Electronic Frontier Foundation v. Office of the Director of National Intelligence
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:07-cv-05278-SI
District Judge Susan Illston, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2017 at 4:12 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Electronic Frontier Foundation Electronic Frontier Foundation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Electronic Frontier Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marcia Clare Hofmann +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 marcia@eff.org
Space David L. Sobel +2027 979 009 x104 +1 202 797 9066 sobel@eff.org
v.
Office Of The Director Of National Intelligence Office Of The Director Of National Intelligence, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Irwin Warden +1 202 616 5084 +1 202 616 8460 andrew.warden@usdoj.gov
Office San Francisco
Filed 10/17/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County San Francisco
Terminated 3/5/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP, CLOSED, E-Filing
Flags ADRMOP,CLOSED,E-Filing
  Entries (75) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 64 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 Order on Motion for Attorney FeesCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS re [48]. Signed by Judge Susan Illston. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2008)
    LREF
    Legal Document 63 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: 5/22/2008 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER VACATING ORAL ARGUMENT re [48] plaintiff's motion for attorney's fees and costs. Signed by Judge Susan Illston. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2008)
      LREF
      Legal Document 62 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 Proposed Order
      Proposed Order re [57] Response in Support, Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for an Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 5/9/2008)
        LREF
        Legal Document 61 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 Declaration in Support
        Declaration of Thomas H. Steele in Support of [57] Response in Support, Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for an Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Related document(s)[57]) (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 5/9/2008)
          LREF
          Legal Document 60 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 Declaration in Support
          Declaration of Kurt Opsahl in Support of [57] Response in Support, Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for an Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Related document(s)[57]) (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 5/9/2008)
            LREF
            Legal Document 59 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 Declaration in Support
            Declaration of Marcia Hofmann in Support of [57] Response in Support, Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for an Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-B)(Related document(s)[57]) (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 5/9/2008)
              LREF
              Legal Document 58 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 Declaration in Support
              Declaration of David L. Sobel in Support of [57] Response in Support, Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for an Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Related document(s)[57]) (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 5/9/2008)
                LREF
                Legal Document 57 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 Response in Support
                RESPONSE in Support re [48] MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for an Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 5/9/2008)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 56 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                  Memorandum in Opposition re [48] MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for an Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs filed byOffice of the Director of National Intelligence. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit, # (5) Exhibit, # (6) Exhibit, # (7) Proposed Order)(Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 5/2/2008)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 55 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing
                  ***ERRONEOUS ATTACHMENT***CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2008 09:00 AM. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2008) Modified on 4/16/2008 (ys, COURT STAFF).
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 54 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing
                    CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing set for 5/23/2008 09:00 AM. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2008)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 set motion and R&R; deadlines/hearings
                      Set/Reset Deadlines as to [48] MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for an Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs. Motion Hearing set for 5/23/2008 09:00 AM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2008)
                        LREF
                        Blank 
                        Set/Reset Deadlines as to [48] MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for an Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs. Motion Hearing set for 5/23/2008 09:00 AM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2008)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 53 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008 Proposed Order
                          Proposed Order re [48] MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for an Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 4/11/2008)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 52 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008 Declaration in Support
                            Declaration of Jennifer Stisa Granick in Support of [48] MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for an Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Related document(s)[48]) (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 4/11/2008)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 51 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008 Declaration in Support
                              Declaration of Kurt Opsahl in Support of [48] MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for an Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Related document(s)[48]) (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 4/11/2008)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 50 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008 Declaration in Support
                                Declaration of David L. Sobel in Support of [48] MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for an Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Related document(s)[48]) (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 4/11/2008)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 49 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008 Declaration in Support
                                  Declaration of Marcia Hofmann in Support of [48] MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for an Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-F)(Related document(s)[48]) (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 4/11/2008)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 48 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008, Terminated: 6/4/2008 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                    MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for an Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 4/11/2008)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 47 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/1/2008 Stipulation
                                      STIPULATION Extending Hearing Date And Briefing Schedule For Motion For Attorney's Fees by Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 4/1/2008)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 46 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
                                        ORDER DISMISSING CASE. EFF will move for attorney's fees no later than 4/11/08. ODNI will oppose EFF's motion for attorney's fees no later than 4/25/08. EFF will reply to ODNI's opposition no later than 5/2/08. The Court will hear the motion for attorney's fees on 5/16/08. Signed by Judge Illston on 3/5/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2008)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 45 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008 Order on Motion to Relate CaseCourt Filing
                                          ORDER by Judge Illston denying [40] Motion to Relate Case (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2008)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 44 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: 3/4/2008 Stipulation
                                            STIPULATION Of Dismissal by Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 3/4/2008)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 43 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 2/28/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                              Memorandum in Opposition re [40] MOTION to Relate Case filed byOffice of the Director of National Intelligence. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 2/28/2008)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 42 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008 Telephone Conference
                                                Minute Entry: Telephone Conference (Date Filed: 2/27/2008). The Court will not sign the recently submitted stipulation re: summary judgment.Counsel will be submitting a Rule 41 dismissal.() (ts, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/27/2008)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 41 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 Stipulation
                                                  STIPULATION Re: Motion for Summary Judgment by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 2/22/2008)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 40 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008, Terminated: 3/5/2008 MOTION to Relate Case
                                                    MOTION to Relate Case 08-1023-EDL filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Marcia Hofmann, # (2) Proposed Order)(Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 2/21/2008) Modified on 2/22/2008 (ys, COURT STAFF).
