Enron Corp Securitie, et al v. , et al
Federal Court Proceeding Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:02-md-01446

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo American National Insurance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by American National Insurance Company

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space American National Insurance Company
No Logo Bayerische Landesbank, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bayerische Landesbank

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bayerische Landesbank
No Logo Connecticut Resources Recovery Authority, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Connecticut Resources Recovery Authority

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Connecticut Resources Recovery Authority
No Logo DK Acquisitions Partners, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Porter & Hedges, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey R Elkin +1 713 226 0617 + 713 226 0217 jelkin@porterhedges.com
No Logo Fleming & Associates, LLP, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fleming & Associates, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fleming & Associates LLP +1 415 352 7171
No Logo Nathaniel Pulsifer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Schwartz Junell Greenburg & Oathout, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger B Greenberg +1 713 752 0017 + 713 752 0327 rgreenberg@schwartz-junell.com
No Logo Newby Plaintiffs, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Schwartz Junell Greenburg & Oathout, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger B Greenberg +1 713 752 0017 + 713 752 0327 rgreenberg@schwartz-junell.com
No Logo Paul Okomo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey R. Krinsk +1 519 238 1333 +1 619 238 5425 jrk@classactionlaw.com
No Logo Ravenswood Capital - I, L.L.C., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ravenswood Capital - I, L.L.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ravenswood Capital - I, L.L.C.
Regents of the University of California Regents of the University of California, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "The Regents of the University of California"
Unknown Role, Owl Rock Capital Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Lerach Coughlin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/04/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew P Siben +1 619 231 1058

Toggle Switch Represented by Schwartz Junell Greenburg & Oathout, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger B Greenberg +1 713 752 0017 + 713 752 0327 rgreenberg@schwartz-junell.com
No Logo The Variable Annuity Life Insurance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hennigan Bennett & Dorman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Louis Palmer +1 213 694 1200 +1 213 694 1234 palmer@hbdlawyers.com
No Logo Tittle Plaintiffs, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Campbell Harrison et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin L Harrison +1 713 752 2332 +1 713 752 2330 rharrison@chd-law.com
No Logo Unicredito Italiano S.p.a., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles G Berry +1 212 715 1169 + 212 715 1399
No Logo Westboro Properties LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greer Herz Adams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. Mytelka +1 409 797 3200 +1 409 766 6424 amytelka@greerherz.com
No Logo Yosemite Securities Trust I, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Yosemite Securities Trust I

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Yosemite Securities Trust I
v.
No Logo Bank Defendants, Defendant
No Logo Deutsche Banc Securities Inc, Defendant
Deutsche Bank AG Deutsche Bank AG, Defendant
Unknown Role, Nrp, Inc.
Unknown Role, Sherwood Group, Inc.,
Unknown Role, Briazz, Inc.
Unknown Role, Dsl.net, Inc.
Unknown Role, Blockbuster, Inc.
Unknown Role, Korea Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Brazil Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Solv Ex Corp
Unknown Role, Newmark Homes Corp
Unknown Role, Comple Tel Europe Nv
Unknown Role, Doblique Inc
Unknown Role, Mesa Airlines Inc
Unknown Role, Emerson Radio Corp
Unknown Role, Emachines Inc /de/
Unknown Role, Rreef America L.l.c.
Unknown Role, Id Arizona Corp.
Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Defendant
Enron Corporation Enron Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Enron Corp"

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Leon Doyle +1 713 750 8805 +1 713 750 0903 doyle@reynoldsfrizzell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Brewer Pritchard PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Mark Brewer +1 713 209 2950 +1 713 659 5302 brewer@bplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/03/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen D. Susman +1 713 653 7801 +1 713 654 6666 ssusman@susmangodfrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Lassetter Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Scott D Lassetter +1 713 523 0325 +1 713 523 0132 sdl@lassetterfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOHN B. STRASBURGER +1 713 546 5102 +1 713 224 9511 john.strasburger@weil.com
JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "JPMorgan Chase & Co"
Lay, Kenneth L Lay, Kenneth L, Defendant
Officially listed as "Kenneth L Lay"

Toggle Switch Represented by Carrington Coleman Sloman & Blumenthal

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DIANE M. SUMOSKI +1 214 855 3000 + 214 855 1333 dsumoski@ccsb.com
No Logo Michael J Kopper, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by BECK REDDEN & SECREST LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric J.R. Nichols +1 713 951 3700 +1 713 951 3720 enichols@brsfirm.com
No Logo Newby & Tittle Defendants, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GIBBS & BRUNS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
No Logo Outside Directors Enron, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbs Bruns LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Turner Ross +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 bross@gibbs-bruns.com
No Logo Vinson & Elkins LLP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John K. Villa +1 202 434 5000 +1 202 434 5029 jvilla@wc.com
No Logo Algis V. Plioplys, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Algis V. Plioplys

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Algis V. Plioplys +1 773 238 9769
No Logo Deposition Scheduling Committee, Interested Party
No Logo Sierra Pacific Resources and Nevada Power Company, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolfe Rifkin et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan H Waller +1 205 803 0051 +1 205 933 5451
No Logo Citrus Corp, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Berry Dunbar Bowen +1 713 521 3525 +1 713 521 3575 berrybowen@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of James B Dougherty

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley Westmoreland +1 713 237 0222 +1 713 237 0401 deerjc@aol.com
No Logo Joe H Walker, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Paine Tarwater Bickers & Tillman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua R Walker +1 865 525 0880 +1 865 521 7441 jrw@painetar.com
No Logo Moody's Corp, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark K Glasser +1 713 315 9002 +1 713 315 9199 mkglasser@sidley.com
No Logo Northern Border Partners LP, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Berry Dunbar Bowen +1 713 521 3525 +1 713 521 3575 berrybowen@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of James B Dougherty

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley Westmoreland +1 713 237 0222 +1 713 237 0401 deerjc@aol.com
No Logo Settlement Class Members, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maureen McGuirl +1 212 785 4100

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED N. Albert Bacharach, Jr. +1 352 378 9859
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward W Cochran +1 216 751 5546 +1 216 751 6630
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence William Schonbrun +1 510 547 8070 +1 510 547 8070 lschon@inreach.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kieve Law Offices, Inc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Loren Kieve +1 415 364 0060 lk@kievelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pritchard McCall et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank H Tomlinson +1 205 328 9190 + 205 458 0035

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste. 900

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Rothstein +1 800 733 2224

Toggle Switch Represented by The Yoes Law Firm LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart Cooper Yoes +1 409 833 2352 +1 409 838 5577 scy@yoeslawfirm.com
No Logo Enron Corp Securities, Derivative & "ERISA" Litigation, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/12/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Frankel +1 713 528 2519 +1 713 528 2509

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Ignatius Grance +1 212 878 3261 + 212 878 8375

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Timothy Hauser +1 202 219 8637 +1 202 219 7346

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd Wayne Hutton +1 214 797 0808 +1 972 552 9484 twhlaw@hotmail.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank W Morgan +1 281 367 9200 +1 281 367 2453 frankwmorgan@sbcglobal.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary Benjamin Pitts +1 281 992 1100 +1 281 992 1109 defensebasecomp@aol.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald Gene Woods +1 713 862 9600 +1 713 864 8738 ronwoodslaw@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eliot Lauer +1 212 696 6192 + 212 697 1559

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Lewin +1 212 806 5684

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Klari Neuwelt +1 212 593 8800

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Timothy Pfeifer +1 212 819 8200 + 212 819 7824

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neal Tomlins +1 918 747 6500 + 918 749 0874

Toggle Switch Represented by 2001 Parkplace North

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Michael Rediker +1 205 251 1000 +1 205 324 1133 jmr@hsy.com

Toggle Switch Represented by 5th Circuit Infomation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George Paul Howes +1 619 231 1058 +1 713 571 0912

Toggle Switch Represented by Adair and Myers PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clinton A. Krislov +1 312 606 0500 +1 312 606 0207 clint@krislovlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Adams Reese LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Clayton C Cannon +1 713 652 5151 clayton.cannon@arlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Alioto Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph M. Alioto, Sr. +1 415 434 8900 +1 415 434 9200 jmalioto@aliotolaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Charles Grant +1 404 881 7000 +1 404 881 7777 jim.grant@alston.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Altshuler Berzon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James M. Finberg +1 415 421 7151 +1 415 362 8064 jfinberg@altshulerberzon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Alyssa A Qualls

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/13/2005 Alyssa A Qualls

Toggle Switch Represented by Amy L Brown

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy L Brown

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles G Berry +1 212 715 1169 + 212 715 1399
LEAD ATTORNEY Scott Bernard Schreiber +1 202 942 5000 +1 202 942 5999 scott_schreiber@aporter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Potter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin S Antonipillai +1 202 942 5122 + 202 942 5999
LEAD ATTORNEY John C Massaro +1 202 942 5122

Toggle Switch Represented by Ashby & Geddes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen E Jenkins +1 302 654 1888 + 302 654 2067

Toggle Switch Represented by Ass't Atty Gen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fredrick F Neid +1 402 471 2682
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark D Starr +1 402 471 2682

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John H Boone +1 760 320 3201
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Leon Doyle +1 713 750 8805 +1 713 750 0903 doyle@reynoldsfrizzell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Garrett S Flynn +1 860 676 3148 + 860 674 0085
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carol V Gilden +1 312 521 2403 + 312 521 2100
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard C Goode +1 847 498 5320 + 847 498 5712
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harvey Greenfield + 212 949 0049
Space Richard P Hix +1 918 582 1211
TERMINATED: 10/10/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A Huettner +1 216 771 1330 + 216 283 6700
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory P Joseph +1 212 407 1210 + 212 407 1280
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David B Kahn +1 847 501 5083 + 874 501 5086
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald Joseph Kormanik +1 713 355 2323 +1 713 355 4848
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey R. Krinsk +1 519 238 1333 +1 619 238 5425 jrk@classactionlaw.com
Space F Jackson Lewis +1 513 802 2130
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James F Marshall +1 626 287 4540 + 626 237 2003
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth D McConnico +1 281 286 7779 +1 281 286 9990 ken@mcconnicolaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J Melley, III +1 860 247 9933 + 860 247 9944
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ira M Press +1 212 371 6600 + 212 751 2540
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Lee Ringgenberg +1 303 792 9526
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey S Saltz
LEAD ATTORNEY Cynthia S Schiffer +1 254 724 4127
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert K Spotswood +1 205 986 3639
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig A Varga
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Eric Wren, III +1 254 710 7670 +1 254 710 2817

Toggle Switch Represented by Atty General Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore M Doolittle +1 860 808 5355 + 860 808 5391

Toggle Switch Represented by Baggett Gordon & Deison

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George David Gordon +1 936 756 1813 +1 936 760 2305 gdgordon@bgdlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Bailey Cavalieri LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. Goodstein +1 614 221 3155 +1 614 221 0479 michael.goodstein@baileycavalieri.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya A. Jacobs +1 713 751 1600 +1 713 751 1717 tjacobs@bakerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence David Finder +1 713 427 5030 +1 713 427 5099 lawrence.finder@bakermckenzie.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph D Cheavens +1 713 229 1215 +1 713 229 2850 joseph.cheavens@bakerbotts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brigid M. Carpenter +1 615 726 5600 + 615 744 7341 bcarpenter@bakerdonelson.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas O. Helton +1 423 209 4194 +1 423 752 9544 thelton@bakerdonelson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by bancsilaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/05/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Slavin +1 203 368 0211

Toggle Switch Represented by Banks Law Office PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert S Banks, Jr. +1 503 222 7475 + 503 248 0138

Toggle Switch Represented by Banowsky Levine PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Baxter Ward Banowsky +1 214 871 1300 +1 214 871 0038 bwb@banowsky.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bartlit Beck LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip Scott Beck +1 312 494 4400 +1 312 494 4440 philip.beck@bartlit-beck.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Carroll Smith, Jr. +1 303 592 3188 +1 303 592 3140 joseph.smith@bartlit-beck.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alison Wheeler +1 303 592 3100

Toggle Switch Represented by Bass, Barry & Sims, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/10/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael L. Dagley +1 615 742 6200

Toggle Switch Represented by Bechnel Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel E Bechnel, Jr. +1 985 536 1186 + 985 536 6445

Toggle Switch Represented by BECK REDDEN & SECREST LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric J.R. Nichols +1 713 951 3700 +1 713 951 3720 enichols@brsfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Beck Redden et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Murray Fogler +1 713 951 3700 +1 713 951 3720 mfogler@brsfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Beirne, Maynard & Parsons, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allyson L Mihalick +1 713 871 6810 + 713 960 1527
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Roger Parsons +1 713 623 0887 +1 713 960 1527 jparsons@bmpllp.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Herbert Blake Tartt, Jr. +1 713 623 0887 +1 713 960 1527

Toggle Switch Represented by Benard V Preziosi

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Benard V Preziosi

Toggle Switch Represented by Benckenstein Oxford LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hubert Oxford, III +1 409 833 9182 +1 409 833 8819

Toggle Switch Represented by Berg & Androphy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joel Marc Androphy +1 713 529 5622 +1 713 529 3785 jandrophy@bafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sherrie R. Savett +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4604 ssavett@bm.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arthur Stock +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4604 astock@bm.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Berman DeValerio, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Jameson Pucillo +1 561 835 9400 +1 561 835 0302 mpucillo@bermandevalerio.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bieser, Greer & Landis, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Carr Greer +1 937 223 6337 +1 937 223 6339 DCG@BGLLAW.COM

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael L Spafford +1 202 373 6000 +1 202 373 6368 michael.spafford@bingham.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul S Chan +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 pchan@birdmarella.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Blank Rome LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry Abrams +1 713 228 6601 +1 713 228 6605 babrams@BlankRome.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Bruce Drubel +1 603 643 9090 +1 603 643 9010 rdrubel@bsfllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bowen Riley Warnock & Jacobson PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Salvador M Hernandez + 615 320 3737

Toggle Switch Represented by Bracewell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gayle Anne Boone +1 214 468 3800 +1 214 468 3888
LEAD ATTORNEY J Clifford Gunter, III +1 713 221 1213 + 713 221 2164 clifford.gunter@bgllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julia Boaz Cooper +1 205 521 8810 +1 205 488 6810 jbcooper@bradleyarant.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Brewer Pritchard PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Mark Brewer +1 713 209 2950 +1 713 659 5302 brewer@bplaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sondra Jones Jurica +1 713 209 2950 +1 713 659 5302 jurica@bplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown Raysman Millstein Felder & Steiner LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C Evan Stewart +1 212 895 2670 + 212 895 2900

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown Sims, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Myrick Browning, Jr. +1 713 629 1580 +1 713 629 5027 rbrowning@brownsims.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bruce D Angiolillo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/02/2009 Bruce D Angiolillo

Toggle Switch Represented by Butler Snow O'Mara Stevens & Cannada, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christy D. Jones +1 601 985 4500 +1 601 948 4500 christy.jones@butlersnow.com
Space Kurt G Rademacher +1 601 948 5711
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin McRae Watson +1 601 948 5711 +1 601 985 4500 ben.watson@butlersnow.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cabaniss, Johnston, Gardner, Dumas & O'Neal

