Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. Abbyy USA Software House, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:09-cv-00538
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Abbyy Usa Software House Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Siebman, Burg, Phillips & Smith LLP

No Logo Gfi-usa, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Capshaw DeRieux, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eugene L. Chang +1 212 728 8988 +1 212 728 8111 mao@willkie.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc E Montgomery +1 212 728 8546 +1 212 728 8111 mmontgomery@willkie.com
No Logo Kidasa Software, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Collins Edmonds & Pogorzelski PLLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein, Faucett & Preberg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael James Collins +1 713 877 1515 +1 713 877 1737 mcollins@gfpiplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Van Cleef Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Van Cleef +1 903 248 8244 +1 903 248 8249 charles@vancleef.net
No Logo No Magic, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "No Magic, Incorporated."

Represented by Capshaw DeRieux, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Christopher Nelson +1 214 259 0901 +1 214 259 0910 mark.nelson@snrdenton.com
No Logo Punch Software, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hardy & Atherton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C Hardy, III +1 903 561 8400 +1 903 561 8228 john@hardylaw.com
No Logo Wordsearch Corp, L.l.c., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/07/2010 E Glenn Thames +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 glennthames@potterminton.com
No Logo Cioview Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "CIOview Corp."

Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

No Logo CommonTime, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Capshaw DeRieux, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP (DC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Marc E Montgomery +1 212 728 8546 +1 212 728 8111 mmontgomery@willkie.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Eugene L. Chang +1 212 728 8988 +1 212 728 8111 mao@willkie.com
No Logo Internetsafety.com, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 allengardner@potterminton.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
No Logo Systran Software, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by JMM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Michael McBride +1 817 877 1824 +1 817 877 1797 enotices@mcbridelegal.com
No Logo Systran U.S.A., Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by JMM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY John Michael McBride +1 817 877 1824 +1 817 877 1797 enotices@mcbridelegal.com
No Logo Uniloc (Singapore) Private Ltd., Counter-Defendant
Officially listed as "Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited"

Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
No Logo Honorable Robert Faulkner, Mediator

Represented by JAMS

Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (174) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 174 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: 1/4/2011 Judgment*
    LREF
    Blank 173 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: 12/21/2010 Order
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: 12/13/2010 Stipulation of Dismissal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: 12/13/2010 Stipulation of Dismissal
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: 11/16/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: 11/15/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
              STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/19/10. cc:attys 10-20-10(mll, ) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None
                Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER denying as moot 92 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/4/2010. (gsg) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER granting 164 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims by pltfs against deft No Magic Inc are dismissed with prejudice; all counterclaims by deft No Magic Inc against pltfs are dismissed without prejudice. Parties shall each bear their own attys' fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/01/10. cc:attys 10-01-10(mll, ) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
                      STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant No Magic, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER granting 161 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims between pltf and deft GFI USA Inc are dismissed with prejudice. Parties shall each bear their own atty's fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/27/10. cc:attys 9-27-10(mll, ) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andy Tindel on behalf of No Magic, Incorporated. (Tindel, Andy) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                            STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant GFI USA, Inc., d/b/a GFI Software USA by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None
                              NOTICE by No Magic, Incorporated. of Compliance (Nelson, Mark) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Disclosure by No Magic, Incorporated. re the Court's August 19, 2010 Order (Nelson, Mark) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by GFI USA, Inc. re the Court's August 19, 2010 Order (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting 154 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims between pltfs and deft Kidasa Software are dismissed with prejudice. Parties shall bear their own attys' fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/30/10. cc:attys 8-30-10(mll, ) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting 153 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims between pltfs and deft Abbyy USA Software House are dismissed with prejudice. Parties shall bear their own attys' fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/30/10. cc:attys 8-30-10(mll, ) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Winston Oliver Huff on behalf of Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Huff, Winston) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None
