Perales v. Obama et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Alaska District Court, Case No. 3:11-cv-00182
District Judge John W. Sedwick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 21, 2017 at 12:30 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Azael Dythian Perales, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by P.O. Box 501

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Azael Dythian Perales +1 714 507 9318
v.
No Logo A. C. Roper, Defendant
No Logo A. Gragera, Defendant
No Logo A. Hemphill, Defendant
No Logo A. J. Kramer, Defendant
No Logo A. J. McCampbell, Defendant
No Logo Abdul K. Kallon, Defendant
No Logo Ada M. Healey, Defendant
No Logo Adam Weinacker, Defendant
No Logo Alan Austerman, Defendant
No Logo Alan Baker, Defendant
No Logo Alan C. Boothe, Defendant
No Logo Alan Dick, Defendant
Greenspan, Alan Greenspan, Alan, Defendant
Officially listed as "Alan Greenspan"
No Logo Alan H.W. Shiff, Defendant
No Logo Alan Harper, Defendant
No Logo Alan N. Weeden, Defendant
No Logo Alan Ridenour, Defendant
No Logo Alan W. Frank, Defendant
No Logo Alana Chamoun, Defendant
No Logo Albert Arnold Gore, Defendant
No Logo Albert Kookesh, Defendant
No Logo Albert S. Dabrowski, Defendant
No Logo Albert T. Wada, Defendant
No Logo Alberto R. Gonzales, Defendant
No Logo Alessandra DiMauro, Defendant
No Logo Alex Dimitrief, Defendant
No Logo Alex Kozinski, Defendant
No Logo Alfred A. Plamann, Defendant
No Logo Alfred C. Liggins, Defendant
No Logo Alfred V. Covello, Defendant
No Logo Alice M. Batchelder, Defendant
No Logo Alisa Kelli Wise, Defendant
No Logo Alissandra Geliga, Defendant
No Logo Allan G. Lafley, Defendant
No Logo Allen Farley, Defendant
No Logo Allen Smith Reeves, Defendant
No Logo Allen T. Compton, Defendant
No Logo Allen Treadaway, Defendant
No Logo Allison, Claire, Defendant
No Logo Alvin Holmes, Defendant
No Logo Alvin W. Thompson, Defendant
No Logo Amador S. Bustos, Defendant
No Logo Amy Hayes Naylor, Defendant
No Logo Andre Birotte, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Andrea Jung, Defendant
No Logo Andrew A. Connell, Defendant
No Logo Andrew Cecere, Defendant
No Logo Andrew Eristoff, Defendant
No Logo Andrew J. Sale , Defendant
No Logo Andrew J. Sale, Defendant
No Logo Andrew Lamar Alexander, Defendant
No Logo Andy Dillon, Defendant
No Logo Ann E. Sewill, Defendant
No Logo Ann M. Fudge, Defendant
No Logo Ann McClintock, Defendant
No Logo Ann Voris, Defendant
No Logo Anna Fairclough, Defendant
No Logo Anne Altman, Defendant
No Logo Annette Harder, Defendant
No Logo Annie Wing, Defendant
No Logo Anthony Donfor, Defendant
No Logo Anthony McLeod Kennedy, Defendant
No Logo Anthony W. Ishii, Defendant
No Logo Antonin Gregory Scalia, Defendant
No Logo April Wever, Defendant
No Logo Arlen Specter, Defendant
No Logo Arnold Schwarzenegger, Defendant
No Logo Art Brown, Defendant
No Logo Arthur D. Levinson, Defendant
No Logo Arthur Orr, Defendant
No Logo Arthur Payne, Defendant
No Logo Arvind A. Menon, Defendant
No Logo Ashley Veskerna, Defendant
No Logo Audrey B. Collins, Defendant
No Logo B. Mayles, Defendant
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Defendant
Officially listed as "Barack H. Obama"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017
No Logo Barbara B. Boyd, Defendant
No Logo Barbara Jill Walters, Defendant
No Logo Barbara Levy Boxer, Defendant
No Logo Barbara Michels, Defendant
No Logo Barbara Pisaro, Defendant
No Logo Barney Frank, Defendant
No Logo Barry Mask, Defendant
No Logo Barry Moore, Defendant
No Logo Baso Sangque, Defendant
No Logo Becky Nordgren, Defendant
Bernanke, Ben Shalom Bernanke, Ben Shalom, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ben Shalom Bernanke"
No Logo BEN BROOKS, Defendant
No Logo Ben Downs, Defendant
No Logo Ben Pilkerton, Defendant
No Logo Benjamin Galloway, Defendant
No Logo Benjamin Todd Jealous, Defendant
No Logo Berry Forte, Defendant
No Logo Bert Kerttula, Defendant
No Logo Bert Stedman, Defendant
No Logo Berta Gardner, Defendant
No Logo Beth Comstock, Defendant
No Logo Beth Kerttula, Defendant
No Logo Beth Pearce, Defendant
No Logo Beth Ranshau, Defendant
No Logo Beth Wood, Defendant
No Logo Betsy Lawer, Defendant
No Logo Bettye Davis, Defendant
No Logo Beverly B. Martin, Defendant
No Logo Beverly Dyer, Defendant
No Logo Bill Campbell, Defendant
No Logo Bill Canepa, Defendant
No Logo Bill Coleman, Defendant
No Logo Bill Hendrich, Defendant
No Logo Bill Holtzclaw, Defendant
No Logo Bill Lockyer, Defendant
No Logo Bill Matthews, Defendant
No Logo Bill Poole, Defendant
No Logo Bill Roberts, Defendant
No Logo Bill Stoltze, Defendant
No Logo Bill Thomas, Jr, Defendant
No Logo Bill Wielechowski, Defendant
No Logo Billy Beasley, Defendant
No Logo Blaine Galliher, Defendant
No Logo Blake W. Nordstrom, Defendant
No Logo Bob Herron, Defendant
No Logo Bob Lynn, Defendant
No Logo Bob Miller, Defendant
No Logo Bob Peterson, Defendant
No Logo Bob Sasser, Defendant
No Logo Bobby Singleton, Defendant
No Logo Bohdan A. Futey, Defendant
No Logo Bonnie Erbe, Defendant
No Logo Brackett B. Denniston, III, Defendant
No Logo Brad Hooker, Defendant
No Logo Bradley DeBerg, Defendant
No Logo Brandon Burgess, Defendant
No Logo Brandon Clark Stone, Defendant
No Logo Brian Beckwith, Defendant
No Logo Brian Cornell, Defendant
No Logo Brian Lawlor, Defendant
No Logo Brian Moynihan, Defendant
No Logo Brian Paul Strength, Defendant
No Logo Brian Sonntag, Defendant
No Logo Brian W. Brady, Defendant
No Logo Brian Worrell, Defendant
No Logo Brooke Ollis, Defendant
No Logo Bruce A. Myers, Defendant
No Logo BRUCE REID, Defendant
No Logo Bryan Taylor, Defendant
No Logo Bryce Edgmon, Defendant
No Logo Business Executives of General Electric Company, Defendant
No Logo Byron Leslie Dorgan, Defendant
No Logo C. Douglas Kranwinkle, Defendant
No Logo C. Lynwood Smith, Jr, Defendant
No Logo C. Thomas McVey, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Callie T. Dietz, Defendant
No Logo Calvin Poole, Defendant
No Logo Cam Ward, Defendant
No Logo Cameron Moody, Defendant
No Logo Carl Gatto, Defendant
No Logo Carlos Vanegas, Defendant
No Logo Caro Marks, Defendant
No Logo Carol Carter, Defendant
No Logo Carol Eckert, Defendant
No Logo Carol Joyal, Defendant
No Logo Carol Savlick, Defendant
No Logo Caroline Beasley, Defendant
No Logo Carolyn Sharpe, Defendant
No Logo Carolyn W. Colvin, Defendant
No Logo Carolyn Wiggin, Defendant
No Logo Carr Allison, Defendant
No Logo Catherine Provencher, Defendant
No Logo Catherine Woody, Defendant
No Logo Cathryn Lovely, Defendant
No Logo Cathy Giessel, Defendant
No Logo Cathy Luke, Defendant
No Logo Cathy Munoz, Defendant
No Logo Cecelia Smith, Defendant
No Logo Chad Fincher, Defendant
No Logo Chandra B. Brisbon, Defendant
No Logo Charisse Millett, Defendant
No Logo Charlene Begley, Defendant
No Logo Charles Christopher Cox, Defendant
No Logo Charles D. Rangel, Defendant
No Logo Charles Ellis Schumer, Defendant
No Logo Charles Ernest Grassley, Defendant
No Logo Charles F. Lettow, Defendant
No Logo Charles Harry Green, Defendant
No Logo Charles Holliday, Defendant
No Logo Charles, Lee, Defendant
No Logo Charles Malone, Defendant
No Logo Charles O. Newton, Defendant
No Logo Charles R. Malone, Defendant
No Logo CHARLES R. WILSON, Defendant
No Logo Charles S. Haight, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Charles T. Roth, Defendant
No Logo Charlie Daniels, Defendant
No Logo Charlie Huggins, Defendant
No Logo Chester Martin Keely, Defendant
No Logo Chip Flowers, Defendant
No Logo Chris Dudley, Defendant
No Logo Chris England, Defendant
No Logo Chris Moore, Defendant
No Logo Chris Norby, Defendant
No Logo Chris Tuck, Defendant
No Logo Christina Reiss, Defendant
No Logo Christine Odell Cook Miller, Defendant
No Logo Christinge M. Durham , Defendant
No Logo Christinge M. Durham, Defendant
No Logo Christopher F. Droney, Defendant
No Logo Christopher H. Cornelius, Defendant
No Logo Christopher John Dodd, Defendant
No Logo Christopher Samuel Bond, Defendant
No Logo Clarence Maddox, Defendant
No Logo Clarence Thomas, Defendant
No Logo Clark D. Ivory, Defendant
No Logo Claudi Santiago, Defendant
No Logo Clay Scofield, Defendant
No Logo Clint Zweifel, Defendant
No Logo Colin Luther Powell, Defendant
No Logo Colonel Albert F. Rodriguez, Defendant
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "Condoleezza Rice"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.
No Logo Constance H. Lau, Defendant
No Logo Courtney Feine, Defendant
No Logo Craig Ford, Defendant
No Logo Craig Johnson, Defendant
No Logo Craig M. Kellison, Defendant
No Logo Craig Pittman, Defendant
No Logo Craig Sorrell Pittman, Defendant
No Logo Craig Stowers, Defendant
No Logo Craig Weatherup, Defendant
No Logo Crit Luallen, Defendant
No Logo Curt Pringle, Defendant
No Logo Curtin Winsor, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Curtis L. Collier, Defendant
No Logo Curtis M. Loftis, Jr., Defendant
No Logo D. Callaghan, Defendant
No Logo D. Disrud, Defendant
No Logo Dale B. Miller, Defendant
No Logo Dale E. Kildee, Defendant
No Logo Dale M. Cundiff, Defendant
No Logo Dale M. Herder, Defendant
No Logo Dan Auble, Defendant
No Logo Dan Bucks, Defendant
No Logo Dan Henson, Defendant
No Logo Dan Mason, Defendant
No Logo Dan Rutherford, Defendant
No Logo Dan Saddler, Defendant
No Logo DAN WILLIAMS, Defendant
No Logo Dana Fabe, Defendant
No Logo Dana Withers, Defendant
No Logo Dani Jahn, Defendant
No Logo Daniel Boman, Defendant
No Logo Daniel C. Heintzelman, Defendant
No Logo Daniel J. Broderick, Defendant
No Logo Daniel J. Doyle, Defendant
No Logo Daniel J. Lynch, Defendant
No Logo Daniel Janki, Defendant
No Logo Daniel K. Tarullo, Defendant
No Logo Daniel Ken Inouye, Defendant
No Logo Daniel Savadove, Defendant
No Logo Daniel Scott Campbell, Defendant
No Logo Daniel VanHorn, Defendant
No Logo Dann H. Bowman, Defendant
No Logo Darius Grier, Defendant
No Logo Darrio Melton, Defendant
No Logo Dave Yost, Defendant
No Logo David A. Vaudt, Defendant
No Logo David B. Sentelle, Defendant
No Logo David Box, Defendant
No Logo David C. Williams, Defendant
No Logo David Carey, Defendant
No Logo David Colston, Defendant
No Logo David Drier, Defendant
No Logo David Guttenberg, Defendant
No Logo David H. Lillard, Jr., Defendant
No Logo David Hulen, Defendant
No Logo David Hunter Pate, Defendant
No Logo David I. Rainer, Defendant
No Logo David J. Barrett, Defendant
No Logo David J. Field, Defendant
No Logo David L. Joyce, Defendant
No Logo David Lemoine, Defendant
No Logo David M. Schippers, Defendant
No Logo David M. Walker, Defendant
No Logo David Perry, Defendant
No Logo David Porter, Defendant
No Logo David R. Obey, Defendant
No Logo David Rodgers, Defendant
No Logo David Scott, Defendant
No Logo David Sessions, Defendant
No Logo David Vallee, Defendant
No Logo David Y. Chen, Defendant
No Logo Dean S. Landis, Defendant
No Logo Debbie Matz, Defendant
No Logo Deborah Bowen, Defendant
No Logo Del Marsh, Defendant
No Logo Demetrius C. Newton, Defendant
No Logo Denise L. Nappier, Defendant
No Logo Dennis Egan, Defendant
No Logo Dennis Hastert, Defendant
No Logo Dennis L. Beck, Defendant
No Logo Dennis Waks, Defendant
No Logo Deon Levingston, Defendant
No Logo Derek Holt, Defendant
No Logo Dexter Grimsley, Defendant
No Logo Diane Abegglen, Defendant
No Logo Diane Groesbeck, Defendant
No Logo Dianne Goldman Berman Feinstein, Defendant
No Logo Dick Brewbaker, Defendant
No Logo Dick Brewbaker , Defendant
No Logo Dick Durban, Defendant
No Logo Dino Drudi, Defendant
No Logo Dmitri Stockton, Defendant
No Logo Dolores Celio, Defendant
No Logo Dominic J. Squatrito, Defendant
No Logo Don Bankhead, Defendant
No Logo Don Benson, Defendant
No Logo Don Chang, Defendant
No Logo Don Feder, Defendant
No Logo Don Stenberg, Defendant
No Logo Donald Collins, Jr, Defendant
No Logo Donald Henry Rumsfeld, Defendant
No Logo Donald Mann, Defendant
No Logo Donald Olson, Defendant
No Logo Donna F. Martinez, Defendant
No Logo Donna M. Jones, Defendant
No Logo Donnie Chesteen, Defendant
No Logo Doug Ducey, Defendant
No Logo Douglas A. Warner, III, Defendant
No Logo Douglas Beeverse, Defendant
No Logo Douglas E. Canton, Defendant
No Logo Douglas Franklin, Defendant
No Logo Douglas H. Schulman, Defendant
No Logo Douglas H. Shulman, Defendant
No Logo Douglas H. Weber, Defendant
No Logo Douglas W. Shorenstein, Defendant
No Logo Dr. David Thrasher, Defendant
No Logo Dr. James I. Cash, Jr., Defendant
Yellen, Janet Yellen, Janet, Defendant
Officially listed as "Janet Louise Yellen"
No Logo Dr. John C. Williams, Defendant
No Logo Dr. Susan Hockfield, Defendant
No Logo Dr. William Frisk, Defendant
No Logo Duke, Austin, Defendant
No Logo Duncan Hunter, Defendant
No Logo Dunia A. Shive, Defendant
No Logo Duwayne Bridges, Defendant
No Logo E. Morales, Defendant
No Logo Ed Henry, Defendant
No Logo Ed Royce, Defendant
No Logo Edith Blodgett, Defendant
No Logo Edmund G. Brown, Defendant
No Logo Edolphus Towns, Defendant
No Logo Edward Atsinger, Defendant
No Logo Edward DeMarco, Defendant
No Logo Edward J. Damich, Defendant
No Logo Edward Moore Kennedy, Defendant
No Logo Edward Smith, Defendant
No Logo Edwin E. Dahlberg, Defendant
No Logo ELAINE BEECH, Defendant
No Logo Elaine Howle, Defendant
Chao, Elaine L. Chao, Elaine L., Defendant
Officially listed as "Elaine Lan Chao"
Unknown Role, NORWEST CORP
Unknown Role, PROTECTIVE LIFE CORP
Unknown Role, News Corp
Unknown Role, New Newscorp LLC
Unknown Role, Virginia Holdco, Inc.
