Soverain Software LLC v. J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:09-cv-00274
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 6, 2017 at 3:54 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Amway Corporation Amway Corporation, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Amway Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Laura Beth Miller

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
Avon Products, Inc. Avon Products, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/08/2010 Debra Elaine Gunter +1 903 595 3111 debby@yw-lawfirm.com
TERMINATED: 12/08/2010 Herbert A Yarbrough, III +1 903 595 3111 +1 903 595 0191 trey@yw-lawfirm.com
No Logo Ballard Designs, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Misty C Blair +1 713 225 2300 +1 713 225 2340 mblair@seyfarth.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Ronald Lanser +1 312 460 5000 +1 312 460 7000 jlanser@seyfarth.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. Levinson +1 312 460 5000 +1 312 460 7000 mlevinson@seyfarth.com
No Logo Bidz.com, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Seldon and Scillieri

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A Scillieri +1 310 209 4475 jas@speakeasy.net
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert A Seldon +1 310 443 9100 iplaw@speakeasy.net

Represented by The Dacus Firm, PC

No Logo Cornerstone Brands, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Misty C Blair +1 713 225 2300 +1 713 225 2340 mblair@seyfarth.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Ronald Lanser +1 312 460 5000 +1 312 460 7000 jlanser@seyfarth.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. Levinson +1 312 460 5000 +1 312 460 7000 mlevinson@seyfarth.com
No Logo Garnet Hill, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Misty C Blair +1 713 225 2300 +1 713 225 2340 mblair@seyfarth.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Ronald Lanser +1 312 460 5000 +1 312 460 7000 jlanser@seyfarth.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. Levinson +1 312 460 5000 +1 312 460 7000 mlevinson@seyfarth.com
No Logo Hsn Improvements LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Misty C Blair +1 713 225 2300 +1 713 225 2340 mblair@seyfarth.com
PRO HAC VICE Joseph Ronald Lanser +1 312 460 5000 +1 312 460 7000 jlanser@seyfarth.com
PRO HAC VICE Michael R. Levinson +1 312 460 5000 +1 312 460 7000 mlevinson@seyfarth.com
No Logo Hsn, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Misty C Blair +1 713 225 2300 +1 713 225 2340 mblair@seyfarth.com
PRO HAC VICE Joseph Ronald Lanser +1 312 460 5000 +1 312 460 7000 jlanser@seyfarth.com
PRO HAC VICE Michael R. Levinson +1 312 460 5000 +1 312 460 7000 mlevinson@seyfarth.com
No Logo J C Penney Corporation Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by J C Penney Co Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Diane K Lettelleir +1 972 431 5012 +1 972 531 5012 dlettell@jcpenney.com
No Logo Qvc, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Brian Plies +1 512 394 3012 +1 512 394 3001 jeff.plies@dechert.com

Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413
No Logo Shutterfly, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ireland Carroll & Kelley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/30/2010 Otis W Carroll, Jr. +1 903 561 1600 +1 903 581 1071 Fedserv@icklaw.com
TERMINATED: 04/30/2010 Deborah J Race +1 903 561 1600 drace@icklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Minn Chung +1 415 268 7685 +1 415 268 5722 MChung@mofo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Ellis Monach +1 415 268 7588 +1 415 268 7522 amonach@mofo.com
No Logo Smith & Noble, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Misty C Blair +1 713 225 2300 +1 713 225 2340 mblair@seyfarth.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Ronald Lanser +1 312 460 5000 +1 312 460 7000 jlanser@seyfarth.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. Levinson +1 312 460 5000 +1 312 460 7000 mlevinson@seyfarth.com
No Logo The Territory Ahead, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Misty C Blair +1 713 225 2300 +1 713 225 2340 mblair@seyfarth.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Ronald Lanser +1 312 460 5000 +1 312 460 7000 jlanser@seyfarth.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. Levinson +1 312 460 5000 +1 312 460 7000 mlevinson@seyfarth.com
No Logo Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Olivo, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Franklin Ward +1 908 277 3333 +1 212 972 5866 wardj@wardolivo.com
No Logo Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Olivo, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Franklin Ward +1 908 277 3333 +1 212 972 5866 wardj@wardolivo.com
No Logo Vistaprint Ltd., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Christopher Lee Campbell +1 213 944 4928 +1 562 726 1772 chrislcampbell@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413

Toggle Switch Represented by Testa, Hurwitz & Thibeault LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard S. Sanders +1 617 248 7000
No Logo VistaPrint USA Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Christopher Lee Campbell +1 213 944 4928 +1 562 726 1772 chrislcampbell@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413

Toggle Switch Represented by Testa, Hurwitz & Thibeault LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard S. Sanders +1 617 248 7000
No Logo Smith & Noble, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Misty C Blair +1 713 225 2300 +1 713 225 2340 mblair@seyfarth.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Ronald Lanser +1 312 460 5000 +1 312 460 7000 jlanser@seyfarth.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. Levinson +1 312 460 5000 +1 312 460 7000 mlevinson@seyfarth.com
No Logo Soverain Software LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Cordon Smith +1 310 543 2244 +1 310 543 2204 pi.law@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Geer Hawkins +1 217 390 8309 +1 312 832 4700 phawkins@foley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/13/2010 Michael F Harte +1 312 876 7644 michael.harte@lw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Aaron Nelson +1 312 876 7700 +1 312 993 9767 david.nelson@lw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rodriguez O'Donnell Gonzalez & Williams, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carlos Rodriguez +1 202 293 3300 +1 202 293 3307 rodriguez@rorfgw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert B Wilson +1 212 596 9472 +1 646 728 2641 rwilson@fishneave.com
No Logo Michael Phillip Patterson, Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by Mike Patterson Mediation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Philip Patterson +1 903 592 4433 mike@mikepattersonmediation.com
No Logo Richard Egan, Technical Advisor

Represented by O'Keefe, Egan & Peterman LLP

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (595) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Status Report
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Withdraw
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Bill of Costs
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None USCA Judgment
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 584 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER granting 583 Motion for Release of Bond Obligation. The Court orders that the supersedeas bonds of Victoria's Secret and Avon be released upon entry of this order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/10/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                          Unopposed MOTION for Release of Bond Obligation by Avon Products, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Glenn, James) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER granting 581 Motion Requesting Suspension of Adjustments. Defendants are to continue to track and calculate the amount of quarterly adjustment that would be necessary under the existing Order, ECF No. 578. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/25/2013. (gsg) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
                              Unopposed MOTION REQUESTING THE SUSPENSION OF ADJUSTMENTS TO THEIR SUPERSEDEAS BONDS AND MODIFICATION OF THIS COURTS ORDER REQUIRING THOSE ADJUSTMENTS by Avon Products, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Glenn, James) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER granting 576 Motion for Bond. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/12/2012. (gsg) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 579 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting 575 Motion for Bond. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/12/2012. (gsg) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 578 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting 577 Motion directing defendants to post quarterly adjustments to bonds. This Court retains jurisdiction over all proceedings to enforce the ongoing royalty provisions of the Final Judgment and the provisions of this Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/12/2012. (gsg) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                      Agreed MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO POST QUARTERLY ADJUSTMENTS TO THEIR SUPERSEDEAS BONDS FOR ONGOING ROYALTIES THAT ACCRUE DURING THE PENDENCY OF DEFENDANTS APPEALS by Avon Products, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                        Unopposed MOTION for Bond by Avon Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Glenn, James) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                          Unopposed MOTION for Bond by Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Bond, # 2 Exhibit B - Declaration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 574 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Post-Trial Motion Proceedings held on 2/27/12 before Chief Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 68 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/9/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2013. (sms, ) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 573 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC for proceedings held on 02/27/2012 before Judge Hon. Leonard Davis, (Masterson, Robert) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in the amount of $105,835.28. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re 566 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Avon Products, Inc. USCA Case Number 12-1650. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 570 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re 565 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC. USCA Case Number 12-1649. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Pretrial Proceedings held on 4/21/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/5/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/15/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/13/2012. (sms, ) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                        ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit as to Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Final Judgment, Memorandum, Motion for Attorney Fees and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet as to 566 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT by Avon Products, Inc. (dlc, ) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                          ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit as to Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Final Judgment and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet as to 565 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT by Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management LLC. (dlc, ) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL - FEDERAL CIRCUIT by Avon Products, Inc.. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0540-3769802. (Glenn, James) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL - FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to 559 Judgment,,,,,, by Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0540-3769498. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Robert D Rhoad on behalf of Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3767597. (Rhoad, Robert) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Daniel B Epstein on behalf of Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3765963. (Epstein, Daniel) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A - Form AO133, # 2 Appendix B - Fernands Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 1 - Final Judgment, # 4 Exhibit Table 2, # 5 Exhibit Table 3, # 6 Exhibit Table 4, # 7 Exhibit Table 5, # 8 Exhibit Table 6, # 9 Exhibit Table 7)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Robert L Masterson on behalf of Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3764723. (Masterson, Robert) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Steven Ruhland on behalf of Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3756102. (Ruhland, Christopher) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          FINAL JUDGMENT. The Court awards damages to Soverain Software LLC for Victorias Secret Direct Brand Management, LLCs infringement of the '314 and '492 Patents in the amount of $9,200,000.00. The Court awards damages to Soverain for Avon Products, Inc.'s infringement of the '314 and '492 Patents in the amount of $8,700,000.00. Soverain is further awarded post-verdict damages from 11-19-2011, until the date of this Final Judgment at the following rates: (1) 0.4% for victoriassecret.com; (2) 0.42% for avon.com; and (3) 0.35% for youravon.com. Soverain is further awarded prejudgment and post-judgment interest on the actual damages found by the jury and those awarded as post-verdict damages calculated at the prime rate as of the date of this Final Judgment, compounded quarterly. Soverain is awarded its prejudgment Costs of Court. Soverain is entitled to post-judgment interest any time period between the entry of this Final Judgment and the date upon which Soverain receives payment from Defendants as ordered herein. For the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order 555 , Defendants are hereby ORDERED, for the remaining life of the '314 and '492 Patents and so long as their infringement continues, to pay Soverain an ongoing royalty at the following rates: (1) 1.0% for victoriassecret.com; (2) 1.05% for avon.com; and (3)0.875% for youravon.com. All relief not granted in this Final Judgment is DENIED. All pending motions not previously resolved are DENIED. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/22/12. cc:attys 8-22-12(mll, ) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 557 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Barry J Schindler is hereby terminated as counsel for Defendant Avon Products Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/17/2012. (leh, ) (Entered: 08/17/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Termination of Electronic Notices by Avon Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schindler, Barry) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Termination of Electronic Notices by Avon Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schindler, Barry) Modified on 8/16/2012 (sm, ). (Entered: 08/15/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying as moot 386 Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 422 Sealed Motion for Sanctions; granting 530 Sealed Motion for an Award of Pre- and Post-Judgment Interest and Post-Verdict Damages; granting 531 Sealed Motion for Post-Judgment Royalties; denying 532 Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Expenses; denying 534 Sealed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Alternatively for Remittitur and New Trial. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/09/12. cc:attys 8-09-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE by Soverain Software LLC re 539 Response in Opposition to Motion, Notice of Additional Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Post-Verdict Motion Hearing Hearing held on 2/27/2012. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In) (rlf, ) (Entered: 03/10/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 552 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        Sealed Document. Defendants' Sur-Reply in Opposition to Soverain's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Expenses. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17)(Levy, David) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 551 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          Sealed Document. Defendants' Sur-Reply in Opposition to Soverain's Motion for an Award of Pre- and Post-Judgment Interest and Post-Verdict Damages. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6, # 2 Exhibit 7)(Levy, David) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 550 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            Sealed Document. Defendants' Sur-Reply in Opposition to Soverain's Motion for Post-Judgment Royalties. (Levy, David) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 534 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and in the Alternative for Remittitur and/or New Trial filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER resetting Post Judgment Motion Hearing for 2/27/2012 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/17/12. cc:attys 2-17-12(mll, ) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 532 MOTION for Exceptional Case Status and Attorney Fees filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 531 SEALED MOTION FOR POST-JUDGMENT ROYALTIES filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 545 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 530 SEALED MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF PRE- ANDPOST-JUDGMENT INTEREST, AND POST-VERDICT DAMAGES filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 544 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                        SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 534 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and in the Alternative for Remittitur and/or New Trial filed by Avon Products, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 15, # 2 Exhibit 16, # 3 Exhibit 17, # 4 Exhibit 18)(Levy, David) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 543 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                          SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 532 MOTION for Exceptional Case Status and Attorney Fees filed by Avon Products, Inc., Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Trewitt 2005, # 2 Exhibit B Trewitt 2011, # 3 Exhibit C Sept 30 Letter, # 4 Exhibit D Oct 10 Letter, # 5 Exhibit E Oct 12 Letter, # 6 Exhibit F dx100, # 7 Exhibit G Sims - Avon, # 8 Exhibit H PX152, # 9 Exhibit I Roman depo, # 10 Exhibit J DX083, # 11 Exhibit K DX289, # 12 Exhibit L DX288, # 13 Exhibit M DX235, # 14 Exhibit N Conkel depo, # 15 Exhibit O DX201, # 16 Exhibit P Glenn Email, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT 543 .***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 541 SEALED MOTION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I, # 2 Exhibit J, # 3 Exhibit K, # 4 Exhibit L, # 5 Exhibit M, # 6 Exhibit N, # 7 Exhibit O, # 8 Exhibit P, # 9 Exhibit Q, # 10 Exhibit R, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Gabriel, Michael) Modified on 2/2/2012 (mjc, ). (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. ATTORNEY TO REFILE.*** SEALED MOTION by Avon Products, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Gabriel, Michael) Modified on 1/31/2012 (mjc, ). (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 540 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 539 Response in Opposition to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3, # 2 Exhibit 4, # 3 Exhibit 5, # 4 Exhibit 13)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 534 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and in the Alternative for Remittitur and/or New Trial filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 6, # 4 Exhibit 7, # 5 Exhibit 8, # 6 Exhibit 9, # 7 Exhibit 10, # 8 Exhibit 11, # 9 Exhibit 12, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 538 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 531 SEALED MOTION FOR POST-JUDGMENT ROYALTIES filed by Avon Products, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Brian Napper, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Levy, David) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 537 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 530 SEALED MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF PRE- ANDPOST-JUDGMENT INTEREST, AND POST-VERDICT DAMAGES filed by Avon Products, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Levy, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/1/2012: # 7 Exhibit 2 Corrected) (mjc, ). (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 1/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 535 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/25/12. cc:attys 1-25-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/25/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 1/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION Extend Post-Trial Briefing Deadlines by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 01/25/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 534 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and in the Alternative for Remittitur and/or New Trial by Avon Products, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit DX-15, # 16 Exhibit DX-152, # 17 Exhibit DX-157, # 18 Exhibit DX-160)(Levy, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/12/2012: # 19 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ). (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 533 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 532 MOTION for Exceptional Case Status and Attorney Fees. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 7, # 2 Exhibit 8, # 3 Exhibit 9)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Exceptional Case Status and Attorney Fees by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 531 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  SEALED MOTION FOR POST-JUDGMENT ROYALTIES by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 530 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF PRE- ANDPOST-JUDGMENT INTEREST, AND POST-VERDICT DAMAGES by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      REPORT of Mediation by George Richard Grainger. Mediation result: Impasse(Grainger, George) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Avon Products, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC re 520 Transcript,,, Notice of Intent to Request Redaction (Glenn, James) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to 496 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Response to Defendants' Offer of Proof Concerning the Exclusion of Evidence Regarding the Functional Operations of the "Future Fantasy Bookstore" Website by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** RESPONSE to 496 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Defendants Offer of Proof Concerning the Exclusion of Evidence Regarding the Functional Operations of the Future Fantasy Bookstore Website by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Smith, Michael) Modified on 11/23/2011 (gsg). (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 11/18/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/16/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/23/2012. (sms, ) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings held on 11/17/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Judith Werlinger/Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/16/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/23/2012. (sms, ) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings - Afternoon Session held on 11/16/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Judith Werlinger/Shea Sloan. shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/16/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/23/2012. (sms, ) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings - Morning Session held on 11/16/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Judith Werlinger/Shea Sloan. shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/16/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/23/2012. (sms, ) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings - Afternoon Session held on 11/15/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Judith Werlinger/Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/16/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/23/2012. (sms, ) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings - Morning Session held on 11/15/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/16/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/23/2012. (sms, ) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings - Afternoon Session held on 11/14/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Judith Werlinger/Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/16/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/23/2012. (sms, ) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Trial Proceedings - Morning Session held on 11/14/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporters: Judith Werlinger/Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/16/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/23/2012. (sms, ) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Voir Dire Proceedings held on 11/7/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/16/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/23/2012. (sms, ) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Pretrial Hearing Proceedings held on 10/20/11 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/16/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/27/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/23/2012. (sms, ) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER. All post-verdict motions due by 1/9/2012. Post-verdict Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2012 09:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Parties shall attend mediation by 12-31-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/21/11. cc:attys 11-22-11(mll, ) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Jury Instructions by Avon Products, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Proposed Jury Instruction No. 7.5)(Levy, David) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Jury Instructions by Avon Products, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Proposed Jury Instruction No. 5)(Levy, David) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 512 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial completed on 11/18/2011. (Court Reporters Judy Werlinger/Shea Sloan.) (jml, ) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 11/17/2011. (Court Reporters Judy Werlinger/Shea Sloan.) (jml, ) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Defendants' Exhibit List of Exhibits to be Filed Under Seal.(jml, ) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's Exhibit List of Documents to be Filed Under Seal. (jml, ) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Defendants' Exhibit List 1. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List 2, # 2 Exhibit List 3, # 3 Exhibit List 4 - FINAL)(jml, ) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's Exhibit List 1. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List 2, # 2 Exhibit List 3, # 3 FINAL Exhibit List 4)(jml, ) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 506 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed VERDICT FORM IN ITS ENTIRETY. (jml, ) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 505 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      JURY VERDICT. (jml, ) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Jury Instructions by Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Carter, Winstol) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Jury Instructions by Avon Products, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Carter, Winstol) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***Proposed Jury Instructions by Avon Products, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Nos. 5 and 7.5)(Carter, Winstol) Modified on 11/18/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***Proposed Jury Instructions by Avon Products, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Nos. 5 and 7.5)(Carter, Winstol) Modified on 11/17/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stephen Smith for Soverain Software LLC. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 11/16/2011. (Court Reporters Judy Werlinger/Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-in Sheet) (jml, ) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 11/15/2011. (Court Reporters Judy Werlinger/Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-in Sheet) (jml, ) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 11/14/2011. (Court Reporters Judy Werlinger/Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-in Sheet) (jml, ) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Avon Products, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC Defendants' Offer of Proof Concerning the Exclusion of Evidence Regarding the Functional Operations of the "Future Fantasy Bookstore" Website (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION of Dismissal of J.C. Penney Corporation by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Jury Instructions by Avon Products, Inc., Soverain Software LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER. The Court orders payment to technical advisor Richard Egan to be paid equally between Plaintiff and Defendant, with each to pay $487.50 for a total amount of $975.00. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/14/11. (leh, ) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 492 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING 491 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that all claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff Soverain Software LLC and Defendant Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, are dismissed without prejudice. All attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/14/11. (leh, ) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 11/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION of Dismissal of Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc. Without Prejudice by Soverain Software LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 11/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Preetam A Shingavi on behalf of Avon Products, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc. (Shingavi, Preetam) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Allen Glenn, Jr on behalf of Avon Products, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc. (Glenn, James) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Jack Levy on behalf of Avon Products, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc. (Levy, David) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Winstol D Carter, Jr on behalf of Avon Products, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc. (Carter, Winstol) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPORT of Mediation by George Richard Grainger. Mediation result: Impasse regarding claims against Avon and Victora Secret(Grainger, George) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPORT of Mediation by George Richard Grainger. Mediation result: JC Penney Settled(Grainger, George) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 484 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document. Jury Questionnaires. (rlf, ) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Selection held on 11/7/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, ) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Preetam A Shingavi on behalf of J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. (Shingavi, Preetam) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REGARDING EXHIBITS. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/07/11. cc:attys 11-07-11(mll, ) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 11/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 479 Opposed MOTION Entry of Proposed Amended Pretrial Order re 379 Proposed Pretrial Order,Opposed MOTION Entry of Proposed Amended Pretrial Order re 379 Proposed Pretrial Order, filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 11/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposed MOTION Entry of Proposed Amended Pretrial Order re 379 Proposed Pretrial Order, by Avon Products, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Levy, David) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Avon Products, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Soverain Software LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc. JOINT NOTICE OF AGREEMENT REGARDING JURY QUESTIONNAIRE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 477 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              10.20.11 Minute Entry - PRETRIAL: for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Final Pretrial Conference held on 10/20/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (leh, ) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying as moot 412 Motion for Leave to Supplement the Joint Proposed Pretrial Order; denying as moot 425 Sealed Motion to Strike Portions of the Supplemental Expert Reports of Andrew S Cromarty and Arthur M Keller; denying 443 Motion for More Definite Statement to Clarify the Scope of the Claim Term; denying as moot 462 Motion to Limit Number of Asserted Claims. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/24/11. cc:attys 10-24-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 470 Opposed MOTION in Limine filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 474 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 457 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Soverain Software LLC. (re-filed from Sealed Docket No. 472) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION. ATTACHED CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL TO Document # 471 Reply in Support of Motion. PLEASE NOTE.*** (mjc, ) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 457 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Smith, Michael) Modified on 10/18/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 10/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 471 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 455 SEALED MOTION to compel supplemental production from Defendants filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Smith, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/18/2011: # 7 Certificate of Authorization to File Under Seal) (mjc, ). (Entered: 10/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposed MOTION in Limine by Avon Products, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Glenn, James) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 462 Opposed MOTION to Limit Number of Asserted Claims filed by Avon Products, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc.. (Levy, David) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 10/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 462 Opposed MOTION to Limit Number of Asserted Claims filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 10/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 467 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 455 SEALED MOTION to compel supplemental production from Defendants filed by Avon Products, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Text of Proposed Order)(Levy, David) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 466 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 457 MOTION for Sanctions filed by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Levy, David) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 465 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Soverain Software LLC re 459 Order Joint Submission Regarding The Court's Docket Control Order (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 464 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting in part and denying in part 456 Motion to Expedite Briefing; granting in part and denying in part 458 Motion to Expedite Briefing. The Court ORDERS expediting briefing on Soverains Motion to Compel Supplemental Production from Defendants 455 and Soverains Rule 37 Motion for an Order Compelling Supplemental Disclosures from J.C. Penney and for Rule 37(c) Sanctions 457 according to the following schedule: Response due by 10-08-2011; Reply due by 10-14-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/04/11. cc:attys 10-04-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 443 Opposed MOTION for More Definite Statement to Clarify the Scope of the Claim Term "Computer" filed by Avon Products, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 18, # 2 Exhibit 19, # 3 Exhibit 20)(Levy, David) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposed MOTION to Limit Number of Asserted Claims by Avon Products, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gabriel, Michael) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 456 MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule re Motion to Compel Supplemental Production from Defendants, 458 MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule re Motion for Sanctions filed by Avon Products, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Levy, David) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 460 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED RESPONSE by Soverain Software LLC to 448 Sealed Document ( Defendants Supplemental Briefing Relating to Defendants Motion to Strike and Preclude Expert Reports and Testimony of Raymond Sims) filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER that parties are to meet and confer and submit a revised Docket Control Order to the Court by 10-06-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/22/11. cc:attys 9-22-11(mll, ) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule re Motion for Sanctions by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassidy, Kate) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None Motion for Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Sanctions by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassidy, Kate) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule re Motion to Compel Supplemental Production from Defendants by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassidy, Kate) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 455 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED MOTION to compel supplemental production from Defendants by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassidy, Kate) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 454 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 443 Opposed MOTION for More Definite Statement to Clarify the Scope of the Claim Term "Computer" filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2011: # 6 Text of Proposed Order Corrected) (mjc, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2011: # 7 Exhibit 1 Searchable, # 8 Exhibit 2 Searchable) (mjc, ). (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 452 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Soverain Software LLC. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft Bidz.com Inc are dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/15/11. cc:attys 9-15-11(mll, ) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Bidz.com, Inc. by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 445 Motion to Expedite Briefing. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/06/11. cc:attys 9-07-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying as moot 426 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/06/11. cc:attys 9-07-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 445 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing for the Motion to Clarify the Scope of the Claim Term "Computer" filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 448 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document. Defendants' Supplemental Briefing Relating to Defendants' Motion to Strike and Preclude Expert Reports and Testimony of Raymond S. Sims. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Glenn, James) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 392 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Motion to Strike and Preclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Raymond S. Sims filed filed by Avon Products, Inc., Bidz.com, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Glenn, James) Modified on 9/6/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION. ATTACHED CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL TO Document # 444 Sealed Additional Attachments. PLEASE NOTE.*** (mjc, ) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing for the Motion to Clarify the Scope of the Claim Term "Computer" by Avon Products, Inc., Bidz.com, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Levy, David) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 444 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 443 Opposed MOTION for More Definite Statement to Clarify the Scope of the Claim Term "Computer" Exhibit 10. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 11, # 2 Exhibit 12, # 3 Exhibit 16)(Levy, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/2/2011: # 4 Certificate of Authorization to File Under Seal) (mjc, ). (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposed MOTION for More Definite Statement to Clarify the Scope of the Claim Term "Computer" by Avon Products, Inc., Bidz.com, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 13, # 11 Exhibit 14, # 12 Exhibit 15, # 13 Exhibit 17, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Levy, David) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 441 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David S Nir terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/15/11. cc:attys 7-15-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for David S. Nir by Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 440 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc. of Firm Name Change (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 438 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by QVC, Inc. All claims and counterclaims in this action between pltf and deft QVC Inc are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, expenses, and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/24/11. cc:attys 5-25-11(mll, ) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal by QVC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER resetting Jury Selection for 11/7/2011 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis; Jury Trial reset for 11/7/2011 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/10/11. cc:attys 5-11-11(mll, ) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Soverain Software LLC of the Parties' Joint Submission Regarding Trial Setting (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 435 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Motion re 422 SEALED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS filed by Avon Products, Inc., Bidz.com, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., QVC, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit P - Hearing Transcript Excerpts)(Levy, David) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 434 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion (DKT 425) SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORTS OF ANDREW S. CROMARTY AND ARTHUR M. KELLER filed by Avon Products, Inc., Bidz.com, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., QVC, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc.(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 433 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 432 Reply to Response to Motion, Exhibit D. (Levy, David) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 432 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 412 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File to Supplement the Joint Proposed Pretrial Order filed by Avon Products, Inc., Bidz.com, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., QVC, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc.. (Levy, David) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 431 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 425 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORTS OF ANDREW S. CROMARTY AND ARTHUR M. KELLER filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 430 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 422 SEALED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 429 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 422 SEALED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS filed by Avon Products, Inc., Bidz.com, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., QVC, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit E-1, # 8 Exhibit E-2, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K, # 15 Exhibit L, # 16 Exhibit M, # 17 Exhibit N, # 18 Exhibit O)(Levy, David) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 428 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 425 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORTS OF ANDREW S. CROMARTY AND ARTHUR M. KELLER filed by Avon Products, Inc., Bidz.com, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., QVC, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G)(Levy, David) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 426 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 425 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORTS OF ANDREW S. CROMARTY AND ARTHUR M. KELLEREmergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 425 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORTS OF ANDREW S. CROMARTY AND ARTHUR M. KELLER filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 425 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORTS OF ANDREW S. CROMARTY AND ARTHUR M. KELLER by Avon Products, Inc., Bidz.com, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 425 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORTS OF ANDREW S. CROMARTY AND ARTHUR M. KELLER by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 423 Motion to Expedite Briefing Schedule for Soverain's Motion for Sanctions. Defts' Opposition shall be filed by 5-02-2011; Soverain's Reply shall be filed by 5-05-2011; and defts' Surreply shall be filed by 5-09-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/29/11. cc:attys 4-29-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule for Soverain's Motion for Sanctions by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 422 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 412 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File to Supplement the Joint Proposed Pretrial Order filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying 262 Motion to Stay; denying 296 Motion to Compel; granting 306 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims; denying 307 Motion to Compel; granting 344 Sealed Motion for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions; denying as moot 365 Sealed Motion for Leave to Serve Infringement Contentions and Expert Reports; denying 377 Motion to Strike ; granting 384 Sealed Patent Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement; denying 385 Sealed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction; denying 392 Sealed Patent Motion to Strike and Preclude the Expert Report of Raymond Sims; denying 409 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 411 Sealed Motion in Limine; denying 418 Motion to Continue Trial Date. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/21/11. cc:attys 4-22-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  4.21.11 Minute Entry - PRETRIAL: for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Final Pretrial Conference held on 4/21/2011. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, ) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Continue Trial Date by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 417 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 409 MOTION in Limine filed by Avon Products, Inc., Bidz.com, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., QVC, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Errata C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Levy, David) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 416 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 392 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Motion to Strike and Preclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Raymond S. Sims filed filed by Avon Products, Inc., Bidz.com, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., QVC, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Levy, David) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Avon Products, Inc., Bidz.com, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., QVC, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc. Estimates of Time Needed at Trial (McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Soverain Software LLC of Plaintiff's Estimates of Trial Time (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 413 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 411 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motions in limine filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposed MOTION for Leave to File to Supplement the Joint Proposed Pretrial Order by Avon Products, Inc., Bidz.com, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., QVC, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Levy, David) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 411 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motions in limine by Avon Products, Inc., Bidz.com, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., QVC, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Glenn, James) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 410 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 409 MOTION in Limine. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 409 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 408 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 392 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Motion to Strike and Preclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Raymond S. Sims filed filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Setting Trial Dates. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/07/11. cc:attys 4-07-11(mll, ) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 386 SEALED MOTION of Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Based on Divided Infringement filed by Avon Products, Inc., Bidz.com, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., QVC, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ward, John) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 405 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 384 SEALED PATENT MOTION DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO WILLFUL INFRINGEMENT filed by QVC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Eric H. Findlay, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 404 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 385 SEALED MOTION Defendant's J.C. Penney Corporation Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Avon Products, Inc., Bidz.com, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., QVC, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James Glenn, # 2 Exhibit 16, # 3 Exhibit 17, # 4 Exhibit 18, # 5 Exhibit 19)(Glenn, James) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 403 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 377 MOTION to Strike Certain Portions of the Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Jack D. Grimes filed by Avon Products, Inc., Bidz.com, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., QVC, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James Glenn, # 2 Exhibit J, # 3 Exhibit K, # 4 Exhibit L, # 5 Exhibit M, # 6 Exhibit N, # 7 Exhibit O, # 8 Exhibit P, # 9 Exhibit Q, # 10 Exhibit R, # 11 Exhibit S, # 12 Exhibit T)(Glenn, James) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 365 SEALED MOTION PURSUANT TO RULE 16(b) FOR LEAVETO SERVE INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AND EXPERT REPORTSREGARDING QVCS CUSTOMER SERVICE/ORDER ENTRY WEBSITE filed by QVC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Ashbrook, # 2 Exhibit 7 - Excerpts of Soverain Newegg Appeal Brief, # 3 Exhibit 8 - Shamos Deposition Transcript)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 400 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Gary M Gex terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/01/11. cc:attys 4-01-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Gary M. Gex by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gex, Gary) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 399 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: Proposed Order re: 398 Sealed Response to Motion. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 398 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 384 SEALED PATENT MOTION DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO WILLFUL INFRINGEMENT filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35)(Smith, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/31/2011: # 36 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ). (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 397 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 386 SEALED MOTION of Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Based on Divided Infringement filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 396 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 385 SEALED MOTION Defendant's J.C. Penney Corporation Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 395 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 365 SEALED MOTION PURSUANT TO RULE 16(b) FOR LEAVETO SERVE INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AND EXPERT REPORTSREGARDING QVCS CUSTOMER SERVICE/ORDER ENTRY WEBSITE filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 394 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 377 MOTION to Strike Certain Portions of the Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Jack D. Grimes filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Additional Attachments to Main Document: 392 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Motion to Strike and Preclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Raymond S. Sims filed.. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 392 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants' Motion to Strike and Preclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Raymond S. Sims filed by QVC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit of Eric H. Findlay, # 3 Exhibit 1 - Wolanyk Transcript, # 4 Exhibit 2 - Expert Report of Sims, # 5 Exhibit 3 - Sims Transcript, # 6 Exhibit 4 - Wolanyk Depo. Exhibit 11, # 7 Exhibit 5 - Stewart Transcript, # 8 Exhibit 6 - Competitive Update, # 9 Exhibit 7 - Grimes Transcript, # 10 Exhibit 8 - Gosh Transcript, # 11 9 - Soverain Damages Calculation)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 391 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 365 SEALED MOTION PURSUANT TO RULE 16(b) FOR LEAVE TO SERVE INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AND EXPERT REPORTS REGARDING QVCS CUSTOMER SERVICE/ORDER ENTRY WEBSITE filed by QVC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit of Ashbrook, # 3 Exhibit 1 - Grimes Expert Report, # 4 Exhibit 2 - Grimes Transcript, # 5 Exhibit 3 - Soverain's First Set of Interrogatories, # 6 Exhibit 4 - Soverain's Rule 34 Demand for Inspection, # 7 Exhibit 5 - QVC's Reponse to Soverain's Demand for Inspection, # 8 Exhibit 6 - Ashbrook/Cassidy Email Exchange)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 03/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 388 Motion to Remove Counsel from CM/ECF Notifications. HSN defts' counsel Joseph Lanser, Michael Levinson, Matthew Werber and Misty Blair shall be removed from CM/ECF notification in this case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/15/11. cc:attys 3-15-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 383 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by QVC, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/14/11. cc:attys 3-14-11(mll, ) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION REMOVE COUNSEL FROM CM/ECF NOTIFICATIONS by Ballard Designs, Inc., Cornerstone Brands, Inc., Garnet Hill, Inc., HSN Improvements, LLC, HSN, Inc., Smith & Noble, LLC, The Territory Ahead, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lanser, Joseph) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 387 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document. [Proposed] Order relating to Document Number 385. (Glenn, James) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 386 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION of Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Based on Divided Infringement by Avon Products, Inc., Bidz.com, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., QVC, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Micahel G. Gabriel, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9-25, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Levy, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/10/2011: # 12 Signed Declaration of Michael G. Gabriel) (mjc, ). (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 385 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED MOTION Defendant's J.C. Penney Corporation Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit J. Glenn Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15)(Glenn, James) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 384 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED PATENT MOTION DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO WILLFUL INFRINGEMENT by QVC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit of Findlay, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter Brief filed by QVC, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Letter Brief)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***Letter Brief filed by QVC, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Letter Brief)(Findlay, Eric) (Document filed in incorrect case, sealed by court.) Modified on 3/9/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Avon Products, Inc., Bidz.com, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., QVC, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc. re 377 MOTION to Strike Certain Portions of the Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Jack D. Grimes - Certificate of Conference (Glenn, James) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Bidz.com, Inc. Notice of Request for Daily Transcript and Real Time Reporting of Court Proceedings (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Pretrial Order (Joint) by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff'sTrial Witness List, # 2 Exhibit 2- Defendants' Trial Witness List, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Proposed Verdict Form, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Defendants' Proposed Verdict Form, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Plaintiff''s Proposed Jury Instructions, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Defendants' Proposed Jury Instructions)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 378 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 377 MOTION to Strike Certain Portions of the Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Jack D. Grimes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Glenn, James) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike Certain Portions of the Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Jack D. Grimes by Avon Products, Inc., Bidz.com, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., QVC, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc.. Responses due by 3/21/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James A. Glenn, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit F, # 6 Exhibit G, # 7 Exhibit H, # 8 Exhibit I, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Glenn, James) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc. of Request for Daily Transcript and Real Time Reporting of Court Proceedings (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Avon Products, Inc. Of Request For Daily Transcript and Real Time Reporting of Court Proceedings (McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. Request for Daily Transcript and Real Time Reporting (Carter, Winstol) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by QVC, Inc. of Request for Daily Transcripts (Masterson, Robert) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Soverain Software LLC of Request for Daily Transcripts and Real Time Reporting (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER that pltf and defts pay $1,023.75 to Richard Egan for services as technical consultant to the Court through 1-31-2011, for a total amount of $2,047.50. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/04/11. cc:attys 3-04-11(mll, ) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Soverain Software LLC re 365 SEALED MOTION PURSUANT TO RULE 16(b) FOR LEAVETO SERVE INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AND EXPERT REPORTSREGARDING QVCS CUSTOMER SERVICE/ORDER ENTRY WEBSITE (Amended Certificate of Conference) (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR PLEASE DISREGARD.