George Pappas v. Countrywide Financial Corp et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:07-cv-05295
District Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 26, 2016 at 4:07 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Barry Brahn, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodkind Labaton Rudoff & Sucharow LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan M. Plasse +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 883 7063

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Kreindler & Kreindler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gretchen M. Nelson +1 213 622 6469 +1 213 622 6019 gnelson@kreindler.com

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Represented by Lockridge Grindal Nauen, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark I Labaton +1 310 500 3540 +1 310 824 2870 mlabaton@motleyrice.com
No Logo George Pappas, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/28/2007 Barbara Jane Hart +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 883 7062

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/24/2007 Sean M. Handler, Esq. +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 ecf_filings@ktmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/11/2008 Russel N Jacobson +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 818 0477 rjacobson@labaton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/24/2007 RAMZI ABADOU +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 ramzia@lcsr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Scott + Scott, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Nicholas J Licato, Jr. +1 619 233 4565 +1 619 233 0508 nlicato@scott-scott.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Randell Scott +1 860 537 5537 +1 860 537 4432 drscott@scott-scott.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arthur L. Shingler, III +1 619 233 4565 +1 619 233 0508 ashingler@scott-scott.com
No Logo Shelley B. Katzeff, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodkind Labaton Rudoff & Sucharow LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan M. Plasse +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 883 7063

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Kreindler & Kreindler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gretchen M. Nelson +1 213 622 6469 +1 213 622 6019 gnelson@kreindler.com

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark I Labaton +1 310 500 3540 +1 310 824 2870 mlabaton@motleyrice.com
v.
No Logo Andrew Gissinger, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Marquart Crone & Hawxhurst LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/15/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Wayne Marquart +1 424 652 7800 +1 424 652 7850 jmarquart@bakermarquart.com

Represented by Crone Hawxhurst LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/19/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Blake Edward Williams +1 415 733 6000 +1 415 677 9041 bwilliams@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lloyd Winawer +1 650 752 3100 +1 650 853 1038 lwinawer@goodwinprocter.com
TERMINATED: 12/19/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle Anthony Wombolt +1 650 752 3147 +1 650 853 1038 kwombolt@goodwinprocter.com

Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

No Logo Angelo Mozilo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/17/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Pamela Kentos Graham +1 310 203 4030 +1 310 229 1285 pamela.graham@dbr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Pastuszenski +1 617 570 1094 +1 617 523 1231 BPastuszenski@goodwinprocter.com
TERMINATED: 12/18/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Blake Edward Williams +1 415 733 6000 +1 415 677 9041 bwilliams@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lloyd Winawer +1 650 752 3100 +1 650 853 1038 lwinawer@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle Anthony Wombolt +1 650 752 3147 +1 650 853 1038 kwombolt@goodwinprocter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Irell & Manella, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric J Carsten +1 310 277 1010 +1 310 203 7199 ecarsten@irell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Iian Daniel Jablon +1 310 277 1010 +1 310 203 7199 ijablon@irell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Randall Louis Jackson +1 310 203 7081 +1 310 203 7199 rjackson@irell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel P Lefler +1 310 277 1010 +1 310 203 7199 dlefler@irell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Siegel +1 310 277 1010 +1 310 203 7199 dsiegel@irell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Dean Aufhauser +1 202 434 5049 +1 202 434 5029 daufhauser@wc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven M Cady +1 202 434 5000 +1 202 434 5029 scady@wc.com
No Logo Ben Enis, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/08/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Blake Edward Williams +1 415 733 6000 +1 415 677 9041 bwilliams@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lloyd Winawer +1 650 752 3100 +1 650 853 1038 lwinawer@goodwinprocter.com
TERMINATED: 12/08/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle Anthony Wombolt +1 650 752 3147 +1 650 853 1038 kwombolt@goodwinprocter.com
No Logo Carlos M Garcia, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/16/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Blake Edward Williams +1 415 733 6000 +1 415 677 9041 bwilliams@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lloyd Winawer +1 650 752 3100 +1 650 853 1038 lwinawer@goodwinprocter.com
TERMINATED: 10/16/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle Anthony Wombolt +1 650 752 3147 +1 650 853 1038 kwombolt@goodwinprocter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/11/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith H Fichtelman +1 310 788 1517 +1 310 277 4730 kfichtelman@mwe.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L. Sanders +1 310 551 9397 +1 310 277 4730 jsanders@mwe.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Motion Picture Association of America

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/08/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa E Stone +1 818 995 6600 +1 818 285 4401 lisa_stone@mpaa.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Francisca M Mok +1 310 734 5200 +1 310 734 5299 fmok@reedsmith.com
No Logo Countrywide Capital V, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Charles Devine +1 617 570 1794 +1 617 523 1231 bdevine@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Pastuszenski +1 617 570 1094 +1 617 523 1231 BPastuszenski@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Alan Simes +1 212 813 8879 +1 212 355 3333 jsimes@goodwinprocter.com
TERMINATED: 12/18/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Blake Edward Williams +1 415 733 6000 +1 415 677 9041 bwilliams@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lloyd Winawer +1 650 752 3100 +1 650 853 1038 lwinawer@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle Anthony Wombolt +1 650 752 3147 +1 650 853 1038 kwombolt@goodwinprocter.com
Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/08/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mitchell Alan Lowenthal +1 212 225 2760 +1 212 225 3999 mlowenthal@cgsh.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Charles Devine +1 617 570 1794 +1 617 523 1231 bdevine@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Pastuszenski +1 617 570 1094 +1 617 523 1231 BPastuszenski@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Alan Simes +1 212 813 8879 +1 212 355 3333 jsimes@goodwinprocter.com
TERMINATED: 12/18/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Blake Edward Williams +1 415 733 6000 +1 415 677 9041 bwilliams@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lloyd Winawer +1 650 752 3100 +1 650 853 1038 lwinawer@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle Anthony Wombolt +1 650 752 3147 +1 650 853 1038 kwombolt@goodwinprocter.com
TERMINATED: 12/18/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Blake Edward Williams +1 415 733 6000 +1 415 677 9041 bwilliams@goodwinprocter.com
No Logo Edwin Heller, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/08/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Blake Edward Williams +1 415 733 6000 +1 415 677 9041 bwilliams@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lloyd Winawer +1 650 752 3100 +1 650 853 1038 lwinawer@goodwinprocter.com
TERMINATED: 12/08/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle Anthony Wombolt +1 650 752 3147 +1 650 853 1038 kwombolt@goodwinprocter.com
No Logo Eric P Sieracki, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shirli Fabri Weiss +1 619 699 3650 +1 619 699 2701 shirli.weiss@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Pastuszenski +1 617 570 1094 +1 617 523 1231 BPastuszenski@goodwinprocter.com
TERMINATED: 12/18/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Blake Edward Williams +1 415 733 6000 +1 415 677 9041 bwilliams@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lloyd Winawer +1 650 752 3100 +1 650 853 1038 lwinawer@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle Anthony Wombolt +1 650 752 3147 +1 650 853 1038 kwombolt@goodwinprocter.com

Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

No Logo Fenner & Smith Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan C. Dickey +1 212 351 2399 +1 212 351 6399

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean J. Kitchens +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 dkitchens@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Harley W. Snyder, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/08/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Blake Edward Williams +1 415 733 6000 +1 415 677 9041 bwilliams@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lloyd Winawer +1 650 752 3100 +1 650 853 1038 lwinawer@goodwinprocter.com
TERMINATED: 12/08/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle Anthony Wombolt +1 650 752 3147 +1 650 853 1038 kwombolt@goodwinprocter.com
No Logo Henry G. Cisneros, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/08/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Blake Edward Williams +1 415 733 6000 +1 415 677 9041 bwilliams@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lloyd Winawer +1 650 752 3100 +1 650 853 1038 lwinawer@goodwinprocter.com
TERMINATED: 12/08/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle Anthony Wombolt +1 650 752 3147 +1 650 853 1038 kwombolt@goodwinprocter.com
No Logo Jeffrey M. Cunningham, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/08/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Blake Edward Williams +1 415 733 6000 +1 415 677 9041 bwilliams@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lloyd Winawer +1 650 752 3100 +1 650 853 1038 lwinawer@goodwinprocter.com
TERMINATED: 12/08/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle Anthony Wombolt +1 650 752 3147 +1 650 853 1038 kwombolt@goodwinprocter.com
No Logo Keith P. Russell, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/08/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Blake Edward Williams +1 415 733 6000 +1 415 677 9041 bwilliams@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lloyd Winawer +1 650 752 3100 +1 650 853 1038 lwinawer@goodwinprocter.com
TERMINATED: 12/08/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle Anthony Wombolt +1 650 752 3147 +1 650 853 1038 kwombolt@goodwinprocter.com
No Logo Martin R. Melone, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/08/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Blake Edward Williams +1 415 733 6000 +1 415 677 9041 bwilliams@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lloyd Winawer +1 650 752 3100 +1 650 853 1038 lwinawer@goodwinprocter.com
TERMINATED: 12/08/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle Anthony Wombolt +1 650 752 3147 +1 650 853 1038 kwombolt@goodwinprocter.com
No Logo Oscar P. Robertson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/08/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Blake Edward Williams +1 415 733 6000 +1 415 677 9041 bwilliams@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lloyd Winawer +1 650 752 3100 +1 650 853 1038 lwinawer@goodwinprocter.com
TERMINATED: 12/08/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle Anthony Wombolt +1 650 752 3147 +1 650 853 1038 kwombolt@goodwinprocter.com
No Logo Robert J. Donato, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/08/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Blake Edward Williams +1 415 733 6000 +1 415 677 9041 bwilliams@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lloyd Winawer +1 650 752 3100 +1 650 853 1038 lwinawer@goodwinprocter.com
TERMINATED: 12/08/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle Anthony Wombolt +1 650 752 3147 +1 650 853 1038 kwombolt@goodwinprocter.com
No Logo Robert T. Parry, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/08/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Blake Edward Williams +1 415 733 6000 +1 415 677 9041 bwilliams@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lloyd Winawer +1 650 752 3100 +1 650 853 1038 lwinawer@goodwinprocter.com
TERMINATED: 12/08/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle Anthony Wombolt +1 650 752 3147 +1 650 853 1038 kwombolt@goodwinprocter.com
No Logo Stanford L. Kurland, Defendant

Represented by Caldwell Leslie & Proctor PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/18/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Blake Edward Williams +1 415 733 6000 +1 415 677 9041 bwilliams@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lloyd Winawer +1 650 752 3100 +1 650 853 1038 lwinawer@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle Anthony Wombolt +1 650 752 3147 +1 650 853 1038 kwombolt@goodwinprocter.com
No Logo A G Edwards & Sons, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan C. Dickey +1 212 351 2399 +1 212 351 6399

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/23/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Dore +1 213 229 7085 +1 213 229 6085 mdore@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean J. Kitchens +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 dkitchens@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lindsay R. Pennington +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 lpennington@gibsondunn.com
ABN AMRO Inc. ABN AMRO Inc., Consol Defendant
Officially listed as "ABN Amro Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan C. Dickey +1 212 351 2399 +1 212 351 6399

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/23/2010 Michael Dore +1 213 229 7085 +1 213 229 6085 mdore@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean J. Kitchens +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 dkitchens@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lindsay R. Pennington +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 lpennington@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Banc Of America Securities LLC, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan C. Dickey +1 212 351 2399 +1 212 351 6399

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/23/2010 Michael Dore +1 213 229 7085 +1 213 229 6085 mdore@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean J. Kitchens +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 dkitchens@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lindsay R. Pennington +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 lpennington@gibsondunn.com
Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays Capital Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan C. Dickey +1 212 351 2399 +1 212 351 6399

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/23/2010 Michael Dore +1 213 229 7085 +1 213 229 6085 mdore@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean J. Kitchens +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 dkitchens@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lindsay R. Pennington +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 lpennington@gibsondunn.com
BNP Paribas Securities Corporation BNP Paribas Securities Corporation, Consol Defendant
Officially listed as "BNP Paribas Securities Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan C. Dickey +1 212 351 2399 +1 212 351 6399

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/23/2010 Michael Dore +1 213 229 7085 +1 213 229 6085 mdore@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lindsay R. Pennington +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 lpennington@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Bny Capital Markets, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan C. Dickey +1 212 351 2399 +1 212 351 6399

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/23/2010 Michael Dore +1 213 229 7085 +1 213 229 6085 mdore@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean J. Kitchens +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 dkitchens@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lindsay R. Pennington +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 lpennington@gibsondunn.com
Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan C. Dickey +1 212 351 2399 +1 212 351 6399

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/23/2010 Michael Dore +1 213 229 7085 +1 213 229 6085 mdore@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean J. Kitchens +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 dkitchens@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lindsay R. Pennington +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 lpennington@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Countrywide Securities Corporation, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Charles Devine +1 617 570 1794 +1 617 523 1231 bdevine@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Pastuszenski +1 617 570 1094 +1 617 523 1231 BPastuszenski@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Alan Simes +1 212 813 8879 +1 212 355 3333 jsimes@goodwinprocter.com
TERMINATED: 12/18/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Blake Edward Williams +1 415 733 6000 +1 415 677 9041 bwilliams@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lloyd Winawer +1 650 752 3100 +1 650 853 1038 lwinawer@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle Anthony Wombolt +1 650 752 3147 +1 650 853 1038 kwombolt@goodwinprocter.com
No Logo David Sambol, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/18/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Blake Edward Williams +1 415 733 6000 +1 415 677 9041 bwilliams@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lloyd Winawer +1 650 752 3100 +1 650 853 1038 lwinawer@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle Anthony Wombolt +1 650 752 3147 +1 650 853 1038 kwombolt@goodwinprocter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lori Lynn Phillips +1 206 389 6075 +1 206 515 8914 lori.phillips@hellerehrman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael David Torpey +1 415 773 5700 +1 415 773 5759 mtorpey@orrick.com
Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc. Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan C. Dickey +1 212 351 2399 +1 212 351 6399

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/23/2010 Michael Dore +1 213 229 7085 +1 213 229 6085 mdore@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean J. Kitchens +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 dkitchens@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lindsay R. Pennington +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 lpennington@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Dresdner Kleinwort Wasserstein Securities Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan C. Dickey +1 212 351 2399 +1 212 351 6399

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/23/2010 Michael Dore +1 213 229 7085 +1 213 229 6085 mdore@gibsondunn.com
The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Consol Defendant
Officially listed as "Goldman, Sachs & Co."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan C. Dickey +1 212 351 2399 +1 212 351 6399

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/23/2010 Michael Dore +1 213 229 7085 +1 213 229 6085 mdore@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean J. Kitchens +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 dkitchens@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lindsay R. Pennington +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 lpennington@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Grant Thornton LLP, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven D Atlee

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott P. Glauberman +1 312 558 5600 sglauber@winston.com
No Logo Greenwich Capital Markets, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan C. Dickey +1 212 351 2399 +1 212 351 6399

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/23/2010 Michael Dore +1 213 229 7085 +1 213 229 6085 mdore@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean J. Kitchens +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 dkitchens@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lindsay R. Pennington +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 lpennington@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Gwendolyn Stewart King, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/12/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Blake Edward Williams +1 415 733 6000 +1 415 677 9041 bwilliams@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lloyd Winawer +1 650 752 3100 +1 650 853 1038 lwinawer@goodwinprocter.com
TERMINATED: 01/12/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle Anthony Wombolt +1 650 752 3147 +1 650 853 1038 kwombolt@goodwinprocter.com
HSBC Securities USA, Inc. HSBC Securities USA, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan C. Dickey +1 212 351 2399 +1 212 351 6399

