Christopher Craig et al v. City of King City et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:11-cv-04219-EDL

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 17, 2016 at 1:00 AM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Abraham Aguayo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Adams, Ferrone & Ferrone

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A McGill +1 805 373 5900 +1 818 874 1382 mmcgill@adamsferrone.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rains Lucia Stern, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell Marc Perry +1 925 609 1699 +1 925 609 1690 rperry@rlslawyers.com
No Logo Christopher Craig, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Adams, Ferrone & Ferrone

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A McGill +1 805 373 5900 +1 818 874 1382 mmcgill@adamsferrone.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rains Lucia Stern, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell Marc Perry +1 925 609 1699 +1 925 609 1690 rperry@rlslawyers.com
No Logo Jaime Andrade, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Adams, Ferrone & Ferrone

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A McGill +1 805 373 5900 +1 818 874 1382 mmcgill@adamsferrone.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rains Lucia Stern, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell Marc Perry +1 925 609 1699 +1 925 609 1690 rperry@rlslawyers.com
v.
No Logo City of King City, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Vincent P. Hurley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raymond Alexander Thomas +1 831 661 4800 +1 831 661 4804 rthomas@hurleylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Vincent P. Hurley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amanda Michelle Cohen +1 831 661 4800 +1 831 661 4804 acohen@hurleylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent P. Hurley +1 831 661 4800 +1 831 661 4804 vhurley@hurleylaw.com
No Logo Jerry Hunter, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Vincent P. Hurley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amanda Michelle Cohen +1 831 661 4800 +1 831 661 4804 acohen@hurleylaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent P. Hurley +1 831 661 4800 +1 831 661 4804 vhurley@hurleylaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent P. Hurley +1 831 661 4800 +1 831 661 4804 vhurley@hurleylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raymond Alexander Thomas +1 831 661 4800 +1 831 661 4804 rthomas@hurleylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raymond Alexander Thomas +1 831 661 4800 +1 831 661 4804 rthomas@hurleylaw.com
No Logo Mark Baker, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Vincent P. Hurley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amanda Michelle Cohen +1 831 661 4800 +1 831 661 4804 acohen@hurleylaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent P. Hurley +1 831 661 4800 +1 831 661 4804 vhurley@hurleylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent P. Hurley +1 831 661 4800 +1 831 661 4804 vhurley@hurleylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raymond Alexander Thomas +1 831 661 4800 +1 831 661 4804 rthomas@hurleylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raymond Alexander Thomas +1 831 661 4800 +1 831 661 4804 rthomas@hurleylaw.com
No Logo Michael Powers, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Vincent P. Hurley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amanda Michelle Cohen +1 831 661 4800 +1 831 661 4804 acohen@hurleylaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent P. Hurley +1 831 661 4800 +1 831 661 4804 vhurley@hurleylaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent P. Hurley +1 831 661 4800 +1 831 661 4804 vhurley@hurleylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raymond Alexander Thomas +1 831 661 4800 +1 831 661 4804 rthomas@hurleylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raymond Alexander Thomas +1 831 661 4800 +1 831 661 4804 rthomas@hurleylaw.com
No Logo Myrna Glick, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Judith Melinda Tishkoff , +1 213 680 5088 +1 213 250 7900 tishkoff@lbbslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Judith Melinda Tishkoff , +1 213 680 5088 +1 213 250 7900 tishkoff@lbbslaw.com
No Logo Nick Baldiviez, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Vincent P. Hurley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amanda Michelle Cohen +1 831 661 4800 +1 831 661 4804 acohen@hurleylaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent P. Hurley +1 831 661 4800 +1 831 661 4804 vhurley@hurleylaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent P. Hurley +1 831 661 4800 +1 831 661 4804 vhurley@hurleylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raymond Alexander Thomas +1 831 661 4800 +1 831 661 4804 rthomas@hurleylaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raymond Alexander Thomas +1 831 661 4800 +1 831 661 4804 rthomas@hurleylaw.com
No Logo The Stewart LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Daniels, Fine, Israel, Schonbuch & Lebovits, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/11/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Ronald Fine +1 310 556 7900 +1 310 556 2807 Fine@dfis-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Veatch Carlson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith Glen Wileman +1 213 381 2861 +1 213 383 6370 kwileman@veatchfirm.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (216) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 208 Stipulation to Dismissal of Defendant Myrna Glick.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Defendant Myrna Glick, Ph.D. filed by Myrna Glick(as an agent for King City), Myrna Glick(individually). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tishkoff, Judith) (Filed on 4/16/2013) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting re 206 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendants City of King City, Baldiviez, Powers, Hunter & Baker with Prejudice. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER of Dismissal filed by Christopher Craig, Abraham Aguayo, Jaime Andrade, City of King, Nick Baldiviez, Michael Powers, Mark Baker, Jerry Hunter. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Perry, Russell) (Filed on 2/5/2013) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          CLERKS NOTICE VACATING THE JURY TRIAL BASED ON SETTLEMENT OF THE CASE BY THE PARTIES.
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Minute Entry: Settlement Conference: Settlement put on the record. Case has settled in full. (Date Filed: 1/17/2013). (Court Reporter Kelly Shainline.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/17/2013) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Plaintiff's Further Brief re Civil Code Section 56.20 filed by Christopher Craig. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration)(Perry, Russell) (Filed on 1/16/2013) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 202 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER FOLLOWING PRETRIAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/16/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
                  LREF
                  Blank 202 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER FOLLOWING PRETRIAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/16/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James for Settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on January 15, 2013. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2013) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 200 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER GRANTING REQUEST to bring audio-visual equipment into the Court building 194 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/14/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
                        LREF
                        Blank 200 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER GRANTING REQUEST to bring audio-visual equipment into the Court building re 194 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/14/2013. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Declaration of Michael Powers Regarding Payment of Unemployment Insurance Benefits for Christopher Craig and Abraham Aguayo filed byMark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually). (Hurley, Vincent) (Filed on 1/14/2013) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            STIPULATED TIMELINE filed by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(as City Manager for the King City). (Hurley, Vincent) (Filed on 1/14/2013) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 197 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on January 14, 2013. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
                                LREF
                                Blank 197 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on January 14, 2013. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  OBJECTIONS to Defendants Proposed 1.2 Jury Instruction and Limiting Special Instruction filed by Christopher Craig. (Perry, Russell) (Filed on 1/11/2013) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    [Proposed] Special Instructions filed by Christopher Craig . (Perry, Russell) (Filed on 1/11/2013) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Stipulated Application for Order to Bring Audio-Visual Equipment into the Court building filed by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually). (Hurley, Vincent) (Filed on 1/11/2013) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Separately Submitted [Proposed] Jury Instructions for Instruction 1.2 and Special Instruction Regarding Arbitrations filed by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually) Defts' Separately Submitted Proposed Instruction 1.2 and Special Instruction re Arbitrations. (Hurley, Vincent) (Filed on 1/11/2013) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          OBJECTIONS and [Proposed] Jury Instruction 1.2 and Argument in Favor of Defendants' Special Instruction re Arbitrations filed by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually). (Hurley, Vincent) (Filed on 1/11/2013) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            STIPULATED Pre-Instruction Subset & Revised Jury Instructions 12.10 filed by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually) Stipulated Pre-Instruction Subset and Revised 12.10. (Hurley, Vincent) (Filed on 1/11/2013) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              TRIAL BRIEF by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually). (Hurley, Vincent) (Filed on 1/10/2013) (Entered: 01/10/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                TRIAL BRIEF re: Order Following Pretrial Conference by Christopher Craig. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit)(Perry, Russell) (Filed on 1/10/2013) (Entered: 01/10/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  Transcript of Proceedings held on 1-8-2013, before Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/9/2013. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 1/9/2013) (Entered: 01/09/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte granting in part and denying in part 139 Motion in Limine; denying 140 Motion in Limine; granting 142 Motion in Limine; granting 144 Motion to Bifurcate; granting 151 Motion in Limine; granting 153 Motion in Limine; denying 160 Motion in Limine; finding as moot 161 Motion in Limine; denying 164 Motion in Limine. (This document is also the Pretrial Conference Order, which is document 186 .) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013) (Entered: 01/09/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 1/9/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013) (Entered: 01/09/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Minute Entry: Final Pretrial Conference (Date Filed: 1/9/2013). (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/9/2013) (Entered: 01/09/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          TRIAL BRIEF re Damages for Counts Three and Four, and Objections to Plaintiffs New Proposed Special Verdict on Counts Three and Four by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually). (Hurley, Vincent) (Filed on 1/7/2013) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Proposed Form of Verdict by Christopher Craig Plaintiff's Amended Proposed Special Verdict Forms with Objections by Defendants. (Perry, Russell) (Filed on 1/7/2013) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              RESPONSE to re 180 Objection, to Exhibits by Christopher Craig. (Perry, Russell) (Filed on 1/2/2013) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                OBJECTIONS to Pltfs' Proposed Voir Dire Questions by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually). (Hurley, Vincent) (Filed on 1/2/2013) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  OBJECTIONS to Plaintiff's Exhibits by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually). (Hurley, Vincent) (Filed on 1/2/2013) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Proposed Form of Verdict by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually) . (Hurley, Vincent) (Filed on 1/2/2013) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      TRIAL BRIEF Joint Brief Regarding Parties' Objections to Certain Jury Instructions by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually). (Attachments: # 1 Supplement CACI 430, # 2 Supplement Instruction 5.5, # 3 Supplement Instruction 1.4)(Hurley, Vincent) (Filed on 1/2/2013) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        RESPONSE (re 160 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Paul S. D. Berg ) filed byMark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Hurley ISO Defts' Opposition to Pltf's MIL-2, # 2 Exhibit Exh A to Hurley Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exh B to Hurley Declaration)(Hurley, Vincent) (Filed on 1/2/2013) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          RESPONSE (re 161 MOTION in Limine to Exclude David A. Dusenbury as an Expert ) filed byMark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually). (Hurley, Vincent) (Filed on 1/2/2013) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Declaration of Russell Perry in Support of 173 Opposition/Response to Motion, 174 Opposition/Response to Motion, 172 Opposition/Response to Motion, 171 Opposition/Response to Motion, 169 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byChristopher Craig. (Related document(s) 173 , 174 , 172 , 171 , 169 ) (Perry, Russell) (Filed on 1/2/2013) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              RESPONSE (re 143 Fifth MOTION in Limine ) filed byChristopher Craig. (Perry, Russell) (Filed on 1/2/2013) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                RESPONSE (re 142 Fourth MOTION in Limine ) filed byChristopher Craig. (Perry, Russell) (Filed on 1/2/2013) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  RESPONSE (re 141 Third MOTION in Limine ) filed byChristopher Craig. (Perry, Russell) (Filed on 1/2/2013) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    RESPONSE (re 140 Second MOTION in Limine ) filed byChristopher Craig. (Perry, Russell) (Filed on 1/2/2013) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      RESPONSE (re 164 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Defendants' Claimed Legitimate Purpose for Terminating Plaintiffs Craig and Aguayo ) filed byMark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually). (Hurley, Vincent) (Filed on 1/2/2013) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        RESPONSE (re 139 First MOTION in Limine ) filed byChristopher Craig. (Perry, Russell) (Filed on 1/2/2013) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 12/31/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Exhibit List by Christopher Craig.. (Perry, Russell) (Filed on 12/31/2012) (Entered: 12/31/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Proposed Jury Instructions by Christopher Craig . (Perry, Russell) (Filed on 12/28/2012) (Entered: 12/28/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Proposed Jury Instructions by Christopher Craig Parties Joint Jury Instructions. (Perry, Russell) (Filed on 12/28/2012) (Entered: 12/28/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Proposed Jury Instructions by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually) Defendants' Separately Proposed Jury Instructions. (Hurley, Vincent) (Filed on 12/28/2012) (Entered: 12/28/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine Number One to Exclude Evidence of Defendants' Claimed Legitimate Purpose for Terminating Plaintiffs Craig and Aguayo filed by Abraham Aguayo, Christopher Craig. Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 1/2/2013. Replies due by 1/8/2013. (Perry, Russell) (Filed on 12/26/2012) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Proposed Special Forms of Verdict filed by Abraham Aguayo, Jaime Andrade, Christopher Craig . (Perry, Russell) (Filed on 12/26/2012) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Plaintiff's Jury Instructions filed by Abraham Aguayo, Jaime Andrade, Christopher Craig . (Perry, Russell) (Filed on 12/26/12) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine Number Three to Exclude David A. Dusenbury as an Expert filed by Abraham Aguayo, Jaime Andrade, Christopher Craig. Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 1/2/2013. Replies due by 1/8/2013. (Perry, Russell) (Filed on 12/26/2012) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine Number Two to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Paul S. D. Berg filed by Abraham Aguayo, Jaime Andrade, Christopher Craig. Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 1/2/2013. Replies due by 1/8/2013. (Perry, Russell) (Filed on 12/26/2012) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Pretrial Conference Statement by Christopher Craig. (Perry, Russell) (Filed on 12/26/2012) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Witness List by Christopher Craig Exhibit of Expert Witness Qualifications. (Perry, Russell) (Filed on 12/26/2012) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                TRIAL BRIEF by Christopher Craig. (Perry, Russell) (Filed on 12/26/2012) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  Exhibit List by Christopher Craig.. (Perry, Russell) (Filed on 12/26/2012) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Proposed Voir Dire by Christopher Craig . (Perry, Russell) (Filed on 12/26/2012) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS A-J to Defendants' Motions in Limine No. 1 through 5 filed by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually). Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 1/9/2013. Replies due by 1/16/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Hurley, Vincent) (Filed on 12/26/2012) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        Third MOTION in Limine AMENDED filed by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually). Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 1/9/2013. Replies due by 1/16/2013. (Hurley, Vincent) (Filed on 12/26/2012) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          Exhibit List AMENDED by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually).. (Hurley, Vincent) (Filed on 12/26/2012) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            Fifth MOTION in Limine AMENDED filed by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually). Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 1/9/2013. Replies due by 1/16/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Hurley, Vincent) (Filed on 12/26/2012) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Exhibit of Defendants' Expert Qualifications filed by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(as acting Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Michael Powers(individually) Expert Qualifications. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit)(Hurley, Vincent) (Filed on 12/26/2012) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                TRIAL BRIEF filed by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually). (Hurley, Vincent) (Filed on 12/26/2012) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  [Proposed] Special Form of Verdict filed by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually) . (Hurley, Vincent) (Filed on 12/26/2012) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    [Proposed] Jury Instructions filed by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually) . (Hurley, Vincent) (Filed on 12/26/2012) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      Exhibit List filed by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(as Chief of Police for the King City Police Department), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually).. (Hurley, Vincent) (Filed on 12/26/2012) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        [Proposed] Voir Dire Questions filed by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually) . (Hurley, Vincent) (Filed on 12/26/2012) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Bifurcate Trial: To Have Trial on the Issue of Liability Prior to Trial on the Issue of Damages; Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually). Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 1/9/2013. Replies due by 1/16/2013. (Hurley, Vincent) (Filed on 12/26/2012) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            Fifth MOTION in Limine filed by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually). Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 1/9/2013. Replies due by 1/16/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Hurley, Vincent) (Filed on 12/26/2012) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              Fourth MOTION in Limine filed by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually). Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 1/9/2013. Replies due by 1/16/2013. (Hurley, Vincent) (Filed on 12/26/2012) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                Third MOTION in Limine filed by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually). Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 1/9/2013. Replies due by 1/16/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Hurley, Vincent) (Filed on 12/26/2012) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  Second MOTION in Limine filed by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually). Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 1/9/2013. Replies due by 1/16/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Hurley, Vincent) (Filed on 12/26/2012) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    First MOTION in Limine filed by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually). Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 1/9/2013. Replies due by 1/16/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Hurley, Vincent) (Filed on 12/26/2012) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held, case did not settle. (Date Filed: 12/17/2012). (Recording: Not Recorded.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/17/2012) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Further Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge: Further Settlement Conference re remaining Defendants, City of King City, et al., set for 12/17/2012 at 10:00 AM, in Chambers. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/28/2012. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held, case partially settled. Further settlement conference scheduled for remaining defendants on 12/17/2012 at 10:00 a.m. (Date Filed: 11/28/2012). (Recording #FTR: 3:29 - 3:32 (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/28/2012) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 135 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 11/27/2012. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 135 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 11/27/2012. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 134 Filed: 11/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Deadline to file/Exchange Pretrial Documents re 133 : Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/8/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 11/21/2012. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 134 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Deadline to file/Exchange Pretrial Documents re 133 : Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/8/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 11/21/2012. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER to Extend Deadline to File/Exchange Pretrial Documents re 61 Case Management Scheduling Order -Joint Stipulaton to Extend the Deadline to File/Exchange Pretrial Documents; Proposed Order- filed by Christopher Craig. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Perry, Russell) (Filed on 11/20/2012) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry: Telephone Conference held re excusing defendants from settlement conference. Defendant are excused from personally attending settlement conference. (Date Filed: 11/8/2012). (Time: 11:30 - 12:00.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/8/2012) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 131 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 124 Motion to Excuse Defendants From Attending Settlement Conference. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 131 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting re 124 Motion to Excuse Defendants From Attending Settlement Conference. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 130 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 126 Stipulation To Permit Myrna Glick to be Excused from the Settlement Conference. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 130 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting re 126 Stipulation To Permit Myrna Glick to be Excused from the Settlement Conference. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012) (Entered: 11/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                CLERKS NOTICE SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE: Telephonic Conference set for 11/8/2012 10:30 AM. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012) (Entered: 11/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to (re 124 MOTION for Administrative Relief to Excuse Defendants Nick Baldiviez, Jerry Hunter and Mark Baker from the Settlement Conference) -Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion to Excuse Baldiviez, Hunter and Baker From Settlement Conference- filed by hristopher Craig. (Perry, Russell) (Filed on 11/2/2012) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Administrative Relief to Be Excused from November 27, 2012 Settlement Conference re 126 STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER To Permit Myrna Glick Ph.D. To Be Excused from the November 27, 2012 Settlement Conference filed by Myrna Glick(individually). Responses due by 11/15/2012. Replies due by 11/26/2012. (Tishkoff, Judith) (Filed on 11/1/2012) (Entered: 11/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER To Permit Myrna Glick Ph.D. To Be Excused from the November 27, 2012 Settlement Conference filed by Myrna Glick. (Tishkoff, Judith) (Filed on 11/1/2012) (Entered: 11/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting re 91 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying re 98 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2012) (Entered: 11/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Administrative Relief to Excuse Defendants Nick Baldiviez, Jerry Hunter and Mark Baker from the Settlement Conference filed by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually). Responses due by 11/2/2012. Replies due by 11/9/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Raymond Thomas In Support Of, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admin Relief)(Thomas, Raymond) (Filed on 10/29/2012) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting re 121 Stipulation & re 119 Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal in Regards to Exhibits to City Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2012) (Entered: 10/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting re 118 Stipulation & re 117 Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal in Regards to Exhibits to City Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2012) (Entered: 10/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER Granting re 119 Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal Previously E-filed Exhibits, and to Re-File Redacted Versions as to City Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment - SUBMITTED AS CORRECTION TO ECF DCK #118 filed by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually). (Thomas, Raymond) (Filed on 10/26/2012) (Entered: 10/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/16/2012 before Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte (Date Filed: 10/16/2012) re 91 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Nick Baldiviez, Mark Baker, Jerry Hunter, Michael Powers, City of King City, 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Christopher Craig. (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/16/2012) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Administrative Relief Allowing Defendants to File Documents Under Seal, as Re Exhibits to City Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment -Motion to File Under Seal Previously E-filed Exhibits, and to Re-File Redacted Versions- filed by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Raymond A. Thomas, # 2 Exhibit A through O, # 3 Exhibit P through U, # 4 Exhibit V through X)(Thomas, Raymond) (Filed on 10/15/2012) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER Granting Motion to File Previously Filed Exhibits Under Seal and Re-file Redacted Versions (as re City Defts' Opposition to Pltfs' MSJ) filed by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually). (Thomas, Raymond) (Filed on 10/15/2012) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Administrative Relief Allowing Defendants to File Entire Documents Under Seal, as re Exhibits to City Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment ion to File Under Seal -Motion to File Under Seal Previous E-filed Exhibits, and to Refile Redacted Versions, Attached- filed by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through O, # 2 Exhibit P through S, # 3 Exhibit T through V, # 4 Declaration)(Thomas, Raymond) (Filed on 10/15/2012) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER Granting Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal in Regards to Exhibits to City Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Refile Redacted Set filed by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually). (Thomas, Raymond) (Filed on 10/15/2012) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Raymond Thomas in Support of re 114 Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Reply to Opposition/Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Mark Baker (as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez (indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter (individually), Michael Powers (individually). (Related document(s) 114 ) (Thomas, Raymond) (Filed on 9/25/2012) (Entered: 09/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum of Points & Authorities in REPLY to re 101 Response/Opposition to (re 91 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) filed by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez (indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter (individually), Michael Powers (individually). (Thomas, Raymond) (Filed on 9/25/2012) (Entered: 09/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Hearings on re 91 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 10/16/2012 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2012) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE (re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) OPPOSITION TO PLTFS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed byMark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually). (Thomas, Raymond) (Filed on 9/18/2012) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTIONS to re 99 Request for Judicial Notice, by Myrna Glick(as an agent for King City), Myrna Glick(individually). (Tishkoff, Judith) (Filed on 9/18/2012) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE (re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byMyrna Glick(as an agent for King City), Myrna Glick(individually). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Tishkoff, Judith) (Filed on 9/18/2012) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Raymond Thomas in Support of 102 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byMark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually). (Related document(s) 102 ) (Thomas, Raymond) (Filed on 9/18/2012) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Michael Powers in Support of 102 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byMark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually). (Related document(s) 102 ) (Thomas, Raymond) (Filed on 9/18/2012) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Amanda Cohen in Support of 102 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byMark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually). (Related document(s) 102 ) (Thomas, Raymond) (Filed on 9/18/2012) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Nick Baldiviez in Support of 102 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byMark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually). (Related document(s) 102 ) (Thomas, Raymond) (Filed on 9/18/2012) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to (re 98 Plaintiffs' MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed by Mark Baker (as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez (indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter (individually), Michael Powers (individually). (Thomas, Raymond) (Filed on 9/18/2012) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to (re 91 Defendants' MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) filed by Christopher Craig, Abraham Aguayo & Jaime Andrade. (Perry, Russell) (Filed on 9/18/2012) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTIONS to re 92 Declaration in Support, 93 Declaration in Support, by Christopher Craig. (Perry, Russell) (Filed on 9/18/2012) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request for Judicial Notice in Support of re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Christopher Craig. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 98 ) (Perry, Russell) (Filed on 9/4/2012) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Christopher Craig. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 9/18/2012. Replies due by 9/25/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Supplement Points and Authorities, # 3 Proposed Order)(Perry, Russell) (Filed on 9/4/2012) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [Proposed] Order Granting re 91 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Second & Sixth Causes of Action filed by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually). (Thomas, Raymond) (Filed on 9/4/2012) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Amanda Cohen In Support of re 91 Defts' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Second & Sixth Causes of Action filed by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(as City Manager for the King City). (Thomas, Raymond) (Filed on 9/4/2012) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Jerry Hunter in Support of re 91 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Second & Sixth Causes of Action filed by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually). (Related document(s) 91 ) (Thomas, Raymond) (Filed on 9/4/2012) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Nick Baldiviez in Support of re 91 Defts' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Second & Sixth Causes of Action filed by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually). (Thomas, Raymond) (Filed on 9/4/2012) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Second & Sixth Causes of Action; MEMORANDUM of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually). Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 9/18/2012. Replies due by 9/25/2012. (Thomas, Raymond) (Filed on 9/4/2012) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION Session held on 6/20/2012. Case did not settle, further facilitated discussions are not expected. ADR process is complete. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2012) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge: Settlement Conference set for 11/27/2012 10:00 AM.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/24/2012. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012) (Entered: 08/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 88 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REFERRING CASE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 8/22/2012. (knsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 88 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REFERRING CASE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 8/22/2012. (knsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting re 84 Motion for Leave to Depose Plaintiff Abraham Aguayo after the discovery cut-off. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Raymond Thomas in Support of re 84 MOTION for Administrative Relief Allowing Defendants to Depose Plaintiff Abraham Aguayo After the Discovery Cut-Off filed by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez, City of King City, Jerry Hunter, Michael Powers. (Related document(s) 85 , 84 ) (Thomas, Raymond) (Filed on 7/30/2012) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER Granting re 84 MOTION for Administrative Relief Allowing Defendants to Depose Plaintiff Abraham Aguayo After the Discovery Cut-Off filed by Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez, City of King City, Jerry Hunter, Michael Powers, Christopher Craig, Abraham Aguayo & Jaime Andrade. (Thomas, Raymond) (Filed on 7/30/2012) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Administrative Relief Allowing Defendants to Depose Plaintiff Abraham Aguayo After the Discovery Cut-Off filed by Mark Baker, Nick Baldiviez, City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually). Responses due by 8/3/2012. Replies due by 8/10/2012. (Thomas, Raymond) (Filed on 7/30/2012) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Steven J. Rosenberg as Mediator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2012) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 77 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 4/30/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2012) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, PREVIOUSLY NOTICED FOR MAY 1, 2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Appear by Telephone For Case Management Conference filed by Myrna Glick(individually). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tishkoff, Judith) (Filed on 4/25/2012) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING THE CMC due to closure of the bridge the morning of May 1, 2012: Further Case Management Conference set for 5/1/2012 03:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 4/24/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [PROPOSED] STIPULATED Protective Order filed by Mark Baker(individually), Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), Nick Baldiviez(as Chief of Police for the King City Police Department), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Jerry Hunter(as acting Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Michael Powers(as City Manager for the King City), Michael Powers(individually). (Thomas, Raymond) (Filed on 4/24/2012) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Mark Baker(individually), Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), Nick Baldiviez(as Chief of Police for the King City Police Department), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Jerry Hunter(as acting Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Michael Powers(as City Manager for the King City), Michael Powers(individually). (Thomas, Raymond) (Filed on 4/24/2012) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CASE REFERRED to Mediation, per document 72. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012) Modified on 8/9/2016 (aaa, COURT STAFF). This is a Text Only Docket Entry (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Amended Complaint Demand for Jury byMyrna Glick(individually). (Tishkoff, Judith) (Filed on 4/10/2012) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 73 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte denying re 64 Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012) Modified on 4/5/2012 (tn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/27/2012 before The Honorable Elizabeth D Laporte (Date Filed: 3/27/2012). (Court Reporter Jim Yeomans.) (kns, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/27/2012) (Entered: 03/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTIONS to re 69 Request for Judicial Notice by Myrna Glick(as an agent for King City), Myrna Glick(individually). (Tishkoff, Judith) (Filed on 3/8/2012) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY (re 64 MOTION to Dismiss ) to Plaintiff's Opposition filed byMyrna Glick(as an agent for King City), Myrna Glick(individually). (Tishkoff, Judith) (Filed on 3/8/2012) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request for Judicial Notice; Declaration of Russell M. Perry filed by Christopher Craig, Abraham Aguayo & Jaime Andrade. (McGill, Michael) (Filed on 3/1/2012) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to (re 64 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(f)) Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Glicks' Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(f); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Christopher Craig, Abraham Aguayo & Jaime Andrade. (McGill, Michael) (Filed on 3/1/2012) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Correction of Opposition/Response or Reply Deadlines pertaining to re 64 MOTION to Dismiss (Reason: Correcting an error) filed by Myrna Glick(as an agent for King City), Myrna Glick(individually). Responses due by 3/1/2012. Replies due by 3/8/2012. (Tishkoff, Judith) (Filed on 2/24/2012) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendants' ANSWER to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, Request for Jury Trial filed by Mark Baker(individually), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(as City Manager for the King City). (Hurley, Vincent) (Filed on 2/22/2012) (Entered: 02/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Hearing on re 64 Defendant Myrna Glick, Ph.D.'s MOTION to Dismiss or Strike Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing re-set for 3/27/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2012) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION to Dismiss or Strike Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Myrna Glick(as an agent for King City), Myrna Glick(individually). Motion Hearing set for 3/27/2012 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 4/10/2012. Replies due by 4/17/2012. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Tishkoff, Judith) (Filed on 2/16/2012) (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages & Injunctive Relief against Mark Baker,Nick Baldiviez, City of King, Myrna Glick, Jerry Hunter & Michael Powers.Filed by Jaime Andrade, Abraham Aguayo & Christopher Craig. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2012) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 62 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING WITH LEAVE TO AMEND DEFENDANT GLICK'S MOTION TO DISMISS re 30 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on January 17, 2012. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2012) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 4/24/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/1/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Discovery due by 8/1/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 9/4/2012. Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2012. Joinder of Parties due by 1/31/2012. Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2012 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Jury Trial set for 1/22/2013 through 2/4/2013 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Jury Selection set for 1/22/2013 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/12/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2012) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 1/10/2012 before The Honorable Elizabeth D Laporte (Date Filed: 1/11/2012). (Recording #10:34- 10:45.) (kns, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/11/2012) (Entered: 01/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Christopher Craig, Abraham Aguayo, Jaime Andrade, Nick Baldiviez, Michael Powers, Jerry Hunter, Mark Baker, Myrna Glick, Ph.D.. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(Perry, Russell) (Filed on 1/3/2012) (Entered: 01/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 58 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY re 56 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 12/29/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2011) (Entered: 12/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [DOCKETED IN ERROR. PLS. DISREGARD]...ORDER granting 56 Motion to Appear by Telephone; Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D Laporte (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2011)..Modified on 12/29/2011 (tn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Appear by Telephone for Case Management Conference filed by Christopher Craig. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Telephonic Appearance)(Perry, Russell) (Filed on 12/22/2011) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 55 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER re 54 Stipulation to continue the CMC, filed by Christopher Craig. Case Management Statement due by 1/3/2012. Case Management Conference set for 1/10/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco.Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 11/16/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION re 43 ADR Scheduling Order, by Christopher Craig. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Perry, Russell) (Filed on 11/15/2011) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for Christopher Craig (Perry, Russell) (Filed on 11/15/2011) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for Jaime Andrade (Perry, Russell) (Filed on 11/15/2011) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for Abraham Aguayo (Perry, Russell) (Filed on 11/15/2011) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by City of King City, Nick Baldiviez, Michael Powers, Mark Baker, and Jerry Hunter (Thomas, Raymond) (Filed on 11/15/2011) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Perry, Russell) (Filed on 11/15/2011) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE filed by Christopher Craig, Abraham Aguayo & Jaime Andrade of Court's Standing Order Re Case Management Conference (Perry, Russell) (Filed on 11/8/2011) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Myrna Glick(as an agent for King City), Myrna Glick(individually).. (Tishkoff, Judith) (Filed on 9/21/2011) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Abraham Aguayo, Jaime Andrade, Christopher Craig.. (Perry, Russell) (Filed on 9/8/2011) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mark Baker(individually), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(as City Manager for the King City).. (Cohen, Amanda) (Filed on 9/8/2011) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERKS NOTICE re FILING OF CONSENT FORMS, not later than 9/8/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/29/2011. Case Management Conference set for 12/6/2011 03:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order re Case Management Conference, # 3 Standing Order for all Judges)(mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2011) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:11-cv-04399. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER by Judge George H. King: In light of the order of transferring the above-entitled action to the Northern District ofCalifornia, San Jose Division, the scheduling conference of September 12, 2011 is TAKEN OFF CALENDAR and the hearing date is VACATED. re: Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings 23 . (lw) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER re: Defendants' Motion to Transfer for Convenience; Defendant Myrna Glick's Motion to Dismiss/Strike; 19 30 by Judge George H. King: (PLEASE REVIEW DOCUMENT FOR FULL AND COMPLETE DETAILS) This matter is before the Court on Defendants King City, Nick Baldiviez, Michael Powers, Mark Baker, and Jerry Hunter's (collectively, "Defendants") Motion to Transfer for Convenience, and on Defendant Myrna Glick's ("Glick") Motion to Dismiss/Strike "Plaintiff's" Complaint. In their Motion to Transfer, Defendants seek to transfer venue to the Northern District of California ("Northern District"), located in San Jose, California. We have considered the papers filed in support of and in opposition to the Motions, and deem these matters appropriate for resolution without oral argument. L.R. 7-15. Because the Parties are familiar with the facts in this case, they will be repeated only as necessary. Having considered all the relevant factors, we conclude that transfer of this action is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)..... Accordingly, Defendants' Motion is hereby GRANTED and this case is TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of California, San Jose Division. The Clerk is directed to effect this transfer forthwith. In light of this decision, we decline to reach Defendant Myrna Glick's Motion to Dismiss but reserve it for ruling by the transferee court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Case transferred to the Northern District of California, San Jose Division. Case extracted and transferred via electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated. ) (Attachments: # 1 Transmittal Leter - Civil Case Transfer Out) (lw) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge George H. King: On the court's own motion, Defendant's Motion to Transfer for Convenience 19 , and Defendant's Motion to Dismiss/Strike 30 , noticed for hearing on August 22, 2011, is TAKEN OFF CALENDAR and will be taken UNDER SUBMISSION without oral argument on that date. F.R.Civ.P. 78; Local Rule 7-15 (formerly 7.11). No appearance by counsel shall be necessary. The hearing date is vacated. Further briefing, if any, shall be filed in accordance with Local Rules as if the noticed hearing date had not been vacated. (lw) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY In Support MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, San Jose Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support 19 filed by Defendants Mark Baker, Mark Baker, Nick Baldiviez, Nick Baldiviez, City of King City, Jerry Hunter, Jerry Hunter, Michael Powers, Michael Powers. (Hurley, Vincent) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER re: Motion to Dismiss; 13 by Judge George H. King: On June 24, 2011, Defendant The Stewart LLC ("Defendant") filed a Motion to Dismiss ("Motion"). However, on July 25, 2011, the Parties filed a Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant pursuant to a settlement agreement. Pursuant to this stipulation, on July 27, 2011, the Court dismissed all claims against Defendant with prejudice. Therefore, the Motion is hereby DENIED as moot. The August 15, 2011 hearing date is hereby VACATED and the matter is taken off calendar. (bm) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY In support MOTION to Dismiss Case as to Myrna Glick 30 filed by Defendants Myrna Glick, Myrna Glick. (Tishkoff, Judith) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION to MOTION to Dismiss Case as to Myrna Glick 30 filed by Plaintiffs Abraham Aguayo, Jaime Andrade, Christopher Craig. (Perry, Russell) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION to MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, San Jose Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support 19 filed by Plaintiffs Abraham Aguayo, Jaime Andrade, Christopher Craig. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Perry, Russell) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge George H. King, re Stipulation for Dismissal 31 . The Ninth, Tenth, and Eleventh Causes of Action against the Defendant The Sewart Co LLC's only, are dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. (ir) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge George H. King, pursuant to Stipulation 29 , it is hereby ordered that all claims in plaintiffs complaint under the Seventh Cause of Action for a claim of violation of the Confidentiality of Medical Information Act, California Civil Code sections 56 et seq., made against Myrna Glick, Ph.D., only, are hereby stricken. (ir) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant The Stewart LLC filed by Plaintiff Jaime Andrade, Christopher Craig, Abraham Aguayo. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McGill, Michael) (Entered: 07/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case as to Myrna Glick filed by defendant Myrna Glick(as an agent for King City), Myrna Glick(individually). Motion set for hearing on 8/22/2011 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. King. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tishkoff, Judith) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION to Strike filed by defendant Myrna Glick(as an agent for King City), Myrna Glick(individually). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tishkoff, Judith) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Myrna Glick(as an agent for King City), Myrna Glick(individually), (Tishkoff, Judith) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION To Continue The Motion To Dismiss Filed By Defendant The Sewart Co., LLC by Judge George H. King, re Stipulation 26 : The Court has reviewed the Joint Stipulation submitted by Plaintiffs Aguayo and Andrade and the Defendant The Sewart Co., LLC. Based upon a review of the record and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss filed by the Defendant, The Sewart Co., LLC is continued from July 25, 2011 to August 15, 2011. (bm) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearing Date on Defendants Motion to Dismiss/Notice of Settlement from July 25, 2011 to August 15, 2011 Re: MOTION to Dismiss defendant The Stewart LLC 13 filed by Plaintiff Abraham Aguayo, Jaime Andrade, Christopher Craig. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Re Stipulation to Continue the Motion to Dismiss Filed by Defendant The Sewart Co., LLC)(McGill, Michael) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY opposition MOTION to Dismiss defendant The Stewart LLC 13 filed by Defendant The Stewart LLC. (Wileman, Keith) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Judge George H. King Granting substitute attorney Keith G. Wileman as retained counsel for Defendant The Sewart Company LLC dba Aaron's Sales & Lease Ownership, in place and stead of attorney Paul R Fine. (lw) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. King: Counsel shall read this order carefully and shall have available the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26 in complying with this Order. THIS MATTER IS SET FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON: MONDAY, SEPTEMBER 12, 2011 AT 1:30 P.M., at the Roybal FederalBuilding and Courthouse, 255 E. Temple Street, Suite 650, Los Angeles, California. Counsel primarily responsible for the conduct of this litigation and who has the authority to enter into stipulations and to make admissions regarding all matters that the participants may reasonably anticipate may be discussed, or the party if unrepresented, SHALL ATTEND IN PERSON. By no later than AUGUST 12, 2011, counsel for all appearing parties and all unrepresented appearing parties, if any, shall meet, in person, and discuss the matters setforth in Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). By no later than AUGUST 29, 2011, counsel for all appearing parties and all unrepresented appearing parties, if any, shall file a joint "REPORT OF PARTIES' PLANNING MEETING" (See document for further details) (ir) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION to Substitute attorney Keith G. Wileman in place of attorney Paul R. Fine filed by Defendant The Stewart LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wileman, Keith) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Mark Baker in support of MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, San Jose Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support 19 filed by Defendants Mark Baker, Nick Baldiviez, City of King City, Jerry Hunter, Michael Powers. (Hurley, Vincent) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Nick Baldiviez in support of MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, San Jose Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support 19 filed by Defendants Mark Baker, Nick Baldiviez, City of King City, Jerry Hunter, Michael Powers. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hurley, Vincent) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California, San Jose Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support filed by Defendants Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually). Motion set for hearing on 8/22/2011 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. King. (Hurley, Vincent) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), City of King City, Jerry Hunter(individually), Michael Powers(individually).(Hurley, Vincent) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Myrna Glick(as an agent for King City) answer now due 7/22/2011; Myrna Glick(individually) answer now due 7/22/2011, re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by defendant Myrna Glick(as an agent for King City); Myrna Glick(individually).(Tishkoff, Judith) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION to MOTION to Dismiss defendant The Stewart LLC 13 filed by Plaintiffs Abraham Aguayo, Jaime Andrade, Christopher Craig. (Perry, Russell) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Myrna Glick(as an agent for King City) answer now due 7/6/2011; Myrna Glick(individually) answer now due 7/6/2011, re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by defendant Myrna Glick(as an agent for King City); Myrna Glick(individually).(Tishkoff, Judith) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Stewart LLC, (Fine, Paul) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss defendant The Stewart LLC filed by defendant The Stewart LLC. Motion set for hearing on 7/25/2011 at 09:30 AM before Judge George H. King. (Fine, Paul) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Stewart LLC answer now due 7/5/2011, filed by DEFENDANT The Stewart LLC.(Fine, Paul) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department) answer now due 7/6/2011; City of King City answer now due 7/6/2011, re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendants Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department); City of King City.(Hurley, Vincent) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christopher Craig, upon Defendant Michael Powers(individually) served on 5/31/2011, answer due 6/21/2011. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Monica Silva, Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (McGill, Michael) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christopher Craig, upon Defendant The Stewart LLC served on 5/26/2011, answer due 6/16/2011. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon David Stewart, Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (McGill, Michael) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christopher Craig, upon Defendant Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally) served on 5/27/2011, answer due 6/17/2011. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mark Baker, Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (McGill, Michael) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christopher Craig, upon Defendant Myrna Glick(as an agent for King City) served on 6/1/2011, answer due 6/22/2011. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kelly Harlowe, Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (McGill, Michael) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christopher Craig, upon Defendant Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department) served on 5/27/2011, answer due 6/17/2011. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mark Baker, individually and as Sergeant for the King City Police Department in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (McGill, Michael) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christopher Craig, upon Defendant Jerry Hunter(individually) served on 5/27/2011, answer due 6/17/2011. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mark Baker,Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (McGill, Michael) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 73 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte denying 64 Motion to Dismiss (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christopher Craig, upon Defendant City of King City served on 5/25/2011, answer due 6/15/2011. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Erica Sonne, City Clerk, Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (McGill, Michael) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 62 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING WITH LEAVE TO AMEND DEFENDANT GLICK'S MOTION TO DISMISS re 30 filed by Myrna Glick. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on January 17, 2012. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT (See document for further details) by Judge George H. King. (ir) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 58 Filed: 12/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 12/29/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Abraham Aguayo, Jaime Andrade, Christopher Craig. (et) (ds). (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 55 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER re 54 Stipulation to continue the CMC, filed by Christopher Craig. Case Management Statement due by 1/3/2012. Case Management Conference set for 1/10/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco.Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 11/16/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against Defendants Mark Baker(as Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Mark Baker(individually), Nick Baldiviez(indiviudally), Nick Baldiviez(as Chief of Police for the King City Police Department), City of King City, Does 1 through 10 inclusive, Myrna Glick(as an agent for King City), Myrna Glick(individually), Jerry Hunter(individually), Jerry Hunter(as acting Sergeant for the King City Police Department), Michael Powers(individually), Michael Powers(as City Manager for the King City), The Stewart LLC.Case assigned to Judge George H. King for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia Rosenberg. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs Jaime Andrade, Christopher Craig, Abraham Aguayo. (et) (ds). (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 30 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?