One-E-Way Inc v. Plantronics Inc et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:11-cv-06673
District Judge Percy Anderson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 2, 2017 at 7:37 AM DT (4.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo One-e-way, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fernald Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brandon C Fernald +1 323 410 0320 +1 323 410 0330 brandon@fernaldlawgroup.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel D Stanger +1 323 410 0300 +1 323 310 0330 rachel.stanger@fernaldlawgroup.com

Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

v.
No Logo Audiovox Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space D. JOSEPH ENGLISH, ESQUIRE
Space Katherine L Nichols +1 213 689 7400 +1 213 689 7401 knichols@duanemorris.com
Space Christopher Joseph Tyson +1 202 776 7800 +1 202 776 7801 cjtyson@duanemorris.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John P. Cooley +1 619 696 6700 +1 619 696 7124 jcooley@gordonrees.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of E D Lerman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adrian J Rowe +1 619 740 2240 +1 619 744 2201 rowe@lawyer.com
No Logo Does, Defendant
No Logo Harman International Industries, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Barcelo & Harrison LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Reynaldo C Barcelo +1 949 340 9736 +1 949 258 5752 rey@bhiplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natalie Marie Hanlon-Leh +1 303 607 3500 +1 303 607 3600 natalie.hanlonleh@faegrebd.com
Space Joel D. Sayres joel.sayres@faegrebd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martha K Gooding +1 949 721 6900 +1 949 721 6910 mgooding@jonesday.com
No Logo Imation Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter M Lancaster +1 612 340 2600 +1 612 340 8856 lancaster.peter@dorsey.com
Space Kenneth E. Levitt +1 612 340 2600 +1 612 340 8856 levitt.kenneth@dorsey.com
Space Kent Jeffrey Schmidt +1 714 800 1400 +1 714 800 1499 santos.maria@dorsey.com
No Logo Jaybird Gear, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Parr Waddoups Brown Gee & Loveless, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Jeremy Adamson +1 801 257 7974 +1 801 532 7750 jadamson@parrbrown.com
Space Timothy B. Smith +1 801 532 7840 +1 801 532 7750 tsmith@parrbrown.com
No Logo Plantronics, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Harrington Foxx Dubrow & Canter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward W Lukas, Jr. +1 213 489 3222 +1 213 623 4321 elukas@hfdclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rader, Fishman & Grauer, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas E. Bejin +1 248 594 0600 +1 248 594 0610 teb@raderfishman.com
No Logo Tdk U.s.a. Corporation, Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (95) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (Attachments: # 1 Order Dismissing Plantronics, Inc.) (gk) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER DISMISSING PLANTRONICS, INC. WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Percy Anderson: Upon Stipulation 92 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Plantronics, Inc. is hereby dismissed, with prejudice, as to all claims asserted by Plaintiff. Each party hereto shall bear its own costs and attorney's fees incurred in this action. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6. ) (gk) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
      STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Plantronics Inc filed by Plaintiff One-E-Way Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court has been advised by counsel that this matter has settled. The parties have ten (10) days from the date of this order or until the next scheduled court appearance, whichever is shorter, to file with the court a dismissal of the action or to appear, in-person or telephonically with their clients, to place the settlement on the record. The parties may contact the deputy clerk of the court to calendar theappearance. If the parties do not dismiss the action or do not place the settlement on the record, the matter will remain on the Court's active trial calendar with all pretrial and trial dates in effect. (pso) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Settlement filed by plaintiff Plantronics Inc. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
            STATEMENT of Defendant Plantronics, Inc. re Service of Preliminary Invalidity Contentions (Lukas, Edward) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: The Stipulated Protective Order is entered on this date. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulated Protective Order) (gk) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff One-E-Way Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
                  DISCLOSURE of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions filed by Plaintiff One-E-Way Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Selection of Private Mediator filed by plainitiff One-E-Way Inc. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 02/06/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: None