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/23/2010 Michael Dore +1 213 229 7085 +1 213 229 6085 mdore@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lindsay R. Pennington +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 lpennington@gibsondunn.com
JPMorgan Securities, Inc. JPMorgan Securities, Inc., Consol Defendant
Unknown Role, CHEMICAL BANKING CORP
Unknown Role, Peloton Resources Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan C. Dickey +1 212 351 2399 +1 212 351 6399

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/23/2010 Michael Dore +1 213 229 7085 +1 213 229 6085 mdore@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean J. Kitchens +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 dkitchens@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lindsay R. Pennington +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 lpennington@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Kathleen Brown, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Bradley Morrison +1 213 687 5000 +1 213 621 5304 peter.morrison@skadden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Steven Waxman +1 213 687 5000 +1 213 687 5600 ewaxman@skadden.com
KPMG LLP KPMG LLP, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Rosenfeld +1 703 591 2225

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward S Kim +1 714 830 0615 edward.kim@bingham.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vick Law Group APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/03/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Vick +1 213 784 6225 +1 213 784 6226 scott@vicklawgroup.com
Lehman Brothers, Inc. Lehman Brothers, Inc., Consol Defendant
Unknown Role, Lehman Abs Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan C. Dickey +1 212 351 2399 +1 212 351 6399

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/23/2010 Michael Dore +1 213 229 7085 +1 213 229 6085 mdore@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean J. Kitchens +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 dkitchens@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lindsay R. Pennington +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 lpennington@gibsondunn.com
Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc. Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Consol Defendant
Officially listed as "Merrill, Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated"
Unknown Role, Cumulus Media Inc.
Unknown Role, Lodgian, Inc.
Unknown Role, Mlgpe Ltd
Merrill Lynch GP Inc. Unknown Role, Merrill Lynch GP Inc.
Unknown Role, Infospace.com, Inc.
Unknown Role, New BlackRock, Inc.
Unknown Role, NATIONSBANK CORP
Bank of America, NA Unknown Role, Bank of America, NA
Unknown Role, Gabelli Utility Fund
Unknown Role, Muniholdings Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munivest Fund II Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan C. Dickey +1 212 351 2399 +1 212 351 6399

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/23/2010 Michael Dore +1 213 229 7085 +1 213 229 6085 mdore@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean J. Kitchens +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 dkitchens@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lindsay R. Pennington +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 lpennington@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Michael E Dougherty, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Bradley Morrison +1 213 687 5000 +1 213 621 5304 peter.morrison@skadden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Steven Waxman +1 213 687 5000 +1 213 687 5600 ewaxman@skadden.com
Morgan Stanley & Company Inc. Morgan Stanley & Company Inc., Consol Defendant
Officially listed as "Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan C. Dickey +1 212 351 2399 +1 212 351 6399

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/23/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Dore +1 213 229 7085 +1 213 229 6085 mdore@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean J. Kitchens +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 dkitchens@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lindsay R. Pennington +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 lpennington@gibsondunn.com
RBC Capital Markets Corporation RBC Capital Markets Corporation, Consol Defendant
Officially listed as "RBC Capital Markets Corp."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan C. Dickey +1 212 351 2399 +1 212 351 6399

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/23/2010 Michael Dore +1 213 229 7085 +1 213 229 6085 mdore@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean J. Kitchens +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 dkitchens@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lindsay R. Pennington +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 lpennington@gibsondunn.com
RBC Dain Rauscher Inc RBC Dain Rauscher Inc, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan C. Dickey +1 212 351 2399 +1 212 351 6399

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/23/2010 Michael Dore +1 213 229 7085 +1 213 229 6085 mdore@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean J. Kitchens +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 dkitchens@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lindsay R. Pennington +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 lpennington@gibsondunn.com
RBC Dominion Securities, Inc. RBC Dominion Securities, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan C. Dickey +1 212 351 2399 +1 212 351 6399

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/23/2010 Michael Dore +1 213 229 7085 +1 213 229 6085 mdore@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean J. Kitchens +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 dkitchens@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lindsay R. Pennington +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 lpennington@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Scotia Capital Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan C. Dickey +1 212 351 2399 +1 212 351 6399

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/23/2010 Michael Dore +1 213 229 7085 +1 213 229 6085 mdore@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lindsay R. Pennington +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 lpennington@gibsondunn.com
SG Americas Securities, LLC SG Americas Securities, LLC, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan C. Dickey +1 212 351 2399 +1 212 351 6399

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/23/2010 Michael Dore +1 213 229 7085 +1 213 229 6085 mdore@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Td Securities Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan C. Dickey +1 212 351 2399 +1 212 351 6399

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/23/2010 Michael Dore +1 213 229 7085 +1 213 229 6085 mdore@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lindsay R. Pennington +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 lpennington@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Thomas K McLaughlin, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brobeck, Phleger & Harrison LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William F Sullivan +1 858 720 2500 +1 858 720 2500 wmfsullivan@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/12/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Blake Edward Williams +1 415 733 6000 +1 415 677 9041 bwilliams@goodwinprocter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lloyd Winawer +1 650 752 3100 +1 650 853 1038 lwinawer@goodwinprocter.com
TERMINATED: 11/12/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle Anthony Wombolt +1 650 752 3147 +1 650 853 1038 kwombolt@goodwinprocter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua G Hamilton +1 213 683 6000 +1 213 627 0705 joshuahamilton@paulhastings.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eleanor K Mercado +1 213 683 6000 +1 213 627 0705 eleanormercado@paulhastings.com
UBS Securities LLC UBS Securities LLC, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan C. Dickey +1 212 351 2399 +1 212 351 6399

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/23/2010 Michael Dore +1 213 229 7085 +1 213 229 6085 mdore@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean J. Kitchens +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 dkitchens@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lindsay R. Pennington +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 lpennington@gibsondunn.com
Wachovia Corporation Wachovia Corporation, Consol Defendant
Officially listed as "Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan C. Dickey +1 212 351 2399 +1 212 351 6399

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/23/2010 Michael Dore +1 213 229 7085 +1 213 229 6085 mdore@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean J. Kitchens +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 dkitchens@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lindsay R. Pennington +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 lpennington@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Wachovia Securities, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan C. Dickey +1 212 351 2399 +1 212 351 6399

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/23/2010 Michael Dore +1 213 229 7085 +1 213 229 6085 mdore@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean J. Kitchens +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 dkitchens@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lindsay R. Pennington +1 213 229 7416 +1 213 229 6416 lpennington@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Andre Cowley, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ANDRE COWLEY
No Logo Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Fire & Police Pension Association of Colorado, Movant

Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Bank of America Corporation Bank of America Corporation, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/20/2009 David I Hurwitz +1 213 430 6000 +1 213 430 6407 dhurwitz@omm.com
No Logo BILLY DRIGGERS, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Billy Driggers
No Logo Commonwealth of Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Trust Fund and SEIU Plans Master Trust, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Arthur Binkow +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 info@glancylaw.com
No Logo Dr Marshall J Orloff Ira RO FCC as Custodian AllianceBernstein US Focs Blnd, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Darrell Palmer +1 619 231 0303 +1 619 231 4755 darrell.palmer@cox.net
No Logo Dr Marshall J Orloff Ira RO FCC as Custodian Gates Core Plus Fixed Income, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Darrell Palmer +1 619 231 0303 +1 619 231 4755 darrell.palmer@cox.net
No Logo Isong Akpan, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Isong Akpan
No Logo Jonathan Lee Riches, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by 7950 Jones Branch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Lee Riches, r +1 843 387 9400
No Logo Larry Norris, Movant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Larry Norris
No Logo Major Spaulding, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MAJOR SPAULDING
No Logo MARIO ALVARADO, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mario Alvarado
No Logo Mario Logozzo, Movant

Represented by Schubert Jonckheer & Kolbe LLP

No Logo Orloff Fam Tr Uad 12-13-01, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Darrell Palmer +1 619 231 0303 +1 619 231 4755 darrell.palmer@cox.net
No Logo Patrick J Simpson, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick J. Simpson +1 503 727 2035
No Logo Ralph Rogers, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ralph Rogers
No Logo Byron B Matthews, Jr, Objector

Toggle Switch Represented by Byron B Matthews, Jr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Byron B Matthews, Jr +1 212 352 0503
No Logo Independent Fiduciary Services, Inc., Objector

Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

No Logo SRM Global Limited Fund Partnership, Objector

Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

No Logo The Bank of America 401(k) Plan for Legacy Companies, Objector

Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

No Logo Vincent Alvidres, Objector

Toggle Switch Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cari Campen Laufenberg +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 claufenberg@kellerrohrback.com
No Logo Robert L Garber, Third Party Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth P. Lin +1 859 793 0070 elizabethl@blbglaw.com
No Logo Thomas P DiNapoli, Consol Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/19/2010, PRO HAC VICE Ann Elizabeth Gittleman +1 212 946 9329 +1 212 656 1038 agittleman@yahoo.com
TERMINATED: 11/28/2007 Barbara Jane Hart +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 883 7062

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodkind Labaton Rudoff & Sucharow LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan M. Plasse +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 883 7063

Toggle Switch Represented by Hennigan Bennett & Dorman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk D Dillman +1 213 694 1200 +1 213 694 1234 KDillman@McKoolSmithHennigan.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Michael Hennigan +1 213 694 1200 +1 213 694 1234 HenniganJ@hbdlawyers.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael H Swartz +1 213 694 1200 +1 213 694 1234 mswartz@mckoolsmithhennigan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kreindler & Kreindler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gretchen M. Nelson +1 213 622 6469 +1 213 622 6019 gnelson@kreindler.com

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Represented by Lockridge Grindal Nauen, LLP