***Additional Attachments to Main Document: 365 SEALED MOTION PURSUANT TO RULE 16(b) FOR LEAVETO SERVE INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AND EXPERT REPORTSREGARDING QVCS CUSTOMER SERVICE/ORDER ENTRY WEBSITE.. (Smith, Michael) Modified on 3/2/2011 (mjc, ). (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc. of Supplemental Rog Responses and Amended and Supplemented Initial Disclosures (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. Service of Supplemental and Amended Responses to Initial Disclosures and Interrogatories (Carter, Winstol) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Avon Products, Inc. of Service of Second Amended Initial Disclosures and Second Amended Responses/Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (Warshawsky, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 365 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED MOTION PURSUANT TO RULE 16(b) FOR LEAVETO SERVE INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AND EXPERT REPORTSREGARDING QVCS CUSTOMER SERVICE/ORDER ENTRY WEBSITE by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendants' Trial Witness List by Avon Products, Inc., Bidz.com, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., QVC, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc.. (Craft, Roger) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 344 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions filed by Avon Products, Inc., Bidz.com, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., QVC, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc.. (Glenn, James) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Address by Douglas Ray McSwane, Jr (McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 358 Motion for Extension of Time to serve Expert Reports. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/15/11. cc:attys 2-15-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 360 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 357 Motion for Extension of Time. Dispositive Motions due 3-09-2011; Response to Dispositive Motions due 3-30-2011; Replies to Dispositive Motions due 4-06-2011. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/15/11. cc:attys 2-15-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of the Markman Hearing held on October 28, 2010 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jan Mason,Telephone number: 903-590-1096. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (92 pages) Redaction Request due 3/7/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/17/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/16/2011. (rem, ) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File To Serve Expert Reports by Bidz.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Amend Docket Control Order re 301 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Avon Products, Inc., Bidz.com, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., QVC, Inc., Soverain Software LLC, Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Winstol) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 344 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by Soverain Software LLC of Rebuttal Expert Reports (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Hotline Conference held on 2/10/2011. (Jan Lockhart, ECRO.) (jml) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/10/2011: # 1 Corrected Minutes) (jml, ). (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kimberly A Warshawsky for Avon Products, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by QVC, Inc. of Service of Rebuttal Expert Report on behalf of All Defendants (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Avon Products, Inc., Bidz.com, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., QVC, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc. Defendants' Notice of Compliance of Service of Rebuttal Expert Report of Brian W. Napper (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael G Gabriel for Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Avon Products, Inc., Bidz.com, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., QVC, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc. of Compliance of Service of Rebuttal Expert Report of Arthur M. Keller (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ryan McPhee for Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 324 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re Direct Infringement; denying 322 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re Inducement of Infringement; denying as moot 323 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re Contributory Infringement; granting 321 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re Willful Infringement. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/27/11. cc:attys 1-28-11(mll, ) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to 343 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) of Defendants' of Additional Authority by Soverain Software LLC. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 345 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: Declaration of James A. Glenn in Support of 344 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 1 Part 3, # 4 Exhibit 1 Part 4, # 5 Exhibit 1 Part 5, # 6 Exhibit 1 Part 6, # 7 Exhibit 1 Part 7, # 8 Exhibit 1 Part 8, # 9 Exhibit 1 Part 9, # 10 Exhibit 1 Part 10, # 11 Exhibit 2 Part 1, # 12 Exhibit 2 Part 2, # 13 Exhibit 2 Part 3, # 14 Exhibit 2 Part 4, # 15 Exhibit 2 Part 5, # 16 Exhibit 2 Part 6, # 17 Exhibit 2 Part 7, # 18 Exhibit 2 Part 8, # 19 Exhibit 2 Part 9, # 20 Exhibit 2 Part 10)(Glenn, James) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 344 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Winstol) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc. re 324 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, Notice of Additional Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***DISREGARD ENTRY - FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY*** NOTICE by Avon Products, Inc., Bidz.com, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., QVC, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc. re 324 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, Notice of Additional Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ainsworth, Charles) Modified on 1/24/2011 (kls, ). (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 340 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Soverain Software LLC. All claims asserted by pltf against defts HSN Inc, HSN Improvements LLC, Cornerstone Brands Inc, Ballard Designs Inc, Garnet Hill Inc, Smith & Noble LLC, and The Territory Ahead Inc are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All costs are to be borne by the party incurring same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/19/11. cc:attys 1-19-11(mll, ) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter Brief filed by Avon Products, Inc., Bidz.com, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., QVC, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter Brief filed by QVC, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by Soverain Software LLC of Expert Reports (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter Brief filed by Soverain Software LLC (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter Brief filed by Soverain Software LLC (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter Brief filed by Soverain Software LLC (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter Brief filed by Soverain Software LLC (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 332 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OPINION. The Court interprets the claim language in this case in the manner set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/13/11. cc:attys 1-13-11(mll, ) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Avon Products, Inc. (Notice of Compliance of serving expert report of Keller) (McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Avon Products, Inc. of Additional Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. Notice of Service of Expert Report Filed on Behalf of All Defendants (Carter, Winstol) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by QVC, Inc. Defendants' Notice of Service of Expert Report filed on behalf of all Defendants (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert D Rhoad for QVC, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 325 Motion to Supplement Infringement Contentions concerning deft Avon Products, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/05/11. cc:attys 1-05-11 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION Unopposed Motion To Supplement Infringement Contentions Pursuant To P.R. 3-6(b) by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter Brief filed by Avon Products, Inc., Bidz.com, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., QVC, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Letter Brief)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 12/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter Brief filed by QVC, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Craft, Roger) (Entered: 12/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter Brief filed by QVC, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Craft, Roger) (Entered: 12/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter Brief filed by QVC, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Craft, Roger) (Entered: 12/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 306 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims filed by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.. (Levy, David) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER that pltf and defts each pay $7,390.84 to Richard Egan for costs and services to the Court as the Court's technical advisor, for a total amount of $14,781.68. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/16/10. cc:attys 12-16-10(mll, ) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 306 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by VistaPrint, Ltd., VistaPrint, USA, Inc. of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Gubiotti, Matthew) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 314 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Debra Elaine Gunter and Herbert A Yarbrough, III terminated as counsel for Avon Products Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/08/10. cc:attys 12-08-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 296 MOTION to Compel Document Production, Interrogatory Responses and 30(b)(6) Testimony from Defendants Victorias Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., and Victorias Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC MOTION to Compel Document Production, Interrogatory Responses and 30(b)(6) Testimony from Defendants Victorias Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., and Victorias Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC (Supplemental Reply in Support) filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Avon Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Amway Corp. re 305 Order, Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Timmerman, Scott) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert L Masterson for QVC, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert W Ashbrook, Jr for QVC, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Brian Plies on behalf of QVC, Inc. (Plies, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 309 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              First Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc..(Carter, Winstol) (Entered: 11/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 307 Supplemental MOTION to Compel (Supplement to Docket No. 296) filed by Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Nir, David) (Entered: 11/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supplemental MOTION to Compel (Supplement to Docket No. 296) by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Amended Answer, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Glenn Declaration, # 4 Exhibit A - Chart of OOE system)(Levy, David) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 303 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Soverain Software LLC. All claims asserted between pltf and deft Amway Corp are dismissed with prejudice. All costs are to be borne by the party incurring same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/22/10. cc:attys 11-23-10(mll, ) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 304 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER that prior to filing any summary judgment motion, parties must submit letter briefs seeking permission to file the motion; prior to filing any motions to strike or Daubert Motions, the parties must submit letter briefs seeking permission to file the motion; each side is limited to 10 disputed motions in limine; each side is limited to designating 250 exhibits for trial absent a showing of good cause; each side is limited to designating no more than 10 hours of deposition testimony for use at trial absent a showing of good cause; in addition to identifying witnesses as "will call," "may call," or "probably will not call," each side shall identify the witness's employer and topic the witness will address. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/23/10. cc:attys 11-23-10(mll, ) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION of Dismissal of Amway Corp. by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sara Kay Borrelli on behalf of QVC, Inc. (Borrelli, Sara) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 301 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 293 Motion to Extend Deadlines. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/15/10. cc:attys 11-15-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 292 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Soverain Software LLC. All claims asserted between pltf and defts Vistaprint Limited and Vistaprint USA Inc are dismissed with prejudice. All costs are to be borne by the party incurring same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/15/10. cc:attys 11-15-10(mll, ) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 296 MOTION to Compel Document Production, Interrogatory Responses and 30(b)(6) Testimony from Defendants Victorias Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., and Victorias Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC MOTION to Compel Document Production, Interrogatory Responses and 30(b)(6) Testimony from Defendants Victorias Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., and Victorias Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 296 MOTION to Compel Document Production, Interrogatory Responses and 30(b)(6) Testimony from Defendants Victorias Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., and Victorias Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC MOTION to Compel Document Production, Interrogatory Responses and 30(b)(6) Testimony from Defendants Victorias Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., and Victorias Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC filed by Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Nir, David) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 11/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglas Ray McSwane, Jr on behalf of Avon Products, Inc. (McSwane, Douglas) (Entered: 11/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 11/11/2010, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Compel Document Production, Interrogatory Responses and 30(b)(6) Testimony from Defendants Victorias Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., and Victorias Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 11/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Keith H Forst for Soverain Software LLC. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Peter G Hawkins for Soverain Software LLC. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION Extend Certain Deadlines re 175 Order Docket Control Order by Avon Products, Inc., Ballard Designs, Inc., Bidz.com, Inc., Cornerstone Brands, Inc., Garnet Hill, Inc., HSN Improvements, LLC, HSN, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., QVC, Inc., Smith & Noble, LLC, The Territory Ahead, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal of VistaPrint, Ltd. and VistaPrint USA, Inc. by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 291 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPORT of Mediation by Michael Phillip Patterson. Mediation result: settled(Patterson, Michael) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    10.28.10 Minute Entry - MARKMAN Hrg. for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Markman Hearing held on 10/28/2010. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, ) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 289 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shannon Marie Dacus on behalf of Bidz.com, Inc. (Dacus, Shannon) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPORT of Mediation by Michael Phillip Patterson. Mediation result: recessed(Patterson, Michael) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPORT of Mediation by Michael Phillip Patterson. Mediation result: recessed(Patterson, Michael) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPORT of Mediation by Michael Phillip Patterson. Mediation result: still negotiating(Patterson, Michael) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 282 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/26/10. cc:attys 10-26-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***REPORT of Mediation by Michael Phillip Patterson. Mediation result: impasse(Patterson, Michael) Modified on 10/28/2010 (mjc, ). (Entered: 10/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SOVERAINS PATENT RULE 4-5(c) REPLY TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFS filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages FOR ITS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFS by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 281 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF re 276 Plaintiff's Revised Opening Claim Claim Construction Brief (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S)(Nir, David) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to 276 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Avon Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - US Patent No. 7,272,639, # 2 Exhibit 2 - M.P.E.P. Section 201.07, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Preliminary Rebuttal Report of Plaintiff's Expert Michael Ian Shamos, Ph.D., J.D., filed in Soverain Software, LLC, Plaintiff, v. Amazon.com, Inc., Defendant, Eastern District of Texas, Civil Action No. 06-04CV14, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Amendment to Patent Application No. 09/005,479 dated December 28, 2001, # 5 Exhibit 5 - US Patent No. 5,708,780 (part 1 of 2), # 6 Exhibit 5 - US Patent No. 5,708,780 (part 2 of 2))(Lovett, Mary-Olga) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Responsive CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Amway Corp., QVC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 277 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael F Harte terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/13/10. cc:attys 10-13-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REVISED OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPORT of Mediation by Michael Phillip Patterson. Mediation result: settled(Patterson, Michael) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 274 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 262 MOTION to Stay filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED P.R.4-3 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION & PREHEARING STATEMENT filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***REPORT of Mediation by Michael Phillip Patterson. Mediation result: Settled(Patterson, Michael) Modified on 10/7/2010 (mjc, ). (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 271 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER that parties meet and confer and narrow the number of disputed terms to a reasonable number. The Court further orders parties to file an amended PR 4-3 Statement by 10-06-10. The Court will allow pltf to resubmit its Opening Claim Construction Brief, and extends the deadline to 10-08-10; the deadline for defts' Responsive Brief to 10-15-2010; and the deadline for pltf's Reply Brief to 10-22-2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/01/10. cc:attys 10-01-10(mll, ) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 262 MOTION to Stay pending Newegg Appeal filed by Amway Corp., Avon Products, Inc., Ballard Designs, Inc., Bidz.com, Inc., Cornerstone Brands, Inc., Garnet Hill, Inc., HSN Improvements, LLC, HSN, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., QVC, Inc., Smith & Noble, LLC, The Territory Ahead, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., VistaPrint, Ltd., VistaPrint, USA, Inc.. (Werber, Matthew) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert B Wilson for Soverain Software LLC. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Amazon D.I. 246, Claim Construction Opinion, # 2 Exhibit B - Newegg D.I. 192, Order Granting Leave To File Amended Claim Construction, # 3 Exhibit C - Newegg D.I. 214, Claim Construction Order, # 4 Exhibit D - U.S. Patent No. 5,715,314 and Reexamination Certificate, # 5 Exhibit E - U.S. Patent No. 5,909,492 and Reexamination Certificate, # 6 Exhibit F - Text of asserted claims, with disputed terms shown in bold, # 7 Exhibit G - D.I. 263, Exhibit C, Defendants Proposed Claim Constructions and Support, # 8 Exhibit H - FOLDOC Free On-Line Dictionary of Computing, at http://foldoc.org/ (definition of client dated October 27, 1997), # 9 Exhibit I - Newegg D.I. 434, Memorandum Opinion and Order, # 10 Exhibit J - U.S. Patent No. 7,272,639, # 11 Exhibit K - U.S. Patent Pub. No. 2010/0057561, continuation of Application No. 08/168,519, # 12 Exhibit L - U.S. Patent No. 5,708,780 and Reexamination Certificate, # 13 Exhibit M - D.I. 263, Exhibit B, Soverain's Proposed Claim Constructions and Support)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 262 MOTION to Stay filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Smith, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2010: # 3 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ). (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER appointing Richard Egan as the technical advisor to the Court in this action, with his costs to be assessed equally between pltf and deft and timely paid as billed. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/14/10. cc:attys 9-15-10(mll, ) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 264 Motion to Amend/Correct Deadlines. The deadline to file tutorials is extended to 9-20-2010 and the Discovery Deadline for Claim Construction Issues is extended to 9-17-2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/13/10. cc:attys 9-13-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct 175 Order by Amway Corp., Avon Products, Inc., Ballard Designs, Inc., Bidz.com, Inc., Garnet Hill, Inc., HSN Improvements, LLC, HSN, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., QVC, Inc., Smith & Noble, LLC, Soverain Software LLC, The Territory Ahead, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., VistaPrint, Ltd., VistaPrint, USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 263 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          P.R. 4-3 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT filed by Amway Corp., Avon Products, Inc., Ballard Designs, Inc., Bidz.com, Inc., Cornerstone Brands, Inc., Garnet Hill, Inc., HSN Improvements, LLC, HSN, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., QVC, Inc., Smith & Noble, LLC, Soverain Software LLC, The Territory Ahead, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., VistaPrint, Ltd., VistaPrint, USA, Inc. (Werber, Matthew) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Stay by Amway Corp., Avon Products, Inc., Ballard Designs, Inc., Bidz.com, Inc., Cornerstone Brands, Inc., Garnet Hill, Inc., HSN Improvements, LLC, HSN, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., QVC, Inc., Smith & Noble, LLC, The Territory Ahead, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., VistaPrint, Ltd., VistaPrint, USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Werber Declaration, # 2 Exhibits A - E)(Werber, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2010: # 3 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ). (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kate E Cassidy for Soverain Software LLC. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address by John A Scillieri (Scillieri, John) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 258 Motion to Amend Docket Control Order. The deadline to file the Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement is extended to 8-31-2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/24/10. cc:attys 8-24-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Amway Corp., Avon Products, Inc., Ballard Designs, Inc., Bidz.com, Inc., Cornerstone Brands, Inc., Garnet Hill, Inc., HSN Improvements, LLC, HSN, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., QVC, Inc., Shutterfly, Inc., Smith & Noble, LLC, Soverain Software LLC, The Territory Ahead, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., VistaPrint, Ltd., VistaPrint, USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Levy, David) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Amway Corp., Avon Products, Inc., Ballard Designs, Inc., Bidz.com, Inc., Cornerstone Brands, Inc., Garnet Hill, Inc., HSN Improvements, LLC, HSN, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., QVC, Inc., Smith & Noble, LLC, Soverain Software LLC, The Territory Ahead, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., VistaPrint, Ltd., VistaPrint, USA, Inc. Joint Statement Regarding Appointment of Technical Advisor (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Diane K Lettelleir on behalf of J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. (Lettelleir, Diane) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Amway Corp. of Compliance regarding Privilege Log (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Gary M Gex for J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Bidz.com, Inc. Defendant Bidz.com, Inc.'s Notice of Compliance Regarding Local Patent Rule 4-2 Disclosures (Scillieri, John) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Ballard Designs, Inc., Cornerstone Brands, Inc., Garnet Hill, Inc., HSN Improvements, LLC, HSN, Inc., Smith & Noble, LLC, The Territory Ahead, Inc. OF COMPLIANCE REGARDING P.R. 4-2 DISCLOSURES (Werber, Matthew) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by VistaPrint, Ltd., VistaPrint, USA, Inc. of Compliance of Service of 4-2 Preliminary Claim Construction and Extrinsic Evidence (Faltin, Heather) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Soverain Software LLC Regarding Privilege Logs (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by Soverain Software LLC Regarding PR 4-2 Disclosures (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Disclosure by Amway Corp. Regarding Compliance with PR 4-2 (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 4-2 (Carter, Winstol) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by QVC, Inc. of Compliance of Service of 4-2 Preliminary Claim Construction and Extrinsic Evidence (Jackson, John) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc. of Compliance of Service of 4-2 Preliminary Claim Construction and Extrinsic Evidence (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: 7/26/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Avon Products, Inc. re 174 Order of Compliance with P.R. 4-2 (Lovett, Mary-Olga) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by VistaPrint, Ltd., VistaPrint, USA, Inc. of Compliance with Discovery Order (Dkt. 239) re: Privilege Log (Faltin, Heather) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. of No Disputes As To Claims of Privileged Documents (Carter, Winstol) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Bidz.com, Inc. Defendant Bidz.com, Inc.'s Notice Of No Disputes As To Claims Of Privileged Documents (Scillieri, John) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Avon Products, Inc. No Disputes As To Claims of Privileged Documents (Lovett, Mary-Olga) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Ballard Designs, Inc., Cornerstone Brands, Inc., Garnet Hill, Inc., HSN Improvements, LLC, HSN, Inc., Smith & Noble, LLC, The Territory Ahead, Inc. CONCERNING PRIVILEGE LOGS (Werber, Matthew) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc. of No Disputes as to Claims of Privileged Document (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: 7/12/2010 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 236 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/12/10. cc:attys 7-12-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: 7/9/2010 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 175 Order Docket Control Order extending deadlines for P.R. 4-2 to July 26, 2010 and P.R. 4-3 to August 23, 2010 by Amway Corp., Avon Products, Inc., Ballard Designs, Inc., Bidz.com, Inc., Cornerstone Brands, Inc., Garnet Hill, Inc., HSN Improvements, LLC, HSN, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., QVC, Inc., Smith & Noble, LLC, Soverain Software LLC, The Territory Ahead, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., VistaPrint, Ltd., VistaPrint, USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: 7/8/2010 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Alana Mistretta for VistaPrint, Ltd., VistaPrint, USA, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 234 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: 6/25/2010 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/25/10. cc:attys 6-25-10(mll, ) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 233 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: 6/25/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATED ESI DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/25/10. cc:attys 6-25-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: 6/24/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Agreed MOTION for Entry of Protective Order and Discovery Order Regarding ESI by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order Regarding ESI, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Discovery Order Regarding ESI)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: 6/22/2010 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 230 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. The deadline for parties to exchange privilege logs or file notice that there are no disputes concerning privileged documents is extended to 7-23-2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/22/10. cc:attys 6-22-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Amend/Correct 175 Order (Docket Control Order) by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: 6/10/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dwayne LeRoy Mason on behalf of Avon Products, Inc. (Mason, Dwayne) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: 5/24/2010 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 227 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. The deadline for parties to exchange privilege logs is extended to 6-28-2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/24/10. cc:attys 5-24-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: 5/21/2010 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 175 Order by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: 5/17/2010 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 219 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Avon Products, Inc. by Soverain Software LLC.(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: 5/13/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Campbell on behalf of VistaPrint, Ltd., VistaPrint, USA, Inc. (Campbell, Christopher) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: 4/30/2010 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 223 Motion to Remove Attorneys from electronic noticing in this case. Attorneys Otis Carroll and Deborah Race are terminated effective the date of this order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/30/10. cc:attys 4-30-10(mll, ) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: 4/29/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION Motion to Terminate ECF Notifications by Shutterfly, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Race, Deborah) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: 4/29/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Disclosure by Avon Products, Inc. Defendant (Lovett, Mary-Olga) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: 4/27/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Disclosure by Amway Corp. Additional Disclosures pursuant to Paragraph 2 of the Court's Discovery Order (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: 4/27/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by VistaPrint, Ltd., VistaPrint, USA, Inc. (Sanders, Richard) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 219 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: 4/27/2010 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant Avon Productions, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM S against Soverain Software LLC by Avon Products, Inc..(Lovett, Mary-Olga) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: 4/27/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Disclosure by Soverain Software LLC (Additional Disclosures) (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: 4/27/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. re additional disclosures (Carter, Winstol) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: 4/26/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Disclosure by Ballard Designs, Inc., Cornerstone Brands, Inc., Garnet Hill, Inc., HSN Improvements, LLC, HSN, Inc., Smith & Noble, LLC, The Territory Ahead, Inc. (Werber, Matthew) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: 4/26/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by Bidz.com, Inc. Additional Disclosures (Scillieri, John) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: 4/26/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Disclosure by Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc. Additional Disclosures (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: 4/26/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Disclosure by QVC, Inc. Additional Disclosures (Jackson, John) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: 4/13/2010 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying 120 Motion to Dismiss. The Court denies the motion as to that argument without prejudice to re-raising after discovery and claim construction. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/12/2010. (gsg) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 211 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: 3/24/2010 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 210 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/24/10. cc:attys 3-24-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: 3/23/2010 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 175 Order - Docket Control Order by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: 3/22/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by Soverain Software LLC of PR 4-1 Disclosures (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: 3/19/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Disclosure by Amway Corp., Avon Products, Inc., Ballard Designs, Inc., Bidz.com, Inc., Cornerstone Brands, Inc., Garnet Hill, Inc., HSN Improvements, LLC, HSN, Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., QVC, Inc., Smith & Noble, LLC, The Territory Ahead, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., VistaPrint, Ltd., VistaPrint, USA, Inc. 4-1 Proposed Terms and Claim Elements for Construction (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 207 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: 3/10/2010 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 206 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. The deadline to comply with Patent Rule 4-1 is extended to 3-19-2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/08/10. cc:attys 3-10-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: 3/10/2010 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Bidz.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scillieri, John) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: 3/9/2010 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Bidz.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scillieri, John) Modified on 3/10/2010 (mjc, ). (Entered: 03/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: 3/4/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by Avon Products, Inc. P.R. 3-3 Invalidity Contentions and P.R. 3-4 Documentation (Lovett, Mary-Olga) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 3/3/2010, Entered: 3/3/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by Ballard Designs, Inc., Garnet Hill, Inc., Smith & Noble, LLC, The Territory Ahead, Inc., HSN, Inc., HSN Improvements, LLC, Cornerstone Brands, Inc. -- Notice of P.R. 3-3 and P.R. 3-4 Disclosures -- (Thames, Earl) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: 3/2/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Disclosure by Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC re compliance with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: 3/1/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Amway Corp. of Compliance Regarding P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: 3/1/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Disclosure by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. re compliance with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 disclosures (Carter, Winstol) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: 3/1/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by VistaPrint, Ltd., VistaPrint, USA, Inc. (Sanders, Richard) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: 2/26/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Disclosure by Bidz.com, Inc. (Scillieri, John) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: 2/26/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by QVC, Inc. Notice of Compliance with Local Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4 (Jackson, John) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: 2/8/2010 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 195 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/08/10. cc:attys 2-08-10 (mll, ) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: 2/5/2010 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 175 Order Amend Docket Control Order by Soverain Software LLC, Bidz.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 02/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: 1/19/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Disclosure by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. of Initial Disclosures (Carter, Winstol) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 1/18/2010, Entered: 1/18/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by Soverain Software LLC Pursuant to Paragraph 1 of the Discovery Order (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 01/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 1/15/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Disclosure by Avon Products, Inc. Notice of Initial Disclosures (Lovett, Mary-Olga) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 1/15/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by VistaPrint, Ltd., VistaPrint, USA, Inc. (Sanders, Richard) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 1/15/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Disclosure by Amway Corp. Notice of Compliance with Initial Disclosure (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 1/15/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Disclosure by Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC Notice of Initial Disclosures (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 1/15/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by QVC, Inc. Notice of Initial Disclosures (Jackson, John) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 1/15/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by Smith & Noble, LLC -- Notice of Initial Disclosures -- (Thames, Earl) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 1/15/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Disclosure by HSN, Inc. -- Notice of Initial Disclosures -- (Thames, Earl) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 1/15/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by HSN Improvements, LLC -- Notice of Initial Disclosures -- (Thames, Earl) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 1/15/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Disclosure by Garnet Hill, Inc. -- Notice of Initial Disclosures -- (Thames, Earl) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 1/15/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by Cornerstone Brands, Inc. -- Notice of Initial DIsclosures -- (Thames, Earl) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 1/15/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Disclosure by Ballard Designs, Inc. -- Notice of Initial Disclosures -- (Thames, Earl) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 1/15/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Disclosure by The Territory Ahead, Inc. -- Notice of Initial Disclosures -- (Thames, Earl) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 1/15/2010 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by Bidz.com, Inc. Defendant Bidz.com, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures (Scillieri, John) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: 1/7/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC (Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 01/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: 1/7/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Ainsworth on behalf of Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 01/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: 12/30/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 176 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Shutterfly, Inc., Soverain Software LLC. Pltf's complaint against Shutterfly, Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Shutterfly's counterclaims against pltf are dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own attys' fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/30/09. cc:attys 12-30-09(mll, ) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: 12/28/2009 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION of Dismissal by Shutterfly, Inc., Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/29/2009: # 2 Corrected Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ). (Entered: 12/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: 12/14/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/14/09. cc:attys 12-14-09(mll, ) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: 12/14/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/14/09. cc:attys 12-14-09(mll, ) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: 11/23/2009 Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling, Protective or Discovery Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Submission of Proposed Agreed Discovery order by Soverain Software LLC. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: 11/23/2009 Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling, Protective or Discovery Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Soverain Software LLC. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: 11/17/2009 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 170 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline to file the agreed discovery order and docket control order is extended to 11-23-2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/17/09. cc:attys 11-17-09 (mll, ) (Entered: 11/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: 11/16/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Discovery Order and Docket Control Order by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 169 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: 11/9/2009 Notice of Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by Soverain Software LLC Pursuant to PR 3-1 and 3-2 (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 11/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: 11/4/2009 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Anastasia M Fernands for Soverain Software LLC. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: 11/3/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER that parties are to submit agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders to the Court by 11-16-2009. For purposes of computing the time deadlines under the local patent rules, the Court deems 11-16-2009 as the effective Rule 16 Initial Case Management Conference date, and thus pltf's PR 3-1 and 3-2 disclosures will be due 11-06-2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/03/09. cc:attys 11-03-09(mll, ) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: 11/2/2009 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry - 11.2.09 Status Conference for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John Love: Status Conference held on 11/2/2009. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (rlf, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2009: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (rlf, ). (Entered: 11/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: 11/2/2009 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Brian Craft on behalf of QVC, Inc. (Craft, Roger) (Entered: 11/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: 10/29/2009 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Amway Corp. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: 10/28/2009 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Herbert A Yarbrough, III on behalf of Avon Products, Inc. (Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 10/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: 10/28/2009 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Elaine Gunter on behalf of Avon Products, Inc. (Gunter, Debra) (Entered: 10/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: 10/26/2009 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 105 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Shutterfly, Inc. by Soverain Software LLC.