Peters v. Jinkosolar Holding Co., Ltd. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-07133
District Judge J. Paul Oetken, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 3, 2017 at 10:40 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Marco Peters, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ralph Nicholas Sianni +1 302 622 7006 +1 302 622 7100 rsianni@gelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Straite +1 646 722 8500 +1 646 722 8501 dstraite@gelaw.com

Represented by Zamansky & Associates LLC

v.
No Logo Collins Stewart Llc, Defendant

Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Defendant

Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

No Logo Jinkosolar Holding Company, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Jinkosolar Holding Co., Ltd."

Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

No Logo Oppenheimer & Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Oppenheimer & CO., Inc."

Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

No Logo Roth Capital Partners, Llc, Defendant

Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

No Logo Abdullah Al Mahmud, Lead Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Uri Seth Ottensoser +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 ottensoser@bernlieb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Seidman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 seidman@bernlieb.com

Represented by Zamansky & Associates LLC

No Logo Azriel Shusterman, Lead Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Uri Seth Ottensoser +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 ottensoser@bernlieb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Seidman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 seidman@bernlieb.com

Represented by Zamansky & Associates LLC

No Logo Richard Matkevich, Lead Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Matkevich

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Uri Seth Ottensoser +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 ottensoser@bernlieb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Seidman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 seidman@bernlieb.com

Pro Se

No Logo Vaughn Leroy Meyer, Lead Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vaughn Leroy Meyer

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Uri Seth Ottensoser +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 ottensoser@bernlieb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Seidman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 seidman@bernlieb.com