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Crawford Sharp McGivaren, Jr. +1 205 716 5312 + 205 716 5389 csm@cabaniss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory G Ballard +1 212 504 6000 gregory.ballard@cwt.com
Space Jason Michael Halper +1 212 504 6605 +1 212 504 6666 jason.halper@cwt.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Arthur Markel +1 212 504 6112 +1 212 504 6666 greg.markel@cwt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cahill Gordon & Reindell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Floyd Abrams +1 212 701 3622

Toggle Switch Represented by Campbell Harrison et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin L Harrison +1 713 752 2332 +1 713 752 2330 rharrison@chd-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Capitol Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey S Boyd +1 512 463 1788 +1 512 463 1932 jeff.boyd@governor.state.tx.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Carmody & Torrance, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony M. Fitzgerald +1 203 777 5501 +1 203 784 3199 afitzgerald@carmodylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carrington, Coleman, Sloman & Blumenthal, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth E Carroll +1 214 855 3000 +1 214 855 1333 kcarroll@ccsb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James E Coleman, Jr. +1 214 855 3000 + 214 855 1333 jcoleman@ccsb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cauley, Geller, Bowman & Coates, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Curtis L Bowman +1 501 312 8500 + 501 312 8505

Toggle Switch Represented by Chadbourne & Parke, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space C. IAN ANDERSON +1 212 408 2322 +1 646 710 2322
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Joseph Hall +1 212 408 5100 +1 212 541 5369 thall@chadbourne.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Chitwood Harley Harnes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin D Chitwood , +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MChitwood@chitwoodlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey H Konis +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward H. Nicholson, Jr. +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 ehn@classlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by CityPlace II

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James M Tanski +1 860 525 2700 +1 860 247 7861

Toggle Switch Represented by Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan I. Blackman +1 212 225 2490 jblackman@cgsh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan A Davis +1 212 225 2000 +1 212 225 3999 edavis@cgsh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Max Gitter +1 212 225 2610 +1 212 225 3999 kdewey@cgsh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Nancy I Ruskin +1 212 225 2000 +2253 225 225 3999 nruskin@cgsh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Clifford Chance, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY James N Benedict +1 212 878 8000 +1 212 822 5696
LEAD ATTORNEY Christopher M Joralemon +1 212 878 8000
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Adam Kirsch +1 212 878 8192 +1 212 878 8375 mark.kirsch@cliffordchance.com
LEAD ATTORNEY James F. Moyle +1 212 878 8508 +1 212 878 8375 james.moyle@cliffordchance.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Paul +1 212 878 8000 + 212 878 3216
Space Guy C Quinlan +1 212 878 8000
LEAD ATTORNEY James B. Weidner +1 212 878 8000 +1 212 878 8375 James.Weidner@CliffordChance.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Jeffrey Toll +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 stoll@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Wolf PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stewart I Edelstein +1 203 368 0211 + 203 576 8504

Toggle Switch Represented by Connelly Baker & Wotring, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Earnest W. Wotring +1 713 980 1700 +1 713 980 1701 ewotring@connellybaker.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Copeland France et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George Walton Walker, III +1 334 834 1180 +1 334 834 3172

Toggle Switch Represented by Copeland Franco et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lee H Copeland + 334 834 3172

Toggle Switch Represented by Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph Winters Cotchett +1 650 697 6000 +1 650 697 0577 jcotchett@cpmlegal.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Mark Cotton Molumphy +1 650 697 6000 +1 650 697 0577 mmolumphy@cpmlegal.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Bruce L. Simon +1 650 697 6000 +1 650 697 0577 bsimon@psswplaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven N. Williams +1 650 697 6000 +1 650 697 0577 swilliams@cpmlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Coughlin Stoia Geller Rudman & Robbins, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Regina M Ames +1 310 859 3100 + 310 278 2148
LEAD ATTORNEY Alexandra S Bernay +1 619 231 1058
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen J Hodges +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423

Toggle Switch Represented by Courtney and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Cal Courtney, Jr. +1 713 706 4100 +1 713 706 4104 ccourtney@courtneyassociates.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Craddock Massey et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel K Craddock +1 512 485 7920 +1 512 485 7921 dcraddock@craddockmassey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Crady Jewett et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/14/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY Carlton Dalbey Wilde, Jr. +1 713 739 7007 +1 713 739 8403 cwilde@cjmlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard W. Clary +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 rclary@cravath.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Darin Patrick McAtee +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 dmcatee@cravath.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julia A North +1 212 474 1000 + 212 765 0652
LEAD ATTORNEY Julie A North +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 jnorth@cravath.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip Thomas Inglima +1 202 624 2795 +1 202 628 5116 pinglima@crowell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by CROWLEY NORMAN LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard E. Norman +1 713 651 1771 +1 713 651 1775 rnorman@crowleynorman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cruse Scott et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Billy Jack Shepherd +1 713 650 6600 +1 713 650 1720

Toggle Switch Represented by Cunningham Darlow LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tom Alan Cunningham +1 713 255 5500 +1 713 255 5555 tcunningham@cunninghamdarlow.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard J Zook +1 713 255 5500 + 713 255 5555 rzook@cdzc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Curtis-Mallet-Prevost et al.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Peter Fleming, Jr. +1 212 696 6192
LEAD ATTORNEY Michael J Moscato +1 212 696 6192

Toggle Switch Represented by Dalton PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY R Douglas Dalton +1 602 224 2444 + 602 224 2422

Toggle Switch Represented by Darden Fowler et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry L Foerster +1 936 756 3337 + 936 756 2606

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sharon Katz +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3508 skatz@dpw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel F Kolb +1 212 450 4394 +1 212 450 3394 daniel.kolb@dpw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Berry et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Alex G Filotto +1 860 275 0100
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John B Nolan + 860 275 0343

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Edwards et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce W Day +1 405 239 2121 +2361 236 236 1012
LEAD ATTORNEY Bill P Guest +1 405 239 2121 +1 405 236 1012 bguest@dayedwards.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dearman & Gerson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Jeffrey Dearman +1 954 915 8888 + 954 915 9191

Toggle Switch Represented by Delaney Zemetis et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael G Durham +1 203 458 9168 + 203 458 4424
LEAD ATTORNEY Patrick M Noonan +1 203 458 9168

Toggle Switch Represented by Dennis C Brown

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/18/2005 Dennis C Brown

Toggle Switch Represented by Deputy Atty Gen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED L Steven Grasz +1 402 471 2681

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickstein Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard Schiffman +1 202 729 7470 +1 202 730 4520 SchiffmanH@dicksteinshapiro.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ira Lee Sorkin +1 212 277 6576 +1 212 997 9880 sorkini@dicksteinshapiro.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Keara M. Gordon +1 212 335 4500 +1 212 335 4501 keara.gordon@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Doerner Saunders Daniel & Anderson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lewis N Carter +1 918 582 1211 + 918 591 5362 lcarter@dsda.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Donald A Wall

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald A Wall

Toggle Switch Represented by Donovan Searles, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. Donovan +1 215 732 6067 +1 215 732 8060 mdonovan@donovansearles.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dornbush, Mensch, Mandelstam & Schaeffer, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RICHARD J. SCHAEFFER +1 212 759 3300 + 212 753 7673 schaeffer@dsswlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas W. Sankey +1 713 402 3900 +1 713 402 3901 twsankey@duanemorris.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Elliott Greenleaf et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark A Kearney +1 215 977 1016 +1 215 977 1099

Toggle Switch Represented by Ellis Carstarphen et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Morgan Carstarphen, III +1 713 647 6800 +1 713 647 6884 emc@ecdglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Emerson Poynter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Emerson - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 281 488 8854 +1 281 488 8867 jemerson@emersonpoynter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Entwistle & Cappucci

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Vincent R Cappucci +1 202 894 7200

Toggle Switch Represented by Entwistle & Cappuci LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen D Oestreich +1 212 894 7200 + 212 894 7272

Toggle Switch Represented by Entwistle and Cappucci LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew J Entwistle +1 212 894 7200 +1 212 894 7272 aentwistle@entwistle-law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Johnston deForest Whitman, Jr. +1 212 894 7200 +1 212 894 7272 jwhitman@entwistle-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Erez Liebermann

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/13/2005 Erez Liebermann

Toggle Switch Represented by Federman Sherwood

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Bernard Federman +1 405 235 1560 +1 405 239 2112 wbf@federmanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Feldman Franden Woodard & Farris

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R Farris +1 918 583 7129 +1 918 584 3814 jfarris@tulsalawyer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fleming & Associates, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED G. Sean Jez +1 713 621 7944 +1 713 621 9638 sean_jez@fleming-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fleming, Nolen & Jez, L.l.p.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George M. Fleming +1 713 621 7944 +1 713 621 9638 george_fleming@fleming-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Flemming Zulack Williamson Zauderer, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/29/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Linda M Marino +1 212 412 9500 +1 212 964 9200 lmarino@fzwz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fogarty Coen et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James R Fogarty +1 203 661 1000 + 203 629 7319

Toggle Switch Represented by Francis J Trzuskowski

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Francis J Trzuskowski

Toggle Switch Represented by Fredrick G Herold

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/24/2004 Fredrick G Herold

Toggle Switch Represented by Freese, Sigrid H.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amelia Rudolph +1 404 853 8000 + 404 853 8806

Toggle Switch Represented by Friday Porta Cox & Ward

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Glenn DeValerio +1 617 542 8300 +1 617 542 1194 gdevalerio@bermandevalerio.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie Elise Kamps +1 212 859 8000 +1 212 859 4000 julie.kamps@friedfrank.com
LEAD ATTORNEY William G McGuinness +1 212 859 8000 +1 212 859 4000 mcguiwi@ffhsj.com
LEAD ATTORNEY DAVID M. MORRIS +1 212 859 8204 +1 212 859 4000 morrida@friedfrank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rodney Acker +1 214 855 7466 +1 214 855 8200 racker@fulbright.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Linda Leuchter Addison +1 713 651 5628 +1 713 651 5246 linda.addison@nortonrosefulbright.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gerard G. Pecht +1 713 651 5151 +1 713 651 5246 gerard.pecht@nortonrosefulbright.com
TERMINATED: 09/23/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Charles Slusser +1 713 651 5500 +1 713 651 5246 slusser@fulbright.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Futterman & Howard Chtd

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael I Behn +1 312 427 3600 + 312 427 1850

Toggle Switch Represented by GABLE AND GOTWALS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Oliver S Howard +1 918 595 4835 + 918 595 4990

Toggle Switch Represented by Gancedo & Nieves LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hector G. Gancedo +1 626 685 9800 +1 626 685 9808 hgancedo@gancedonieves.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardere Wynne Sewell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Anthony Hagemann +1 713 276 5064 +1 713 276 6064 thagemann@gardere.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert M. Hoffman +1 214 999 4707 +1 214 999 3707 rhoffman@gardere.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Edward Matthews +1 713 276 5760 +1 713 276 6760 wmatthews@gardere.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Stuart Ringold +1 713 276 5488

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deborah J Jeffrey +1 202 778 1800 + 202 822 8106 djeffrey@zuckerman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Garrison Levin-Epstein Chimes & Richardson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ethan A. Levin-Epstein +1 203 777 4425 elevin-epstein@garrisonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gartner Law Firm PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/15/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Dean Gartner +1 713 621 7340 + 713 621 7771

Toggle Switch Represented by Gauthier etl al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/17/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean F Greenwood +1 713 343 1614 +1 713 630 8074 sean@ghwlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gersten & Clifford

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eliot B. Gersten +1 860 527 7044 +1 860 527 4968 egersten@gcrlaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Gholson Hicks & Nichols

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dewitt T Hicks, Jr. +1 662 243 7300 + 662 327 6217 dhicks@ghs-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GIBBS & BRUNS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbs & Bruns, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aundrea K. Frieden +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 afrieden@gibbsbruns.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Kathy Dawn Patrick +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 kpatrick@gibbsbruns.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbs Bruns LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Turner Ross +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 bross@gibbs-bruns.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James L. Hallowell +1 212 351 4000 jhallowell@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marshall Ross King +1 212 351 3905 +1 212 351 5243 mking@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy K Roake +1 650 849 5300 +1 650 849 5333 troake@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Robert F. Serio +1 212 351 3917 +1 212 351 5246 rserio@gibsondunn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gold Bennett Cera & Sidener LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul F. Bennett +1 415 777 2230 +1 415 777 5189 pfb@gbcslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Golden & Owens LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED H Bruce Golden +1 713 223 2600 + 713 223 5002

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein & Lipski LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward W Goldstein +1 713 877 1515 +1 713 877 1145 egoldstein@gliplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodman, Elizabeth

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Wendy Hope Zoberman +1 561 835 9400 +1 561 835 0322

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Douglas Hail +1 212 813 8800 +1 212 355 3733 bhail@goodwinprocter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry G. Flynn +1 713 961 3366 +1 713 961 3938 bflynn@gordonrees.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon Fournaris et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Grover C Brown

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Jay W. Eisenhofer +1 646 722 8512 +1 646 722 8501 jeisenhofer@gelaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SIDNEY STEVEN LIEBESMAN +1 302 622 7000 +1 302 622 7100 sliebesman@gelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Graves, Dougherty, Hearon & Moody, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Helen Currie Foster +1 512 480 5600 +1 512 480 5881 hfoster@gdhm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J. McKetta, III +1 512 480 5600 +1 512 480 5816 mmcketta@gdhm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Green & Green

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick A Green +1 936 756 4545 +1 936 756 4579

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenley Rotenberg et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary I Grenley +1 503 241 0570 +1 503 241 0914

Toggle Switch Represented by Greer Herz Adams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. Mytelka +1 409 797 3200 +1 409 766 6424 amytelka@greerherz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Groom Law Group, Chtd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen M Saxon +1 202 857 0620 + 202 659 4503

Toggle Switch Represented by Gwt Global Weighing Technologies GmbH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Elizabeth Cabraser +1 415 956 1000

Toggle Switch Represented by Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steve William Berman +1 206 623 7292 +1 206 623 0594 steve@hagens-berman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Harrison Bettis et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/04/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D Mitchell McFarland +1 713 843 7900 +1 713 843 7901 mitch.mcfarland@harrisonbettis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hartzog Conger Cason & Neville

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles E Geister, III +1 405 235 7000 +1 405 996 3403 cgeister@hartzoglaw.com
Space Drew Neville, Jr. +1 405 235 7000 +1 405 235 7329 dneville@hartzoglaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED B J Rothbaum +1 405 235 7000 + 405 996 3403

Toggle Switch Represented by Haskell Slaughter et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dorothy R Drake +1 205 251 1000 +1 205 324 1133
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas T Gallion, III +1 334 265 8573 + 334 264 7945
Space Michael K K Choy +1 205 251 1000 +1 205 324 1133
Space Page A Poerschke +1 205 251 1000 pap@hsy.com
Space Constance C Walker +1 334 265 8573 +1 334 264 7945

Toggle Switch Represented by Hawash Meade & Gaston LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/10/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter J Cicack +1 713 658 9001 +1 713 658 9011 wcicack@hmgllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Haynes And Boone, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George W Bramblett, Jr. +1 214 651 5000 +1 214 651 5940 george.bramblett@haynesboone.com
Space Noel M Hensley +1 214 651 5631 +1 214 200 0470 noel.hensley@haynesboone.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jerry L Marks +1 213 689 0200

Toggle Switch Represented by Herrick Feinstein LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason Anthony D'Angelo +1 212 592 5911 jdangelo@herrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hicks Thomas et al.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Taylor Mayo Hicks +1 713 547 9100 +1 713 547 9150 thicks@hicks-thomas.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hoffman Angeli LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY David H. Angeli +1 503 222 1125 +1 503 222 7589 david@hoffmanangeli.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Brad M Johnston +1 212 918 3000
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis H. Tracey, III +1 212 918 3000 +9183 918 918 3100 dhtracey@hhlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Albert William Turnbull +1 202 637 5600 +1 202 637 5910 awturnbull@hhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hoguet Newman et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/25/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael G Davies +1 212 689 8808 + 212 689 5101

Toggle Switch Represented by Holzer Holzer et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Corey D Holzer +1 770 392 0090

Toggle Switch Represented by Horton Shields et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen L Dowd +1 860 522 8338 + 860 728 0401

Toggle Switch Represented by Howard J C Nicols

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Howard J C Nicols

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert E. Gooding, Jr. +1 949 721 6900 +1 949 721 6910 goodingr@howrey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angelo Russo

Toggle Switch Represented by Huckaby Scott et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James C Huckaby, Jr.