Represented by Locks Law Firm, LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark I Labaton +1 310 500 3540 +1 310 824 2870 mlabaton@motleyrice.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (1178) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1174 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Declaration
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1173 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1173 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER AMENDING PLAN FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND IN VIEW OF SETTLEMENT WITH COUNTRYWIDE 401(k) PLAN by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer, re MOTION for Disbursement of Funds 1161 . See order for details. (jy) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1172 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Telephone Conference,, 1171 . MINUTE ORDER 1171 IS A DUPLICATE DOCKET. DOCKET 1171 WAS ERRONEOUSLY DOCKETED AND THEREFORE, PLEASE DISREGARD. (shb) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1171 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Telephone Conference
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1171 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
            MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC HEARING RE: PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO AMENDPLAN FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND IN VIEW OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT WITH COUNTRYWIDE 401(k) PLAN (dkt #1161). Telephone Conference held before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer: The case is called and appearances are made. Court and counsel discuss the motion to amend plan for final distribution of net settlement fund (dkt # 1161). The Court GRANTS the motion and signs the order. Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle. (shb) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1170 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Disbursement of funds
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1170 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer: The case is called and appearances are made. Court and counsel discuss the motion to amend plan for final distribution of net settlement fund (dkt # 1161 ). The Court GRANTS the motion and signs the order.Court Reporter: Deborah Gackle. (jy) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1169 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None
                  Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney James A Meyers counsel for Defendant David Sambol. James A. Meyers is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant James A. Meyers. (Meyers, James) (Entered: 04/10/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1168 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                    SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer re: MOTION for Disbursement of Funds 1161 . Telephone Conference set for 4/8/2015 at 1:30 PM before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. Please dial the telephone number below during the reservation date and time. Call-in Number: 213-894-0800. Please follow the prompts and enter the codes below. Meeting ID: 7002# User Password: 3427#. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jy) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/03/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1167 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None Statement
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1166 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None Mail Returned
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1166 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None
                          Mail Returned addressed to Arthur L Shingler re USCA Order, 1158 (kss) (Entered: 02/24/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1165 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None
                            Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David A Priebe counsel for Defendant Eric P Sieracki. Nicolas Morgan is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Eric P. Sieracki. (Priebe, David) (Entered: 02/24/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1164 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1163 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Declaration (Motion related)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1162 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1161 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Disbursement of funds
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1160 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None
                                      Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney John Warren Rissier counsel for Consol Defendant KPMG LLP. Gwyn Donna Quillen is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant KPMG LLP. (Rissier, John) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1159 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None
                                        Notice of Electronic Filing re USCA Order 1158 e-mailed to Gwyn Donna Quillen at gwyn.quillen@bingham.com bounced due to invalid email. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/06/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1158 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None
                                          ORDER from 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 1153 filed by The Bank of America 401(k) Plan for Legacy Companies CCA # 14-55518. The Appeal is dismissed. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. Order received in this district on 12/29/14. [See document for all the details] (mat) (Entered: 01/02/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1157 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                            Notice of Electronic Filing re Transcript Designation and Ordering Form (G-120) 1156 e-mailed to Attorney Jane H Bu at janebu@ymail.com bounced due to invalid recipient. Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to janebu@ymail.com. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1156 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 1153 , as to Plaintiff and Objector The Bank of America 401(k) Plan for Legacy Companies Court Reporter. Court will contact Chris C. Scheithauer at cscheithauer@mwe.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Other: 08-02-2010 by Margaret Babykin; 02/25/2011 by Leandra Amber; 02/24/2014 by Miranda Algorri. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Scheithauer, Christopher) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1155 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                Mail Returned addressed to Kyle A. Wombolt, Goodwin Procter LLP, re Amended Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Proposed Plan for Final Distribution of Net Settlement Fund and Denying the Plan's Motion to Approve Claims Based on S-8 Stock and Unitized Interests 1140 . (gk) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1154 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                  NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 14-55518, 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 1153 (car) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1153 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Plaintiff Class Member and Objector The Bank of America 401(k) Plan for Legacy Companies. Appeal of Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds,,, 1138 , Order,,,,,, 1139 , Order,,,,,,, 1140 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0973-13588565 paid.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Scheithauer, Christopher) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1152 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                      Mail Returned addressed to Arthur L. Shingler, Scott and Scott LLP, re Order Approving Plan for Final Disbursement of Net Settlement Funds 1138 . (gk) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1151 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                        Mail Returned addressed to Arthur L. Shingler, Scott and Scott LLP, re Order 1140 . (gk) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1150 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                          Mail Returned addressed to Larry Norris re Civil Minutes of Motion Hearing 1137 . (gk) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1149 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                            Mail Returned addressed to Jonathan Lee Riches re Civil Minutes of Motion Hearing 1137 . (gk) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1148 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                              Mail Returned addressed to Ralph Rogers re Civil Minutes of Motion Hearing 1137 . (gk) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1147 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                Mail Returned addressed to Arthur L. Singler, Scott and Scott LLP, re Civil Minutes of Motion Hearing 1137 . (gk) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1146 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  Mail Returned addressed to MAJOR SPAULDING re Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice 1125 . (rne) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1145 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    Mail Returned addressed to JONATHAN LEE RICHES re Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice 1125 . (rne) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1144 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      Mail Returned addressed to LARRY NORRIS re Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice 1125 (rne) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1143 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        Mail Returned addressed to RALPH ROGERS re Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice 1125 (rne) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1142 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          Mail Returned addressed to KYLE A WOMBOLT re Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice 1125 . (rne) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1141 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            Mail Returned addressed to ARTHUR L SHINGLER III re Notice of Filing Transcript 1135 . (rne) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1140 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PROPOSED PLAN FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND AND DENYING THE PLAN'S MOTION TO APPROVE CLAIMS BASED ON S-8 STOCK AND UNITIZED INTERESTS 1139 by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer: The 401(k) Savings & Investment Plan's motion to approve the claims of the Plan and Plan participants with respect to shares acquired directly from CFC pursuant to an S-8 registration statement and through cross-trades with other Plan participants is DENI ED. The 401(k) Plan shall be eligible to participate in the Net Settlement Fund only to the extent that the Plan itself, at the "trust" level, purchased shares of Countrywide common stock in the open market during the Class Period. Shares of stock acquired by 401(k) Plan participants directly from Countrywide or through intra-Plan trades during the Class Period are not included in the Common Stock Subclass because they were not purchased in the open market during the Class Period. The Court further concludes that such shares of stock acquired by 401(k) Plan participants directly from Countrywide or through intra-Plan trades should not be treated the same as common stock purchased in the open market. Accordingly, transactions in sh ares of stock issued pursuant or traceable to Countrywide's 5/11/2007 Form S-8 registration statement, and transactions in unitized interests in the Company Stuck Fund by the 401(k) Plan participants, are ineligible and noncompensable under the terms of the Settlement and the Plan of Allocation of the Net Settlement Fund. Plaintiff's motion for approval of the proposed plan for final distribution of the Net Settlement Fund 1111 is GRANTED. This amended order contains an addition to footnote four. No other revisions have been made. (gk) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1139 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PROPOSED PLAN FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND AND DENYING THE PLAN'S MOTION TO APPROVE CLAIMS BASED ON S-8 STOCK AND UNITIZED INTERESTS by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer: The 401(k) Savings & Investment Plan's motion to approve the claims of the Plan and Plan participants with respect to shares acquired directly from CFC pursuant to an S-8 registration statement and through cross-trades with other Plan participants is DENIED. The 401(k) Plan shall be eligible to participate in the Net Settlement Fund only to the extent that the Plan itself, at the "trust" level, purchased shares of Countrywide common stock in the open market during the Class Period. Shares of stock acquired by 401(k) Plan participants directly from Countrywide or through intra-Plan trades during the Class Period are not included in the Common Stock Subclass because they were not purchased in the open market during the Class Period. The Court further concludes that such shares of stock acquired by 401(k) Plan participants directly from Countrywide or through intra-Plan trades should not be treated the same as common stock purchased in the open market. Accordingly, transactions in shares of stock issued pursuant or traceable to Countrywide's 5/11/2007 Form S-8 registration statement, and transactions in unitized interests in the Company Stuck Fund by the 401(k) Plan participants, are ineligible and noncompensable under the terms of the Settlement and the Plan of Allocation of the Net Settlement Fund. Plaintiff's motion for approval of the proposed plan for final distribution of the Net Settlement Fund 1111 is GRANTED. (gk) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1138 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER APPROVING PLAN FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that: Plaintiff's Motion 1111 is granted in its entirety, and the Court approves the administrative determinations of the Claims Administrator accepting and rejecting the Claims Held in Abeyance, including the Proofs of Claim submitted by the 401(k) Plan. The plan for final distribution of the Net Settlement Fund set forth in the Declaration of Eric S. Schachter of Rust Consulting, Inc. Regarding Final Distribution Plan, filed on 11/25/2013, is approved. Court-authorized Claims Administrator, Rust Consulting, Inc., shall be paid its outstanding fees and expenses incurred after the entry of the Initial Distribution Order and in connection with carrying out the second distribution, in the total amount of $270,379.68. See document for details. (gk) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1137 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer RE: Plaintiffs New York Funds' Motion for Approval of Proposed Plan for Final Disbursement of Net Settlement Fund 1111 . The Court hears from counsel. Plaintiffs shall submit a proposed revised order approving plan for final distribution of net settlement fund for the Court's review. Memorandum of decision and order to follow. Court Reporter: Miranda Algorri. (gk) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1136 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE OF LODGING filed PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING OF PROPOSED REVISED ORDER APPROVING PLAN FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND re MOTION for Disbursement of Funds NOTICE OF MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS FOR APPROVAL OF PROPOSED PLAN FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND 1111 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Revised Order Approving Plan for Final Distribution of Net Settlement Fund, # 2 Exhibit B - Redline between Proposed Revised Order and the Proposed Order originally submitted to the Court on this motion (ECF No. 1111-1))(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1135 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 02-24-2014; 11:07 A.M. re Transcript 1134 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Algorri, Miranda) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1134 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 02-24-2014;; 11:07 A.M.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Miranda Algorri, phone number/email mirandaalgorri@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/21/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/31/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/29/2014. (Algorri, Miranda) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1133 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            Mail Returned addressed to JONATHAN LEE RICHES re Order, Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines 1123 . (rne) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1132 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              Mail Returned addressed to RALPH ROGERS re Order, Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines 1123 . (rne) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1131 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                Mail Returned addressed to ISONG AKPAN re Order, Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines 1123 . (rne) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1130 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Mail Returned addressed to KYLE A WOMBOLT re Order, Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines 1123 . (rne) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1129 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Mail Returned addressed to LARRY NORRIS re Order, Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines 1123 . (rne) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1128 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Mail Returned addressed to Major Spaulding re Order Extending Plaintiffs' Time to File Reply Submissions 1123 . (gk) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1127 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Disbursement of Funds NOTICE OF MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS FOR APPROVAL OF PROPOSED PLAN FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND 1111 filed by Plaintiff Barry Brahn, Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration REPLY DECLARATION OF ERIC S. SCHACHTER OF RUST CONSULTING, INC. REGARDING FINAL DISTRIBUTION PLAN)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1126 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Lori S Brody counsel for Plaintiff Barry Brahn. Lori Sambol Brody is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Barry Brahn. (Brody, Lori) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1125 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer: granting 1124 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Nicole M. Zeiss on behalf of Lead Plaintiffs New York Funds, designating Michael Swartz as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1124 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                              APPLICATION for attorney Nicole M. Zeiss to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13234460 paid.) filed by Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Swartz, Michael) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1123 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER EXTENDING PLAINTIFFS' TIME TO FILE REPLY SUBMISSIONS IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND AND RESCHEDULING HEARING NOTICED FOR 2/3/2014 by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer: Upon Stipulation 1122 , THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS the hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Proposed Plan for Final Distribution of Net Settlement Fund 1111 shall proceed on 2/24/2014 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. Plaintiffs shall file reply submissions in further support of the Final Distribution Motion no later than 1/24/2014. (gk) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1122 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  STIPULATION for Order EXTENDING PLAINTIFFS TIME TO FILE REPLY SUBMISSIONS IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND AND RESCHEDULING HEARING NOTICED FOR FEBRUARY 3, 2014 filed by Plaintiffs Barry Brahn, Thomas P DiNapoli. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1121 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Certificate of Service filed by Objector The Bank of America 401(k) Plan for Legacy Companies re: Declaration (Motion related),, 1120 , Declaration (Motion related), 1118 , Declaration (Motion related),,, 1117 , Declaration (Motion related), 1119 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion,, 1116 (Scheithauer, Christopher) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1120 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Thomas Hortenstine In Opposition To MOTION for Disbursement of Funds NOTICE OF MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS FOR APPROVAL OF PROPOSED PLAN FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND 1111 (DECLARATION OF THOMAS HORTENSTINE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PROPOSED PLAN FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND) filed by Objector The Bank of America 401(k) Plan for Legacy Companies. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Scheithauer, Christopher) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1119 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of John J. Nestico In Opposition To MOTION for Disbursement of Funds NOTICE OF MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS FOR APPROVAL OF PROPOSED PLAN FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND 1111 (DECLARATION OF JOHN J. NESTICO IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PROPOSED PLAN FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND) filed by Objector The Bank of America 401(k) Plan for Legacy Companies. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Scheithauer, Christopher) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1118 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Nancy G. Ross In Opposition To MOTION for Disbursement of Funds NOTICE OF MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS FOR APPROVAL OF PROPOSED PLAN FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND 1111 (DECLARATION OF NANCY G. ROSS IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PROPOSED PLAN FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND) filed by Objector The Bank of America 401(k) Plan for Legacy Companies. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Scheithauer, Christopher) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1117 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Chris C. Scheithauer In Opposition To MOTION for Disbursement of Funds NOTICE OF MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS FOR APPROVAL OF PROPOSED PLAN FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND 1111 (DECLARATION OF CHRIS C. SCHEITHAUER IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PROPOSED PLAN FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND) filed by Objector The Bank of America 401(k) Plan for Legacy Companies. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21)(Scheithauer, Christopher) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1116 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Disbursement of Funds NOTICE OF MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS FOR APPROVAL OF PROPOSED PLAN FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND 1111 (OPPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF CLASS MEMBER AND OBJECTOR THE BANK OF AMERICA 401(K) PLAN, AS A SUCCESSOR TO THE COUNTRYWIDE FINANCIAL CORPORATION 401(K) SAVINGS AND INVESTMENT PLAN TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PROPOSED PLAN FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND) filed by Objector The Bank of America 401(k) Plan for Legacy Companies. (Scheithauer, Christopher) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1115 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION for Disbursement of Funds NOTICE OF MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS FOR APPROVAL OF PROPOSED PLAN FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND 1111 PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF REQUEST AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PROPOSED PLAN FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND filed by PLAINTIFFS Barry Brahn, Thomas P DiNapoli. (Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1114 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of ERIC S. SCHACHTER OF RUST CONSULTING, INC. REGARDING FINAL DISTRIBUTION PLAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Disbursement of Funds NOTICE OF MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS FOR APPROVAL OF PROPOSED PLAN FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND 1111 filed by Plaintiff Barry Brahn, Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A THRU E)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1113 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of DAVID J. GOLDSMITH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Disbursement of Funds NOTICE OF MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS FOR APPROVAL OF PROPOSED PLAN FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND 1111 filed by Plaintiff Barry Brahn, Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1112 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Disbursement of Funds NOTICE OF MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS FOR APPROVAL OF PROPOSED PLAN FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND 1111 filed by Plaintiff Barry Brahn, Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1111 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Disbursement of Funds NOTICE OF MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS FOR APPROVAL OF PROPOSED PLAN FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND filed by Plaintiffs Barry Brahn, Thomas P DiNapoli. Motion set for hearing on 2/3/2014 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER APPROVING PLAN FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1110 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Mail Returned addressed to Larry Norris re USCA Mandate 1104 (pso) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Mail Returned addressed to Patrick Simpson re USCA Mandate 1104 (im) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1108 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Mail Returned addressed to Major Spaulding re USCA Mandate 1104 . (gk) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1107 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Mail Returned addressed to Isong Akpan re USCA Mandate 1104 . (gk) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1106 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Mail Returned addressed to Ralph Rogers re USCA Mandate 1104 . (gk) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1105 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Mail Returned addressed to Jonathan Lee Riches re USCA Mandate 1104 . (gk) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1104 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MANDATE of 9th CCA filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 1065 CCA # 11-55570. The decision of the district court is affirmed. Mandate received in this district on 6/20/2013. (dmap) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1103 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Barry Brahn, Thomas P DiNapoli, re Status Report 1102 served on 02/12/2013. (Goldsmith, David) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1102 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT regarding setting of hearing in Ninth Circuit of the Countrywide 401(k) plan's appeal of this court's plan of allocation order filed by Plaintiff Barry Brahn, Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Goldsmith, David) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1101 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Electronic Filing re Motion Hearing, Link Motions to Minutes,, 1100 e-mailed to Joshua Crowell bounced due to invalid e-mail address. Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to jcrowell@glancylaw.com. Pursuant to the General Order and Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1100 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. The case is called and appearances are made. Court and counsel discuss the motion to approve net settlement fund and allow payment of claims, administrators fees and expenses (doc # 1090). The Court approve the motion and signs the order. The Court approves destructions of documents after three years. The parties are ordered to keep the court appraised on the appeal process. 1090 Court Reporter: Wil Wilcox. (cs) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1099 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Mail Returned Undeliverable addressed to Ralph Rogers re Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds 1097 . (jp) (Entered: 12/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1098 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Mail Returned Undeliverable addressed to Jonathan Lee Riches re Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds 1097 . (jp) (Entered: 12/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1097 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER APPROVING ADMINISTRATIVE DETERMINATIONS OF PROOFS OF CLAIM, AUTHORIZING INITIAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND, AND ALLOWING PAYMENT OF CLAIMS ADMINISTRATOR'S FEES AND EXPENSES by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that: The renewed motion 1090 is granted in its entirety, and the Court approves the administrative determinations of the Claims Administrator accepting and rejecting Proofs of Claim submitted in connection with the Settlement. The Net Settlement Fund established by the Settlement of this Action shall be distributed to the Authorized Claimants listed in Exhibits N and O to the Declaration of Eric J. Miller of Rust Consulting, Inc. Regarding Processing of Claim Forms and Calculation of Authorized Claimants' Recognized Claims, dated 10/5/2012. Otherwise eligible Proofs of Claim that were submitted after the 4/26/2011 extended postmark deadline but received on or before 9/30/2012 are hereby deemed timely and shall be included in the distribution. Proofs of Claim rejected or otherwise found to be ineligible by the Claims Administrator are hereby rejected. A $30 million reserve shall be withheld from the initial distribution of the Net Settlement Fund. Rust shall be paid its outstanding fees and expenses in connection with the services performed and to be performed in administering the Settlement and distributing the Net Settlement Fund, in the total amount of $2,272,639.62. See document for details. (gk) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1096 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Brian E Pastuszenski counsel for Defendants Countrywide Capital V, Countrywide Financial Corp, Countrywide Home Loans Inc., Stanford L. Kurland, Angelo Mozilo, David Sambol, Eric P Sieracki.Stacey B. Ardini f/k/a Stacey S. Baron is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendants Countrywide Financial Corp., Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Countrywide Capital V, Angelo Mozilo, Eric P. Sieracki, David Sambol and Stanford L. Kurland (Pastuszenski, Brian) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1095 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Electronic Filing re Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 1093 , Memorandum in Support of Motion, 1091 , Renewed MOTION for Disbursement of Funds NOTICE OF RENEWED MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS TO APPROVE ADMINISTRATIVE DETERMINATIONS OF PROOFS OF CLAIM, AUTHORIZE INITIAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND, AND ALLOW PAYMENT OF CLAIMS ADMINISTRATORS FEES AND EXPEN 1090 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents), Proof of Service (subsequent documents), Proof of Service (subsequent documents) 1094 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 1092 e-mailed to sbaron@goodwinprocter.com bounced due to 550 5.1.1 RESOLVER.ADR.RecipNotFound; not found. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to the General Order and Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(tyw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1094 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Barry Brahn, Thomas P DiNapoli, re Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 1093 , Memorandum in Support of Motion, 1091 , Renewed MOTION for Disbursement of Funds NOTICE OF RENEWED MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS TO APPROVE ADMINISTRATIVE DETERMINATIONS OF PROOFS OF CLAIM, AUTHORIZE INITIAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND, AND ALLOW PAYMENT OF CLAIMS ADMINISTRATORS FEES AND EXPEN 1090 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 1092 served on 10/9/12. (Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1093 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of ERIC J. MILLER OF RUST CONSULTING, INC. REGARDING PROCESSING OF CLAIM FORMS AND CALCULATION OF AUTHORIZED CLAIMANTS RECOGNIZED CLAIMS Renewed MOTION for Disbursement of Funds NOTICE OF RENEWED MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS TO APPROVE ADMINISTRATIVE DETERMINATIONS OF PROOFS OF CLAIM, AUTHORIZE INITIAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND, AND ALLOW PAYMENT OF CLAIMS ADMINISTRATORS FEES AND EXPEN 1090 filed by Plaintiff Barry Brahn, Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1092 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of DAVID J. GOLDSMITH IN SUPPORT OF Renewed MOTION for Disbursement of Funds NOTICE OF RENEWED MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS TO APPROVE ADMINISTRATIVE DETERMINATIONS OF PROOFS OF CLAIM, AUTHORIZE INITIAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND, AND ALLOW PAYMENT OF CLAIMS ADMINISTRATORS FEES AND EXPEN 1090 filed by Plaintiff Barry Brahn, Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1091 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support of Renewed MOTION for Disbursement of Funds NOTICE OF RENEWED MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS TO APPROVE ADMINISTRATIVE DETERMINATIONS OF PROOFS OF CLAIM, AUTHORIZE INITIAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND, AND ALLOW PAYMENT OF CLAIMS ADMINISTRATORS FEES AND EXPEN 1090 filed by Plaintiffs Barry Brahn, Shelley B. Katzeff, Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1090 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND Renewed MOTION for Disbursement of Funds NOTICE OF RENEWED MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS TO APPROVE ADMINISTRATIVE DETERMINATIONS OF PROOFS OF CLAIM, AUTHORIZE INITIAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND, AND ALLOW PAYMENT OF CLAIMS ADMINISTRATORS FEES AND EXPENSES filed by Plaintiffs Barry Brahn, Thomas P DiNapoli, Shelley B. Katzeff. Motion set for hearing on 11/9/2012 at 01:30 PM before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1089 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer: 1. Plaintiffs Motion to Approve Administrative Determinations of Proofs of Claim, Authorize Initial Distribution of Net Settlement Fund, and Allow Payment of Claims Administrators Fees and Expenses (the SettlementDistribution Motion, ECF Nos. 1072-1076 and 1082-1084), is withdrawnwithout prejudice to renewal. 2. The hearing on the Settlement Distribution Motion, currentlyscheduled to proceed on August 14, 2012 at 1:30 p.m., is taken off calendar.3. Plaintiffs shall file a renewed Settlement Distribution Motion at theearliest practicable time. 1072 \ (pj) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1088 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Barry Brahn, Thomas P DiNapoli, re Stipulation to Withdraw Motion/Application/Request/Ex Parte Application,, 1087 served on 8/10/12. (Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1087 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION to Withdraw Motion MOTION for Disbursement of Funds NOTICE OF MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS TO APPROVE ADMINISTRATIVE DETERMINATIONS OF PROOFS OF CLAIM, AUTHORIZE INITIAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND, AND ALLOW PAYMENT OF CLAIMS ADMINISTRATORS FEES AND EXPENSES 1072 filed by Plaintiffs Barry Brahn, Thomas P DiNapoli. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order WITHDRAWING PLAINTIFFS SETTLEMENT DISTRIBUTION MOTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO RENEWAL AND TAKING AUGUST 14, 2012 MOTION HEARING OFF CALENDAR)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1086 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Lori S Brody counsel for Plaintiff Barry Brahn. Lori Sambol Brody will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Lori Sambol Brody is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Barry Brahn (Brody, Lori) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1085 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Electronic Filing re Proof of Service (subsequent documents), Proof of Service (subsequent documents) 1084 , Supplement(Motion related), Supplement(Motion related), Supplement(Motion related) 1082 e-mailed to mimiyang@mofo.com bounced due to 550 5.7.1 RESOLVER.RST.NotAuthorized; not authorized. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to the General Order and Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(tyw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1084 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Barry Brahn, Thomas P DiNapoli, re Supplement(Motion related), Supplement(Motion related), Supplement(Motion related) 1083 , Supplement(Motion related), Supplement(Motion related), Supplement(Motion related) 1082 served on 8/3/2012. (Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1083 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Disbursement of Funds NOTICE OF MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS TO APPROVE ADMINISTRATIVE DETERMINATIONS OF PROOFS OF CLAIM, AUTHORIZE INITIAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND, AND ALLOW PAYMENT OF CLAIMS ADMINISTRATORS FEES AND EXPENSES 1072 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ERIC J. MILLER OF RUST CONSULTING, INC. REGARDING ADDITIONAL DISPUTED CLAIM filed by Plaintiff Barry Brahn, Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit S, # 2 Exhibit T, # 3 Exhibit U)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1082 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Disbursement of Funds NOTICE OF MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS TO APPROVE ADMINISTRATIVE DETERMINATIONS OF PROOFS OF CLAIM, AUTHORIZE INITIAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND, AND ALLOW PAYMENT OF CLAIMS ADMINISTRATORS FEES AND EXPENSES 1072 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO APPROVE ADMINISTRATIVE DETERMINATIONS OF PROOFS OF CLAIM, AUTHORIZE INITIAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND, AND ALLOW PAYMENT OF CLAIMS ADMINISTRATORS FEES AND EXPENSES filed by Plaintiff Barry Brahn, Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1081 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney David J Goldsmith counsel for Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli.Mike Markunas is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Thomas DiNapoli (Goldsmith, David) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1080 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney David J Goldsmith counsel for Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli.Lloyd Donders is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Thomas DiNapoli (Goldsmith, David) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1079 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Electronic Filing re Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail,,,, 1078 e-mailed to ldonders@labaton.com, mmarkunas@labaton.com and lcantor@labaton.com bounced due to users does not exist. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to the General Order and Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(tyw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1078 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Electronic Filing re Memorandum in Support of Motion, 1073 , MOTION for Disbursement of Funds NOTICE OF MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS TO APPROVE ADMINISTRATIVE DETERMINATIONS OF PROOFS OF CLAIM, AUTHORIZE INITIAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND, AND ALLOW PAYMENT OF CLAIMS ADMINISTRATORS FEES AND EXPENSES 1072 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 1075 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 1074 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents), Proof of Service (subsequent documents), Proof of Service (subsequent documents) 1076 e-mailed to Stuart M. Glass bounced due to invalid e-mail address. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to the General Order and Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1077 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Electronic Filing re Memorandum in Support of Motion, 1073 , MOTION for Disbursement of Funds NOTICE OF MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS TO APPROVE ADMINISTRATIVE DETERMINATIONS OF PROOFS OF CLAIM, AUTHORIZE INITIAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND, AND ALLOW PAYMENT OF CLAIMS ADMINISTRATORS FEES AND EXPENSES 1072 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 1075 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 1074 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents), Proof of Service (subsequent documents), Proof of Service (subsequent documents) 1076 e-mailed to Carolyn M Trinh bounced due to invalid e-mail address. Primary e-mail address corrected with a request that the attorney update her profile. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to carolyn.trinh@oracle.com. Pursuant to the General Order and Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1076 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Barry Brahn, Thomas P DiNapoli, re Memorandum in Support of Motion, 1073 , MOTION for Disbursement of Funds NOTICE OF MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS TO APPROVE ADMINISTRATIVE DETERMINATIONS OF PROOFS OF CLAIM, AUTHORIZE INITIAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND, AND ALLOW PAYMENT OF CLAIMS ADMINISTRATORS FEES AND EXPENSES 1072 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 1075 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 1074 served on 7/13/2012. (Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1075 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of ERIC J. MILLER MOTION for Disbursement of Funds NOTICE OF MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS TO APPROVE ADMINISTRATIVE DETERMINATIONS OF PROOFS OF CLAIM, AUTHORIZE INITIAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND, AND ALLOW PAYMENT OF CLAIMS ADMINISTRATORS FEES AND EXPENSES 1072 DECLARATION OF ERIC J. MILLER OF RUST CONSULTING, INC. REGARDING PROCESSING OF CLAIM FORMS AND CALCULATION OF AUTHORIZED CLAIMANTS RECOGNIZED CLAIMS filed by Plaintiff Barry Brahn, Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1074 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of DAVID J. GOLDSMITH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Disbursement of Funds NOTICE OF MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS TO APPROVE ADMINISTRATIVE DETERMINATIONS OF PROOFS OF CLAIM, AUTHORIZE INITIAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND, AND ALLOW PAYMENT OF CLAIMS ADMINISTRATORS FEES AND EXPENSES 1072 filed by Plaintiff Barry Brahn, Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1073 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Disbursement of Funds NOTICE OF MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS TO APPROVE ADMINISTRATIVE DETERMINATIONS OF PROOFS OF CLAIM, AUTHORIZE INITIAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND, AND ALLOW PAYMENT OF CLAIMS ADMINISTRATORS FEES AND EXPENSES 1072 filed by Plaintiff Barry Brahn, Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1072 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Disbursement of Funds NOTICE OF MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS TO APPROVE ADMINISTRATIVE DETERMINATIONS OF PROOFS OF CLAIM, AUTHORIZE INITIAL DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND, AND ALLOW PAYMENT OF CLAIMS ADMINISTRATORS FEES AND EXPENSES filed by Plaintiff Barry Brahn, Thomas P DiNapoli. Motion set for hearing on 8/14/2012 at 01:30 PM before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1071 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 8/2/10 11:03 a.m. (ha) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1070 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on August 2, 2010 11:03 A.M. to 11:35 A.M. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Margaret J. Babykin, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/8/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/18/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2011. (Babykin, Margaret) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1069 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Mitchell A Lowenthal counsel for Defendant Countrywide Financial Corp.Mitchell A. Lowenthal is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Countrywide Financial Corp. (Lowenthal, Mitchell) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1068 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM For Dates: 08-02-2010; 11-16-2010; 12-14-2010; 12-16-2010; 02-25-2011; Court Reporter: Margaret Babykin; Leandra Amber; Bridget Montero; Victoria Valine; Leandra Amber; Court of Appeals Case Number: 11-55570; Re: 1065 (Scheithauer, Christopher) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1067 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPEAL FEE PAID: Plaintiff Class Member Settlement Objector The Bank of America 401(k) Plan for Legacy Companies. re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,, 1065 ; Receipt Number: LA013411, PAID in the amount of $455. (lr) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1066 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 11-55570 9th CCA regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 1065 as to Plaintiff The Bank of America 401(k) Plan for Legacy Companies. (dmap) (Entered: 04/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1065 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Plaintiff Class Member Settlement Objector The Bank of America 401(k) Plan for Legacy Companies. Appeal of Judgment,,, 1063 , Order on Motion for Settlement,,,,, 1061 (Appeal fee FEE NOT PAID.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Appeal to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Appeal to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Notice of Appeal to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit)(Scheithauer, Christopher) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1064 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Summary Judgment, 784 filed by Defendant Eric P Sieracki. (Priebe, David) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1063 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. Pursuant to Rule 23 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, this Court finds that the terms and provisions of the Settlement Agreement were entered into by the Parties at arm's-length and in good faith, and are fully and finally approved as fair, reasonable, and adequate as to, and in the best interests of, each ofthe Parties and the Class Members. The Parties and their counsel are hereby directed to implement and consummate the Settlement in accordance with its terms and conditions. The Action and all Settled Claims are dismissed with prejudice. The Parties are to bear their own costs, except as otherwise provided in the Settlement Agreement or this Final Judgment and Order ("Final Judgment"). (See attached document for details.) (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (lom) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1062 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES TO LEAD COUNSEL 988 , 1030 by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. it is hereby ORDERED: The Court hereby awards Lead Counsel attorneys' fees of $46,472,000, or approximately 7.73% of the anticipated Gross Settlement Fund, plus interest earned at the same rates earned by the Gross Settlement Fund. Such attorney's fees shall be paid to Lead Counsel from the Gross Settlement Fund. Additionally, the Court hereby awards Lead Counsel reimbursement of expenses in the amount of $8,080,517.87, plus interest on the amount of expenses actually paid by Plaintiffs' Counsel as of September 15,2010, i.e., $4,102,291.91, earned at the same rates earned by the Gross Settlement Fund. Such expenses shall be paid to Lead Counsel from the Gross Settlement Fund. (Refer to attached document for details.) (lom) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1061 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER APPROVING PLAN OF ALLOCATION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND AS MODIFIED 983 by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. This Order incorporates by reference the definitions in the Settlement Agreement, as modified by the Amendment, and all terms used herein shall have the same meanings as set forth in the Settlement Agreement and Amendment; 2. This Court has jurisdiction over the subject matter of the Plan of Allocation of the Net Settlement Fund and all matters relating thereto, including all members of the Class; 3. Due and adequate notice of the Plan of Allocation and the modification thereto was directed to all persons who are Class members, advising them of their right to object thereto; 4. The terms and conditions of the Plan of Allocation, including, without limitation, the formulas for the calculation of Recognized Losses, and the modification, all of which are set forth in the Notice and Supplemental Notice provided to Class members, are a fair, reasonable, and adequate basis upon which to allocate the Net Settlement Fund among Authorized Claimants. 5. All objections to the proposed Plan of Allocation, including the objections submitted by Independent Fiduciary Services, Inc., David B. Orser, and Vembar K. Ranganathan, are overruled in their entirety. (lom) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1060 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 02-25-11, 1:06 P.M. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber, phone number (213) 894-6603, www.leandraamber.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/30/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/9/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/7/2011. (Amber, Leandra) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1059 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Summary Judgment 780 filed by Defendant Andrew Gissinger. (Carman, Eva) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1058 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER DENYING PENDING MOTIONS AS MOOT by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. On Friday, February 25, 2011, the Court held the final fairness hearing in the above referenced case and approved the class action settlement and the dismissal of Defendants Garcia and Gissinger. Accordingly, the Court DENIES the following pending motions as moot: Motion to Compel Further Responses to First Set of Interrogatories 712 ; Motion for Protective Order for Precluding Plaintiffs' Discovery of Documents Subpoenaed from the SEC 741 ; Application to Stay Case Pending Approval of Stipulations to Dismiss Action Against Defendants Garcia and Gissinger 755 . (lom) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1057 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, 782 filed by Defendant Carlos M. Garcia. (Sanders, James) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1056 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES OF HEARING (held and completed) ON: 1. MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT AND PLAN OF ALLOCATION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUNDS (fld 10/11/10) 983 ; (fld 2/4/11) 1030 ; 2. PETITION OF LEAD COUNSEL FOR LEAD PLAINTIFFS FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES (fld 10/11/10) 988 ; (fld 2/4/11) 1024 before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. Court and counsel discuss the objections, the proposed settlement and award of fees and costs. The Court approves the settlement as fair, adequate and reasonable for the reasons stated on the record. The Court grants the dismissal of defendants Garcia and Gissinger. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber. (lom) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1055 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Summary Judgment 785 filed by defendant David Sambol. (Tu, Michael) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1054 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Comments of Unnamed Class Members in support of Class Action Settlement, Settlement Agreement, and Attorney Fees filed by Movants Orloff Fam Tr Uad 12-13-01, Dr Marshall J Orloff Ira RO FCC as Custodian Gates Core Plus Fixed Income, Dr Marshall J Orloff Ira RO FCC as Custodian AllianceBernstein US Focs Blnd. (lom) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1053 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Summary Judgment, 767 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Siegel, David) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1052 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Summary Judgment 943 filed by Defendants A.G. Edwards & Sons, Inc., ABN Amro Incorporated, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Banc of America Securities LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Greenwich Capital Markets, Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities Inc., Merrill, Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated, RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC. (Kitchens, Dean) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1051 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) 760 filed by Defendants Kathleen Brown, Michael E Dougherty. (Morrison, Peter) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1050 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Summary Judgment, 779 filed by defendants Countrywide Capital V, Countrywide Financial Corp, Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Pastuszenski, Brian) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1049 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Summary Judgment 772 filed by defendant KPMG LLP. (Rissier, John) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1048 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Summary Judgment, 790 filed by Defendant Stanford L. Kurland. (Caldwell, Christopher) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1047 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Outside Directors' Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Summary Judgment Due to Settlement filed by Defendants Henry G. Cisneros, Jeffrey M. Cunningham, Robert J. Donato, Ben Enis, Edwin Heller, Gwendolyn Stewart King, Martin R. Melone, Robert T. Parry, Oscar P. Robertson, Keith P. Russell, Harley W. Snyder. (Rodriguez, D) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1046 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE CALL (in chambers) held before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. Court and counsel discuss the IFS objections. The conference call is completed. Court Reporter: Sheri Kleeger. (lom) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1045 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer: granting 1034 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Richard B. Drubel on behalf of SRM Global Limited Fund Partnership, designating Jeremy M. Goldman as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1044 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli, re Declaration (non-motion), Declaration (non-motion) 1042 , Declaration (Motion related) 1043 , Response (non-motion) 1041 served on 2/22/2011. (Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1043 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Joel H. Bernstein in Support of MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses 1030 (Second Supplemental) filed by Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1042 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Joel H. Bernstein in Response to Recent Submission of Byron B. Mathews, Jr. and Further Response to Objection of IFS filed by Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1041 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE filed by Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli to Recent Submission of Byron B. Mathews, Jr. and Further Response to Objection of IFS (Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1040 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER EXCLUDING SRM GLOBAL FUND LIMITED PARTNERSHIP FROM THE CLASS by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. Upon consideration of SRM Global Fund Limited Partnership's ("SRM") Objection to the Proposed Final Judgment 1035 , and any responses thereto, the Court HEREBY ORDERS that: SRM shall be included in the list of entities which have excluded themselves from the Class, attached as Exhibit 1 to the proposed Final Judgment in this matter. (lom) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1039 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Objector SRM Global Limited Fund Partnership, re Declaration (non-motion), Declaration (non-motion) 1036 , Notice (Other) 1038 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties 1037 , Objections - non-motion, 1035 served on February 16, 2011. (Goldman, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1038 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Intention to Appear at Fairness Hearing filed by Objector SRM Global Limited Fund Partnership. (Goldman, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1037 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Objector SRM Global Limited Fund Partnership, (Goldman, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1036 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Philip C. Korologos re Objections - non-motion, 1035 filed by Objector SRM Global Limited Fund Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Goldman, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1035 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTIONS to MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Proposed Modified Settlement and Modified Plan of Allocation of Net Settlement Fund 1024 filed by Objector SRM Global Limited Fund Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Goldman, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1034 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION for attorney Richard B. Drubel to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Objector SRM Global Limited Fund Partnership. (PHV FEE PAID 2/15/11.) (lom) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1033 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli, re Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 1026 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 1032 , Memorandum in Support of Motion 1031 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 1027 , MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses 1030 , Memorandum in Support of Motion 1025 , Declaration (non-motion), Declaration (non-motion) 1029 , MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Proposed Modified Settlement and Modified Plan of Allocation of Net Settlement Fund 1024 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 1028 served on 2/4/2011. (Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1032 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Michael H. Diamond in support of MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses 1030 filed by Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit A - Part 3)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1031 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses 1030 filed by Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1030 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. Motion set for hearing on 2/25/2011 at 01:00 PM before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Order Awarding Attorneys' Fees, # 2 [Proposed] Order Approving Plan of Allocation of Net Settlement Fund As Modified)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1029 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION (Second Supplemental) of Thomas R. Glenn of Rust Consulting, Inc. Regarding Notice to the Class filed by Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1028 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Karen J. Seemen in support of MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Proposed Modified Settlement and Modified Plan of Allocation of Net Settlement Fund 1024 and Modified Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1027 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Diane D. Foody, Esq. in support of MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Proposed Modified Settlement and Modified Plan of Allocation of Net Settlement Fund 1024 and Modified Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1026 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Joel H. Bernstein in support of MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Proposed Modified Settlement and Modified Plan of Allocation of Net Settlement Fund 1024 and Lead Counsel's Modified Petition for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1025 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Proposed Modified Settlement and Modified Plan of Allocation of Net Settlement Fund 1024 filed by Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1024 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of Final Approval of Proposed Modified Settlement and Modified Plan of Allocation of Net Settlement Fund filed by plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. Motion set for hearing on 2/25/2011 at 01:00 PM before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1023 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT- TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on THURSDAY, DECEMBER 16, 2010 at 1:00 p.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Victoria L. Valine, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/22/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/4/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/2/2011. (mat) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1022 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Aviah Cohen Pierson counsel for Plaintiffs Barry Brahn, Shelley B. Katzeff.Aviah Cohen Pierson is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Barry Brahn and Shelley B. Katzeff (Pierson, Aviah) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1021 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL TO FIRST AMENDMENT TO SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND DIRECTING DISSEMINATION OF SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE TO THE CLASS by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer: Upon Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of First Amendment to Settlement Agreement 1016 , It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED as follows: The Court preliminarily finds that the propose Amendment should be approved. A hearing (the "Fairness Hearing") will be held on 2/25/2011 at 1:00 PM before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel's Application for a Fee and Expense Award shall be filed with the Court no later than 21 days before the Fairness Hearing. The Court approves the form and substance of the Supplemental Notice. Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel is hereby authorized to use Rust Consulting, Inc. (the "Claims Administrator") to supervise and administer the Supplemental Notice procedure under the supervision of Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel. See document for further details. (gk) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1020 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Objector Byron B Matthews, Jr. (lom) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1019 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Objections Concerning Request for Exclusion filed by Objector Byron B Matthews, Jr. (lom) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1018 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli, re MOTION for Settlement Approval of First Amendment to Settlement Agreement 1016 , Memorandum in Support of Motion 1017 , Stipulation for Settlement 1015 served on 1/4/2011. (Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1017 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Settlement Approval of First Amendment to Settlement Agreement 1016 filed by Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1016 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of First Amendment to Settlement Agreement filed by plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. Motion set for hearing on 1/12/2011 at 01:30 PM before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Approval to First Amendment to Settlement Agreement and Directing Dissemination of Supplemental Notice to the Class)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1015 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended STIPULATION for Settlement / First Amendment to Amended Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement filed by plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A-1, # 3 Exhibit B)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1014 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. The Court has determined that there is good cause to place UNDER SEAL the transcripts of the December 14,2010 and December 16,2010 telephonic conferences with counsel. (lom) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1013 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE CALL held before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. The case is called and appearances are made. The conference call is held and completed. Court Reporter: Victoria Valine. (lom) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1012 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE CALL held before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. The case is called and appearances are made. The conference call is held and completed. Court Reporter: Bridget Montero. (lom) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1011 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Lloyd Winawer counsel for Defendants Countrywide Capital V, Countrywide Financial Corp, Consol Defendant Countrywide Securities Corporation. Changing address to 601 S. Figueroa Street, 41st Floor, Los Angeles, California 90017. Changing phone and fax number to Tel: 213-426-2500 / Fax: 213-623-1673. Filed by defendants Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Securities Corporation, and Countrywide Capital V (Winawer, Lloyd) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1010 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. The Final Fairness Hearing scheduled for Tuesday, December 14, 2010 at 1:00 p.m. is hereby CONTINUED until further notice. The Court will reschedule the hearing at a later date. (lom) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1009 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli, re Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition (non-motion), Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition (non-motion) 1005 , Declaration (non-motion), Declaration (non-motion) 1007 , Declaration (non-motion), Declaration (non-motion), Declaration (non-motion), Declaration (non-motion) 1006 SUPPLEMENTAL PROOF OF SERVICE served on 11/30/2010. (Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 11/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1008 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli, re Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition (non-motion), Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition (non-motion) 1005 , Declaration (non-motion), Declaration (non-motion) 1007 , Declaration (non-motion), Declaration (non-motion), Declaration (non-motion), Declaration (non-motion) 1006 served on 11/29/2010. (Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1007 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Thomas R. Glenn re Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition (non-motion), Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition (non-motion) 1005 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION REGARDING NOTICE TO THE CLASS filed by Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1006 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Joel H. Bernstein re Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition (non-motion), Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition (non-motion) 1005 Responding to Objections, Concerning Requests for Exclusion from the Class, and Reporting on Settlement of SEC Action filed by Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1005 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition filed by Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. Responding to Objections, Concerning Requests for Exclusion from the Class, and Reporting on Settlement of SEC Action Re: Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 994 (Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1004 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Michael H Dore counsel for Consol Defendants A.G. Edwards & Sons, Inc., ABN Amro Incorporated, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., BNY Capital Markets, Inc., Banc of America Securities LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Dresdner Kleinwort Wasserstein Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Greenwich Capital Markets, Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities Inc., Lehman Brothers Inc., Merrill, Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets Corp., RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., RBC Dominion Securities Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, Scotia Capital Inc., TD Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC, Wachovia Securities, Inc.. Michael H Dore will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Michael H Dore is no longer attorney of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Co-Defendants A.G. Edwards & Sons Inc.; ABN Amro Inc.; BNY Capital Markets, Inc.; Banc of America Securities LLC; Barclays Capital Inc.; Citigroup Global Markets Inc.; Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.; Goldman, Sachs & Co.; Greenwich Capital Markets Inc.; J.P. Morgan Securities Inc.; Lehman Brothers Inc.; Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith, Inc.; Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc.; RBC Dain Rauscher Inc.; RBC Dominion Securities Inc.; UBC Securities LLC; Wachovia Capital Markets LLC; RBC Capital Markets Copr.; Wachovia Securities Inc.; BNP Paribas Securities Corp.; HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.; Scotia Capital Inc.; TD Securities Inc.; Dresdner Kleinwort Wasserstein Securities Inc.; SG Americas Securities LLC (Dore, Michael) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1003 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer: TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE CALL (held and completed) The case is called and appearance are made. Court and counsel discuss the status of the case. (bp) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1002 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer: The Fairness Hearing scheduled for 12/6/2010 at 1:00 PM., is CONTINUED to 12/14/2010 at 1:00 PM. All other dates and deadlines remain unchanged. (jp) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1001 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES: PROCEEDINGS: TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE CALL (held and completed) before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer: The case is called and appearances are made. Court and counsel discuss the status of the case. The Court takes the motion under submission and its order will follow. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber. (jp) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1000 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION for Settlement Approval of PROPOSED SETTLEMENT AND PLAN OF ALLOCATION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND 983 , MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses 988 filed by Consol Defendants A.G. Edwards & Sons, Inc., ABN Amro Incorporated, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Banc of America Securities LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Greenwich Capital Markets, Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities Inc., Merrill, Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated, RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC. (Mircheff, Alexander) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 999 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer: granting 998 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Nancy G. Ross on behalf of Objector Independent Fiduciary Services, Inc., designating Chris C. Scheithauer as local counsel. (Fee paid 11/8/10) (lom) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 998 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First APPLICATION for attorney Nancy G. Ross to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Objector Independent Fiduciary Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-N. Ross Certificate of Admission & Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit B-N. Ross Courts & Dates of Admission, # 3 Proposed Order)(Scheithauer, Christopher) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 997 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF LODGING Exhibit A (Compact Disk) to Objection to Proposed Settlement and Plan of Allocation 994 by Independent F filed by Objector Independent Fiduciary Services, Inc. (lom) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2010: # 1 G-114) (lom). (Entered: 10/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 996 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Intention to Appear at Fairness Hearing filed by attorney Christopher C Scheithauer on behalf of Objector Independent Fiduciary Services, Inc. (lom) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 995 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Objector Independent Fiduciary Services, Inc. (lom) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 994 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTION to Proposed Settlement and Plan of Allocation re: MOTION 983 filed by Objector Independent Fiduciary Services, Inc. (lom) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 993 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES IN CHAMBERS by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. The Fairness Hearing scheduled for Monday, November 15, 2010 at 1:00 p.m., is continued to Monday, December 6, 2010, at 1:00 p.m. (lom) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 992 Filed: 10/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli, re MOTION for Settlement Approval of PROPOSED SETTLEMENT AND PLAN OF ALLOCATION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND 983 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 985 , Memorandum in Support of Motion 989 , Memorandum in Support of Motion 984 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 991 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 986 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 990 , Declaration (Motion related), Declaration (Motion related) 987 , MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses 988 served on October 11, 2010. (Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 10/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 991 Filed: 10/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of /COMPENDIUM OF INDIVIDUAL DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses 988 filed by Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration 1, # 2 Declaration 2, # 3 Declaration 3, # 4 Declaration 4, # 5 Declaration 5, # 6 Declaration 6, # 7 Declaration 7, # 8 Declaration 8, # 9 Declaration 9, # 10 Declaration 10, # 11 Declaration 11, # 12 Declaration 12, # 13 Declaration 13, # 14 Declaration 14, # 15 Declaration 15, # 16 Declaration 16, # 17 Declaration 17, # 18 Declaration 18)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 10/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 990 Filed: 10/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Michael H. Diamond in support of MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses 988 filed by Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D Part 1, # 5 Exhibit D Part 2)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 10/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 989 Filed: 10/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses 988 filed by Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 10/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 988 Filed: 10/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. Motion set for hearing on 11/15/2010 at 01:00 PM before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order AWARDING ATTORNEYS FEES AND EXPENSES TO LEAD COUNSEL)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 10/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 987 Filed: 10/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Frank C. Torchio in support of MOTION for Settlement Approval of PROPOSED SETTLEMENT AND PLAN OF ALLOCATION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND 983 filed by Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Appendix Part 1, # 5 Appendix Part 2)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 10/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 986 Filed: 10/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Thomas R. Glenn of Rust Consulting, Inc. in support of MOTION for Settlement Approval of PROPOSED SETTLEMENT AND PLAN OF ALLOCATION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND 983 REGARDING NOTICE TO THE CLASS filed by Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 10/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 985 Filed: 10/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Joel H. Bernstein in support of MOTION for Settlement Approval of PROPOSED SETTLEMENT AND PLAN OF ALLOCATION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND 983 filed by Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 10/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 984 Filed: 10/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Settlement Approval of PROPOSED SETTLEMENT AND PLAN OF ALLOCATION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND 983 filed by Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 10/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 983 Filed: 10/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of PROPOSED SETTLEMENT AND PLAN OF ALLOCATION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND filed by Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. Motion set for hearing on 11/15/2010 at 01:00 PM before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order FOR FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE, # 2 Proposed Order APPROVING PLAN OF ALLOCATION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 10/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 982 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Alexis L. Shapiro, Esq. Relating to Notice Under 28 U.S.C. § 1715 filed by Defendants Countrywide Capital V, Countrywide Financial Corp, Consol Defendant Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Proof of Service)(Winawer, Lloyd) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 981 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Granting Stipulation to Exceed Page Limitation 979 by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. The Court hereby ORDERS as follows: Lead Plaintiffs shall file a memorandum of law in support of their motion for final approval of the proposed Settlement of this class action and the Plan of Allocation of the Net Settlement Fund of no longer than 65 pages; and Lead Counsel shall file a memorandum of law in support of its application for an award of counsels' fees and expenses of no longer than 40 pages. (lom) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 980 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli, re Stipulation to Exceed Page Limitation, 979 served on 9/23/2010. (Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 979 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION to Exceed Page Limitation as to Lead Plaintiffs' Memoranda in Support of Motions for Final Approval of Proposed Settlement and Plan of Allocation and Award of Attorney's Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 978 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer: denying 