Pro Se

No Logo Dr. Ronald Snyder, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Seidman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 seidman@bernlieb.com
No Logo JinkoSolar Investor Group, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Entwistle and Cappucci LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard William Gonnello +1 212 894 7219 +1 212 894 7272 rgonnello@entwistle-law.com
No Logo Lin, Wu, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Chapin Fitzgerald & Bottini LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Albert Yong Chang +1 619 230 0063 +1 619 238 0622 achang@cfsblaw.com
No Logo WJ Chiang, Movant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 77
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (119) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Abdullah Al Mahmud, Vaughn Leroy Meyer, Azriel Shusterman. (Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    AFFIDAVIT of Stephen J. Cirami in Support re: 114 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Notice of Motion for an Order Authorizing Disbursement of the Net Settlement Fund.. Document filed by Abdullah Al Mahmud, Vaughn Leroy Meyer, Azriel Shusterman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B-1, # 3 Exhibit B-2, # 4 Exhibit B-3, # 5 Exhibit C-1, # 6 Exhibit C-2 (Part 1), # 7 Exhibit C-2 (Part 2), # 8 Exhibit C-3 (Part 1), # 9 Exhibit C-3 (Part 2), # 10 Exhibit D)(Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 114 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Notice of Motion for an Order Authorizing Disbursement of the Net Settlement Fund. . Document filed by Abdullah Al Mahmud, Vaughn Leroy Meyer, Azriel Shusterman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 114 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Notice of Motion for an Order Authorizing Disbursement of the Net Settlement Fund. . Document filed by Abdullah Al Mahmud, Vaughn Leroy Meyer, Azriel Shusterman. (Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Notice of Motion for an Order Authorizing Disbursement of the Net Settlement Fund. Document filed by Abdullah Al Mahmud, Vaughn Leroy Meyer, Azriel Shusterman. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Order)(Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED THAT: This Order and Final Judgment incorporates by reference the definitions of terms defined in the Stipulation, and all terms used herein shall have the same meanings as set forth in the Stipulation and its exhibits. The Court has jurisdiction over the subject matter of the Action and over all parties to the Action, including, but not limited to, the Lead Plaintiff's, all Class Members (including any Class Members who did not file a proper and timely request for exclusion), and the Defendants. Lead Plaintiff's Abdullah al-Mahmud, Azriel Shusterman, and Vaughn Leroy Meyer are hereby appointed, for settlement purposes only, as "Class Representatives" in respect of the Class for purposes of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23. Bernstein Liebhard LLP and Zamansky LLC, which were appointed by the Court to serve as Co-Lead Counsel, are hereby appointed, for settlement purposes only, as counsel for the Class pursuant to Rules 23(c)(1)(B) and (g) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Class that this Court preliminarily certified in the Order for Preliminary Approval of Settlement, Notice, and Hearing is hereby finally certified for settlement purposes under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(b)(3). The persons listed on Exhibit A, annexed hereto, have submitted requests for exclusion from the Class that were accepted by the Court. By virtue of such requests, those persons are deemed not to be members of the Class, and have no rights to participate in the Settlement or to receive any distributions from the Net Settlement Fund. Except for those persons listed on Exhibit A, no other persons have submitted requests for exclusion from the Class that were accepted by the Court. The persons listed on Exhibit A are the only persons whose requests for exclusion have been accepted, and, as a consequence, these persons are not bound by the terms of the Stipulation and this Order and Final Judgment. The Stipulation and the Settlement are approved as fair, reasonable, and adequate, and in the best interests of the Class, and the Class Members and the parties to the Stipulation are directed to implement the Stipulation in accordance with its terms and provisions. The complaints filed in the Action are hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs, except as provided in the Stipulation. Co-Lead Counsel are hereby awarded 30% of the Gross Settlement Fund in attorneys' fees, which sum the Court finds to be fair and reasonable, and $79,466.99 in reimbursement of expenses, which shall be paid to Co-Lead Counsel from the Gross Settlement Fund with interest at the same net rate that the Gross Settlement Fund earns. The award of attorneys' fees shall be allocated among additional plaintiffs' counsel in a fashion which, in the opinion of Co-Lead Counsel, fairly compensates any additional plaintiffs' counsel for their respective contributions in the prosecution of the Action. The Settlement has created a fund of $5,050,000 in cash that is already on deposit, and numerous Class Members who submit, or have submitted, acceptable Claim Forms will benefit from the Settlement created by Co-Lead Counsel. And as set forth herein. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 3/11/2016) (ama) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of MOTIONS FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND EXPENSES AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS served on DEFENDANTS on 02/19/16. Document filed by Abdullah Al Mahmud. (Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 108 MOTION for Attorney Fees . . Document filed by Abdullah Al Mahmud. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit)(Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  DECLARATION of MICHAEL S. BIGIN AND JACOB H. ZAMANSKY in Support re: 106 MOTION for Settlement ., 108 MOTION for Attorney Fees .. Document filed by Abdullah Al Mahmud. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    AFFIDAVIT of JOSE FRAGA in Support re: 106 MOTION for Settlement ., 108 MOTION for Attorney Fees .. Document filed by Abdullah Al Mahmud. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit)(Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MOTION for Attorney Fees . Document filed by Abdullah Al Mahmud. Return Date set for 3/11/2016 at 10:00 AM.(Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 106 MOTION for Settlement . . Document filed by Abdullah Al Mahmud. (Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MOTION for Settlement . Document filed by Abdullah Al Mahmud. Return Date set for 3/11/2016 at 10:00 AM.(Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ORDER denying 86 Motion to Dismiss / Notice of Motion of Defendant Jinkosolar Holding Co., Ltd. to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint; denying 89 Motion to Dismiss / Notice of Motion of Defendant Steven Markscheid to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint. On September 15, 2015, the Plaintiffs in this matter filed a stipulation of settlement and an unopposed motion for preliminary approval of the settlement. (Dkt. Nos. 100, 101.) After reviewing the proposed settlement, the Court granted the motion. In light of the Order preliminarily approving the settlement, the pending motions to dismiss this action are denied without prejudice to renewal in the event that settlement is not consummated. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions at Docket Numbers 86 and 89. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 9/17/2015) (kko) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT, NOTICE, AND HEARING granting 101 Motion to Approve Notice of Lead Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Court has reviewed the Stipulation and does hereby preliminarily approve the Settlement set forth therein, subject to further consideration at the Settlement Hearing described below. 2. The Court finds that: (a) the Settlement Agreement resulted from arm's-length negotiations; and (b) the Settlement Agreement is sufficiently fair, reasonable and adequate as to the Class Members to warrant providing notice of the Settlement to Class Members and holding a Settlement Hearing. 3. A hearing (the "Settlement Hearing") shall be held before this Court on March 11, 2016, at 10:00 a.m., at Courtroom 706 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York 10007, to determine whether the proposed Settlement of the Action on the terms and conditions provided for in the Settlement Agreement is fair, reasonable, and adequate to the Class and should be approved by the Court. 4. Pursuant to Rule 23 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court preliminarily certifies for purposes of settlement only a Class consisting of all persons and entities who purchased or otherwise acquired JinkoSolar Holding Co., Ltd. New York Stock Exchange-traded ADSs (NYSE:JKS) between May 13, 2010 and September 20, 2011 (the "Class Period"), either in or traceable to the May 13, 2010 initial public offering or the November 4, 2010 secondary offering, or on the open market during the Class Period, and were damaged thereby. 5. Solely for purposes of the Settlement, the Court preliminarily finds that the prerequisites for a class action under Rules 23(a) and (b)(3) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure have been satisfied in that: (a) the members of the Class are so numerous that joinder of all Class Members in the Action is impracticable; (b) there are questions of law and fact common to the Class that predominate over any individual questions; (c) the claims of the Lead Plaintiffs are typical of the claims of the Class; (d) Lead Plaintiffs and its counsel have fairly and adequately represented and protected the interests of Class Members; and (e) a class action is superior to other available methods for the fair and efficient adjudication of the controversy. 6. Pursuant to Rule 23 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and for the purposes of this Settlement only, Lead Plaintiffs Abdullah al-Mahmud, Azriel Shusterman, and Vaughn Leroy Meyer are certified as class representatives and Co-Lead Counsel Bernstein Liebhard LLP and Zamansky LLC are certified as class counsel. 26. All proceedings in the Action are stayed until further order of this Court, except as may be necessary to implement the Settlement or comply with the terms of the Settlement Agreement. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 9/17/2015) (kko) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Stipulation of Settlement and Motion for Preliminary Approval on September 15, 2015. Document filed by Abdullah Al Mahmud, Vaughn Leroy Meyer, Azriel Shusterman. (Bigin, Michael) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 101 MOTION to Approve Notice of Lead Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. . Document filed by Abdullah Al Mahmud, Vaughn Leroy Meyer, Azriel Shusterman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bigin, Michael) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MOTION to Approve Notice of Lead Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. Document filed by Abdullah Al Mahmud, Vaughn Leroy Meyer, Azriel Shusterman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Bigin, Michael) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Stipulation of Settlement. Document filed by Abdullah Al Mahmud, Vaughn Leroy Meyer, Azriel Shusterman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A-1, # 3 Exhibit A-2, # 4 Exhibit A-3, # 5 Exhibit B)(Bigin, Michael) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        SUGGESTION OF DEATH upon the record Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(a)(1). Document filed by Abdullah Al Mahmud, Vaughn Leroy Meyer, Azriel Shusterman (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 08/18/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael S. Bigin on behalf of Abdullah Al Mahmud, Richard Matkevich, Vaughn Leroy Meyer, Azriel Shusterman. (Bigin, Michael) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
                                            JOINDER to join re: 95 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, . Document filed by Collins Stewart LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Roth Capital Partners, LLC.