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles A Gall +1 214 468 3325 +1 214 880 0011 cgall@hunton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hurwitz Sagarin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Daniel Sagarin +1 203 877 8000

Toggle Switch Represented by Ice Miller

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Petersen +1 317 236 2308 + 317 592 4730

Toggle Switch Represented by Ikard and Golden PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank N. Ikard, Jr. +1 512 472 2884 +1 512 472 3669

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Lynde Babcock +1 214 953 6030 +1 214 953 5822 cbabcock@jw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Glen Morrison Boudreaux +1 713 752 4404 +1 713 754 6712 gboudreaux@jw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jacob Grudberg et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David L Belt +1 203 772 3100 + 203 772 1691

Toggle Switch Represented by Jamail & Kolius

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph D Jamail, Jr. +1 713 651 3000 +1 713 651 1957 denise@joejamail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Janis Schuelke et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/04/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Henry F Schuelke, III +1 202 861 0600 +1 202 861 4750

Toggle Switch Represented by Jeffer, Mangels, Butler & Marmaro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Robert Edwin Mangels +1 415 398 8080 +1 415 398 5584 RMangels@jmbm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jeffrey B Korn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/10/2005 Jeffrey B Korn

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenkens & Gilchrist, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Keith Carter Hannigan +1 312 425 3900 +1 312 425 3909

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Avidan J. Stern +1 312 923 2732 +1 312 840 7732

Toggle Switch Represented by Jill F Kopeikin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/24/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY Jill F Kopeikin

Toggle Switch Represented by Jinks Daniel et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/05/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lynn W Jinks, III +1 334 738 4225

Toggle Switch Represented by John Cooper McDonald

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/11/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY John Cooper McDonald

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David L. Carden +1 212 326 3839 +1 212 755 7306 dlcarden@jonesday.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fordham Eric Huffman +1 614 469 3939 +1 614 461 4198 fehuffman@jonesday.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Micheletto +1 212 326 3690 +1 212 755 7306 rmicheletto@jonesday.com
TERMINATED: 02/11/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY David T. Miller +1 202 879 3939 +1 832 239 3600 dtmiller@jonesday.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Marshall Newman, Jr. +1 216 586 3939 +1 216 579 0212 jmnewman@jonesday.com
TERMINATED: 02/11/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian A Troyer +1 216 586 3939 + 216 579 0212
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hugh R Whiting +1 832 239 3939 +1 832 239 3600 hrwhiting@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Joseph R Wallin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/10/2005 Joseph R Wallin

Toggle Switch Represented by Judicial Watch, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Meredith Cavallo Di Liberto +1 202 646 5172
LEAD ATTORNEY Larry E Klayman +1 202 646 5172

Toggle Switch Represented by K L Gates Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen J Crimmins +1 202 778 9440 +1 202 778 9100

Toggle Switch Represented by Kahn Kleinman et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J Bartolozzi +1 216 736 3345 + 216 623 4912

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaiser & Conrad, L.L.P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffery B Kaiser +1 713 571 8000 +1 713 571 8002 admindesk@kaiserconrad.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert N. Kaplan , +1 212 687 1980 +1 212 687 7714 rkaplan@kaplanfox.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Karin A DeMasi

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/10/2005 Karin A DeMasi

Toggle Switch Represented by Katherine B. Forrest

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/10/2005 Katherine B. Forrest

Toggle Switch Represented by Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dawn Marie Canty +1 312 902 5253 +1 312 577 4416 dawn.canty@kattenlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keith Weber PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Q Keith +1 830 825 3304 +1 830 825 3457

Toggle Switch Represented by Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jan Nielsen Little +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 jlittle@kvn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Erin Maura Riley +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 1900 eriley@kellerrohrback.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lynn Lincoln Sarko +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 lsarko@kellerrohrback.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Britt L. Tinglum +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 btinglum@kellerrohrback.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keller Rohrback, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Gary A. Gotto +1 602 248 0088 +1 602 248 2822

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley Drye & Warren, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Gregory +1 203 324 1400 + 203 327 2669

Toggle Switch Represented by Kellogg Huber et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Reid M Figel +1 202 326 7918
LEAD ATTORNEY Mark C Hansen +1 202 326 7900 + 202 326 7999
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David E Ross +1 202 326 7900 + 202 326 7999
Space David L. Schwarz +1 202 326 7900 +1 202 326 7999 dschwarz@khhte.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ANTONIA M. APPS +1 202 326 7900 +1 202 326 7999

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelly M Klaus

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/18/2005 Kelly M Klaus +1 415 512 4022

Toggle Switch Represented by Kerker Van Nest LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY John W Keker +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilgore & Kilgore PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Theodore C Anderson +1 214 379 0810 +1 214 379 0846 tca@kilgorelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Pennington LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles G King, III +1 713 225 8400 +1 713 225 8488

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul R. Bessette +1 512 457 2100 +1 512 457 2100 pbessette@kslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kker & Van Nest LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Christa M Anderson +1 415 391 5400 + 415 397 7188

Toggle Switch Represented by KMZ Rosenman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Diane da Cunha +1 212 940 8588

Toggle Switch Represented by Krieg Keller Sloan Reilley & Roman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen M Burton +1 415 249 8330
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stan G Roman +1 415 249 8330 + 415 249 8333

Toggle Switch Represented by Krislov & Asoc Ltd

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Jessica J Mead +1 312 606 0500 +1 312 606 0207

Toggle Switch Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan M. Plasse +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 818 0477 jplasse@glrslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ethan Joseph Brown +1 310 229 9300 +1 310 229 9380 valerie.ferguson1@lw.com
Space Charles Ward Cox +1 213 485 1234 +1 213 891 8763 charles.cox@alston.com
Space James Joseph Farrell +1 213 891 8498 +1 213 891 8763 james.farrell@lw.com
Space Gabriel G Gregg +1 415 391 0600 gabriel.gregg@lw.com
Space Christopher R. Harris +1 212 906 1880 +1 212 751 4864 christopher.harris@lw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Douglas Harrison +1 415 395 8202 +1 415 395 8095 matt.harrison@lw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Catherine E. Palmer , +1 212 906 1200 catherine.palmer@lw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Miles Norman Ruthberg +1 212 906 1688 +1 212 751 4864 miles.ruthberg@lw.com
Space Camille N Rybar +1 213 485 1234 +1 213 891 8763
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Allen Wald +1 415 391 0600 +1 415 395 8095 peter.wald@lw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Balam O. Letona

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Ronit Setton +1 212 504 6000 + 212 504 6666

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Bernard M Gross PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deborah R. Gross +1 215 561 3600 +1 215 561 3000 debbie@bernardmgross.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D Stephen Haga, Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Webster +1 817 978 6459 +1 817 978 2700

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Donald E Wood

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George Whittenburg +1 806 372 5700 + 806 372 5757

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Karl Phillip Barth +1 206 623 7292 +1 206 623 0594 karlb@hbsslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of J. R. Hefner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/16/2004 Lauren Ouziel +1 202 223 7334

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of James B Dougherty

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John D Ellis, Jr. +1 713 654 7900 +1 713 650 6815 jdellislaw@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of James C Lee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Richard Blumenthal +1 860 808 5318 +1 860 808 5391

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jennifer Piskun Johnson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Jennifer Piskun Johnson +1 512 371 9910

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Peter H Riddell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Luisa Caro +1 202 736 8000

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert G. Turner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Albert McDermott, III +1 713 527 9190 +1 713 758 0134 rapidly@swbell.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Stephen J. Curley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen James Curley +1 203 327 1317 +1 203 276 8768 scurley@cur-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Steven E Cauley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven E Cauley +1 501 312 8500 + 501 312 8505

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Worrell A Reid

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Zweifach +1 212 832 8300 +1 212 763 7600

Toggle Switch Represented by Lerach Coughlin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Shawn M Hays +1 619 231 1058
TERMINATED: 10/04/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William S Lerach +1 619 231 1058
TERMINATED: 10/04/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY Matthew P Siben +1 619 231 1058

Toggle Switch Represented by Levett Rockwood

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew B Nevas +1 203 222 0885

Toggle Switch Represented by Levett Rockwood, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Madeleine F. Grossman +1 203 222 0885 +1 203 226 8025 litigation@levettrockwood.com
TERMINATED: 03/15/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc J Kurzman +1 203 222 0885 + 203 226 8025

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Richard Martin Heimann +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 rheimann@lchb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Melanie M. Piech +1 415 956 1008

Toggle Switch Represented by Lightfoot Franklin et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Warren B Lightfoot +1 205 581 0700 + 205 581 0799

Toggle Switch Represented by Lightfoot Franklin White LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne Sikes Hornsby, U +1 205 581 0700

Toggle Switch Represented by Lindsay Hart et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carl R Neil +1 503 226 7677

Toggle Switch Represented by Linklaters LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Lawrence Byrne +1 212 903 9000 +1 212 903 9100 larry.byrne@linklaters.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Robert Croffoot-Suede +1 212 903 9100 lance.croffoot-suede@linklaters.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Liskow & Lewis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Hayden Burns +1 713 651 2964 +1 713 651 2908 hburns@liskow.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Litigation Section

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas J Blessington +1 215 560 2414 +1 215 560 2494
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel J Doyle +1 713 787 2944 + 717 772 4526

Toggle Switch Represented by Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Ervin McKay +1 713 226 1200 +1 713 223 3717 kmckay@lockelord.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lockridge Grindal Nauen, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A Lockridge +1 612 339 6900 +1 612 399 0981 ralockridge@locklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by London & Yancey LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/07/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Mark Hart

Toggle Switch Represented by Loughlin Fitzgerald et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John F Conway +1 203 265 2035

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Lowey +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0500 slowey@lowey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil Lewis Selinger +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 nselinger@lowey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lyons, Patricia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Jeniphr Breckenridge +1 206 623 7292 + 206 623 0594

Toggle Switch Represented by Maguire & Schneider

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith W Schneider +1 614 224 1222 + 614 224 1236

Toggle Switch Represented by Mann Cowan et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/05/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ted L Mann +Pleas eus eavalid + 205 879 9663

Toggle Switch Represented by Margaret E McGuinness

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/13/2005 Margaret E McGuinness

Toggle Switch Represented by Margaret K Dooley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/10/2005 Margaret K Dooley

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark H Wildasin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/07/2005 Mark H Wildasin

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew D. Campbell +1 312 782 0600
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Daniel Manela +1 713 238 2645 +1 713 238 4645 mmanela@mayerbrownrowe.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Michele L Odorizzi +1 312 782 0600 +1 312 701 7711 modorizzi@mayerbrown.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Curtis D Ripley +1 312 701 8836 +1 312 706 8332
Space Jordan M Rudnick +1 312 782 0600
Space Alan N Salpeter +1 312 782 0600 +1 312 701 7711 asalpeter@mayerbrownrowe.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Maynard, Cooper & Gale, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED N. Lee Cooper +1 205 254 1000 +2541 254 254 1999 lcooper@maynardcooper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alvin L Fox, Jr. +1 334 262 2001 + 334 262 2043

Toggle Switch Represented by McCallion & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth F McCallion +1 646 366 0880 + 646 366 1384

Toggle Switch Represented by McClanahan Myers Espey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Randy J McClanahan +1 713 223 2005 +1 713 223 3664 randy@mmellp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McCune Zenner & Happell PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Malcolm Leonard McCune +1 615 254 7770 + 615 251 1385

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Bennett Kratenstein +1 212 547 5695 +1 212 547 5444 akratenstein@mwe.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McElroy Deutsch Mulvaney & Carpenter, LLP-Greenwood Village

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Harvey Goldstein +1 860 241 2642 +1 860 522 2796 rgoldstein@mdmc-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mcgehee, Chang, Barnes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack E McGehee +1 713 864 4000 +1 713 868 9393 jmcgehee@lawtx.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald Earl Cook +1 832 214 9955 +1 713 571 9652 rcook@mcguirewoods.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Melissa J. Baily

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/10/2005 Melissa J. Baily

Toggle Switch Represented by Melton Espy & Williams, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin Joseph Espy +1 334 263 6621 +1 334 263 7252 bespy@mewlegal.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Cleodus Espy, III +1 334 263 6621 +1 334 263 7252 jespy@mewlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven H Schulman +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229

Toggle Switch Represented by Mildred M Morris

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY Mildred M Morris

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller & Chevalier Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick P de Gravelles +1 202 626 5842
Space Emmett Boaz Lewis +1 202 626 6090 +1 202 626 5801 elewis@milchev.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark J. Rochon +1 202 626 5800 +1 202 628 0858 mrochon@milchev.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Minton Burton et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roy Q Minton +1 512 476 4873 +1 512 479 8315

Toggle Switch Represented by MITCHELL LAW OFFICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anne Shelby +1 212 373 3000

Toggle Switch Represented by Mithoff Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Janie L Jordan +1 713 654 1122 jjordan@mithofflaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Warren Mithoff, Jr. +1 713 654 1122 +1 713 739 8085 rmithoff@mithofflaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael John Lawson +1 415 442 1000 +1 415 442 1001 michael.lawson@morganlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Moukawsher & Walsh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Joseph Walsh +1 860 549 8440 +1 860 549 8443 mwalsh@mwlawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mullen, Tim

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RON KILGARD +1 602 248 0088

Toggle Switch Represented by Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin S. Allred +1 213 683 9146 +1 213 683 5146 kevin.allred@mto.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Kristin Linsley Myles +1 415 512 4000 +1 415 512 4077 kristin.myles@mto.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Willson Spiegel +1 213 683 9152 +1 213 683 5152 john.spiegel@mto.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Myles Bartley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Myles Bartley

Toggle Switch Represented by Neal Gerber & Eisenberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED H. Nicholas Berberian +1 312 269 8000 + 312 269 1747 nberberian@ngelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nickens Keeton et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacks C Nickens +1 713 353 6668 +1 713 571 9652 jnickens@mcguirewoods.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon M. Barrett +1 202 383 5308 +1 202 383 5414 sbarrett@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Kathleen P Kelly +1 202 383 5350
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey William Kilduff +1 202 383 5300 +1 202 383 5414 jkilduff@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory Yann Porter +1 202 383 5300 + 202 383 5414
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert M. Stern +1 202 383 5328 +1 202 383 5396 rstern@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Karen Mary Wahle +1 202 383 5366 +1 202 383 5313 kwahle@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/14/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Mattax +1 512 463 0150 +1 512 477 2348 david.mattax@oag.state.tx.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Illinois Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Don R. Sampen +1 312 814 3722 + 312 814 1154

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Texas Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rose Ann Reeser +1 512 475 4632 +1 512 477 4544

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogden Gibson Broocks Longoria & Hall LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Wesley Ogden, Jr. +1 713 844 3000 +1 713 844 3030 bogden@ogblh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Oikonomopoulou, Ifigenia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan Allison +1 310 203 8080

Toggle Switch Represented by One State Street

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Louis R. Pepe +1 860 522 5175 +1 860 522 2796 lpepe@pepehazard.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Osborne and Helman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey T Knebel +1 512 542 2031 + 512 542 2011

Toggle Switch Represented by Parmer, Jeffery Kenneth

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Spears +1 212 213 6996 +1 212 213 0849

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul D Clote, Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul D Clote +1 713 659 2800 +1 713 654 0052 p.clote@clotelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Michael E. Gertzman +1 212 373 3281 +1 212 373 2274 mgertzman@paulweiss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Claudia Leslie Hammerman +1 212 373 3321 +1 212 373 2795 chammerman@paulweiss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Jonathan Hillel Hurwitz +1 212 373 3254 +1 212 492 0254 jhurwitz@paulweiss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Brad Scott Karp +1 212 373 2384 +1 212 373 2384 bkarp@paulweiss.com
Space Robert Neil Kravitz +1 212 373 3392 +1 212 373 2730 rkravitz@paulweiss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Mark Floyd Pomerantz +1 212 373 3010 +1 212 373 0010 mpomerantz@paulweiss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Richard A. Rosen +1 212 373 3305 +1 212 373 2359 rrosen@paulweiss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Sandeep N Solanki +1 212 373 3000 + 212 492 0454
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBYN TARNOFSKY +1 212 373 3090 +1 212 492 0090 rtarnofsky@paulweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Penn & Seaborn LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/05/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED L Shane Seaborn +1 334 775 9778

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepe & Hazard, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James G. Green, Jr. +1 860 241 2615 +1 860 522 2796 jgreen@pepehazard.com
Space Douglas R. Steinmetz +1 203 319 4026 +1 203 259 0251 dsteinmetz@pepehazard.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kara L Haberbush +1 202 220 1200 + 202 220 1665
Space Elizabeth T Parker +1 215 981 4000
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew R Skolnik +1 215 891 4000 + 215 981 4750

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul T. Fortino +1 503 727 2014 +1 503 727 2222 pfortino@perkinscoie.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pezold Barker & Woltz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph C Woltz +1 918 584 0506 jwoltz@pbwtulsa.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pezold Richey et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gene G Boerner, III +1 918 584 0506
LEAD ATTORNEY Robert K Pezold +1 918 584 0506

Toggle Switch Represented by Phelps Dunbar LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claude L Stuart, III +1 713 626 1386 +1 713 626 1388 stuartc@phelps.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pierce & O'Neill, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward John Jack O'Neill, Jr. +1 713 634 3638 +1 713 634 3639 joneill@pierceoneill.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Jason Carrington Norwood +1 713 634 3607 +1 713 634 3601 jnorwood@pierceoneill.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Piper Marbury Rudnik & Wolfe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY David Clarke, Jr. +1 202 799 4503

Toggle Switch Represented by PO Box 3307

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Paul Paradis +1 212 889 3700

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stanley Merrill Grossman +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 SMGrossman@pomlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Porter, Wright, Morris & Arthur, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Kingsley Merkle, Jr. +1 614 227 2000 + 614 227 2100

Toggle Switch Represented by Post, Lyle

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Morris +1 302 426 0400 + 302 426 0406

Toggle Switch Represented by Provost Umphrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Thomas Walter Umphrey - PHV +1 409 838 8848 +1 409 838 8888 wu@pulf.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Puls and Liebrecht P C

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Kelly Puls +1 214 363 9393 +1 214 890 1300

Toggle Switch Represented by Purdie & Metz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan M Purdie +1 601 957 1596 +1 601 957 2449

Toggle Switch Represented by Rachel G Skaistis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/10/2005 Rachel G Skaistis

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald J Myers +1 202 419 9231 + 202 414 9299
LEAD ATTORNEY Michael David Richman +1 312 207 1000 +1 202 414 9299 mdrichman@reedsmith.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Douglas Kevin Spaulding +1 202 414 9235 +1 202 414 9299 dspaulding@reedsmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by REICH & BINSTOCK

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Debra Brewer Hayes +1 713 622 7271 dhayes@dhayeslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reinstein & Sherman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip T Reinstein +1 847 498 6630 +1 847 498 2834

Toggle Switch Represented by Reynolds, Frizzell, Black, Doyle, Allen & Oldham, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Kenan Oldham +1 713 485 7200 +1 713 485 7500 oldham@reynoldsfrizzell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Richards Layton et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles F Richards, Jr. +1 302 651 7738

Toggle Switch Represented by Riley Riper et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas A Riley, Jr. +1 610 647 5800 + 610 647 1580

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY James Ian Jaconette +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 jamesj@rgrdlaw.com
TERMINATED: 07/10/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY John A Lowther +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 johnl@csgrr.com
Space Keith Farmer Park +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 keithp@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Rusell Englert Orseck Untereiner & Sauber, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Gary A. Orseck +1 202 775 4504 +1 202 775 4510 gorseck@robbinsrussell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Lawrence Saul Robbins +1 202 775 4501 +1 202 775 4510 lrobbins@robbinsrussell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn Schaefer Zecca +1 202 775 4508 +1 202 775 4510 kzecca@robbinsrussell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Umeda LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian James Robbins +1 619 525 3990 +1 619 525 3991 brobbins@robbinsumeda.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rome McGuigan et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Glenn E Coe +1 860 549 1000 + 860 724 3921
Space Brenda M Hamilton +1 860 549 1000 + 860 724 3921

Toggle Switch Represented by Rothschild Barry et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan S Madans

Toggle Switch Represented by Rusty Hardin and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell Hardin, Jr. +1 713 652 9000 +1 713 652 9800

Toggle Switch Represented by Sannomiya, Takashi

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Neil Rothstein +1 860 537 3818

Toggle Switch Represented by Satterlee Stephens Burke & Burke LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua M. Rubins - PHV +1 212 818 9200 +1 212 818 9606 jrubins@ssbb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schatz & Noble PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew M Schatz +1 860 493 6292

Toggle Switch Represented by Schechter McElwee et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/30/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew D Shaffer +1 713 524 3500 +1 713 751 0412 mshaffer@smslegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard S. Schiffrin +1 610 667 7706 + 610 667 7056

Toggle Switch Represented by Schoengold & Sporn, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel P Sporn +1 212 964 0046 +1 212 267 8137

Toggle Switch Represented by Schopf & Weiss LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paula Enid Litt +1 312 701 9300 +1 312 701 9335 litt@sw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jose A. Lopez +1 312 701 9300 + 312 701 9335 lopez@sw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schwartz Junell Greenburg & Oathout, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger B Greenberg +1 713 752 0017 + 713 752 0327 rgreenberg@schwartz-junell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Austin Schwartz +1 713 752 0017 +1 713 752 0327 dschwartz@sjgolaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Scott & Scott, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY James E Miller +1 860 537 5537

Toggle Switch Represented by Scott and Scott

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Randell Scott +1 860 537 5537 +1 860 537 4432 drscott@scott-scott.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/10/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY Christina Marie Putman +1 713 860 0094 +1 713 225 2340 cputman@seyfarth.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shapiro Haber & Urmy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/07/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED THOMAS G. SHAPIRO +1 617 439 3939 +1 617 439 0134 tshapiro@shulaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Herbert Scott Washer +1 212 848 7216 +1 212 848 7179 herbert.washer@shearman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shepherd, Scott, Clawater & Houston, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George W Billy Shepherd, III +1 713 650 6600 +1 713 650 1720 bshepherd@sschlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheppard Mullin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul S Malingagio +1 213 620 1780 +1 213 620 1398 pmalingagio@sheppardmullin.com
TERMINATED: 05/23/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY Eric Scott O'Connor +1 212 332 3800 +1 212 332 3888 eoconnor@sheppardmullin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shubert and Reed LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C Schubert +1 415 788 4220 + 415 788 0161

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark K Glasser +1 713 315 9002 +1 713 315 9199 mkglasser@sidley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William F Lloyd +1 312 853 7736 + 312 853 7036
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Dana Warden +1 202 736 8080 +1 202 736 8711 mwarden@sidley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Robert A. Bourque +1 212 455 2000 + 214 455 2502 rbourque@stblaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chet Alan Kronenberg +1 818 755 7009 +1 818 755 7009 ckronenberg@stblaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary Elizabeth McGarry +1 212 455 2574 +1 212 455 2502 mmcgarry@stblaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Ann G Rappleye +1 212 455 2000
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roy L. Reardon +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 rreardon@stblaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas C. Rice , +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 trice@stblaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY John D Roesser +1 212 455 3735
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David W. Woll +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 dwoll@stblaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY David W. Woll +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 dwoll@stblaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Jonathan K. Youngwood +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 jyoungwood@stblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sirota & Sirota, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Saul Roffe +1 609 791 7007 +1 609 896 9060 saul@sirotalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Walter Schwartz +1 713 655 5160 +1 888 329 2286 schwartz@skadden.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Slsdrvrs,hlprs,dairy Workers 683

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Bruce Hiler +1 202 383 5300 +1 202 383 5414

Toggle Switch Represented by Smyser Kaplan & Veselka LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig Smyser +1 713 221 2330 +1 713 221 2320 csmyser@skv.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smyser Kaplan Veselka LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Larry R. Veselka +1 713 221 2300 +1 713 221 2320 lveselka@skv.com

Toggle Switch Represented by So Twr Pennzoil Pl

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Abigail K Sullivan +1 713 223 2900 +1 713 221 1212

Toggle Switch Represented by Sound Intellectual Property PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Volk +1 206 623 7292

Toggle Switch Represented by Spotswood LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth D Sansom +1 205 986 3620

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James P +1 202 626 6793

Toggle Switch Represented by Stamper, Teresa

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Conable +1 503 802 2188

Toggle Switch Represented by STANFORD LAW SCHOOL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph A Grundfest +1 650 723 0458 + 650 723 8229

Toggle Switch Represented by Starnes & Atchison

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED W Stancil Starnes +1 205 868 6000 + 205 868 6099

Toggle Switch Represented by Starnes Atchison

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay M Ezelle +1 205 868 6000

Toggle Switch Represented by State Bar Information

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith Alan Ward +1 512 469 0900

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste 1600

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kurt Maguire Rupert +1 405 235 7000 +1 405 996 3403 krupert@hartzoglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste 2000

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/21/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY James J Ormiston +1 713 986 7000 +1 713 986 7100 jormiston@lrmlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste 250

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY James Prentiss Pennington +1 713 225 8400 +1 713 225 8488 jpennington@kandplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste. 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/07/2007 Jonathan T Suder +1 817 334 0400 + 817 334 0401 jts@fsclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste. 304

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andy Tindel +1 903 596 0900 +1 903 596 0909 atindel@andytindel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony C. Epstein +1 202 429 8065 +1 202 261 7507 aepstein@steptoe.com
LEAD ATTORNEY F. Michael Kail +1 202 429 3000 +1 202 429 3902 mkail@steptoe.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Paul J. Ondrasik, Jr. +1 202 429 6486 +1 202 429 3902 msherman@steptoe.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Steuart Tower

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James D Miller +1 212 878 8000 + 212 878 8375

Toggle Switch Represented by Stoel Rives, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barnes H. Ellis +1 503 294 9243 +1 503 220 2480 bhellis@stoel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strickland, Olga P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY David Wertheimer +1 212 918 3000

Toggle Switch Represented by Stull, Stull et al.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tzivia Brody

Toggle Switch Represented by Sugano, Atsushi

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Brody +1 212 687 7230

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 725

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger F Claxton +1 214 969 9029 +1 214 953 0583 roger@claxtonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Harold Braff +1 212 558 4705 +1 212 558 3333 braffd@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam R Brebner +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 291 9229 brebnera@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Eric Johnson +1 310 712 6600 +1 310 712 8800 johnsonee@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Steven John Purcell +1 212 558 1657 +1 212 558 4371 purcells@sullcrom.com
Space Daniel H R Laguardia +1 212 558 4000
Space Michael Thomas Tomaino, Jr. +1 212 558 4715 +1 212 558 3588 tomainom@sullcrom.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan Cormwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julian C Swearengin +1 212 558 7296 + 212 558 3588

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth S. Marks +1 713 651 9366 +1 713 654 6666 kmarks@susmangodfrey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen D. Susman +1 713 653 7801 +1 713 654 6666 ssusman@susmangodfrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Baskin Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Dollar Baskin, III +1 512 381 6300 +1 512 322 9280 jbaskin@baskin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Bilek Law Firm, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Emerson Bilek +1 713 227 7720 +1 713 227 9404 tbilek@hb-legal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Hartnett Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/20/2012 Jim Hartnett, Jr. +1 214 742 4655 +1 214 855 7857

Toggle Switch Represented by The Spencer Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bonnie E Spencer +1 713 961 7770 +1 713 961 5336 bonniespencer@spencer-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WARNER LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Thomas Warner +1 281 664 7777 +1 281 664 7773 pwarner@warner-law.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas, Sherry

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Milo Petranovich +1 503 778 2100 + 503 778 2200

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Knight LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/06/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Burton Shoebotham +1 713 653 8668 +1 832 397 8270 jonathan.shoebotham@tklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson Hine, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED WILLIAM C. WILKINSON +1 614 469 3266 William.Wilkinson@ThompsonHine.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tomlins & Goins

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Ronald E Goins +1 918 747 6500

Toggle Switch Represented by Tonkon Torp LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Zachary W L Wright +1 503 802 2041 +1 503 802 3741 zach.wright@tonkon.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William F. Martson, Jr. +1 503 802 2005 +1 503 972 3705 rick.martson@tonkon.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Amy Joseph Pedersen +1 503 802 2110

Toggle Switch Represented by TROUT CACHERIS, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert P. Trout +1 202 464 3300 +1 202 463 3319 rtrout@troutcacheris.com

Toggle Switch Represented by TSE Enterprises, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary Ellen Fairfield +1 614 464 6335 +1 614 719 4707 mefairfield@vorys.com

Toggle Switch Represented by TYLER, COOPER ET AL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ralph G Elliot +1 860 725 6200 + 860 278 3802

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Labor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Robin Springberg Parry +1 202 693 5614 +1 202 693 5610 parry.robin@dol.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Alan Schloss +1 202 693 5603 +1 202 693 5610 schloss.michael@dol.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/20/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Vizcarrondo, Jr. +1 212 403 1000 +1 212 403 2000 pvizcarrondo@wlrk.com
TERMINATED: 05/20/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan E Pickhardt +1 212 403 1000

Toggle Switch Represented by Walker Bryant et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph F Welborn, III +1 615 313 6002

Toggle Switch Represented by Watts Guerra Craft LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mikal C. Watts +1 800 994 0019 +1 210 447 0501 mcw@wgclawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin J. Bienenstock +1 212 310 8000

Toggle Switch Represented by Weiss & Yourman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph H Weiss +1 212 682 3025

Toggle Switch Represented by Weitzman Law Offices, LLC (NJ)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J Sussman +1 713 226 1132 +1 713 229 2523

Toggle Switch Represented by Weston Benshoof Rochefort Rubalcava & MacCuish LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew M Gilford +1 213 576 1000
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David S MacCuish +1 213 576 1000

Toggle Switch Represented by Whatley Drake & Kallas LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joe Ramon Whatley, Jr. +1 212 447 7070 +1 212 447 7077 jwhatley@wdklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Whatley Drake LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Harrington Burke +1 205 328 9576
LEAD ATTORNEY G. Douglas Jones +1 205 328 9576 +3289 328 328 9669

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Case LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Alexander Merryman +1 213 620 7700 +1 213 687 0758 bmerryman@whitecase.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Owen C Pell +1 212 819 8891 +1 212 354 8113 opell@whitecase.com
Space Johanna S Wilson +1 212 819 8200

Toggle Switch Represented by Whittenburg Whittenburg & Schachter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Karl L Baumgardner +1 806 372 5700 + 806 372 5757
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan L Burnette +1 806 372 5700 + 806 372 5757
LEAD ATTORNEY Raymond P Harris, Jr. +1 214 999 5700
LEAD ATTORNEY C Jared Knight +1 806 372 5700 + 806 372 5757
LEAD ATTORNEY Cary Ira Schacht +1 214 999 5700 + 214 999 5747

Toggle Switch Represented by Wick Phillips Gould & Martin, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brant C Martin +1 214 740 4033 + 817 338 1416 brant.martin@wickphillips.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiggin & Dana LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J Kelleher +1 203 363 7638 + 203 363 7676
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William H. Prout, Jr. +1 203 498 4400 +1 203 782 2889 wprout@wiggin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY George Anthony Borden +1 202 434 5563 +1 202 434 5029 gborden@wc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Mary G Clark +1 202 434 5113 + 202 434 5029
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gilbert O Greenman
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John K. Villa +1 202 434 5000 +1 202 434 5029 jvilla@wc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilshire Scott et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacalyn D Scott +1 713 651 1221 +1 713 651 0020

Toggle Switch Represented by Winstead PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey C King +1 817 420 8200 +1 817 420 8201 jking@winstead.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wise Carter et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George Q Evans +1 601 968 5500
LEAD ATTORNEY Douglas E Levanway +1 601 968 5551 +1 601 968 5519

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel W. Krasner +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 krasner@whafh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert B Weintraub +1 212 545 4689 +1 212 545 4653 weintraub@whafh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Horowitz et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew M Horowitz +1 860 724 6667 + 860 293 1979

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf, Block, Schorr and Solis-Cohen, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DANA B. KLINGES +1 215 977 2000 + 215 977 2632

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf, Popper, Ross, Wolf & Jones, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Craig Finkel +1 212 759 4600 +1 212 486 2093 rfinkel@wolfpopper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Robert M. Kornreich +1 212 759 4600 +1 212 486 2093 rkornreich@wolfpopper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wright Brown Close LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harvey G Brown, Jr. +1 713 572 4321 +1 713 572 4320 brown@wrightbrownclose.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yetter Coleman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles R Parker +1 713 632 8000 +1 713 632 8002 cparker@yettercoleman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Autry W Ross +1 713 632 8000 +1 713 632 8002 aross@yettercoleman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R Paul Yetter +1 713 632 8000 +1 713 632 8002 pyetter@yettercoleman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by YOUNG, PICKETT & LEE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Damon Michael Young +1 903 794 1303 +1 903 792 5098 dyoung@youngpickettlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zeiger & Carpenter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Wolcott Zeiger +1 614 365 4100

Toggle Switch Represented by Zeldes, Needle & Cooper, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David P Atkins +1 203 333 9441 + 203 333 1489

Toggle Switch Represented by Zimmerman Reed PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Selcer Zimmerman +1 612 341 0400 +1 612 341 0844 csz@zimmreed.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zimmern Law Firm PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Andrew Zimmern +1 713 529 4999

Toggle Switch Represented by Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Norman L. Eisen +1 202 778 1824 +1 202 822 8106 neisen@zuckerman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Bell Eisenberg +1 410 332 0400 + 410 659 0436
Space Amy Margaret McNamer +1 202 551 4507 +1 202 772 9231 amcnamer@zuckerman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger Eric Zuckerman +2027781 800 ext1802 +1 202 822 8106 rzuckerman@zuckerman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zwerling Schachter et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A Speirs +1 212 223 3900 + 212 371 5969
LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey C Zwerling +1 212 223 3900
No Logo James Bouillion, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hays McConn Rice & Pickering PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Stephen Hays +1 713 654 1111 +1 713 650 0027 mhays@haysmcconn.com
No Logo Judicial Panel Multidistrict Litigation, Party of Interest
No Logo Mike Lange, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mike Lange +1 203 366 8413
No Logo Reinhardt Lange, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith & Hultin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Reinhardt Lange +1 203 366 8413
  Entries (464) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None
Clerks Notice regarding CMECF notice returned undeliverable from zimmern@netzero.net on the account of Kenneth Andrew Zimmern. The referenced email address has been deleted from your CM/ECF account, filed. (tferguson, ) (Entered: 09/20/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None
    Clerks Notice regarding CMECF notice returned undeliverable from rcook@nickenskeeton.com on the account of Ronald Earl Cook. The referenced notice was sent prior to you changing your email address, filed. (tferguson, ) (Entered: 09/20/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None
      Clerks Notice regarding CMECF notice returned undeliverable from rcook@nickenskeeton.com on the account of Ronald Earl Cook. The referenced email address has been deleted from your CM/ECF account, filed. (tferguson, ) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None
        Clerks Notice regarding CMECF notice returned undeliverable from jnickens@nickenskeeton.com on the account of Jacks C Nickens. The referenced email address has been deleted from your CM/ECF account, filed. (tferguson, ) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER Re ALGIS V. PLIOPLYS denying 454 Motion to Reinstate.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None
            Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Jonathan H Waller as to Sierra Pacific Resources and Nevada Power Company re: 456 Notice re Undeliverable Email, filed. (thanniable, ) Updated address and re-noticed document (Entered: 08/30/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None
              Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Malcolm Leonard McCune as to Enron Corp Securities, Derivative & "ERISA" Litigation re: 461 Notice re Undeliverable Email. Updated address, re-sent notice, filed. (gkelner, ) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
                Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney William Kelly Puls re: 464 Notice re Undeliverable Email, filed. (mmapps, ) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None
                  Letter from Jim Hartnett re: removing attorney from service list, filed. (mmapps, ) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None
                    Clerks Notice regarding CMECF notice returned undeliverable from kelly@pllawpc.com on the account of William Kelly Puls. The referenced email address has been deleted from your CM/ECF account, filed. (tferguson, ) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None
                      Clerks Notice regarding CMECF notice returned undeliverable from michael.lawson@morganlewis.com on the account of Michael John Lawson. The referenced email address has been deleted from your CM/ECF account, filed. (tferguson, ) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None
                        Clerks Notice regarding CMECF notice returned undeliverable from edwardcochran@adelphia.net on the account of Edward W Cochran. The referenced email address has been deleted from your CM/ECF account, filed. (tferguson, ) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None
                          Clerks Notice regarding CMECF notice returned undeliverable from mmccune@blackburnandmccune.com on the account of Malcolm Leonard McCune. The referenced email address has been deleted from your CM/ECF account, filed. (tferguson, ) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None
                            Clerks Notice regarding CMECF notice returned undeliverable from admindesk@kaiserconrad.com on the account of Jeffery B Kaiser. The referenced email address has been deleted from your CM/ECF account, filed. (tferguson, ) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None
                              Clerks Notice regarding CMECF notice returned undeliverable from maedwards@lockelord.com on the account of Kenneth E McKay. The referenced email address has been deleted from your CM/ECF account, filed. (tferguson, ) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None
                                Clerks Notice regarding CMECF notice returned undeliverable from rsussman@lockelord.com on the account of Robert J Sussman. The referenced email address has been deleted from your CM/ECF account, filed. (tferguson, ) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None
                                  Clerks Notice regarding CMECF notice returned undeliverable from trechen@pepehazard.com on the account of Thomas J Rechen. The referenced email address has been deleted from your CM/ECF account, filed. (tferguson, ) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None
                                    Clerks Notice regarding CMECF notice returned undeliverable from jwaller@cwp-law.com on the account of Jonathan H Waller. The referenced email address has been deleted from your CM/ECF account, filed. (tferguson, ) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None
                                      Clerks Notice regarding CMECF notice returned undeliverable from rspeirs@zsz.com on the account of Richard A Speirs. The referenced email address has been deleted from your CM/ECF account, filed. (tferguson, ) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None
                                        MOTION for Reinstatement, Admission of Facts and Ex-Parte Motion for Order for Relief Concerning Algis V Plioplys by Algis V. Plioplys, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/4/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(glyons) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 452 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: 5/20/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting 446 Unopposed MOTION Revoke Request for Exclusion from Newby Settlement Classes.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(sjones, ) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 451 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: 5/20/2009 Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                              ORDER Dismissing claims with prejudice and without costs or attorney fees.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(sjones, ) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: 5/20/2009 Notice of Dismissal
                                                NOTICE of Dismissal as to Robert Belfer; Norman Blake; Ronnie Chan; Jon Duncan; Paulo Ferraz Pereira; Joe Foy; Wendy Gramm; Ken L. Harrison; Robert Jaedicke; Charles LeMaistre; Rebecca mark-Jusbasche; John Mendelsohn; Jerome Meyer; Frank Savage; John Urquhart; John Wakeham; Charls Walker; Bruce Willison; and Hebert Winokur by Paul Okomo, filed. (sjones, ) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: 4/20/2009 Response
                                                  RESPONSE to 446 Unopposed MOTION Revoke Request for Exclusion from Newby Settlement Classes, filed by The Regents of the University of California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Greenberg, Roger) (Entered: 04/20/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: 4/7/2009 Proposed Order
                                                    PROPOSED ORDER - CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: 446 Unopposed MOTION Revoke Request for Exclusion from Newby Settlement Classes, filed.(Krinsk, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: 4/7/2009 Proposed Order
                                                      PROPOSED ORDER REVOKING PAUL OKOMOS REQUEST FOR EXCLUSION FROM NEWBY SETTLEMENT CLASSES re: 446 Unopposed MOTION Revoke Request for Exclusion from Newby Settlement Classes, filed.(Krinsk, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/3/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                        Unopposed MOTION Revoke Request for Exclusion from Newby Settlement Classes by Paul Okomo, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/23/2009. (Krinsk, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/03/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: 3/19/2009 Letter
                                                          Letter from attorney Donald A Wall requesting removal of himself and Squire Sanders & Dempsey LLP from future communications, filed. (ltien, ) (Entered: 03/19/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: 2/2/2009 Letter
                                                            Letter from Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP requesting removal of attorney Bruce Angiolillo from all notification in all Enron-related cases, filed.(ltien, ) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: 1/16/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                              NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Matthew L. Tuccillo by Nathaniel Pulsifer, filed. (Greenberg, Roger) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 Conditional Transfer Order
                                                                JPML CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER (certified copy) transferring case 4:03cv5808 to Eastern District of Pennsylvania to be included in MDL Docket No. 1446. (ltien, ) (Entered: 07/29/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting 439 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John A Lowther terminated.(Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) Parties notified.(ypippin, ) (Entered: 07/14/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 Proposed Order
                                                                    PROPOSED ORDER re: 439 MOTION for John A. Lowther to Withdraw as Attorney, filed.(Greenberg, Roger) (Entered: 07/09/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                      MOTION for John A. Lowther to Withdraw as Attorney by The Regents of the University of California, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/29/2008. (Greenberg, Roger) (Entered: 07/09/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        RECOMMENDATION OF REMAND TO JPMDL re: CA H 04-324 Unicredito Italiano Spa and Bank Bolska Kasa Opieki SA vs. J.P. Morgan Chase Bank et al.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 12/11/2007)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          OPINION AND ORDER re: CA 04-324 (#158) Unicredito Italiano SpA and Bank Polska Kasa Opieki's motion for recommendation of remand is granted; recommendation will issue by separate instrument. CA H 03-3393 (#217) and CA H 05-3031 (#148) Motions to change venue to Southern District of New York are granted, provided JPMDL remands Unicredito. Until the Panel issues its decision, DK Acquisition and Avenue Capital are stayed.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 12/11/2007)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007 Mail Returned Undeliverable
                                                                            Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Keith Carter Hannigan re: 426 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, filed. (esmith, ) (Entered: 11/21/2007)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                              MOTION for Johnathan T Suder to Withdraw as Attorney by Enron Corp Securities, Derivative & "ERISA" Litigation, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/27/2007. (dbiagas, ) (Entered: 11/16/2007)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: 10/23/2007 Mail Returned Undeliverable
                                                                                Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Guy C Quinlan re: 426 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, filed. (tcampbell, ) (Entered: 10/23/2007)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: 10/23/2007 Mail Returned Undeliverable
                                                                                  Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Robert S Banks, Jr re: 426 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, filed. (tcampbell, ) (Entered: 10/23/2007)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Mail Returned Undeliverable
                                                                                    Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Robert S Banks, Jr re: 427 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, filed. (dpower, ) (Entered: 10/19/2007)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007 Letter
                                                                                      Letter from Mildred Morris re: removing name frm the certificate of service, filed. (dbiagas, ) (Entered: 10/18/2007)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007 Letter
                                                                                        Letter from Mildred M Morris re: Remove name from the certificate of service, filed. (dbiagas, ) (Entered: 10/18/2007)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007 Letter
                                                                                          Letter from John C. McDonald re: removal from service list, filed. (rvazquez, ) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                            NOTICE to Withdraw as Attorney J D Lee,PLLC re: 426 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Enron Corp Securities, Derivative & "ERISA" Litigation, filed. (dbiagas, ) (Entered: 10/15/2007)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting 424 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney William S Lerach terminated.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(bgoolsby, ) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting 422 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Matthew P Siben terminated.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(bgoolsby, ) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                  PROPOSED ORDER re: 424 MOTION for William S. Lerach to Withdraw as Attorney, filed.(Greenberg, Roger) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                    MOTION for William S. Lerach to Withdraw as Attorney by The Regents of the University of California, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/22/2007. (Greenberg, Roger) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                      PROPOSED ORDER re: 422 MOTION for Matthew P. Siben to Withdraw as Attorney, filed.(Greenberg, Roger) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                        MOTION for Matthew P. Siben to Withdraw as Attorney by The Regents of the University of California, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/22/2007. (Greenberg, Roger) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Firm Name Change re Coughlin Stoia Geller Rudman & Robbins LLP by The Regents of the University of California, filed. (Greenberg, Roger) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: 4/6/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                            NOTICE of MASTER LIST of Motions Not Affected By Fifth Circuit Ruling Regarding Section 10 Liability by Outside Directors Enron, filed. (Ross, Brian) (Entered: 04/06/2007)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/20/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                              NOTICE Notice to All Parties in All Pending Enron Tagalong and Coordinated Cases by Outside Directors Enron, filed. (Ross, Brian) (Entered: 03/20/2007)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/1/2006 Entry
                                                                                                                Letter to USDC SDNY requesting transfer of case 1:06-7082 for inclusion in MDL 1446 with certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order from JPML , filed. (ddar, ) (Entered: 12/01/2006)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: 12/1/2006 Letter
                                                                                                                  Letter from JPML and certified copy of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-34) re: MDL 1446 transferring Southern District of New York Case 1:06-7082 Silvercreek Management Inc et al v CIBC World Markets Inc et al to the Southern District of Texas, filed. (ddar, ) (Entered: 12/01/2006)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Submission of Letter by Settlement Class Members, filed. (Kieve, Loren) (Entered: 11/29/2006)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 415 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 Miscellaneous HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      THIS ENTRY IS COPY OF 1217 minutes filed in Tittle, 01-3913, Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Melinda Harmon. FINAL APPROVAL HEARING held on 7/24/2006, as to Northern Trust. Appearances:See attached for Appearances.(Court Reporter: Cher Barron), filed.(htippen, ) (Entered: 07/24/2006)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 7/3/2006, Entered: 7/3/2006 Mail Returned Undeliverable
                                                                                                                        Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney James G Green, Jr re: 411 Clerk's Notice , filed. (sbyrum, ) (Entered: 07/03/2006)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006 Order Striking DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER striking 403 Reply to Response to Motion. Pleading does not comply with Order No. 4018 in CV 01-3624 issued 10/11/05.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(ltien, ) (Entered: 06/16/2006)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 412 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: 6/14/2006 Document
                                                                                                                            Opposition of Bank Defendants to Third-Party Defendant Michael Krautz' Motion for Leave to Take Fact Depositions by JPMorgan Chase & Co, Deutsche Banc Securities Inc, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Simms, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/14/2006)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                              CLERKS NOTICE of Entry of Orders on Class Certification. Parties notified, filed. (rwestmoreland, ) (Entered: 06/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006 Mail Returned Undeliverable
                                                                                                                                Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Kathleen P Kelly re: 390 Order, , filed. (sbyrum, ) (Entered: 06/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006 Mail Returned Undeliverable
                                                                                                                                  Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney John H Boone re: 395 Order,, , filed. (swhite) (Entered: 06/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 408 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER OF COORDINATION into MDL 1446. Lead Case No. 4:01cv3624 Mark Newby et al vs Enron Corporation and Member Case No. 4:06cv1785.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 06/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: 6/2/2006 Mail Returned Undeliverable
                                                                                                                                      Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney James G Green, Jr re: 395 Order,, , filed. (csonnier, ) (Entered: 06/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006 Mail Returned Undeliverable
                                                                                                                                        Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney James N Benedict re: 395 Order,, , filed. (RTS)(sguevara, ) (Entered: 05/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: 5/26/2006 Settlement ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Melinda Harmon. FINAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held on 5/24/2006. Appearances: See Attached. (Court Reporter: Fred Warner) Ref CA H 03-2240 Conseco Annuity Assurance Co vs Citigroup et al; CA H 02-3401 Washington State Investment Board et al; CA H 01-3624 Newby et al vs Enron Corp et al. Final Settlement hearing held as to the Citigroup defendants, CIBC defendants, and JP Morgan Chase defendants. Objections as stated on the record. Amended Orders of Final Judgment and Dismissal executed on the record. Plaintiff's request for Order awarding partial reimbursement of lead plaintiff's expenses is granted.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 05/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: 5/24/2006 Mail Returned Undeliverable
                                                                                                                                            Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Robert Q Keith re: 395 Order,, , filed. (mkallie, ) (Entered: 05/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: 5/24/2006 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to 394 MOTION to Amend, filed by Joe H Walker, et al. (thanniable, ) (Entered: 05/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: 5/22/2006 Order on Motion to AmendCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER: The Financial Institutions and Enron Corp 394 Motion with Respect to Certain Discovery Deadlines in the Cases Coordinated or Consolidated with Newby or Tittle and in Enron Corp v. Citigroup Inc, No. 03-09266 (SDNY. Bankr), along with responses and replies is DENIED.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(psmith, ) (Entered: 05/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: 5/17/2006 Mail Returned Undeliverable
                                                                                                                                                  Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Kristin L Myles re: 390 Order, , filed. (mperales, ) (Entered: 05/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: 5/16/2006 Reply in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                    REPLY in Support of 394 MOTION to Amend, filed by Enron Corp Securities, Derivative & "ERISA" Litigation, JPMorgan Chase & Co, Deutsche Banc Securities Inc, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Enron Corp. (Simms, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to 394 MOTION to Amend, filed by Vinson & Elkins LLP. (ejuarez, ) (Entered: 05/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: 5/11/2006 Mail Returned Undeliverable
                                                                                                                                                        Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Robert Q Keith re: 390 Order, , filed. (kejones, ) (Entered: 05/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                          Opposed RESPONSE to 394 MOTION to Amend, filed by American National Insurance Company, Bayerische Landesbank, Connecticut Resources Recovery Authority, DK Acquisitions Partners, Ravenswood Capital - I, L.L.C., Yosemite Securities Trust I, Westboro Properties LLC. (Elkin, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006 Mail Returned Undeliverable
                                                                                                                                                            Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Sean M Murphy re: 390 Order, , filed. (mkallie, ) (Entered: 05/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/8/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER on the Request for Expedited Consideration of the Financial Institutions and Enron Corp. for their Motion with Respect to Certain Discovery Deadlines in the cases coordinated or consolidated with Newby or Tittle and in Enron Corp. v. Citigroup Inc., No. 03-09266 (S.D.N.Y. Bankr.)is GRANTED. Any Opposition to said motion shall be filed by May 15, 2006, and replies shall be filed May 19, 2006. ( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(espencer, ) Modified on 5/9/2006 (espencer, ). (Entered: 05/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: 5/5/2006 Motion to Amend
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION with Respect to Certain Discovery Deadlines and REQUEST for Expedited Consideration by JPMorgan Chase & Co, Deutsche Banc Securities Inc, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/25/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simms, Nicholas) Modified on 5/22/2006 (ltien, ). (Entered: 05/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: 5/2/2006 Mail Returned Undeliverable
                                                                                                                                                                  Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney James N Benedict re: 390 Order, , filed. (ledwards, ) (Entered: 05/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: 4/20/2006 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven F Helfand, Helfand Law Offices, counsel for Consolidated Plaintiff John W Davis in Enron Corp Securities, Derivative & "ERISA" Litigation (H 02-3401, H 03-2240), filed. (ddarneille, ) (Entered: 04/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: 4/20/2006 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address by James E Coleman, Jr of Carrington, Coleman, Sloman & Blumenthal LLP, counsel for Kenneth L Lay, filed. (H 01-3624, H 01-3913, H 01-3645 and member case H 02-3939)(ddarneille, ) (Entered: 04/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: 4/20/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        COPY OF ORDER #1179 IN H-01-3913. Order Preliminarily Approving Partial Settlement with Northern Trust, Conditionally Certifying Class for Purposes of Settlement, Approving Form and Manner of Notice, and Scheduling Hearing on Fairness of Settlement Pursuant to Federal Rule Civil Procedure 23(E).( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(espencer, ) (Entered: 04/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: 4/20/2006 Minute EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          COPY OF Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Melinda Harmon. Proceedings held on 4/20/2006. MOTION for Settlement in H-01-3913. Final Hearing on Settlement set for July 24, 2006 at 1:30 p.m. Appearances:See Attached Appearance Sheet.(Court Reporter: Bruce Slavin), filed.(espencer, ) (Entered: 04/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: 4/17/2006 Motion for Clarification
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Amend July 11, 2003 Scheduling Order by JPMorgan Chase & Co, Deutsche Banc Securities Inc, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/8/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simms, Nicholas) Modified on 4/18/2006 (htippen, ). (Entered: 04/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 4/5/2006, Entered: 4/5/2006 Certified Mail Receipt Returned
                                                                                                                                                                              Certified Mail Receipt Returned as to USDC - SDNY, executed on 3/27/06 , filed. (espencer, ) (Entered: 04/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSFER LETTER Request to Southern District of New York CA 1:05-8743 Westpac Banking Corp vs Citibank NA and CA 1:05-6939 Westpac Banking Corp vs Citibank NA requesting case files be transferred to be included in MDL 1446.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 03/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                  JPML TRANSFER ORDER (certified copy) transferring USDC Southern District of New York Case 1:05-6939 Westpac Banking Corp vs Citibank NA for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings in to MDL 1446 Enron Corp Securities, Derivateive & ERISA Litigation. (kmurphy, ) (Entered: 03/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: 3/9/2006 Class Certification HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Melinda Harmon. CLASS CERTIFICATION HEARING held on 3/8/2006. Hearing continued on 1445 . Lead Plaintiff's Amended Motion For Class Certification. Appearances as stated on the record. Argument heard. Exhibits admitted. Final argument. The Court will take the matter under advisement. Appearances:see attached appearance list.(Court Reporter: S. Carlisle-Neisser), filed.(ghassan, ) (Entered: 03/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/9/2006 Class Certification HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Melinda Harmon. CLASS CERTIFICATION HEARING held on 3/7/2006. Hearing held on 1445 . Lead Plaintiff's Amended Motion For Class Certification. Appearances as stated on the record. Argument heard. Exhibits and witnesses presented for the record. Hearing will continue on 03/08/06 at 9:00 a.m. Appearances:See attached appearance list.(Court Reporter: S. Carlisle-Neisser), filed.(ghassan, ) (Entered: 03/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/23/2006 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Melinda Harmon. Hearing held on ([#4433]) Motion for Prelimiinary Approval of Proposed Settlements with Citigroup Inc. The Court preliminarily approves the settlements. Order amending Notice of Pedency and partial Settlement of Class Actions and Orders Preliminarily approving Settlement executed on the record. Final fairness hearing set 5/24/2006 at 9:00 a.m.MOTION HEARING held on 2/22/2006. Appearances:See Attached List.(Court Reporter: June Simon), filed.(lfilmore, ) (Entered: 02/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Melinda Harmon. MOTION HEARING held on 1/12/2006 on Tittle Pltfs' Motion for Class Certification. Presentation & arguments by counsel. Northern Trust is granted leave to supplement the record by 1/20/06. Pltfs to respond by 1/27/06. Appearances: Linda L Addison, Thomas E Bilek, Aundrea Kristine Frieden, Michael Kenan Oldham, Lynn Lincoln Sarko, Britt L Tinglum, Zachary W L Wright. See list attached to minutes for additional counsel present.(Court Reporter: A. Manley), filed.(djustice, ) (Entered: 01/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: 1/11/2006 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            (THIS IS A DUPLICATE OF 4397 MINUTES IN 01-3624] - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Melinda Harmon. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 1/11/2006. Defts' Expert Report and rebuttal to Pltfs' Expert Report due by 02/08/06. The Class Certification Hearing set 01/17/06 is RESET TO 02/27/06 at 9:30 a.m. at Courtroom 9C before Judge Melinda harmon. Appearances:See Attached For Appearances.(Court Reporter: Stephanie Carlisle), filed.(htippen, ) (Entered: 01/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 12/27/2005, Entered: 12/30/2005 Mail Returned Undeliverable
                                                                                                                                                                                              Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Edward W Cochran re: 376 Clerks Notice , filed. (ypippin, ) (Entered: 12/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 12/27/2005, Entered: 12/30/2005 Mail Returned Undeliverable
                                                                                                                                                                                                Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Sean M Murphy re: 376 Clerks Notice , filed. (ypippin, ) (Entered: 12/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: 12/9/2005 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                  JPMDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER 33 (certified copy) transferring SD New York 1:05-8743 Westpac Banking Corp vs Citibant NA to be included in MDL 1446 Enron Corp Securities et al. (kmurphy, ) (Entered: 12/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 12/9/2005 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERKS NOTICE re: 373 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Parties notified, filed. (rwestmoreland, ) (Entered: 12/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION & ORDER dismissing Action CA H 04-1648 City of Montgomery, Alabama Employees' Retirement System vs Kenneth Lay et al. (Ref CA 04-1648 #41). (kmurphy, ) (Entered: 12/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 374 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sixth Quarterly Report To The Courts On The Progress Of The Deposition Progress by Bank Defendants, filed.(ctaylor, ) (Entered: 12/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting Enron Corp's 371 Motion for Confidentiality.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 12/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: 11/28/2005 Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER OF DISMISSAL of Ca H 05-981 Sierra Pacific Resources et al vs Citigroup Inc. et al.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 11/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                              UNOPPOSED MOTION for Confidentiality by Enron Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/5/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order; # 2 Affidavit Marisa Bascope;# 3 Continuation Affidavit of Marisa Bascope;# 4 Exhibit Declaration of Angel Esguerra)(jmarchand, ) (Entered: 11/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                (COPY OF 4162 ORDER IN CA H-01-3624) ORDER REGARDING PRESUMPTIVE DOCUMENT AUTHENTICITY AND PRESUMPTIVE BUSINESS RECORDS granting ( 4098 in CA 01-3624) Motion Of Lead Plaintiff, The Private Action Plaintiffs, The Tittle Plaintiffs, The Department of Labor, Enron Corp., The Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp., and the Financial Institution Dependants For Entry Of An Order Regarding Presumptive Document Authenticity And Presumptive Business Records.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon, Jointly signed by United States Bankruptcy Judge Arthur J Gonzalez) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 11/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: 11/13/2005 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Motion Hearing re: 348 MOTION for Clarification, 350 MOTION for Discovery MOTION to Expedite Consideration MOTION to Expedite Consideration by Bank Defendants, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/29/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(rwestmoreland, ) (Entered: 11/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/10/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Amending Expert Discovery Schedule in the Cases Coordinated & Consolidated with Newby & Tittle.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 11/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/10/2005 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPINION AND ORDER on 348 (Ref #3888 CA H 01-3624)Motions for Clarification of Scheduling Order and 349 and 350 Motion with Respect to Expert Discovery in Consolidated and Coordinated Cases.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 11/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to motions for class certification (#1445 in H-01-3624, #447 in H-01-3913). Plaintiffs in each action shall file by 11/30/05 a summary of no more than five pages identifying the issues still viable that need to be addressed. Counsel in the Tittle action shall appear for a class certification hearing on 1/12/06 at 1:30pm in Courtroom 9C. Counsel in the Newby action shall appear for a class certification hearing on 1/17/06 at 9:30am.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(ltien, ) (Entered: 11/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition to MOTION for Entry of an Order Regarding Presumptive Document Authenticity and Presumptive Business Records and Request for Expedited Consideration (Newby Instrument No. 4098) (Sumoski, Diane) Title of entry corrected on 11/15/2005 (ltien, ). Refer to Civil Action No. H-01-3624 #4131. (Entered: 11/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL (Westboro #14) AND PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEUTSCHE BANK TO REFRAIN FROM INSTRUCTING WITNESSES DURING QUESTIONING (MDL 1446)- granting (#14 in CA H-03-1276) Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Deutsche Bank is to designate and present a knowledgeable 30(b)(6) witness on each and every one of the matters and transactions previously noticed. It is further ORDERED that 341 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Deutsche Bank to Refrain from Instruction Witnesses During the Questioning is GRANTED. Given the fact that time for discovery is drawing to a close, it may be necessary for the parties to take this additional deposition after 11/30/05. The Court authorizes the taking of this additional deposition as soon as possible, even if it must be taken after the close of discovery.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 11/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: 10/31/2005 Reply in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reply Brief in Support of 341 Joinder in 340 MOTION to Compel Deutsche Bank to refrain from improperly instructing witnesses during questioning, filed by The Regents of the University of California, The Variable Annuity Life Insurance Company. (ltien, ) (Entered: 10/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/28/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference Call held on 10/7/2005, before Judge Melinda Harmon. ORIGINAL TRANSCRIPT IS FILED IN C.A. H-01-3913. Court Reporter: K. Metzger , filed. (dclark, ) (Entered: 10/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: 10/21/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reply to Response to 350 MOTION for Discovery MOTION to Expedite Consideration MOTION to Expedite Consideration, filed by Bank Defendants. (McMahon, Kerry) (Entered: 10/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE and PARTIAL JOINDER to 349 Response to Motion, filed by Private Action Plaintiffs.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 10/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to 348 MOTION for Clarification, 350 MOTION for Discovery MOTION to Expedite Consideration MOTION to Expedite Consideration, filed by UniCredito Italiano Spa. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(ypippin, ) (Entered: 10/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: 10/17/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply to Objections to 341 MOTION to Compel filed by Westboro Properties LLC. et al. (kmurphy, ) (Entered: 10/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/13/2005 Minute EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Telephone Conference Call held before Judge Melinda Harmon. Proceedings held on 10/7/2005 regarding 4021 LETTER MOTION for Conference concerning depositions of certain Deutsche Bank witnesses and Deft Northern Trust's Motion for Discovery Conference 1099 (CA H 01-3913 Tittle et al vs Enron Corp et al). The Court Orders Deutsche to make the witnesses available on the day they were subpoenaed or to work out other dates. On the Northern Trust Motion in the Tittle matter, if the parties are not able to resolve their issues, the Court will address the matter at the close of the settlement hearing on Wednesday, 10/12/05. Appearances:See Attached.(Court Reporter: Anita Manley), filed.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 10/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005 Minute EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COPY/Notice of Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Melinda Harmon in CA 01-3913, Pamela Tittle, et al vs Enron Corp., et al. Peliminary Approval Hearing held on 10/12/2005 on Tittle Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion For Order Preliminarily Aproving Proposed Partial Settlement With Arthur Andersen and David Duncan, 1085 in Tittle. Order executed on the record. Final Fairness Hearing set 12/20/05 at 2:00 p.m. Appearances:See Attached for Appearances.(Court Reporter: Cher Barron), filed.(htippen, ) (Entered: 10/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER - As this litigation has grown longer and larger, there are increasing problems maintaining an orderly docketing of pleadings. The Court strongly encourages parties to file court pleadings electronically; Filing on the ESL website does not constitute filing it with the Court and the 20-day submission date begins when a motion is filed with the Court; Every document filed in response to another submission MUST IDENTIFY IT ITS TITLE the instrument number of the original motion; Responses, replies, and surreplies should be filed in the same case as the motion to which they refer was filed; If pleadings are filed that do not conform to this order, the Court ORDERS that the docket clerks are hereby authorized to strike them.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 10/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: 10/6/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re CA H 04-1060 ESI Sky River LP et al vs Fastow et al 82 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case. Defts are Dismissed Without Prejudice. Case terminated.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, (Entered: 10/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 10/5/2005, Entered: 10/6/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER of Coordination of Wilkens et al vs Merrill Lynch & Co Inc et al CA H 05-3310 into Newby et al vs Enron Corporation CA H 01-3624, MDL 1446 Enron Securities Derivative & ERISA Litigation.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified. Modified on 10/6/2005 (kmurphy, ). (Entered: 10/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 10/5/2005, Entered: 10/6/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER of COORDINATION of CA H 05-3031 Avenue Capital Management II LP et al vs JP Morgan Chase & Co et al tranferring to the docket of Melinda Harmon and is designated as a coordinated case in conjunction with Newby CA H 01-3624 and Enron MDL 1446. ( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified. (kmurphy, ) ( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified. (Entered: 10/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: 10/3/2005 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 341 Joinder in 340 MOTION to Compel, filed by Deutsche Banc Securities Inc, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H# 10 Exhibit I# 11 Exhibit J# 12 Exhibit K)(Androphy, Joel) Modified on 10/6/2005 - linked to #340 (ltien, ). (Entered: 10/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: 9/29/2005 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION with Respect to Expert Discovery in All Cases Consolidated or Coordinated with Newby or Tittle and MOTION for Expedited Consideration by the Bank Defendants, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/17/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) This entry is attached to the same document as 349 , this entry was made for case management purposes.(ltien, ) (Entered: 09/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: 9/29/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to F&A Plaintiffs' 348 MOTION for Clarification of the court's scheduling order as it pertains to Private Action Plaintiffs, filed by the Bank Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(ltien, ) (Entered: 09/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/29/2005 Motion for Clarification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Clarification of the court's scheduling order as it pertains to Private Action Plaintiffs, by Fleming & Associates LLP, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/27/2005. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(ltien, ) (Entered: 09/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERKS NOTICE. Orders entered CA H 01-3624 3897, 3898, 3902, 3905, 3913, 3914 and 3915, 3916, 3917, & 3918 and CA H 01-3913 1075, 1076 and 1077. Parties notified. (kmurphy, ) (Entered: 09/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005 Minute EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Melinda Harmon. FAIRNESS HEARING held on 9/12/2005 Jointly By Video Conference with US Bankruptcy Judge Gonzales in New York. Hearing held on Tittle Pltf's Mtn For Final Approval of Partial Settlement (No. 1071 CA H 01-3913 ref member CA H 03-2257 Chao vs Enron) The parties presented to both Courts final settlement issues. Lynn Sarko for Tittle Pltfs addressed the settlement issues before Judge Harmon. Robin Perry appeared on behalf of the Dept of Labor. The Court approves the Tittle and Dept of Labor settlements, as stated on the record. Orders executed on the record, filed.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 09/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 9/13/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by Lerach Coughlin Stoia Geller Rudman & Robbins LLP, counsel for Newby Plaintiffs, filed. (Greenberg, Roger) (Entered: 09/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of James J. Coster re: 343 Response in Opposition to Motion , filed. (Attachments: # 1 Tab E# 2 Tabs F & G# 3 Tab H# 4 Tab H# 5 tab I# 6 Tab I)(rroberts, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/12/2005 (rroberts, ). (Ref CA H 01-3624 4020) Modified on 10/12/2005 (kmurphy, ). (Entered: 09/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition to 340 MOTION to Compel Deutsche Bank produce witness for deposition, filed by Moody's Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(rroberts, ) (Ref CA H 01-3624 4019) Modified on 10/12/2005 (kmurphy, ). (Entered: 09/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED ORDER re: 341 Joinder, filed.(Greenberg, Roger) Modified on 10/6/2005 (ltien, ). (Entered: 09/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 ~Motion for Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joinder in 340 Motion to Compel by Newby Plaintiffs, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B-F)(Greenberg, Roger) Modified on 10/6/2005 - linked to #340 (ltien, ). (Entered: 09/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel Deutsche Bank produce witness for deposition by Westboro Properties, Stonehurst Capital Plaintiffs and the Lamkin Plaintiffs, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/28/2005. (CA Ref 03cv1276 #14)(kmurphy, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/6/2005 (ltien, ). Filers modified on 10/6/2005 (ltien, ). (Entered: 09/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to 338 Bank Defts' Fifth Quarterly Report on Depositions filed by Arthur Andersen LLP. (kmurphy, ) (Entered: 09/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FIFTH QUARTERLY REPORT to the Courts on the Progress of the Deposition Process by Bank Defendants, filed.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 09/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 9/2/2005, Entered: 9/2/2005 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERKS NOTICE re: Entry of Orders on CA H 01-3624 Newby #3860, 3861, 3862, 3863, 3864, 3872, 3876 and 3877 and CA H 01-3913 Tittle 1061. Parties notified, filed. (kmurphy, ) (Entered: 09/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: 9/1/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COORDINATION ORDER of CA H 05-2787 Marsh vs Merrill Lynch & Co into CA H 01-3624 Newby et al vs Enron Corporation et al.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 09/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: 8/29/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of hearing on deposition protocol order held on 7/28/05 before Judge Melinda Harmon. Court Reporter: Bruce Slavin , filed. (cpeebles) (Entered: 08/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: 8/29/2005 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER to Clerk Eastern District of Missouri requesting case file of CA 4:05cv529 to be transferred to SDTX USDC Houston to be included in MDL 1446. (Attachments: # 1 JPMDL Transfer Order (Certified)) (kmurphy, ) (Entered: 08/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: 8/29/2005 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JPMDL TRANSFER ORDER re: USDC Eastern District of Missouri CA H 05-529 Wilkens et al vs Merrill Lynch & Co Inc et al transferring case to be included in MDL 1446 Enron Corp Securities, Derivative & ERISA Litigation. (kmurphy, ) (Entered: 08/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: 8/8/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of preliminary approval hearing held on 7/27/05 before Judge Melinda Harmon. Court Reporter: Bruce Slavin , filed. (cpeebles) (Entered: 08/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 7/28/2005, Entered: 7/28/2005 Miscellaneous HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              (NOTE: This entry is duplicate of 3735 minutes in CA H-01-3624) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Melinda Harmon. HEARING held on 7/28/2005. Andersen's objections are overruled. The Court will execute the Order jointly with U.S. Bankruptcy Judge Gonzalez. Appearances:See Attached For Appearances.(Court Reporter: Bruce Slavin), filed.(htippen, ) (Entered: 07/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: 7/27/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                (NOTE: This ORDER grants 1006 Mtn in CA H-01-3913) ORDER PRELIMINARY APPROVING PARTIAL SETTLEMENT CONDITIONALLY CERTIFYING CLASS FOR PURPOSES OF SETTLEMENT, APPROVING FORM AND MANNER OF NOTICE, AND SCHEDULING HEARING ON FAIRNESS OF SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE CIVIL PROCEDURE 23(E). .( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(htippen, ) (Entered: 07/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: 7/27/2005 Miscellaneous HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Melinda Harmon. PRELIMINARY APPROVAL HEARING held on 7/27/2005, on Pltf's Motion 1006 in Pamela Tittle, et al vs Enron Corp., et al (01-3913). ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING PARTIAL SETTLEMENT CONDITIONALLY CERTIFYING CLASS FOR PURPOSES OF SETTLEMENT, APPROVING FORM AND MANNER OF NOTICE, AND SCHEDULING HEARING ON FAIRNESS OF SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE CIVIL PROCEDURE 23(e). Appearances:See Attached For Appearances.(Court Reporter: Bruce Slavin), filed.(htippen, ) (Entered: 07/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: 7/25/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Ref CA H 05-774 (State of Arkansas Teacher Retirement System et al vs Merrill Lynch & Co. et al) #80 OPINION AND ORDER OF REMAND granting #12 MOTION to Remand, mooting #72 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #27 MOTION to Dismiss remains pending for a ruling by the state court.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy) (Entered: 07/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: 7/25/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Ref: CA G 05-12 (American National Insurance Company et al vs Credit Suisse First Boston Inc. et al) #14 OPINION AND ORDER OF REMAND granting #9 MOTION to Remand and mooting #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer or otherwise Respond to the Pltfs' Complaint( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 07/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: 7/20/2005 Certified Mail Receipt Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certified Mail Receipt Returned as to Northern District of Ohio, executed on 7/14/2005 re: 325 Letter, , filed. (rwestmoreland, ) (Entered: 07/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSFER LETTER REQUEST from Southern District of Texas- Houston Division to Clerk, Northern District of Ohio re: 1:05cv48 Marsh vs Merrill Lynch & Co Inc et al to be transfer to SDTX Houston per JPMDL Transfer Order for case to be included in MDL 1446 Enron Corp Securities, Derivative, ERISA Litigation. (kmurphy, ) (Entered: 07/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005 Minute EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry (Ref CA H 01-3624 #3687) for proceedings held before Judge Melinda Harmon, filed. MOTION HEARING held on 7/7/2005. Appearances: See Attached. (Court Reporter: Gayle Dye) Hearing held on #3529 Deft Andrew Fastow's Motion for Reconsideration of #3516 May 25, 2005 Order with Respect to Depositions Subject to Stay and Fifth Amendment Assertions and #3606 Deft Mark E. Koenig's Motion to Postpone Discovery and Stay Responsive Pleadings, and for Reconsideration of #3516 May 25, 2005 Order with Respect to Depositions Subject to Stays and Fifth Amendment Assertions. Oral objections by Enron Task Force. The Court heard further argument on the issue. Stay is lifted on Discovery. Parties to work out an Order. Issues under advisement will be heard on July 28, 2005 at 1:30 pm. Order to issue.(kmurphy, ) Modified on 7/8/2005 to Hearing date change (kmurphy, ). (Entered: 07/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: 6/21/2005 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JPMDL TRANSFER ORDER (certified copy) transferring Northern District of Ohio CA 1:05-48 Joseph Marsh vs Merrill Lynch & Co Inc et al to Southern District of Texas Houston to be included in MDL 1446 Enron Corp. Securities, Derivative & ERISA Litigation. (kmurphy, ) (Entered: 06/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: 6/14/2005 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry (Ref CA H 01-3624 #3592) for proceedings held before Judge Melinda Harmon. MOTION HEARING held on 6/13/2005 on #3590 Arthur Andersen LLP's Motion to Stay the Order Granting the Texas State Board of Public Accountancy's Motion to Intervene pending appellate review and request for expedited consideration. Assistant Attorney General Charles McDonald appeared by telephone for the Texas Board of Public Accountancy. The Court will allow two weeks, until 6/27/05 for Arthur Andersen to pursue the appeal, as stated on the record. Counsel for Arthur Andersen to file status with the Court. Appearances:See attached.(Court Reporter: Johnny Sanchez), filed.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 06/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER OF COORDINATION Case #4:05cv1917 LJM2 Co-Investment LP et al vs Fastwo et al with # 4:01cv3624 Newby et al vs Enron Corp., et al.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified. (Ref CA H 05-1917 #19 and CA H 01-3624 #3578) (kmurphy, ) (Entered: 06/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: 5/26/2005 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERKS NOTICE re: 318 ORDER and 319 ORDER. Parties notified, filed. (rwestmoreland, ) (Entered: 05/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: 5/25/2005 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER the hearing on 6/2/05 is CANCELLED in light of the 318 Agreed Order with Respect to Depositions Subject to Stays and 5th Amendment Assertions.( Signed by US District Judge Melinda Harmon and US Bankruptcy Judge Arthur J. Gonzalez) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) Modified on 5/25/2005 (kmurphy, ). (Entered: 05/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: 5/25/2005 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER with Respect to Depositions Subject to Stays and Fifth Amendment Assertions. ( Signed by US District Judge Melinda Harmon and Bankruptcy Judge Arthur J. Gonzalez) Parties notified. (REF CA H 01-3624 #3490 Response/Motion; Order #3516, CA H 01-3913 #968)(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 05/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: 5/4/2005 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JPMDL TRANSFER ORDER (certified copy) transferring LJM2 Co-Investment LP vs Andrew Fastow et al ND TX Bky Adversary 3:04-3565 and Merrill Lynch & Co Inc et al vs State of Arkansas Teacher Retirement System et al ND Ca 3:05-472 to the Southern District of Texas to be included in MDL 1446 Enron Corp Sercurities, Derivative & ERISA Litigation.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 05/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 4/29/2005 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CLERKS NOTICE re: Entry of Orders 314 and 315 . Parties notified, filed. (kmurphy, ) (Entered: 04/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER OF COORDINATION CA H 05-1191 is coordinated into Newby CA H 01-3624.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified. (REF CA 05-1191 #79 and CA H 01-3624 #3397)(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 04/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER OF COORDINATION of G 05-221 into Newby CA H 01-3624 ( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (REF CA G 05-221 #7 and CA H 01-3624 #3396) (Entered: 04/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERKS NOTICE re: Entry of Orders 311 312 . Parties notified (kmurphy, ) (Entered: 04/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER OF COORDINATION of CA H 05-1164 into Newby CA H 01-3624 (MDL 1446 Enron Corporation Securities, Derivative and ERISA Litigation) and mooting 4 Deft's MOTION to Consolidate Lead Case No. 01-3624 and Member Case No.05-1164, and granting 5 Deft's MOTION for Extension of Time To Move, Answer or Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint and pleading is stayed.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified. (Ref CA 05-1164 #7 and CA 01-3624 #3383)(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 04/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/22/2005 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER OF COORDINATION of CA H 05-1165 into Newby CA H 01-3624 (MDL 1446 Enron Corporation Securities, Derivative and ERISA Litigation) and mooting 4 Deft's MOTION to Consolidate Lead Case No. 01-3624 and Member Case No.05-1165, and granting 5 Deft's MOTION for Extension of Time To Move, Answer or Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint and pleading is stayed.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (Ref CA 05-1165 #6 and CA H 01-3624 #3382)Parties notified(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 04/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: 4/19/2005 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERKS NOTICE re: Coordination Orders 306 307 308 309 . Parties notified, filed. (kmurphy, ) (Entered: 04/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/18/2005 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER OF COORDINATION CA H 05-1207 Mirdjani et al vs Arthur Andersen et al is coordinated into CA H 01-3624 Newby et al vs Entron et al (MDL 1446), Case Reassigned to Judge Melinda Harmon. Judge Sim Lake no longer assigned to the case. (Case Ref CA H 05-1207 #23 and CA H 01-3624 #3361)( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 04/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/18/2005 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER OF COORDINATION CA H 05-981 Sierra Pacific Resources et al vs Citigroup Inc et al into CA H 01-3624 Newby et al vs Enron Corporation et al (MDL 1446).(Case Ref CA H 05-981 #10 and CA H 01-3624 #3360)( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 04/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/18/2005 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER OF COORDINATION CA H 05-0974 Public Utility District No 1 of Snohomish County Washington vs Citigroup et al into CA H 01-3624 Newby et al vs Enron Corporation et al (MDL 1446).(Case REF CA H 01-3624 #3359, CA H 05-974 #12)( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 04/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/18/2005 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER OF COORDINATION CA H 05-774 State of Arkansas Teacher Retirement System et al vs Merrill Lynch & Co into CA H 01-3624 Newby et al vs Enron Corporation et al (MDL 1446).( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (REF CA H 05-774 #69, CA H 01-3624 #3358)(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 04/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/14/2005 Minute EntryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Melinda Harmon. Proceedings held on 4/11/2005. Joint hearing held by US District Judge Melinda Harmon and US Bankruptcy Judge Arthur Gonzalez, Southern District of New York (Judge Gonzalez by video conference) on: 1) final approval of proposed Newby settlements regarding Outside Directors and Ken Harrison, Bank of America and Lehman, and the Official Creditors' Committee Settlement and on 2) motions for summary judgment concerning the use of the interpleader funds, and 3) motion to amend deposition protocol. The Court heard from the parties on the issues. Keith Parks's (for Lead Plaintiff) oral motion to withdraw 3 appendices filed 4/4/05 (no. 3313, 3314 and 3315) and substitute them with redacted versions is GRANTED as stated on the record. The matters addressed at the hearing are under advisement. Order to issue. Appearances:see attached.(Court Reporter: June Simon), filed.(ltien, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/14/2005 (ltien, ). (Entered: 04/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: 3/17/2005 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 303 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan H Waller for Sierra Pacific Resources and Nevada Power Co.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(sfedele, ) (Entered: 03/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: 3/15/2005 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Jonathan H Waller to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sierra Pacific Resources and Nevada Power Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/31/2005. (sfedele, ) (Entered: 03/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/10/2005 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Bank Defendants' March 2005 297 Report to the Court on the Progress of the Deposition Process, filed by Vinson & Elkins LLP, Arthur Andersen LLP, and Certain Outside Directors. (ltien, ) (Entered: 03/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          March 2005 Quarterly Report to the Court by Enron Corp, filed.(ltien, ) (Entered: 03/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005 Mail Returned Undeliverable
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Karl P Barth (#289), filed. (sfedele, ) (Entered: 03/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005 Mail Returned Undeliverable
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Kathleen P Kelly re: 289 Clerks Notice, filed. (dkelly, ) (Entered: 03/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORRECTION TO MARCH 2005 QUARTERLY REPORT TO THE COURT on the Progress of the Deposition Process by Bank Defendants, filed.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 03/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MARCH 2005 QUARTERLY REPORT on the Progress of the Deposition Process by Bank Defendants, filed.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 03/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: 3/3/2005 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Melinda Harmon. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/2/2005 on Ongoing Discovery Issues (per letter request No. 924 CA H 01-3913). Mr. Sarko for Tittle Pltfs announced the Enron deft is moving from non-settling party to settling party. The parties presented status and concerns on the discovery of the case. The Court will rule on the Tittle pltf's partially opposed oral mtn for brief stay of deposition schedule. Order to issue. Appearances: See attached. (Court Reporter: Ed Reed), filed. (kmurphy, ) (REF CA 01-3913 #927) (Entered: 03/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 3/1/2005 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter from USDC Southern District of Texas to USDC Nevada re: Sierra Pacific Resournces et al vs Citigroup Inc et al CA 2:04-1605 requesting case file be transferred to be included in MDL 1446, filed. (kmurphy, ) (Entered: 03/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 3/1/2005 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter from USDC Southern District of Texas to USDC Western District of Washington re: Public Uitility District No 1 of Snohomish County Washington vs Citigroup Inc et al CA 2:04-2389 requesting case file to be transferred to be included in MDL 1446, filed. (kmurphy, ) (Entered: 03/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 3/1/2005 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter from USDC Southern District of Texas to USDC Southern District of New York re: CA 1:04-7301 Yosemite Securities Trust I et al vs Citibank NA et al requesting case file be transferred to be included in MDL 1446, filed. (kmurphy, ) (Entered: 03/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 3/1/2005 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter from USDC Southern District of Texas to United States Bankruptcy Court State Northern District of Texas re: Adversary 3:04-3511 State of Arkansas et al vs Merrill Lynch & Co et al requesting case file be transferred to be included in MDL 1446, filed. (kmurphy, ) (Entered: 03/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JPML ORDER Lifting Stay of Conditional Transfer Order 28 (certified copy) and transferring Sierra Resources et al vs Citigroup Inc et al CA 2:04-1605 and Public Utility District No 1 of Snohmoish County, Washington vs Citigroup Inc et al WD Washington CA 2:04-2389, filed. (kmurphy, ) (Entered: 02/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JPMDL TRANSFER ORDER (Certified Copy) transferring Yosemite Securities Trust I et al vs Citibank NA et al Southern District of New York Case 1:04-7301 and State of Arkansas Teacher Retirement System et al vs Merrill Lynch & Co et al Northern District of Texas Bankruptcy Adversary 3:04-3511, filed. (kmurphy, ) (Entered: 02/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERKS NOTICE : Entry of Orders CA H 03-1558 #340, CA H 03-1579 #66, CA H 03-1580, filed. (kmurphy, ) (Entered: 02/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Miscellaneous Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ENTRY: Preliminary Approval of partial settlement HEARING held. (No. 2949, 2950, 2969, 2971, 2984 and 2985 in 01-3624). See Attached for appearances of counsel. The court heard proposed settlement issues and objections. Any further briefing on the arbitration issue must be filed by Feb 14, 2005, with Responses due Feb 21, 2005. Orders preliminarily approving the settlement executed. Order authorizing the transfer of insurance proceeds executed. (Court Reporter: G Dye), filed.(psmith, ) Modified on 2/7/2005 (psmith, ). (Entered: 02/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: 1/24/2005 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERKS NOTICE re: 286 Order:, filed. (kmurphy, ) (Entered: 01/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION SCHEDULING.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon and Judge Arthur J. Gonzalez) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 01/18/2005) (Ref Ca 01-3624 #2963, Ca 01-3913 #916, Ca 04-91 #53 and Ca 03-2257 #24) (Entered: 01/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter from Richard W. Clary re: Proposed Order Regarding Deposition Scheduling, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (kmurphy, ) (Entered: 01/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Melinda Harmon. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 1/6/2005 simultaneously with US Bankruptcy Judge Arthur Gonzales, SD of New York, on Bank Deft's Motion for Telephonic Status Conference (No 2854 CA H 01-3624). The Court heard argument on problems with the prompt appearance of Enron witnesses who were nominated for deposition by the Deposition Scheduling Committee. The parties offered solutions to the problems and will provide an agreed order, as stated on the record. Appearances:See attached.(Court Reporter: C Barron), filed.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 01/10/2005)(REF CA 01-3624 #2926) (Entered: 01/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: 12/23/2004 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED DEPOSITION PROTOCOL ORDER pursuant to Order entered 12/13/04 on CA H 01-3624 2818 .( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon and Judge Arthur J. Gonzalez ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Ref CA H 01-3624 #2875 and CA H 01-3913 #909)(kmurphy, ) Modified on 12/23/2004 (kmurphy, ). (Entered: 12/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/22/2004 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Melinda Harmon. TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE held on 12/22/2004 on negotiations and to determine the need for scheduling in the interpleader action. Parties request Order to deposit money for the Interpleader proceeds into the Registry of the Court. An agreement in principal on all major terms was announced and request for preliminary approval will be filed as soon as possible. Agreed scheduling order presented to the Court. Orders executed. (kmurphy ) (Entered: 12/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 12/21/2004, Entered: 12/21/2004 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 2854 Motion for Hearing Status Conference set for 01/06/05 at 02:00 PM CST before Judge Melinda Harmon. Counsel is to contact the Case Manager to arrange the call. (CA Ref #2855 CA H 01-3624)( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) (kmurphy, ) Modified on 12/22/2004 (htippen, ). (Entered: 12/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: 12/17/2004 Mail Returned Undeliverable
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mail Returned Undeliverable Kelly M Klaus re: 272 Order , filed. (sfedele, ) (Entered: 12/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: 12/16/2004 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying Bank Defts' CA H 01-3624 #2552 Motion to Modify Deposition Protocol.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon and Judge Arthur J Gonzalez ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 12/14/2004 on CA H 01-3624)(Reference Entry CA H 01-3624 #2821) Modified on 12/16/2004 (kmurphy, ). (Entered: 12/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: 12/9/2004 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Melinda Harmon. PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING held on 12/8/2004 Ref #2462 and 2477 MOTION (in CA H-01-3624) for Preliminary Injunction; MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Parties reached an agreement. Exhibits admitted; paper exhibits to be withdrawn & resubmitted on CD. Preliminary Injunction Order executed. Request for mediation denied. Telephone conference set 12/22/04 at 2:00 to determine need for scheduling in interpleader action. Deadlines for responsive pleadings to the interpleader action and to the Outside Directors' counterclaims are stayed. Appearances: See attached list.(Court Reporter: K Metzger), filed.(djustice, ) (Entered: 12/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 274 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: 12/7/2004 Sealed Event
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED MINUTES, filed. (Ref CA H 01-3624 #2753 and CA H 04-91 #42) (4:04CI6007)(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 12/07/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: 11/10/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER OF COORDINATION WITH MDL 1446 (and CA H 01-3624 ref #2601) AND DENIAL OF MOTION TO REMAND Case Ref CA H 04-3581 Aksamit et al vs UBS Painewebber Inc et al #40.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 11/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 11/4/2004, Entered: 11/4/2004 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Melinda Harmon. MOTION HEARING held on 11/4/2004. The Court heard argument on the issue of lifting the stays on discovery relating to defts under indictment and on the govt's motion to intervene and for access to the depositions and exhibits. The parties agreed to a 6-month continuation of the stays on depositions of the criminal defts. The Court set a Hearing on June 2, 2005 at 10:00 a.m. to revisit the issue of lifting the stays. The Court took under advisement the government's motion to intervene and for access to the depostions and exhibits. The Court also ordered an expedited response date of 11/15/04 to Bank Defts' motion to amend the deposition protocol order, filed 11/3/04. Because the parties agreed to an extension fo the TRO enjoining the insurance companies from expending funds from the Greenwich layer of the D&O policies, the preliminary injunction hearing originally scheduled for this afternoon is reset to 11/15/04 at 1:00 pm. Appearances: See Attached Appearance List. (Court Reporter: Fred Warner),(Ref CA 01-3624 #2570) filed.(kmurphy, ) Modified on 11/4/2004 (kmurphy, ). (Entered: 11/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: 11/1/2004 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from USDC SDTX Clerk's Office to Western District of Texas requesting case file CA 1:04-268 per JPMDL Transfer Order (Ref #268), filed. (kmurphy, ) Modified on 1/27/2005 (kmurphy, ). (Entered: 11/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 10/20/2004, Entered: 10/20/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER relating to parallel civil and criminal proceedings the USA's motion to intervene and for access to deposition and exhibits the Court orders counsel for Lead Plaintiff, all Defts who have been granted stays, the government, and any interested parties wanting to attend shall appear for a Hearing set for 11/4/2004 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 9C before Judge Melinda Harmon.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon )(REF CA H 01-3624 #2446/2475) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 10/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: 10/20/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting Motion of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp to Reopen Pirelli Derivative Cases and to Substitute as Real Party Plaintiff in Interest on behalf of Bankruptcy Estate, (H 01-3645 (117), H 01-3690 (#35), H 01-3892 (#9), H 01-3998 (#11), H 02-1832 (#9), H 02-1838 (42), H 02-1922 (#20), and H 02-3427 (#20)) ( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 10/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: 10/20/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER the USDC SDTX has implemented an electronic system for filing of all court documents, in light of the large number of cases involved in this litigation counsel shall deliver a courtesy copy of all documents filed with the Court to Judge Melinda Harmon chambers.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 10/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF