LivePerson Inc v. Lodsys LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Wisconsin Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:11-cv-01030
District Judge Rudolph T Randa, presiding

Tags
Last Updated October 2, 2016 at 12:06 PM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Live Person, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David L. DeBruin +1 414 271 6560 +1 414 277 0656 dldebruin@mbf-law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melanie J Reichenberger +1 414 271 6560 +1 414 277 0656 mjreichenberger@michaelbest.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Ross Gilford +1 312 962 3510 sgilford@proskauer.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Catherine J. Spector +1 312 962 3550 +1 312 962 3551 cspector@proskauer.com
v.
No Logo Lodsys, LLC, Defendant
Unknown Role, Lodsys Holdings, LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Andrus, Sceales, Starke & Sawall, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron T. Olejniczak +1 414 271 7590 +1 414 271 5770 tmdocketing@andruslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Flachsbart & Greenspoon, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William W. Flachsbart +1 312 551 9500 +1 312 551 9501 wwf@fg-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. La Porte +1 312 551 9500 +1 312 551 9501 Michael.laporte@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by PETERSON YOUNG PUTRA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher M Huck +1 206 624 6800 huck@pypfirm.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (84) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 8/7/2012. All claims dismissed with prejudice. Each side to bear its own attorney's fees, expenses, and costs. Motions terminated: 62 MOTION to Dismiss; 73 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply; 75 MOTION to Enjoin. (cc: all counsel)(cb) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 84 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by LivePerson Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Reichenberger, Melanie)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 8/2/2012 granting 82 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's response to plaintiff's motion to enjoin 75 now due 8/16/2012. (cc: all counsel) (cb) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None
        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time by Lodsys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olejniczak, Aaron)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T. Randa on 7/11/2012 granting 79 Motion for Extension of Time. (cc: all counsel) (cb) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None
            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lodsys LLC (Olejniczak, Aaron)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None
              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time by Lodsys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olejniczak, Aaron)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
                REQUEST by LivePerson Inc for Oral Argument on its Motion to Enjoin. (Reichenberger, Melanie)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
                  DECLARATION of Kimberly A. Mottley in Support of LivePerson's Motion to Enjoin Lodsys from Asserting Claims of Infringement Against LivePerson's Customers. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Reichenberger, Melanie)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
                    BRIEF in Support filed by LivePerson Inc re 75 MOTION to Enjoin Lodsys from Asserting Claims of Infringement Against LivePerson's Customers . (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Reichenberger, Melanie) Modified text on 6/29/2012 (blr).
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
                      MOTION to Enjoin Joinder Lodsys from Asserting Claims of Infringement Against LivePerson's Customers by LivePerson Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reichenberger, Melanie) Modified event on 6/29/2012 (blr).
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Aaron T Olejniczak (Olejniczak, Aaron)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
                          MOTION for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by LivePerson Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - LivePerson's Surreply In Opposition To Defendant's Motion To Dismiss, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Reichenberger, Melanie)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None
                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lodsys LLC (Olejniczak, Aaron)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None
                              DECLARATION of Aaron T. Olejniczak (Second) . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Olejniczak Declaration - 03-08-12 Memorandum)(Olejniczak, Aaron)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None
                                REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Lodsys LLC re 62 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Transfer or Stay MOTION to Stay MOTION to Transfer Case . (Olejniczak, Aaron) Modified on 3/30/2012 (mlm).
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
                                  DECLARATION of Melanie J. Reichenberger . (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B, # 3 Appendix C, # 4 Appendix D, # 5 Appendix E, # 6 Appendix F, # 7 Appendix G, # 8 Certificate of Service)(Reichenberger, Melanie)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LivePerson Inc (Reichenberger, Melanie)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
                                      DECLARATION of Kimberly A. Mottley . (Reichenberger, Melanie)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
                                        BRIEF in Opposition filed by LivePerson Inc re 62 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Transfer or Stay MOTION to Stay MOTION to Transfer Case . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Reichenberger, Melanie) Modified on 3/6/2012 (mlm).
