Lloyd T. Kearns
Bankruptcy Case California Eastern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 10-40570
District Judge Christopher M. Klein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo August B. Landis, U.S. Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Judith C. Hotze

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith C. Hotze +1 916 930 2100
No Logo Doris T. Kearns, Joint Debtor

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Doris T. Kearns

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/18/2011 Mitchell L. Abdallah +1 916 446 1974 +1 916 446 3371
No Logo Lloyd T. Kearns, Debtor

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lloyd T. Kearns

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/18/2011 Mitchell L. Abdallah +1 916 446 1974 +1 916 446 3371
No Logo Susan K. Smith, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of J. Russell Cunningham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Russell Cunningham +1 916 443 2051 +1 916 443 2651 rcunningham@dnlc.net
  Entries (172) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service of 171 Declaration, 172 Exhibit(s) [DNL-6] (lars) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
    Certificate/Proof of Service of 171 Declaration, 172 Exhibit(s) [DNL-6] (lars) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 172 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
      Exhibit(s) to 166 Motion/Application to Sell [DNL-6] (lars) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
        LREF
        Blank 171 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
        Declaration of Susan K. Smith in support of 166 Motion/Application to Sell [DNL-6] (lars) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None
          Certificate/Proof of Service of 166 Motion/Application to Sell [DNL-6], 167 Notice of Hearing, 168 Exhibit(s) (nkrs) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
            Certificate/Proof of Service of 166 Motion/Application to Sell [DNL-6], 167 Notice of Hearing, 168 Exhibit(s) (nkrs) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 168 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
              Exhibit(s) to 166 Motion/Application to Sell [DNL-6] (nkrs) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                LREF
                Blank 167 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
                Notice of Hearing Re: 166 Motion/Application to Sell [DNL-6] to be held on 11/15/2011 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (nkrs) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                  LREF
                  Blank 166 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
                  Motion/Application to Sell [DNL-6] Filed by Trustee Susan K. Smith (nkrs) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                    LREF
                    Blank 165 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
                    Civil Minutes -- Hearing Re: 62 Counter Motion for Turnover [DNL-3] continued; Hearing to be held on 11/22/2011 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (tjas) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
                      Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 09/17/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
                        Copy of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (nkrs) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None
                          Order Not Approving 153 Reaffirmation Agreement (nkrs) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None
                            Civil Minutes -- Hearing Held Re: 153 Reaffirmation Agreement NOT APPROVED (tjas) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
                              Notice of Rescinding of All Signatures Re: 158 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding (msts) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
                                Notice of Rescinding of All Signatures Re: 158 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding (msts) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
                                  Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding Filed by Joint Debtor Doris T. Kearns, Debtor Lloyd T. Kearns (msts) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                    Order Denying 84 Motion/Application To Determine Excessive Payment To Debtor's Counsel [DNL-4] (lars) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                      Civil Minutes -- Hearing Held Under Advisement Re: 84 Motion/Application To Determine Excessive Payment To Debtor's Counsel [DNL-4] SUBMITTED (tjas) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                        Certificate/Proof of Service of 144 Response/Reply, 145 Declaration, 146 Exhibit(s) [DNL-4] (lars) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                          Exhibit(s) in support of 144 Response/Reply [DNL-4] (lars) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                            Declaration of Mitchell L. Abdallah in support of 144 Response/Reply [DNL-4] (lars) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                              Response/Reply [DNL-4] Filed by Interested Party Mitchell L. Abdallah Re: 108 Interim Order, 108 Order to Show Cause, 108 Order to Set/Continue/Reschedule Hearing (lars) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                Certificate/Proof of Service of 138 Declaration, 139 Declaration, 140 Declaration, 141 Response/Statement, 142 Exhibit(s) [DNL-4] (lars) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  Exhibit(s) to 138 Declaration, 140 Declaration [DNL-4] (lars) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    Response/Statement Filed by U.S. Trustee August B. Landis in Connection with Court's Order Re: 84 Motion/Application To Determine Excessive Payment To Debtor's Counsel [DNL-4] (lars) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      Declaration of Carla K. Cordero in Connection with Court's Order Re: 84 Motion/Application To Determine Excessive Payment To Debtor's Counsel [DNL-4] (lars) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        