Pacific Coast Systems v. YRC Worldwide, Inc. et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:07-cv-05369-EDL
District Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte
Last Updated July 26, 2017 at 2:57 PM EDT (7.7 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Pacific Coast Systems, Plaintiff

Represented by Audet & Partners, LLP

v.
No Logo Arkansas Best Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Averitt Express, Defendant
No Logo Con-way Inc., Defendant
FedEx Corporation FedEx Corporation, Defendant
Officer/Director, Roadway Services, Inc.
No Logo Jevic Transportation, Inc., Defendant
No Logo New England Motor Freight Inc., Defendant
No Logo Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc., Defendant
No Logo R & L Carriers, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Saia, Inc., Defendant
United Parcel Service United Parcel Service, Defendant
Officially listed as "United Parcel Service, Inc."
No Logo Yrc Worldwide, Inc., Defendant
Attributes
Office San Francisco
Filed 10/19/2007
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 410 - Anti-Trust
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to Another District
County San Francisco
Terminated 2/19/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP, CLOSED, E-Filing, TRANSF
Timeline
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008 Receipt
RECEIPT/ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Certified Docket Sheet & Transferral Order & All Original Case File Documents Filed from United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2008)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Remark
Transfer Out Transmittal LETTER: A Certified Docket Sheet & Certified Copy of Transferral Order & All Original Case File Documents Sent Via Certified Mail to United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia, MDL No. 1895.(tn, COURT STAFF)
LREF
Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Order Transferring Case
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER by United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation TRANSFERRING CASE to United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1407, with the consent of that court, this case has been assigned to the Honorable William S. Duffey, Jr..***Civil Case Terminated. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2008)
LREF
Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008 Clerks Notice
CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING Case Management Conference to 3/4/2008 10:00 AM. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2008)
LREF
Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Clerks Notice
CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING Case Management Conference to 1/30/2008 03:00 PM. Joint case management statement due 1/22/2008. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2008)
LREF
Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007 ADR Scheduling Order
ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due 1/22/2008 & Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2008 at 3:00 PM.. (Attachments: #(1) EDL Standing Order). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/22/2007 (tn, COURT STAFF).
LREF
Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007 Complaint
CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT for Violation of the Sherman Act & Demand for Jury Trial - [Summons Issued] against Arkansas Best Corporation, Averitt Express, Jevic Transportation Inc., New England Motor Freight Inc., Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc., R&L Carriers, Inc., Saia, Inc., YRC Worldwide, Inc., Fedex Corporation, United Parcel Service, Inc. & Con-Way, Inc., [Filing Fee: $350.00, Receipt Number 34611011682]. Filed by Plaintiff Pacific Coast Systems. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2007)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007 Case Referred to ECF
CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tn, COURT STAFF)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007 Summons Issued
SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Arkansas Best Corporation, Averitt Express, Jevic Transportation Inc., New England Motor Freight Inc., Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc., R&L Carriers, Inc., Saia, Inc., YRC Worldwide, Inc., Fedex Corporation, United Parcel Service, Inc. & Con-Way, Inc.. (tn, COURT STAFF)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 93 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?