Feeney v. Walgreens Health Initiatives, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Alabama Northern District Court, Case No. 3:10-cv-00844
District Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 17, 2016 at 11:36 PM EDT (5.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Ashley Horton, Plaintiff
No Logo Bridget McDaniel, Plaintiff
No Logo Chris Valandingham, Plaintiff
No Logo David Charles Orr, Plaintiff
No Logo Debbie L. Sharp, Plaintiff
No Logo Emily Humphries, Plaintiff
No Logo Erica Murphy Holden, Plaintiff
No Logo Fawn Moore, Plaintiff
No Logo James M. Coffman, Plaintiff
No Logo Jeremy Green, Plaintiff
No Logo JERRY JOHNSON, Plaintiff
No Logo Jessica Fletcher, Plaintiff
No Logo Jessica H. Feeney, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Butler Liberty Law, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael L Weathers +1 256 764 1318 +1 256 764 1319 michael.l.weathers@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF SUSAN DONAHUE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan G Donahue +1 509 341 4620 sdonahue@sdonahuelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander N Gerogiannis +1 205 454 4403 alexgerogiannis@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiggins Childs Quinn & Pantazis, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin W. Jent +1 205 314 0500 +1 205 254 1500 kjent@wcqp.com
Space Gregory O. Wiggins +1 205 314 0542 +1 205 254 1500 gwiggins@wigginschilds.com
Space Robert Lee Wiggins, Jr. +1 205 314 0500 +2541 254 254 1500 rwiggins@wcqp.com
No Logo Jessica N. Smith, Plaintiff
No Logo Kenneth L Brown, Plaintiff
No Logo Kimberly Burbank, Plaintiff
No Logo Krista Hester, Plaintiff
No Logo Laura Fitterman, Plaintiff
No Logo LeAndra R. Guyton, Plaintiff
No Logo Maritta McCollum, Plaintiff
No Logo Marsha Lynn Hilliard, Plaintiff
No Logo Mary James, Plaintiff
No Logo Melissa L. Nichols, Plaintiff
No Logo Monica Vaughn, Plaintiff
No Logo Nanette Boatwright Boone, Plaintiff
No Logo Natalie Graham, Plaintiff
No Logo Nester A. Arevalo Rivas, Plaintiff
No Logo Nicole M. Francisco, Plaintiff
No Logo Nocias Ford, Plaintiff
No Logo Rachael M. Willis, Plaintiff
No Logo Sandra Goode, Plaintiff
No Logo Shanekia Murphy, Plaintiff
No Logo Shanna Myrick, Plaintiff
No Logo Tabitha Gilbert, Plaintiff
No Logo Tamika Betts, Plaintiff
No Logo Tonya Lynn Cross, Plaintiff
No Logo Veronica Taylor, Plaintiff
No Logo Wanda Davis-Willard, Plaintiff
No Logo Wendy D. Eckl-Hester, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Kelly Services Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carr, Allison, Pugh, Howard, Oliver & Sisson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bricker S Daughtry +1 205 949 2914 +1 205 822 2057 bdaughtry@carrallison.com
Space Thomas L Oliver, II +1 205 822 2006 +1 205 822 2057 toliver@carrallison.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brett Christopher Bartlett +1 404 885 1500 +1 404 892 7056 bbartlett@seyfarth.com
Space Gerald L. Maatman, Jr. +1 312 460 5000 +1 312 460 7000 gmaatman@seyfarth.com
Space Steven J Pearlman +1 312 460 5000 +1 312 460 7000 spearlman@seyfarth.com
Space BRANDON L. SPURLOCK +1 312 460 5231 +1 312 460 7965 bspurlock@seyfarth.com
No Logo Walgreens Health Initiatives, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Richard Carrigan +1 205 328 1900 +1 205 328 6000 Richard.carrigan@ogletreedeakins.com
Space Veronica L Merritt +1 205 328 1900 +1 205 328 6000 veronica.merritt@odnss.com
Space J. Trent Scofield +1 205 382 1900 +1 205 325 6000 trent.scofield@odnss.com
Space Samantha K Smith +1 205 328 1900 +1 205 328 6000 samantha.smith@odnss.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 201
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (104) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 104 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
APPROVAL ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT that the parties' joint motion for approval of their proposed settlement agreement and attorneys' fee award is GRANTED, the settlement is APPROVED, and all claims asserted by plaintiffs are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, costs are taxed as paid as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 10/17/2012. (AHI ) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER that the court GRANTS the parties joint 102 Motion for in camera review of thier confidential settlement aggreement and release as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 10/16/2012. (AHI) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 102 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
      Joint MOTION In Camera Review of Confidential Settlement Documents by Walgreens Health Initiatives, Inc.. (Smith, Samantha) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER that the Joint Motion to Stay is GRANTED and all deadlines in this case are stayed for 30 days; as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 5/18/2012. (AHI) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None
          Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines by Thirty (30) Days to Allow Parties to Engage in Settlement Discussions by Jessica H. Feeney. (Wiggins, Gregory) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None
            NOTICE by Jessica H. Feeney of Filing Consent Forms (Wendy D. Eckl-Hester, Sandra Goode, and Marsha Lynn Hilliard) (Wiggins, Gregory) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None