Declaration of Vikas Kumar in Connection with Court's Order Re: 84 Motion/Application To Determine Excessive Payment To Debtor's Counsel [DNL-4] (lars) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          Declaration of Allen C. Massey in Connection with Court's Order Re: 84 Motion/Application To Determine Excessive Payment To Debtor's Counsel [DNL-4] (lars) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                Certificate/Proof of Service of 134 Notice of Entry [DNL-5] (lars) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  Notice of Entry of 133 Order on Motion/Application to Abandon [DNL-5] (lars) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    Civil Minute Order Granting 120 Motion/Application To Abandon [DNL-5] (lars) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      Request for Judicial Notice Re: 131 Response/Reply, [DNL-5] 131 Counter Motion Quash Trustees Motion to Abandon Filed by Joint Debtor Doris T. Kearns, Debtor Lloyd T. Kearns (lars) Modified on 4/19/2011 (lars). (Entered: 04/19/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        Counter Motion to Quash Trustees Motion to Abandon Filed by Joint Debtor Doris T. Kearns, Debtor Lloyd T. Kearns [DNL-5] (lars) Modified on 4/19/2011 (lars). (Entered: 04/19/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          Civil Minute Order Denying 82 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding (lars) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            Declaration of Lloyd T. Kearns in support of 82 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding (lars) (Entered: 04/05/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              Declaration of LLoyd T. Kearns Re: 82 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding (lars) (Entered: 04/05/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                Declaration of Lloyd T. Kearns Re: 82 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding (lars) (Entered: 04/05/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Certificate of Mailing of Notice to File Claims as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Certificate/Proof of Service of 120 Motion/Application to Abandon [DNL-5], 121 Notice of Hearing, 122 Declaration, 123 Exhibit(s) (lars) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Exhibit(s) to 122 Declaration [DNL-5] (lars) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Declaration of Susan K. Smith in support of 120 Motion/Application to Abandon [DNL-5] (lars) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Notice of Hearing Re: 120 Motion/Application to Abandon [DNL-5] to be held on 4/19/2011 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (lars) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Motion/Application to Abandon [DNL-5] Filed by Trustee Susan K. Smith (lars) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Notice to Creditors to File Proof of Claim as Transmitted to BNC for Service Proofs of Claim due by 6/21/2011. (lars) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Civil Minute Order Granting 95 Motion/Application to Withdraw As Attorney (dhes) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Civil Minutes -- Hearing Re: 82 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding continued; Hearing to be held on 4/5/2011 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (tjas) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 116 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Civil Minute Order/Order to Set/Continue/Reschedule Hearing Re: 62 Counter Motion for Turnover [DNL-3] ; Hearing to be held on 9/27/2011 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE DISCOVERY DEADLINE IS AUGUST 31, 2011 (dhes) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Certificate/Proof of Service of 114 Notice [LK-1] (lars) (Entered: 03/17/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Notice of Continued Hearing Re: 82 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding [LK-1] (lars) (Entered: 03/17/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Document - FOIA Request (1) and Request for Discovery Filed by Debtor Lloyd T. Kearns (jris) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            Document - Judicial Notice No. 2 of Declaration of Independence, the Consitution of the United States, Constitution of the State of California, Judges Oath, Code of Judicial Conduct (CJC) and Rules of Professional Conduct (RPC) Filed by Debtor Lloyd T. Kearns (jris) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Response/Reply Filed by Joint Debtor Doris T. Kearns, Debtor Lloyd T. Kearns Re: 102 Opposition/Objection (lars) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Certificate/Proof of Service of 109 Notice of Entry [DNL-4] (lars) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Notice of Entry of 108 Interim Order, 108 Order to Show Cause, 108 Order to Set/Continue/Reschedule Hearing [DNL-4] (lars) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Order to Set/Continue/Reschedule Hearing Re: 84 Motion/Application To Determine Excessive Payment To Debtor's Counsel [DNL-4]; Hearing to be held on 6/7/2011 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (stps) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Civil Minutes -- Hearing Re: 84 Motion/Application To Determine Excessive Payment To Debtor's Counsel [DNL-4] continued; Hearing to be held on 6/7/2011 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (tjas) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Certificate/Proof of Service of 82 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding, 101 Notice of Hearing (lars) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Certificate/Proof of Service of 102 Opposition/Objection, 103 Declaration, 104 Exhibit(s) (stps) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Exhibit(s) in support of 102 Opposition/Objection (stps) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Susan K. Smith in opposition to 82 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding (stps) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Opposition/Objection Filed by Trustee Susan K. Smith Re: 82 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding (stps) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Hearing