ira M. Levee on behalf of Factivia, Inc., Factiva Limited and Dow Jones & Company, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 1/13/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Service)(Levee, Ira) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13218 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion Response of SPCP Group LLC, as Agent for Silver Point Capital Fund, LP and Silver Point Capital Offshore Fund, Ltd, as Successor to Certain Claims of Alliance Laundry Systems LLC, to Debtors' Sixty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) (related document(s) 12533 ) filed by Herbert K. Ryder on behalf of SPCP Group, L.L.C., as Agent for Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P. and Silver Point Capital Offshore Fund, Ltd.. Objections due by 12/6/2010, (Ryder, Herbert) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13217 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion : Omnibus Response of Loeb Claimants to Debtors' Sixty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) (related document(s) 12533 ) filed by Claude Szyfer on behalf of Loeb Offshore B Fund Ltd., Loeb Offshore Fund Ltd., Loeb Arbitrage B Fund LP, Loeb Arbitrage Fund. (Szyfer, Claude) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13216 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:LYXOR ASSET MANAGEMENT S.A.(Claim No. 19116). To CONTRARIAN FUNDS, LLC. filed by Alisa Mumola on behalf of Contrarian Funds, LLC.(Mumola, Alisa) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13215 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:LYXOR ASSET MANAGEMENT S.A.(Claim No. 19127). To CONTRARIAN FUNDS, LLC. filed by Alisa Mumola on behalf of Contrarian Funds, LLC.(Mumola, Alisa) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13214 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection Debtors' Sixty-Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Supporting Documentation Claims), In re: Claim No. 23913 (related document(s) 12530 ) filed by Daniel S. Klonsky. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13213 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:H/2 Targeted Return Strategies I Master Fund LP(Claim No.67169, Amount 2,648,778.10); H/2 Targeted Return Strategies I Master Fund LP(Claim No.67170, Amount 2,648,778.00); H/2 Credit Partners Master Fund Ltd.(Claim No.20270, Amount 21,513,211.00); H/2 Credit Partners Master Fund Ltd.(Claim No.20272, Amount 21,513,211.00); H/2 Credit Partners Master Fund Ltd.(Claim No.67171, Amount 18,603,338.13); H/2 Credit Partners Master Fund Ltd.(Claim No.67172, Amount 18,603,338.13). To Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch. filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch.(Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13212 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:H/2 Special Opportunities Ltd.(Claim No.67167, Amount 81,868.00); H/2 Special Opportunities Ltd.(Claim No.67168, Amount 81,868.00); H/2 Special Opportunities Ltd.(Claim No.20267, Amount 113,514.00); H/2 Special Opportunities Ltd.(Claim No.20268, Amount 113,514.00); H/2 Targeted Return Strategies I Master Fund LP(Claim No.20265, Amount 2,806,877.00); H/2 Targeted Return Strategies I Master Fund LP(Claim No.20266, Amount 2,806,877.00). To Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch. filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch.(Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13176 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 12/2/2010 Admitting Michael Dunn to Practice Pro Hac Vice in this Court. (Related Doc # 13128 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13175 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation, Agreement, and Order Between Lehman Commercial Paper Inc. and Citibank N.A. Providing for Limited Relief from the Automatic Stay with Respect to Certain Foreign Exchange Hedging Transactions filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with presentment to be held on 12/9/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 12/8/2010, (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13174 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank Luxembourg S.A.(Claim No.46939, Amount 14,243,000.00). To Goldman, Sachs & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13173 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Withdrawal of Claim(s): Nos. 27348, and 27551 Filed on September 22, 2009. filed by Hugh F. Hill IV on behalf of Poenix Life Limited.(Epps, Juanita) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13172 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Manners of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13009 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2)(Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13171 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:THE LANDINGS ON MILLENIA BLVD PARTNERS LTD(Claim No.5710, Amount 35,000.00). To LIQUIDITY SOLUTIONS, INC. filed by Norman David Schoenfeld on behalf of Liquidity Solutions, Inc..(Schoenfeld, Norman) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13170 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:ESSEX WANDERING CREEK LLC(Claim No.57739, Amount 5,600.00). To LIQUIDITY SOLUTIONS, INC.. filed by Norman David Schoenfeld on behalf of Liquidity Solutions, Inc..(Schoenfeld, Norman) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13169 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:ESSEX INGLENOOK COURT LLC(Claim No.57738, Amount 8,800.00). To LIQUIDITY SOLUTIONS, INC. filed by Norman David Schoenfeld on behalf of Liquidity Solutions, Inc..(Schoenfeld, Norman) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13168 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13076 , 13077 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13167 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:ESSEX FOUNTAIN PARK APTS LP(Claim No.57737, Amount 44,800.00). To LIQUIDITY SOLUTIONS, INC.. filed by Norman David Schoenfeld on behalf of Liquidity Solutions, Inc..