(Sushon, William) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 89 MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of Motion of Defendant Steven Markscheid to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Steven Markscheid. (Polovoy, Brian) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 86 MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of Motion of Defendant Jinkosolar Holding Co., Ltd. to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Jinkosolar Holding Co., Ltd.. (Polovoy, Brian) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 89 MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of Motion of Defendant Steven Markscheid to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint., 86 MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of Motion of Defendant Jinkosolar Holding Co., Ltd. to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Abdullah Al Mahmud, Richard Matkevich, Vaughn Leroy Meyer, Azriel Shusterman. (Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 11/12/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER granting 92 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.Lead Plaintiffs' motion to file a 40-page memorandum in response to Defendants' motions to dismiss and joinder is granted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages UNOPPOSED LETTER REQUESTING LEAVE TO FILE AN OMNIBUS OPPOSITION MEMORANDUM TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND JOINDER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from JOSEPH R. SEIDMAN, JR. dated 10/14/14. Document filed by Azriel Shusterman.(Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                        JOINDER to join re: 86 MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of Motion of Defendant Jinkosolar Holding Co., Ltd. to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Collins Stewart LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Roth Capital Partners, LLC.(Sushon, William) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 89 MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of Motion of Defendant Steven Markscheid to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Steven Markscheid. (Polovoy, Brian) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of Motion of Defendant Steven Markscheid to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Steven Markscheid.(Polovoy, Brian) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                              DECLARATION of Brian H. Polovoy in Support re: 86 MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of Motion of Defendant Jinkosolar Holding Co., Ltd. to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Jinkosolar Holding Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Polovoy, Brian) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 86 MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of Motion of Defendant Jinkosolar Holding Co., Ltd. to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Jinkosolar Holding Co., Ltd.. (Polovoy, Brian) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of Motion of Defendant Jinkosolar Holding Co., Ltd. to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Jinkosolar Holding Co., Ltd..(Polovoy, Brian) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER FOLLOWING REMAND: 1. JinkoSolar, Mr. Markscheid, and the Underwriter Defendants shall file their motions to dismiss the Amended Complaint on or before September 30, 2014. 2. Lead Plaintiffs shall file their opposition on or before November 11, 2014. 3. The moving defendants shall file their reply submissions on or before December 8, 2014. The conference previously scheduled for September 5, 2014 is hereby adjourned., ( Motions due by 9/30/2014., Responses due by 11/11/2014., Replies due by 12/8/2014.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 8/26/2014) (lmb) (Entered: 08/26/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER: A scheduling conference will be held on Friday, September 5, 2014, at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 706 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse. Counsel are directed to use the Court's Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order form to jointly prepare a detailed written proposed schedule for any motions and discovery. Counsel should type entries into this form using a copy of the form available at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Oetken. This form should be submitted to the Court at least two days before the date of the scheduling conference., ( Scheduling Conference set for 9/5/2014 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 706, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge J. Paul Oetken.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 8/22/2014) (lmb) (Entered: 08/22/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 78 Corrected Notice of Appeal filed by Azriel Shusterman, Abdullah Al Mahmud, Richard Matkevich, Vaughn Leroy Meyer USCA Case Number 13-616. Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the order of the District Court is VACATED and the case is REMANDED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 08/21/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Opinion)(nd) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          USCA OPINION (Certified) as to 78 Corrected Notice of Appeal filed by Azriel Shusterman, Abdullah Al Mahmud, Richard Matkevich, Vaughn Leroy Meyer. USCA Case Number 13-0616-cv. Appeal from an order of the District Court for the Southern District of New York dismissing a complaint alleging violations of the federal securities laws. We vacate the dismissal of the complaint on the ground that the failure to disclose ongoing serious pollution problems rendered misleading statements describing measures taken to comply with Chinese environment regulations. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 07/31/2014. (nd) (Entered: 07/31/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 79 Notice of Appeal filed by Lin Wu USCA Case Number 13-678. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion by appelalnt Lin Wu for voluntary dismissal of his appeal is GRANTED. Each party shall bear their own costs.Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 3/25/2013. (nd) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motions to dismiss are GRANTED in their entirety. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the motions at docket numbers 62 and 65 and to close this case. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 2/27/2013) (tro) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL from 76 Clerk's Judgment, 52 Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s), Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s), Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s), Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s), Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s), Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s), Order on Motion to Approve, Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s), Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s), Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s),, Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s), Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s),, Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s),, Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s), Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s), Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s),, Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s), Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s),, Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s),, Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s), Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s), Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s),, Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s), Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s),, Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s),, Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s), Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s), Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s),, Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s), Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s),, Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s), 75 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,. Document filed by Lin Wu. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number 0208-8257137. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Chang, Albert) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  CORRECTED NOTICE OF APPEAL re: 77 Notice of Appeal, 75 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,. Document filed by Abdullah Al Mahmud, Richard Matkevich, Vaughn Leroy Meyer, Azriel Shusterman. (Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    FILING ERROR - FILERS NOT SELECTED - NOTICE OF APPEAL from 75 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,. Document filed by Abdullah Al Mahmud. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Seidman, Joseph) Modified on 2/19/2013 (nd). (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum and Order dated January 22, 2013, Defendants' motions to dismiss are granted in their entirety; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 1/22/13) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(ml) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank 75 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 62 Motion to Dismiss; granting 65 Motion to Dismiss. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motions to dismiss are GRANTED in their entirety. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the motions at docket numbers 62 and 65 and to close this case. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 1/22/2013) (lmb)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 75 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 62 Motion to Dismiss; granting 65 Motion to Dismiss. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motions to dismiss are GRANTED in their entirety. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the motions at docket numbers 62 and 65 and to close this case. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 1/22/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            JOINDER to join Reply in further support of its motion to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Collins Stewart LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Roth Capital Partners, LLC.(Bednark, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 65 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Steven Markscheid. (Polovoy, Brian) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 62 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Jinkosolar Holding Co., Ltd.. (Polovoy, Brian) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU (SEE DOCUMENT #74) - REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 62 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Collins Stewart LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Roth Capital Partners, LLC. (Bednark, Benjamin) Modified on 11/8/2012 (ldi). (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 62 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint., 65 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Azriel Shusterman. (Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Joseph R. Seidman, Jr. dated 9/07/2012 re: Lead Plaintiffs request leave to file one 40 page brief, which is due on September 27,2012, in response to these three motions. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 9/12/2012) (ama) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken, from Brian H. Polovoy, dated 7/27/2012, re: request permission to file a 29-page memorandum in support of JinkoSolar's motion, which would exceed the standard pages limit by four pages. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 7/31/2012) (ja) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                          JOINDER to join re: 62 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint. / The Underwriter Defendants' Joinder In JinkoSolar Holding Co., Ltd.'s Motion To Dismiss The Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Collins Stewart LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Roth Capital Partners, LLC.(Bednark, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/01/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 65 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Steven Markscheid. (Polovoy, Brian) (Entered: 08/01/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Steven Markscheid.(Polovoy, Brian) (Entered: 08/01/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Brian H. Polovoy in Support re: 62 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Jinkosolar Holding Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Polovoy, Brian) (Entered: 08/01/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 62 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Jinkosolar Holding Co., Ltd.. (Polovoy, Brian) (Entered: 08/01/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Jinkosolar Holding Co., Ltd..(Polovoy, Brian) (Entered: 08/01/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER: l. Markscheid shall move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint on or before August l, 2012. 2. If Markscheid files a motion to dismiss, Lead Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to such motion on or before September 27, 2012, and Markseheid's reply submission shall be filed on or before October 29, 2012. 3. By signing this stipulation, the parties have not waived their rights with respect toany potential issue in this litigation, including, but not limited to, the assertion of jurisdictional defenses, either by motion or otherwise. (Steven Markscheid answer due 8/1/2012). ( Motions due by 8/1/2012, Responses due by 9/27/2012, Replies due by 10/29/2012.