                      Joint STIPULATION for Discovery filed by Plaintiff One-E-Way Inc.(Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 02/06/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                        CIVIL TRIAL ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: This matter is set for trial before the Honorable Percy Anderson. See document regarding the Court's procedures and requirements for civil trials. (smom) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                          SCHEDULING ORDER [FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b)] by Judge Percy Anderson: Establishing a Discovery Cut-off Date of July 30, 2012; setting Motion Cut-off date of August 6, 2012; setting Final Pretrial Conference for September 7, 2012 at 1:30 PM.; and setting Jury Trial Date of October 9, 2012 at 9:00 AM. (smom) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank 81 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                            MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court has received the parties' joint 26(f) report and finds that a scheduling conference is not necessary. The scheduling conference currently on calendar for 1/23/2012 at 10:30 AM is hereby vacated, and the matter taken off calendar. Pursuant to the agreement of the parties, this matter has been referred to private mediation. The parties have 14 days to select a mediator who has no conflicts and is otherwise available to act as the settlement officer in this matter. Plaintiff shall serve on all parties and file with the Court a Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions ("Infringement Contentions") on or before 2/24/2012. No later than 30 days after service upon it of the Infringement Contentions, defendant shall serve on all parties its Invalidity Contentions. See document for details. Jury Trial set for 10/9/2012 09:00 AM before Judge Percy Anderson. File Final Trial Exhibit Stipulation 10/4/2012. Hearing on Motions in Limine and Hearing on Disputed Jury Instructions at 1:30 PM 10/1/2012. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/7/2012 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. Motions in Limine to be filed by 9/7/2012. Proposed Voir Dire Questions & Agreed-to Statement of Case 9/7/2012. Lodge Pretrial Conference Order & Pretrial Exhibit Stipulation by 8/24/2012. File Contentions of Fact & Law 8/24/2012. Exhibit List due by 8/24/2012. Witness List due by 8/24/2012. File Status Report Regarding Settlement by 8/24/2012. File Agreed Upon Set of Instructions & Verdict Forms and File Joint Statement Regarding Disputed Instructions, Verdicts, etc. 8/24/2012. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 8/13/2012. Last Day for Hearing Motions 8/6/2012. Discovery cut-off 7/30/2012. Last Day for Hearing on Motion to Amend Pleadings or Add Parties 4/16/2012. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) (Entered: 01/23/2012)
                              LREF
                              Blank 80 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                              MINUTES - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff One-E-Way, Inc.'s Response 76 to the Court's Order to Show Cause dated 1/4/2012 72 . The Court concludes that Plaintiff has misjoined defendants in this action. Accordingly, defendants Audiovox Corp., Imation Corp., Harman International Industries, and JayBird Gear, LLC are hereby dropped from this action without prejudice as to Plaintiff's ability to refile its actions against them individually. Plaintiff requests that instead of dropping parties for misjoinder, the Court sever and consolidate the cases for various pre-trial purposes pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a). The Court declines to sever and consolidate the cases. Court Reporter: None. (gk) (Entered: 01/20/2012)
                                LREF
                                Blank 79 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson 77 . Before the Court is a Stipulation to Continue Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b), 26(f) Scheduling Conference (Docket No. 77). As required by the Courts Order Setting Scheduling Conference, the parties conducted their meeting of counsel and submitted their Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) Joint Report. If, after considering the Joint Report, the Court concludes that a Scheduling Conference is necessary, the Court will continue the Scheduling Conference to accommodate counsels trial plans. Should the Court determine that a Scheduling Conference is unnecessary, the Court will issue a Scheduling Order with pretrial and trial dates and vacate the Scheduling Conference. (im) (Entered: 01/19/2012)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting 75 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christopher J. Tyson on behalf of Defendant Audiovox Corporation, designating Katherine L. Nichols as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 01/18/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None
                                    STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from January 23, 2012 to February 13, 2012 filed by Defendant Plantronics Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Continuing Scheduling Conference)(Lukas, Edward) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/16/2012, Entered: None
                                      RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff One-E-Way Incto Order to Show Cause,,,,, 72 (Casto, Edward) (Entered: 01/16/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