Re: 82 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding to be held on 3/15/2011 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (stps) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Civil Minutes -- Hearing Re: 84 Motion/Application To Determine Excessive Payment To Debtor's Counsel [DNL-4] continued; Hearing to be held on 3/2/2011 at 03:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (tjas) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 99 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Civil Minutes -- Hearing Re: 62 Counter Motion for Turnover [DNL-3] continued; Hearing to be held on 3/15/2011 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (tjas) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Amended Certificate/Proof of Service of 95 Motion/Application by Mitchell L. Abdallah to Withdraw as Attorney [MLA-5], 96 Notice of Hearing (stps) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Motion/Application by Mitchell L. Abdallah to Withdraw as Attorney [MLA-5] (stps) DUPLICATE SEE DOCUMENT #95 (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Hearing Re: 95 Motion/Application by Mitchell L. Abdallah to Withdraw as Attorney [MLA-5] to be held on 3/15/2011 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (stps) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Motion/Application by Mitchell L. Abdallah to Withdraw as Attorney [MLA-5] (stps) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94
                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93
                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92
                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91
                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90
                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89
                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88
                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87
                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate/Proof of Service of 67 Opposition/Objection, 68 Declaration, 69 Exhibit(s) [MLA-3] (stps) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Exhibit(s) to 68 Declaration [MLA-3] (stps) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Susan K. Smith in support of 67 Opposition/Objection [MLA-3] (stps) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition/Objection Filed by Trustee Susan K. Smith Re: 58 Motion/Application to Convert Case From Chapter 7 to Chapter 13 [MLA-3] (stps) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate/Proof of Service of 62 Counter Motion for Turnover [DNL-3], 63 Notice of Hearing, 64 Declaration, 65 Exhibit(s) (stps) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Exhibit(s) to 64 Declaration [DNL-3] (stps) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Susan K. Smith in support of 62 Counter Motion for Turnover [DNL-3] (stps) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Hearing Re: 62 Counter Motion for Turnover [DNL-3] to be held on 1/11/2011 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (stps) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Counter Motion for Turnover [DNL-3] Filed by Trustee Susan K. Smith (stps) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order, 58 Motion/Application to Convert Case From Chapter 7 to Chapter 13 [MLA-3], 59 Notice of Hearing, 60 Declaration (stps) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Lloyd T. Kearns and Doris T. Kearns in support of 58 Motion/Application to Convert Case From Chapter 7 to Chapter 13 [MLA-3] (stps) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Hearing Re: 58 Motion/Application to Convert Case From Chapter 7 to Chapter 13 [MLA-3] to be held on 1/11/2011 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (stps) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion/Application to Convert Case From Chapter 7 to Chapter 13 [MLA-3] Filed by Joint Debtor Doris T. Kearns, Debtor Lloyd T. Kearns (stps) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate/Proof of Service of 53 Objection to Homestead Exemption [DNL-2], 54 Notice of Hearing, 55 Declaration, 56 Exhibit(s) (stps) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit(s) to 55 Declaration [DNL-2] (stps) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Susan K. Smith in support of 53 Objection to Homestead Exemption [DNL-2] (stps) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Hearing Re: 53 Objection to Homestead Exemption [DNL-2] to be held on 1/4/2011 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (stps) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Objection to Homestead Exemption [DNL-2] Filed by Trustee Susan K. Smith (stps) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amendment Cover Sheet Re: 51 Summary/Schedule(s)/Statement of Financial Affairs/Disclosure, 51 Statement of Intention (stps) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 51 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statement of Intention (stps) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended Chapter 7 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Means Test Calculation - Form 22A (stps) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Civil Minute Order Denying 32 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding [MLA-1] (stps) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate/Proof of Service of 47 Notice of Withdrawal [MLA-1] (stps) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Withdrawal Re: 32 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding [MLA-1] (stps) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate/Proof of Service of 45 Notice of Entry [DNL-1] (stps) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Entry of 44 Order on Motion/Application to Employ [DNL-1] (stps) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting 36 Motion/Application to Employ J. Russell Cunningham [DNL-1] (stps) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate/Proof of Service of 35 Opposition/Objection, 39 Declaration [MLA-1] (msts) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate/Proof of Service of Proposed Order, 36 Motion/Application to Employ J. Russell Cunningham as Attorney(s) [DNL-1], 37 Declaration, 38 Exhibit(s) (msts) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Mailing of Notice to File Claims as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Susan K. Smith in opposition to 32 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding [MLA-1] (stps) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Exhibit(s) to 37 Declaration [DNL-1] (stps) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of J. Russell Cunningham in support of 36 Motion/Application to Employ J. Russell Cunningham as Attorney(s) [DNL-1] (stps) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion/Application to Employ J. Russell Cunningham as Attorney(s) [DNL-1] Filed by Trustee Susan K. Smith (stps) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition/Objection Filed by Trustee Susan K. Smith Re: 32 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding [MLA-1] (stps) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice to Creditors to File Proof of Claim as Transmitted to BNC for Service Proofs of Claim due by 2/2/2011. (stps) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended Certificate/Proof of Service of 30 Declaration, 31 Amended Notice of Hearing, 32 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding [MLA-1] (stps) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amended Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding [MLA-1] Filed by Joint Debtor Doris T. Kearns, Debtor Lloyd T. Kearns (stps) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended Notice of Hearing Re: 26 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding [MLA-1] to be held on 11/16/2010 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (stps) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended Declaration of Mitchell L. Abdallah in support of 26 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding [MLA-1] (stps) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate/Proof of Service of 26 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding [MLA-1], 27 Notice of Hearing, 28 Declaration (stps) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Mitchell L. Abdallah in support of 26 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding [MLA-1] (stps) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Hearing Re: 26 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding [MLA-1] to be held on 12/14/2010 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (stps) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion/Application to Dismiss Case/Proceeding [MLA-1] Filed by Joint Debtor Doris T. Kearns, Debtor Lloyd T. Kearns (stps) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Intent to Close Chapter 7 Case Without Entry of Discharge Due to Failure to File Financial Management Course Certificate as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Intent to Close Chapter 7 Case Without Entry of Discharge Due to Failure to File Financial Management Course Certificate as Transmitted to BNC for Service. (Admin) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Civil Minute Order Granting 9 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [DMM-1] (stps) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statement of Social Security Number(s) (stps) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate/Proof of Service of 16 Amended Verification and Master Address List, 18 Summary/Schedule(s)/Statement of Financial Affairs/Disclosure, 19 Summary/Schedule(s)/Statement of Financial Affairs/Disclosure, 20 Statement of Intention (stps) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended Statement of Intention (stps) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended Statement of Financial Affairs (Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required) (stps) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended Summary of Schedules Statistical Summary Schedules A - J (Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required) (stps) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended Chapter 7 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Means Test Calculation - Form 22A (stps) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amended Master Address List (Fee Paid $26) (stps) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate/Proof of Service of 9 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [DMM-1], 10 Notice of Hearing, 11 Declaration, 12 Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362) (lars) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Exhibit(s) to 11 Declaration [DMM-1] (lars) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Exhibit(s) to 11 Declaration [DMM-1] (lars) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Movant's Information Sheet (Section 362) Re: 9 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [DMM-1] (lars) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Ceseli Spearman in support of 9 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [DMM-1] (lars) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Hearing Re: 9 Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [DMM-1] to be held on 10/12/2010 at 09:30 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (lars) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion/Application for Relief from Stay [DMM-1] Filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Fee Paid $150) (lars) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Meeting of Creditors as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Requirement to File a Statement of Completion of Course in Personal Financial Management as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BNC 341 Notice Requested (CMX) (auto) (Entered: 08/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management Course Certificate as Transmitted to BNC for Service. (Admin) (auto) (Entered: 08/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statement of Social Security Number(s) (fdis) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Master Address List (auto) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Susan K. Smith (auto) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition. All Schedules and Statements filed. (fdis) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 61 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?