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 6/29/2012) (djc) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Service was accepted by Steven Markscheid. Document filed by Azriel Shusterman, Vaughn Leroy Meyer, Abdullah Al Mahmud, Richard Matkevich. (Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (SEE DOCUMENT #60)- SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Steven Markscheid answer due 6/29/2012. Service was accepted by Vondal Lawson. Document filed by Azriel Shusterman; Vaughn Leroy Meyer; Abdullah Al Mahmud; Richard Matkevich. (Seidman, Joseph) Modified on 6/26/2012 (lb). (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. William Blair & CO. served on 6/5/2012, answer due 6/26/2012. Service was accepted by Barbara Tang, Receptionist. Document filed by Azriel Shusterman; Dr. Ronald Snyder; Vaughn Leroy Meyer; Marco Peters; Abdullah Al Mahmud; Richard Matkevich. (Galbraith, Kevin) (Entered: 06/07/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint, against Collins Stewart LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Haitao Jin, Jinkosolar Holding Co., Ltd., Xianhua Li, Zibin Li, Steven Markscheid, Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Roth Capital Partners, LLC, Wing Keong Siew, Loggen Zhang, William Blair & CO. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Marco Peters. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Marco Peters.(cd) (Entered: 06/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Joseph R. Seidman, Jr. dated 5/30/2012 re: Our amended complaint is currently due today, May 30, 2012. Due to several religious holidays this past weekend, as well as Memorial Day, we are respectfully requesting a 2-day extension of time until Friday June 1, 2012 to file our amended complaint. Defendant JinkoSolar Holding Co. Ltd. and the Underwriter Defendants (the only defendants who have appeared in the action) have agreed to such an extension, but they request a similar 2-day extension from July 30, 2012 to August 1, 2012 for the deadline for their motions to dismiss. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted., ( Amended Pleadings due by 6/1/2012., Motions due by 8/1/2012.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 5/30/2012) (lmb) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Ralph Nicholas Sianni on behalf of Richard Matkevich, Vaughn Leroy Meyer, Marco Peters. New Address: Stewarts Law US LLP, 535 Fifth Avenue, 4th Floor, New York, New York, USA 10017, (212) 897-3730. (Sianni, Ralph) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by David A. Straite on behalf of Richard Matkevich, Vaughn Leroy Meyer, Marco Peters. New Address: Stewarts Law US LLP, 535 Fifth Avenue, 4th Floor, New York, New York, USA 10017, (212) 897-3730. (Straite, David) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and betweenthe undersigned attorneys for the Lead Plaintiffs, JinkoSolar, and the Underwriter Defendants, as follows: 1. Lead Plaintiffs shall file and serve their amended complaint (the "Amended Complaint) on or before May 30, 2012.2. JinkoSolar and the Underwriter Defendants shall move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint on or before July 30, 2012. 3. If JinkoSolar and/or the Underwriter Defendants file motions to dismiss, Lead Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to such motions on or before September 27,2012, and JinkoSolar and the Underwriter Defendants shall file reply submissions On or before October 29, 2012. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 4/2/2012) (djc) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: denying 22 Motion to Appoint ; denying 25 Motion to Appoint ; denying 29 Motion to Appoint ; denying 29 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 32 Motion to Appoint ; granting 41 Motion to Appoint ; denying 42 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 19 Motion to Appoint ; denying 19 Motion to Approve. For the foregoing reasons, the JKS Groups amended motion to be appointed lead plaintiff and to appoint Bernstein Liebhard LLP and Zamansky & Associates, LLC as lead counsel (Dkt. No. 41) is GRANTED. All other motions to be appointed lead plaintiff (Dkt. Nos. 19, 22, 25, 29, and 32) are DENIED. Lin Wus motion for reconsideration and request for certification of an interlocutory appeal under Section 1292(b) (Dkt. No. 42) are DENIED. The parties shall submit a status letter to the Court no later than March 30, 2012 setting forth the next steps in the case, including whether lead plaintiffs intend to file an Amended Complaint. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 3/19/2012) (jfe) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 1/12/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 1/12/2012 before Judge J. Paul Oetken. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Eve Giniger, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/2/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/12/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/8/2012.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 42 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 41 AMENDED MOTION to Appoint VAUGH LEROY MEYER, RICHARD MATKEVICH, ABDULLAH AL MAHMUD, AND AZRIEL SHUSTERMAN to serve as lead plaintiff(s)... Document filed by Lin Wu. (Chang, Albert) (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 42 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 41 AMENDED MOTION to Appoint VAUGH LEROY MEYER, RICHARD MATKEVICH, ABDULLAH AL MAHMUD, AND AZRIEL SHUSTERMAN to serve as lead plaintiff(s)... Document filed by Abdullah Al Mahmud. (Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 02/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Jinkosolar Holding Co., Ltd..(Polovoy, Brian) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Gerard Burke on behalf of Jinkosolar Holding Co., Ltd. (Burke, Brian) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jerome Steven Fortinsky on behalf of Jinkosolar Holding Co., Ltd. (Fortinsky, Jerome) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Howard Polovoy on behalf of Jinkosolar Holding Co., Ltd. (Polovoy, Brian) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 42 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 41 AMENDED MOTION to Appoint VAUGH LEROY MEYER, RICHARD MATKEVICH, ABDULLAH AL MAHMUD, AND AZRIEL SHUSTERMAN to serve as lead plaintiff(s)... Document filed by Lin Wu. (Chang, Albert) (Entered: 01/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Reconsideration re; 41 AMENDED MOTION to Appoint VAUGH LEROY MEYER, RICHARD MATKEVICH, ABDULLAH AL MAHMUD, AND AZRIEL SHUSTERMAN to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Lin Wu.(Chang, Albert) (Entered: 01/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED MOTION to Appoint VAUGH LEROY MEYER, RICHARD MATKEVICH, ABDULLAH AL MAHMUD, AND AZRIEL SHUSTERMAN to serve as lead plaintiff(s). Document filed by Abdullah Al Mahmud. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 01/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 22 MOTION to Appoint Individual Investor Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., 29 MOTION to Appoint Abdullah Al Mahmud, Azriel Shusterman, Dr. Ronald Snyder to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Abdullah Al Mahmud, Azriel Shusterman, Dr. Ronald Snyder to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Lin Wu. (Chang, Albert) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Vaughn Leroy Meyer, Richard Matkevich, Abdullah Al Mahmud and Azriel Shusterman in Support re: 22 MOTION to Appoint Individual Investor Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., 29 MOTION to Appoint Abdullah Al Mahmud, Azriel Shusterman, Dr. Ronald Snyder to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Abdullah Al Mahmud, Azriel Shusterman, Dr. Ronald Snyder to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Abdullah Al Mahmud, Richard Matkevich, Vaughn Leroy Meyer, Azriel Shusterman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 22 MOTION to Appoint Individual Investor Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., 29 MOTION to Appoint Abdullah Al Mahmud, Azriel Shusterman, Dr. Ronald Snyder to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Abdullah Al Mahmud, Azriel Shusterman, Dr. Ronald Snyder to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Abdullah Al Mahmud, Azriel Shusterman, Vaughn Leroy Meyer, Richard Matkevich. (Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of NON-OPPOSITION OF THE JINKOSOLAR INVESTOR GROUP TO COMPETING LEAD PLAINTIFF MOTIONS. Document filed by JinkoSolar Investor Group. (Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of WJ Chiang's Motion for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection as Counsel re: 32 MOTION to Appoint WJ Chiang to serve as lead plaintiff(s) [Notice of Motion and Motion of WJ Chiang for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel]. MOTION to Appoint WJ Chiang to serve as lead plaintiff(s) [Notice of Motion and Motion of WJ Chiang for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel].. Document filed by WJ Chiang. (Gonsiorowski, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: A conference will be held on January 11,2012 at 11:00 a.m. to hear the motions. Any submissions in opposition to any motion for appointment as lead plaintiff must be filed no later than January 5, 2012. (Responses due by 1/5/2012. Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2012 at 11:00 AM before Judge J. Paul Oetken.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 12/22/2011) (ab) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Elizabeth M. Gonsiorowski in Support re: 32 MOTION to Appoint WJ Chiang to serve as lead plaintiff(s) [Notice of Motion and Motion of WJ Chiang for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel]. MOTION to Appoint WJ Chiang to serve as lead plaintiff(s) [Notice of Motion and Motion of WJ Chiang for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel].. Document filed by WJ Chiang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Press Release, # 2 Exhibit B - Movant Certification, # 3 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, # 4 Exhibit D - Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP Firm Resume)(Gonsiorowski, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 32 MOTION to Appoint WJ Chiang to serve as lead plaintiff(s) [Notice of Motion and Motion of WJ Chiang for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel]. MOTION to Appoint WJ Chiang to serve as lead plaintiff(s) [Notice of Motion and Motion of WJ Chiang for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel].. Document filed by WJ Chiang. (Gonsiorowski, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Appoint WJ Chiang to serve as lead plaintiff(s) [Notice of Motion and Motion of WJ Chiang for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel]. Document filed by WJ Chiang. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion of WJ Chiang for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel)(Gonsiorowski, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Joseph R. Seidman, Jr. in Support re: 29 MOTION to Appoint Abdullah Al Mahmud, Azriel Shusterman, Dr. Ronald Snyder to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Abdullah Al Mahmud, Azriel Shusterman, Dr. Ronald Snyder to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Abdullah Al Mahmud, Azriel Shusterman, Dr. Ronald Snyder. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 29 MOTION to Appoint Abdullah Al Mahmud, Azriel Shusterman, Dr. Ronald Snyder to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Abdullah Al Mahmud, Azriel Shusterman, Dr. Ronald Snyder to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Abdullah Al Mahmud, Azriel Shusterman, Dr. Ronald Snyder. (Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Appoint Abdullah Al Mahmud, Azriel Shusterman, Dr. Ronald Snyder to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Document filed by Abdullah Al Mahmud, Azriel Shusterman, Dr. Ronald Snyder. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Albert Y. Chang in Support re: 25 MOTION to Appoint Lin Wu to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and to Approve Selection of Lead Counsel.. Document filed by Lin Wu. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B, # 3 Exhibit Ex. C, # 4 Exhibit Ex. D)(Chang, Albert) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 25 MOTION to Appoint Lin Wu to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and to Approve Selection of Lead Counsel.. Document filed by Lin Wu. (Chang, Albert) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 22 MOTION to Appoint Individual Investor Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Marco Peters. (Straite, David) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appoint Lin Wu to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and to Approve Selection of Lead Counsel. Document filed by Lin Wu.(Chang, Albert) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Jacob H. Zamansky in Support re: 22 MOTION to Appoint Individual Investor Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Marco Peters. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 1, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 2, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 3, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 4, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 5, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 6, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 7)(Straite, David) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU (SEE DOCUMENT #26) - MOTION to Appoint Individual Investor Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. Document filed by Marco Peters.(Straite, David) Modified on 12/13/2011 (ldi). (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Appoint Individual Investor Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s). Document filed by Marco Peters.(Straite, David) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Richard W. Gonnello in Support re: 19 MOTION to Appoint JinkoSolar Investor Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Approve lead plaintiff's selection of lead counsel.. Document filed by JinkoSolar Investor Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 19 MOTION to Appoint JinkoSolar Investor Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Approve lead plaintiff's selection of lead counsel.. Document filed by JinkoSolar Investor Group. (Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Appoint JinkoSolar Investor Group to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., MOTION to Approve lead plaintiff's selection of lead counsel. Document filed by JinkoSolar Investor Group.(Gonnello, Richard) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER. In light of the stipulations and scheduling orders entered on November 2, 2011 and November 8, 2011 extending the time for Defendants to respond to the Complaint (Dckt. Entry Nos. 15 and 17), the initial pre-trial conference scheduled for November 28, 2011 is hereby adjourned sine die, pending the resolution of any motions to be appointed as lead plaintiff. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 11/22/2011) (rjm) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER: JinkoSolar need not move, answer, or otherwise respond to the complaint, and will only need to move, answer, or otherwise respond to any consolidated amended complaint filed by lead plaintiff on a date to be determined after the appointment of lead plaintiff as directed by the Court. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 11/7/2011) (ab) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The Underwriter Defendants need not move, answer, or otherwise respond to the complaint, and will only need to move, answer, or otherwise respond to any consolidated amended complaint filed by lead plaintiff on a date to be determined after the appointment of lead plaintiff as directed by the Court. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 11/1/2011) (ft) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Collins Stewart Inc., Corporate Parent Collins Stewart Hawkpoint plc, Corporate Parent Collins Stewart Europe Limited for Collins Stewart LLC. Document filed by Collins Stewart LLC.(Butwin, Bradley) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Group AG, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse AG, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc. for Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. Document filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC.(Butwin, Bradley) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin Andrew Bednark on behalf of Collins Stewart LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Roth Capital Partners, LLC (Bednark, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Joseph Sushon on behalf of Collins Stewart LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Roth Capital Partners, LLC (Sushon, William) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Roth Capital Partners, LLC.(Butwin, Bradley) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Oppenheimer Holdings Inc. for Oppenheimer & CO., Inc.. Document filed by Oppenheimer & CO., Inc..(Butwin, Bradley) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bradley Jay Butwin on behalf of Collins Stewart LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Roth Capital Partners, LLC (Butwin, Bradley) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Jacob Zamansky dated 10/26/2011 re: Given that defense counsel has yet to enter an appearance, and the PSLRA provides for briefing with respect to appointment of lead plaintiff into January, Plaintiff anticipates substantial efficiencies if Your Honor were to adjourn the conference until such time as a lead plaintiff is determined. ENDORSEMENT: The conference currently set for November 28, 2011 is hereby adjourned sine die, to be re-scheduled after the resolution of any motions to be appointed lead plaintiff. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/26/2011) (lmb) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/28/2011 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 15D, at the United States Court House, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge J. Paul Oetken. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/24/2011) (ab) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Roth Capital Partners, LLC served on 10/13/2011, answer due 11/3/2011. Service was accepted by Shamika Thomas, Administrative Assistant. Document filed by Marco Peters. (Straite, David) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Oppenheimer & CO., Inc. served on 10/13/2011, answer due 11/3/2011. Service was accepted by Loretta Burns, Administrative Assistant. Document filed by Marco Peters. (Straite, David) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Collins Stewart LLC served on 10/13/2011, answer due 11/3/2011. Service was accepted by Rich Sorrentino, Chief Compliance Officer. Document filed by Marco Peters. (Straite, David) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC served on 10/13/2011, answer due 11/3/2011. Service was accepted by Pamela A. Fleming, Legal Assistant. Document filed by Marco Peters. (Straite, David) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Jinkosolar Holding Co., Ltd. served on 10/13/2011, answer due 11/3/2011. Service was accepted by Sattie Jairam, Process Specialist. Document filed by Marco Peters. (Straite, David) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against Kangping Chen, Collins Stewart LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Haitao Jin, Jinkosolar Holding Co., Ltd., Xiande Li, Xianhua Li, Zibin Li, Steven Markscheid, Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Roth Capital Partners, LLC, Wing Keong Siew, Loggen Zhang. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 18665)Document filed by Marco Peters.(ama) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 233 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?