                                          STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Kidasa Software, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant ABBYY USA Software House, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting 151 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. ORDERED that the deadline for the parties to substantially complete document production is extended up to and including September 10, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/19/2010. (gsg) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by GFI USA, Inc., No Magic, Incorporated.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Mark) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael James Collins (Collins, Michael) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Helen Chae MacLeod for Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                      ANSWER to 144 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of NO MAGIC, INC. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                        ANSWER to 143 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of GFI USA, INC. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc..(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Uniloc Corporation Pty. Limited. for Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE by GFI USA, Inc., Kidasa Software, Inc., No Magic, Incorporated. of Compliance pursuant to P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Nelson, Mark) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                              AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by No Magic, Incorporated..(Nelson, Mark) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. by GFI USA, Inc.. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Additional Disclosures) (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of Disclosure by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Additional Disclosures) (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE by WORDsearch Corp, L.L.C. Initial Disclosures Under Section 1 of the Discovery Order (Bayer, Karl) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE by GFI USA, Inc. of Compliance (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Robert Faulkner added as Mediator. First Round Mediation Deadline 10/1/2010. Second Round 8/16/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/14/2010. (gsg) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE by Abbyy USA Software House, Inc., GFI USA, Inc., Kidasa Software, Inc., No Magic, Incorporated., WORDsearch Corp, L.L.C. re 129 Order, of Compliance with the Court's Order of June 1, 2010 (Nelson, Mark) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. re 129 Order, of Compliance with the Court's Order of June 1, 2010 (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting 132 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for GFI USA Inc to serve its initial disclosure is extended to 6-11-2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/08/10. cc:attys 6-08-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Initial Disclosures) (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE of Disclosure by Kidasa Software, Inc. Initial Disclosure (Collins, Michael) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Defendant GFI USA, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Initial Disclosures) by GFI USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rambin, Daymon) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE of Disclosure by Abbyy USA Software House, Inc. (Initial Disclosures) (Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE by No Magic, Incorporated. of Compliance with Court Order (Dkt. 122) to Submit Initial Disclosures (Nelson, Mark) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER that pltfs and defts each file an in camera proposal designating a preferred mediator in this case. Parties shall deliver such proposals for in camera review by 6-10-2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/01/10. cc:attys 6-01-10(mll, ) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Regarding Appointment of Mediator (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE by Kidasa Software, Inc. Defendant Kidasa Software Inc.'s Offer of Judgment (Collins, Michael) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. to Update Court Regarding Settlement of Parties to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404 (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting 124 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Defendant Punch Software LLC is dismissed with prejudice. Parties shall bear their own atty's fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/13/10. cc:attys 5-13-10(mll, ) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                      STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Punch Software LLC by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 123 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/29/10. cc:attys 4-29-10(mll, ) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 122 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/29/10. cc:attys 4-29-10(mll, ) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. (Unopposed) of Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Docket Control Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Discovery Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                              SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion to Transfer Venue (Docket Entry 92) filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Scott R. Maynard, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting 118 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline to submit the Docket Control Order and Discovery Order is extended to 4-28-2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/20/10. cc:attys 4-20-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Submit Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 114 Motion to Seal Document. Defts' Reply in Support of Defts' Motion to Transfer Venue shall be filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/16/10. cc:attys 4-16-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 116 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion (Defendants' Amended Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404) filed by Abbyy USA Software House, Inc., GFI USA, Inc., No Magic, Incorporated., Punch Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Galindo Declaration, # 2 Chiu Declaration, # 3 Duncanson Declaration, # 4 Beermann Declaration, # 5 Bayer Declaration, # 6 Chang Second Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 14 to Chang Second Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 15 to Chang Second Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 16 to Chang Second Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 17 to Chang Second Declaration, # 11 Supplement 18 to Chang Second Declaration)(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        ***DISREGARD ENTRY - REFILED AS DOCUMENT #116*** SEALED PATENT Defendants' Reply to Response to PATENT Motion filed by