Unknown Role, Ingersoll-Rand plc
No Logo Elena Kagan, Defendant
No Logo Elizabeth A. Duke, Defendant
No Logo Elizabeth B. Kautz, Defendant
No Logo Elizabeth Dole, Defendant
No Logo Ellen Bree Burns, Defendant
No Logo Ellen S. Miller, Defendant
No Logo Elvi De Quiroz, Defendant
No Logo Elwyn Thomas, Defendant
No Logo Emily C. Hewitt, Defendant
No Logo Emmanuel Issoze-Ngondet, Defendant
No Logo Emmett Ripley Cox, Defendant
No Logo Eric Brown, Defendant
No Logo Eric Feige, Defendant
No Logo Eric G. Bruggink, Defendant
Holder, Jr., Eric H. Holder, Jr., Eric H., Defendant
Officially listed as "Eric H. Holder"
No Logo Eric Kersten, Defendant
No Logo Eric Vogeler, Defendant
No Logo Erika Freeman, Defendant
No Logo Ernest A. Almonte, Defendant
No Logo Esq. James G. Mcdonald, Defendant
No Logo Esq. William Collard, Defendant
No Logo Evan Mackinder, Defendant
No Logo Ferdinando Beccalli-Falco, Defendant
No Logo Fernando M. Olguin, Defendant
No Logo Francine Zepeda, Defendant
No Logo Francis M. Allegra, Defendant
No Logo Frank Brian Rice, Defendant
No Logo Frank M. Hull, Defendant
No Logo Frank P. Reiche, Defendant
No Logo Fred David Lowery, Defendant
No Logo Fred Dyson, Defendant
No Logo Freyja Johnson, Defendant
No Logo Frosty Wooldridge, Defendant
No Logo G. Auerbach, Defendant
No Logo G. De La Torre, Defendant
No Logo Gary Gensler, Defendant
No Logo Gary Jones, Defendant
No Logo Gary S. Austin, Defendant
No Logo Gary Stevens, Defendant
No Logo Gayle King, Defendant
No Logo Gene L. Dodaro, Defendant
No Logo General Electric Board of Directors, Defendant
No Logo George C. Bandy, Defendant
No Logo George E. Carpenter, Defendant
No Logo George L. Beck, Jr., Defendant
No Logo George Miller, Defendant
No Logo George Victor Voinovich, Defendant
Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Defendant
Officially listed as "George Walker Bush"
No Logo George W. Miller, Defendant
No Logo Georgia High, Defendant
No Logo Georgina Kawamura, Defendant
No Logo Gerald Allen, Defendant
No Logo Gerald Bard Tjoflat, Defendant
No Logo Gerald Dial, Defendant
No Logo Gerald E. Lynch, Defendant
No Logo Gerard Araud, Defendant
No Logo Gerda Bikales, Defendant
No Logo Gina M. Raimondo, Defendant
No Logo Glen B. Gainer, III, Defendant
No Logo Glenn Jackson, Defendant
No Logo Glenn Murdock, Defendant
No Logo Gordon H. Smith, Defendant
No Logo Gordon Richard England, Defendant
No Logo Governor Robert Bentley, Defendant
No Logo Grace Evans Cherashore, Defendant
No Logo Graham Gilbert, Defendant
No Logo Greg Burdine, Defendant
No Logo Greg L. Prickett, Defendant
No Logo Greg M. Conger, Defendant
No Logo Greg Reed, Defendant
No Logo Greg Shaw, Defendant
No Logo Greg Wren, Defendant
No Logo Guy Cottrell, Defendant
No Logo Gwat Bhattacharjie, Defendant
No Logo H J Rivera, Defendant
No Logo Hank Sanders, Defendant
No Logo Hardeep Singh Puri, Defendant
No Logo Harri Anne Smith, Defendant
No Logo Harry Preston Hall, II, Defendant
No Logo Harry Reid, Defendant
No Logo Harry Shiver, Defendant
No Logo Harry Simon, Defendant
No Logo Harwell G. Davis, Defendant
No Logo Hazel Cash, Defendant
No Logo Hector Balderas, Defendant
No Logo Heidi Raphael, Defendant
No Logo Helen Milliken, Defendant
No Logo Henry Arnold Waxman, Defendant
No Logo Henry Buhl, Defendant
No Logo Henry L. Kotkins, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Hilary Sheard, Defendant
Clinton, Hillary Rodham Clinton, Hillary Rodham, Defendant
Officially listed as "Hillary R. Clinton"
No Logo Hollis French, Defendant
No Logo Holly B. Fitzsimmons, Defendant
No Logo Holly Winnie, Defendant
No Logo Hon Ed Carnes, Defendant
No Logo Hon J. L. Edmondson, Defendant
No Logo Hon. Brian Bilbray, Defendant
No Logo Hon. Fred C. Ikle, Defendant
No Logo Hon. Louis Barletta, Defendant
No Logo Hon. Richard Lamm, Defendant
No Logo Hon. Walter D. Huddleston, Defendant
No Logo Howard Sanderford, Defendant
No Logo Howard Schultz, Defendant
No Logo Hugh Brien, Defendant
No Logo Inge P. Johnson, Defendant
No Logo Ivan Barbalic, Defendant
No Logo J. Douglas Steere, Defendant
No Logo J. Bayard Boyle, Defendant
No Logo J. Carter, Defendant
No Logo J. Elizabeth Kellum, Defendant
No Logo J. Foy Guin, Defendant
No Logo J. L. Edmonston, Defendant
No Logo J. Mark White, Defendant
No Logo J. Michael Joiner, Defendant
No Logo J. T. Waggoner, Defendant
No Logo Jack Abernethy, Defendant
No Logo Jack Markell, Defendant
No Logo Jack Wagner, Defendant
No Logo Jack, William, Defendant
No Logo James Allen Main, Defendant
No Logo James B. Boone, Jr., Defendant
No Logo James C. Duff, Defendant
No Logo James C. Hill, Defendant
No Logo James Dorcy, Defendant
No Logo James E. Buskey, Defendant
No Logo James E. Christensen, Defendant
No Logo James E. Clyburn, Defendant
No Logo James F. Bellot, Defendant
No Logo James F. Merow, Defendant
No Logo James Gerstenlauer, Defendant
No Logo James H. Hancock, Defendant
No Logo James Henry Webb, Defendant
No Logo James J. Mulva, Defendant
No Logo James L. McIntire, Defendant
No Logo James L. Sanford, Defendant
No Logo James, Lewis, Defendant
No Logo James Michael Perry, Defendant
No Logo JAMES P. CAMPBELL, Defendant
No Logo James R Dunn, Defendant
No Logo James R. Woolwine, Defendant
No Logo James S. Tisch, Defendant
No Logo James Shennan, Jr., Defendant
No Logo James Smith Lloyd, Defendant
No Logo James V. Selna, Defendant
Dimon, Jamie Dimon, Jamie, Defendant
Officially listed as "Jamie Dimon"
No Logo Jamie Ison, Defendant
No Logo Jamie S. MIller, Defendant
No Logo Jan Horbaly, Defendant
No Logo Jane Harman, Defendant
No Logo Jane Holl Lute, Defendant
No Logo Janed Bond Arterton, Defendant
No Logo Janet C. Hall, Defendant
No Logo Janet Cowell, Defendant
No Logo Janet Napolitano, Defendant
No Logo Janice Mueller, Defendant
No Logo Jason Matthew Jackson, Defendant
No Logo Javier Teruel, Defendant
No Logo Jay Ireland, Defendant
No Logo Jay Ireland , Defendant
No Logo Jay Love , Defendant
No Logo Jay Love, Defendant
No Logo Jeff Gaspin, Defendant
Sessions, Jefferson Beauregard, III Sessions, Jefferson Beauregard, III, Defendant
Officially listed as "Jefferson Beauegard Sessions"
United States Department of Justice Attorney General, United States Department of Justice, February 9, 2017 - November 7, 2018
United States of America Attorney General, United States of America, February 9, 2017 - November 7, 2018
No Logo Jeffrey Atwater, Defendant
No Logo Immelt, Jeffrey R., Defendant
Officially listed as "Jeffrey R. Immelt"
General Electric Company CEO, General Electric Company, September 7, 2001 - August 1, 2017
Unknown Role, Athenahealth, Inc.
Unknown Role, Twilio, Inc.
Unknown Role, Bloom Energy Corp
Unknown Role, Bear Newco, Inc.
No Logo Jeffrey S. Borenstein, Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey Staniels, Defendant
No Logo Jennifer Leigh Argo, Defendant
No Logo Jennifer Mann, Defendant
No Logo Jeremy H. Oden, Defendant
No Logo Jeremy Kroger, Defendant
No Logo Jeremy Wayne Armstrong, Defendant
No Logo Jerry Fielding, Defendant
No Logo Jerry Lewis, Defendant
No Logo Jessica A. Marventano, Defendant
No Logo Jessica Ayton, Defendant
No Logo Jihan Andoni, Defendant
No Logo Jill N. Parrish, Defendant
No Logo Jim Barton, Defendant
No Logo Jim Conschafter, Defendant
No Logo Jim McClendon, Defendant
No Logo Lee & Hayes PLLC, Defendant
Officially listed as "Jim Patterson"
No Logo Jim Rohr, Defendant
No Logo Jimmy Holley, Defendant
No Logo Jo Tittel, Defendant
No Logo Joan Fishere, Defendant
No Logo Joan G. Margolis, Defendant
No Logo Joan Keller, Defendant
No Logo Joe Faust, Defendant
No Logo Joe Hubbard, Defendant
No Logo Joe Mayer, Defendant
No Logo Joe Paskvan, Defendant
No Logo Joe Thomas, Defendant
No Logo Joel F. Dubina, Defendant
No Logo Joel Mccleary, Defendant
No Logo Joel Oxley, Defendant
No Logo John A Perez, Defendant
No Logo John Ashcroft, Defendant
No Logo John Boehner, Defendant
No Logo John Brock, Defendant
No Logo John C. Dugan, Defendant
No Logo John Chiang, Defendant
No Logo John Coghill, Defendant
No Logo John Conyers, Jr., Defendant
No Logo John Davidson Rockefeller, IV, Defendant
No Logo John Dimitri Negroponte, Defendant
No Logo John Dineen, Defendant
No Logo John E. Ott, Defendant
No Logo John E. Potter, Defendant
No Logo John F. Clark, Defendant
No Logo John F. Knight, Defendant
No Logo John G. Morgan, Defendant
No Logo John G. Roberts, Defendant
No Logo John G. Stumpf, Defendant
No Logo John Gerspach, Defendant
No Logo John Glover Roberts, Defendant
No Logo John Gorman, Defendant
No Logo John H. Wilkerson, Defendant
No Logo John J. Falconi, Defendant
No Logo John Jefferson Utsey, Defendant
No Logo John Kelley Johnson, Defendant
No Logo John Krenicki, Jr, Defendant
No Logo John L. Flannery, Defendant
No Logo Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP, Defendant
Officially listed as "John Lynch"
No Logo John M. Keel, Defendant
No Logo John M. Spratt, Jr., Defendant
No Logo John Merrill, Defendant
No Logo John Munn, Defendant
No Logo John Neely Kennedy, Defendant
No Logo John O'Colvin, Defendant
No Logo John P. Murtha, Defendant
No Logo John Paul Wiese, Defendant
No Logo John Perdue, Defendant
No Logo John Philip Sousa, Defendant
No Logo John Purcell, Defendant
No Logo John R. Beck, Defendant
No Logo John Robinson, Defendant
No Logo John Ryan, Defendant
No Logo John Samuels, Defendant
No Logo John Schaff, Defendant
No Logo JOHN S. PRATT, Defendant
No Logo John V. Evans, Jr., Defendant
No Logo John Van de Kamp, Defendant
No Logo John W. Rogers, Jr., Defendant
No Logo John Walsh, Defendant
No Logo John William Warner, Defendant
No Logo Johnny Elllis, Defendant
No Logo Johnny M. Morrow, Defendant
No Logo Johnny Reid Edwrads, Defendant
No Logo Jonathan Coslet, Defendant
No Logo Jonathan Jeffress, Defendant
No Logo Jose Filipe Moraes Cabral, Defendant
No Logo Joseph C. Berenato, Defendant
No Logo Joseph C. Mitchell, Defendant
No Logo Joseph E. Robertson, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Joseph Isadore Lieberman, Defendant
No Logo Joseph R. Guzzardi, Defendant
Biden Jr., Joseph R. Biden Jr., Joseph R., Defendant
Officially listed as "Joseph Robinette Biden"
No Logo Joseph Schlesinger, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Schwartz, Defendant
No Logo Josh Mandel, Defendant
No Logo Joshua Cooper Ramo, Defendant
No Logo Joy Guest, Defendant
No Logo Joy Ogwu, Defendant
No Logo Joyce White Vance, Defendant
No Logo Juandalynn Givan, Defendant
No Logo Judith E. Dupre, Defendant
No Logo Julie Koehn, Defendant
No Logo Julie Nelson, Defendant
No Logo Justice Daniel E. Winfree, Defendant
No Logo K. C. Mcalpin, Defendant
No Logo K. L. Brown, Defendant
No Logo Karl Rove, Defendant
No Logo Karla S. Chambers, Defendant
No Logo Karon O. Bowdre, Defendant
No Logo Kate Brown, Defendant
No Logo Kate Marshall, Defendant
No Logo Katherine Marie Klos, Defendant
No Logo Kathryn A. Cassidy, Defendant
No Logo Kathy Hunter, Defendant
No Logo Kay Ivey, Defendant
No Logo Kay M. Hoveland, Defendant
No Logo Kay Ruthven Hagan, Defendant
No Logo Keesha Jones, Defendant
No Logo Keith E. Smith, Defendant
No Logo Keith Huff, Defendant
No Logo Keith S. Sherin, Defendant
No Logo Kelly Buechner, Defendant
No Logo Kelly Maria Rippa, Defendant
No Logo Kelly Schmidt, Defendant
No Logo Ken A. Miller, Defendant
No Logo Ken Johnson, Defendant
No Logo Kenneth Feinberg, Defendant
No Logo Kenneth P. Wilcox, Defendant
No Logo Kerry Mitchell, Defendant
No Logo Kerry Rich, Defendant
No Logo Kesa Marie Johnston, Defendant
No Logo Ketajh Brown, Defendant
No Logo Kevin Finnerty, Defendant
No Logo KEVIN JOHNSON, Defendant
No Logo Kevin Meyer, Defendant
No Logo Kevin Pl Lembo, Defendant
No Logo Kim Roberts Hedgpeth, Defendant
No Logo Kimberly Brown Barnes, Defendant
No Logo Kizito Namulandan, Defendant
No Logo Kurt Olson, Defendant
No Logo Kurt Schuller, Defendant
No Logo Kurt Wallace, Defendant
No Logo Kwesi Mfume, Defendant
No Logo Kyle Johansen, Defendant
No Logo L. Davis, Defendant
No Logo L. Scott Coogler, Defendant
No Logo Lance Pruitt, Defendant
No Logo Lane W. Mann, Defendant
