Round Rock Research LLC v. Dole Food Company Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-01239
District Judge Richard G. Andrews, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 21, 2016 at 11:04 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dole Food Company, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Elizabeth Keller +1 302 571 6600 kkeller@ycst.com
No Logo Dole Food Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Round Rock Research, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon Todd Hohenthaner +1 212 446 4832 +1 212 446 4900 jhohenthaner@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Farnan +1 302 655 4200 bef@pgslaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,500,650; 5,627,544; 5,974,078; US 6,459,726 B1; US RE41,531 E; 5,266,925; 5,583,850; 5,986,570; US 7,265,674 B2; US RE 41,562 E. (Attachments: # 1 Order)(nms) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    SO ORDERED Granting 43 Stipulation of Dismissal, filed by Round Rock Research LLC (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/25/2014. (nms) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None
      STIPULATION of Dismissal by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORAL ORDER: The Stay is Continued until 11/21/2014. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/7/2014. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01239-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 11/07/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None
          Joint STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/06/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORAL ORDER: The parties are to submit a Joint Status Report in 30 days. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/7/2014. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01237-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 10/07/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None
              Joint STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC, Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/5/2014, Entered: None
                STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 04/05/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None
                  Joint STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                    NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Eugene Chiu as co-counsel.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None
                      Joint STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None
                        Joint STATUS REPORT by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
                          Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,500,650; 5,627,544; 5,974,078; US 6,459,726 B1; US RE41,531 E; 5,266,925; 5,583,850; 5,986,570; US 7,265,674 B2; US RE 41,562 E . (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                            First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dole Food Company Inc. - filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER Administratively Closing Cases. The parties shall submit a status report to the Court no later than October 5, 2012, and every six months thereafter. It is further Ordered that the parties shall promptly notify the Court when the reexaminations are complete and the stays should be lifted so that the cases may be reopened and other appropriate action may be taken. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/23/2012. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01237-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER Granting (19 in 1:11-cv-01244-RGA, 27 in 1:11-cv-01242-RGA, 21 in 1:11-cv-01238-RGA, 16 in 1:11-cv-01245-RGA, 22 in 1:11-cv-01279-RGA, 22 in 1:11-cv-01237-RGA, 20 in 1:11-cv-01240-RGA, 26 in 1:11-cv-01243-RGA, 27 in 1:11-cv-01241-RGA, 29 in 1:11-cv-01239-RGA, 12 in 1:12-cv-00309-RGA) Stipulation and Proposed Order to Amend Pleadings and to Stay Cases Pending Reexamination of Patents-In-Suit. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/23/2012. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01237-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
                                  Joint STIPULATION To Amend Pleadings and To Stay Cases Pending Reexamination of Patents-In-Suit by Amazon.com Inc., V F Corporation, Gap Inc., Round Rock Research LLC, Motorola Solutions Inc., American Apparel Inc., J.C. Penney Corporation Inc., Fruit of the Loom Inc., Dole Food Company Inc., PepsiCo, Inc., Macy's Retail Holdings Inc., Hanesbrands Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    Official Transcript of Motion to Stay held on 04-05-12 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/27/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/7/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/5/2012. (lad) (Main Document 28 replaced on 4/10/2012) (ksr, ). (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 27 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      MEMORANDUM ORDER Granting (D.I. 12 in 1:11-cv-01239-RGA, D.I. 18 in 1:11-cv-01241-RGA, D.I. 14 in 1:11-cv-01242-RGA) MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination Of The Patents-In-Suit. The parties shall submit a status report no later than October 5, 2012, and every six months thereafter; and the parties should promptly advise the Court if and when the stay should be lifted. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/6/2012. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01239-RGA, 1:11-cv-01241-RGA, 1:11-cv-01242-RGA(nms) (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None
                                        Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from John W. Shaw regarding [Supplemental Authority Relevant to Defendants Dole's and Hanesbrands' Motions to Stay Pending Reexamination of the Patents-in-Suit] - re (19 in 1:11-cv-01239-RGA) Reply Brief. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Shaw, John) (Entered: 03/28/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER Postponing Scheduling Conference. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/27/2012. Associated Cases: 1:11-cv-01237-RGA et al.(nms) (Main Document 25 replaced on 3/27/2012) (nms). (Entered: 03/27/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                            PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to the Honorable Richard G. Andrews)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                              Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Brian E. Farnan regarding March 28 Scheduling Conference. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from John W. Shaw regarding [Request for Continuance of the Scheduling Conference Set for Wednesday, March 28, 2012 at 1:00 p.m.]. (Shaw, John) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                  Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding Scheduling Conference on March 28, 2012. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                    DECLARATION of Pamela McElroy re 19 Reply Brief, by Dole Food Company Inc.. (Shaw, John) Modified on 3/20/2012 (nms). (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                      REPLY BRIEF re 12 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination of the Patents in Suit filed by Dole Food Company Inc.. (Shaw, John) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                        ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 12 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination of the Patents in Suit filed by Round Rock Research LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/19/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                          ANSWER to 10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Round Rock Research LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 3/28/2012 at 1:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/21/2012. (nms) (Entered: 02/22/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                              Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from John W. Shaw regarding Request for Oral Argument re: Motion to Stay Pending Reexamination of the Patents-In-Suit - re 12 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination of the Patents in Suit. (Shaw, John) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                DECLARATION of Pamela McElroy re 12 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination of the Patents in Suit, by Dole Food Company Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Shaw, John) Modified on 2/22/2012 (nms). (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  OPENING BRIEF in Support re 12 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination of the Patents in Suit filed by Dole Food Company Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/9/2012. (Shaw, John) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination of the Patents in Suit - filed by Dole Food Company Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shaw, John) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Dole Food Company Inc.. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Round Rock Research LLC by Dole Food Company Inc..(Keller, Karen) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Pamela McElroy, Brian M. Kramer and David C. Doyle - filed by Dole Food Company Inc.. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, plead or otherwise respond to the Complaint to February 13, 2012 - filed by Dole Food Company Inc., Round Rock Research LLC. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jon T. Hohenthaner, Jason Berrebi, and Eugene Chiu of Desmarais LLP - filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/04/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to ANSWER, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to 2/6/2012 - filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/30/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Round Rock Research LLC. Dole Food Company Inc. served on 12/15/2011, answer due 1/5/2012. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/19/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,500,650; 5,627,544; 5,974,078; US 6,459,726 B1; US RE41,531E;. (ead) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (ead) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Dole Food Company Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-991621.) - filed by Round Rock Research LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(ead) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 430 times.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?