Securities and Exchange Commission v. Angelo Mozilo et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:09-cv-03994
District Judge John F. Walter, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 29, 2021 at 12:08 PM ST (2.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States Securities and Exchange Commission United States Securities and Exchange Commission, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Securities and Exchange Commission"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Spencer Evan Bendell +1 323 965 3998 +1 323 965 3908 bendells@sec.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lynn M Dean +1 323 965 3998 +1 323 965 3908 deanl@sec.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sam S Puathasnanon +1 323 965 4503 +1 323 965 3908 puathasnanons@sec.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paris Ahkeem Wynn +1 323 965 4562 +1 323 965 3908 wynnp@sec.gov
v.
No Logo Angelo Mozilo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Irell & Manella, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric J Carsten +1 310 277 1010 +1 310 203 7199 ecarsten@irell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles E. Elder +1 310 277 1010 +1 310 203 7199 celder@irell.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Randall Louis Jackson +1 310 203 7081 +1 310 203 7199 rjackson@irell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel P Lefler +1 310 277 1010 +1 310 203 7199 dlefler@irell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Siegel +1 310 277 1010 +1 310 203 7199 dsiegel@irell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vicki Chou +1 213 894 8692 +1 213 894 0141 vicki.chou@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Dean Aufhauser +1 202 434 5049 +1 202 434 5029 daufhauser@wc.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven M Cady +1 202 434 5000 +1 202 434 5029 scady@wc.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel Bryant Davidoff +1 202 434 5648 +1 202 434 5029 sdavidoff@wc.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tobin J Romero +1 202 434 5000 +1 202 434 5029 tromero@wc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/18/2009 Caroline Elizabeth Kane +1 213 443 5314 +1 213 443 5400 caroline.kane@wilmerhale.com
TERMINATED: 12/18/2009 David C Marcus +1 213 443 5300 +1 213 443 5400 david.marcus@wilmerhale.com
No Logo David Sambol, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lori Lynn Phillips +1 206 389 6075 +1 206 515 8914 lori.phillips@hellerehrman.com

Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

No Logo Eric Sieracki, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shirli Fabri Weiss +1 619 699 3650 +1 619 699 2701 shirli.weiss@dlapiper.com

Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

No Logo John P McMurray, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean C Knowles +1 206 359 6224 +1 206 359 9000 sknowles@perkinscoie.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David F Taylor +1 206 359 8440 +1 206 359 9440 DFTaylor@perkinscoie.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 77
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (526) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None Report
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 10/27/2020, Entered: None Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: None Report
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 7/30/2020, Entered: None Report
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: None Report
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: None Report
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Report
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Report
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Report
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None For Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Report
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Report
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Disbursement of funds
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Disbursement of funds
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Report
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Report
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Report
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Report
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Report
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None For Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Report
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Report
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None Report
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Report
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None Report
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None Report
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: granting 488 SEC Application for Order to Establish a Fair fund, Appoint Rust consulting, Appoint Damasco and Associates, etc. (se) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              APPLICATION for Order for (1) Establishing a Fair Fund, (2) Appointing Rust Consulting as Distribution Agent, and (3) Appointing Damasco & Associates, LLP as Tax Administrator filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Puathasnanon, Sam) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT by Judge John F. Walter. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Mozilo is permanently restrained and enjoined. FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Mozilo is liable for disgorgement in the amount of $44,706,304 together with prejudgment interest thereon in the amount of $293,696, for a total of $45,000,000, and a civil penalty in the amount of $22,500,000 pursuant to Section 20(d)(1) of the Securities Act, 15 USC § 77t(d)(1), and Sections 21(d)(3) and 21A(a) of the Exchange Act, 15 USC §§ 78u(d)(3) and 78u-1(a). $25,000,000 of the $45,000,000 disgorgement (inclusive of prejudgment interest) obligation is deemed fully and finally satisfied by sums that were deposited into escrow on or about 9/15/2010 in connection with, and pursuant to the terms of, the settlement of the action styled In re Countrywide Financial Corporation Securities Litigation, Lead Case No. CV 07-05295 MRP. Mozilo shall satisfy his civil penalty obligation by causing the payment of $5,250,000 within twenty business days of the issuance of this Final Judgment, another $6,000,000 on or before 12/31/2010, and another $11,250,000 by no later than 2/1/2011, as directed in writing by the Commissions counsel in this action, either to the Clerk of this Court or to the designated escrow agent for the settlement funds in CFCSL. Related to: Settlement Agreement 481 (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (jp) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT ERIC SIERACKI by Judge John F. Walter. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Sieracki and Sieracki's, servants, employees, attorneys-in-fact, and all persons in active concert or participation with them who receive actual notice of this Final Judgment by personal service or otherwise are permanently restrained and enjoined. FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Sieracki shall pay a civil penalty in the amount of $130,000 pursuant to Section 20(d)(1) of the Securities Act, 15 U.S.C. § 77t(d)(1), and Section 21(d)(3) of the Exchange Act, 15 U.S.C. § 78u(d)(3). Sieracki shall satisfy his obligation to pay the civil penalty by causing the payment of $130,000 within twenty business days of the issuance of this Final Judgment (see attached Final Judgment for further information). Related to: Settlement Agreement 483 . (jp) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT DAVID SAMBOL by Judge John F. Walter. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Sambol is permanently restrained and enjoined (see attached Final Judgment for further information). FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Sambol shall cause to be paid an amount of $4,967,367 together with prejudgment interest thereon in the amount of $32,633 for a total of $5,000,000 representing disgorgement paid pursuant to the terms of Paragraphs 2(b) and 3 of the Consent, and a civil penalty in the amount of $520,000 pursuant to Section 20(d)(1) of the Securities Act, 15 U.S.C. § 77t(d)(1), and Section 21(d)(3) of the Exchange Act, 15 U.S.C. § 78u(d)(3). Within twenty business days of the entry of this Final Judgment, Sambol shall satisfy the obligation to pay the aforementioned disgorgement and civil penalty by causing to be paid $5,520,000, as directed in writing by the Commission's counsel in this action, (see attached document for further information). Related to: Settlement Agreement 482 . (jp) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      MINUTES: PROCEEDINGS: STATUS CONFERENCE RE: PROPOSED SETTLEMENT AND FINAL JUDGMENTS before Judge John F. Walter: For the reasons stated on the record, the Court finds the proposed settlement and Final Judgments in this case fair, adequate, reasonable, in the public interest, and consistent with the goals of the securities laws, and signs the proposed Final Judgments. The trial date, scheduled in this action for 10/19/2010, is hereby VACATED. Court Reporter: Victoria Valine. (jp) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Consent of Eric Sieracki filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Final Judgment)(McCoy, John) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Consent of David Sambol filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Final Judgment)(McCoy, John) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Consent of Angelo Mozilo filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Final Judgment)(McCoy, John) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              MINUTE IN CHAMBERS ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge John F. Walter:The parties are hereby notified that a Status Conference set for 10/15/2010 AT 11:00 AM before Judge John F. Walter. (jp) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                Offer of Proof re Expert Witness Richard K. Green Ph.D. Pursuant to Court's September 27, 2010 Order filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(McCoy, John) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Offer of Proof in Opposition to David Sambol's Motion in Limine No. 4 Regarding "Lessons Learned" Documents filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission re: MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Evidence Of Countrywide's "Lessons Learned" Analysis MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Evidence Of Countrywide's "Lessons Learned" Analysis 382 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lynn M. Dean)(McCoy, John) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 10/8/10; 10:00 a.m. (Seijas, Pamela) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 10/08/10; 10:00 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Pamela A. Batalo, phone number www.pamelabatalo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/3/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/13/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2011. (Seijas, Pamela) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        MINUTES OF HEARING ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE before Judge John F. Walter: Case called. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court makes the following rulings: David Sambol's Renewed Motion in Limine No. 1 to Preclude the Testimony of Richard K. Green [fld 10/5/10, doc 449 ] DEFERRED David Sambol's Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Any Reliance On Or Citation Or Reference To Regulation S-K, Item 303 [fld 9/24/10, doc 377 ] DENIED David Sambol's Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Handwritten Note By John McMurray filed by Defendant David Sambol [fld 9/24/10, doc 379 ] DEFERRED David Sambol's Motion in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Evidence Of Countrywide's "Lessons Learned" Analysis [fld 9/24/10, doc 382 ] DEFERRED David Sambol's Motion in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Evidence of the Advancement of Legal Expenses to Non-Party Witnesses [fld 9/24/10, doc 384] DENIED Eric Sieracki's Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence, Testimony and Argument Challenging Adequacy, Accuracy or GAAP-Compliance of Countrywide's Financial Statements During RelativePeriod [fld 10/5/10, doc 444 ] DEFERRED Eric Sieracki's Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude All References to Fall 2007 Notes [fld 9/24/10, doc 380 ] DENIEDEric Sieracki's Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude All References to Emails from Mr. Sieracki to His Late Father [fld 9/24/10, doc 381 ] DENIED Eric Sieracki's Motion in Limine No. 4 to Exclude All References to Other Litigation Matters And/or Proceedings [fld 9/24/10, doc 383 ] DENIED AS MOOT Angelo Mozilo's Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Alan Hess [fld 10/5/10, doc 451 ]UNDER SUBMISSION Angelo Mozilo's Motion in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Improper Evidence of Materiality [fld 9/24/10, doc 363 ] UNDER SUBMISSIONAngelo Mozilo's Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Improper Lay Opinion Testimony [fld 9/24/10, doc 366] UNDER SUBMISSION Angelo Mozilo's Motion in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Plaintiff's Factually and Logically Unsustainable Arguments [fld 9/24/10, doc 395 ] DENIED SEC's Renewed Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence of Purported Reliance on Federal Regulatory Agencies [fld 10/5/10, doc 447 ] DENIED. SEC's Motion in Limine No 2 and 5 to Exclude Certain Opinions of Defendants' Experts Based on Rules 702, 704 and 403 of the Federal Rules of Evidence [fld 10/5/10, doc 445 ] UNDER SUBMISSION SEC's Renewed Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Evidence of Purported Reliance on Professionals [fld 10/5/10, doc 455 ] DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Court GRANTS Defendants' Ex Parte Application for An Order Shortening Time for Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Three Peremptory Challenges Per Party [fld 10/7/10, doc 472 ]. The Motion [doc 371 ] is set for hearing on 10/19/2010 at 8:30 AM. The Jury Trial remains set for 10/19/2010 at 8:30 AM. Court Reporter: Pam Batalo. (jp) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle: denying 330 Motion to Quash (ec) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                            OPPOSITION re: MOTION for Order for Three Peremptory Challenges Per Party 471 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Paris A. Wynn)(Wynn, Paris) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                              EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing to October 8, 2010 on Defendants' Motion For Three Peremptory Challenges Per Party 471 filed by Defendants Angelo Mozilo, David Sambol, Eric Sieracki. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Declaration of Randall L. Jackson, # 3 Proposed Order)(Siegel, David) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Three Peremptory Challenges Per Party filed by Defendants Angelo Mozilo, David Sambol, Eric Sieracki. Motion set for hearing on 10/8/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Declaration of Randall L. Jackson, # 3 Proposed Order)(Siegel, David) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  MINUTES OF Final Pretrial Conference held before Judge John F. Walter. Hearing on Motions in Limine remains set for October 8, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. and the Jury Trial remains set for October 19, 2010, at 8:30 am. Court Reporter: Victoria Valine. (kbr) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    OBJECTIONS to Notice (Other) 460 of SEC's Intent to Call Defendants in Case-In-Chief filed by Defendants Angelo Mozilo, David Sambol, Eric Sieracki. (Siegel, David) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      JOINDER filed by Defendant David Sambol joining in MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY AND ARGUMENT CHALLENGING ADEQUACY, ACCURACY OR GAAP-COMPLIANCE OF COUNTRYWIDE'S FINANCIAL STATEMENTS DURING RELATIVE PERIOD MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY AND ARGUMENT CHALLENGING ADEQUACY, ACCURACY OR GAAP-COMPLIANCE OF COUNTRYWIDE'S FINANCIAL STATEMENTS DURING RELATIVE PERIOD 444 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Alan Hess MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Alan Hess 451 . (Brown, Walter) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        JOINDER in MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Alan Hess MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Alan Hess 451 , Renewed MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Preclude THE TESTIMONY OF RICHARD K. GREENRenewed MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Preclude THE TESTIMONY OF RICHARD K. GREEN 449 filed by Defendant Eric Sieracki. (Weiss, Shirli) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          JOINDER in MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY AND ARGUMENT CHALLENGING ADEQUACY, ACCURACY OR GAAP-COMPLIANCE OF COUNTRYWIDE'S FINANCIAL STATEMENTS DURING RELATIVE PERIOD MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY AND ARGUMENT CHALLENGING ADEQUACY, ACCURACY OR GAAP-COMPLIANCE OF COUNTRYWIDE'S FINANCIAL STATEMENTS DURING RELATIVE PERIOD 444 , Renewed MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Preclude THE TESTIMONY OF RICHARD K. GREENRenewed MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Preclude THE TESTIMONY OF RICHARD K. GREEN 449 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Siegel, David) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Parties' Designated Testimonies of Angelo Mozilo Filed by Angelo Mozilo, David Sambol, Securities and Exchange Commission, Eric Sieracki. (McCoy, John) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Parties' Designated Investigative and Deposition Testimony of David Sambol Angelo Mozilo, David Sambol, Securities and Exchange Commission, Eric Sieracki. (McCoy, John) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Parties' Designated Deposition Testimony of Joseph Miller Angelo Mozilo, David Sambol, Securities and Exchange Commission, Eric Sieracki. (McCoy, John) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Parties' Designated Deposition Testimony of Julie Scammahorn Angelo Mozilo, David Sambol, Securities and Exchange Commission, Eric Sieracki. (McCoy, John) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Designated Testimonies of Eric Sieracki Angelo Mozilo, David Sambol, Securities and Exchange Commission, Eric Sieracki. (McCoy, John) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Intent to Call Defendants in Its Case-in-Chief filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (McCoy, John) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. correcting MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Alan Hess MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Alan Hess 451 (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Joint Memorandum of Points and Authorities Regarding Angelo Mozilo's Motion In Limine No. 1 To Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Alan Hess)(Siegel, David) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Tobin J. Romero in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Renewed MOTION IN LIMINE #3 to Exclude Evidence of Purported Reliance on Professionals 455 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Paris A. Wynn in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Alan Hess MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Alan Hess 451 , Renewed MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Preclude THE TESTIMONY OF RICHARD K. GREENRenewed MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Preclude THE TESTIMONY OF RICHARD K. GREEN 449 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 143, # 6 Exhibit 149, # 7 Exhibit 627)(Wynn, Paris) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Shirli F. Weiss in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY AND ARGUMENT CHALLENGING ADEQUACY, ACCURACY OR GAAP-COMPLIANCE OF COUNTRYWIDE'S FINANCIAL STATEMENTS DURING RELATIVE PERIOD MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY AND ARGUMENT CHALLENGING ADEQUACY, ACCURACY OR GAAP-COMPLIANCE OF COUNTRYWIDE'S FINANCIAL STATEMENTS DURING RELATIVE PERIOD 444 filed by Defendant Eric Sieracki. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C7a, # 4 Exhibit C7b, # 5 Exhibit C7c, # 6 Exhibit C7d, # 7 Exhibit C7e, # 8 Exhibit C7f, # 9 Exhibit C7g, # 10 Exhibit C7h, # 11 Exhibit D)(Weiss, Shirli) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND Renewed MOTION IN LIMINE #3 to Exclude Evidence of Purported Reliance on Professionals filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion set for hearing on 10/8/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Spencer E. Bendell, # 2 Proposed Order)(Wynn, Paris) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Parties' Designated Depostion Testimony of Oscar Robertson filed by All Parties Angelo Mozilo, David Sambol, Securities and Exchange Commission, Eric Sieracki. (McCoy, John) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF DESIGNATED DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF HUGH WEST filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Brown, Walter) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Daniel P. Lefler in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Alan Hess MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Alan Hess 451 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-2)(Siegel, David) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Alan Hess filed by defendant Angelo Mozilo. Motion set for hearing on 10/8/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Joint Memorandum of Points and Authorities)(Siegel, David) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Lynn M. Dean in support of Renewed MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Evidence of Purported Reliance on Federal Regulatory AgenciesRenewed MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Evidence of Purported Reliance on Federal Regulatory Agencies 447 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 900, # 25 Exhibit 901, # 26 Exhibit 902, # 27 Exhibit 903, # 28 Exhibit 904-1, # 29 Exhibit 904-2, # 30 Exhibit 1012, # 31 Exhibit 1013, # 32 Exhibit 1401, # 33 Exhibit 4123, # 34 Exhibit 4305, # 35 Exhibit 4911, # 36 Exhibit 4951, # 37 Exhibit 5055, # 38 Exhibit 5077, # 39 Exhibit 5411, # 40 Exhibit 5452, # 41 Exhibit 5700, # 42 Exhibit 5752, # 43 Exhibit 6759, # 44 Exhibit 6832, # 45 Exhibit 7332)(Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND Renewed MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Preclude THE TESTIMONY OF RICHARD K. GREEN filed by Defendant David Sambol. Motion set for hearing on 10/8/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Declaration of Penelope Graboys Blair, # 4 Exhibit A to Graboys Blair Decl.)(Brown, Walter) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Parties' Designated Deposition Testimony of Henry Cisneros filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND Renewed MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Evidence of Purported Reliance on Federal Regulatory Agencies filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion set for hearing on 10/8/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF LODGING filed DOCUMENTS RELATED TO DEFENDANT ERIC SIERACKI'S REVISED re MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY AND ARGUMENT CHALLENGING ADEQUACY, ACCURACY OR GAAP-COMPLIANCE OF COUNTRYWIDE'S FINANCIAL STATEMENTS DURING RELATIVE PERIOD MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY AND ARGUMENT CHALLENGING ADEQUACY, ACCURACY OR GAAP-COMPLIANCE OF COUNTRYWIDE'S FINANCIAL STATEMENTS DURING RELATIVE PERIOD 444 (Weiss, Shirli) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Certain Opinions of Defendants' Experts Based on Rules 702, 704 and 403 of the Federal Rules of Evidence filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion set for hearing on 10/8/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Paris A. Wynn, # 2 Proposed Order)(Wynn, Paris) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY AND ARGUMENT CHALLENGING ADEQUACY, ACCURACY OR GAAP-COMPLIANCE OF COUNTRYWIDE'S FINANCIAL STATEMENTS DURING RELATIVE PERIOD filed by Defendant Eric Sieracki. Motion set for hearing on 10/8/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: # 1 Revised Joint Brief re Motion in Limine #1, # 2 Proposed Order)(Weiss, Shirli) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE (Joint) of Designated Deposition Testimony of Sherry Whitley filed by Defendant Eric Sieracki. (Morgan, Nicolas) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST to Supplement Eric P. Sieracki's Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Admission Nos. 30-31, 43, 58, 64-67 & 69, And Requests for Production Nos. 3-14, 52-54, & 59 re MOTION to Compel Responses to Requests for Admission Nos. 30-31, 43, 58, 64-67 & 69 and Requests for Production Nos. 3-14, 52-54 & 59 151 filed by Defendant Eric Sieracki Eric Sieracki. (Coopersmith, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            DAVID SAMBOL's RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S OFFER OF PROOF REGARDING REGULATION S-K (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James A.Meyers, # 2 Exhibits 1 - 5 to Meyers Decl.)(Brown, Walter) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. correcting MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Improper Lay Opinion Testimony MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Improper Lay Opinion Testimony 366 (Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENT to MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Evidence of the Advancement of Legal Expenses to Non-Party Witnesses MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Evidence of the Advancement of Legal Expenses to Non-Party Witnesses 384 filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Brown, Walter) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Designated Deposition Testimony of Van Hesser Angelo Mozilo, David Sambol, Securities and Exchange Commission, Eric Sieracki. (McCoy, John) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Designated Deposition Testimony of Christopher Brendler Angelo Mozilo, David Sambol, Securities and Exchange Commission, Eric Sieracki. (McCoy, John) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Offer of Proof Regarding Item 303 of Regulation S-K filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sam S. Puathasnanon)(Puathasnanon, Sam) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 10/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTIONS to Notice of Lodging 432 of Defendants' Joint Satement of Proposed Voir Dire Through Juror Questionnaire filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Wynn, Paris) (Entered: 10/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          CIVIL TRIAL ORDER: This matter is set for trial before the Honorable John F. Walter, Courtroom No. 16 (1st Floor, Spring Street level), United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, California. The Court's procedures and requirements for civil trials (see attached Order for further information). (jp) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT of the Case filed by Defendants Angelo Mozilo, David Sambol, Eric Sieracki, Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission (McCoy, John) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF LODGING filed Defendants' Joint Statement re Voir Dire Questions (Proposed) 431 (Attachments: # 1 Defendants' Proposed Juror Questionnaire)(Siegel, David) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Voir Dire Questions Angelo Mozilo, David Sambol, Securities and Exchange Commission, Eric Sieracki.. (Wynn, Paris) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant Eric Sieracki. re OFFER OF PROOF FOR DEFENDANTS' EXPERT as to Miscellaneous Document 423 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit F, # 6 Exhibit G, # 7 Exhibit H, # 8 Exhibit B)(Caplan, Matthew) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Offer of Proof re: Expert Witness Richard K. Green PH.D. Pursuant to Court's September 27, 2010 Order filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Expert Report of Professor Richard K. Green, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Rebuttal Expert Report of Professor Richard Green, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Transcript of Deposition of Richard K. Green)(McCoy, John) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Offer of Proof for Defendants' Expert Christopher Culp, Ph.D. filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Siegel, David) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        OFFER OF PROOF FOR DEFENDANTS' EXPERT JOSEPH A. GRUNDFEST (Attachments: # 1 Documents Supporting Grundfest Opinions 1-8, # 2 Curriculum Vitae of Joseph A. Grundfest, # 3 Expert Report of Joseph A. Grundfest, part 1, # 4 Expert Report of Joseph A. Grundfest, part 2, # 5 Expert Report of Joseph A. Grundfest, part 3, # 6 Expert Report of Joseph A. Grundfest, part 4, # 7 Expert Report of Joseph A. Grundfest, part 5, # 8 Expert Report of Joseph A. Grundfest, part 6, # 9 Expert Report of Joseph A. Grundfest, part 7, # 10 Expert Report of Joseph A. Grundfest, part 8, # 11 Expert Report of Joseph A. Grundfest, part 9, # 12 Rebuttal Expert Report of Joseph A. Grundfest, # 13 Transcript of Deposition of Joseph A. Grundfest)(Graboys Blair, Penelope) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Offer of Proof re: Expert Witness Prof. Michael LaCour-Little Pursuant to Court's September 27, 2010 Order filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Expert Report of Professor Michael LaCour-Little, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Rebuttal Expert Report of Professor Michael LaCour-Little, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Transcript of Deposition of Michael LaCour-Little)(Puathasnanon, Sam) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Offer of Proof for Defendants' Expert Kenneth M. Lehn, Ph.D. filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Siegel, David) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              OFFER OF PROOF FOR DEFENDANTS' EXPERT KERRY D. VANDELL, Ph.D. (Attachments: # 1 Documents Supporting Vandell Opinions 1-7, # 2 Curriculum Vitae of Mr. Kerry D. Vandell, Ph.D., # 3 Expert Report of Kerry D. Vandell, Ph.D., # 4 Rebuttal Report of Mr. Kerry D. Vandell, Ph.D., # 5 Transcript of Deposition of Kerry D. Vandell, Ph.D.)(Graboys Blair, Penelope) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                OFFER OF PROOF FOR DEFENDANTS' EXPERT filed by Defendant Eric Sieracki (Caplan, Matthew) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Offer of Proof re: Expert Witness Alan Hess, PH.D. Pursuant to Court's September 27, 2010 Order filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Expert Report of Alan Hess, PH.D., # 2 Exhibit 2 - Rebuttal Expert Report of Alan Hess, PH.D., # 3 Exhibit 3 - Transcript of Deposition of Alan Hess)(Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OFFER OF PROOF FOR DEFENDANTS' EXPERT CHARLES GRICE (Attachments: # 1 Documents Supporting Grice Opinions 1-5, # 2 Curriculum Vitae of Mr. Charles Grice, # 3 Rebuttal Report of Mr. Charles Grice, # 4 Transcript of Deposition of Charles Grice)(Graboys Blair, Penelope) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental PRETRIAL STIPULATION regarding Exhibits. (McCoy, John) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT of in Response to Defendants' Motion Requesting Modification of Case Management Order MOTION for Order for Granting Request to Modify Case Management Order 347 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (McCoy, John) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE IN CHAMBERS ORDER REGARDING OFFERS OF PROOF FOR EXPERT WITNESSES by Judge John F. Walter: Based on the Court's preliminary review of the pending motions in limine seeking to exclude the testimony of the various experts, the Court orders the parties to file, for each expert that will testify at trial, the experts curriculum vitae, report, deposition transcript (a single-sided, mini-script copy), and an offer of proof containing the opinion or opinions which counsel expects to elicit from each expert on or before 9/30/2010. (See attached Minute Order for further information). (jp) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION in opposition to re: REQUEST for Order for to Cross-Examine Eric P. Sieracki Pursuant to Local Rule 7-8 416 filed by Defendant Eric Sieracki. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shirli F. Weiss)(Caplan, Matthew) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST for Order for to Cross-Examine Eric P. Sieracki Pursuant to Local Rule 7-8 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. Request set for hearing on 10/8/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McCoy, John) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission re MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Evidence of Purported Reliance on Professionals MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Evidence of Purported Reliance on Professionals 373 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission re MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Legal Conclusions and Evidentiary Narratives Offered by Defendants' Experts MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Legal Conclusions and Evidentiary Narratives Offered by Defendants' Experts 372 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (McCoy, John) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission re Corrected MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Evidence of Purported Reliance on Federal Regulatory AgenciesCorrected MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Evidence of Purported Reliance on Federal Regulatory Agencies 371 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission re MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Certain Testimony of Defendants' Experts Based on Rule 702 of the Federal Rules of Evidence MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Certain Testimony of Defendants' Experts Based on Rule 702 of the Federal Rules of Evidence 375 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant Eric Sieracki. (Weiss, Shirli) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINDER filed by Defendant David Sambol joining in MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY AND ARGUMENT CHALLENGING ADEQUACY, ACCURACY OR GAAP - COMPLIANCE OF COUNTRYWIDE'S FINANCIAL STATEMENTS DURING RELEVANT PERIOD MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY AND ARGUMENT CHALLENGING ADEQUACY, ACCURACY OR GAAP - COMPLIANCE OF COUNTRYWIDE'S FINANCIAL STATEMENTS DURING RELEVANT PERIOD MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY AND ARGUMENT CHALLENGING ADEQUACY, ACCURACY OR GAAP - COMPLIANCE OF COUNTRYWIDE'S FINANCIAL STATEMENTS DURING RELEVANT PERIOD MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY AND ARGUMENT CHALLENGING ADEQUACY, ACCURACY OR GAAP - COMPLIANCE OF COUNTRYWIDE'S FINANCIAL STATEMENTS DURING RELEVANT PERIOD 378 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Evidence or Argument in Support of a Theory of Negligence MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Evidence or Argument in Support of a Theory of Negligence 369 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Improper Evidence of Materiality MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Improper Evidence of Materiality 363 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Alan Hess MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Alan Hess 361 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude ALL REFERENCES TO FALL 2007 NOTES MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude ALL REFERENCES TO FALL 2007 NOTES 380 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude ALL REFERENCES TO EMAILS FROM MR. SIERACKI TO HIS LATE FATHER MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude ALL REFERENCES TO EMAILS FROM MR. SIERACKI TO HIS LATE FATHER 381 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Plaintiff's Factually and Logically Unsustainable Arguments MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Plaintiff's Factually and Logically Unsustainable Arguments 395 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude ALL REFERENCES TO OTHER LITIGATION MATTERS AND/OR PROCEEDINGS MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude ALL REFERENCES TO OTHER LITIGATION MATTERS AND/OR PROCEEDINGS 383 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Improper Lay Opinion Testimony MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Improper Lay Opinion Testimony 366 . (Brown, Walter) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of George Gigounas re MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Evidence Regarding Preparation of Countrywide Financial Statements and Purported Compliance with GAAP MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Evidence Regarding Preparation of Countrywide Financial Statements and Purported Compliance with GAAP 374 filed by Defendant Eric Sieracki. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Caplan, Matthew) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Eric P. Sieracki re MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Evidence of Purported Reliance on Professionals MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Evidence of Purported Reliance on Professionals 373 filed by Defendant Eric Sieracki. (Caplan, Matthew) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of LORI LYNN PHILLIPS IN OPPOSITION TO Corrected MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Evidence of Purported Reliance on Federal Regulatory AgenciesCorrected MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Evidence of Purported Reliance on Federal Regulatory Agencies 371 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Legal Conclusions and Evidentiary Narratives Offered by Defendants' Experts MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Legal Conclusions and Evidentiary Narratives Offered by Defendants' Experts 372 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Certain Testimony of Defendants' Experts Based on Rule 702 of the Federal Rules of Evidence MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Certain Testimony of Defendants' Experts Based on Rule 702 of the Federal Rules of Evidence 375 filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A - C, # 2 Exhibit D, part 1, # 3 Exhibit D, part 2, # 4 Exhibits E - L, # 5 Exhibit M, # 6 Exhibits N - O)(Brown, Walter) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINDER in MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY AND ARGUMENT CHALLENGING ADEQUACY, ACCURACY OR GAAP - COMPLIANCE OF COUNTRYWIDE'S FINANCIAL STATEMENTS DURING RELEVANT PERIOD MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY AND ARGUMENT CHALLENGING ADEQUACY, ACCURACY OR GAAP - COMPLIANCE OF COUNTRYWIDE'S FINANCIAL STATEMENTS DURING RELEVANT PERIOD MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY AND ARGUMENT CHALLENGING ADEQUACY, ACCURACY OR GAAP - COMPLIANCE OF COUNTRYWIDE'S FINANCIAL STATEMENTS DURING RELEVANT PERIOD MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY AND ARGUMENT CHALLENGING ADEQUACY, ACCURACY OR GAAP - COMPLIANCE OF COUNTRYWIDE'S FINANCIAL STATEMENTS DURING RELEVANT PERIOD 378 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Evidence of the Advancement of Legal Expenses to Non-Party Witnesses MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Evidence of the Advancement of Legal Expenses to Non-Party Witnesses 384 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude The Testimony of Richard K. Green MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude The Testimony of Richard K. Green 376 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Handwritten Note By John McMurray MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Handwritten Note By John McMurray 379 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude ALL REFERENCES TO FALL 2007 NOTES MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude ALL REFERENCES TO FALL 2007 NOTES 380 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Evidence Of Countrywide's "Lessons Learned" Analysis MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Evidence Of Countrywide's "Lessons Learned" Analysis 382 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Any Reliance On Or Citation Or Reference To Regulation S-K, Item 303 MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Any Reliance On Or Citation Or Reference To Regulation S-K, Item 303 377 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude ALL REFERENCES TO EMAILS FROM MR. SIERACKI TO HIS LATE FATHER MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude ALL REFERENCES TO EMAILS FROM MR. SIERACKI TO HIS LATE FATHER 381 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude ALL REFERENCES TO OTHER LITIGATION MATTERS AND/OR PROCEEDINGS MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude ALL REFERENCES TO OTHER LITIGATION MATTERS AND/OR PROCEEDINGS 383 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Siegel, David) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINDER filed by Defendant Eric Sieracki joining in MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Evidence of the Advancement of Legal Expenses to Non-Party Witnesses MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Evidence of the Advancement of Legal Expenses to Non-Party Witnesses 384 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Evidence or Argument in Support of a Theory of Negligence MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Evidence or Argument in Support of a Theory of Negligence 369 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Improper Evidence of Materiality MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Improper Evidence of Materiality 363 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude The Testimony of Richard K. Green MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude The Testimony of Richard K. Green 376 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Alan Hess MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Alan Hess 361 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Handwritten Note By John McMurray MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Handwritten Note By John McMurray 379 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Evidence Of Countrywide's "Lessons Learned" Analysis MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Evidence Of Countrywide's "Lessons Learned" Analysis 382 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Any Reliance On Or Citation Or Reference To Regulation S-K, Item 303 MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Any Reliance On Or Citation Or Reference To Regulation S-K, Item 303 377 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Plaintiff's Factually and Logically Unsustainable Arguments MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Plaintiff's Factually and Logically Unsustainable Arguments 395 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Improper Lay Opinion Testimony MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Improper Lay Opinion Testimony 366 . (Caplan, Matthew) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PRETRIAL STIPULATION regarding Exhibits. (Attachments: # 1 Pre-Trial Exhibit Stipulation Part 2)(McCoy, John) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Lynn M. Dean in opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Evidence of the Advancement of Legal Expenses to Non-Party Witnesses MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Evidence of the Advancement of Legal Expenses to Non-Party Witnesses 384 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Evidence or Argument in Support of a Theory of Negligence MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Evidence or Argument in Support of a Theory of Negligence 369 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Alan Hess MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Alan Hess 361 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude ALL REFERENCES TO FALL 2007 NOTES MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude ALL REFERENCES TO FALL 2007 NOTES 380 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Evidence Of Countrywide's "Lessons Learned" Analysis MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Evidence Of Countrywide's "Lessons Learned" Analysis 382 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Any Reliance On Or Citation Or Reference To Regulation S-K, Item 303 MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Any Reliance On Or Citation Or Reference To Regulation S-K, Item 303 377 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude ALL REFERENCES TO EMAILS FROM MR. SIERACKI TO HIS LATE FATHER MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude ALL REFERENCES TO EMAILS FROM MR. SIERACKI TO HIS LATE FATHER 381 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Improper Lay Opinion Testimony MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Improper Lay Opinion Testimony 366 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY AND ARGUMENT CHALLENGING ADEQUACY, ACCURACY OR GAAP - COMPLIANCE OF COUNTRYWIDE'S FINANCIAL STATEMENTS DURING RELEVANT PERIOD MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY AND ARGUMENT CHALLENGING ADEQUACY, ACCURACY OR GAAP - COMPLIANCE OF COUNTRYWIDE'S FINANCIAL STATEMENTS DURING RELEVANT PERIOD MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY AND ARGUMENT CHALLENGING ADEQUACY, ACCURACY OR GAAP - COMPLIANCE OF COUNTRYWIDE'S FINANCIAL STATEMENTS DURING RELEVANT PERIOD MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY AND ARGUMENT CHALLENGING ADEQUACY, ACCURACY OR GAAP - COMPLIANCE OF COUNTRYWIDE'S FINANCIAL STATEMENTS DURING RELEVANT PERIOD 378 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Improper Evidence of Materiality MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Improper Evidence of Materiality 363 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude The Testimony of Richard K. Green MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude The Testimony of Richard K. Green 376 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Handwritten Note By John McMurray MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Handwritten Note By John McMurray 379 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Plaintiff's Factually and Logically Unsustainable Arguments MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Plaintiff's Factually and Logically Unsustainable Arguments 395 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude ALL REFERENCES TO OTHER LITIGATION MATTERS AND/OR PROCEEDINGS MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude ALL REFERENCES TO OTHER LITIGATION MATTERS AND/OR PROCEEDINGS 383 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18)(Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Joint Statement re Disputed Jury Instructions and Verdict Forms set) filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo.. (Siegel, David) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Joint Agreed Upon Set of Jury Instructions set) filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo.. (Siegel, David) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of John M. McCoy III in opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Evidence of the Advancement of Legal Expenses to Non-Party Witnesses MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Evidence of the Advancement of Legal Expenses to Non-Party Witnesses 384 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Evidence Of Countrywide's "Lessons Learned" Analysis MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Evidence Of Countrywide's "Lessons Learned" Analysis 382 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Any Reliance On Or Citation Or Reference To Regulation S-K, Item 303 MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Any Reliance On Or Citation Or Reference To Regulation S-K, Item 303 377 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude The Testimony of Richard K. Green MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude The Testimony of Richard K. Green 376 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Handwritten Note By John McMurray MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Handwritten Note By John McMurray 379 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18)(Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Randall L. Jackson in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Plaintiff's Factually and Logically Unsustainable Arguments MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Plaintiff's Factually and Logically Unsustainable Arguments 395 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-7, # 2 Exhibits 8-13)(Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF LODGING filed of [Proposed] Order re MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Evidence Regarding Preparation of Countrywide Financial Statements and Purported Compliance with GAAP MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Evidence Regarding Preparation of Countrywide Financial Statements and Purported Compliance with GAAP 374 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McCoy, John) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Brown, Walter) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Plaintiff's Factually and Logically Unsustainable Arguments filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. Motion set for hearing on 10/8/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Proposed Order)(Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Joint [Proposed] Final Pretrial Conference Order)(McCoy, John) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Siegel, David) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of RANDALL S. LUSKEY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Evidence of the Advancement of Legal Expenses to Non-Party Witnesses MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Evidence of the Advancement of Legal Expenses to Non-Party Witnesses 384 filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A - B)(Brown, Walter) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of RANDALL S. LUSKEY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Evidence Of Countrywide's "Lessons Learned" Analysis MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Evidence Of Countrywide's "Lessons Learned" Analysis 382 filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A - I)(Brown, Walter) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of ERIC M. HAIRSTON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Handwritten Note By John McMurray MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Handwritten Note By John McMurray 379 filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A - C)(Brown, Walter) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Spencer E. Bendell in Opposition of MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY AND ARGUMENT CHALLENGING ADEQUACY, ACCURACY OR GAAP - COMPLIANCE OF COUNTRYWIDE'S FINANCIAL STATEMENTS DURING RELEVANT PERIOD MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY AND ARGUMENT CHALLENGING ADEQUACY, ACCURACY OR GAAP - COMPLIANCE OF COUNTRYWIDE'S FINANCIAL STATEMENTS DURING RELEVANT PERIOD MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY AND ARGUMENT CHALLENGING ADEQUACY, ACCURACY OR GAAP - COMPLIANCE OF COUNTRYWIDE'S FINANCIAL STATEMENTS DURING RELEVANT PERIOD MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY AND ARGUMENT CHALLENGING ADEQUACY, ACCURACY OR GAAP - COMPLIANCE OF COUNTRYWIDE'S FINANCIAL STATEMENTS DURING RELEVANT PERIOD 378 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude ALL REFERENCES TO FALL 2007 NOTES MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude ALL REFERENCES TO FALL 2007 NOTES 380 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude ALL REFERENCES TO EMAILS FROM MR. SIERACKI TO HIS LATE FATHER MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude ALL REFERENCES TO EMAILS FROM MR. SIERACKI TO HIS LATE FATHER 381 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude ALL REFERENCES TO OTHER LITIGATION MATTERS AND/OR PROCEEDINGS MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude ALL REFERENCES TO OTHER LITIGATION MATTERS AND/OR PROCEEDINGS 383 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of JAMES A. MEYERS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Any Reliance On Or Citation Or Reference To Regulation S-K, Item 303 MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Any Reliance On Or Citation Or Reference To Regulation S-K, Item 303 377 filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A - C, # 2 Exhibits D - E)(Brown, Walter) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of PENELOPE GRABOYS BLAIR IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude The Testimony of Richard K. Green MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude The Testimony of Richard K. Green 376 filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, part 1, # 2 Exhibit A, part 2, # 3 Exhibit A, part 3, # 4 Exhibits B - C)(Brown, Walter) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Spencer E. Bendell in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Evidence Regarding Preparation of Countrywide Financial Statements and Purported Compliance with GAAP MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Evidence Regarding Preparation of Countrywide Financial Statements and Purported Compliance with GAAP 374 , Corrected MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Evidence of Purported Reliance on Federal Regulatory AgenciesCorrected MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Evidence of Purported Reliance on Federal Regulatory Agencies 371 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Legal Conclusions and Evidentiary Narratives Offered by Defendants' Experts MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Legal Conclusions and Evidentiary Narratives Offered by Defendants' Experts 372 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Evidence of Purported Reliance on Professionals MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Evidence of Purported Reliance on Professionals 373 , MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Certain Testimony of Defendants' Experts Based on Rule 702 of the Federal Rules of Evidence MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Certain Testimony of Defendants' Experts Based on Rule 702 of the Federal Rules of Evidence 375 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29)(Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Tobin J. Romero in support of Mozilo's opposition to Plaintiff's MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Evidence of Purported Reliance on Professionals MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Evidence of Purported Reliance on Professionals 373 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 - 8, # 2 Exhibit 9)(Siegel, David) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Evidence of the Advancement of Legal Expenses to Non-Party Witnesses filed by Defendant David Sambol. Motion set for hearing on 10/8/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Proposed Order)(Brown, Walter) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude ALL REFERENCES TO OTHER LITIGATION MATTERS AND/OR PROCEEDINGS filed by Defendant Eric Sieracki. Motion set for hearing on 10/8/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Brief regarding Motion in Limine #4, # 2 Declaration of Nicolas Morgan, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Proposed Order)(Caplan, Matthew) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Evidence Of Countrywide's "Lessons Learned" Analysis filed by Defendant David Sambol. Motion set for hearing on 10/8/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Proposed Order)(Brown, Walter) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude ALL REFERENCES TO EMAILS FROM MR. SIERACKI TO HIS LATE FATHER filed by Defendant Eric Sieracki. Motion set for hearing on 10/8/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Brief regarding Motion in Limine #3, # 2 Declaration of Jeffrey B. Coopersmith, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Proposed Order)(Caplan, Matthew) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude ALL REFERENCES TO FALL 2007 NOTES filed by Defendant Eric Sieracki. Motion set for hearing on 10/8/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Brief regarding Motion in Limine #2, # 2 Declaration of Jeffrey B. Coopersmith, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Proposed Order)(Caplan, Matthew) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Handwritten Note By John McMurray filed by Defendant David Sambol. Motion set for hearing on 10/8/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Proposed Order)(Brown, Walter) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY AND ARGUMENT CHALLENGING ADEQUACY, ACCURACY OR GAAP - COMPLIANCE OF COUNTRYWIDE'S FINANCIAL STATEMENTS DURING RELEVANT PERIOD filed by Defendant Eric Sieracki. Motion set for hearing on 10/8/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Brief regarding Motion in Limine #1, # 2 Declaration of Shirli Weiss, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C7a, # 6 Exhibit C7b, # 7 Exhibit C7c, # 8 Exhibit C7d, # 9 Exhibit C7e, # 10 Exhibit C7f, # 11 Exhibit C7g, # 12 Exhibit C7h, # 13 Exhibit D, # 14 Exhibit E, # 15 Exhibit F, # 16 Exhibit G, # 17 Exhibit H, # 18 Exhibit I, # 19 Exhibit J, # 20 Proposed Order)(Caplan, Matthew) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Any Reliance On Or Citation Or Reference To Regulation S-K, Item 303 filed by Defendant David Sambol. Motion set for hearing on 10/8/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Proposed Order)(Brown, Walter) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude The Testimony of Richard K. Green filed by Defendant David Sambol. Motion set for hearing on 10/8/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Proposed Order)(Brown, Walter) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#5) to Exclude Certain Testimony of Defendants' Experts Based on Rule 702 of the Federal Rules of Evidence filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion set for hearing on 10/8/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge John F. Walter.(Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Evidence Regarding Preparation of Countrywide Financial Statements and Purported Compliance with GAAP filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion set for hearing on 10/8/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge John F. Walter.(McCoy, John) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Evidence of Purported Reliance on Professionals filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion set for hearing on 10/8/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge John F. Walter.(Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Legal Conclusions and Evidentiary Narratives Offered by Defendants' Experts filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion set for hearing on 10/8/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge John F. Walter.(Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND Corrected MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Evidence of Purported Reliance on Federal Regulatory Agencies filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion set for hearing on 10/8/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge John F. Walter.(Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Samuel Bryant Davidoff in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Evidence or Argument in Support of a Theory of Negligence MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Evidence or Argument in Support of a Theory of Negligence 369 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-5)(Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#4) to Exclude Evidence or Argument in Support of a Theory of Negligence filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. Motion set for hearing on 10/8/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Proposed Order)(Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Tobin J. Romero in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Improper Lay Opinion Testimony MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Improper Lay Opinion Testimony 366 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Witness List Angelo Mozilo, David Sambol, Securities and Exchange Commission, Eric Sieracki.. (McCoy, John) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#3) to Exclude Improper Lay Opinion Testimony filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. Motion set for hearing on 10/8/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Proposed Order)(Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. correcting MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Evidence of Purported Reliance on Federal Regulatory Agencies MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Evidence of Purported Reliance on Federal Regulatory Agencies 358 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Tobin J. Romero in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Improper Evidence of Materiality MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Improper Evidence of Materiality 363 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#2) to Exclude Improper Evidence of Materiality filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. Motion set for hearing on 10/8/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Proposed Order)(Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Daniel P. Lefler in support of MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Alan Hess MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Alan Hess 361 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-7)(Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Alan Hess filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. Motion set for hearing on 10/8/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Proposed Order)(Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE filed by plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. of Joint Notice of Real-Time Reporting Spelling List (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT Regarding Settlement filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE (#1) to Exclude Evidence of Purported Reliance on Federal Regulatory Agencies filed by plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion set for hearing on 10/8/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge John F. Walter.(Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER MODIFYING SCHEDULE FOR EXCHANGE OF TRIAL GRAPHICS by Judge John F. Walter. In accordance with the Joint Stipulation Modifying Schedule for Exchange of Trial Graphics 355 , and good cause being shown, that All parties in this matter need not comply with Local Rule 16-3, which requires the disclosure of "copies of all graphic or illustrative material to be shown to the trier of fact as illustrating the testimony of a witness" at least eleven days before trial. All parties in this matter will disclose graphic or illustrative materials on any opposing party at least 48 hours in advance of their introduction at trial. (See attached Order for further information). (jp) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REGARDING TRIAL TESTIMONY FOR OUT-OF-DISTRICT WITNESSES 328 by Judge John F. Walter. In accordance with the Stipulation Regarding Trial Testimony For Out-Of-District Witnesses, and good cause being shown, that One or more of the parties intends to call the following witnesses to appear and testify in person at trial: Kevin Bartlett, Susan Bow, Cliff Rossi. (See attached Order for further information). (jp) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint STIPULATION to Reschedule Schedule For Exchange Of Trial Graphics filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Walter) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle taking off calendar Non-Party Witness John P. McMurray's Motion to Quash Trial Subpoena 330 . (ec) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY in Opposition to MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena of Non-Party Witness John P. McMurray 330 (Sur-Reply) filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Wynn, Paris) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY in support MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena of Non-Party Witness John P. McMurray 330 filed by Movant John P McMurray. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A to Non-Party Witness John McMurray's Reply [Part I of II], # 2 Appendix A to Non-Party Witness John McMurray's Reply [Part II of II)(Ortiz, Monica) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 351 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT DAVID SAMBOL'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION 155 ; ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT ERIC P. SIERACKI'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION 156 ; and gORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT ANGELO MOZILO'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ADJUDICATION 157 . (kbr) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. In accordance with the Stipulation to Shorten Time for Hearing on Defendants' Motion Requesting Modification of Case Management Order 346 and good cause being shown, that Defendants' MOTION Requesting Modification of Case Management Order 347 will be heard at the pretrial conference on 10/1/2010 at 10:00 AM; The SEC may file a response to Defendants' Motion Requesting Modification of Case Management Order by 9/27/2010. (jp) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena of Non-Party Witness John P. McMurray 330 filed by Defendants Angelo Mozilo, David Sambol, Eric Sieracki. (Siegel, David) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Eric J. Carsten in Support of MOTION for Order for Granting Request to Modify Case Management Order 347 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3)(Siegel, David) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Granting Request to Modify Case Management Order filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. Motion set for hearing on 10/1/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants' Motion Requesting Modification of Case Management Order, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion Requesting Modification of Case Management Order)(Siegel, David) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION for Order Shortening Time for Hearing on Defendants' Motion Requesting Modification of Case Management Order filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Shortening Time For Hearing on Defendants' Motion Requesting Modification of Case Management Order)(Siegel, David) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle: granting 338 Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time for Hearing on Discovery Motions. Motion set for hearing on 9/22/2010 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle. (ec) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REGARDING AUTHENTICITY OF DOCUMENTS by Judge John F. Walter. In accordance with the Stipulation Regarding Authenticity of Documents 343 filed on 9/7/2010, by Plaintiff and Defendants, and good cause being shown, that Subject to the limitations expressed below, the following categories of documents will be considered authentic (see attached Order for further information). The parties agree that with respect to any potential trial exhibits that have not been previously introduced at deposition in this matter, the parties will notify each other by no later than 9/13/2010 of any documents that a party believes may not be in good form such that the parties can address this concern; The parties' agreement is limited to questions of authenticity and does not address any issues pertaining to the admissibility of any document. (jp) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION for Order Regarding Authenticity of Document filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE filed by Defendant Eric Sierackito EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Non-Party John P. McMurray's Motion to Quash Trial Subpoena 338 DEFENDANTS' JOINT POSITION (Morgan, Nicolas) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Sean C. Knowles in opposition EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Non-Party John P. McMurray's Motion to Quash Trial Subpoena 338 filed by Movant John P McMurray. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to S. Knowles Declaration)(Ortiz, Monica) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION in opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Non-Party John P. McMurray's Motion to Quash Trial Subpoena 338 filed by Movant John P McMurray. (Ortiz, Monica) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: granting 335 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sean C. Knowles on behalf of non-party subpoenaed witness John McMurray, designating Monica M. Ortiz as local counsel. (se) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Non-Party John P. McMurray's Motion to Quash Trial Subpoena filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Proposed Order)(Wynn, Paris) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION re: MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena of Non-Party Witness John P. McMurray 330 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Paris A. Wynn)(Wynn, Paris) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE filed by non-party John P McMurray, re APPLICATION for attorney Sean C Knowles to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV FEE PAID.) 335 served on September 1, 2010. (Ortiz, Monica) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION for attorney Sean C Knowles to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (PHV FEE PAID.) filed by Non-Party John P McMurray. Lodged Proposed Order. (jp) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Non-party subpoenaed witness John P McMurray, re Declaration (Motion related) 331 , MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena of Non-Party Witness John P. McMurray 330 , Exhibit to Motion 332 , Declaration (Motion related) 333 served on 8/31/10. (se) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of JOHN P. McMURRAY filed by Non-Party John P McMurray. (jp) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS to Declaration of Sean C. Knowles in support of MOTION to Quash 330 filed by Non-Party John P McMurray. (jp) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of SEAN C. KNOWLES filed by Non-Party John P McMurray. (jp) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 330 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoena of Non-Party Witness John P. McMurray; Memorandum of Points and Authorities. Motion set for hearing on 10/4/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (jp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/2/2010: # 1 Proposed Order) (jp). (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter: The Court, on its own motion, hereby refers the Motion to Quash Trial Subpoena of Non-Party Witness John P. Mcmurray, manually filed with the Clerk's Office on August 31, 2010, toMagistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle. The hearing on October 4, 2010 before Judge Walter is vacated and taken off calendar. Counsel shall contact Magistrate Judge Nagle's clerk for a new hearing date. (se) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION for Order Regarding Trial Testimony For Out-Of-District Witnesses filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Siegel, David) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle: The Court confers with counsel regarding the status of discovery.Court Recorder: cs. (ec) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter: ORDER TAKING UNDER SUBMISSION DEFENDANT David Sambol's MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 ; ORDER TAKING UNDER SUBMISSION DEFENDANT Eric P. Sieracki's MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 156 ; ORDER TAKING UNDER SUBMISSION DEFENDANT Angelo Mozilo's MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 . Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds that these matters are appropriate for decision without oral argument. The hearing calendared for 8/30/2010 is hereby vacated and the matters are taken off calendar. The matters will be deemed submitted on the vacated hearing date and the clerk will notify the parties when the Court has reached a decision. (jp) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings November 2, 2009 @ 8:30 A.M. (Valine, Victoria) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on November 2, 2009 @ 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Victoria L. Valine, CSR, RMR, CRR, phone number www.victoriavalinecsr.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/15/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/25/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/23/2010. (Valine, Victoria) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF LODGING filed [Proposed] Statement of Decision on Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Statement of Decision)(Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DEFENDANTS' JOINT RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES OF MATERIAL FACT re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendants Angelo Mozilo, David Sambol, Eric Sieracki. (Siegel, David) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 [JOINT] filed by Defendants Angelo Mozilo, David Sambol, Eric Sieracki. (Siegel, David) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY In Support MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendant Eric Sieracki. (Weiss, Shirli) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Eric M. Hairston In Support Of MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 281 - 284)(Hairston, Eric) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY In Support Of MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Tabs 1 - 3 to Appendix)(Brown, Walter) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENCE re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendants Angelo Mozilo, David Sambol, Eric Sieracki. (Siegel, David) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 re Insider Trading Allegations filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Siegel, David) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DEFENDANTS' JOINT RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendants Angelo Mozilo, David Sambol, Eric Sieracki. (Siegel, David) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY filed by Defendants Angelo Mozilo, David Sambol, Eric Sieracki to Request for Judicial Notice, Request for Relief,,,,,, 159 (Siegel, David) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of David Priebe In Support Of MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 filed by Defendant Eric Sieracki. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 290, # 2 Exhibit 291, # 3 Exhibit 292, # 4 Exhibit 293, # 5 Exhibit 294, # 6 Exhibit 295, # 7 Exhibit 296 (Part 1), # 8 Exhibit 296 (Part 2), # 9 Exhibit 296 (Part 3), # 10 Exhibit 297, # 11 Exhibit 298, # 12 Exhibit 299, # 13 Exhibit 300, # 14 Exhibit 301, # 15 Exhibit 302, # 16 Exhibit 303, # 17 Exhibit 304, # 18 Exhibit 305, # 19 Exhibit 306, # 20 Exhibit 307, # 21 Exhibit 308, # 22 Exhibit 309, # 23 Exhibit 310, # 24 Exhibit 311, # 25 Exhibit 312, # 26 Exhibit 313)(Priebe, David) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ERIC P. SIERACKIS SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendant Eric Sieracki. (Priebe, David) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN ERIC P. SIERACKIS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (REPLY): WITNESS ANNE McCALLION re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendant Eric Sieracki. (Priebe, David) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN ERIC P. SIERACKIS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (REPLY): WITNESS JOHN McMURRAY re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendant Eric Sieracki. (Priebe, David) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON ISO DEFENDANTS' REPLIES TO SEC'S OPPOSITIONS TO MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: WITNESS JULIE SCAMMAHORN re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Brown, Walter) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      INVESTIGATIVE TESTIMONY RELIED UPON ISO DEFENDANTS' REPLIES TO SEC'S OPPOSITIONS TO MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: WITNESS JENS CHRISTIAN INGERSLEV re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Brown, Walter) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON ISO DEFENDANTS' REPLIES TO SEC'S OPPOSITIONS TO MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: WITNESS JENS CHRISTIAN INGERSLEV re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Brown, Walter) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Errata to Opposition to Joint Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Puathasnanon, Sam) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 305 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Spencer E.Bendell in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 296, # 2 Exhibit 297, # 3 Exhibit 298, # 4 Exhibit 299.1, # 5 Exhibit 299.2, # 6 Exhibit 299.3, # 7 Exhibit 300, # 8 Exhibit 301, # 9 Exhibit 302, # 10 Exhibit 303, # 11 Exhibit 304, # 12 Exhibit 305, # 13 Exhibit 306, # 14 Exhibit 307, # 15 Exhibit 308, # 16 Exhibit 309, # 17 Exhibit 310, # 18 Exhibit 311, # 19 Exhibit 312, # 20 Exhibit 313, # 21 Exhibit 314.1, # 22 Exhibit 314.2, # 23 Exhibit 315.1, # 24 Exhibit 315.1.1, # 25 Exhibit 315.2, # 26 Exhibit 315.3, # 27 Exhibit 315.4, # 28 Exhibit 315.5, # 29 Exhibit 316, # 30 Exhibit 317, # 31 Exhibit 318, # 32 Exhibit 319, # 33 Exhibit 320, # 34 Exhibit 321, # 35 Exhibit 322, # 36 Exhibit 323, # 37 Exhibit 324, # 38 Exhibit 325)(McCoy, John) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Withdrawal of Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties 303 filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Tu, Michael) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice and Certification of Interested Parties filed by Defendant David Sambol, (Tu, Michael) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 302 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT of Genuine Issues of Material Fact in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Puathasnanon, Sam) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 301 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION to MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (McCoy, John) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Puathasnanon, Sam) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 299 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Lynn M Dean in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 Exhibits Part 22 beginning with Exhibit 182 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 183, # 2 Exhibit 184, # 3 Exhibit 185, # 4 Exhibit 186, # 5 Exhibit 187, # 6 Exhibit 188, # 7 Exhibit 190, # 8 Exhibit 191, # 9 Exhibit 192, # 10 Exhibit 193, # 11 Exhibit 189)(McCoy, John) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Lynn M Dean in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 Exhibits Part 21 beginning with Exhibit 179 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 180, # 2 Exhibit 181.1, # 3 Exhibit 181.2, # 4 Exhibit 181.3, # 5 Exhibit 181.4, # 6 Exhibit 181.5, # 7 Exhibit 181.6, # 8 Exhibit 181.7, # 9 Exhibit 181.8, # 10 Exhibit 181.9, # 11 Exhibit 181.10, # 12 Exhibit 181.11, # 13 Exhibit 181.12, # 14 Exhibit 181.13, # 15 Exhibit 181.14, # 16 Exhibit 181.15)(McCoy, John) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Lynn M Dean in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 Exhibits Part 20 beginning with Exhibit 176.3 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 176.4, # 2 Exhibit 176.5, # 3 Exhibit 176.6, # 4 Exhibit 176.7, # 5 Exhibit 177, # 6 Exhibit 178.1, # 7 Exhibit 178.2, # 8 Exhibit 178.3, # 9 Exhibit 178.4, # 10 Exhibit 178.5, # 11 Exhibit 178.6, # 12 Exhibit 178.7, # 13 Exhibit 178.8, # 14 Exhibit 178.9, # 15 Exhibit 178.10)(McCoy, John) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Investigative Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS BRIAN KUELBS re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Lynn M Dean in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 Exhibits Part 19 beginning with Exhibit 161 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 162, # 2 Exhibit 163, # 3 Exhibit 164, # 4 Exhibit 165, # 5 Exhibit 166, # 6 Exhibit 167, # 7 Exhibit 168, # 8 Exhibit 169, # 9 Exhibit 170, # 10 Exhibit 171, # 11 Exhibit 172, # 12 Exhibit 173, # 13 Exhibit 174.1, # 14 Exhibit 174.2, # 15 Exhibit 174.3, # 16 Exhibit 174.4, # 17 Exhibit 174.5, # 18 Exhibit 175, # 19 Exhibit 176.1, # 20 Exhibit 176.2)(McCoy, John) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Investigative Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS ERIC SIERACKI re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Investigative Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS DAVID SAMBOL re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Lynn M Dean in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 Exhibits Part 18 beginning with Exhibit 141 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 142.1, # 2 Exhibit 142.2, # 3 Exhibit 142.3, # 4 Exhibit 142.4, # 5 Exhibit 142.5, # 6 Exhibit 142.6, # 7 Exhibit 142.7, # 8 Exhibit 143, # 9 Exhibit 144, # 10 Exhibit 145, # 11 Exhibit 146, # 12 Exhibit 147, # 13 Exhibit 148, # 14 Exhibit 149, # 15 Exhibit 150, # 16 Exhibit 151, # 17 Exhibit 152, # 18 Exhibit 153, # 19 Exhibit 154, # 20 Exhibit 155, # 21 Exhibit 156, # 22 Exhibit 157, # 23 Exhibit 158, # 24 Exhibit 159, # 25 Exhibit 160)(McCoy, John) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Investigative Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions For Summary Judgment: WITNESS JOHN McMURRAY re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendant Angelo Mozilo's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Insider Trading Allegations filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Puathasnanon, Sam) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Investigative Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment: WITNESS KEVIN BARTLETT re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Lynn M Dean in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 Exhibits Part 17 beginning with Exhibit 13.3 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 130.4, # 2 Exhibit 130.5, # 3 Exhibit 130.6, # 4 Exhibit 130.7, # 5 Exhibit 130.8, # 6 Exhibit 130.9, # 7 Exhibit 130.10, # 8 Exhibit 130.11, # 9 Exhibit 130.12, # 10 Exhibit 130.13, # 11 Exhibit 130.14, # 12 Exhibit 130.15, # 13 Exhibit 130.16, # 14 Exhibit 130.17, # 15 Exhibit 131, # 16 Exhibit 132, # 17 Exhibit 133, # 18 Exhibit 134, # 19 Exhibit 135, # 20 Exhibit 136, # 21 Exhibit 137, # 22 Exhibit 138, # 23 Exhibit 139, # 24 Exhibit 140)(McCoy, John) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Deposition Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS STEVEN TRENTACOSTA re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Deposition Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS JOHN TAYLOR re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Deposition Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS ERIC SIERACKI re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Lynn M Dean in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 Exhibits Part 16 beginning with Exhibit 116 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 117, # 2 Exhibit 118, # 3 Exhibit 119, # 4 Exhibit 120, # 5 Exhibit 121, # 6 Exhibit 122, # 7 Exhibit 123.1, # 8 Exhibit 123.2, # 9 Exhibit 123.3, # 10 Exhibit 123.4, # 11 Exhibit 123.5, # 12 Exhibit 123.6, # 13 Exhibit 124, # 14 Exhibit 125, # 15 Exhibit 126, # 16 Exhibit 127, # 17 Exhibit 128, # 18 Exhibit 129, # 19 Exhibit 130.1, # 20 Exhibit 130.2)(McCoy, John) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Deposition Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS JACK SCHAKETT re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Deposition Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS JULIE SCAMMAHORN re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Deposition Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS DAVID SAMBOL re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Lynn M Dean in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 Exhibits Part 15 beginning with Exhibit 91 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 92, # 2 Exhibit 93, # 3 Exhibit 94, # 4 Exhibit 95, # 5 Exhibit 96, # 6 Exhibit 97, # 7 Exhibit 98, # 8 Exhibit 99, # 9 Exhibit 100, # 10 Exhibit 101, # 11 Exhibit 102, # 12 Exhibit 103, # 13 Exhibit 104, # 14 Exhibit 105, # 15 Exhibit 106, # 16 Exhibit 107, # 17 Exhibit 108, # 18 Exhibit 109, # 19 Exhibit 110, # 20 Exhibit 111, # 21 Exhibit 112, # 22 Exhibit 113, # 23 Exhibit 114, # 24 Exhibit 115)(McCoy, John) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Deposition Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS CLIFFORD ROSSI re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Deposition Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS LISA RIORDAN re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Deposition Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS JOSEPH MILLER re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Lynn M Dean in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 Exhibits Part 14 beginning with Exhibit 71 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 72, # 2 Exhibit 73, # 3 Exhibit 74, # 4 Exhibit 75, # 5 Exhibit 76, # 6 Exhibit 77, # 7 Exhibit 78, # 8 Exhibit 79, # 9 Exhibit 80, # 10 Exhibit 81, # 11 Exhibit 82, # 12 Exhibit 83, # 13 Exhibit 84, # 14 Exhibit 85, # 15 Exhibit 86, # 16 Exhibit 87, # 17 Exhibit 88, # 18 Exhibit 89, # 19 Exhibit 90)(McCoy, John) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Deposition Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS LAURA MILLEMAN re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Deposition Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS JOHN McMURRAY re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Deposition Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS ANNE McCALLION re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of John M. McCoy III in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 Exhibits Part 8 beginning with Exhibit 284 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 285, # 2 Exhibit 286-1, # 3 Exhibit 286-2, # 4 Exhibit 286-3, # 5 Exhibit 286-4, # 6 Exhibit 286-5, # 7 Exhibit 287, # 8 Exhibit 288, # 9 Exhibit 289, # 10 Exhibit 290, # 11 Exhibit 291-1, # 12 Exhibit 291-2, # 13 Exhibit 291-3, # 14 Exhibit 291-4, # 15 Exhibit 292, # 16 Exhibit 293, # 17 Exhibit 294, # 18 Exhibit 295)(Puathasnanon, Sam) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Lynn M Dean in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 Exhibits Part 13 beginning with Exhibit 63 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 64, # 2 Exhibit 65, # 3 Exhibit 66, # 4 Exhibit 67, # 5 Exhibit 68, # 6 Exhibit 69, # 7 Exhibit 70.1, # 8 Exhibit 70.2, # 9 Exhibit 70.3, # 10 Exhibit 70.4, # 11 Exhibit 70.5, # 12 Exhibit 70.6, # 13 Exhibit 70.7, # 14 Exhibit 70.8, # 15 Exhibit 70.9)(McCoy, John) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Deposition Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS KATHRYN MARTIN re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Deposition Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS PAUL LIU re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of John M. McCoy III in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 Exhibits Part 7 beginning with Exhibit 273-4 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 273-5, # 2 Exhibit 274, # 3 Exhibit 275, # 4 Exhibit 276, # 5 Exhibit 277, # 6 Exhibit 278, # 7 Exhibit 279, # 8 Exhibit 280, # 9 Exhibit 281-1, # 10 Exhibit 281-2, # 11 Exhibit 281-3, # 12 Exhibit 281-4, # 13 Exhibit 282, # 14 Exhibit 283)(Puathasnanon, Sam) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Deposition Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS BRIAN KUELBS re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Lynn M Dean in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 Exhibits Part 12 beginning with Exhibit 59-1 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 59-2, # 2 Exhibit 59-3, # 3 Exhibit 59-4, # 4 Exhibit 59-5, # 5 Exhibit 59-6, # 6 Exhibit 59-7, # 7 Exhibit 59-8, # 8 Exhibit 60, # 9 Exhibit 61-1, # 10 Exhibit 61-2, # 11 Exhibit 62-1, # 12 Exhibit 62-2, # 13 Exhibit 62-3, # 14 Exhibit 62-4, # 15 Exhibit 62-5, # 16 Exhibit 62-6)(McCoy, John) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Deposition Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS GREG HENDRY re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of John M. McCoy III in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 Exhibits Part 6 beginning with Exhibit 266-5 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 267-1, # 2 Exhibit 267-2, # 3 Exhibit 267-3, # 4 Exhibit 267-4, # 5 Exhibit 267-5, # 6 Exhibit 267-6, # 7 Exhibit 268, # 8 Exhibit 269, # 9 Exhibit 270, # 10 Exhibit 271, # 11 Exhibit 272, # 12 Exhibit 273-1, # 13 Exhibit 273-2, # 14 Exhibit 273-3)(Puathasnanon, Sam) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Lynn M Dean in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 Exhibit Part 11 beginning with Exhibit 53 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 54, # 2 Exhibit 55, # 3 Exhibit 56-1, # 4 Exhibit 56-2, # 5 Exhibit 56-3, # 6 Exhibit 56-4, # 7 Exhibit 56-5, # 8 Exhibit 56-6, # 9 Exhibit 56-7, # 10 Exhibit 57, # 11 Exhibit 58)(McCoy, John) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of John M. McCoy III in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 Exhibits Part 5 beginning with Exhibit 257 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 258, # 2 Exhibit 259, # 3 Exhibit 260, # 4 Exhibit 261, # 5 Exhibit 262, # 6 Exhibit 263, # 7 Exhibit 264-1, # 8 Exhibit 264-2, # 9 Exhibit 264-3, # 10 Exhibit 265, # 11 Exhibit 266-1, # 12 Exhibit 266-2, # 13 Exhibit 266-3, # 14 Exhibit 266-4)(Puathasnanon, Sam) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of John M. McCoy III in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 Exhibits Part 4 beginning with Exhibit 242-3 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 243, # 2 Exhibit 244, # 3 Exhibit 245, # 4 Exhibit 246, # 5 Exhibit 247, # 6 Exhibit 248, # 7 Exhibit 249, # 8 Exhibit 250, # 9 Exhibit 251, # 10 Exhibit 252, # 11 Exhibit 253, # 12 Exhibit 254, # 13 Exhibit 255, # 14 Exhibit 256)(Puathasnanon, Sam) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Lynn M Dean in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 Exhibits Part 10 beginning with Exhibit 52-1 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 51.-2, # 2 Exhibit 51-3, # 3 Exhibit 51-4, # 4 Exhibit 51-5, # 5 Exhibit 51-6, # 6 Exhibit 51-7, # 7 Exhibit 51-8, # 8 Exhibit 51-9, # 9 Exhibit 51-10, # 10 Exhibit 52-1, # 11 Exhibit 52-2, # 12 Exhibit 52-3, # 13 Supplement 52-4)(McCoy, John) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Deposition Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS NICHOLAS KRSNICH re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of John M. McCoy III in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 Exhibits Part 3 beginning with Exhibit 229 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 230, # 2 Exhibit 231, # 3 Exhibit 232, # 4 Exhibit 233, # 5 Exhibit 234, # 6 Exhibit 235, # 7 Exhibit 236, # 8 Exhibit 237, # 9 Exhibit 238, # 10 Exhibit 239, # 11 Exhibit 240, # 12 Exhibit 241, # 13 Exhibit 242-1, # 14 Exhibit 242-2)(Puathasnanon, Sam) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Deposition Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS SIVARAMKRISHNAN IYER re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of John M. McCoy III in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 Exhibits Part 2 beginning with Exhibit 214 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 215, # 2 Exhibit 216, # 3 Exhibit 217, # 4 Exhibit 218, # 5 Exhibit 219, # 6 Exhibit 220, # 7 Exhibit 221, # 8 Exhibit 222, # 9 Exhibit 223, # 10 Exhibit 224, # 11 Exhibit 225, # 12 Exhibit 226, # 13 Exhibit 227, # 14 Exhibit 228)(Puathasnanon, Sam) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Deposition Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS JENS CHRISTIAN INGERSLEV re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of John M. McCoy III in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 Exhibits Part 1 beginning with Exhibit 203 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 204, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 205, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 206, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 207-1, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 207-2, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 207-3, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 207-4, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 207-5, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 208, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 209, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 210, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 211, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 212, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 213)(Puathasnanon, Sam) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Deposition Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS ANDREW GISSINGER re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Deposition Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS KAYE FELLER re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Deposition Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS BILL COBB re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Deposition Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS CHRISTOPHER BRENDLER re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of John M. McCoy III in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 194-1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 194-2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 194-3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 194-4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 194-5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 