No Logo Lara Quint, Defendant
No Logo Laura Hall, Defendant
No Logo Lauren G. Gooding, Defendant
No Logo Lawrence E. Harrison, Defendant
No Logo Lawrence J. Block, Defendant
No Logo Lawrence J. O'Neill, Defendant
No Logo Lawrence M. Baskir, Defendant
No Logo Lawrence Mcadory, Defendant
No Logo Lawrence R. Johnston, Defendant
No Logo Lawrence S. margolis, Defendant
No Logo Lea Linn Mosley, Defendant
No Logo Lee E. Portis, Defendant
No Logo Leon Edward Panetta, Defendant
No Logo Leonard Green, Defendant
No Logo Les Donovan, Defendant
No Logo Les Gara, Defendant
No Logo Lesil McGuire, Defendant
No Logo Lesley Vance, Defendant
No Logo Lew Dickey, Defendant
No Logo Lexi Negin, Defendant
No Logo Li Baodong, Defendant
No Logo Liles C. Burke, Defendant
No Logo Lily Ruiz, Defendant
No Logo Linda C. Harter, Defendant
No Logo Linda Coleman, Defendant
No Logo Linda Day, Defendant
No Logo Linda Menard, Defendant
No Logo Lindsey Holmes, Defendant
No Logo Linn Dyk, Defendant
No Logo Lisa Wright, Defendant
No Logo Lissa Gardner, Defendant
No Logo Loren A. Smith, Defendant
No Logo Lorenzo Simonelli, Defendant
No Logo Loretta Sanchez, Defendant
No Logo Lorraine Murphy Weil, Defendant
No Logo Louise McIntosh Slaughter, Defendant
No Logo Luther Strange, Defendant
No Logo Lydia Curtis Dillingham, Defendant
No Logo Lyle W. Cayce, Defendant
No Logo Lyman Hoffman, Defendant
No Logo Lyn Stuart, Defendant
No Logo Lynn Beall, Defendant
No Logo Lynn C. Woosley, Defendant
No Logo Lynn Greer, Defendant
No Logo Lynn J. Bush, Defendant
No Logo M. Earp, Defendant
No Logo M. Prout, Defendant
No Logo M. Williams, Defendant
No Logo M.D. Alfred P. Doyle, Defendant
No Logo M.D. Clifford Colwell, Defendant
No Logo M.D. John Tanton, Defendant
No Logo M.D. Sandra R. Hernandez, Defendant
No Logo M.S. M.P.H. Susan Desmond-Hellmann, Defendant
No Logo Mac Buttram, Defendant
No Logo Mac McCutcheon, Defendant
No Logo Madelyn Bonnot Griffin, Defendant
No Logo Malcolm Warren McSwean, Defendant
No Logo Manju Ganeriwala, Defendant
No Logo Marc Days, Defendant
No Logo Marc Keahey, Defendant
No Logo Marc Morgan, Defendant
No Logo Marcel Black, Defendant
No Logo Marci Burdick, Defendant
No Logo Marcia Paltenstein, Defendant
No Logo Margaret L. Smith, Defendant
No Logo Margaret Liu, Defendant
No Logo Margaret M. Sweeney, Defendant
No Logo Margaret S. Childers, Defendant
No Logo Margo Frampton, Defendant
No Logo Maria E. Stratton, Defendant
No Logo Maria Luiza Ribeiro Viotti, Defendant
No Logo Marian B. Horn, Defendant
No Logo Marian Blank Horn, Defendant
No Logo Marie Bragg, Defendant
No Logo Mariella P. Foley, Defendant
No Logo Marilyn Hempel, Defendant
No Logo Marilyn May, Defendant
No Logo Marion M. Higa, Defendant
No Logo Mark J. Krakowiak, Defendant
No Logo Mark L. Vachon, Defendant
No Logo Mark Lyall Grant, Defendant
No Logo Mark M. Little, Defendant
No Logo Mark Neuman, Defendant
No Logo Mark R. Kravitz, Defendant
No Logo Mark Ranalli, Defendant
No Logo Mark Robert Warner, Defendant
No Logo Mark Sullivan, Defendant
No Logo Mark Tuggle, Defendant
No Logo Mark W. Begor, Defendant
No Logo Marshal-David M. Singer, Defendant
No Logo Martha Lynn McCain, Defendant
No Logo Martha Shoffner, Defendant
No Logo Martin, Frank S., Defendant
No Logo Martin J. Gurenberg, Defendant
No Logo Mary Ann Call May, Defendant
No Logo Mary Becker Windom, Defendant
No Logo Mary Beth Quist, Defendant
No Logo Mary Ellen Coster Williams, Defendant
No Logo Mary F. Kaiser, Defendant
No Logo Mary Moore, Defendant
No Logo Mary O. McWilliams, Defendant
No Logo Mary Petras, Defendant
No Logo Mary Pfaff, Defendant
No Logo Mary Schapiro, Defendant
No Logo Mary Sue McClurkin, Defendant
No Logo Mathew S. Peterson, Defendant
No Logo Matthew B. Durrant, Defendant
No Logo Matthew Bockman, Defendant
No Logo Matthew Mnich, Defendant
No Logo Matthew S. Petersen, Defendant
No Logo Matthew Scoble, Defendant
No Logo Max Gruenberg, Defendant
No Logo Max Thelen, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Maxine Moore Carr Waters, Defendant
No Logo Megan F. Clubb, Defendant
No Logo Melinda French Gates, Defendant
No Logo Mellody Hobson, Defendant
No Logo Melody Walcott, Defendant
No Logo Meredith Shay Peters, Defendant
No Logo Merika Coleman, Defendant
No Logo Merilyn Hammond, Defendant
No Logo Mia Costello, Defendant
No Logo Michael A. Neal, Defendant
No Logo Michael A. Nutter, Defendant
No Logo Michael B. Enzi, Defendant
No Logo Michael Beckel, Defendant
No Logo Michael Chertoff, Defendant
No Logo Michael Courlander, Defendant
No Logo Michael F. Bolin, Defendant
No Logo Michael Fischer, Defendant
No Logo Michael Fitzgerald, Defendant
No Logo Michael Geesey, Defendant
No Logo Michael J. Astrue, Defendant
No Logo Michael J. Fiorile, Defendant
No Logo Michael J. Seng, Defendant
No Logo Michael Mullen, Defendant
No Logo Michael Oppenheimer, Defendant
No Logo Michael Petrik, Defendant
No Logo Michael Sellers, Defendant
No Logo Michael Seto, Defendant
No Logo Michael Steele, Defendant
No Logo Michelle Giacobbe, Defendant
No Logo Micky Hammon, Defendant
No Logo Mike Ball, Defendant
No Logo Mike Chenault, Defendant
No Logo Mike Doogan, Defendant
No Logo Mike Duke, Defendant
No Logo Mike Foley, Defendant
No Logo Mike Grimsley, Defendant
No Logo Mike Hale, Defendant
No Logo Mike Hawker, Defendant
No Logo Mike Hill, Defendant
No Logo Mike Hubbard, Defendant
No Logo Mike Jones, Defendant
No Logo Mike Millican, Defendant
No Logo Mike Novak, Defendant