(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: 10/26/2009 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 120 MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) and 8(a)(2) MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) and 8(a)(2) filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: 10/26/2009 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 132 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of VistaPrint USA by Soverain Software LLC.(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: 10/26/2009 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 126 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of VistaPrint, Ltd. by Soverain Software LLC.(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: 10/26/2009 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 103 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Amway Corp. by Soverain Software LLC.(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: 10/14/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 120 MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) and 8(a)(2) MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) and 8(a)(2) filed by Avon Products, Inc.. (Lovett, Mary-Olga) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: 10/14/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** REPLY to Response to Motion re 120 MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) and 8(a)(2) MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) and 8(a)(2) filed by Avon Products, Inc.. (Lovett, Mary-Olga) Modified on 10/14/2009 (mjc, ). (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: 10/9/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER setting Status Conference for 11/2/2009 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John Love. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/09/09. cc:attys 10-09-09(mll, ) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 153 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: 10/8/2009 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 116 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of QVC, Inc. by Soverain Software LLC.(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: 10/8/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 148 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Soverian shall have until 10-26-2009 to file any responses it considers appropriate to the Answer and Counterclaim of Vistaprint Ltd. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/08/09. cc:attys 10-08-09 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: 10/8/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 147 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Soverian shall have to 10-26-2009 to file any responses it considers appropriate to the Answer and Counterclaim of Vistaprint USA Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/08/09. cc:attys 10-08-09 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 150 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: 10/8/2009 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 131 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc. and Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC by Soverain Software LLC.(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: 10/8/2009 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 115 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of J.C. Penney Corporation by Soverain Software LLC.(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: 10/7/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 126 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Vistaprint, Ltd. by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: 10/7/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 132 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of VistaPrint USA, Inc. by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: 10/1/2009 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 120 MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) and 8(a)(2) MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) and 8(a)(2) filed by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: 9/25/2009 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Heather A Faltin for VistaPrint, Ltd., VistaPrint, USA, Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: 9/25/2009 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John A Scillieri for Bidz.com, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: 9/25/2009 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert A Seldon for Bidz.com, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: 9/24/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 139 Motion of Soverain for an order enlarging the time in which it can respond to the Answer and Counterclaim of Amway Corp. THEREFORE, it is hereby ORDERED that Soverain shall have until Monday, October 26, 2009 in which to file any responses it considers appropriate to the Answer and Counterclaim of Amway Corp., including, but not limited to motions under rules 9 and 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and a responsive pleading to Amways counterclaim. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/24/2009. (kls, ) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: 9/24/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 140 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Answer and Counterclaim of Shutterfly, Inc. THEREFORE, it is hereby ORDERED that Soverain shall have until Monday, October 26, 2009 in which to file any responses it considers appropriate to the Answer and Counterclaim of Shutterfly, Inc., including, but not limited to motions under rules 9 and 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and a responsive pleading to Shutterflys counterclaim. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/24/2009. (kls, ) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: 9/23/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 105 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Shutterfly, Inc. by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 09/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: 9/23/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 103 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Amway Corp. by Soverain Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 09/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: 9/22/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re 111 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Soverain Software LLC. Pltf's claims against Etronics Inc are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and expenses. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/21/09. cc:attys 9-22-09(mll, ) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: 9/17/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Soverain Software LLC re 12 Order (Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference) (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 136 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: 9/17/2009 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 99 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Bidz.com, Inc. by Soverain Software LLC.(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: 9/16/2009 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Amway Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Alticor Corporate Enterprises Inc. for Amway Corp.. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: 9/15/2009 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Limited Brands, Inc. for Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC, Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc.. (Leggat, Bonnie) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: 9/15/2009 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by VistaPrint, USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Vistaprint Limited for VistaPrint, USA, Inc.. (Sanders, Richard) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: 9/15/2009 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by VistaPrint, USA, Inc..(Sanders, Richard) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: 9/15/2009 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management, LLC.(Leggat, Bonnie) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: 9/15/2009 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by VistaPrint, Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Vistaprint, N.V. for VistaPrint, Ltd.. (Sanders, Richard) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: 9/15/2009 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer to Docket No. 91 ANSWER to Complaint /Counterclaim of Smith & Noble,LLC by Soverain Software LLC.(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: 9/15/2009 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 93 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of The Territory Ahead by Soverain Software LLC.(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: 9/15/2009 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 89 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Garnett Hill by Soverain Software LLC.(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: 9/15/2009 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by VistaPrint, Ltd..(Sanders, Richard) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: 9/15/2009 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 84 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Ballard Designs, Inc. by Soverain Software LLC.(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: 9/15/2009 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 87 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Cornerstone Brands, Inc. by Soverain Software LLC.(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: 9/15/2009 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 82 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of HSN Improvements by Soverain Software LLC.(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: 9/15/2009 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 80 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of HSN, Inc. by Soverain Software LLC.(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: 9/15/2009 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Avon Products, Inc. (Lovett, Mary-Olga) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: 9/15/2009 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) and 8(a)(2) by Avon Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mary-Olga Lovett, # 2 Exh. 1, # 3 Exh. 2, # 4 Exh. 3, # 5 Exh. 4, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Lovett, Mary-Olga) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: 9/15/2009 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent J. C. Penney Company, Inc. for J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.. (Carter, Winstol) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: 9/15/2009 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***DISREGARD ENTRY - ATTORNEY TO REFILE*** MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) and 8(a)(2) by Avon Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mary-Olga Lovett, # 2 Exh. 1, # 3 Exh. 2, # 4 Exh. 3, # 5 Exh. 4)(Lovett, Mary-Olga) Modified on 9/15/2009 (kls, ). (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: 9/15/2009 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by QVC, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Media Corporation for QVC, Inc.. (Jackson, John) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: 9/15/2009 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, DEFENSES, COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by QVC, Inc..(Jackson, John) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: 9/14/2009 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc..(Carter, Winstol) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: 9/11/2009 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Barry J Schindler for Avon Products, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: 9/11/2009 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael A Nicodema for Avon Products, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: 9/11/2009 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Gaston Kroub for Avon Products, Inc.. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: 9/10/2009 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Soverain Software LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 09/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 110 Filed: 9/9/2009, Entered: 9/9/2009 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bidz.com, Inc. (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 09/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/9/2009, Entered: 9/9/2009 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mary-Olga Lovett on behalf of Avon Products, Inc. (Lovett, Mary-Olga) (Entered: 09/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: 9/2/2009 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Allen Glenn, Jr on behalf of J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. (Glenn, James) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: 9/2/2009 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Winstol D Carter, Jr on behalf of J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc. (Carter, Winstol) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 106 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: 8/31/2009 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Shutterfly, Inc. (Monach, Andrew) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: 8/31/2009 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint AND, COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by Shutterfly, Inc..(Monach, Andrew) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 104 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: 8/31/2009 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Amway Corp. identifying Corporate Parent None for Amway Corp.. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: 8/31/2009 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by Amway Corp..(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: 8/31/2009 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc..( Levy, David) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: 8/28/2009 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re QVC, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: 8/28/2009 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 86 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Victoria's Secret defts to answer, move, or otherwise respond to pltf's Complaint is extended to 9-15-2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/27/09. cc:attys 8-28-09(mll, ) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: 8/27/2009 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by Bidz.com, Inc..(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: 8/27/2009 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Soverain Software LLC by Bidz.com, Inc..(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: 8/27/2009 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Earl Glenn Thames, Jr on behalf of Ballard Designs, Inc., Garnet Hill, Inc., Smith & Noble, LLC, The Territory Ahead, Inc., HSN, Inc., HSN Improvements, LLC, Cornerstone Brands, Inc. (Thames, Earl) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: 8/27/2009 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M Jackson on behalf of QVC, Inc. (Jackson, John) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 385 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?