(Schoenfeld, Norman) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13166 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion Response by E-Capital Profits Limited to Debtors' Sixty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) (related document(s) 12533 ) filed by Ira A. Reid on behalf of E-Capital Profits Limited. with hearing to be held on 12/22/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 12/6/2010, (Reid, Ira) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13165 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:UNIVERSITY CLUB PARTNERS, LTD(Claim No.5711, Amount 24,000.00). To LIQUIDITY SOLUTIONS, INC.. filed by Norman David Schoenfeld on behalf of Liquidity Solutions, Inc..(Schoenfeld, Norman) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13164 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 12/2/2010 Granting Debtors' Sixty-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims). (Related Doc # 11978 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13163 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 12/2/2010 Granting Debtors' Fifty-Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Duplicative of Indenture Trustee Claims). (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13162 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Volksbank Granz-Bruck e. Gen.(Claim No. 58678). To Osterreichische Volksbanken-Aktiengesellschaft. filed by Thomas R. Califano on behalf of Osterreichische Volksbanken-Aktiengeselleschaft.(Califano, Thomas) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13161 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation, Agreement, and Order Between the Debtors and the Internal Revenue Service filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with presentment to be held on 12/8/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 12/7/2010, (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13160 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement : Notice of Filing of Settlement Agreement Related to Motion of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. and Lehman Commercial Paper, Inc. Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 9019(a) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for Authority to Enter into Settlement Agreement with Respect to Heritage Fields Property and to Consummate Transactions in Connection Therewith (related document(s) 12997 ) filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Perez, Alfredo) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13159 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Samuel Garcia of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 12996 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13158 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Regions Bank(Claim No.1121, Amount 17,349,437.00). To Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC. filed by Thomas T. Janover on behalf of Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC.(Janover, Thomas) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13157 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Samuel Garcia of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 12996 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13156 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion (related document(s) 12533 ) filed by Gregory M. Bentz on behalf of Fed. Home Loan Bank-Des Moines. (Bentz, Gregory) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13155 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.(Claim No.66833, Amount 18,000,000.00). To Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC. filed by Thomas T. Janover on behalf of Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC.(Janover, Thomas) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13154 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Banc of America Securities LLC(Claim No.63135, Amount 381,009.63). To Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13153 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Banc of America Securities LLC(Claim No.59415, Amount 2,110,542.46). To Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13152 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Banc of America Securities LLC(Claim No.63111, Amount 728,174.53). To Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13151 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Banc of America Securities LLC(Claim No.63124, Amount 232,127.00). To Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13150 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Banc of America Securities LLC(Claim No.63124, Amount 621,888.89). To OCM Opportunities Fund VIIb, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of OCM Opportunities Fund VIIb, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13149 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Withdrawal of Claim(s): No. 8864 of James Sokol filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Malo, David) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13148 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 13113 ) filed by Claude Szyfer on behalf of Mitsui & Co. Commodity Risk Management Limited. (Szyfer, Claude) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13147 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Bank of America Securities LLC(Claim No.63111, Amount 1,950,844.38). To OCM Opportunities Fund VIIb, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of OCM Opportunities Fund VIIb, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13146 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Banc of America Securities LLC(Claim No.59415, Amount 5,654,331.15). To OCM Opportunities Fund VIIb, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of OCM Opportunities Fund VIIb, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13145 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 12/1/2010 Granting Debtors' Sixtieth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Duplicative of Indenture Trustee Claims). (Related Doc # 11970 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13144 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 12/1/2010 Granting Debtors Sixty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Settled Derivative Claims). (Related Doc # 11975 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13143 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Banc of America Securities LLC(Claim No.63135, Amount 1,020,758.71). To OCM Opportunities Fund VIIb, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of OCM Opportunities Fund VIIb, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13142 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 12/1/2010 Authorizing the Debtors to Sell Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.'s Interest in a Note and its Equity in Libro Companhia Securitizadora de Creditos Financeiros. (Related Doc # 12586 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13141 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Radcliffe SPC, Ltd.