DF v. Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:07-cv-00801

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 24, 2017 at 2:26 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DF, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Thomas Pfau +1 206 462 4334 +1 206 623 3624 michael@pcvalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by KOSNOFF FASY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy D Kosnoff +1 206 257 3590 tim@kosnoff.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste 2100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle A Menely +1 206 676 7500 +1676757 +16 676 7575 mmenely@gth-law.com
v.
No Logo Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon Tilden Thomas & Cordell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Cooper Gordon +1 206 467 6477 +1 206 467 6292 cgordon@gordontilden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Rosenberger +1 206 467 6477 +1 206 467 6292 mrosenberger@gordontilden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey I Tilden +1 206 467 6477 jtilden@gordontilden.com
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 Court Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having notified the Court of settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs to any party. In the event that settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case within 60 days of the date of this order. Any trial date and pretrial dates previously set are hereby VACATED. Signedby Judge James L. Robart.
    LREF
    Blank 7 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007
    DECLARATION of Michael Rosenberger re 6 Response to Order to Show Cause by Defendant Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9)(Rosenberger, Michael)
      LREF
      Blank 6 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007
      RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Defendant Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (Rosenberger, Michael)
        LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 Court Filing
        ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - The court orders Defendant to show cause within seven days of the date of this order why the court should not remand the matter for lack of jurisdiction re 1 Notice of Removal, filed by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints by Judge James L. Robart.
          LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007
          VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (Attachments: # 1 Continuation - 2 of 5# 2 Continuation 3 of 5# 3 Continuation - 4 of 5# 4 Continuation - 5 of 5)(Rosenberger, Michael)
            LREF
            Blank 3 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007
            DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff DF. (Menely, Michelle)
              LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007
              NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (Rosenberger, Michael)
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007
                NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 06-2-18131-0 KNT; (Receipt # SEA 9640), filed by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit to Complaint# 2 Civil Cover Sheet # 3 Email request to file new case)(PM, )
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 8 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?