977 Movants' Motion to Intervene. Now that the existing parties have entered into a class action settlement agreement and are awaiting final approval, they will suffer great prejudice from allowing any other parties to intervene. Moreover, Movants have not shown a significantly protectable interest in the action. Even if Movants had established that they are actually employees of Countrywide, Movants' interest in their salary and benefits packages does not relate to this action in any way and the disposition of this action will not affect Movants' ability to protect their entitlements. (lom) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 977 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Object, Intervene, and counsel recusal filed by Movants Isong Akpan, Mario Alvarado, Andre Cowley, Billy Driggers, Richard Galietti, Larry Norris, Jonathan Lee Riches, Ralph Rogers, Patrick J Simpson, Major Spaulding. (lom) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 976 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORRECTED ORDER by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer GRANTING Preliminary Approval to Settlement and Directing Dissemination of Notice to The Class 842 . A Fairness Hearing will be held on 11/15/2010 at 1:00 PM., to determine, among other things, (a) whether the proposed Settlement of the Action on the terms and conditions provided in the Settlement Agreement is fair, reasonable, and adequate and should be approved by the Court; (b) whether the proposed Plan of Allocation of the Net Settlement Fund is fair and reasonable and should be approved by the Court; (c) whether a Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal with prejudice substantially in the form of Exhibit B to the Settlement Agreement should be entered in this Action; and (d) to consider Plaintiffs Lead counsel's application for a Fee and Expense Award. Any papers in support of final approval of the Settlement shall be filed with the Court no later than 35 days before the Fairness Hearing. (See attached Order for further information). (jp) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 975 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT- Order Granting Angelo R. Mozilo's Application to File Documents Under Seal Pursuant to Protective Order. (mat) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 974 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: 8/4/2010 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES OF PLAINTIFFS' RENEWED UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT (fld 6/29/10) 842 held and completed - non-evidentiary before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. Court and counsel discuss the motion. The Court grants preliminary approval 842 and the order will follow. Court Reporter: Margaret Babykin. (lom) (Entered: 08/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 973 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: 8/3/2010 Order on Motion for SettlementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer: granting 842 Motion for Preliminary Approval to Settlement and Directing Disseminaton of Notice to the Class. It is hereby Ordered: A hearing (the "Fairness Hearing") will be held on Monday, November 15, 2010 at 1:00 p.m. before the Honorable Mariana R. Pfaelzer in Courtroom 12 of the United States District Court for the Central District of California, 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, California 90012, to determine, among other things, (a) whether the proposed Settlement of the Action on the terms and conditions provided in the Settlement Agreement is fair, reasonable, and adequate and should be approved by the Court; (b) whether the proposed Plan of Allocation of the Net Settlement Fund is fair and reasonable and should be approved by the Court; (c) whether a Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice substantially in the form of Exhibit B to the Settlement Agreement should be entered in this Action; and (d) to consider Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel's application for a Fee and Expense Award. Any papers in support of final approval of the Settlement, approval of the Plan of Allocation, and Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel's application for a Fee and Expense Award shall be filed with the Court no later than thirty-five (35) days before the Fairness Hearing. (Refer to attached documents for other requirements.) (lom) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 972 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Chandru M. Harjani in Support of Motion for Underwriter Defendants for Summary Judgment [FRCP 56]. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3)(mat) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 971 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of John C. Bolger in Support of Motion for Underwriter Defendants for Summary Judgment [FRCP 56]. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3)(mat) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 970 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Guy ERB in Support Notice of Motion and Motion of Underwriter Defendants for Summary Judgment [FRCP 56]. (Attachments: Part 2)(mat) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 969 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Statement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT- Separate Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Motion of Underwriter Defendants for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: Part 2)(mat) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 968 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Stanley Shipley in Support of Motion for Underwriter Defendants for Summary Judgment [FRCP 56]. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3)(mat) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 967 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Todd G. Owens in Support of Motion for Underwriter Defendants for Summary Judgment [FRCP 56]. (mat) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 966 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Thomas D. Novack in Support Notice of Motion and Motion of Underwriter Defendants for Summary Judgment [FRCP 56]. (Attachments: Part 2)(mat) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 965 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Kevin M. McCann in Support of Motion for Underwriter Defendants for Summary Judgment [FRCP 56]. (mat) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 964 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Alexander M. Mircheff in Support of Motion for Underwriter Defendants for Summary Judgment [FRCP 56] (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4)(mat) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 963 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Statement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT- Outside Directors' Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of their Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: Part 2)(mat) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 962 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT- Outside Directors' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Outside Directors' Motion for Summary Judgment. (mat) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 961 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Jeffrey M. Cunningham in Support of Outside Directors' Motion for Summary Judgment. (mat) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 960 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Robert J. Donato in Support of Outside Directors' Motion for Summary Judgment. (mat) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 959 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Oscar P. Robertson in Support of Outside Directors' Motion for Summary Judgment. (mat) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 958 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Edwin Heller in Support of Outside Directors' Motion for Summary Judgment. (mat) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 957 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Ben M. Enis in Support of Outside Directors' Motion for Summary Judgment. (mat) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 956 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Gwendolyn S. King in Support of Outside Directors' Motion for Summary Judgment. (mat) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 955 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Robert T. Parry in Support of Outside Directors' Motion for Summary Judgment. (mat) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 954 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Henry G. Cisneros in Support of Outside Directors' Motion for Summary Judgment. (mat) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 953 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Harley W. Snyder in Support of Outside Directors' Motion for Summary Judgment.(mat) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 952 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Order on Application for LeaveCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer: granting 805 Application to file documents Under Seal. (mat) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 951 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Keith P. Russell in Support of Outside Directors' Motion for Summary Judgment.(mat) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 950 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT- Underwriter Defendants' Compendium of Exhibits Volume VII in Support of Motion of Underwriter Defendants for Summary Judgment [FRCP 56]. (mat) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 949 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT- Underwriter Defendants' Compendium of Exhibits Volume VI in Support of Motion of Underwriter Defendants for Summary Judgment [FRCP 56]. (mat) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 948 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT- Underwriter Defendants' Compendium of Exhibits Volume V in Support of Motion of Underwriter Defendants for Summary Judgment [FRCP 56]. (mat) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 947 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT- Underwriter Defendants' Compendium of Exhibits Volume IV in Support of Motion of Underwriter Defendants for Summary Judgment [FRCP 56]. (mat) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 946 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT- Underwriter Defendants' Compendium of Exhibits Volume III in Support of Motion of Underwriter Defendants for Summary Judgment [FRCP 56]. (mat) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 945 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT- Underwriter Defendants' Compendium of Exhibits Volume II in Support of Motion of Underwriter Defendants for Summary Judgment [FRCP 56].(mat) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 944 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT- Underwriter Defendants' Compendium of Exhibits Volume 1 in Support of Motion of Underwriter Defendants for Summary Judgment [FRCP 56]. (mat) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 943 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/30/2010 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT- Notice of Motion and Motion of Underwriter Defendants for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof. (mat) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 942 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of D. Anthony Rodriguez in Support of the Outside Directors' Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: Part 2)(mat) (Additional attachment(s) Part 3) (mat). Modified on 7/29/2010 (mat). (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 941 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Chistoper G. Caldwell in Support of Defendant Stanford L. Kurland's Motion for Summary Judgment; Exhibits. (Attachments: Part 2, Part 3, Part 4, Part 5)(mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 940 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Statement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT- Defendant Stanford L. Kurland's Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of his Motion for Summary Judgment. (mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 939 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Defendant Stanford L. Kurland in Support of 's Motion for Summary Judgment. (mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 938 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT- Defendant Stanford L. Kurland Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment.(mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 937 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of David C. Codell; and Exhibits in Support of Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant Stanford L. Kurland's Motion for Summary Judgment. (mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 936 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Statement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT- STATEMENT of UNCONTROVERTED FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW in Support of KPMG's MOTION for Summary Judgment, or, In the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 part 2, # 2 part 3, # 3 part 4)(mg) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 935 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of John J. McConnell PH.D., in Support of KPMG LLP's Motion for Summary Judgment or, In the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment. (mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 934 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Patrick Kinsella in Support of KPMG LLP's Motion for Summary Judgment or, In the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment. (mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 933 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of John G. Klinge in Support of KPMG LLP's Motion for Summary Judgment or, In the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment. (mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 932 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT- Consolidated Set of Exhibits to Outside Directors' Declarations in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. (mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 931 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Order on Application to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer: granting Outside Directors' 930 Application for Order Allowing Defendants to File Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Documents Under Seal. (mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 930 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Application to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Outside Director's Application for Order Allowing Defendants to file Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Documents Under Seal. (mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 929 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Statement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT- Defendant Andrew Gissenger's Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of His Motion for Summary Judgment. (mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 928 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT- Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant Andrew Gissenger's Motion for Summary Judgment. (mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 927 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Andrew Gissenger III in Support of his Motion for Summary Judgment. (mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 926 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT- Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant Eric P. Sieracki's Motion for Summary Judgment. (mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 925 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Statement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT- Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Defendant Eric P. Sieracki's Motion for Summary Judgment. (mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 924 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Eric P. Sieracki in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment.(mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 923 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Statement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT- Statement of Unconterverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Defendant David Sambol's Motion for Summary Judgment. (mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 922 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT- Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant David Sambol's Motion for Summary Judgment. (mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 921 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of J. Warren Rissier in Support of KPMG LLP's Motion for Summary Judgment or, In the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment.(mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 920 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of John Taylor in Support of KPMG LLP's Motion for Summary Judgment or, In the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment.(mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 919 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of J. Warren Rissier in Support of KPMG LLP's Motion for Summary Judgment or, In the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment.(mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 918 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of John Taylor in Support of KPMG LLP's Motion for Summary Judgment or, In the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment. (mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 917 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Kathleen Brown in Support of Michael E. Dougherty's and Kathleen Brown's Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication. Vol 2 of 2 (mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 916 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Kathleen Brown in Support of Michael E. Dougherty's and Kathleen Brown's Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication. Vol 1 of 2 (mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 915 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Virginia F. Milstead in Support of Michael E. Dougherty's and Kathleen Brown's Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication. Vol 2 of 2 (mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 914 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Virginia F. Milstead in Support of Michael E. Dougherty's and Kathleen Brown's Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication. Vol 1 of 2 (mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 913 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Michael E. Dougherty in Support of Michael E. Dougherty's and Kathleen Brown's Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication. Vol 2 of 2(mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 912 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Michael E. Dougherty in Support of Michael E. Dougherty's and Kathleen Brown's Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication. Vol 1 of 2 (mat) Modified on 7/29/2010 (mat). (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 911 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT- Michael E. Dougherty's and Kathleen Brown's Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Michael E. Dougherty's and Kathleen Brown's Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication. (mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 910 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT- NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication; 2) Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law; 3) Declaration of Michael E. Dougherty; 4) Declaration of Kathleen Brown; 5) Declaration of Viginia F. Milstead; 6) Proposed Order; 7) Proof of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Judgment)(mat) Modified on 7/29/2010 (mat). (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 909 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT- Exhibits 36 thru 58Declaration of Jane H. Bu in Support of Defendant Andrew Gissinger's Motion for Summary of Judgment.(mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 908 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT- Exhibits 12 thru 35Declaration of Jane H. Bu in Support of Defendant Andrew Gissinger's Motion for Summary of Judgment.(mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 907 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of Jane H. Bu in Support of Defendant Andrew Gissinger's Motion for Summary of Judgment with Exhibits 1 thru 11.(mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 906 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT- Lori Lynn Phillips's Declaration in Support of Defendant David Sambol's Motion for Summary Judgment.(mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 905 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT- Defendant David Sambol's Declaration in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment.(mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 904 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT- KPMG LLP's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment or, In the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment.(mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 903 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT- KPMG LLP's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment or, In the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment.(mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 902 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of David C. Codell; and Exhibits in Support of Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant Stanford L. Kurland's Motion for Summary Judgment. Vol 3 of 3 Exhibits F-I. (mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 901 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of David C. Codell; and Exhibits in Support of Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant Stanford L. Kurland's Motion for Summary Judgment. Vol 2 of 3 Exhibits C-E. (mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 900 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT- Declaration of David C. Codell; and Exhibits in Support of Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant Stanford L. Kurland's Motion for Summary Judgment. Vol 1 of 3 Exhibits A-B. (mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 899 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Order on Application to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT- Order Granting KPMG LLP's Application to File Under Seal Documents in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment or, In the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment. (mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 898 Filed: 6/26/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT- PROOF OF SERVICE (mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 897 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT- Memorandum of Points and Authoritities in Support of KPMG LLP's Motion for Summary Judgment or, In the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment. (mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 896 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Application to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT- KPMG LLP's Application to File Under Seal Documents in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment or, In the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment; Declaration of Edward S. Kim. (mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 895 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Order on Application for LeaveCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer: granting Defendant David Sambol's 807 Application to file Under Seal Documents in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. (mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 894 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Order on Application for LeaveCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer: granting defendant Andrew Gissinger III's 810 Application for and Order Allowing Mr. Gissinger Leave to file documents in Support of his Motion for Summary Judgment Under Seal. (mat) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 893 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Order on Application for Leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT- Order Granting Michael E. Dougherty's and Kathleen Brown's Application for Leave to File Under Seal. (mat) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 892 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Order on Application to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT- Order Granting Defendant Stanford L. Kurland's Application for Leave to file Documents in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Under Seal. (mat) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 891 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Application to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT- Defendant Standford L. Kurland's Application for Leave to Fiel Documents in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Under Seal; Declaration of David C. Codell in Support Thereof. (mat) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 890 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Notice of Lodging