(Claim No.19467, Amount 6,942,706.16). To Stonehill Master Fund, Ltd.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Stonehill Master Fund Ltd..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13140 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 12/1/2010 Granting Debtors' Sixty-First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Duplicative of Indenture Trustee Claims). (Related Doc # 11972 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13139 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Stephen P Wing on behalf of Charles L. Kuykendall. (Attachments: # 1 Pleading Proposed Order) (Wing, Stephen) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13138 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 12/1/2010 Granting Debtors' Fifty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Amended and Superseded Claims). (Related Doc # 11941 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13137 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Banc of America Securities LLC(Claim No.63135, Amount 122,112.40). To OCM Opportunities Fund VIIb (Parallel), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of OCM Opportunities Fund VIIb (Parallel), L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13136 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 12/1/2010 Denying Motion of Lawrence Fogarazzo, et al., for Relief from the Automatic Stay to Allow Advancement Under Insurance Policies by Lloyd's of London. (Related Doc # 10279 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13135 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Banc of America Securities(Claim No.59415, Amount 676,422.31). To OCM Opportunities Fund VIIb (Parallel),L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of OCM Opportunities Fund VIIb (Parallel), L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13134 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Banc of America Securities LLC(Claim No.63111, Amount 233,377.67). To OCM Opportunities Fund VIIb (Parallel), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of OCM Opportunities Fund VIIb (Parallel), L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13133 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Banc of America Securities LLC(Claim No.63124, Amount 74,395.98). To OCM Opportunities Fund VIIb (Parallel), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of OCM Opportunities Fund VIIb (Parallel), L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13132 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Banc of America Securities LLC(Claim No.63135, Amount 1,367,059.39). To Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13131 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Banc of America Securities LLC(Claim No.59415, Amount 7,572,608.88). To Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13130 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Banc of America Securities LLC(Claim No.63111, Amount 2,612,684.17). To Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13129 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Banc of America Securities LLC(Claim No.63124, Amount 832,869.74). To Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13128 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Michael Dunn on behalf of Caja De Credito De Los Ingenieros, SCC. Filing fee collected, receipt #FEEDUE. (Porter, Minnie) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13127 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Banc of America Securities LLC(Claim No.63135, Amount 63,422.72). To Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII (Parallel 2), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII (Parallel 2), L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13126 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Banc of America Securities LLC(Claim No.59415, Amount 351,320.11). To Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII (Parallel 2), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII (Parallel 2), L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13125 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Banc of America Securities LLC(Claim No.63111, Amount 121,211.66). To Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII (Parallel 2), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII (Parallel 2), L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13124 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Banc of America Securities LLC(Claim No.63124, Amount 38,639.77). To Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII (Parallel 2), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII (Parallel 2), L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13123 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Banc of America Securities LLC(Claim No.59415, Amount 1,220,881.09). To Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII (Parallel), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII (Parallel), L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13122 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Banc of America Securities LLC(Claim No.63111, Amount 421,225.59). To Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII (Parallel), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII (Parallel), L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13121 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Banc of America Securities LLC(Claim No.63124, Amount 134,278.02). To Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII (Parallel), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII (Parallel), L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13120 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Banc of America Securities LLC(Claim No.63135, Amount 220,401.84). To Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII (Parallel), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII (Parallel), L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13119 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.66655, Amount 7,500,000.00). To Jade Tree I, L.L.C.. filed by Scott L. Esbin on behalf of Jade Tree I, L.L.C..