194-6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 194-7, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 195, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 196, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 197, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 198, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 199, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 200, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 201, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 202)(Puathasnanon, Sam) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Deposition Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS SUSAN BOW re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Deposition Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS DAVID BIGELOW re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Lynn M Dean in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 Exhibits Part 9 beginning with 47-1 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 47-2, # 2 Exhibit 47-3, # 3 Exhibit 47-4, # 4 Exhibit 47-5, # 5 Exhibit 47-6, # 6 Exhibit 47-7, # 7 Exhibit 47-8, # 8 Exhibit 47-9, # 9 Exhibit 47-10, # 10 Exhibit 47-11, # 11 Exhibit 47-12, # 12 Exhibit 47-13, # 13 Exhibit 47-14, # 14 Exhibit 47-15, # 15 Exhibit 47-16, # 16 Exhibit 47-17, # 17 Exhibit 47-18, # 18 Exhibit 47-19, # 19 Exhibit 48, # 20 Exhibit 49, # 21 Exhibit 50)(McCoy, John) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Summary Judgment re: Request for Judicial Notice, Request for Relief,,,,,, 159 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 243 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTIONS in opposition to re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE CITED IN DEFENDANTS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Lynn M Declaration in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 Exhibits Part 8 beginning with Exhibit 45-1 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 45-2, # 2 Exhibit 45-3, # 3 Exhibit 45-4, # 4 Exhibit 45-5, # 5 Exhibit 45-6, # 6 Exhibit 45-7, # 7 Exhibit 45-8, # 8 Exhibit 45-9, # 9 Exhibit 45-10, # 10 Exhibit 45-11, # 11 Exhibit 45-12, # 12 Exhibit 45-13, # 13 Exhibit 45-14, # 14 Exhibit 45-15, # 15 Exhibit 45-16, # 16 Exhibit 45-17, # 17 Exhibit 45-18, # 18 Exhibit 46)(McCoy, John) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Deposition Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS KEVIN BARTLETT re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Deposition Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS ISABEL BACKLEY re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Deposition Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS FRANK AGUILERA re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Lynn M Dean in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 Exhibits Part 7 beginning with Exhibit 43-1 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 43-2, # 2 Exhibit 43-3, # 3 Exhibit 43-4, # 4 Exhibit 43-5, # 5 Exhibit 43-6, # 6 Exhibit 43-7, # 7 Exhibit 43-8, # 8 Exhibit 43-9, # 9 Exhibit 43-10, # 10 Exhibit 43-11, # 11 Exhibit 43-12, # 12 Exhibit 43-13, # 13 Exhibit 43-14, # 14 Exhibit 43-15, # 15 Exhibit 43-16, # 16 Exhibit 43-17, # 17 Exhibit 44)(McCoy, John) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Deposition Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS NATHAN JOSHUA ADLER re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Lynn M Dean in oppposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 Exhibits Part 6 beginning with Exhibit 41-1 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 41-2, # 2 Exhibit 41-3, # 3 Exhibit 41-4, # 4 Exhibit 41-5, # 5 Exhibit 41-6, # 6 Exhibit 41-7, # 7 Exhibit 41-8, # 8 Exhibit 41-9, # 9 Exhibit 41-10, # 10 Exhibit 42)(McCoy, John) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 235 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Investigative Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS ANGELO MOZILO re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Investigative Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS JOSEPH MILLER re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Lynn M. Dean in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 Exhibits Part 5 beginning with Exh 37-1 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 37-2, # 2 Exhibit 37-3, # 3 Exhibit 37-4, # 4 Exhibit 37-5, # 5 Exhibit 37.6, # 6 Exhibit 37-7, # 7 Exhibit 37-8, # 8 Exhibit 37-9, # 9 Exhibit 37-10, # 10 Exhibit 37-11, # 11 Exhibit 37-12, # 12 Exhibit 38, # 13 Exhibit 39, # 14 Supplement 40)(McCoy, John) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Investigative Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS ANNE MCCALLION re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Investigative Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS VIJA LALA re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Lynn M Dean in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 Exhibits Part 4 beginning with Exhibit 26 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 27, # 2 Exhibit 28, # 3 Exhibit 29, # 4 Exhibit 30, # 5 Exhibit 31, # 6 Exhibit 32, # 7 Exhibit 33, # 8 Exhibit 34, # 9 Exhibit 35, # 10 Exhibit 36)(McCoy, John) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Investigative Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS ROBERT LA COURSIERE re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 228 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Investigative Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS STANFORD KURLAND re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Lynn M. Dean in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 Exhibits Part 3 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 12, # 2 Exhibit 13, # 3 Exhibit 14, # 4 Exhibit 15, # 5 Exhibit 16, # 6 Exhibit 17, # 7 Exhibit 18, # 8 Exhibit 19, # 9 Exhibit 20, # 10 Exhibit 21, # 11 Exhibit 22, # 12 Exhibit 23, # 13 Exhibit 24, # 14 Exhibit 25)(McCoy, John) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Investigative Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS JENS CHRISTIAN INGERSLEV re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Investigative Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS GREG HINDRY re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Lynn M Dean in opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 Exhibits Part 2 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4-9, # 2 Exhibit 4-10, # 3 Exhibit 5-1, # 4 Exhibit 5-2, # 5 Exhibit 5-3, # 6 Exhibit 5-4, # 7 Exhibit 5-5, # 8 Exhibit 5-6, # 9 Exhibit 5-7, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit 8, # 13 Exhibit 9, # 14 Exhibit 10)(McCoy, John) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Investigative Testimony Relied Upon in Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment: WITNESS ANDREW GISSINGER re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  INVESTIGATIVE TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN PLAINTIFF SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: WITNESS MARK ELBAUM re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    INVESTIGATIVE TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN PLAINTIFF SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: WITNESS ROBERT DONATO re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      INVESTIGATIVE TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN PLAINTIFF SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: WITNESS JOHN CONNORS re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        INVESTIGATIVE TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN PLAINTIFF SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: WITNESS FRANK AGUILERA re: MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Lynn M. Dean in opposition MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4-1, # 5 Exhibit 4-2, # 6 Exhibit 4-3, # 7 Exhibit 4.4, # 8 Exhibit 4-5, # 9 Exhibit 4-6, # 10 Exhibit 4-7)(McCoy, John) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 8-2-10 2;00 p.m. (ha) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8-2-10 2:00 p.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Echo Reporting, Inc., phone number (858) 453-7590. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/2/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2010. (ha) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES OF (1)Defendant David Sambols Motion To Compel Responses to His SecondSet of Requests for Admission; (2)Defendant Angelo Mozilos Motion To Compel Responses to Interrogatories Nos. 12 and 17 and Requests for Admission Nos. 4 through 30; (3)Defendant Angelo Mozilos Motion To Compel Production of Transcripts; and (4)Defendant Eric Sierackis Motion To Compel Responses to Requests for Admission Nos. 30-31, 43, 58, 64-67, and 69 and Requests for Production Nos. 3-14, 52-54, and 59. Denying 132 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 134 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 135 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 139 Motion to Compel; taking under advisement 151 Motion to Compel; held before Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle. See attached minute order for further details.Court Recorder: CS 8/2/10. (mz) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. correcting Statement (Motion related), Statement (Motion related) 174 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Defendants' Corrected Joint Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment)(Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant David Sambol. correcting Motion Related Document 184 (Brown, Walter) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN DAVID SAMBOL'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS CLIFFORD ROSSI re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Brown, Walter) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS SUSAN BOW re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS JOHN CONNERS re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS JOHN CONNERS re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS: SHIVARAMKRISHNAN IYER re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS: ROBERT DONATO re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 206 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS ANGELO MOZILO re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS VAN HESSER re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS TIMOTHY WENNES re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS CINDY SIMANTEL re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS SCOTT KURZBAN re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS JOHN MCMURRAY re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS JOHN MCMURRAY re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS ANNE MCCALLION re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS KENNETH LEHN, PH.D re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS MICHAEL LACOUR-LITTLE, PH.D re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS BRIAN KUELBS re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS KEVIN BARTLETT re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS JENS CHRISTIAN INGERSLEV re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS JENNIFER SANDEFUR FOSTER re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS: CARLOS GARCIA re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS DAVID WALKER re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS CHRISTOPHER CULP re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS CHRISTOPHER BRENDLER re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant David Sambol. correcting Motion Related Document 176 (Brown, Walter) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN DAVID SAMBOLS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS ANNE MCCALLION re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Brown, Walter) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN DAVID SAMBOLS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS CHRISTOPHER BRENDLER re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Brown, Walter) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN DAVID SAMBOLS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS CLIFFORD ROSSI re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Brown, Walter) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN DAVID SAMBOLS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS VAN HESSER re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Brown, Walter) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN DAVID SAMBOLS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS MICHAEL LACOUR-LITTLE re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Brown, Walter) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN DAVID SAMBOLS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS GREGORY HENDRY re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Brown, Walter) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN DAVID SAMBOLS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS JOHN MCMURRAY re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Brown, Walter) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        INVESTIGATIVE TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN DAVID SAMBOLS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS JOHN MCMURRAY re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Brown, Walter) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          INVESTIGATIVE TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN DAVID SAMBOLS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS FRANK AGUILERA re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Brown, Walter) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Daniel P. Lefler In Support Of Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendants Angelo Mozilo, David Sambol, Eric Sieracki. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-13, # 2 Exhibit 14-18, # 3 Exhibit 19-25, # 4 Exhibit 26-28, # 5 Exhibit 29, # 6 Exhibit 3-34, # 7 Exhibit 35-52, # 8 Exhibit 35-60, # 9 Exhibit 61(1), # 10 Exhibit 61(2), # 11 Exhibit 62-71, # 12 Exhibit 71-72, # 13 Exhibit 74-79, # 14 Exhibit 80-88, # 15 Exhibit 89, # 16 Exhibit 90, # 17 Exhibit 91-99, # 18 Exhibit 100-08, # 19 Exhibit 109-11, # 20 Exhibit 112-13, # 21 Exhibit 114(1), # 22 Exhibit 114(2)-117, # 23 Exhibit 188-128B, # 24 Exhibit 129-32, # 25 Exhibit 133-38, # 26 Exhibit 139-48, # 27 Exhibit 149-54, # 28 Exhibit 155-60, # 29 Exhibit 161-62, # 30 Exhibit 163-64, # 31 Exhibit 165-90, # 32 Exhibit 191(1), # 33 Exhibit 191(2), # 34 Exhibit 191(3), # 35 Exhibit 191(4), # 36 Exhibit 191(5), # 37 Exhibit 191(6), # 38 Exhibit 191(7), # 39 Exhibit 191(8), # 40 Exhibit 191(9), # 41 Exhibit 192-205, # 42 Exhibit 206-33, # 43 Exhibit 234-49, # 44 Exhibit 250-51, # 45 Exhibit 252-59, # 46 Exhibit 260-265(1), # 47 Exhibit 265(2), # 48 Exhibit 265(3), # 49 Exhibit 265(4), # 50 Exhibit 266-275, # 51 Exhibit 276, # 52 Exhibit 277, # 53 Exhibit 278-80)(Siegel, David) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN DAVID SAMBOL'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS ANNE MCCALLION re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Brown, Walter) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge John F. Walter: ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing Hearing Date on and Deadline for Oppositions to Simultaneous Summary Judgment Motions to be filed by Defendants 150 . Pursuant to Rule 78 of the FRCP and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds that this matter is appropriate for decision without oral argument. After considering the moving and opposing papers and the arguments therein, the Court rules as follows: Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application is GRANTED in part, DENIED in part. The Court sets the following briefing schedule and hearing date for Defendants' motions for summary judgment: Plaintiff's oppositions shall be filed on or before 8/16/2010; Defendants' replies shall be filed on or before 8/23/2010; The hearing remains set for 8/30/2010 at 1:30 PM. (jp) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 174 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT STATEMENT of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendants Angelo Mozilo, David Sambol, Eric Sieracki. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 173 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Tabs 1 and 2 to Appendix)(Brown, Walter) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 172 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 [JOINT] filed by Defendants Angelo Mozilo, David Sambol, Eric Sieracki. (Siegel, David) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of John Damiani in support of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendant Eric Sieracki. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit D-1)(Priebe, David) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Eric P. Sieracki In Support Of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendant Eric Sieracki. (Weiss, Shirli) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN ERIC P. SIERACKI'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS JOHN TAYLOR re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendant Eric Sieracki. (Priebe, David) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendant Eric Sieracki. (Weiss, Shirli) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN ERIC P. SIERACKI'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS JULIE SCAMAHORN re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendant Eric Sieracki. (Priebe, David) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN ERIC P. SIERACKI'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS LISA RIORDAN re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendant Eric Sieracki. (Priebe, David) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN ERIC P. SIERACKI'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS LAURA MILLEMAN re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendant Eric Sieracki. (Priebe, David) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN ERIC P. SIERACKI'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS ANNE McCALLION re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendant Eric Sieracki. (Priebe, David) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN ERIC P. SIERACKI'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS CARLOS GARCIA re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendant Eric Sieracki. (Priebe, David) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN ERIC P. SIERACKI'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS JIM FURASH re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendant Eric Sieracki. (Priebe, David) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN ERIC P. SIERACKI'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS SUSAN BOW re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendant Eric Sieracki. (Priebe, David) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DEPOSITION TESTIMONY RELIED UPON IN ERIC P. SIERACKI'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: WITNESS KEVIN BARTLETT re MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendant Eric Sieracki. (Priebe, David) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 155 , MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 , MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki 156 filed by Defendants Angelo Mozilo, David Sambol, Eric Sieracki. (Siegel, David) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication 157 re Insider Trading Allegations filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Siegel, David) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. Motion set for hearing on 8/30/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Statement of Decision)(Siegel, David) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to All Claims against Eric P. Sieracki filed by Defendant Eric Sieracki. Motion set for hearing on 8/30/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Statement of Decision Granting Eric P. Sieracki's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Weiss, Shirli) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 155 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication filed by Defendant David Sambol. Motion set for hearing on 8/30/2010 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Statement of Decision)(Brown, Walter) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle: rescheduling from 7/27/2010 to 8/2/2010 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle, Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories Nos. 12 &17 and Requests for Admission Nos. 4 through 30 135 , Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Admission Nos. 30-31, 43, 58, 64-67 & 69 and Requests for Production Nos. 3-14, 52-54 & 59 151 , Motion to Compel Further Responses to Second Set of Requests for Admission 139 , and Motion to Compel Production of Transcripts 132 . (ec) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Continuing Hearing Date on and Deadline for Oppositions to Simultaneous Summary Judgment Motions to Be Filed by Defendants 150 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Siegel, David) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Responses to Requests for Admission Nos. 30-31, 43, 58, 64-67 & 69 and Requests for Production Nos. 3-14, 52-54 & 59 151 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission, Defendant Eric Sieracki. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeff Coopersmith in Support of Eric P. Sieracki's Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Admission Nos. 30-31, 43, 58, 64-67 & 69 and Requests for Production Nos. 3-14, 52-54 & 59, # 2 Exhibit A to Jeff Coopersmith Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Jeff Coopersmith Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Jeff Coopersmith Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Jeff Coopersmith Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to Jeff Coopersmith Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F to Jeff Coopersmith Declaration, # 8 Exhibit G to Jeff Coopersmith Declaration to, # 9 Exhibit H to Jeff Coopersmith Declaration, # 10 Exhibit I to Jeff Coopersmith Declaration, # 11 Exhibit J to Jeff Coopersmith Declaration, # 12 Declaration of Sam S. Puathasnanon in Opposition to Eric P. Sieracki's Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Admission Nos. 30-31, 43, 58, 64-67 & 69 and Requests for Production Nos. 3-14, 52-54 & 59on to, # 13 Proposed Order)(Coopersmith, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Responses to Requests for Admission Nos. 30-31, 43, 58, 64-67 & 69 and Requests for Production Nos. 3-14, 52-54 & 59 filed by defendant Eric Sieracki. Motion set for hearing on 7/27/2010 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle. (Coopersmith, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Continuing Hearing Date on and Deadline for Oppositions to Simultaneous Summary Judgment Motions to Be Filed by Defendants filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of John M. McCoy III, # 3 Proposed Order)(McCoy, John) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 7/01/10 10:08am (Lopez, Margarita) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 7/01/10 10:08am. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: ECHO Reporting, Inc., phone number (858) 453-7590. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 8/9/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/19/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/17/2010. (Lopez, Margarita) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle: granting 145 Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time for Hearing on Discovery Motions (ec) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Proposed Order Granting Defendant Eric Sieracki's Ex Parte Application For Order Shortening Time For Hearing On Motion To Compel Responses To Requests For Admission and For Requests For Production re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing Defendant Eric Sieracki's Ex Parte Application For Order Shortening Time For Hearing On Motion To Compel Responses To Requests For Admission And For Requests For Production 145 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Coopersmith, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EX PARTE APPLICATION to Shorten Time for Hearing Defendant Eric Sieracki's Ex Parte Application For Order Shortening Time For Hearing On Motion To Compel Responses To Requests For Admission And For Requests For Production filed by defendant Eric Sieracki. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Declaration of Jeffrey Coopersmith, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Jeffrey Coopersmith, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Jeffrey Coopersmith, # 5 Proposed Order)(Coopersmith, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Production of Transcripts 132 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Second Set of Requests for Admission 139 filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Hill, Christin) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories Nos. 12 &17 and Requests for Admission Nos. 4 through 30 134 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Adam Fletcher, # 2 Exhibit A to Supplemental Fletcher Declaration)(Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE Of Intention To Request Extension Of Trial Length filed by Defendants Angelo Mozilo, David Sambol, Eric Sieracki. (Siegel, David) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Second Set of Requests for Admission 139 filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christin Hill in Support of Motion to Compel, # 2 Exhibits 1-2 to Declaration of Christin Hill, # 3 Declaration of Spencer E. Bendell in Opposition to Motion to Compel and Exhibits 1-2)(Hill, Christin) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Second Set of Requests for Admission filed by Defendant David Sambol. Motion set for hearing on 7/27/2010 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hill, Christin) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories Nos. 12 &17 and Requests for Admission Nos. 4 through 30 134 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Adam Fletcher in Support of Motion to Compel, # 2 Exhibit 1, 2 to Fletcher Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Fletcher Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 4, 5 to Fletcher Declaration, # 5 Declaration of Spencer Bendell in Opposition to Motion to Compel, # 6 Exhibit 1 to Bendell Declaration)(Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. correcting MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories Nos. 12 &17 and Requests for Admission Nos. 4 through 30 135 (Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle granting Ex Parte Application for Order for Granting Relief from the Presumptive Deposition Duration Limitation Set Forth in Rule 30(d)(1), with Respect to the Deposition of John P. McMurray 120 (ec) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories Nos. 12 &17 and Requests for Admission Nos. 4 through 30 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. Motion set for hearing on 7/27/2010 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Adam Fletcher in Support of Motion to Compel, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits 1, 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits 4, 5, # 5 Declaration Spencer Bendell in Opposition to Motion to Compel, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories Nos. 12 &17 and Requests for Admission Nos. 4 through 30 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. Motion set for hearing on 7/27/2010 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle. (Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Production of Transcripts 132 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of Vicki Chou In Support Of Motion To Compel, # 2 Exhibit 1-8 To Chou Declaration, # 3 Declaration Of Lynn Dean In Opposition To Motion To Compel, # 4 Exhibit 1 To Dean Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 2-3 To Dean Declaration)(Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Production of Transcripts filed by defendant Angelo Mozilo. Motion set for hearing on 7/27/2010 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle. (Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REGARDING PAGE LIMITS ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge John F. Walter, re Stipulation for Order 128 . (kbr) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Proposed Order re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Granting Relief from the Presumptive Deposition Duration Limitation Set Forth in Rule 30(d)(1), with Respect to the Deposition of John P. McMurray, Former Chief Credit Risk Officer of Countrywide Financial Corporatio EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Granting Relief from the Presumptive Deposition Duration Limitation Set Forth in Rule 30(d)(1), with Respect to the Deposition of John P. McMurray, Former Chief Credit Risk Officer of Countrywide Financial Corporatio 120 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Vicki Chou counsel for Defendant Angelo Mozilo. Adding Vicki Chou as attorney as counsel of record for Angelo Mozilo for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo (Chou, Vicki) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION for Order Concerning Page Limits on Defendants' Motions For Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle: granting to extent recited on the record 120 Ex Parte Application for Order (ec) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Granting Relief from the Presumptive Deposition Duration Limitation Set Forth in Rule 30(d)(1), with Respect to the Deposition of John P. McMurray, Former Chief Credit Risk Officer of Countrywide Financial Corporatio EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Granting Relief from the Presumptive Deposition Duration Limitation Set Forth in Rule 30(d)(1), with Respect to the Deposition of John P. McMurray, Former Chief Credit Risk Officer of Countrywide Financial Corporatio 120 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Paris A. Wynn)(Wynn, Paris) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 6-16-10 11:51 a.m. (ha) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 6-16-10 11:51 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Babykin Courthouse Services, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/15/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/25/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/22/2010. (ha) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DEFENDANTS' JOINT RESPONSE re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Granting Relief from the Presumptive Deposition Duration Limitation Set Forth in Rule 30(d)(1), with Respect to the Deposition of John P. McMurray, Former Chief Credit Risk Officer of Countrywide Financial Corporatio EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Granting Relief from the Presumptive Deposition Duration Limitation Set Forth in Rule 30(d)(1), with Respect to the Deposition of John P. McMurray, Former Chief Credit Risk Officer of Countrywide Financial Corporatio 120 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Siegel, David) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Randall Louis Jackson counsel for Defendant Angelo Mozilo. Adding Eric J. Carsten as attorney as counsel of record for Angelo Mozilo for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Paris A. Wynn in Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Granting Relief from the Presumptive Deposition Duration Limitation Set Forth in Rule 30(d)(1), with Respect to the Deposition of John P. McMurray, Former Chief Credit Risk Officer of Countrywide Financial Corporatio EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Granting Relief from the Presumptive Deposition Duration Limitation Set Forth in Rule 30(d)(1), with Respect to the Deposition of John P. McMurray, Former Chief Credit Risk Officer of Countrywide Financial Corporatio 120 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26)(Wynn, Paris) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Granting Relief from the Presumptive Deposition Duration Limitation Set Forth in Rule 30(d)(1), with Respect to the Deposition of John P. McMurray, Former Chief Credit Risk Officer of Countrywide Financial Corporation filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Spencer E. Bendell, # 3 Proposed Order)(Wynn, Paris) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle regarding the SEC's second supplemental response to Defendant's Interrogatory No. 11.Court Recorder: cs. (ec) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge John F. Walter GRANTING Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Samuel Bryant Davidoff on behalf of Defendant Angelo R. Mozilo, designating Randall L Jackson as local counsel (PHV FEE PAID) 117 . (jp) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION for attorney Samuel Bryant Davidoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $185 receipt number 0973-7098530 paid.) filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)(Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 6-8-10 10:04 a.m. (dc) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 115 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 06-08-10 10:04 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Babykin Courthouse Services, phone number 626-963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/2/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/12/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/9/2010. (dc) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 06-08-10 10:04 a.m. (dc) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 06-08-10 10:04 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Babykin Courthouse Services, phone number 626-963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/2/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/12/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/9/2010. (dc) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER FOR MODIFYING SCHEDULE FOR EXCHANGE OF EXPERT REPORTS by Judge John F. Walter, re Stipulation for Order 110 . (kbr) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES OF Discovery Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle granting 107 Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories. The court schedules a follow-up Telephone Conference for 6/16/2010 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle.Court Recorder: cs. (ec) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint STIPULATION for Order Modifying Schedule for Exchange of Expert Reports filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McCoy, John) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission 107 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Siegel, David) (Entered: 05/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 108 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT STIPULATION to MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission 107 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel P. Lefler, # 2 Exhibit 1-5 to Declaration of Daniel P. Lefler, # 3 Exhibit 6-8 to Declaration of Daniel P. Lefler, # 4 Declaration of Spencer E. Bendell, # 5 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Spencer E. Bendell (part 1 of 4), # 6 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Spencer E. Bendell (part 2 of 4), # 7 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Spencer E. Bendell (part 3 of 4), # 8 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Spencer E. Bendell (part 4 of 4))(Siegel, David) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories of Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. Motion set for hearing on 6/8/2010 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle. (Siegel, David) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter, Discovery cut-off 8/2/2010; Exhibit List due by 9/24/2010; Witness List due by 9/24/2010; Motions to be heard by 8/30/2010; Motions in Limine to be filed by 9/24/2010; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/24/2010; Last date to conduct settlement conference is 3/2/2010. Jury Trial set for 10/19/2010 at 08:30 AM before Judge John F. Walter. Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge John F. Walter. (se) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter, re Standing Order 4 . (se) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge John F. Walter granting Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Tobin J. romero on behalf of Defendant Angelo R Mozilo, designating Randall L. Jackson as local counsel (PHV FEE PAID) 103 . (jp) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION for attorney Tobin J. Romero to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $185 receipt number 0973-6846049 paid.) filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Attachments: # 1 Certifications of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)(Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle granting Stipulation for Discovery 101 . (ec) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION for Discovery as to Expert Discovery Protocols filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Walter) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT REPORT of Results of Settlement Conference filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Bendell, Spencer) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Michael C Tu counsel for Defendant David Sambol. Changing address to 701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 5600, Seattle, WA 98104. Filed by Defendant David Sambol (Tu, Michael) (Entered: 02/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Michael C Tu counsel for Defendant David Sambol. Changing address to 701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 5600, Seattle, WA 98104. Filed by Defendant David Sambol (Tu, Michael) (Entered: 02/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge John F. Walter granting Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Steven M. Cady on behalf of Angelo R. Mozilo, designating Randall L. Jackson as local counsel 95 . (jp) (Entered: 02/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge John F. Walter granting Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Beth A. Stewart on behalf of Defendant Angelo R. Mozilo, designating Randall L. Jackson as local counsel 94 . (jp) (Entered: 02/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION for attorney Steven M. Cady to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $185 receipt number 0973-6565115 paid.) filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Attachments: # 1 Certifications of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)(Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION for attorney Beth A. Stewart to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $185 receipt number 0973-6564918 paid.) filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Attachments: # 1 Certifications of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)(Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: granting 91 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David D. Aufhauser on behalf of Defendant, Angelo R. Mozilo, designating David Siegel as local counsel. (kbr) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: granting 90 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brendan V. Sullivan, Jr. on behalf of Defendant, Angelo R. Mozilo, designating David Siegel as local counsel. (kbr) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION for attorney David D. Aufhauser to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $185 receipt number 0973-6552047 paid.) filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)(Siegel, David) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION for attorney Brendan V. Sullivan, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $185 receipt number 0973-6551862 paid.) filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Attachments: # 1 Certifications of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)(Siegel, David) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Randall Louis Jackson counsel for Defendant Angelo Mozilo. Adding Charles E. Elder as attorney as counsel of record for Angelo Mozilo for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 12/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: granting 87 Application to Withdraw as Counsel of Record. (se) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 87 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Withdraw As Counsel of Record filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kane, Caroline) (Entered: 12/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Penelope A Graboys Blair counsel for Defendant David Sambol. Adding Penelope Graboys Blair as attorney as counsel of record for David Sambol for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendant David Sambol (Graboys Blair, Penelope) (Entered: 12/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge John F. Walter granting Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Charles J. Ha on behalf of defendant David Sambol, designating Michael Tu as local counsel (PHV FEE PAID) 83 . (jp) (Entered: 12/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge John F. Walter grantingApplication to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Lori Lynn Phillips on behalf of defendant David Sambol, designating Michael Tu as local counsel (PHV FEE PAID) 82 . (jp) (Entered: 12/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION for attorney Charles J. Ha to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $185 receipt number 09730000000006244446 paid.) filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tu, Michael) (Entered: 12/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION for attorney Lori Lynn Phillips to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $185 receipt number 09730000000006244345 paid.) filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tu, Michael) (Entered: 12/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) 1 with JURY DEMAND filed by defendant Eric Sieracki.(Weiss, Shirli) (Entered: 11/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) 1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo.(Siegel, David) (Entered: 11/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) 1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant David Sambol.(Brown, Walter) (Entered: 11/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 78 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge John F. Walter: re: ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT ANGELO MOZILO'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT 42 , ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT DAVID SAMBOL'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT 50 , ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT ERIC P. SIERACKI'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT 47 , ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT DAVID SAMBOL'SMOTION TO STRIKE 44 . (kbr) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: denying 42 Motion to Dismiss Case ; denying 44 Motion to Strike ; denying 47 Motion to Dismiss Case ; denying 50 Motion to Dismiss Case. (se) SEE DOCKET ENTRY 78 FOR IMAGE Modified on 11/3/2009 (sr). (gk). (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter that the Court schedule of trial and pretrial date as following: Jury Trial (Estimated length 3 weeks) set for 10/19/2010 at 08:30 AM. [Jury trial] Hearing on Motions in Limine; Hearing on Disputed Jury Instructions at 10:00 AM on 10/8/2010. Pre-Trial Conference; File Proposed Voir Dire Qs and Agreed-to Statement of Case 10:00 AM on 10/1/2010. Submit Pre-Trial Conference Order; File Motions in Limine; Memo of Contentions of Fact and Law; Pre-Trial Exhibit Stipulation; Summary of Witness Testimony and Time Estimates; File Status Report re Settlement; File Agreed Upon Set of Jury Instructions and Verdict Forms; File Joint Statement re Disputed Instructions, Verdicts, etc., due by 9/24/2010. Last day for hearing Motions at 1:30 PM on 8/30/2010; Discovery cut-off 8/2/2010. ADDITIONAL MATTERS TO BE DETERMINED AT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Last date to conduct settlement conference is 3/2/2010. Last day to file Joint Report re results of Settlement Conference due by 3/9/2010. (jp) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES Scheduling Conference held before Judge John F. Walter: ADR-12 is signed and filed. Court ordered the dates as indicated on Scheduling and Case Management Order filed today. Counsel served with Scheduling and Case Management Order on this date. Court Reporter: Victoria Valine. (jp) (Entered: 11/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER/REFERRAL TO ADR PILOT PROGRAM by Judge John F. Walter, case ordered to a private mediator to be completed no later than 3/2/2010. (jp) (Entered: 11/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT ADR PILOT PROGRAM QUESTIONNAIRE filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo.(Siegel, David) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 weeks, filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo.. (Siegel, David) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge John F. Walter, re Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference and Deadline for Filing Joint Rule 26(F) Report 70 . (jp) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference And Deadline For Filing Joint Rule 26(f) Report filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 10/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge John F. Walter: ORDER TAKING UNDER SUBMISSION Defendant Angelo Mozilo's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint 42 ; ORDER TAKING UNDER SUBMISSION Defendant David Sambol's Motion to Strike 44 ; ORDER TAKING UNDER SUBMISSION Defendant Eric Sierack's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint 47 ; ORDER TAKING UNDER SUBMISSION Defendant David Sambol's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint 50 . The hearing calendared for 10/19/2009 is hereby VACATED and the MATTERS are taken off calendar. The matters will be deemed submitted on the vacated hearing date and the clerk will notify the parties when the Court has reached a decision (jp) (Entered: 10/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo to Request for Judicial Notice, Request for Relief,, 43 (Siegel, David) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY in support of MOTION to Dismiss Case 42 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Siegel, David) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY In Support Of MOTION to Dismiss Case 47 filed by Defendant Eric Sieracki. (Weiss, Shirli) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPENDIX filed by Defendant David Sambol. Re: MOTION to Dismiss Case 50 (Supplemental) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-6)(Brown, Walter) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY in support of MOTION to Dismiss Case 50 filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Brown, Walter) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY in support of MOTION to Strike 44 filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Brown, Walter) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPENDIX filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. Re: Authority Not Published in Official Reporters in Support of Plaintiff's Oppositions to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Tab 1, # 2 Tab 2, # 3 Tab 3, # 4 Tab 4, # 5 Tab 5, # 6 Tab 6, # 7 Tab 7, # 8 Tab 8, # 9 Tab 9, # 10 Tab 10, # 11 Tab 11, # 12 Tab 12)(McCoy, John) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. Re: Request for Judicial Notice, Request for Relief,, 43 (McCoy, John) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION re: MOTION to Strike Notice (Other) 44 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of David Sambol's Motion to Strike 45 , MOTION to Strike 44 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (McCoy, John) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSITION re: MOTION to Dismiss Case 47 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (McCoy, John) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION re: MOTION to Dismiss Case 50 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (McCoy, John) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION re: MOTION to Dismiss Case 42 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (McCoy, John) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle granting Stipulation for Protective Order 54 (ec) (Entered: 09/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Stipulation submitted before wrong judge RE: Stipulation for Protective Order 54 . In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (mz) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by defendant David Sambol. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tu, Michael) (Entered: 08/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorect event selected. Correct event to be used in "NOTICE OF LODGING" under Category "NOTICE"; Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment to Motion to Strike 44 ; Clerk has termed erroneous hearing, document was not a Motion... only a Proposed Order and also modify the docket entries #49 to reflect the caption and documents; In the future, please use the SEARCH feature on the CM/ECF Menu Bar if you are unsure of the events to use. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (jp) (Entered: 08/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is "MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION" under category "RESPONSE/REPLIES/OTHER MOTION RELATED DOCUMENTS" instead of MOTION to Strike 45 , 46 ; Clerk has modify the docket entries #45 & 46 to reflect the caption and documents and also take Motion hearing off calendar before Judge Walter; In the future, please use the SEARCH feature on the CM/ECF Menu Bar if you are unsure of the events to use. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (jp) (Entered: 08/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents. The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is "STRIKE" under Category "MOTIONS" instead of Notice (Other) 44 ; Hearing information is missing; Proposed Document was not submitted as a separate attachment to Motion to Strike (DE #44); Clerk has modify docket entry #44 and set hearing Motion on 10/19/2009 before Judge Walter. The Proposed Order should be filed as an attachment to the e-filed Notice of Lodging and e-mailed to the generic chambers address the Proposed Order to Chambers. See General Order 08-02 for more information. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. (jp) (Entered: 08/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant David Sambol. Motion set for hearing on 10/19/2009 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of David Sambol's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, # 2 Appendix of Authority Not Published in Official Reporters in Support of Defendnat David Sambol's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, # 3 Exhibit 1-7 to Appendix, # 4 Exhibit 8-14 of Appendix, # 5 Proposed Order Re Defendant David Sambol's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint)(Luskey, Randall) (Entered: 08/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant David Sambol's Motion to Strike filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Luskey, Randall). Modified on 8/18/2009 (jp). (Entered: 08/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Dismiss Case 47 filed by Defendant Eric Sieracki. (Weiss, Shirli) (Entered: 08/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Eric Sieracki. Motion set for hearing on 10/19/2009 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Weiss, Shirli) (Entered: 08/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPENDIX OF AUTHORITY NOT PUBLISHED IN OFFICIAL REPORTERS in support of Defendant David Sambol's MOTION to Strike 44 filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Luskey, Randall) Modified on 8/18/2009 (jp). (Entered: 08/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES in support of David Sambol's MOTION to Strike 44 filed by Defendant David Sambol. (Luskey, Randall). Modified on 8/18/2009 (jp). (Entered: 08/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MTION to Strike filed by Defendant David Sambol. Motion set for hearing on 10/19/2009 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Luskey, Randall). Modified on 8/18/2009 (jp). (Entered: 08/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Case 42 filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-5, # 2 Exhibits 6-8, # 3 Exhibits 9-12, # 4 Exhibits 13-32, # 5 Exhibits 33-40, # 6 Exhibits 41-58, # 7 Proof of Service)(Siegel, David) (Entered: 08/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. Motion set for hearing on 10/19/2009 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Proof of Service)(Siegel, David) (Entered: 08/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: granting 39 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph K. Brenner on behalf of defendant Angelo Mozilo, designating David C. Marcus as local counsel. (se) (Entered: 08/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: granting 38 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William R. McLucas on behalf of defendant Angelo Mozilo, designating David C. Marcus as local counsel. (se) (Entered: 08/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION for attorney Joseph K. Brenner to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $185 receipt number 09730000000005713041 paid.) filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)(Marcus, David) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION for attorney William R. McLucas to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Fee of $185 receipt number 09730000000005712766 paid.) filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)(Marcus, David) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Caroline Elizabeth Kane on behalf of Defendant Angelo Mozilo (Kane, Caroline) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David C Marcus on behalf of Defendant Angelo Mozilo (Marcus, David) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER held before Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for November 2, 2009 at 8:30 a.m. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report and an ADR Pilot ProgramQuestionnaire on or before October 26, 2009. (kbr) (Entered: 08/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge John F. Walter, re Stipulation 31 good cause being shown, that the memoranda of points and authorities in support of Defendants Motions to Dismiss shall not exceed 35 pages; The SEC memoranda of points and authorities in opposition to the motions to dismiss shall not exceed 35 pages; alternatively, the SEC may file a single consolidated brief addressing all Motions to Dismiss, which shall not exceed 105 pages; Defendants reply memoranda of points and authorities shall not exceed 15 pages. The schedule for briefing the motions shall be as follows: Motions due on or before 8/14/2009; Opposition(s) due on or before 9/18/2009; Replies due on or before 10/2/2009; The Motions shall be heard on 10/19/2009 at 1:30 PM. (jp) (Entered: 08/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Randall Louis Jackson counsel for Defendant Angelo Mozilo. Adding Daniel P. Lefler as attorney as counsel of record for Angelo Mozilo for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 08/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney David Siegel counsel for Defendant Angelo Mozilo. Adding David Siegel as attorney as counsel of record for Angelo Mozilo for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo (Siegel, David) (Entered: 08/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION to Exceed Page Limitation as to Motions to Dismiss filed by Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. upon Eric Sieracki waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/15/2009, answer due 8/14/2009. Waiver of Service signed by Nicolas Morgan, Attorney for Defendant Eric Sieracki. (McCoy, John) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. upon David Sambol waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/15/2009, answer due 8/14/2009. Waiver of Service signed by Walter F. Brown, Jr., Attorney for Defendant David Sambol. (McCoy, John) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. upon Angelo Mozilo waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/15/2009, answer due 8/14/2009. Waiver of Service signed by David Siegel, Attorney for Defendant Angelo Mozilo. (McCoy, John) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant David Sambol. correcting Notice of Change of Attorney Information (G-06) 21 (Luskey, Randall) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 658 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?