No Logo Millard Drexler, Defendant
No Logo Mimi Walters, Defendant
No Logo Mindy Chang, Defendant
McConnell, Jr., Addison Mitch McConnell, Jr., Addison Mitch, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mitch McConnell"
No Logo Mitchell Khaled Shelly, Defendant
No Logo Monica Knox, Defendant
No Logo Monica Lindeen, Defendant
No Logo Monte Loos, Defendant
No Logo Montserrat Fernandez, Defendant
No Logo Morgan Christen, Defendant
No Logo Mr. Chuck Cross, Defendant
No Logo Mr. Jeffrey Allen, Defendant
No Logo Mr. John Prendergast, Defendant
No Logo Mr. Kyle Thomas, Defendant
No Logo Mr. Matthew Lambert, Defendant
No Logo Mr. Michael Stevens, Defendant
No Logo Mrs. Carlos G. Morrison, Defendant
No Logo Mrs. Gabrielle Giffords, Defendant
No Logo Mrs. T. N. Jordan, Defendant
No Logo Ms. Jeanette Barraza, Defendant
No Logo Ms. Sandra Moncada, Defendant
No Logo Ms. Tonita Allers, Defendant
No Logo Myron Ullman, III, Defendant
No Logo Nancy Anthony, Defendant
No Logo Nancy B. Firestone, Defendant
No Logo Nancy K. Kopp, Defendant
No Logo Nancy Meyer Whittington, Defendant
Pelosi, Nancy Pelosi, Nancy, Defendant
Officially listed as "Nancy Pelosi"
United States House of Representatives Speaker of the House, United States House of Representatives, January 4, 2007 - January 3, 2011
United States House of Representatives Speaker of the House, United States House of Representatives, January 3, 2019 - Present
No Logo Napoleon Bracy, Jr., Defendant
No Logo National Association of State Treasures Presidents, Defendant
No Logo Neal Foster, Defendant
No Logo Neil Jaffee, Defendant
No Logo Neil Milner, Defendant
No Logo Neria R. Douglass, Defendant
No Logo Nestor Osorio Londono, Defendant
No Logo Nhu Duong, Defendant
No Logo Nicole C. Taylor, Defendant
No Logo Nita Norman, Defendant
No Logo Norman E. Waldrop, Defendant
No Logo Norman Y. Mineta, Defendant
No Logo of Labor Hilda L. Solis, Defendant
No Logo Olden Lee, Defendant
No Logo Oliver Robinson, Defendant
No Logo Oliver W. Wanger, Defendant
No Logo Olympia Jean Snowe, Defendant
No Logo Oprah Winfrey, Defendant
No Logo Orrin Hatch, Defendant
No Logo P. Ben McLauchlin, Defendant
No Logo Pamela Daley, Defendant
No Logo Pat Choate, Defendant
No Logo Pat Davidson, Defendant
No Logo Pat Dougherty, Defendant
No Logo Pat H. Bartholomew, Defendant
No Logo Patricia E. Yarrington, Defendant
No Logo Patricia Lynn Murray, Defendant
No Logo Patricia Todd, Defendant
No Logo Patrick Donahoe, Defendant
No Logo Patrick G. Yalung, Defendant
No Logo Patrick Galvin, Defendant
No Logo Patrick Joseph Leahy, Defendant
No Logo Paul A. Schneider, Defendant
No Logo Paul Beckman, Defendant
No Logo Paul Bussman, Defendant
No Logo Paul DeMarco, Defendant
No Logo Paul Dughi, Defendant
No Logo Paul Dundes Wolfowitz, Defendant
No Logo Paul Egan, Defendant
No Logo Paul H. Dobson, Defendant
No Logo Paul H. McTear, Defendant
No Logo Paul Karpowicz, Defendant
No Logo PAUL LEE, Defendant
No Logo Paul, Michael, Defendant
No Logo Paul Otto, Defendant
No Logo Paul, Ryan, Defendant
No Logo Paul Sanford, Defendant
No Logo Paul Seaton, Defendant
No Logo Paul V. Townsend, Defendant
No Logo Paul W. Greene, Defendant
No Logo Pebblin Warren, Defendant
No Logo Peggy R. Groves, Defendant
No Logo Peggy Sasso, Defendant
No Logo Peggy Wilson, Defendant
No Logo Peggy Y. Fowler, Defendant
No Logo Perry Sook, Defendant
No Logo Pete Marks, Defendant
No Logo Pete Petersen, Defendant
No Logo Pete V. Domenici, Defendant
No Logo Peter C. Dorsey, Defendant
No Logo Peter Hoekstra, Defendant
No Logo Peter Horstman, Defendant
No Logo Peter Nunez, Defendant
No Logo Peter Pace, Defendant
No Logo Peter Stark, Defendant
No Logo Peter T. Fay, Defendant
No Logo Peter Wallace, Defendant
No Logo Peter Wittig, Defendant
No Logo Ph.D Frank Morris, Defendant
No Logo Ph.D. Cleveland Chandler, Defendant
No Logo Ph.D. Diana Hull, Defendant
No Logo Ph.D. Frances Burke, Defendant
No Logo Ph.d. Fred Pinkham, Defendant
No Logo Ph.D. Otis W. Graham, Jr, Defendant
No Logo Phil Williams, Defendant
No Logo Philip A. Roberts, Defendant
No Logo Philip Franklin Hutcheson, Defendant
No Logo Phillip D. Morse, Defendant
No Logo Phyllis A. Kravitch, Defendant
No Logo Priscilla Dunn, Defendant
No Logo Quinton T. Ross, Jr., Defendant
No Logo R. David Proctor, Defendant
No Logo R. Lanier Anderson, Defendant
No Logo R. N. Armen, Jr., Defendant
No Logo R. Thomas Wagner, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Rachel Hill, Defendant
No Logo Rachelle Barbour, Defendant
No Logo Rahm Emanuel, Defendant
No Logo Ralph C. Conte, Defendant
No Logo Ralph C. Dawson, Defendant
No Logo Ralph Howard, Defendant
No Logo Ralph M. Oakley, Defendant
No Logo Ralph S. Larsen, Defendant
No Logo Randall L. Cole, Defendant
No Logo Randall Radar, Defendant
No Logo Randy D. Gravley, Defendant
No Logo Randy Davis, Defendant
No Logo Randy Wood, Defendant
No Logo Ray Thomas Kennington, Defendant
No Logo Raymond Douglas Burns, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Raymond Eugene Green, Defendant
No Logo Raymond H. Cole, Defendant
No Logo Rebecca Curry, Defendant
No Logo Rebecca Otto, Defendant
No Logo Reggie Joule, Defendant
No Logo Regis Francis Xavier Philbin, Defendant
No Logo Renay Bertella, Defendant
No Logo Renee Caldwell, Defendant
No Logo Rhonda Jackson, Defendant
No Logo Rich Sattgast, Defendant
No Logo Richard A. Eckstom, Defendant
No Logo Richard A. Laxer, Defendant
Cheney, Richard B. Cheney, Richard B., Defendant