Abbyy USA Software House, Inc., GFI USA, Inc., No Magic, Incorporated., Punch Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Galindo Declaration, # 2 Chiu Declaration, # 3 Duncanson Declaration, # 4 Beermann Declaration, # 5 Bayer Declaration, # 6 Chang Second Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 14 to Chang Second Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 15 to Chang Second Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 16 to Chang Second Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 17 to Chang Second Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 18 to Chang Second Declaration)(Capshaw, Sidney) Modified on 4/16/2010 (kls, ). (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document by GFI USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING 112 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. CommonTime, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/13/2010. (gsg) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant CommonTime, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE by CIOview Corp. Termination of Electronic Notices (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 107 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/07/10. cc:attys 4-08-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 106 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Earl Glenn Thames, Jr terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/07/10. cc:attys 4-08-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER that the Court dates listed on this Order be incorporated into the proposed Docket Control Order which is due on 4-19-2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/07/10. cc:attys 4-07-10(mll, ) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Serve Infringement and Invalidity Contentions by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by WORDsearch Corp, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thames, Earl) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John D. Love to conduct pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/05/10. cc:attys 4-06-10(mll, ) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 101 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Deft InternetSafety.com is dismissed with prejudice. Parties shall bear their own attys' fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/05/10. cc:attys 4-06-10(mll, ) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                4.5.10 Minute Entry (Status Conference): for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 4/5/2010. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (rlf, ) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition to Defendants' 92 Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404 filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig Etchegoyen, # 2 Declaration of James L. Etheridge, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Etheridge Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 2 to Etheridge Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 3 to Etheridge Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 4 to Etheridge Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 5 to Etheridge Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 6 to Etheridge Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 7 to Etheridge Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 8 to Etheridge Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 9 to Etheridge Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 10 to Etheridge Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 11 to Etheridge Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 12 to Etheridge Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 13 to Etheridge Declaration, # 16 Exhibit 14 to Etheridge Declaration, # 17 Declaration of Dianna L. Case, # 18 Exhibit A to Case Declaration, # 19 Exhibit B to Case Declaration, # 20 Exhibit C to Case Declaration, # 21 Exhibit D to Case Declaration, # 22 Exhibit E to Case Declaration, # 23 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant InternetSafety.com, Inc. by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 04/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Kidasa Software, Inc. of Joinder in Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue (Collins, Michael) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Van Cleef on behalf of Kidasa Software, Inc. (Van Cleef, Charles) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** MOTION Joinder of Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue by Kidasa Software, Inc.. (Collins, Michael) Modified on 4/2/2010 (mjc, ). (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Marc E Montgomery for CommonTime, Inc., and GFI USA, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 95 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney James Nicholas Bunch terminated; Eugene L. Chang substituted as lead counsel for CommonTime, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/19/2010. (kls, ) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Counsel by CommonTime, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunch, James) (Entered: 03/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER setting Status Conference for 4/5/2010 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John Love. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/18/10. cc:attys 3-18-10(mll, ) (Entered: 03/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of InternetSafety.com, Inc. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 03/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404 by Abbyy USA Software House, Inc., CommonTime, Inc., GFI USA, Inc., No Magic, Incorporated., Punch Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Galindo Declaration, # 2 Lawrence Declaration, # 3 Chang Declaration, # 4 Chang Exhibits Part 1, # 5 Chang Exhibits Part 2, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Rambin, Daymon) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David D Lee on behalf of CommonTime, Inc. (Lee, David) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eugene L Chang on behalf of CommonTime, Inc. (Chang, Eugene) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daymon Jeffrey Rambin on behalf of CommonTime, Inc., GFI USA, Inc. (Rambin, Daymon) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Punch Software LLC (Brown, Scott) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by GFI USA, Inc. re 78 Notice (Other) (Defendant GFI USA, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Request for Scheduling Conference) (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 85 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Gwen Michelle Rawls terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/17/10. cc:attys 