                                        APPLICATION for attorney Christopher J. Tyson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by defendant Audiovox Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case - Christopher J. Tyson)(Nichols, Katherine) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Joel D Sayres counsel for Defendant Harman International Industries Inc. Changing firm name to Faegre Baker Daniels LLP. Changing e-mail to joel.sayres@FaegreBD.com. Filed by Defendant Harman International Industries, Inc. (Sayres, Joel) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Natalie Hanlon-Leh counsel for Defendant Harman International Industries Inc. Changing firm name to Faegre Baker Daniels LLP. Changing e-mail to natalie.hanlon-leh@FaegreBD.com. Filed by Defendant Harman International Industries, Inc. (Hanlon-Leh, Natalie) (Entered: 01/04/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 72 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court is in receipt of the First Amended Complaint (FAC) filed by plaintiff One-E-Way, Inc. (Plaintiff), the owner of a patent for the Wireless Digital Audio System. Plaintiff has sued defendants Plantronics, Inc., Audiovox Corp., Imation Corp., Harman International Industries, and JayBird Gear, LLC (Defendants) for patent infringement. Plaintiff alleges that Defendants manufacture and sell various wireless digital audio products that infringe various claims of its patent. Based on the factual allegations in the Complaint, it does not appear that Plaintiffs claimsagainst Defendants arise out of the same transaction or occurrence, given that each defendant seems toindependently manufacture and sell different devices that allegedly infringe on the patented invention.The Court therefore orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing, no later than January 16, 2012, why one ormore parties should not be dropped from this case for improper joinder. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 18, 20, 21;see also Coughlin,130 F.3d at 1351 (finding misjoinder where [e]ach claim raises potentially differentissues, and must be viewed in a separate and individual light by the Court). The SchedulingConference, previously calendared for January 9, 2012 at 10:30 a.m., is continued to 10:30 a.m. onJanuary 23, 2012.In response to this Order to Show Cause, Plaintiff may, if it so chooses, file separate actionsagainst Defendants, with new complaints and filing fees. (pso) (Entered: 01/04/2012)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting 53 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney D. Joseph English on behalf of Defendant Audiovox Corporation, designating Katherine L. Nichols as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 01/03/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney Timothy B. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice 64 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: Submitted Good Standing Certificate that is over 30 days old. Certificate was issued on 10/31/11 and application was filed on 12/8/11 See Local Rule 83-2.3.1. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt) (Entered: 01/03/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting 64 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Timothy B. Smith on behalf of Defendant Jaybird Gear LLC, designating Edward W. Lukas, Jr. as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 01/03/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                      JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff One-E-Way Inc.. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                        Notice of Interested Parties filed by defendant Plantronics Inc, identifying One-E-Way; Plantronics, Inc.; Audiovox Corporation dba Acoustic Research; Imation Corporation; Harman International Industries, Inc. dba AKG; Jaybird Gear, LLC. (Lukas, Edward) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney Timothy B. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) 64 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below. Other error(s) with document(s): Submitted Good Standing Certificate that is over 30 days old. Certificate was issued on 10/31/11. Application was filed on 12/8/11. See Local Rule 83-2.3.1. Fee has not been received. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                            Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by defendant Jaybird Gear LLC, identifying One-E-Way, Inc.; Plantronics, Inc.; Audiovox Corporation dba Acoustic Research; Imation Corporation; Harman International Industries, Inc. dba AKG; Jaybird Gear, LLC. (Lukas, Edward) (Entered: 12/08/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                              APPLICATION for attorney Timothy B. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by defendant Jaybird Gear LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Order On Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case)(Lukas, Edward) (Entered: 12/08/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION AND FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Stephen J. Kontos, Esq. for Defendant Plantronics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 G-64 Application, # 2 G-64 Proposed Order) (gk) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION AND FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to R. Terrance Rader, Esq. for Defendant Plantronics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 G-64 Application, # 2 G-64 Proposed Order) (gk) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents re: Response to First Amended Complaint 60 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Certification of Interested Parties and or no copies. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (kpa) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      ANSWER to Amended Complaint, 12 ; Demand for Jury Trial filed by defendant Plantronics Inc.(Lukas, Edward) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting 44 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thomas E. Bejin on behalf of Defendant Plantronics, Inc., designating Edward W. Lukas, Jr. as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Jaybird Gear LLC identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Adamson, Robert) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            ANSWER to Amended Complaint, 12 filed by Defendant Jaybird Gear LLC.(Adamson, Robert) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Jaybird Gear LLC, identifying One-E-Way, Inc., Plantronics, Inc., Audiovox Corporation dba Acoustic Research, Imation Corporation, HRMan International Industries, Inc. dba AKG and Jaybird Gear, LLC. (Adamson, Robert) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Audiovox Corporation, identifying One-E-Way, Inc., Plantronics, Inc., Imation Corporation, Harman International Industries, Inc. dba AKG Jaybird Gear, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Service)(Rowe, Adrian) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , Amended Complaint, 12 filed by Defendant Audiovox Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Service)(Rowe, Adrian) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    APPLICATION for attorney Donald Joseph English to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by defendant Audiovox Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case)(Nichols, Katherine) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting 47 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Peter M. Lancaster on behalf of Defendant Imation Corp., designating Kent J. Schmidt as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Harman International Industries Inc, (Barcelo, Reynaldo) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Harman International Industries Inc, (Barcelo, Reynaldo) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents re: Harman International Industries, Inc's Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint 41 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Certification of Interested Parties and or no copies. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (kpa) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting 46 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kenneth E. Levitt on behalf of Defendant Imation Corp., designating Kent J. Schmidt as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                APPLICATION for attorney Peter Lancaster to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE PAID) filed by defendant Imation Corporation. (kpa) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  APPLICATION for attorney Kenneth E. Levitt to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE PAID) filed by defendant Imation Corporation. (kpa) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff One-E-Way Inc, re Order, Set/Reset Hearing,,,, 43 served on 11/3/11. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      APPLICATION for attorney Thomas E. Bejin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by defendant Plantronics Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case)(Lukas, Edward) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        SCHEDULING CONFERENCE set for 1/9/2012, at 10:30 am by Judge Percy Anderson [FRCP 26(f)]: Counsel shall meet at least 21 days in advance of the Scheduling Conference to prepare a jointly signed report for the court to be submitted no less than 14 days before the Scheduling Conference. The report is to contain the items set forth below. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(c), the parties shall be represented by counsel with authority to enter into stipulations regarding all matters pertaining to conduct of the case. (Please see order for details) (kpa) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting 40 Request to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Reynaldo C Barcelo for defendant Harman International Industries Inc added. Attorney Martha K Gooding terminated. (kpa) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            ANSWER to Amended Complaint, 12 JURY DEMAND. filed by defendant Harman International Industries Inc.(Sayres, Joel) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              First REQUEST to Substitute attorney Reynaldo C. Barcelo in place of attorney Martha K. Gooding filed by defendant Harman International Industries Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sayres, Joel) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer 31 by Judge Percy Anderson: Time for Audivox Corporation d/b/a Acoustic Research to respond to the First Amended Complaint is extended to 11/10/11. (kpa) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting 27 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Natalie Hanlon-Leh on behalf of Defendant Harmon International Industries, Inc., designating Martha K. Gooding as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant Jaybird Gear, LLC to Respond to First Amended Complaint by Not More Than 30 Days filed 10/17/2011 29 . The following error(s) was found: Proposed Order not submitted herewith. Stipulations - Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) event was utilized in docketing this filing. The "30 days or less" event is used for Stipulations as to an initial complaint, pursuant to Local Rule 8-3. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION AND FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Timothy B. Smith for Defendant Jaybird Gear LLC. (Attachments: # 1 G-64 Application, # 2 G-64 Proposed Order) (gk) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT HARMAN INTERNATIONAL INDUSTRIES, INC. D/B/A AKG TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Percy Anderson: Upon Stipulation 31 , the time for Defendant Harmon International Industries, Inc. d/b/a AKG to respond to the First Amended Complaint 12 is extended to 11/2/2011. (gk) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: denying 32 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Terming Attorney D Joseph English. Local counsel must have an office in this district. (lt) Modified on 10/19/2011 (lt). (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT PLANTRONICS, INC. AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Percy Anderson: Upon Stipulation 24 , the time for Defendant Plantronics, Inc. to respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint 12 is extended to 11/16/2011. No further extensions. (gk) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney D. Joseph English to appear on behalf of Defendant Audiovox Corporation, and designating Adrian J. Rowe as local counsel. (PHV FEE PAID.) Lodged Proposed Order. (gk) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 11/10/2011 re Amended Complaint, 12 filed by Defendant Harman International Industries Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sayres, Joel) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Imation Corporation, identifying ONE-E-WAY, INC.; PLANTRONICS, INC.; AUDIOVOX CORPORATION dba ACOUSTIC RESEARCH; HARMAN INTERNATIONAL INDUSTRIES, INC. dba AKG; JAYBIRD GEAR, LLC. (Schmidt, Kent) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by Defendant Jaybird Gear LLC.(Adamson, Robert) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Amended Complaint, 12 Answer to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Imation Corporation.(Schmidt, Kent) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION for attorney Natalie Hanlon-Leh to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV FEE NOT PAID.) filed by Defendant Harman International Industries Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information for attorney Martha K Gooding counsel for Defendant Harman International Industries Inc. Filed by Defendant Harman International Industries, Inc. (Gooding, Martha) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to November 10, 2011 re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , Amended Complaint, 12 filed by Defendant Audiovox Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rowe, Adrian) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to November 16, 2011 filed by defendant Plantronics Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Plantronics, Inc. an Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint)(Lukas, Edward) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS PLANTRONICS, INC., HARMAN INTERNATIONAL INDUSTRIES, INC. AND JAYBIRD GEAR, LLC AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Percy Anderson: Upon Stipulation 18 , the Court grants the request as follows: The time for defendants Plantronics, Inc., Harman International Industries, Inc., and Jaybird Gear, LLC to respond to the First Amended Complaint 12 is extended to 10/17/2011. (gk) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION AND FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to D. Joseph English for Defendant Audiovox Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 G-64 Application, # 2 G-64 Proposed Order) (gk) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to First Amended Complaint By Not More Than 30 Days as to Audiovox Corporation d/b/a Acoustic Research filed 9/20/2011 15 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Stipulations - Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days). Proposed Order not submitted herewith. Stipulations - Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) event was utilized in docketing this filing. The "30 days or less" event is used for Stipulations as to an initial complaint, pursuant to Local Rule 8-3. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to First Amended Complaint By Not More Than 30 Days as to Plantronics, Inc., Harman International Industries, Inc. and Jaybird Gear, LLC filed 9/19/2011 14 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Stipulations - Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days). Proposed Order not submitted herewith. Stipulations - Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) event was utilized in docketing this filing. The "30 days or less" event is used for Stipulations as to an initial complaint, pursuant to Local Rule 8-3. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION AND FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Thomas E. Bejin for Defendant Plantronics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 G-64 Application, # 2 G-64 Proposed Order) (gk) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to October 17, 2011 filed by defendant Harman International Industries Inc, Jaybird Gear LLC, One-E-Way Inc, Plantronics Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Plantronics, Inc., Harman International Industries, Inc and Jaybird Gear, LLC an Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint)(Lukas, Edward) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint By Not More Than 30 Days as to Imation Corporation filed 9/16/2011 13 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Stipulations - Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days). Proposed Order not submitted herewith. Stipulations - Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) event was utilized in docketing this filing. The "30 days or less" event is used for Stipulations as to an initial complaint, pursuant to Local Rule 8-3. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION AND FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Kenneth Levitt for Defendant Imation Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 G-64 Application, # 2 G-64 Proposed Order) (gk) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Audiovox Corporation answer now due 10/19/2011, re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 , Amended Complaint, 12 filed by defendant Audiovox Corporation.(Rowe, Adrian) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Jaybird Gear LLC answer now due 10/17/2011; Harman International Industries Inc answer now due 10/17/2011; Plantronics Inc answer now due 10/17/2011, filed by Defendant Jaybird Gear LLC; Harman International Industries Inc; Plantronics Inc.(Lukas, Edward) (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Imation Corporation answer now due 10/17/2011, filed by Defendant Imation Corporation.(Schmidt, Kent) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Plantronics, Inc., Audiovox Corporation d/b/a Acoustic Research, Imation Corporation, Harman International Industries, Inc. d/b/a AKG and Jaybird Gear, LLC; Party Does and TDK USA Corporation terminated; amending Complaint 1 ; with Jury Demand filed by Plaintiff One-E-Way, Inc. (gk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2011: # 1 Issued Summons on First Amended Complaint) (gk). (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff One-E-Way Inc (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff One-E-Way Inc pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to TDK USA Corporation. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Manual Filing filed by Plaintiff One-E-Way Inc of First Amended Complaint. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 72 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court is in receipt of the First Amended Complaint (FAC) filed by plaintiff One-E-Way, Inc. (Plaintiff), the owner of a patent for the Wireless Digital Audio System. Plaintiff has sued defendants Plant ronics, Inc., Audiovox Corp., Imation Corp., Harman International Industries, and JayBird Gear, LLC (Defendants) for patent infringement. Plaintiff alleges that Defendants manufacture and sell various wireless digital audio products that infringe var ious claims of its patent. Based on the factual allegations in the Complaint, it does not appear that Plaintiffs claimsagainst Defendants arise out of the same transaction or occurrence, given that each defendant seems toindependently manufacture and sell different devices that allegedly infringe on the patented invention.The Court therefore orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing, no later than January 16, 2012, why one ormore parties should not be dropped from this case for improper joinder. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 18, 20, 21;see also Coughlin,130 F.3d at 1351 (finding misjoinder where [e]ach claim raises potentially differentissues, and must be viewed in a separate and individual light by the Court). The SchedulingConference, previously calendared for January 9, 2012 at 10:30 a.m., is continued to 10:30 a.m. onJanuary 23, 2012.In response to this Order to Show Cause, Plaintiff may, if it so chooses, file separate actionsagainst Defendants, with new complaints and filing fees. (pso)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting 7 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Edward E Casto, Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff One-E-Way, Inc., designating Brandon C Fernald as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION for attorney Edward E. Casto, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $275 receipt number 0973-9098690 paid.) filed by plaintiff One-E-Way Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)(Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (pso) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Edward E Casto Jr for Plaintiff One-E-Way Inc. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $275.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (et) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE TO PARTIES OF ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by One-E-Way Inc. (et) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff One-E-Way Inc, identifying Other Affiliate C Earl Woolfork, Other Affiliate Cedric Woolfork, Other Affiliate Tina Woolfork for One-E-Way Inc. (et) (mg). (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against Defendants Audiovox Corporation, Does 1 through 10 inclusive, Harman International Industries Inc, Jaybird Gear LLC, Plantronics Inc, TDK USA Corporation. Case assigned to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Filing fee $ 350 Paid.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff One-E-Way Inc. (et) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2011: # 1 Ntc of Assgmt, # 2 Summons) (mg). (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 579 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?