Officially listed as "Richard Bruce Cheney"
No Logo Richard B. Freeman, Defendant
No Logo Richard Baughn, Defendant
No Logo Richard C. Blum, Defendant
No Logo Richard Craig Shelby, Defendant
No Logo Richard Cummings, Defendant
No Logo Richard Ellis, Defendant
No Logo Richard Fair, Defendant
No Logo Richard Galanti, Defendant
No Logo Richard J. Laird, Defendant
No Logo Richard J. Lindsey, Defendant
No Logo Richard K. Davis, Defendant
No Logo Richard Lee Armitage, Defendant
No Logo Richard Madison, Defendant
No Logo Richard Mauze Burr, Defendant
No Logo Richard Michael DeWine, Defendant
No Logo Richard Mourdock, Defendant
No Logo Richard Norman Hasting, Defendant
No Logo Richard Parson, Defendant
No Logo Rick R. Holley, Defendant
No Logo Robert A. Brady, Defendant
No Logo Robert A. Hatch, Defendant
No Logo Robert A. Weinberger, Defendant
No Logo Robert B. Propst, Defendant
No Logo Robert Brian Smith, Defendant
No Logo Robert Bruce Zoellick, Defendant
No Logo Robert C. Davis, Defendant
No Logo Robert C. Hale, Defendant
No Logo Robert Carter Lockwood, Defendant
No Logo Robert D. Park, Defendant
No Logo Robert E. Hannay, Defendant
No Logo Robert G. Esdale, Sr., Defendant
No Logo Robert Gillespie, Defendant
No Logo Robert H. Hodges, Defendant
No Logo Robert J. Swieringa, Defendant
No Logo Robert J. Yock, Defendant
No Logo Robert Kelly, Defendant
No Logo Robert Louis Nardelli, Defendant
No Logo Robert McCord, Defendant
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Defendant
Officially listed as "Robert Michael Gates"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation
No Logo Robert N. Chatigney, Defendant
No Logo Robert Proffitt, Defendant
No Logo Robert R. Armstrong, Defendant
No Logo Robert R. Di Trolio, Defendant
No Logo Robert Stander, Defendant
No Logo Robert Swan Mueller, Defendant
No Logo Robert Tucker, Defendant
No Logo Robert W. Hubbard, Defendant
No Logo Robert W. Lane, Defendant
No Logo Robin D. Tabora, Defendant
No Logo Robin F. Kaplan, Defendant
No Logo Rochelle B. Lazarus, Defendant
No Logo Rockhelle Johnson, Defendant
No Logo Rod Scott, Defendant
No Logo Roderick C. Wendt, Defendant
No Logo Rodger Smitherman, Defendant
No Logo Roger Bedford, Defendant
No Logo Roger L. Srtomberg, Defendant
No Logo Roger S. Penske, Defendant
No Logo Roger Utnehmer, Defendant
No Logo Roger W. Hinshaw, Defendant
No Logo Roland Lewis Sledge, Defendant
No Logo Ron Crane, Defendant
No Logo Ron Estes, Defendant
No Logo Ronald A. Barrick, Defendant
No Logo Ronald C. Machen, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Ronald E. Nehring, Defendant
No Logo Ronald G. Johnson, Defendant
No Logo Ronald Howard Srawbridge, Sr., Defendant
No Logo Ronald J. David, Defendant
No Logo Ronald Meisburg, Defendant
No Logo Ronald R. Pressman, Defendant
No Logo Ronald Sugar, Defendant
No Logo Ronald Wayne, Defendant
No Logo Rosanna Piccirilli, Defendant
No Logo Rosanna Taormina, Defendant
No Logo Rose E. Chavez, Defendant
No Logo Rosemarie E. Shaheen, Defendant
No Logo Rosemary Barkett, Defendant
No Logo Roy A. Vallee, Defendant
No Logo Roy Blunt, Defendant
No Logo Roy C. Lierman, Defendant
No Logo Roy C. Porter, Defendant
No Logo Russ Hayden, Defendant
No Logo Russell G. Weiner, Defendant
No Logo Russell W. Hinton, Defendant
No Logo Rusty Glover, Defendant
No Logo Ruth Bader Ginsburg, Defendant
No Logo Ruth Jones, Defendant
No Logo Ryan Geoffrey Brake, Defendant
No Logo S. Brown, Defendant
No Logo S. Jones, Defendant
No Logo S. Mertens, Defendant
No Logo Autoliv Asp Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Sally J. Brown"
No Logo Sally Symanski, Defendant
No Logo Sam Nunn, Defendant
No Logo Samantha Shaw, Defendant
No Logo Samuel Henry Welch, Defendant
No Logo Samuel L Newhouse, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Samya Burney, Defendant
No Logo Sandra Lynch, Defendant
No Logo Sandra M. Snyder, Defendant
No Logo Sandra Roland, Defendant
No Logo Sanford Sussman, Defendant
No Logo Santa Lopez-Jarrin, Defendant
No Logo Sarah Bloom Raskin, Defendant
No Logo Sarah Bryner, Defendant
No Logo Sarah G. Epstein, Defendant
No Logo Sarah Palin, Defendant
No Logo Scott Alan Slatton, Defendant
No Logo Scott Beason, Defendant
No Logo Scott Blumenthal, Defendant
No Logo Scott Burns, Defendant
No Logo Scott Kawasaki, Defendant
No Logo Scott L. Hymas, Defendant
No Logo Scott Mcconnell, Defendant
No Logo Sean K. Kennedy, Defendant
No Logo Sean Parnell, Defendant
No Logo Sebastien Monnet, Defendant
No Logo Secretary of Labor Hilda L. Solis, Defendant
No Logo Seth Balfour Thompson, Defendant
No Logo Shadrack McGill, Defendant
No Logo Shane Fitzsimons, Defendant
No Logo Shane Marx, Defendant
No Logo Sharon Barnes, Defendant
No Logo Sharon Cissna, Defendant
No Logo Sharon Harris, Defendant
No Logo Sharon Hughes, Defendant
No Logo Sharon L. Blackburn, Defendant
No Logo Sharon Rice, Defendant
No Logo Shawn Moore, Defendant
No Logo Shawn Nelson, Defendant
No Logo Sheila Bair, Defendant
No Logo Sheila K. Oberto, Defendant
No Logo Sheila Krumholz, Defendant
No Logo Shelli Peterson, Defendant
No Logo Shelly E. Saltzman, Defendant
No Logo Sherod Thaxton, Defendant
Sandberg, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Sheryl K., Defendant
Officially listed as "Sheryl Sandberg"
Unknown Role, eHealth, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation
Unknown Role, Dc Holdco Inc
Facebook, Inc. Unknown Role, Facebook, Inc.
Unknown Role, SVMK Inc.
No Logo Sir James David Wolfensohn, Defendant
No Logo Slade Blackwell, Defendant
No Logo Sonia Jarvis, Defendant
No Logo Sonia M. Sotomayer, Defendant
No Logo Spencer Bachus, Defendant
No Logo Spencer MacColl, Defendant
No Logo Sr Donald Collins, Defendant
No Logo Stacey E. Pickering, Defendant
No Logo Stacia Hylton, Defendant
No Logo STANLEY MARCUS, Defendant
No Logo Stefan R. Underhill, Defendant
No Logo Steny Hoyner, Defendant
No Logo Stephen Bryer, Defendant
No Logo Steve Ballmer, Defendant
No Logo Steve Bolze, Defendant
No Logo Steve Campbell, Defendant
No Logo Steve Clouse, Defendant
No Logo Steve Cooley, Defendant
No Logo Steve Grossman, Defendant
No Logo Steve Hurst, Defendant
No Logo Steve J. Theriot, Defendant
No Logo Steve Jobs, Defendant
No Logo Steve McMillan, Defendant
No Logo Steve Paul Jobs, Defendant
No Logo Steve Scalise, Defendant
No Logo Steve Thompson, Defendant
No Logo Steve Wozniak, Defendant
No Logo Steven Edward Schwartz, Defendant
No Logo Steven J. Giacona, Defendant
No Logo Steven J. McAuliffee, Defendant
No Logo Steven Merrill Nolen, Defendant
No Logo Steven W. Newberry, Defendant
No Logo Sue Bell Cobb, Defendant
No Logo Sue Willis, Defendant
No Logo Susan A. Sutherland, Defendant
No Logo Susan Alger, Defendant
No Logo Susan Combs, Defendant
No Logo Susan E.M. Richards, Defendant
No Logo Susan Fox, Defendant
No Logo Susan G. Braden, Defendant
No Logo Susan H. Black, Defendant
No Logo Susan K. Lee, Defendant
No Logo Susan P. Peters, Defendant
No Logo Susan Stoker, Defendant
No Logo Suzanne M. Bump, Defendant
No Logo Suzi Lowell, Defendant
No Logo T. Michael Putnam, Defendant
No Logo Federal Correctional Institution, Defendant
Officially listed as "Talladega"
No Logo Tammie Wilson, Defendant
No Logo Tammy Irons, Defendant
No Logo Tammy Phan, Defendant
No Logo Tate Reeves, Defendant
No Logo Ted Harbert, Defendant
No Logo Ted Wheeler, Defendant
No Logo Teela Roche, Defendant
No Logo Terasita Edwards, Defendant
No Logo Terri Collins, Defendant
No Logo Terry A. Moore, Defendant
No Logo Terry Lucas Butts, Defendant
No Logo Terry Wilkerson, Defendant
No Logo Terry Willingham Thomas, Defendant
No Logo Thad McClammy, Defendant
No Logo Thomas A. Woodall, Defendant
No Logo Thomas C. Wheeler, Defendant
No Logo Thomas Connolly, Defendant
No Logo Thomas Davis, Defendant
No Logo Thomas DiNaploi, Defendant
No Logo Thomas DiNapoli, Defendant
No Logo Thomas E. Harlow, Defendant
No Logo Lilly Corporate Center, Defendant
Officially listed as "Thomas E. Jackson"
No Logo Thomas H. McTavish, Defendant
No Logo Thomas J. Ciminello, Defendant
No Logo Thomas M. Salmon, Defendant
No Logo Thomas P. Smith, Defendant
No Logo Thomas R. Lee, Defendant
No Logo Thomas Stewart Udall, Defendant
No Logo Thomas Wagoner, Defendant
No Logo Tia Tyan, Defendant
No Logo Tim Berry, Defendant
No Logo Felsman, Bradley, Vaden, Gunter & Dillon, LLP, Defendant
Officially listed as "Tim Cook"
No Logo Tim Doyle, Defendant
No Logo Tim Foley, Defendant
No Logo Tim Kaine, Defendant
No Logo Tim Lange, Defendant
No Logo Timothy Geithner, Defendant
No Logo Timothy Zindel, Defendant
No Logo Tivon Schardl, Defendant
No Logo Todd Brandon Watson, Defendant
No Logo Todd Burchett, Defendant
No Logo Todd Greeson, Defendant
No Logo Todd Hollenbach, Defendant
No Logo Tom Cochran, Defendant
No Logo Tom Daschle, Defendant
No Logo Tom Gentile, Defendant
No Logo Tom Hanson, Defendant
No Logo Tom Monson, Defendant
No Logo Tom Parker, Defendant
No Logo Tom Schweich, Defendant
No Logo Tom Tait, Defendant
No Logo Tom Whatley, Defendant
No Logo Tommy Bryan, Defendant
No Logo Tommy Hills, Defendant
No Logo Tony Axam, Defendant
No Logo Tony Miles, Defendant
No Logo Tony Rackauckas, Defendant
No Logo Torrey Brown, Defendant
No Logo Tracey C. Doi, Defendant
No Logo Trent Lott, Defendant
No Logo Trevor A. Schauenberg, Defendant
No Logo Trip Pittman, Defendant
No Logo Vanessa L. Bryant, Defendant
No Logo Vern Larson, Defendant
No Logo Vernon Ehlers, Defendant
No Logo Vickie Slater, Defendant
No Logo Victor Chavez, Defendant
No Logo Victor Gaston, Defendant
No Logo Victor J. Wolski, Defendant
No Logo Victoria C. Minor, Defendant
No Logo Vikram Pandit, Defendant
No Logo Virginia Emerson Hopkins, Defendant
No Logo Vitaly Churkin, Defendant
No Logo Vivian Davis Figures, Defendant
No Logo W. Fallon, Defendant
No Logo W. Geoffrey Beattie, Defendant
No Logo W. Gregg Spencer, Defendant
No Logo W. Snelson, Defendant
No Logo W. Steinhafel, Defendant
No Logo Walker Stapleton, Defendant
No Logo Walter J. Kucharski, Defendant
No Logo Walter L. Carpeneti, Defendant
No Logo Warren W. Eginton, Defendant
No Logo Wayne Johnson, Defendant
No Logo Wes Keller, Defendant
No Logo Wes Long, Defendant
No Logo Wesley Scott Mobley, Defendant
No Logo Whitney North Seymour, Jr, Defendant
No Logo William Bradley, Defendant
No Logo William C. Thompson, Defendant
No Logo William D. Jones, Defendant
No Logo william E. Reukauf, Defendant
No Logo William G. Holland, Defendant
No Logo William G. Pappas, Defendant
Gates, William Henry Gates, William Henry, Defendant
Officially listed as "William H,. Gates, III"
Microsoft Corporation Unknown Role, Microsoft Corporation
Unknown Role, Icos Corp / De
Unknown Role, Alpha G Inc
Unknown Role, Nbh Inc
Unknown Role, Ecolab Inc.
Unknown Role, DEERE & CO
Unknown Role, Planetout Inc.
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Gates Ventures, LLC
No Logo William H. Cary, Defendant
No Logo William H. Pryor, Jr., Defendant
No Logo William I. Garfinkel, Defendant
No Logo William J. Lynn, Defendant
No Logo William Jefferson Clinton, Defendant
No Logo William K. Suter, Defendant
No Logo William L. McElveen, Defendant
No Logo William M. Acker, Defendant
No Logo William O. Monroe, Defendant
No Logo William Thad Cochran, Defendant
No Logo William W. Chip, Defendant
No Logo Williams E. Castle, Defendant
No Logo Williams E. Castle , Defendant
No Logo Willie L. James, Defendant
No Logo Yoshiaki Fijimori, Defendant
No Logo Young Boozer, Defendant
No Logo Yvonne Kennedy, Defendant
No Logo Yvonne T. Dixon, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2254
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
Returned mail re Dkt 1 , 2 and 3 received on 10/3/11 from A. Perales. Not all documents returned were scanned as the pleadings are in the docket and contain numerous pages. (NXL, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
    JUDGMENT case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 9/21/11. (RMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 4 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER denying 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 9/21/11. (RMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
        MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Azael Dythian Perales. (Attachments: # 1 application)(TYM, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
          Civil Cover Sheet. (TYM, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
            COMPLAINT against All Defendants (), filed by Azael Dythian Perales. (Attachments: # 1 attachment 1, # 2 attachment 2, # 3 attachment 3, # 4 attachment 4, # 5 attachment 5, # 6 attachment 6)(TYM, COURT STAFF) Modified on 9/21/2011 (RMC, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/21/2011 to remove reference to filing fee paid. (RMC, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/20/2011)
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 592 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?