(Esbin, Scott) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13118 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.66653, Amount 7,500,000.00). To Jade Tree I, L.L.C.. filed by Scott L. Esbin on behalf of Jade Tree I, L.L.C..(Esbin, Scott) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13117 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion Response by Pentwater Growth Fund Ltd. to Debtors' Sixty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) (related document(s) 12533 ) filed by Ira A. Reid on behalf of Pentwater Growth Fund Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 12/22/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 12/6/2010, (Reid, Ira) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13116 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal of Proof of Claim No.15316 filed by H. Slayton Dabney Jr. on behalf of Owens & Minor, Inc.. (Dabney, H.) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13115 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:ANP Funding I, LLC(Claim No.14175, Amount 5,259,504.83). To The Royal Bank of Scotland plc. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of The Royal Bank of Scotland plc.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13114 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:ANP Funding I, LLC(Claim No.14162, Amount 5,241,381.77). To The Royal Bank of Scotland plc. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of The Royal Bank of Scotland plc.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13113 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion Response of Mitsui & Co. Commodity Risk Management Limited to Debtors Sixty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) (related document(s) 12533 ) filed by Claude Szyfer on behalf of Mitsui & Co. Commodity Risk Management Limited. with hearing to be held on 12/22/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Szyfer, Claude) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13073 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to AllowMotion for Leave to File Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Barclays Capital Inc. in Response to Post-Trial Submissions by the SEC and SIPC filed by Jonathan D. Schiller on behalf of Barclays Capital, Inc.. (Schiller, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13072 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Motion of Claimants Palmyra Capital Fund, L.P., Palmyra Capital Institutional Fund, L.P., and Palmyra Capital Offshore Fund, L.P. to Permit Late Filing of Their Guarantee Claims Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9006(b)(1) (related document(s) 10370 ) filed by Bryan R. Kaplan on behalf of Palmyra Capital Fund, L.P.,, Palmyra Capital Institutional Fund, L.P., Palmyra Capital Offshore Fund, L.P.. with hearing to be held on 6/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 6/23/2011, (Kaplan, Bryan) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
13071 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Adversary case 10-04331. Complaint against Bank of America, National Association, Ceago ABS CDO 2007-1, Ltd., Ceago ABS CDO 2007-1, LLC, Long Island International Ltd. . Nature(s) of Suit: (91 (Declaratory judgment)), (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Michael C. Ledley, William A Maher, Randall Rainer, James N. Lawlor, Paul R. DeFilippo, Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc. on behalf of Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.. (Maher, William) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13070 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13038 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13069 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 12946 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13068 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Samuel Garcia of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 12958 , 12960 , 12953 , 12957 , 12954 , 12959 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13067 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit / Supplemental Affidavit and Disclosure Statement of Joseph Cioffi, on behalf of Davis & Gilbert LLP (related document(s) 2539 ) filed by Richard P. Krasnow on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13066 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP (partial transfer - AUD 3,200,000.00) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No. 67198). To Golden Tree Distressed Debt Master Fund, LP. filed by Jason Sanjana on behalf of GoldenTree Distressed Debt Master Fund, LP.(Sanjana, Jason) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13065 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP (partial transfer - AUD 6,800,000.00) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No. 67198). To GoldenTree Distressed Debt Fund, LP. filed by Jason Sanjana on behalf of GoldenTree Distressed Debt Fund LP.(Sanjana, Jason) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13064 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Withdrawal of Claim(s): of Susan Mary Pike, Claim No. 9135 filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Malo, David) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13063 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to AllowMotion of Edgewood Management LLC for an Order Directing Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. to Release and Return Non-Estate Property filed by Shaya M. Berger on behalf of Edgewood Management LLC. with hearing to be held on 12/15/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 12/8/2010, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Jaeger Affidavit# 2 Exhibit B - E-mails# 3 Exhibit C - E-mails# 4 Notice) (Berger, Shaya) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13062 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation and Order Signed on 11/29/2010 Concerning Official Transcripts and Audio-Recordings of Proceedings. (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13061 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 12899 ) filed by Benjamin Rosenblum on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Rosenblum, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13060 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:Midway Market Neutral International Master Fund(Claim No.26206, Amount 3,034,976); Midway Market Neutral International Master Fund(Claim No.26208, Amount 3,034,976). To JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA. filed by Howard J. Grossman on behalf of JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A..