2-17-10(mll, ) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of record by No Magic, Incorporated.. (Attachments: # 1 Authorization to Withdraw, # 2 Text of Proposed Order on Gwen M. Rawls and Webb & Webb, P.C.'s Motion to Withdraw)(Rawls, Gwen) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/16/2010: # 3 Corrected Authorization to Withdraw) (gsg, ). (Entered: 02/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re 77 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Defendant Maketech Systems Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Parties shall bear their own attorney's fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/16/10. cc:attys 2-16-10(mll, ) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eugene L Chang for GFI USA, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David D Lee for GFI USA, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew M Wawrzyn for Abbyy USA Software House, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Abbyy USA Software House, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ABBYY Software, Ltd for Abbyy USA Software House, Inc.. (Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 02/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CommonTime, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CommonTime Ltd. for CommonTime, Inc.. (Bunch, James) (Entered: 02/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited re Order,, of Request for Scheduling Conference (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION of Dismissal of Maketech Systems, Inc., d/b/a Docudesk Corporation by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, by CommonTime, Inc..(Bunch, James) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***CORRECTED ENTRY. REPLACES DOCKET ENTRY 66 .*** (Defendant GFI USA, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses) ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, by GFI USA, Inc..(DeRieux, Elizabeth) Modified on 2/11/2010 (gsg). (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re 60 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Defendant CIOview Corp is dismissed with prejudice. Pltfs and deft CIOview Corp shall each bear their own attys' fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/09/10. cc:attys 2-10-10(mll, ) (Entered: 02/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re 59 Stipulation of Dismissal, filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Defendants Systran Software Inc and Systran USA Inc are dismissed with prejudice from this case. Parties shall bear their own attorney's fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/09/10. cc:attys 2-10-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 65 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of ABBYY USA Software House, Inc. by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited.(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by No Magic, Incorporated. (Nelson, Mark) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew B Walters for Punch Software LLC. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Scott R Brown for Punch Software, LLC. (kls, ) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 62 Third Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Original Complaint. Common Time, Inc shall have until and including February 11, 2010 to file its answer or otherwise respond to the Original Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/9/2010. (gsg) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by GFI USA, Inc. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE ENTRY 75 FOR CORRECTION*** (Defendant GFI USA, Inc.'s Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims) ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited by GFI USA, Inc..(DeRieux, Elizabeth) Modified on 2/11/2010 (gsg). (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited by Abbyy USA Software House, Inc..(Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clyde Moody Siebman on behalf of Abbyy USA Software House, Inc. (Siebman, Clyde) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 57 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Punch Software, LLC by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited.(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by CommonTime, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunch, James) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant No Magic, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint by No Magic, Incorporated..(Nelson, Mark) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION of Dismissal of CIOview Corp. by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Dismissing CIOview Corp.)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION of Dismissal of Systran Software, Inc. and Systran U.S.A. Inc. by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Dismissing Systran Software, Inc. and Systran U.S.A. Inc.)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***DISREGARD ENTRY - ATTORNEY TO REFILE*** MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by CIOview Corp., Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Dismissing CIOview Corp.)(Ward, Thomas) Modified on 2/8/2010 (kls, ). (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by Punch Software LLC.(Hardy, John) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to James Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 52 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc. Deft TAL Technologies Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Parties shall bear their own attys' fees, expenses, and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/29/10. cc:attys 1-29-10(mll, ) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 46 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Kidasa Software, Inc. by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited.(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 40 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of WORDsearch Corp., L.L.C. by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited.(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant T.A.L. Technologies, Inc., d/b/a "TALtech" by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 41 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for CIOview Corp to move, answer, or otherwise respond to pltfs' Original Complaint is extended to 2-8-2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/26/10. cc:attys 1-26-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re GFI USA, Inc..( Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kidasa Software, Inc. (Collins, Michael) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 48 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, by InternetSafety.com, Inc..(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Abbyy USA Software House, Inc..( Phillips, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 46 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  KIDASA Software, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM and Affirmative Defenses against Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited by Kidasa Software, Inc..(Collins, Michael) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 36 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. CommonTime Inc shall have to 2-08-2010 to file its answer or otherwise respond to the Original Complaint for Patent Infringement. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/22/10. cc:attys 1-22-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re GFI USA, Inc..( Capshaw, Sidney) Modified on 1/26/2010 (mjc, ). (Entered: 01/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Systran U.S.A., Inc.( McBride, John) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Systran Software, Inc.( McBride, John) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by CIOview Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited by WORDsearch Corp, L.L.C..(Thames, Earl) (Entered: 01/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re No Magic, Incorporated..( Nelson, Mark) (Entered: 01/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Christopher Nelson on behalf of No Magic, Incorporated. (Nelson, Mark) (Entered: 01/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Punch Software LLC.( Hardy, John) (Entered: 01/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, Unopposed Second Motion for Extension by CommonTime, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunch, James) (Entered: 01/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Punch Software LLC.( Hardy, John) (Entered: 12/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Karl Orrin Bayer on behalf of WORDsearch Corp, L.L.C. (Bayer, Karl) (Entered: 12/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re GFI USA, Inc..( Capshaw, Sidney) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re No Magic, Incorporated..( Rawls, Gwen) (Entered: 12/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Abbyy USA Software House, Inc. (Bunch, James) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re InternetSafety.com, Inc..( Jones, Michael) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re WORDsearch Corp, L.L.C..( Thames, Earl) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Earl Glenn Thames, Jr on behalf of WORDsearch Corp, L.L.C. (Thames, Earl) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited identifying Corporate Parent Uniloc Corporation Pty. Limited. for Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited, Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 12/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Systran U.S.A., Inc..( McBride, John) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Systran Software, Inc..( McBride, John) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John J Edmonds on behalf of Kidasa Software, Inc. (Edmonds, John) Modified on 12/16/2009 (ch, ). (Entered: 12/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Henry Mark Pogorzelski on behalf of Kidasa Software, Inc. (Pogorzelski, Henry) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John J Edmonds on behalf of Uniloc USA, Inc. (Edmonds, John) Modified on 12/16/2009 (ch, ). (Entered: 12/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Return of Service Executed as to Punch Software LLC on 12/7/2009, by cert mail; answer due: 12/28/2009. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Return of Service Executed as to CIOview Corp. on 12/7/2009, by cert mail; answer due: 12/28/2009. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to WORDsearch Corp, L.L.C. on 12/7/2009, by cert mail; answer due: 12/28/2009. (mll, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2009: # 1 Proof of Service) (mll, ). (Entered: 12/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CommonTime, Inc. (Bunch, James) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Scott R Maynard for Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Return of Service Executed as to InternetSafety.com, Inc. on 12/3/2009, by cert mail; answer due: 12/24/2009. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Return of Service Executed as to CommonTime, Inc. on 12/5/2009, by cert mail; answer due: 12/28/2009. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Return of Service Executed as to Systran U.S.A., Inc. on 12/3/2009, by cert mail; answer due: 12/24/2009. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Return of Service Executed as to No Magic, Incorporated. on 12/3/2009, by cert mail; answer due: 12/24/2009. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Return of Service Executed as to Systran Software, Inc. on 12/3/2009, by cert mail; answer due: 12/24/2009. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to Abbyy USA Software House, Inc. on 12/3/2009, by cert mail; answer due: 12/24/2009. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Return of Service Executed as to Kidasa Software, Inc. on 12/4/2009, by cert mail. (mll, ) Modified on 12/9/2009 (mll, ). (Entered: 12/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Return of Service Executed as to T.A.L. Technologies, Inc. on 12/4/2009, by cert mail; answer due: 12/28/2009. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Return of Service Executed as to GFI USA, Inc. on 12/4/2009, by cert mail; answer due: 12/28/2009. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Kidasa Software, Inc..( Collins, Michael) (Entered: 12/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James Etheridge for Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to WORDsearch Corp, L.L.C., T.A.L. Technologies, Inc., CIOview Corp., Punch Software LLC, Maketech Systems, Inc., Kidasa Software, Inc., InternetSafety.com, Inc., Abbyy USA Software House, Inc., CommonTime, Inc., No Magic, Incorporated., GFI USA, Inc., Systran Software, Inc., Systran U.S.A., Inc., and emailed to pltf for service on defts. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric M. Albritton on behalf of Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None, Terminated: 2/9/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against WORDsearch Corp, L.L.C., T.A.L. Technologies, Inc., CIOview Corp., Punch Software LLC, Maketech Systems, Inc., Kidasa Software, Inc., InternetSafety.com, Inc., Abbyy USA Software House, Inc., CommonTime, Inc., No Magic, Incorporated., GFI USA, Inc., Systran Software, Inc., Systran U.S.A., Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 05400000000002260016.), filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc (Singapore) Private Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 318 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?