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lodsys LLC (Olejniczak, Aaron)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
                                            DECLARATION of Aaron T. Olejniczak in Support of Lodsys Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Transfer or Stay. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 03-22-11 letter, # 2 Exhibit B - 06-08-11 letter, # 3 Exhibit C - 06-10-11 Complaint, # 4 Exhibit D - 02-11-11 Complaint, # 5 Exhibit E - 05-31-11 Complaint, # 6 Exhibit F - 07-21-11 Amended Complaint, # 7 Exhibit G - 07-05-11 Complaint, # 8 Exhibit H -02-09-12 Opposition)(Olejniczak, Aaron)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
                                              BRIEF in Support filed by Lodsys LLC re 62 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Transfer or MOTION to Stay . (Olejniczak, Aaron) Modified on 2/13/2012 (mlm).
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Transfer or MOTION to Stay by Lodsys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olejniczak, Aaron). Added MOTION on 2/13/2012 (mlm).
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T Randa on 02/03/2012 withdrawing 54 Motion to Dismiss; granting 60 Motion to Withdraw Motion. (cc: all counsel) (Koll, J) (Entered: 02/06/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION to Withdraw Motion to Dismiss by Lodsys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Olejniczak, Aaron)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                      BRIEF in Opposition filed by LivePerson Inc re 54 MOTION to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) or, in the Alternative, for More Definite Statement Under FRCP 12(e) MOTION for More Definite Statement . (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Reichenberger, Melanie)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment with Jury Demand against Lodsys LLC filed by LivePerson Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Certificate of Service)(Reichenberger, Melanie)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lodsys LLC (Olejniczak, Aaron)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                            DECLARATION of Aaron T. Olejniczak . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Olejniczak Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B to Olejniczak Declaration)(Olejniczak, Aaron)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                              BRIEF in Support filed by Lodsys LLC re 54 MOTION to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) or, in the Alternative, for More Definite Statement Under FRCP 12(e) . (Olejniczak, Aaron)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) or, in the Alternative, MOTION for More Definite Statement Under FRCP 12(e) by Lodsys LLC. (Olejniczak, Aaron). Added MOTION for More Definite Statement on 1/9/2012 (mlm).
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER signed by Judge Rudolph T Randa on 12/06/2011 granting 51 Motion for Extension of Time. (cc: all counsel) (Koll, J) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lodsys LLC (Olejniczak, Aaron)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time (Unopposed) by Lodsys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olejniczak, Aaron)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        DISCLOSURE Statement by Lodsys LLC. (Olejniczak, Aaron)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Lodsys LLC. (Olejniczak, Aaron)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by LivePerson Inc. (Reichenberger, Melanie)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              DISCLOSURE Statement by LivePerson Inc. (Reichenberger, Melanie)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by David L DeBruin on behalf of LivePerson Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: David L. De Bruin, Melanie J. Reichenberger (DeBruin, David)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron T Olejniczak on behalf of Lodsys LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Aaron T. Olejniczak (Olejniczak, Aaron)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    LETTER from Clerk to counsel re: transfer of this case to the Eastern District of Wisconsin and asking for a consent/refusal form and Disclosure Statement to be filed. (blr)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:11-cv-04088. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank 42 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        TRANSFERRED to the USDC for the Eastern District of Wisconsin, Milwaukee the electronic record. Mailed letter to all counsel of record. (mr, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman:Notice of motion set for 10/27/11 is stricken. Stipulated Motion to Transfer Venue to 38 is granted. It is hereby ordered that Clerk of Court is to transfer case to the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin. Any pending motions or schedules are stricken as moot. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (cjg, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            Proposed Order by Lodsys, LLC (Flachsbart, William) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by William W. Flachsbart for presentment of motion to change venue 38 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 10/27/2011 at 09:00 AM. (Flachsbart, William) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                MOTION by Defendant Lodsys, LLC to change venue (Flachsbart, William) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6493329. (Mottley, Kimberly) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Motion hearing held on 9/22/2011. Joint motion for Extension of Time to Take Jurisdictional Discovery 33 is granted to and including 10/17/11. Status hearing reset to 11/4/2011 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (cjg, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman:Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6273158. of Christopher M. Huck for Defendant Lodsys, LLC 31 is granted. Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6273171. for attorney Michael A. Goldfarb by attorney Christopher Huck for Defendant Lodsys, LLC 32 is granted.Mailed notice (cjg, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Motion by Catherine J. Spector for presentment of extension of time 33 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 9/22/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Spector, Catherine) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION by Plaintiff LivePerson, Inc. for extension of time to take Jurisdictional Discovery (Spector, Catherine) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6273135. of Michael A. Goldfarb for Defendant Lodsys, LLC (Huck, Christopher) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6273124. of Christopher M. Huck for Defendant Lodsys, LLC (Huck, Christopher) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing set for 9/26/2011 at 09:30 AM. Motion hearing held on 7/26/2011. Motion by by Plaintiff LivePerson, Inc. for Leave to Take Discovery Limited to the Issue of Personal Jurisdiction and Venue 26 is granted as to personal jurisdiction discovery only. Status hearing reset to 9/26/2011 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (cjg, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Lodsys, LLC by William W. Flachsbart (Flachsbart, William) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    EXHIBIT by Plaintiff LivePerson, Inc. (Exhibit 1) regarding MOTION by Plaintiff LivePerson, Inc. for discovery Limited to the Issues of Personal Jurisdiction and Venue 26 (Spector, Catherine) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Catherine J. Spector for presentment of motion for discovery 26 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 7/26/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Spector, Catherine) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION by Plaintiff LivePerson, Inc. for discovery Limited to the Issues of Personal Jurisdiction and Venue (Spector, Catherine) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Notice of motion set for 7/21/11 is stricken. Joint motion for extension of time for Local Patent Rule Deadlines 23 is granted. Due date for Local Patent Rule 2.1 Initial Disclosures is fourteen (14) days after Lodsys files its Answers; provided, however, if Lodsys asserts a counterclaim against LivePerson, the parties have fourteen (14) days after the latest date on which LivePerson may file its answer to that counterclaim. Mailed notice (cjg, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Joint NOTICE of Motion by Catherine J. Spector for presentment of extension of time 23 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 7/21/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Spector, Catherine) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MOTION by Plaintiff LivePerson, Inc., Defendant Lodsys, LLC for extension of time of Local Patent Rule Deadlines (Spector, Catherine) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before Honorable Suzanne B. Conlon: Status hearing set on July 15, 2011 is stricken. Case is reassigned to Judge Guzman.Mailed notice (air, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing set for 7/15/11 is stricken. Mailed notice (cjg, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman pursuant to Local Rule 40.4 for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/12/2011. (jmp, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.] (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by LivePerson, Inc. Notice of Pending Unopposed Motion for Reassignment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bauer, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Suzanne B. Conlon: Defendants motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction 13 is taken under advisement. Plaintiff shall respond by July 22, 2011. Status hearing on July 15, 2011 stands. The motion will not be heard as noticed on July 12, 2011. Mailed notice (air, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Corporate Disclosure by Lodsys, LLC (La Porte, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion by Michael R. La Porte for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction 13 before Honorable Suzanne B. Conlon on 7/12/2011 at 09:00 AM. (La Porte, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT by Defendant Lodsys, LLC in Support of MOTION by Defendant Lodsys, LLC to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction 13 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits to Declaration of Mark Small)(La Porte, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by Lodsys, LLC in support of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction 13 (La Porte, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Defendant Lodsys, LLC to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (La Porte, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Lodsys, LLC by Michael R. La Porte (La Porte, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Suzanne B. Conlon: Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiff 8 by Steven M. Bauer is granted. Mailed notice (air, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.] (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Suzanne B. Conlon: Status hearing set for July 15, 2011 at 09:00 A.M. At the status hearing, the parties are to report on the following: 1. Possibility of settlement in the case; 2. If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is directed to advise all other parties of the courts action herein and to forward a copy of the courts procedure guidelines to defendant(s). The standing order on case management procedures is available on the courts website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/JUDGE/CONLON/sbcpage.htm or can be picked up from the courtroom deputy in room 1744. Mailed notice (air, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by LivePerson, Inc.. Lodsys, LLC waiver sent on 6/22/2011, answer due 8/22/2011. (Bauer, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6105605. (Bauer, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Disclosure STATEMENT by LivePerson, Inc. (Plaintiff's) (Gilford, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Local Rule 3.4 Notice of Claims Involving Patents by LivePerson, Inc. (Gilford, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gilford, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff LivePerson, Inc. by Catherine J. Spector (Spector, Catherine) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff LivePerson, Inc. by Steven Ross Gilford (Gilford, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment filed by LivePerson, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-6101722. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (part one), # 2 Exhibit A (part two), # 3 Exhibit B (part one), # 4 Exhibit B (part two), # 5 Exhibit C (part one), # 6 Exhibit C (part two), # 7 Exhibit D (part one), # 8 Exhibit D (part two))(Gilford, Steven) [Transferred from ilnd on 11/8/2011.]
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 293 times.

                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?