              NOTICE by Jessica H. Feeney of Filing Consent Form (Jenny Johnson) (Wiggins, Gregory) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None
                NOTICE by Jessica H. Feeney of Filing Consent Form (Tabitha Gilbert) (Wiggins, Gregory) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
                  NOTICE by Jessica H. Feeney of Filng Attorneys' Fees Records (Wiggins, Gregory) Modified on 4/17/2012 (AHI). (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
                    NOTICE by Jessica H. Feeney of Filing Consent Form (Natalie Graham) (Wiggins, Gregory) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                      NOTICE by Jessica H. Feeney of Filing Consent Form (Bridget McDaniel) (Wiggins, Gregory) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None
                        NOTICE by Jessica H. Feeney of Filing Consent Forms (Kenneth L. Brown and Laura Fitterman) (Wiggins, Gregory) (Entered: 04/09/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None
                          NOTICE by Jessica H. Feeney of Filing Consent Forms (Nanette Boatwright Boone and Wanda Davis-Willard) (Wiggins, Gregory) (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                            NOTICE by Jessica H. Feeney of Filing Consent Form (James M. Coffman) (Wiggins, Gregory) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None
                              NOTICE by Jessica H. Feeney of Filing Consent Form (Kimberly Burbank) (Wiggins, Gregory) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None
                                NOTICE by Jessica H. Feeney of Filing Consent Form (Shanna Myrick) (Wiggins, Gregory) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE by Jessica H. Feeney of Filing Consent Forms (Erica Murphy Holden and David Charles Orr) (Wiggins, Gregory) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE by Jessica H. Feeney of Filing Consent Forms for Tonya Lynn Cross and LeAndra R. Guyton (Wiggins, Gregory) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE by Jessica H. Feeney of Filing Consent Forms for Jeremy Green; Fawn Moore; Nestor A. Arevalo Rivas; and Chris Vanlandingham (Wiggins, Gregory) (Entered: 03/28/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE by Jessica H. Feeney of Filing Consent Forms to Become Party Plaintiffs (Deborah Humphrey and Stephanie Jackson) (Wiggins, Gregory) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha K Smith on behalf of Walgreens Health Initiatives, Inc. (Smith, Samantha) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE by Jessica H. Feeney of Filing Consent Form to Become Party Plaintiff (Jessica N. Smith) (Wiggins, Gregory) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE by Jessica H. Feeney of Filing Consent Forms to Become Party Plaintiffs (Sally Hensley and Sallie Anna Wood) (Wiggins, Gregory) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE by Jessica H. Feeney of Filing Consent Forms to Become Party Plaintiffs (Melissa L. Nichols and Shanekia Murphy) (Wiggins, Gregory) (Entered: 03/16/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE by Jessica H. Feeney of Filing Consent Forms for Tamika Betts, Jessica Fletcher, Nicole M. Francisco, Krista Hester, Ashley Horton, Maritta McCollum, Veronica Taylor and Monica Vaughn (Wiggins, Gregory) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE by Jessica H. Feeney of Filing Consent Forms to Become Party Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment-Consent Forms)(Wiggins, Gregory) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER that the Plaintiff is ORDERED to send the notice by 3/19/2012, to all current and former Representatives employed by Walgreens Health Initiatives at the Muscle Shoals call center on any date between 1/1/2009, and the present; Discovery due by 8/2/2012; Dispositive Motions due by 9/4/2012; Witenss and Exhibit Lists due by 10/1/2012; Trial ready by 11/2012; as more fully set otu in order. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 3/5/2012. (AHI) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE by Jessica H. Feeney of Filing Response to Court's February 24, 2012 Order Submitting Mutually Agreeable Notice and Consent Form (Wiggins, Gregory) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part the Joint 75 Motion to Amend the Certification Order; It is ordered that the conditional certification order entered by this court on November 22, 2011 is modified as more fully set out in this order. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 2/24/12. (SPT ) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                            Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 72 Memorandum Opinion,,, Order,,, Terminate Motions,, by Jessica H. Feeney. (Jent, Kevin) (Entered: 02/07/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE by Jessica H. Feeney of Filing Joint Proposed Notice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Parties' Joint Proposed Notice)(Jent, Kevin) (Entered: 01/04/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin W Jent on behalf of Jessica H. Feeney (Jent, Kevin) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that the Plaintiff's motion to conditionally certify a collective action class and facilitate notice is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; it is ORDERED that a class of all current and former representatives employed by Walgreens Health Initiatives at its Muscle Shoals call center between 4/5/2007 and 4/5/2010, be, and the same hereby is, conditionally certified; and the parties are ORDERED to give notice to potential class memebers in accordance with the provisions set forth therein; as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 11/22/2011. (AHI) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Alexander Gerogiannis by Jessica H. Feeney. (Gerogiannis, Alexander) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank 70 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER that the Court APPROVES the proposed settlement as a fair and reasonable settlement; all claims against Kelly Services are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; Plaintiff's Motion for Collective Action Certification is DENIED as to Kelly Services; as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 8/23/2011. (AHI) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER that the joint 68 Motion for in camera review of confidential settlement and release agreement is GRANTED, the parties may submit their settlement agreement to the court through chambers email by 8/23/2011; as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 8/17/2011. (AHI ) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          Joint MOTION for In Camera Review of Confidential Settlement and Release Agreement by Kelly Services, Inc.. (Maatman, Gerald) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE by Jessica H. Feeney of Kenneth L. Brown filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Wiggins, Gregory) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 64 MOTION to Strike 56 Evidentiary Material, to Strike 56-1 through 56-3; 56-6 through 56-10; and 60-1, 60-2 MOTION to Strike 56 Evidentiary Material, to Strike 56-1 through 56-3; 56-6 through 56-10; and 60-1, 60-2 filed by Jessica H. Feeney. (Gerogiannis, Alexander) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 57 MOTION to Facilitate Notice Opposition to [58-1] Plaintiffs' Corrected Renewed Motion with Evidence in Support filed at 63 this Date filed by Walgreens Health Initiatives, Inc.. (Carrigan, John) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION to Strike 56 Evidentiary Material, to Strike 56-1 through 56-3; 56-6 through 56-10; and 60-1, 60-2 by Walgreens Health Initiatives, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Carrigan, John) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 57 MOTION to Facilitate Notice and [58-1] - EVIDENTIARY SUBMISSION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITON TO DOC. 58-1 (CORRECTED) RENEWED MOTION TO FACILITATE NOTICE filed by Walgreens Health Initiatives, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit TAB A - Discovery responses, # 2 Exhibit Tab B - Bryan Depo, # 3 Exhibit Tab C - Thirkill Depo, # 4 Exhibit Tab D - Cofield Second Dec, # 5 Exhibit Tab E - DOL Fact Sheet)(Carrigan, John) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 57 MOTION to Facilitate Notice /Response in Opposition to Renewed Motion to Facilitate Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) filed by Kelly Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Deposition Excerpts of Bernard Groft, # 2 Exhibit B - Deposition Excerpts of Ron Walker, # 3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Johnny Deaton, # 4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Cheryl Courier, # 5 Exhibit E - Supplemental Declaration of Johnny Deaton, # 6 Exhibit F - Deposition Excerpt of Ashley Thirkill, # 7 Exhibit G - Deposition Excerpt of Tina Bryan)(Maatman, Gerald) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE by Jessica H. Feeney of Filing Attorney's Fees Records (February 15, 2011) (Wiggins, Gregory) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/16/2011. Modified on 2/16/2011 (AHI). (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          Evidentiary Material (Supplemental) in Support of Renewed Motion to Facilitate Notice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit M - Declaration of Jessica Trousdale, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit N - Declaration of Teresa Carmack)(Wiggins, Gregory) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Veronica L. Merritt by Walgreens Health Initiatives, Inc.. (Merritt, Veronica) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              CORRECT MOTION to Facilitate Notice Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Corrected Motion to Facilitate Notice Pursuant to §216(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act and Brief in Support Thereof (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Motion to Facilitate Notice and Brief)(Wiggins, Gregory) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                MOTION to Facilitate Notice by Jessica H. Feeney. (Wiggins, Gregory) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Evidentiary Material In Support of Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Facilitate Notice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Wiggins, Gregory) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE by Jessica H. Feeney of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (TERESA CARMACK) (Wiggins, Gregory) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE by Jessica H. Feeney of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (KAYLA SMITH) (Wiggins, Gregory) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 53 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding Plaintiffs' Putative Class Claims Under the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 10/27/2010. (AHI) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 52 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER that both the Motion to Facilitate Notice and the Motion for Summary Judgment are DENIED, but without prejudice; Plaintiff's Motion for further discovery is GRATNED, discovery must be completed by 1/26/2011; Plaintiff's class certification must be filed by 1/26/2011; defendants response must be filed by 2/25/2011; as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 10/27/2010. (AHI ) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE by Jessica H. Feeney of Filing Consent to Join (Ivy Renee Pride) (Wiggins, Gregory) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2010. Modified on 9/16/2010 (AHI). (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE by Jessica H. Feeney of Filing Attorney's Fees Records (August 1, 2010-September 15, 2010) (Wiggins, Gregory) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE by Jessica H. Feeney of Filing Consent Form (Jessica Trousdale) (Wiggins, Gregory) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 46 Motion to Strike as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 9/10/2010. (AHI) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to 46 MOTION to Strike 44 Response in Opposition to Motion, /KSIs Response To Plaintiffs Motion To Strike KSIs Sur-Reply In Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion To Facilitate Notice Pursuant To 216(b) Of The FLSA filed by Kelly Services, Inc. (Maatman, Gerald) Modified on 9/10/2010 (AHI). (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike 44 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Jessica H. Feeney. (Wiggins, Gregory) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Jessica H. Feeney of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Amber Campbell McFall) (Wiggins, Gregory) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 19 MOTION Facilitate Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act /Defendant Kelly Services, Inc.'s Sur-Reply In Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion To Facilitate Notice Pursuant To § 216(b) Of The FLSA filed by Kelly Services, Inc.. (Maatman, Gerald) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Jessica H. Feeney of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff - Roshonda Thompson (Wiggins, Gregory) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jessica H. Feeney. (Donahue, Susan) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Jessica H. Feeney of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Kitarya A. Love) (Wiggins, Gregory) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER that defendant's 34 Motion for leave to file a surreply is GRANTED insofar as it seeks, directly and concisely, to address the new evidence contained in the four declarations appended to plaintiff's reply; it is DENIED insofar as it seek leave to further address plaintiff's petition for discovery; The surreply shall not exceed 15 pages in length and shall not exceed the scope of the evidence as relevant to the motion to facilitate notice; the reply is due by 9/1/2010; as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 8/25/2010. (AHI, ) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Jessica H. Feeney of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff by Rhonda Nashae Lindsey (Wiggins, Gregory) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander N Gerogiannis on behalf of Jessica H. Feeney (Gerogiannis, Alexander) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition to 34 MOTION For Leave To File A Sur-Reply In Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion To Faciliate Notice Opposition and Motion to Strike Defendant Kelly Services, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by Jessica H. Feeney. (Donahue, Susan) Modified on 8/18/2010 (AHI ). (Entered: 08/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to 34 MOTION For Leave To File A Sur-Reply In Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion To Faciliate Notice filed by Walgreens Health Initiatives, Inc.. (Merritt, Veronica) Modified on 8/18/2010 (AHI). (Entered: 08/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Jessica H. Feeney Notice of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Donahue, Susan) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MOTION For Leave To File A Sur-Reply In Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion To Faciliate Notice by Kelly Services, Inc.. (Maatman, Gerald) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 19 MOTION Facilitate Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Oppositions to Plaintiff's Motion to Facilitate Notice filed by Jessica H. Feeney. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Attachment A, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Attachment B, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Attachment C, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Attachment D)(Wiggins, Gregory) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Jessica H. Feeney Notice of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Donahue, Susan) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Opposition to 28 Plaintiff's Petition For Discovery Pursuant To Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(F) filed by Kelly Services, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Deaton Declaration)(Maatman, Gerald) Modified on 8/5/2010 (AHI). (Entered: 08/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Opposition to 28 Plaintiffs Petition For Discovery Pursuant To Fed. R.Civ.P. 56(F) filed by Walgreens Health Initiatives, Inc. (Carrigan, John) Modified on 8/5/2010 (AHI ). (Entered: 08/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Replies to Defendant's Responses in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Facilitate Notice (Docs. 22 and 26) by Jessica H. Feeney. (Wiggins, Gregory) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Discovery Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(f) by Jessica H. Feeney. (Wiggins, (Entered: 07/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Jessica H. Feeney of Filing Attorney's Fees Records (July 2010) (Wiggins, Gregory) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/19/2010. Modified on 7/19/2010 (AHI). (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 19 MOTION Facilitate Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act filed by Kelly Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Johnny Deaton, # 2 Exhibit A-1, # 3 Exhibit A-2, # 4 Exhibit A-3, # 5 Exhibit A-4, # 6 Exhibit A-5, # 7 Affidavit Declaration of Cheryl Courier, # 8 Exhibit B-1, # 9 Exhibit B-2, # 10 Exhibit C, # 11 Exhibit D)(Maatman, Gerald) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM Of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Evidentiary Material by Kelly Services, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Johnny Deaton, # 2 Exhibit A-1, # 3 Exhibit A-2, # 4 Exhibit A-3, # 5 Exhibit A-4, # 6 Exhibit A-5, # 7 Affidavit Declaration of Cheryl Courier, # 8 Exhibit B-1, # 9 Exhibit B-2)(Maatman, Gerald) Modified on 7/13/2010 (AHI ). (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment by Kelly Services, Inc.. (Maatman, Gerald) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Evidentiary Material re: 22 Response in Opposition to Motion to Facilitate Notice 19 . (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Cofield, # 2 Exhibit Attach A to Dec, # 3 Exhibit Attach B to Dec, # 4 Exhibit Attach C to Dec, # 5 Exhibit Attach D to Dec, # 6 Exhibit Attach E to Dec, # 7 Exhibit Attach F to Dec)(Carrigan, John) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition to 19 MOTION Facilitate Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act filed by Walgreens Health Initiatives, Inc. (Carrigan, John) Modified on 7/12/2010 (AHI). (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time re Completion of Party Planning Meeting by Walgreens Health Initiatives, Inc.. (Carrigan, John) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 19 MOTION Facilitate Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act by Kelly Services, Inc.. (Daughtry, Bricker) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION Facilitate Notice Pursuant to Section 216(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act by Jessica H. Feeney. (Donahue, Susan) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ALND UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 6/16/2010. (AHI) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Jessica H. Feeney Notice of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Donahue, Susan) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kelly Services, Inc.. (Daughtry, Bricker) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by Kelly Services, Inc..(Daughtry, Bricker) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Jessica H. Feeney Notice of Filing Consent to Become Party Plaintiff (Donahue, Susan) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kelly Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Daughtry, Bricker) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kelly Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Daughtry, Bricker) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kelly Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Daughtry, Bricker) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kelly Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Daughtry, Bricker) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walgreens Health Initiatives, Inc.. (Carrigan, John) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by Walgreens Health Initiatives, Inc..(Carrigan, John) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Kelly Services, Inc.. (Daughtry, Bricker) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed Kelly Services, Inc. served on 4/9/2010, answer due 4/30/2010. (AHI) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed Walgreens Health Initiatives, Inc. no date given with signature.(AHI ) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered via certified mail as to Kelly Services, Inc., Walgreens Health Initiatives, Inc. (AHI) Modified on 4/7/2010 (AHI ). (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Jessica H. Feeney (AHI ) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request for service by certified mail filed by Jessica H. Feeney. (AHI ) Modified on 4/7/2010 (AHI). (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT with jury demand thereon against Kelly Services, Inc., Walgreens Health Initiatives, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number: B4601011079) filed by Jessica H. Feeney.(AHI ) Modified on 4/7/2010 (AHI ). (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 459 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?