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 39 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER continuing motion to 3/21/08. Signed by Judge Illston on 2/14/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2008)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 set motion and R&R; deadlines/hearings
                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines as to [36] MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 3/21/2008 09:00 AM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2008)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 
                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines as to [36] MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 3/21/2008 09:00 AM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2008)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 38 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 Stipulation
                                                            STIPULATION Re: Extension of Briefing Schedule For Motion For Summary Judgment and Proposed Order by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 37 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Brief
                                                              Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of re [36] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byOffice of the Director of National Intelligence. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit)(Related document(s)[36]) (Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 2/5/2008) Modified on 2/6/2008 (ys, COURT STAFF).
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 36 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008, Terminated: 3/5/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Office of the Director of National Intelligence. Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2008 09:00 AM. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 2/5/2008)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 35 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008 Case Management Conference - Initial
                                                                  Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 1/25/2008 before Illston (Date Filed: 1/29/2008). continued to 3/7/08 for motions () (ts, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/29/2008)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 34 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Illston on 1/25/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2008)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008 ADR Phone Conference held
                                                                      ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference conducted on 1/22/08 by HAH. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2008)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 33 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference
                                                                        ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 1/22/08 at 2:00 p.m. Please take note that plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2008)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 32 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                          JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Establishing Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule)(Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 1/16/2008)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 31 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 Order on Motion to Appear by TelephoneCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER by Judge Illston granting [30] Motion to Appear by Telephone (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2008)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 30 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008, Terminated: 1/8/2008 Motion to Appear by Telephone
                                                                              MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference filed by Office of the Director of National Intelligence. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2008 02:00 PM. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 1/7/2008)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 29 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008 Notice of need of ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3
                                                                                NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 1/4/2008)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 28 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of
                                                                                  ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 1/4/2008)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 27 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of
                                                                                    ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options (Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 1/4/2008)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 26 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 Order on Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART [6] PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Susan Illston. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2007)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 25 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 Answer
                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint byOffice of the Director of National Intelligence. (Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 11/26/2007)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 24 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                          Declaration of David L. Sobel in Support of [23] Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(Related document(s)[23]) (Sobel, David) (Filed on 11/16/2007)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 23 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007 Reply Memorandum
                                                                                            Reply Memorandum in Support of [6] Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Sobel, David) (Filed on 11/16/2007) Modified on 11/19/2007 (ys, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 22 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition re [6] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byOffice of the Director of National Intelligence. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) Exhibit # (3) Exhibit # (4) Exhibit # (5) Proposed Order)(Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 11/9/2007)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 21 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Order on Motion to Shorten TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Illston finding as moot [9] Motion to Shorten Time ; setting motion for prelim. injunction on 11/30/07 @ 9:00 a.m. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2007)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 20 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2008 02:00 PM. (Attachments: # (1)) (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2007)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                  Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2008 02:00 PM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2007)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 
                                                                                                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2008 02:00 PM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2007)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007 set motion and R&R; deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines as to [6] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2007 09:00 AM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2007)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 
                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines as to [6] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2007 09:00 AM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2007)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 19 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Stipulation
                                                                                                          STIPULATION re [9] MOTION to Shorten Time For Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 11/1/2007)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 18 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Judge Edward M. Chen no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/31/07. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2007)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007 Clerk's Notice of Impending ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2007)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 16 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting [5] Motion for Pro Hac Vice (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2007)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate JuCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 10/30/2007)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Irwin Warden (Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 10/30/2007)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                      Proposed Order re [9] MOTION to Shorten Time For Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 10/29/2007)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                        Declaration of Marcia Hofmann in Support of [9] MOTION to Shorten Time For Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction :Proof of Service Declaration filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2)(Related document(s)[9]) (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 10/29/2007)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                        Declaration of Marcia Hofmann in Support of [9] MOTION to Shorten Time For Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Related document(s)[9]) (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 10/29/2007)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re [9] MOTION to Shorten Time For Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Related document(s)[9]) (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 10/29/2007)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007, Terminated: 11/6/2007 Motion to Shorten Time
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Shorten Time For Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 10/29/2007)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                              Proposed Order re [6] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 10/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                Declaration of Marcia Hofmann in Support of [6] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-D# (2) Exhibit E-H# (3) Exhibit I# (4) Exhibit J-L# (5) Exhibit M-P)(Related document(s)[6]) (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 10/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007, Terminated: 11/27/2007 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 10/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Electronic Frontier Foundation.. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 10/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                      MOTION of David Sobel for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611011876) filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007 ADR Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                        ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 1/16/2008. Case Management Conference set for 1/23/2008 01:30 AM. (Attachments: # (1) EMC Standing Order; # (2) Case Management Standing Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (ys, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT (summons issued) against Office of the Director of National Intelligence (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611011567). Filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2007 (ys, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007 Case Referred to ECF
                                                                                                                                              CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 
                                                                                                                                                CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 181 times.

                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?