(Grossman, Howard) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13059 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response of Kilroy Realty, L.P. to the Debtors' Sixty - Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) filed by Mark A. Broude on behalf of Kilroy Realty, L.P.. (Broude, Mark) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13058 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Bank of Kaohsiung Offshore Banking Branch(Claim No.46947, Amount $3,062,098.33). To Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch. filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch.(Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13057 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Forest Creek Apartments, LLC(Claim No.9625, Amount $866,445.00). To Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch. filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch.(Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13056 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Landesbank Baden-Wurttemberg(Claim No.67198, Amount AUD 10,000,000). To Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch. filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch.(Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13053 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Merrill Lynch Japan Securities Co., Ltd(Claim No.47888, Amount 954,717.42). To Merrill Lynch International. filed by Merrill Lynch International.(Russell, James) (Entered: 11/26/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13052 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Merrill Lynch Japan Securities Co., Ltd(Claim No.62783, Amount 949,352.00). To Merrill Lynch International. filed by Merrill Lynch International.(Russell, James) (Entered: 11/26/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12997 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Authorize : Motion of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. and Lehman Commercial Paper, Inc. Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 9019(a) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for Authority to Enter into Settlement Agreement with Respect to Heritage Fields Property and to Consummate Transactions in Connection Therewith filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/15/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Responses due by 12/8/2010, (Perez, Alfredo) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12996 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Authorize : Motion of the Debtors Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 9019(b) for Authorization and Approval of the Settlement Between Lehman Brothers Financial Products Inc., Madison Avenue Structured Finance CDO I, Ltd., Madison Avenue Structured Finance CDO I, Corp., Metlife Investment Advisors Company LLC, and U.S. Bank National Association filed by Richard L. Levine on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/15/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Responses due by 12/8/2010, (Levine, Richard) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12995 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit / Fifth Supplemental Affidavit Of Michael Eisenband In Support Of Application For An Order For Retention Of FTI Consulting, Inc. As Financial Advisors For The Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors (related document(s) 1167 ) filed by Dennis O'Donnell on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (O'Donnell, Dennis) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12994 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Authorize : Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Section 363(b) of the Bankruptcy Code for Authorization to Enter into and Perform Under a Services Agreement with Lehman Europe filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/15/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Responses due by 12/8/2010, (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12993 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Debtors' Sixty-Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Supporting Documentation Claims), In re: 5540 (related document(s) 12530 ) filed by Brian J. Loftus. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12992 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter Requesting to Appear Telephonically, In re: December 1, 2010 Hearing, filed by Michael Dunn. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12991 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Debtors' Sixty-Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Supporting Documentation Claims), In Re: Claim No. 7276 (related document(s) 12530 ) filed by Carolyn O. French-Davis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2nd page of notice) (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12990 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:Mediolanum Vita S.p.A.(Claim No.56932, Amount 9,896,221.87). To Yorvik Partners, LLP.. filed by Mediolanum Vita S.p.A..(Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12989 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter filed by CT Corporation. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12988 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter filed by CT Corporation. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12987 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Omnibus Objection to Claims, In re: Claim No. 10109 filed by Stephen A. Rogers. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12986 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Opposition to Objection of Claim No. 6770 filed by Howard C. Wachter on behalf of Kurt Wolf. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12985 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP - Transfer of Claim Other Than For Security - (Claim No.45658, Amount 1,100,000). To Bank Leumi Le-Israel B.M.. filed by Michael Sela.(Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12984 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit Affidavit of Service filed by Jonathan D. Schiller on behalf of Barclays Capital, Inc.. (Schiller, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12983 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:AXA Life Ltd.(Claim No.17827, Amount 6,158,261.84). To CVI GVF Luxembourg Twelve S.a.r.l. filed by Primeshares.(Wilson, Charmaine) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12982 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 12961 ) filed by Patricia Schrage on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. (Schrage, Patricia) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12981 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP (Claim No. 55829, Amount 11,400,000 CHF) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Credit Suisse AG(Claim No. 55829). To Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. filed by Richard B. Levin on behalf of Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC.(Levin, Richard) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12980 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP (Claim No. 66572, Amount 1,000,000 USD) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Credit Suisse (Guernsey) Limited(Claim No. 66572). To Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. filed by Richard B. Levin on behalf of Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC.(Levin, Richard) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12979 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Botticelli, LLC(Claim No.63135, Amount 2,770,263.50). To Banc of America Securities LLC. filed by Banc of America Securities LLC.(Reynolds, Meredith) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12978 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Botticelli, LLC(Claim No.63124, Amount 1,687,795.50). To Banc of America Securities LLC. filed by Banc of America Securities LLC.(Reynolds, Meredith) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12977 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Botticelli, LLC(Claim No.63111, Amount 5,294,123.10). To Banc of America Securities LLC. filed by Banc of America Securities LLC.(Reynolds, Meredith) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12976 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Botticelli, LLC(Claim No.59415, Amount 15,358,475.27). To Banc of America Securities LLC. filed by Banc of America Securities LLC.(Reynolds, Meredith) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12975 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:AG Super Fund International Partners, L.P.(Claim No.63135, Amount 404,501.20). To Banc of America Securities LLC. filed by Banc of America Securities LLC.(Reynolds, Meredith) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12974 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:AG Super Fund International Partners, L.P.(Claim No.63124, Amount 246,403.90). To Banc of America Securities LLC. filed by Banc of America Securities LLC.(Reynolds, Meredith) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12973 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:AG Super Fund International Partners, L.P.(Claim No.63111, Amount 773,394.90). To Banc of America Securities LLC. filed by Banc of America Securities LLC.(Reynolds, Meredith) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12972 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:AG Super Fund International Partners, L.P.(Claim No.59415, Amount 2,227,630.73). To Banc of America Securities LLC. filed by Banc of America Securities LLC.(Reynolds, Meredith) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12899 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment / Notice of Presentment of Stipulated Scheduling Order for Consolidated Actions with Respect to Nomura International PLC, Nomura Securities Co., Ltd., and Nomura Global Financial Products, Inc. filed by Benjamin Rosenblum on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with presentment to be held on 11/24/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 11/24/2010, (Rosenblum, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12898 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation, Agreement and Order Signed on 11/18/2010 Granting State Street Bank and Trust Company Limited Relief from the Automatic Stay. (related document(s) 12281 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12897 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 11/18/2010 Granting Debtors' Motion for Authorization to Implement the 2011 Derivatives Employee Incentive Program. (Related Doc # 12370 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12896 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 11/18/2010 Granting Debtors' Motion for an Order Modifying the Automatic Stay to Allow Advancement Under (i) 2007-2008 Directors and Officers Insurance Policies by Zurich Amercian Insurance Company, ACE Bermuda Insurance Ltd. and St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company, and (ii) 2008-2009 Directors and Officers Insurance Policies by XL Specialty Insurance Company and Federal Insurance Company. (Related Doc # 12369 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12895 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 11/18/2010 Granting Debtors' Motion for an Order Modifying the Automatic Stay to Allow Settlement Payment Under Directors and Officers Insurance Policy. (Related Doc # 12363 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12894 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 11/18/2010 Granting Debtors' Motion for Authorization to Modify Certain Terms of the Restructuring of the Archstone Credit Facilities. (Related Doc # 12475 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12893 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 11/18/2010 Granting Debtors' Forty-Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Duplicative of Indenture Trustee Claims). (Related Doc # 11594 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12892 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 11/18/2010 Granting Debtors' Forty-Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Debtor Claims). (Related Doc # 11584 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12891 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 11/18/2010 Authorizing the Debtors to Grant First Priority Liens in Collateral Posted in Connection with Foreign Exchange Hedging Transactions. (Related Doc # 12529 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12890 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance filed by Craig J. Albert on behalf of Sylvia Agostini. (Albert, Craig) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12889 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Second Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Second Interim Application of Paul, Hastings, Janofsky & Walker LLP, Special Counsel to the Debtors, for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from June 1, 2010 through September 30, 2010 for Paul, Hastings, Janofsky & Walker LLP, Other Professional, period: 6/1/2010 to 9/30/2010, fee:$549,819.95, expenses: $1,890.72. filed by Paul, Hastings, Janofsky & Walker LLP. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12888 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance filed by Craig J. Albert on behalf of Edward J Agostini. (Albert, Craig) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12887 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:UBS AG(Claim No. 59233). To Nomura International PLC. filed by Douglas P. Bartner on behalf of Nomura International plc.(Bartner, Douglas) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12886 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:BYBLOS CONSULTANTS LIMITED(Claim No.39852, Amount 100,000.00). To LIQUIDITY SOLUTIONS, INC. filed by Norman David Schoenfeld on behalf of Liquidity Solutions, Inc..(Schoenfeld, Norman) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12885 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Disallowance and Expungement of Claim No. 10856, filed by Robert Mayhorn. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12884 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter Regarding Telephonic Appearance for December 1st Hearing, filed by William Vereker. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12883 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response Regarding Notice of Amended Agenda of Matters, Re: Chris Stovic (related document(s) 11843 ) filed by Chris Stovic. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12882 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:UBS AG. To Nomura International plc. filed by Douglas P. Bartner on behalf of Nomura International plc.(Bartner, Douglas) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12881 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:UBS AG(Claim No. 59233). To Nomura International plc. filed by Douglas P. Bartner on behalf of Nomura International plc.(Bartner, Douglas) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12880 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
(THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN REFILED, SEE DOCUMENT # 12882 FOR CORRECT ENTRY) Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:UBS AG(Claim No.59233, Amount 5,000,000). To Nomura International plc. filed by Douglas P. Bartner on behalf of Nomura International plc.(Bartner, Douglas) Modified on 11/18/2010 (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12879 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
(THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN REFILED, SEE DOCUMENT # 12881 FOR CORRECT ENTRY)Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:UBS AG(Claim No.59233, Amount 1,085,000). To Nomura International plc. filed by Douglas P. Bartner on behalf of Nomura International plc.(Bartner, Douglas) Modified on 11/18/2010 (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12878 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.67146, Amount 387,117.00); JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.66383, Amount 387,117.00). To Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII (Parallel 2), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII (Parallel 2), L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12877 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Stay Pending Appeal - Notice of Motion and Motion For Limited Stay - (related document(s) 12876 ) filed by William Kuntz III. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12876 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appeal (related document(s) 12662 ) filed by William Kuntz III. (Rouzeau, Anatin) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12875 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:BBVA (Suiza) S.A.(Claim No.51305, Amount 902,000.00). To Goldman, Sachs & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12874 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.67146, Amount 43,749,271.94); JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.66383, Amount 43,749,271.94). To OCM Opportunities Fund VIIb Delaware, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of OCM Opportunities Fund VIIb Delaware, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12873 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:BBVA (Suiza) S.A.(Claim No.51140, Amount 1,815,494.85). To Goldman, Sachs & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12872 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.67146, Amount 21,934,753.59); JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.66383, Amount 21,934,753.59). To Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12871 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:BBVA (Suiza) S.A.(Claim No.51152, Amount 2,250,190.80). To Goldman, Sachs & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12870 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.67146, Amount 69,928,917.83); JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.66383, Amount 69,928,917.83). To Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII Delaware, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII Delaware, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12869 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:BBVA (Suiza) S.A.(Claim No.51151, Amount 8,615,000.00). To Goldman, Sachs & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12868 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Debtors' Fifty-Eighth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Supporting Documentation Claims), In Re: Claim No. 5441 (related document(s) 11942 ) filed by Mitsui Company. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12867 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:BBVA (Suiza) S.A.(Claim No.51141, Amount 413,000.00). To Goldman, Sachs & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12866 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Objection to Claim No. 31285 filed by Zane D. Smith on behalf of Jeannette Mannix. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12865 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:BBVA (Suiza) S.A.(Claim No.51150, Amount 2,095,348.13). To Goldman, Sachs & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12864 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.32145, Amount 11,693,528.00). To Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII Delaware, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII Delaware, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12863 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:BBVA (Suiza) S.A.(Claim No.51168, Amount 1,142,142.30). To Goldman, Sachs & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12862 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.32145, Amount 6,238,936.00). To Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12861 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:BBVA (Suiza) S.A.(Claim No.51148, Amount 1,315,000.00). To Goldman, Sachs & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12860 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Objection to Claim filed by Jeffrey L. Friedman on behalf of Samuel J. Friedman. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12859 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:BBVA (Suiza) S.A.(Claim No.51147, Amount 925,000.00). To Goldman, Sachs & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12858 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.32145, Amount 1,687,279.00). To Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII (Parallel 2), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII (Parallel 2), L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12857 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:BBVA (Suiza) S.A.(Claim No.51146, Amount 1,090,000.00). To Goldman, Sachs & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12856 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.33007, Amount 817,006.00). To Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII (Parallel 2), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII (Parallel 2), L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12855 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.33007, Amount 5,663,259.00). To Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII Delaware, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII Delaware, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12854 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:BBVA (Suiza) S.A.(Claim No.51320, Amount 3,363,921.60). To Goldman, Sachs & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12853 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:BBVA (Suiza) S.A.(Claim No.51170, Amount 1,627,000.00). To Goldman, Sachs & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12852 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.33007, Amount 3,021,497.00). To Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12851 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Debtors' Fifty-Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Duplicative of Indenture Trustee Claims), In re: 37406 (related document(s) 11968 ) filed by William Brackett. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12850 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration : (I) Declaration of Daniel Ehrmann in Support of and (II) Notice of Modification of Motion for Approval of the Termination and Settlement of Certain Prepetition Derivatives Contracts with Trusts for which U.S. Bank National Association Serves as Indenture Trustee and Related Relief (related document(s) 12786 ) filed by Lori R. Fife on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Fife, Lori) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12849 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Withdrawal of Claim(s): CIT Middle Market Loan Trust II [claim nos. 11024, 11025], CIT Lending Services Corporation [claim no. 10488], CIT CLO I Ltd. [claim no. 12412] filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Malo, David) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12848 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Withdrawal of Claim(s): Filed on behalf of CIT Middle Market Loan Trust III [claim no. 11027] filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Malo, David) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12847 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Withdrawal of Claim(s): On behalf of CIT CLO I Ltd. [claim no. 11988] filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Malo, David) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12846 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Withdrawal of Claim(s): Essentia Health [claim no. 67125] and [claim no. 67129] filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Malo, David) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12845 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:Trilogy Leasing Co., LLC(Amount 42,103.00).. To Archon Bay Capital, LLC. filed by Blue Heron Micro Opportunities Fund, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Transfer Notice FRBP Rule 3001 (e)(1))(Tonner, David) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12844 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Samuel Garcia of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 12779 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|