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT- NOTICE OF LODGING of Oversized Documents in Support of Defendant Stanford L. Kurland's Motion for Summary Judgment. (mat) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 889 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Order on Application for Leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT- Order Granting Defendant Eric P. Sieracki's Application to File Under Seal Confidential Documents. (mat) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 888 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT- Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Countrywide Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Vol 29 of 29. (mat) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 887 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT- Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Countrywide Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Vol 28 of 29. (mat) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 886 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT- Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Countrywide Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Vol 27 of 29. (mat) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 885 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT- Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Countrywide Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Vol 26 of 29. (mat) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 884 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT- Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Countrywide Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Vol 25 of 29. (mat) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 883 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT- Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Countrywide Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Vol 24 of 29. (mat) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 882 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT- Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Countrywide Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Vol 23 of 29. (mat) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 881 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT- Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Countrywide Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Vol 22 of 29. (mat) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 880 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT- Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Countrywide Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Vol 21 of 29. (mat) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 879 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT- Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Countrywide Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Vol 20 of 29. (mat) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 878 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT- Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Countrywide Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Vol 19 of 29. (mat) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 877 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT- Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Countrywide Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Vol 18 of 29. (mat) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 876 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT- Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Countrywide Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Vol 17 of 29. (mat) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 875 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT- Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Countrywide Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Vol 16 of 29. (mat) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 874 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT- Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Countrywide Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Vol 15 of 29. (mat) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 873 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT- Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Countrywide Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Vol 14 of 29. (mat) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 872 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT- Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Countrywide Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Vol 13 of 29. (mat) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 871 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT- Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Countrywide Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Vol 12 of 29. (mat) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 870 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT- Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Countrywide Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Vol 11 of 29. (mat) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 869 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT- Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Countrywide Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Vol 10 of 29. (mat) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 868 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT- Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Countrywide Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Vol 9 of 29. (mat) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 867 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT- Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Countrywide Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Vol 8 of 29. (mat) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 866 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT- Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Countrywide Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Vol 7 of 29. (mat) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 865 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT- Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Countrywide Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Vol 6 of 29. (mat) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 864 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT- Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Countrywide Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Vol 5 of 29. (mat) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 863 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT- Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Countrywide Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Vol 4 of 29. (mat) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 862 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT- Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Countrywide Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Vol 3 of 29. (mat) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 861 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT- Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Countrywide Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Vol 2 of 29. (mat) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 860 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT- Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Countrywide Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Vol 1 of 29(mat) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 859 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SSEALED DOCUMENT Countrywide Defendants' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment; Country Wide Defendants' Statement of Uncontroverted Facts. (Attachments: Part 2)(mat) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 858 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Statement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT Countrywide Defendants' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment; Country Wide Defendants' Statement of Uncontroverted Facts. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2)(mat) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 857 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010 Order on Application for LeaveCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer: granting 802 Application for Leave to File Documents in Support of their Motion for Summary Judgment Under Seal.It is hereby Ordered as follows: The Court has determined there is good cause to grant the Application and accepts for filing under seal the following documents: 1. Countywide Defendants' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment; 2. Countywide Defendants' Statement of Uncontroverted Facts; and 3. Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Countrywide Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (mat) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 856 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: 7/19/2010 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental Submission in Support of Plaintiffs' Renewed Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement filed by Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Proof of Service)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 855 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: 7/19/2010 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of address by Lori S Brody attorney for Plaintiffs Barry Brahn, Shelley B. Katzeff. Changing attorneys address to 1801 Century Park East, Suite 1095, Los Angeles, CA 90067. Filed by Plaintiffs Barry Brahn, Shelley B. Katzeff. (Brody, Lori) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 854 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: 7/13/2010 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER DENYING STIPULATION for an Order Shortening Time in Which Plaintiffs' Renewed Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of ProposedSettlement 852 by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. (lom) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 853 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: 7/7/2010 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli, re Stipulation for Order, 852 Shortening Time in Which Plaintiffs Renewed Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement Will Be Heard served on 07/07/2010. (Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 852 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: 7/7/2010 Stipulation for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION for Order Shortening Time in Which Plaintiffs Renewed Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement Will Be Heard filed by Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Shortening Time in Which Plaintiffs' Renewed Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement Will Be Heard)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 851 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: 7/1/2010 Supplement (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT- Supplemental Agreement Regarding Settlement. (mat) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 850 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: 7/1/2010 Order on Application for LeaveCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer: granting 849 Joint APPLICATION for Order Allowing Parties to File Supplemental Agreement to the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement (the "Supplemental Agreement") under seal. (lom) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 849 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: 7/1/2010 Application for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint APPLICATION for Order Allowing Parties to File Supplemental Agreement to the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement (the "Supplemental Agreement") under seal filed by Plaintiffs Thomas P DiNapoli, et al. Lodged [Prop] Order. (lom) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 848 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: 6/29/2010 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli of Final Joint Application; Proposed Order to File Supplemental Agreement Under Seal. (Nelson, Gretchen) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 847 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: 6/29/2010 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli, re 841 Amended STIPULATION for Settlement, 842 NOTICE OF MOTION AND Renewed MOTION for Settlement Approval of / Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement, 843 MEMORANDUM in Support of Renewed MOTION for Settlement Approval of / Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement, 844 DECLARATION of Joel H. Bernstein, 845 DECLARATION of Frank C. Torchio and [846 ]DECLARATION of Thomas R. Glenn of Rust Consulting, Inc. served on 6/29/2010. (Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 846 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: 6/29/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Thomas R. Glenn of Rust Consulting, Inc. in Support of Renewed MOTION for Settlement Approval of / Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement 842 filed by Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 845 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: 6/29/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Frank C. Torchio in Support of Renewed MOTION for Settlement Approval of / Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement 842 filed by Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Appendix Part 1, # 5 Appendix Part 2)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 844 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: 6/29/2010 Declaration (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Joel H. Bernstein in Support of Renewed MOTION for Settlement Approval of / Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement 842 filed by Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 843 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: 6/29/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support of Renewed MOTION for Settlement Approval of / Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement 842 filed by Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 842 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: 6/29/2010 ~Motion for SettlementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND Renewed MOTION for Settlement Approval of / Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement filed by Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. Motion set for hearing on 8/2/2010 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 841 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: 6/29/2010 Stipulation for Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended STIPULATION for Settlement A.G. Edwards & Sons, Inc., ABN Amro Incorporated, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Banc of America Securities LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barry Brahn, Kathleen Brown, Henry G. Cisneros, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Countrywide Capital V, Countrywide Financial Corp, Countrywide Securities Corporation, Jeffrey M. Cunningham, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Thomas P DiNapoli, Robert J. Donato, Michael E Dougherty, Ben Enis, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Greenwich Capital Markets, Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Edwin Heller, J.P. Morgan Securities Inc., KPMG LLP, Shelley B. Katzeff, Gwendolyn Stewart King, Stanford L. Kurland, Martin R. Melone, Merrill, Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated, Angelo Mozilo, Robert T. Parry, RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Oscar P. Robertson, Keith P. Russell, David Sambol, Eric P Sieracki, Harley W. Snyder, UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A-1, # 3 Exhibit A-2, # 4 Exhibit A-3, # 5 Exhibit B)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 840 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: 6/29/2010 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli of Supplemental Agreement Regarding Settlement. (Nelson, Gretchen) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 839 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: 6/16/2010 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER RE: PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTby Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. The Court has reviewed Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for preliminary approval of proposed settlement 833 . The Court finds the motion deficient in several respects and VACATES the hearing scheduled for Tuesday, June 22, 2010. Plaintiffs may re-notice the hearing when they cure the deficiencies and resubmit their motion. (lom) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 838 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/8/2010 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting Stipulation for an Order Shortening Time in Which Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement will be heard 836 by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. It is hereby ORDERED as follows: Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement shall be heard on June 22, 2010, at 1:00 pm. (lom) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 837 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: 6/4/2010 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli, re Memorandum in Support of Motion 834 , Stipulation for Settlement,,,, 835 , Stipulation for Order 836 , MOTION for Settlement Approval of / Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement 833 served on 6/4/2010. (Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 836 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: 6/4/2010 Stipulation for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION for Order Shortening Time in Which Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement Will Be Heard filed by plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 835 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: 6/4/2010 Stipulation for Settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION for Settlement A.G. Edwards & Sons, Inc., ABN Amro Incorporated, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Banc of America Securities LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Barry Brahn, Kathleen Brown, Henry G. Cisneros, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Countrywide Capital V, Countrywide Financial Corp, Countrywide Securities Corporation, Jeffrey M. Cunningham, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Thomas P DiNapoli, Robert J. Donato, Michael E Dougherty, Ben Enis, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Greenwich Capital Markets, Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., Edwin Heller, J.P. Morgan Securities Inc., KPMG LLP, Shelley B. Katzeff, Gwendolyn Stewart King, Stanford L. Kurland, Martin R. Melone, Merrill, Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated, Angelo Mozilo, Robert T. Parry, RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., Oscar P. Robertson, Keith P. Russell, David Sambol, Eric P Sieracki, Harley W. Snyder, UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A-1, # 3 Exhibit A-2, # 4 Exhibit A-3, # 5 Exhibit B)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 834 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: 6/4/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Settlement Approval of / Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement 833 filed by Consol Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. (Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 833 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: 6/4/2010 ~Motion for SettlementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of / Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement filed by Plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli. Motion set for hearing on 6/22/2010 at 01:00 PM before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. (Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 832 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: 5/20/2010 Order on Application for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer: granting 831 Joint Application to Extend Stay of Proceedings. It is hereby Ordered: The stay set forth in the Court's April 8, 2010 Order, staying these proceedings and all pre-trial and trial deadlines, is hereby extended for an additional ten (10) days, through June 2, 2010. (lom) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 831 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: 5/19/2010 Application for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint APPLICATION for Order for Extension of Stay of Proceedings (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proof of Service)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 830 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: 5/13/2010 Order on Request to Substitute AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer: granting 829 Request to Substitute Attorney Francisca M. Mok of Reed Smith LLP for Defendant Carlos Garcia, as attorney of record in place and stead of Francisca M. Mok of McDermott Will & Emery LLP. (lom) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 829 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 Request to Substitute Attorney (G-01)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST to Substitute attorney Reed Smith including attorney Francisca M. Mok in place of attorney McDermott Will & Emery former firm of Francisca M. Mok filed by Defendant Carlos M. Garcia. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sanders, James) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 828 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: 5/3/2010 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of address by Thad A Davis attorney for Defendant Andrew Gissinger. Changing attorneys address to Three Embarcadero Center, San Francisco, CA 94111-4006. Filed by Defendant Andrew Gissinger. (Davis, Thad) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 827 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: 4/23/2010 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MANDATE from 9th CCA filed, CCA # 09-80192, received in this district on 4/21/10. The Court, in its discretion, denies the petition for permission to appeal the district court's December 9, 2009 order granting class action certification. (cbr) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 826 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: 4/20/2010 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER from 9th CCA filed, CCA # 09-80192. Respondents' motion to file under seal the response to the petition for permission to appeal is granted. The court, in its discretion, denies the petition for permission to appeal the district court's December 9, 2009 order granting class action certification. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(f); Chamberlan v. Ford Motor Co., 402 F.3d 952(9th Cir. 2005) (per curiam). Order received in this district on 4/19/2010. (lr) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 825 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: 4/13/2010 Order on Application for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT- Order Modifying Scheduling Order. (mat) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 824 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: 4/13/2010 Application for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT- Joint Application to Modify Scheduling Order. (mat) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 823 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: 4/13/2010 Order on Application for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer: granting 821 Joint Application for an Order Granting Leave to File Documents Under Seal. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: 1. Joint Application to Modify Scheduling Order; and 2. [Proposed] Order Modifying Scheduling Order. Such documents shall be accepted for filing under seal in their entirety. (lom) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 822 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: 4/12/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge A. Howard Matz, re Request for Transcript of Sealed Proceedings 820 . The Court orders that the two sealed transcript sfrom Friday, april 2, 2010 may be released to Labaton Sucharow LLP and Hennigan, Bennett & Dorman LLP. Additionally, the Court authorizes the above release to attorneys to the first transcript to the other counsel who were present at that first hearing and to release the second transcript to the other counsel who were present at the second hearing, provided that they account to the Court reporter have many transcripts were so provided and pay here accordingly. (jp) (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 821 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: 4/9/2010 Application for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION for an order granting leave to file documents under seal filed by Defendants Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Securities, and Countrywide Capital V., Thomas DiNapoli, Barry Brahn, Angelo Mozilo, David Sambol, Eric P Sieracki, Stanford Kurland, Henry Cisneros, Jeffrey Cunningham, Robert Donato, Ben Enis, Martin Melone, Robert Parry, Oscar Robertson, Keith Russell, Harley Snyder, Carlos Garcis, Kathleen Brown, Michael Dougherty, KPMG, Andrew Gissinger, III Lodged proposed order. Modified on 4/12/2010 (shb). (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 820 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: 4/9/2010 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT OF SEALED PROCEEDINGS (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Swartz, Michael) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 819 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: 4/7/2010 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Countrywide Capital V, Countrywide Financial Corp, Consol Defendant Countrywide Securities Corporation of (1) JOINT APPLICATION GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; (2) [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. (Pastuszenski, Brian) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 818 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: 4/7/2010 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Countrywide Capital V, Countrywide Financial Corp, Consol Defendant Countrywide Securities Corporation of 1.) Joint Application to Modify Scheduling Order 2.) [Proposed] Order Modifying Scheduling Order. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Pastuszenski, Brian) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 817 Filed: 4/2/2010, Entered: 4/5/2010 Settlement ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES OF Mediation (Day 3 of 3) (non-evidentiary) before Judge A. Howard Matz: Cause called. Day three of confidential mediation is held. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (jp) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 816 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: 4/2/2010 Settlement ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES OF Mediation (Day 2 of 3) (non-evidentiary) held before Judge A. Howard Matz: Day two of confidential mediation is held. Day three will resume tomorrow, 4/2/2010 at 09:00 AM before Judge A. Howard Matz. (se) (Entered: 04/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 815 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: 4/1/2010 Stipulation for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION for Order Dismissing with Prejudice Securities Act Claims Against Defendant David Sambol filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Phillips, Lori) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 814 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: 4/1/2010 Settlement ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES: Proceedings: Mediation (Day 1 of 3) (Non-evidentiary) before Judge A. Howard Matz: Cause called. Court, mediator, and counsel confer regarding the ground rules for the three-day mediation and informs counsel of the steps taken by the Court in preparation for the mediation. After excusing the Court Reporter, the first day of the confidential mediation is held. Day two of mediation will resume tomorrow, 4/1/2010 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. Court Reporter: Cindy Nirenberg. (jp) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 813 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: 3/31/2010 Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supplemental Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Witness DISCLOSURE filed by Defendants Countrywide Capital V, Countrywide Financial Corp, Consol Defendant Countrywide Securities Corporation (Winawer, Lloyd) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 812 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: 3/31/2010 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES OF MOTION HEARING ON DEFENDANT KEITH P. RUSSELL'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES (fld 1/29/10 doc #712) held and completed - non-evidentiary before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. Court and counsel discuss the motion. The Court takes the motion under submission and its order will follow. Court Reporter: Margaret Babykin. (lom) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 811 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/31/2010 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE re Applicaiton for an Order to File Documents under seal 808 , etc., by electronic mail on 3/26/10 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (See attached document for service lists.)(lom) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 810 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/31/2010 Application for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION for an Order allowing Defendant to File Documents in support of his Motion for Summary Judgment Under Seal; Declaration of Jane H. Bu filed by Defendant Andrew Gissinger. Lodged [Prop] Order. (lom) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 809 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/31/2010 Application for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION to File Under Seal Confidential Documents in support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Eric P Sieracki.(lom) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 808 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/31/2010 Application for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION for an Order to File Documents in support of his Motion for Summary Judgment under seal, pursuant to Protective Order filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. Lodged [Prop] Order. (lom) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 807 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/31/2010 Application for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant David Sambol. Lodged [Prop] Order. (lom) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 806 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/31/2010 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROOF OF SERVICE of Application to File Under Seal Notice of Motion and Motion of Underwriter Defendants for Summary Judgment, etc., by hand delivery and US Mail on 3/26/10 filed by Underwriter Defendants A.G. Edwards & Sons, Inc., ABN Amro Incorporated, BNY Capital Markets, Inc., Banc of America Securities LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Greenwich Capital Markets, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities Inc., Lehman Brothers Inc., Merrill, Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets Corp., RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., RBC Dominion Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC, Wachovia Securities, Inc. (See attached document for service list.) (lom) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 805 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/31/2010 Application for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to File Under Seal, Pursuant to Order Governing the Treatment of Confidential Information dated 8/25/09 filed by Underwriter Defendants A.G. Edwards & Sons, Inc., ABN Amro Incorporated, BNY Capital Markets, Inc., Banc of America Securities LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Greenwich Capital Markets, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities Inc., Lehman Brothers Inc., Merrill, Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets Corp., RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., RBC Dominion Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC, Wachovia Securities, Inc. Lodged [Prop] Order. (lom) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 804 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/31/2010 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Kathleen Brown, Michael E Dougherty, re APPLICATION for Leave to File Under Seal 803 ; Memorandum of Points of Authorities, etc., by electronic mail on 3/26/10. (See attached document for service list.) (lom) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/31/2010 Application for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION for Leave to File Under Seal: Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication, Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law, and Declarations of Michael E. Dougherty, Kathleen Brown and Virginia F. Milstead filed by Defendants Kathleen Brown, Michael E Dougherty. Lodged [Prop] Order. (lom) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 802 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/31/2010 Application for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION for an Order Allowing Countrywide Defendants Leave to File Documents in Support of their Motion for Summary Judgment Under Seal filed by Defendants Countrywide Capital V, Countrywide Financial Corp, Countrywide Securities Corporation. Lodged [Prop] Order. (lom) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 801 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: 3/29/2010 Declaration (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Branko Jovanovic re Proof of Service (subsequent documents), Proof of Service (subsequent documents) 792 , Request for Judicial Notice, Request for Relief,,,, 789 filed by Defendants Countrywide Capital V, Countrywide Financial Corp, Consol Defendant Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Pastuszenski, Brian) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 800 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/29/2010 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF MEDIATOR (In Chambers) by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. The Court hereby APPOINTS the Honorable A. Howard Matz, U.S. District Court Judge, to act as a mediator in the above-referenced dispute. The existing case schedule, including all submission deadlines and hearing dates, shall remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by this Court. (lom) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 799 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/29/2010 Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer: granting 758 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Alexis L. Shapiro on behalf of Defendants Countrywide Financial Corp., Countrywide Capital V, Countrywide Securities Corporation, designating Lloyd Winawer as local counsel. (Fee Paid 3/26/10) (lom) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 798 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Henry G. Cisneros, Jeffrey M. Cunningham, Robert J. Donato, Ben Enis, Edwin Heller, Gwendolyn Stewart King, Martin R. Melone, Robert T. Parry, Oscar P. Robertson, Keith P. Russell, Harley W. Snyder, re Notice (Other), Notice (Other) 795 Proof of Service served on March 26, 2010. (Eth, Jordan) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 797 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Notice of Lodging
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF LODGING filed [Proposed] Judgment Granting Outside Directors' Motion for Summary Judgment re Notice (Other), Notice (Other) 795 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Eth, Jordan) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 796 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Declaration (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Jordan Eth re Notice (Other), Notice (Other) 795 Declaration of Jordan Eth in Support of Outside Directors' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Henry G. Cisneros, Jeffrey M. Cunningham, Robert J. Donato, Ben Enis, Edwin Heller, Martin R. Melone, Robert T. Parry, Oscar P. Robertson, Keith P. Russell, Harley W. Snyder, Consol Defendant Gwendolyn Stewart King. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12)(Eth, Jordan) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 795 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Motion and Motion filed by Defendants Henry G. Cisneros, Jeffrey M. Cunningham, Robert J. Donato, Ben Enis, Edwin Heller, Gwendolyn Stewart King, Martin R. Melone, Robert T. Parry, Oscar P. Robertson, Keith P. Russell, Harley W. Snyder. (Eth, Jordan) Modified on 3/30/2010 (lom). (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 794 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Eric P Sieracki, Proof of Service regarding Motion for Summary Judgment served on 3/26/2010. (Priebe, David) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 793 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Declaration (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of David C. Codell re Request for Judicial Notice 769 filed by Defendant Stanford L. Kurland. (Caldwell, Christopher) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 792 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendants Countrywide Capital V, Countrywide Financial Corp, Countrywide Securities Corporation, re MOTION for Summary Judgment 779 , Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) 775 , Request for Judicial Notice, Request for Relief,,,, 789 served on 3/26/10. (Pastuszenski, Brian) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 791 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Notice of Lodging
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF LODGING filed of [Proposed] Judgment re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Counts I, III, IV, and VI of the Second Consolidated Class Action Amended Complaint 790 (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Judgment in Favor of Defendant Stanford L. Kurland)(Caldwell, Christopher) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 790 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Counts I, III, IV, and VI of the Second Consolidated Class Action Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Stanford L. Kurland. Motion set for hearing on 6/9/2010 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. (Caldwell, Christopher) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 789 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION for Summary Judgment 779 filed by defendants Countrywide Capital V, Countrywide Financial Corp, Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-99, # 2 Exhibit 100-171, # 3 Exhibit 172-174, # 4 Exhibit 175-178, # 5 Exhibit 179 Part 1, # 6 Exhibit 179 Part 2, # 7 Exhibit 180-182, # 8 Exhibit 183-195, # 9 Exhibit 196-210, # 10 Exhibit 211-216, # 11 Exhibit 217-220, # 12 Exhibit 221-223, # 13 Exhibit 224-226, # 14 Exhibit 227 Part 1, # 15 Exhibit 227 Part 2, # 16 Exhibit 228-233, # 17 Exhibit 234-239, # 18 Proposed Order)(Pastuszenski, Brian) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 788 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant David Sambol, re: Defendant David Sambol's App To File Under Seal Documents ISO MSJ; [Proposed] Order; Lori Lynn Phillips's Declaration ISO MSJ; Defendant David Sambol's Declaration ISO MSJ; Statement Of Uncontroverted Facts And Conclusions Of Law ISO MSJ; Memo Of Points And Authorities ISO MSJ served on March 26, 2010. (Torpey, Michael) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 787 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Andrew Gissinger, 1) DEFENDANT GISSINGERS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, 2) DEFENDANT GISSINGERS STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, 3) GISSINGER'S DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, 4) BU'S DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS THEREIN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT served on 3/26/2010. (Carman, Eva) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 786 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION for Summary Judgment 785 filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-15, # 2 Exhibit 16-30)(Torpey, Michael) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 785 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant David Sambol. Motion set for hearing on 6/9/2010 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Torpey, Michael) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 784 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki filed by Defendant Eric P Sieracki. Motion set for hearing on 6/9/2010 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order regarding Motion for Summary Judgment)(Weiss, Shirli) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 783 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Motion Related Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF REQUEST AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CARLOS GARCIA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, ALTERNATIVELY, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Second Amended Consolidated Complaint 782 filed by Defendant Carlos M. Garcia. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Request for Judicial Notice, # 2 Supplement Proof of Service)(Sanders, James) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 782 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Second Amended Consolidated Complaint filed by Defendant Carlos M. Garcia. Motion set for hearing on 6/9/2010 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Carlos Garcia, # 2 Declaration of Elizabeth Graham, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Elizabeth Graham, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Elizabeth Graham, # 5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Elizabeth Graham, # 6 Exhibit D to Declaration of Elizabeth Graham, # 7 Exhibit E to Declaration of Elizabeth Graham, # 8 Exhibit F to Declaration of Elizabeth Graham, # 9 Exhibit G to Declaration of Elizabeth Graham, # 10 Exhibit H to Declaration of Elizabeth Graham, # 11 Exhibit I to Declaration of Elizabeth Graham, # 12 Exhibit J to Declaration of Elizabeth Graham, # 13 Proposed Order Granting Carlos Garcia's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 14 Supplement Proof of Service to MSJ papers, # 15 Supplement Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law)(Sanders, James) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 781 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Consol Defendant KPMG LLP of documents in support of motion for summary judgment. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 780 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by defendant Andrew Gissinger. Motion set for hearing on 6/9/2010 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. (Carman, Eva) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 779 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by defendants Countrywide Capital V, Countrywide Financial Corp, Countrywide Securities Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 6/9/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Winawer, Lloyd) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 778 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Andrew Gissinger of Application for an Order to File Documents Under Seal, [Proposed] Order Granting Application to File under Seal, Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, A. Gissinger's Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment; Gissinger's Declaration In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment; Bu's Declaration In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1)(Carman, Eva) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 777 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Henry G. Cisneros, Jeffrey M. Cunningham, Robert J. Donato, Ben Enis, Edwin Heller, Martin R. Melone, Robert T. Parry, Oscar P. Robertson, Keith P. Russell, Harley W. Snyder, Consol Defendant Gwendolyn Stewart King of Mem of P & A ISO Outside Dirs.' MSJ; Outside Dirs.' Statement of Uncontroverted Facts & Conclusions of Law; Decl. of H. Cisneros; Decl. of J. Cunningham; Decl. of R. Donato; Decl. of B. Enis; Decl. of E. Heller; Decl. of G. King; Decl. of M. Melone; Decl. of R. Parry; Decl. of O. Robertson; Decl. of K. Russell; Decl. of H. Snyder; Decl. of D.A. Rodriguez; Consol. Exs. to Decls. of Outside Dirs.' MSJ. (Eth, Jordan) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 776 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF LODGING filed re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Second Amended Consolidated Complaint 772 (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Judgment)(Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) Modified on 3/29/2010 (lom). (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 775 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendants Countrywide Capital V, Countrywide Financial Corp, Consol Defendant Countrywide Securities Corporation of 1. Countrywide Defendants Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment; 2. Countrywide Defendants Statement of Uncontroverted Facts; and 3. Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Countrywide Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment [Tab 5, Exhibit C to Brian Barney's Declaration, CD Format; Tab 32, Exhibit 12 to Matthew Lindenbaum's Declaration, CD Format]. (Winawer, Lloyd) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 774 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OF SERVICE filed by defendant KPMG LLP, re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Second Amended Consolidated Complaint 772 , Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) 773 and supporting documents served on 3/26/2010. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 773 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Consol Defendant KPMG LLP of documents in support of motion for summary judgment. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 772 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Second Amended Consolidated Complaint filed by defendant KPMG LLP. Motion set for hearing on 6/9/2010 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 771 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo of Application for an Order to File Documents Under Seal, Declaration of Lefler In Support of Application to File Under Seal, [Prop] Order Granting Application to File Under Seal, Memo of P's & A's In Support of Summary Judgment, Lefler Declaration In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, Statement of Uncontroverted Facts. (Siegel, David) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 770 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Stipulation to Reschedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION to Reschedule Exchange of Expert Reports and Expert Discovery. filed by Defendants Countrywide Capital V, Countrywide Financial Corp, Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proof of Service)(Winawer, Lloyd) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 769 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Stanford L. Kurland. (Caldwell, Christopher) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 768 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION for Summary Judgment 767 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Siegel, David) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 767 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. Motion set for hearing on 6/9/2010 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment)(Siegel, David) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 766 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OF SERVICE filed by Underwriter Defendants A.G. Edwards & Sons, Inc., ABN Amro Incorporated, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Banc of America Securities LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Greenwich Capital Markets, Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities Inc., Merrill, Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated, RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC, re Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), Notice of Manual Filing (G-92), Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) 765 served on 03/26/2010. (Kitchens, Dean) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 765 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Consol Defendants A.G. Edwards & Sons, Inc., ABN Amro Incorporated, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Banc of America Securities LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Greenwich Capital Markets, Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities Inc., Merrill, Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated, RBC Dain Rauscher Inc., UBS Securities LLC, Wachovia Capital Markets, LLC of Notice of Motion and Motion of Underwriter Defendants for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof; and Supporting Documents; Separate Statement of Uncontroverted Facts; Proposed Order Granting Underwriters' Summary Judgment Motion; Application to File Under Seal; Proposed Order Granting Application to File Under Seal. (Kitchens, Dean) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 764 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Eric P Sieracki of Application to File Under Seal; [Proposed] Order; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Statement of Uncontroverted Facts; Declaration of E. Sieracki; Declaration of M. Caplan. (Weiss, Shirli) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 763 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re Stipulation to Waive Sealed Envelope Requirement 754 by Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. It is hereby Ordered as follows: Defendants need not file the original or copies of documents filed under seal in sealed envelopes. Defendants will instead file all documents to support their motions for summary judgment in sealed bankers boxes. (lom) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 762 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Stanford L. Kurland of Declaration of David C. Codell and Exhibits in Support of Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant Stanford L. Kurland's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Caldwell, Christopher) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 761 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant Stanford L. Kurland of Application to file Under Seal and [Proposed] Order; Memo of Points and Authorities iso MSJ; Decl. of Stanford Kurland; Decl. of Christopher Caldwell; Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law. (Caldwell, Christopher) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 760 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Consol Defendants Kathleen Brown, Michael E Dougherty of Application for Leave to File Under Seal; Proposed Order; Notice/Motion for Summary Judgment; Statement; Declarations of Dougherty, Brown & Milstead; Proposed Order. (Waxman, Eric) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 759 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 Notice of Manual Filing (G-92)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Defendant David Sambol of APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL; [PROPOSED] ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES ISO OF MSJ; DEC OF LORI LYNN PHILLIPS; DEC OF DAVID SAMBOL; STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. (Torpey, Michael) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 758 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION for attorney Alexis L. Shapiro to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $185 receipt number 0973-6722048 paid.) filed by Defendants Countrywide Capital V, Countrywide Financial Corp, Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proof of Service)(Winawer, Lloyd) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 757 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: 3/25/2010 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Carlos M. Garcia, re Notice of Lodging 756 , APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Approval of Stipulation to Dismiss Action as Against Defendants Carlos Garcia and Andrew Gissinger III 755 served on 03-25-2010. (Sanders, James) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 756 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: 3/25/2010 Notice of Lodging
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF LODGING filed [Proposed] Order re APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Approval of Stipulation to Dismiss Action as Against Defendants Carlos Garcia and Andrew Gissinger III 755 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sanders, James) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 755 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: 3/25/2010 Application to Stay Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Approval of Stipulation to Dismiss Action as Against Defendants Carlos Garcia and Andrew Gissinger III filed by Defendant Carlos M. Garcia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Stipulation to Dismiss Action with Prejudice as to Defendants Carlos Garcia and Andrew Gissinger III)(Sanders, James) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 754 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: 3/25/2010 Stipulation to Waive
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION to Waive Sealed Envelope Requirement of Local Rule 79-5.1 For Documents Filed In Support of Defendants' Motions For Summary Judgment filed by defendants Countrywide Capital V, Countrywide Financial Corp, Countrywide Securities Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proof Of Service)(Winawer, Lloyd) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 753 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: 3/25/2010 Supplement (Motion related)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENT to MOTION for Protective Order for Precluding Plaintiffs' Discovery of Documents Subpoenaed From the SEC 741 Supplemental Memorandum filed by Defendants Angelo Mozilo, David Sambol, Eric P Sieracki. (Tu, Michael) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 752 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: 3/25/2010 Notice of MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION re MOTION for Protective Order for Precluding Plaintiffs' Discovery of Documents Subpoenaed From the SEC 741 filed by Defendants Angelo Mozilo, David Sambol, Eric P Sieracki. Motion set for hearing on 4/19/2010 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mariana R. Pfaelzer. (Tu, Michael) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 751 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: 3/24/2010 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Former Outside Directors' Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures of Expert Testimony (Besirof, Philip) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 750 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: 3/24/2010 Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Thomas P DiNapoli, re Miscellaneous Document 749 served on 3/24/ 2010. (Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace