Arthur v. Offit
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-01398

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 4:26 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: 3/10/2010 Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 29 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM OPINION re 9 and 13 , Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 3/10/2010. (tche)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: 2/26/2010 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: 2/25/2010 Transcript
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: 2/16/2010 Motion Hearing
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: 2/16/2010 Order for Pro hac vice
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: 2/16/2010 Certificate Of Service.
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: 2/9/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: 2/9/2010 Declaration
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: 2/9/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: 2/4/2010 Notice
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: 2/3/2010 Opposition
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: 1/26/2010 Order for Pro hac vice
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: 1/26/2010 Order for Pro hac vice
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: 1/22/2010 Notice of Hearing Date
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: 1/22/2010 Declaration
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: 1/22/2010 Memorandum in Support
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: 1/22/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: 1/22/2010 Financial Disclosure Statement
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: 1/22/2010 Notice of Hearing Date
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: 1/22/2010 Memorandum in Support
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: 1/22/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: 1/21/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: 1/21/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: 1/20/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: 1/20/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: 1/20/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: 1/11/2010 Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/28/2009 Summons Issued
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: 12/28/2009 Complaint
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 192 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?