Aronson, et al v. McKesson HBOC, Inc., et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:99-cv-20743
District Judge Ronald M. Whyte, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Ronald M. Whyte
Last Updated July 21, 2017 at 7:53 AM EDT (7.8 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Alan D. Mello, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric D. Brandfonbrener +1 312 324 8602
No Logo Albert Adams, Plaintiff

Represented by McTigue & Porter LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Brian McTigue +1 202 364 6900 +1 202 364 9960 bmctigue@mctiguelaw.com
No Logo Albert R. Rubey, Plaintiff

Represented by Grippo & Elden LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/17/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald P. Bunnin +1 312 704 7757 +1 312 558 1195 docket@grippoelden.com
TERMINATED: 02/17/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary M. Elden +1 312 704 7700

Represented by Law Offices of Ward S Clay

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/17/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Joseph Wall +1 415 434 3323 owwm@pacbell.net
No Logo Andrew Aronson, Plaintiff

Represented by Barrack, Rodos & Bacine

Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Berger +1 215 875 3026 +1 215 875 4671 danberger@bm.net

Represented by Berman DeValerio, LLP

Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Max Wallace Berger +1 212 554 1403 +1 212 554 1489 MWB@blbglaw.com

Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Don Brian Hufford +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 1373 dbhufford@pomlaw.com
No Logo Andrew Young, Plaintiff

Represented by McManis Faulkner

No Logo Ashfield & Co. Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by McManis Faulkner

No Logo Baker Family Limited Partnership I, Plaintiff

Represented by Barrasso Usdin Kupperman Freeman & Sarver, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Celeste R. Coco-Ewing +1 504 589 9700 +1 504 589 9701 ccoco-ewing@barrassousdin.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen H. Kupperman +1 504 589 9700 skupperman@barrassousdin.com

Represented by Gold Weems Bruser Sues & Rundell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Ogden Middleton, II +1 318 445 6471
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles S Weems, III +1 318 445 6471 +1 318 445 6476 cweems@goldweems.com
No Logo Barbara H. Brubaker, Plaintiff

Represented by Law Offices of David C. Anson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C. Anson +1 520 299 5809 dcanson@ansonlammerslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark D. Lammers +1 520 577 2383 mdlammers@ansonlammerslaw.com
No Logo Barry C. Fitzpatrick, Plaintiff

Represented by McManis Faulkner

No Logo Carlos Bea, Plaintiff

Represented by Grippo & Elden LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/17/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald P. Bunnin +1 312 704 7757 +1 312 558 1195 docket@grippoelden.com
TERMINATED: 02/17/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary M. Elden +1 312 704 7700

Represented by Law Offices of Ward S Clay

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/17/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Joseph Wall +1 415 434 3323 owwm@pacbell.net
No Logo Charles M. Jacobs, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric D. Brandfonbrener +1 312 324 8602

Represented by Grippo & Elden LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/01/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary M. Elden +1 312 704 7700

Represented by Severson & Werson, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/01/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald John Querio +1 415 398 3344 +1 415 956 0439 djq@severson.com

Represented by Tucker Ellis & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/01/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence A. Callaghan +1 415 617 2400 +1 415 617 2409 lawrence.callaghan@tuckerellis.com
No Logo Charlie Hyatt, Plaintiff

Represented by McManis Faulkner

No Logo Cherie Mohrfeld, Plaintiff

Represented by Gold Bennett Cera & Sidener LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Solomon Benjamin Cera +1 415 777 2230 +1 415 777 5189 scera@gbcslaw.com

Represented by Lite DePalma Greenberg & Rivas, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul F. Bennett +1 973 623 3000
No Logo Christine Chang, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Scott Myers +1 415 896 1500 +1 415 896 5068 myerslawfirm@aol.com

Represented by Liner Grode Stein Yankelevitz Sunshine Regenstreif & Taylor LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald Scott Kravitz +1 415 489 7700 +1 415 489 7701 RKravitz@LinerLaw.com

Represented by Markun Zusman Freniere & Compton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Scott Zusman +1 415 438 4449 +1 415 434 4505 ezusman@mzclaw.com

Represented by THe Myers Law Firm LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Patrick Urbatsch +1 415 951 8100
No Logo City of Birmingham Retirement Fund, Plaintiff

Represented by McManis Faulkner

No Logo City of Miami Beach General Employee Retirement Trust, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Lometti +1 219 964 0046
No Logo Daniel Rodriguez, Plaintiff

Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/15/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan Schulman +1 858 793 0070 +1 858 793 0323

Represented by Goodkind Labaton Rudoff & Sucharow LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan M. Plasse +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 883 7063

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

No Logo Debra Rappaport, Plaintiff

Represented by McManis Faulkner

No Logo Diana Baker, Plaintiff

Represented by Barrasso Usdin Kupperman Freeman & Sarver, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Celeste R. Coco-Ewing +1 504 589 9700 +1 504 589 9701 ccoco-ewing@barrassousdin.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen H. Kupperman +1 504 589 9700 skupperman@barrassousdin.com

Represented by Gold Weems Bruser Sues & Rundell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Ogden Middleton, II +1 318 445 6471
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles S Weems, III +1 318 445 6471 +1 318 445 6476 cweems@goldweems.com
No Logo Donald Schverak, Plaintiff

Represented by McManis Faulkner

No Logo E. Austin Hess, Plaintiff

Represented by Law Offices of David C. Anson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C. Anson +1 520 299 5809 dcanson@ansonlammerslaw.com
TERMINATED: 04/15/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark D. Lammers +1 520 577 2383 mdlammers@ansonlammerslaw.com
No Logo Gary Rappaport, Plaintiff

Represented by McManis Faulkner

No Logo Gary Wojkiewicz, Plaintiff

Represented by McManis Faulkner

No Logo Gustav Suess, Plaintiff

Represented by McManis Faulkner

No Logo HBO & Company Securities Act Group, Plaintiff

Represented by ABBEY GARDY LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James S Notis +1 212 889 3700 +1 212 684 5191

Represented by Abbey Spanier Rodd & Abrams, LLP

Represented by Abbey, Gardy & Squitieri, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Jay Seirmarco +1 415 538 3725

Represented by Gardy & Notis, LLP

No Logo Henri Jacob, Plaintiff

Represented by McManis Faulkner

No Logo Henry F. Nelson, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric D. Brandfonbrener +1 312 324 8602

Represented by Grippo & Elden LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/01/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary M. Elden +1 312 704 7700

Represented by Severson & Werson, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/01/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald John Querio +1 415 398 3344 +1 415 956 0439 djq@severson.com

Represented by Tucker Ellis & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/01/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence A. Callaghan +1 415 617 2400 +1 415 617 2409 lawrence.callaghan@tuckerellis.com
No Logo James R. Baker, Jr., Plaintiff

Represented by Barrasso Usdin Kupperman Freeman & Sarver, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Celeste R. Coco-Ewing +1 504 589 9700 +1 504 589 9701 ccoco-ewing@barrassousdin.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen H. Kupperman +1 504 589 9700 skupperman@barrassousdin.com

Represented by Gold Weems Bruser Sues & Rundell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Ogden Middleton, II +1 318 445 6471
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles S Weems, III +1 318 445 6471 +1 318 445 6476 cweems@goldweems.com
No Logo James R. Baker, Jr. As Trustee of the Baker Family Trust for the Benefit of Diana Baker White and Sharon Baker Petrovsky, Plaintiff

Represented by Barrasso Usdin Kupperman Freeman & Sarver, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Celeste R. Coco-Ewing +1 504 589 9700 +1 504 589 9701 ccoco-ewing@barrassousdin.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen H. Kupperman +1 504 589 9700 skupperman@barrassousdin.com

Represented by Gold Weems Bruser Sues & Rundell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Ogden Middleton, II +1 318 445 6471
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles S Weems, III +1 318 445 6471 +1 318 445 6476 cweems@goldweems.com
No Logo James R. Baker, Jr. As Trustee of the James R. Baker, Sr. & Mary Parker Baker Trust for the Benefit of the Baker Granchildren, Plaintiff

Represented by Barrasso Usdin Kupperman Freeman & Sarver, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Celeste R. Coco-Ewing +1 504 589 9700 +1 504 589 9701 ccoco-ewing@barrassousdin.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen H. Kupperman +1 504 589 9700 skupperman@barrassousdin.com

Represented by Gold Weems Bruser Sues & Rundell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Ogden Middleton, II +1 318 445 6471
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles S Weems, III +1 318 445 6471 +1 318 445 6476 cweems@goldweems.com
No Logo Jerry Burger, Plaintiff

Represented by McManis Faulkner

No Logo Jesse Paul, Plaintiff

Represented by McManis Faulkner

No Logo Jesus Garcia, Plaintiff

Represented by McManis Faulkner

No Logo John J. Foley, Plaintiff

Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Berger +1 215 875 3026 +1 215 875 4671 danberger@bm.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Merrill Gene Davidoff +1 215 875 3084 +1 215 875 4671 mdavidoff@bm.net

Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/15/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan Schulman +1 858 793 0070 +1 858 793 0323

Represented by Law Offices of Richard S. E. Johns

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard S.E. Johns +1 415 781 8494 +1 415 397 0792 rsejohns@yahoo.com

Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren Jay Robbins +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 darrenr@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo John Norman, Plaintiff

Represented by McManis Faulkner

No Logo Josephine A. Lamprey, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric D. Brandfonbrener +1 312 324 8602

Represented by Grippo & Elden LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/01/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary M. Elden +1 312 704 7700

Represented by Severson & Werson, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/01/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald John Querio +1 415 398 3344 +1 415 956 0439 djq@severson.com

Represented by Tucker Ellis & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/01/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence A. Callaghan +1 415 617 2400 +1 415 617 2409 lawrence.callaghan@tuckerellis.com
No Logo Kathryn J. Hess, Plaintiff

Represented by Law Offices of David C. Anson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C. Anson +1 520 299 5809 dcanson@ansonlammerslaw.com
TERMINATED: 04/15/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark D. Lammers +1 520 577 2383 mdlammers@ansonlammerslaw.com
No Logo Marvin Barab, Plaintiff

Represented by Law Office of Wallace A. Showman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wallace A. Showman +1 212 333 2322 +1 212 581 8958 was@showmanlaw.com

Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

No Logo Mary P. Baker, Plaintiff

Represented by Barrasso Usdin Kupperman Freeman & Sarver, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Celeste R. Coco-Ewing +1 504 589 9700 +1 504 589 9701 ccoco-ewing@barrassousdin.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen H. Kupperman +1 504 589 9700 skupperman@barrassousdin.com

Represented by Gold Weems Bruser Sues & Rundell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Ogden Middleton, II +1 318 445 6471
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles S Weems, III +1 318 445 6471 +1 318 445 6476 cweems@goldweems.com
No Logo Melissa Rappaport, Plaintiff

Represented by McManis Faulkner

No Logo Merrily Burger, Plaintiff

Represented by McManis Faulkner

No Logo Michael P. Fuchs, Plaintiff

Represented by Fine Kaplan & Black, RPC

No Logo Michelle B. Foley, Plaintiff

Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Berger +1 215 875 3026 +1 215 875 4671 danberger@bm.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Merrill Gene Davidoff +1 215 875 3084 +1 215 875 4671 mdavidoff@bm.net

Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/15/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan Schulman +1 858 793 0070 +1 858 793 0323

Represented by Browne Woods & George, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Reed R. Kathrein +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 Reedk@mwbhl.com

Represented by Law Offices of Richard S. E. Johns

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard S.E. Johns +1 415 781 8494 +1 415 397 0792 rsejohns@yahoo.com

Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Shannon Lerach +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 general_efile@csgrr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren Jay Robbins +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 darrenr@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Minna Suess, Plaintiff

Represented by McManis Faulkner

No Logo Morris Landzberg, Plaintiff

Represented by McManis Faulkner

No Logo New York State Common Retirement Fund, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. ERIK SANDSTEDT +1 212 554 1495 +1 212 554 1444

Represented by Barrack, Rodos & Bacine

Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Berger +1 215 875 3026 +1 215 875 4671 danberger@bm.net

Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Max Wallace Berger +1 212 554 1403 +1 212 554 1489 MWB@blbglaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas E. Chase +1 212 554 1400
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Beata Gocyk-Farber +1 212 554 1421 +1 212 554 1448 Beata@blbglaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rochelle Feder Hansen +1 212 554 1400 +1 212 554 1444 rochelle@blbglaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Ronald Stickney +1 858 793 0070 +1 858 793 0323 davids@blbglaw.com
No Logo Oregon Public Employees Retirement Board, Plaintiff

Represented by Stoll Stoll Berne Lokting & Shlachter, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott A. Shorr +1 503 227 1600 +1 503 227 6840 sshorr@stollberne.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED N. Robert Stoll +1 503 227 1600
No Logo Philip N. Kane, Plaintiff

Represented by McManis Faulkner

No Logo Randolph W. Seed, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric D. Brandfonbrener +1 312 324 8602

Represented by Grippo & Elden LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/01/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary M. Elden +1 312 704 7700

Represented by Severson & Werson, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/01/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald John Querio +1 415 398 3344 +1 415 956 0439 djq@severson.com

Represented by Tucker Ellis & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/01/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence A. Callaghan +1 415 617 2400 +1 415 617 2409 lawrence.callaghan@tuckerellis.com
No Logo Rex Ponthie, Plaintiff

Represented by Barrasso Usdin Kupperman Freeman & Sarver, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Celeste R. Coco-Ewing +1 504 589 9700 +1 504 589 9701 ccoco-ewing@barrassousdin.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen H. Kupperman +1 504 589 9700 skupperman@barrassousdin.com

Represented by Gold Weems Bruser Sues & Rundell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Ogden Middleton, II +1 318 445 6471
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles S Weems, III +1 318 445 6471 +1 318 445 6476 cweems@goldweems.com
No Logo Richard A. Cohen, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/03/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert A. Jigarjian +1 415 341 6660 jigarjianlaw@gmail.com

Represented by Girard Gibbs, LLP

Represented by Green Welling, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/21/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT STANLEY GREEN +1 415 477 6700 +1 415 477 6710 flnd.uscourts@classcounsel.com
No Logo Richard A. Hess, Plaintiff

Represented by Law Offices of David C. Anson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C. Anson +1 520 299 5809 dcanson@ansonlammerslaw.com
TERMINATED: 04/15/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark D. Lammers +1 520 577 2383 mdlammers@ansonlammerslaw.com
No Logo Richard Hall, Plaintiff

Represented by McManis Faulkner

No Logo Richard Rappaport, Plaintiff

Represented by McManis Faulkner

No Logo Robert Waring, Plaintiff

Represented by Murray Frank & Sailer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric J. Belfi +1 212 682 1818 +1 212 682 1892 ebelfi@murrayfrank.com
No Logo Rusty Baker Family Limited Partnership, Plaintiff

Represented by Barrasso Usdin Kupperman Freeman & Sarver, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Celeste R. Coco-Ewing +1 504 589 9700 +1 504 589 9701 ccoco-ewing@barrassousdin.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen H. Kupperman +1 504 589 9700 skupperman@barrassousdin.com

Represented by Gold Weems Bruser Sues & Rundell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Ogden Middleton, II +1 318 445 6471
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles S Weems, III +1 318 445 6471 +1 318 445 6476 cweems@goldweems.com
No Logo Sebastian Bea, Plaintiff

Represented by Grippo & Elden LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/17/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald P. Bunnin +1 312 704 7757 +1 312 558 1195 docket@grippoelden.com
TERMINATED: 02/17/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary M. Elden +1 312 704 7700

Represented by Law Offices of Ward S Clay

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/17/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Joseph Wall +1 415 434 3323 owwm@pacbell.net
No Logo Susan L. Keith, Plaintiff

Represented by Law Offices of David C. Anson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C. Anson +1 520 299 5809 dcanson@ansonlammerslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark D. Lammers +1 520 577 2383 mdlammers@ansonlammerslaw.com
No Logo Susan W. Jacobs, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric D. Brandfonbrener +1 312 324 8602
No Logo Theodore H. Pacha, Plaintiff

Represented by McManis Faulkner

No Logo Walter Pearson, Plaintiff

Represented by Barrasso Usdin Kupperman Freeman & Sarver, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Celeste R. Coco-Ewing +1 504 589 9700 +1 504 589 9701 ccoco-ewing@barrassousdin.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen H. Kupperman +1 504 589 9700 skupperman@barrassousdin.com

Represented by Gold Weems Bruser Sues & Rundell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Ogden Middleton, II +1 318 445 6471
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles S Weems, III +1 318 445 6471 +1 318 445 6476 cweems@goldweems.com
No Logo William Morgan, Plaintiff

Represented by McManis Faulkner

v.
No Logo Alan Seelenfreund, Defendant

Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/06/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Xavier Carlos Vasquez +1 415 705 2321 +1 415 705 2501 vasquezc@sec.gov
No Logo Albert J. Bergonzi, Defendant

Represented by Buchalter Nemer Fields & Younger, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric S. Vanderpool +1 415 227 0900 +1 415 904 3101 evanderpool@buchalter.com

Represented by Cooley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Arthur Renne +1 415 693 2073 +1 415 951 3699 prenne@cooley.com

Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dorothy Yates Kirkley +1 404 521 3939 counsel@kirkleyhawker.com

Represented by Kirkley & Payne

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie Schwartz +1 404 892 8781

Represented by Unknown Entity

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Hawker
Arthur Andersen LLP Arthur Andersen LLP, Defendant
Officially listed as "Arthur Andersen"

Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marshall B. Grossman +1 310 255 9118 +1 310 907 2118 mgrossman@agsk.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gwyn Donna Quillen +1 310 255 9110 +1 310 907 2110 gwyn.quillen@bingham.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Scott Vick +1 310 907 1000 +1 310 907 2000 scott.vick@bingham.com

Represented by Krieg Keller Sloan Reilley & Roman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tracy M. Clements +1 415 249 8330 +1 415 249 8333 tclements@kksrr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stanley Gracey Roman +1 415 249 8330 +1 415 249 8333 sroman@kksrr.com

Represented by Water Garden - North Tower

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/17/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael L. Cypers +1 310 277 1226
Bear, Stearns & Company, Inc. Bear, Stearns & Company, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred Bicknese
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis J. Block +1 212 504 5555 +1 212 504 5557 dennis.block@cwt.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelvin Dean Chen +1 212 504 6535 +1 212 504 6666 kelvin.chen@cwt.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harry Demiris +1 212 504 6000
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jackie Friedman +1 212 504 6000
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan Peter Gardner +1 416 777 6231
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anna K. Sils +1 212 504 6000
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen L. Yen +1 212 504 6000
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Zimmer +1 212 504 6000 +1 212 755 5203

Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Traci Michelle Keith +1 650 328 4600 +1 650 463 2600 Traci.Keith@lw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John D. Minton +1 650 463 3009 +1 650 463 2600 john.minton@lw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allon Stabinsky +1 650 328 4600 +1 650 463 2641 allon.stabinsky@lw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip J. Wang +1 650 328 4600 +1 650 463 2600 philip.wang@lw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Christian Word +1 703 456 5226 +1 703 456 1001 christian.word@lw.com
No Logo Carl E. Reichardt, Defendant

Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/06/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Xavier Carlos Vasquez +1 415 705 2321 +1 415 705 2501 vasquezc@sec.gov
No Logo Charles W. McCall, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael L. Charlson +1 415 969 6900 +1 415 651 8786

Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard S. Caro +1 415 772 6487 +1 415 772 6268 hcaro@hewm.com

Represented by Hogan & Hartson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Shepard +1 415 519 5312 +1 202 637 5910 mjshepard@hhlaw.com

Represented by Kirtland & Packard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Behram Viraf Parekh +1 310 536 1000 +1 310 536 1001 bparekh@yaplaw.com

Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Represented by Weiss & Lurie

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Evan Tullman +1 212 682 3025 +1 212 682 3010 jtullman@aol.com

Represented by Weiss & Yourman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Jay Yourman +1 310 208 2800 +1 310 209 2348 service@wyca.com
No Logo David S. Pottruck, Defendant

Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/06/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Xavier Carlos Vasquez +1 415 705 2321 +1 415 705 2501 vasquezc@sec.gov
No Logo HBOC & Company, Defendant

Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Mark Balabanian +1 415 393 2000 +1 415 393 2286 david.balabanian@bingham.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Leanne Kennard +1 415 393 2626 kkennard@mdbe.com

Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony Warner Clark +1 302 651 3080 +1 302 651 3001 anthony.clark@skadden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Jacob Lerner +1 212 735 3000 +1 212 735 2000 jlerner@skadden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Elliot Lyons +1 415 984 6400 +1 415 984 2698 jlyons@skadden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Alan Miller +1 650 470 4500 +1 650 470 4570 Timothy.Miller@skadden.com

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/27/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa K. Brown +1 415 436 6962 +1 415 436 6748 melissa.k.brown@usdoj.gov
No Logo Heidi E. Yodowitz, Defendant

Represented by Farella Braun & Martel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephanie Sue Powers Skaff +1 415 954 4400
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carl Brandon Wisoff +1 415 954 4400 +1 415 954 4480 bwisoff@fbm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas Rea Young +1 415 954 4400 +1 415 954 4480 dyoung@fbm.com
No Logo Jane E. Shaw, Defendant

Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/06/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Xavier Carlos Vasquez +1 415 705 2321 +1 415 705 2501 vasquezc@sec.gov
No Logo Jay M. Lapine, Defendant

Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Represented by Keesal, Young & Logan, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bernard Reynold Suter +1 415 398 6000 +1 415 981 0136 ben.suter@kyl.com

Represented by Law Office of K.C. Maxwell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED K.C. Maxwell, Esq. +1 415 322 8817 +1 415 888 2372 kcm@kcmaxlaw.com
No Logo Jay P. Gilbertson, Defendant

Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Grace A. Carter +1 415 856 7000 +1 415 856 7100 gracecarter@paulhastings.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Han +1 415 856 7000 +1 415 856 7100 edwardhan@paulhastings.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Garrett Parker +1 404 815 2400 +1 404 815 2424 johnparker@paulhastings.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A. Reding +1 415 856 7000 jackreding@paulhastings.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Braden O. Wilhelm +1 415 856 7100 bradenwilhelm@paulhastings.com

Represented by Trainor Fairbrook

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/10/2006, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maria K. Graesser, Esq. +1 916 929 7000 +1 916 929 7111 mgraesser@trainorrobertson.com
No Logo John M. Pietruski, Defendant

Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/06/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Xavier Carlos Vasquez +1 415 705 2321 +1 415 705 2501 vasquezc@sec.gov
No Logo Mark A. Pulido, Defendant

Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen Byungson Kim +1 213 975 1600 +1 213 975 1740 hkim@bakerlaw.com

Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James T. Fousekis +1 415 777 3999 jim.fousekis@dlapiper.com

Represented by Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sima Saran Ahuja +1 212 820 8000
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brenda E. Cooke +1 212 859 8000
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David B. Hennes +1 212 859 8355 david.hennes@friedfrank.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric A. Hirsch +1 212 859 8737 +1 212 859 4000 eric.hirsch@friedfrank.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Winneker +1 212 820 8000

Represented by Holme Roberts & Owen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel E. Matteo-Boehm +1 415 268 2000 +1 415 268 1999 rachel.matteo-boehm@hro.com

Represented by Kirtland & Packard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Behram Viraf Parekh +1 310 536 1000 +1 310 536 1001 bparekh@yaplaw.com

Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Romanski +1 415 352 3000 dromanski@chapop.com

Represented by Satterlee Stephens Burke & Burke LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin Evan Klein +1 212 404 8706 +1 212 818 9606 jklein@ssbb.com

Represented by Tiffany & Bosco, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark J. Stein +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 mstein@stblaw.com

Represented by Weiss & Lurie

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Evan Tullman +1 212 682 3025 +1 212 682 3010 jtullman@aol.com

Represented by Weiss & Yourman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Jay Yourman +1 310 208 2800 +1 310 209 2348 service@wyca.com
No Logo Mary G.F. Bitterman, Defendant

Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/06/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Xavier Carlos Vasquez +1 415 705 2321 +1 415 705 2501 vasquezc@sec.gov
Mckesson HBOC, Inc. Mckesson HBOC, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Mark Balabanian +1 415 393 2000 +1 415 393 2286 david.balabanian@bingham.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Leanne Kennard +1 415 393 2626 kkennard@mdbe.com

Represented by Sheppard Mullin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert John Stumpf +1 415 434 9100 rstumpf@smrh.com

Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony Warner Clark +1 302 651 3080 +1 302 651 3001 anthony.clark@skadden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Jacob Lerner +1 212 735 3000 +1 212 735 2000 jlerner@skadden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Elliot Lyons +1 415 984 6400 +1 415 984 2698 jlyons@skadden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Alan Miller +1 650 470 4500 +1 650 470 4570 Timothy.Miller@skadden.com

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/27/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa K. Brown +1 415 436 6962 +1 415 436 6748 melissa.k.brown@usdoj.gov
No Logo Richard H. Hawkins, Defendant

Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

No Logo Robert H. Waterman, Jr., Defendant

Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/06/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Xavier Carlos Vasquez +1 415 705 2321 +1 415 705 2501 vasquezc@sec.gov
No Logo Tully M. Friedman, Defendant

Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/06/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Xavier Carlos Vasquez +1 415 705 2321 +1 415 705 2501 vasquezc@sec.gov
Bank of America Corporation Bank of America Corporation, Respondent
Officially listed as "Bank of America, N.A., acting through U.S. Trust, Bank of America Private Wealth Management, as independent fiduciary for the McKesson Corporation Profit-Sharing Investment Plan"

Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shannon M. Barrett +1 202 383 5308 +1 202 383 5414 sbarrett@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Meredith N. Landy +1 650 473 2600 +1 650 473 2601 mlandy@omm.com
No Logo Alfred C. Eckert, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Folger Levin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/07/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel R Miller +1 415 986 2800 +1 415 986 2827 smiller@flk.com
No Logo Alton F. Irby, III, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Folger Levin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/07/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel R Miller +1 415 986 2800 +1 415 986 2827 smiller@flk.com
No Logo Charles E. Thoele, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Donald C. Wegmiller, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Folger Levin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/07/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel R Miller +1 415 986 2800 +1 415 986 2827 smiller@flk.com
No Logo E. Christine Rumsey, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Gerald E. Mayo, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Folger Levin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/07/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel R Miller +1 415 986 2800 +1 415 986 2827 smiller@flk.com
No Logo HBO & Company Board of Directors, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Sheppard Mullin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert John Stumpf +1 415 434 9100 rstumpf@smrh.com
No Logo Holcombe T. Green, Jr., Cross-Defendant

Represented by Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hojoon Hwang +1 415 512 2907 +1 415 512 4077 hwanghx@mto.com
No Logo James V. Napier, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Folger Levin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/07/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel R Miller +1 415 986 2800 +1 415 986 2827 smiller@flk.com
No Logo M. Christine Jacobs, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Folger Levin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/07/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel R Miller +1 415 986 2800 +1 415 986 2827 smiller@flk.com
McKesson Information Solutions Inc. McKesson Information Solutions Inc., Cross-Defendant

Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Elliot Lyons +1 415 984 6400 +1 415 984 2698 jlyons@skadden.com
No Logo Michael L. Kappel, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Philip A. Incarnati, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Folger Levin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/07/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel R Miller +1 415 986 2800 +1 415 986 2827 smiller@flk.com
No Logo Salomon Smith Barney, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Kramer Verhoeven +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 charlesverhoeven@quinnemanuel.com
Other Parties
No Logo James Flanigan, Movant

Represented by 225 Broadway

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John W. Jeffrey +1 619 230 8828

Represented by Barrack, Rodos & Bacine

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gerarld J Rodos +1 215 963 0600 +1 619 963 0838 grodos@barrack.com

Represented by Carney Williams Bates Pulliam & Bowman, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gina M. Cothern +1 501 312 8500
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott E. Poynter +1 501 312 8505

Represented by Cauley Geller Bowman & Coates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven E Cauley +1 501 312 8500 + 501 312 8505

Represented by Dreher Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Robert Miller +1 619 230 8828 +1 619 687 0136 matt@dreherlawfirm.com

Represented by Jeffrey & Dreher

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Scott Dreher +1 619 230 8828 +1 619 687 0136 jdlaw@adnc.com

Represented by Robbins Umeda LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc M. Umeda +1 619 525 3990 +1 619 525 3991 notice@ruflaw.com
No Logo Jeffrey Arnold, Movant

Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge, LLP-Denver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jean-Paul Marie Menard +1 213 688 1000 jpmenard@mckennalong.com
No Logo Larry Greco, Movant

Represented by Glynn & Finley, LLP

No Logo McKesson HBOC Group, Movant

Represented by Folger Levin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Keenan +1 415 986 2800 rkeenan@flk.com

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert N. Kaplan , +1 212 687 1980 +1 212 687 7714 rkaplan@kaplanfox.com

Represented by Kaplan Kilsheimer & Fox LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Janine R. Azriliant +1 212 687 1980

Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

No Logo McKesson Nationwide Group, Movant

Represented by Schoengold Sporn Laitman & Lometti, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel Philips Sporn +1 212 964 0046 +1 212 267 8137 sporn@spornlaw.com

Represented by Weiss & Lurie

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Harry Weiss +1 212 682 3025 +1 212 682 3010 jweiss@weisslawllp.com

Represented by Weiss & Yourman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Jay Yourman +1 310 208 2800 +1 310 209 2348 service@wyca.com
No Logo Much Shelist, PC, Movant
Officially listed as "Much Shelist Freed Deneberg Ament & Rubenstein, P.C."

Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carol V. Gilden +1 312 357 0370 +1 312 357 0369 cgilden@cohenmilstein.com

Represented by Freed Kanner London & Millen LLC

Represented by McManis Faulkner

No Logo New York City Pension Funds, Movant

Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James M. Finberg +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 jfinberg@lchb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Martin Heimann +1 415 956 1000 +1 415 956 1008 rheimann@lchb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melanie M. Piech +1 415 956 1008

Represented by Lowey Dannenberg Bemporad & Selinger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil Lewis Selinger +1 914 997 0500 +1 914 997 0035 nselinger@lowey.com
PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP, Movant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/20/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott A. Fink +1 415 393 8267 +1 415 986 5309
No Logo Rappaport Group, Movant

Represented by Browne Woods & George, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Reed R. Kathrein +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 Reedk@mwbhl.com

Represented by Freed Kanner London & Millen LLC

Represented by Much Shelist, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edith F. Canter +1 312 346 3100

Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

No Logo RICHARD THOMPSON, Movant

Represented by Thomas More Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Thompson +1 734 827 2001 rthompson@thomasmore.org
No Logo Senvest International LLC, Movant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/03/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert A. Jigarjian +1 415 341 6660 jigarjianlaw@gmail.com

Represented by Girard Gibbs, LLP

Represented by Green Welling, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/21/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT STANLEY GREEN +1 415 477 6700 +1 415 477 6710 flnd.uscourts@classcounsel.com
No Logo Senvest Master Fund L.p., Movant
Officer/Director, Immersion Corp

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/03/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert A. Jigarjian +1 415 341 6660 jigarjianlaw@gmail.com

Represented by Girard Gibbs, LLP

Represented by Green Welling, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/21/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT STANLEY GREEN +1 415 477 6700 +1 415 477 6710 flnd.uscourts@classcounsel.com
Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., Movant
Officially listed as "Stephen G. Sullivan"
Officer/Director, Spansion Inc.
Officer/Director, Amd Investments, Inc.
Officer/Director, Amd (u.s.) Holdings, Inc.

Represented by Gold Bennett Cera & Sidener LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph M. Barton +1 415 777 2230 +1 415 777 5189 jmb@gbcsf.com

Represented by Lite DePalma Greenberg & Rivas, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul F. Bennett +1 973 623 3000
No Logo The Kentucky Teachers' Group, Movant

Represented by Chitwood Harley Harnes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neal S. Berinhout +1 404 873 3900
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin D Chitwood , +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MChitwood@chitwoodlaw.com

Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

No Logo UHL Access Plaintiffs' Group, Movant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew D. Rifat +1 619 282 0185 matthew.rifat@gmail.com

Represented by Alexander Hawes & Audet, LLP

Represented by Audet & Partners, LLP

Represented by Colton & Roesser

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roland C. Colton +1 619 259 1100 rcc7@msn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Grant Puleo +1 619 259 1100
No Logo Utah State Retirement Board, Movant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/16/2000, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory D. Phillips +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 683 5176

Represented by Berman DeValerio, LLP

Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas E. Chase +1 212 554 1400
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rochelle Feder Hansen +1 212 554 1400 +1 212 554 1444 rochelle@blbglaw.com

Represented by Heins Mills & Olson, PLC

Represented by Howard Phillips, & Andersen LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/16/2000, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin A Howard +1 801 366 7471 kah@hpalaw.com

Represented by LAW OFFICES OF TERRY L. GODDARD JR. PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/16/2000, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer S. Abrams +1 415 433 3200 jsad@pge.com
No Logo Webmd Corporation, Movant
Officially listed as "WebMD Corp."

Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Represented by The Tidrick Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Gregory Tidrick , +1 510 381 3832 +1 510 291 3226 sgt@tidricklaw.com
No Logo Michael Smeraski, Cross-Claimant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Binns +1 215 557 8000 +9224 922 922 4001
United States Securities and Exchange Commission United States Securities and Exchange Commission, Amicus Curiae
Officially listed as "Securities and Exchange Commission"

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melinda Hardy +1 202 942 0811
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard M. Humes +1 202 942 0871

Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward C. Schweitzer +1 202 942 0823
United States of America United States of America, Intervenor

Represented by Cooley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ross Winston Nadel +1 650 843 5000 +1 650 857 0663

Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Henry Hemann +1 415 442 1355 +1 415 442 1001 jhemann@morganlewis.com

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Paul Crudo +1 415 436 6824 +1 415 436 7234 timothy.crudo@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne-Christine Massullo +1 415 436 7200 Anne-Christine.Massullo@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Vincent Ryan +1 415 436 6730 +1 415 436 6748
Attributes
Citation Unknown
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Timeline
  Entries (1802) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Page 1 Page 2 Page 3 Page 4

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1801 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1800 Filed: 2/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER 1795 Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Expenses. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/8/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
LREF
Blank 1799 Filed: None, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT 1796 Approving Settlement With Arthur Andersen LLP of Contingent Payment Claim. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/8/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
LREF
Blank 1798 Filed: None, Entered: None
Minute Entry: Fairness Hearing held on 2/8/2013 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 2/8/2013). Motions to approve settlement and attorneys' fees and costs are granted. (Court Reporter Summer Fisher.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/8/2013) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
LREF
Blank 1797 Filed: None, Entered: None
CLERKS NOTICE re: Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer On February 1, 2013, counsel for Lead Plaintiff Thomas DiNapoli filed (1)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1796 Filed: None, Entered: None
(Proposed) Judgment Approving Settlement with Arthur Andersen LLP of Contingent Payment Claim (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2013) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1795 Filed: None, Entered: None
(Proposed) Order Awarding Attorney's Fees and Expenses (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2013) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1794 Filed: None, Entered: None
Lead Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Motion for FinalApproval of Settlement with Arthur Andersen LLP of Contingent Payment Claim, and In Further Support of Lead Counsel's Appreicateion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2013) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1793 Filed: None, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Richard W. Simmons Regarding Dissemination of the Andersen Notice of Summary Judgment (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2013) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank 1792 Filed: None, Entered: None
Declaration of Joint Declaration of Jeffrey W. Golan and John C. Browne in Support of in Support of Final Approval of Settlement with Arthur Andersen LLP of Contingent Payment Claim, and in Support of Lead Counsel's Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses 1791 (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2013) (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/04/2013)
LREF
Blank 1791 Filed: None, Entered: None
NOTICE of Lead Plaintiff Motion, Motion Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Settlement with Arthur Andersen LLP of Contingent Payment Claim, and in Support of Lead Counsel's Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2013) (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/04/2013)
LREF
Blank 1789 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Preliminary Approving Settlement With Arthur Andersen LLP of Contengent Payment Claim and Providing for Notice. Settlement Hearing set for 2/8/2013 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/28/12. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
LREF
Blank 1788 Filed: None, Entered: None
LREF
Blank 1787 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 1782 Motion for Re-Distribution of Settlement Funds. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2011) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
LREF
Blank 1786 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
Reply and Notice of Non-Opposition in Further Support of Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Re-Distribution of Residual Settlement Funds(re 1782 filed byNew York State Common Retirement Fund. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011) (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/19/2011)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1785 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None
(Proposed) Order Approving Motion for Re-Distribution of Residual Settlement Funds re 1782 by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2011) (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1784 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Richard W. Simmons in Support for Re-Distribution of Residual Settlement Funds re 1782 filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2011) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1783 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None
Declaration of M. Richard Komins in Support of Motion of Lead Plaintiff, The New York State Common Retirement Fund, for Re-Distribution of Residual Settlement Funds re 1782 filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2011) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1782 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None
Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum of Law of Lead Plaintiff, The New York State Common Retirement Fund, for Re-Distribution of Residual Settlement Funds. Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Responses due by 8/8/2011. Replies due by 8/15/2011. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2011) Modified on 7/26/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/26/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1787 Filed: None, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 1782 Motion for Re-Distribution of Settlement Funds. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2011) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
LREF
Blank 1786 Filed: None, Entered: None
Reply and Notice of Non-Opposition in Further Support of Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Re-Distribution of Residual Settlement Funds(re 1782 filed byNew York State Common Retirement Fund. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011) (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/19/2011)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1781 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: None
DECLARATION OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re 1780 Notice (Other) (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2009) (Entered: 04/30/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1780 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Entry of Order by New York State Common Retirement Fund re 1779 Order (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2009) (Entered: 04/30/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1779 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER re 1745 Approving Further Distribution of Net Settlement Funds. Signed by Judge Whyte on 4/27/09. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2009) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1778 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re 1774 Response, 1776 Affidavit, 1777 Proposed Order, 1775 Declaration (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2009) (Entered: 04/15/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1777 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None
Proposed Order re 1774 re Approving Further Distribution of the Net Settlement Funds by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2009) (Entered: 04/15/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1776 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Richard W. Simmons in Support of 1774 Response by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Part 2)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2009) (Entered: 04/15/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1775 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None
Declaration of Benjamin Galdston in Support of 1774 Response to Court's March 6, 2009 Order filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (Related document(s) 1774 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2009) (Entered: 04/15/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1774 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 1770 Court's March 6, 2009 Order by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2009) (Entered: 04/15/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1773 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Transcript of Proceedings held on 03/06/09, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/8/2009. (las, ) (Filed on 3/11/2009) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1772 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re 1771 Notice (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009) (Entered: 03/10/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1771 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund of Entery of 1770 Order (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009) (Entered: 03/10/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1770 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte denying 1762 Motion and deferring ruling on 1745 . (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2009) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1769 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 1760 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Shannon M. Barrett. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2009) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1768 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re 1767 Supplemental Memorandum (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2009) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1767 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None
Supplemental Memorandum in Reply to 1762 MOTION for Inclusion of Certain Claimants in Settlement Class filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2009) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1766 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re 1765 Declaration, 1764 Memorandum (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2009) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1765 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None
Declaration of Timothy A. Delange in Support of 1745 Motion for Further Distribution of Settlement and in Opposition to U.S. Trust's Objection Thereto filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (Related document(s) 1745 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2009) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1764 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM of Law in Further Support of 1745 Motion for Further Distribution of Settlement and in Opposition to 1758 U.S. Trust's Objection Thereto filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (Related document(s) 1758 , 1745 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2009) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1763 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None
Declaration of Larry Greco in Support of 1762 MOTION for Inclusion of Certain Claimants in Settlement Class filed by Larry Greco. (Related document(s) 1762 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2009) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1762 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None
MOTION for Inclusion of Certain Claimants in Settlement Class filed by Larry Greco. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2009) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1761 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None
Proposed Order re 1760 APPLICATION of Shannon M. Barrett for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611004703) ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611004703) by Bank of America, N.A., acting through U.S. Trust, Bank of America Private Wealth Management, as independent fiduciary for the McKesson Corporation Profit-Sharing Investment Plan. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1760 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None
APPLICATION of Shannon M. Barrett for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611004703) filed by Bank of America, N.A., acting through U.S. Trust, Bank of America Private Wealth Management, as independent fiduciary for the McKesson Corporation Profit-Sharing Investment Plan. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1759 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None
Declaration of Shannon Barrett in Support of U.S. Trust's Memorandum of Law in Response to 1745 Motion of Lead Plaintiff, The New York State Common Retirement Fund, for Further Distribution of the Net Settlement Funds filed byBank of America, N.A., acting through U.S. Trust, Bank of America Private Wealth Management, as independent fiduciary for the McKesson Corporation Profit-Sharing Investment Plan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Landy, Meredith) (Filed on 2/13/2009) Modified on 2/19/2009 (dhm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/13/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1758 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None
Memorandum of Law in Response to 1745 Motion of Lead Plaintiff, The New York State Common Retirement Fund, for Further Distribution of the Net Settlement Funds filed byBank of America, N.A., acting through U.S. Trust, Bank of America Private Wealth Management, as independent fiduciary for the McKesson Corporation Profit-Sharing Investment Plan. (Landy, Meredith) (Filed on 2/13/2009) Modified on 2/19/2009 (dhm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/13/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1757 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 1752 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009) (Entered: 02/12/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1756 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith N. Landy Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Respondent Bank of America, N.A., Acting Through U.S. Trust, Bank of America Private Wealth Management, as Independent Fiduciary for the McKesson Corporation Profit-Sharing Investment Plan (Landy, Meredith) (Filed on 2/12/2009) (Entered: 02/12/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1755 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re 1746 Affidavit, 1745 Memorandum in Support, 1750 Exhibits, 1751 Proposed Order, 1747 Exhibits, 1753 Proposed Order, 1749 Exhibits, 1752 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Seal, 1748 Exhibits, 1754 Declaration in Support, (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1754 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None
Declaration of Timothy A. DeLange in Support of 1752 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to File Under Seal Material in Connection with its Motion for Further Distribution of the Net Settlement Funds filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (Related document(s) 1752 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1753 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None
Proposed Order re 1752 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to File Under Seal Material in Connection with its Motion for Further Distribution of the Net Settlement Funds by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1752 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to File Under Seal Material in Connection with its Motion for Further Distribution of the Net Settlement Funds filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1751 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None
Proposed Order re 1745 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Further Distribution of the Net Settlement Funds by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1750 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None
EXHIBIT H-6, Part Two through I-2 to 1746 the Affidavit of Richard W. Simmons, filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (Related document(s) 1746 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1749 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None
EXHIBIT H-4 Through Exhibit H-6, Part One to 1746 the Affidavit of Richard W. Simmons, filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (Related document(s) 1746 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1748 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None
EXHIBIT H-3 Part Two to 1746 the Affidavit of Richard W. Simmons, filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (Related document(s) 1746 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1747 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None
EXHIBIT H-3 Part One to 1746 the Affidavit of Richard W. Simmons, filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (Related document(s) 1746 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1746 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Richard W. Simmons in Support of Motion for Second Districtuion of the Net McKesson and Arthur Andersen Settlement Funds and Initial Distribution of the Net Bear Stearns Settlement Fund by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1745 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion for Further Distribution of the Net Settlement Funds filed by Lead Plaintiff New York State Common Retirement Fund. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1744 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: None
Letter dated 10/25/2008 from Richard Thompson requesting that he be included in the class settlement. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008) (Entered: 10/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1743 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Robert S. Green (Green, Robert) (Filed on 8/21/2008) (Entered: 08/21/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1742 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 1741 Motion to Amend the Court's July 24, 2003 Stipulation and Order Governing the Treatment of Confidential Information. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2008) (Entered: 08/21/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1741 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
MOTION to Amend/Correct Unopposed Submission of Proposed Order to Amend the Court's July 24, 2003 Stipulation and Order Governing the Treatment of Confidential Information filed by Charles W. McCall. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Shepard, Michael) (Filed on 7/22/2008) (Entered: 07/22/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1740 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Address by Stephen R. Basser (Basser, Stephen) (Filed on 7/15/2008) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1739 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re 1738 Notice of Entry of Order (Other) (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2008) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1738 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER by New York State Common Retirement Fund re 1737 Order (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2008) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1737 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Approving Initial Distribution of the Net McKesson and Andersen Settlement Funds. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/29/2008. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2008) (Entered: 02/15/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1736 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re 1735 Declaration in Support, 1734 Supplemental Submission (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2008) (Entered: 02/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1735 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
Declaration of M. Richard Komins in Support of 1734 Supplemental Submission filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (Related document(s) 1734 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2008) (Entered: 02/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1734 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
Supplemental Submission in Further Support of 1707 Motion for Initial Distribution filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2008) (Entered: 02/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1733 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None
Letter dated 1/28/2008 from Larry Greco. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2008) (Entered: 01/31/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1732 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None
Letter dated 12/18/2005 from Larry Greco. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2008) (Entered: 01/31/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1731 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: None
Written Submission on behalf of Robert Michael Fearing (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2008) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1730 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/18/2008 before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2008) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1729 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: None
Submission Regarding the Inclusion of Certain Claimants in the Settlement Class by McKesson HBOC, Inc., HBOC & Company (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2008) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1728 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re Proposed Order Approving Initial Distribution of the Net McKesson and Andersen Settlement Funds (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2008) (Entered: 01/25/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1727 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE SETTLEMENT WITH BEAR STEARNS & CO, INC. by Judge Ronald M. Whyte (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2008) (Entered: 01/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1726 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Ronald M. Whyte (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2008) (Entered: 01/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1725 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER APPROVING PLAN OF ALLOCATION OF SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS by Judge Ronald M. Whyte (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2008) (Entered: 01/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1724 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/18/2008 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 1/18/2008) re 1715 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund, 1714 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement with Bear Stearns & Co. Inc. filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund, 1707 MOTION for Initial Distribution of the Net McKesson and Andersen Settlement Funds filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/18/2008) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1723 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: None
Letter from Michael G. Bolgatz. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2008) (srm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/17/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1722 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None
Reply Memorandum re 1707 MOTION for Initial Distribution of the Net McKesson and Andersen Settlement Funds filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2008) (Entered: 01/11/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1721 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: None
EXHIBITS C-5 FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1713 POSTED ON 1/3/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2007) (Entered: 01/10/2008)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1720 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: None
EXHIBITS C-1, C-2, C-3 and C-4 FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1713 POSTED ON 1/3/2008 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2007) (Entered: 01/10/2008)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1719 Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: None
DECLARATION OF SERVICE by Josephine A. Lamprey, Susan W. Jacobs re 1718 Opposition (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2007) (Entered: 01/09/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1718 Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: None
Opposition to 1707 MOTION for Initial Distribution of the Net McKesson and Andersen Settlement Funds filed by Josephine A. Lamprey, Susan W. Jacobs. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2007) (Entered: 01/09/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1717 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re 1716 Declaration in Support, Proposed Order, Proposed Order, 1715 MOTION for Attorney Fees, 1714 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement with Bear Stearns & Co. Inc., Proposed Order (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2008) (Entered: 01/08/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1716 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None
Declaration of David R. Stickney and M. Richards Komins in Support of 1714 Final Approval of Class Action Settlement with Bear Stearns & Co. Inc. filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (Related document(s) 1714 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2008) (Entered: 01/08/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1715 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Motion for an Award of Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses Related to the Settlement with Bear, Stearns & Co. Inc. filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2008 09:00 AM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2008) (Entered: 01/08/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1714 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement with Bear Stearns & Co. Inc. filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2008 09:00 AM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2008) (Entered: 01/08/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1713 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 1705 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2008) (Entered: 01/03/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1712 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re Stipulation and Proposed Order re Rescheduling Hearing on Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2007) (Entered: 12/28/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1711 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re Stipulation & Proposed Order Rescheduling Hearing on Final Approval of Class Action Settlement (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2007) (Entered: 12/20/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1710 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER Rescheduling Hearing on Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. Fairness Hearing set for 1/18/2008 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 12/19/07. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2007) (Entered: 12/19/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1709 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re Proposed Order, Proposed Order, 1708 Affidavit, 1705 MOTION to File Under Seal, 1706 Declaration in Support, 1707 MOTION for Initial Distribution of the Net McKesson and Andersen Settlement Funds (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2007) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1708 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Richard W. Simmons in support of 1707 MOTION for Initial Distribution of the Net McKesson and Andersen Settlement Funds by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2007) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1707 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Initial Distribution of the Net McKesson and Andersen Settlement Funds filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2008 09:00 AM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2007) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1706 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: None
Declaration of Timothy A. DeLange in Support of 1705 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to File Under Seal filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (Related document(s) 1705 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2007) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1705 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: None
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to File Under Seal filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2007) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1704 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re 1703 Notice of Continuance of Fairness Hearing.(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2007) (Entered: 12/13/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1703 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Continuance of Fairness Hearing by New York State Common Retirement Fund re 1702 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2007) (Entered: 12/13/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1702 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: None
CLERK'S NOTICE of Continuance: Fairness Hearing is set for 1/11/08 @ 9:00 AM. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2007) (Entered: 12/10/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1701 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: None
CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2007) (Entered: 12/03/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1700 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: None
ORDER of USCA as to 1450 Notice of Appeal filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc. USCA No. 06-15587 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2007) (Entered: 12/03/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1699 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER preliminarily approving settlement with defendant Bear, Stearns & Co. Stipulation is pages 1 to 5. Order is pages 6 to 15. Both signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/28/2007. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2007) (Entered: 09/28/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1698 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Melissa K. Brown (Brown, Melissa) (Filed on 9/27/2007) (Entered: 09/27/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1697 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None
Declaration, FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1691 FILED ON 9/5/2007. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2007) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1696 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None
Declaration, FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1691 FILED ON 9/5/2007. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2007) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1695 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION, FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1691 FILED ON 9/5/2007. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2007) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1694 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None
Declaration, FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1691 FILED ON 9/5/2007.(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2007) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1693 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION, FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1691 FILED ON 9/5/2007.(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2007) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1692 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION, FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1691 FILED ON 9/5/2007. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2007) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1691 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 1602 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to File Under Seal Material in Connection with its Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Blaine F. Nye and the Declaration of Edward J. Sincavage, Motion to Strike Portions of the Report of Robert W. Berliner, and Daubert Motion to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of J. T. Atkins (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2007) (dhm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/06/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1690 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES: Commencement of trial and all pretrial deadlines from 8/15/2007 and thereafter shall be adjourned for 30 days and the parties shall report to the Court in 14 days regarding the status of this matter. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/20/2007. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2007) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1689 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: None
Letter dated 8/14/2007 from Carole Kanter requesting the removal of attorneys Marhsall B. Growwman and Michael L. Cypers from the service list, and requesting changes be made to the email addresses of Gwyen Donna Quillen and Timothy Scott Vick (note: attorneys are responible for updating their account information). (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2007) (Entered: 08/17/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1688 Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/3/2007 before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2007) (Entered: 08/10/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1687 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None
STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION re 1568 , 1573 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2007) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1686 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: None
Declaration FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1684 (Related document(s) 1573 , 1568 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2007) (Entered: 08/06/2007)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1685 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: None
Reply Memorandum FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1684. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2007) (Entered: 08/06/2007)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1684 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER sealing the reply memorandum in support of Bearn, Stearns & Co.'s motion for summary judgment and the reply declaraton of Kevin P. Clarke. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 8/6/2007. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2007) (Entered: 08/06/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1683 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re 1682 Reply Memorandum (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2007) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1682 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: None
Response to 1687 Bear Stearns & Co. Inc.'s Statement of Recent Decision re 1568 , 1573 MOTIONS for Summary Judgment, filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2007) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1681 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re 1680 Pretrial Conference Statement (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1680 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None
Joint Pretrial Statement filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund and Bear Stearns and Company, Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1679 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
(REDACTED) Reply Memorandum in support of 1675 MOTION to Strike the Declarations of Blaine F. Nye and Edward J. Sincavage filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1678 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
(REDACTED) Opposition to 1607 RENEWED MOTION for Class Certification filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1677 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
(REDACTED) Reply Memorandum in further support of 1674 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of J.T. Atkins filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1676 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
(REDACTED) Reply Memorandum in furhter support of 1673 MOTION to Strike the Declaration of Robert W. Berliner, filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1675 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None
(REDACTED) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION WITH MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Blaine F. Nye and the Declaration of Edward J. Sincavage filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2007 09:00 AM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1674 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None
(REDACTED) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of J.T. Atkins filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2007 09:00 PM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1673 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None
(REDACTED) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION WITH MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT to Strike 1600 Portions of the Report of Robert W. Berliner, filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2007 09:00 AM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1672 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
(REDACTED) MOTION in Limine to Exclude Irrelevant Testimony of J.T. Atkins filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2007 02:00 PM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1671 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
(REDACTED) MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument regarding Dr. Blaine F. Nye's Opinions on Loss Causation and Damages filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2007 02:00 PM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1670 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
(REDACTED) MOTION in Limine to Preclude Any Testimony or Evidence regarding Aggregated Damages to the Entire Putative Class filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2007 02:00 PM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1669 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
(REDACTED) MOTION in Limine to Preclude Any Testimony that is Improper Under Federal Rules of Evidence Rule 702 and Rule 602 filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2007 02:00 PM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1668 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
(REDACTED) MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument regarding the Opinions of Robert W. Berliner filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2007 02:00 PM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1667 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
(REDACTED) MOTION in Limine to Preclude Irrelevant and Prejudical Evidence and Argument filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2007 02:00 PM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1666 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: None
(REDACTED) Reply Memorandum in support of 1568 , 1573 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1665 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
Declaration FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1656 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1664 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
MOTION FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1656. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2007 02:00 PM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1663 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
MOTION FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1656. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2007 02:00 PM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1662 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
Declaration FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1656(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1661 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
MOTION FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1656. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2007 02:00 PM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1660 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
MOTION FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1656. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2007 02:00 PM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1659 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
MOTION FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1656. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2007 02:00 PM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1658 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
Declaration FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1656 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1657 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
MOTION FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1656. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2007 02:00 PM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1656 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting 1627 Bear Stearns & Co. Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1655 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
Opposition FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1650(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1654 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
Reply Memorandum FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1650(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1653 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
Reply Declaration FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1650 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1652 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
Reply Memorandum FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1650(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1651 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
Reply Memorandum FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1650 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1650 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting 1615 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1649 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: None
Reply Declaration FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1647 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1648 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: None
Declaration FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1647(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1647 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER sealing reply declaration in support of Bear Stearns & Co.'s motion for summary judgment and declaration in support of Bear, Stearns & Co.'s motion for summary judgment reply brief. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/31/2007. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1646 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: None
Declaration FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1642(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1645 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: None
Memorandum in Opposition FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1642(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1644 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: None
Memorandum in Opposition FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1642 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1643 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: None
Opposition FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1642 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1642 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting 1608 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1641 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: None
Reply Declaration FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1626 (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1640 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re 1635 MOTION in Limine, 1638 Declaration in Support, Proposed Order, 1637 MOTION in Limine, Proposed Order, Proposed Order, 1636 MOTION in Limine, 1639 Certificate of Service, (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1639 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re 1632 MOTION in Limine, 1634 MOTION in Limine, Proposed Order, 1631 MOTION in Limine, 1633 MOTION in Limine, Proposed Order, Proposed Order, Proposed Order (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1638 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
Declaration of Jeffrey A. Barrack in Support of 1635 , 1632 , 1634 , 1637 , 1631 , 1633 , 1636 Motions in Limine filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (Related document(s) 1635 , 1632 , 1634 , 1637 , 1631 , 1633 , 1636 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1637 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION in Limine No. 7 Regarding the Use of Depositions at Trial filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2007 02:00 PM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1636 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Preclude Evidence at Trial Relating to any Class Member's Holdings of HBO & Co. Stock filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2007 02:00 PM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1635 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Preclude Christopher B. Barry from Offering Accounting and Causation Opinions at Trial filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2007 02:00 PM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1634 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Reference to Settlement Amounts filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2007 02:00 PM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1633 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Preclude Defendant from Introducing Criminal Indictments filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2007 02:00 PM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1632 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Reference to Issues Related to the Lead Plaintifff filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2007 02:00 PM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1631 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Bifurcate for Trial Class-Wide Issues and Individualized Issues filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2007 02:00 PM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2007) (Entered: 08/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1630 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc. re Received Document, Proposed Order, Received Document, Proposed Order, Received Document, Received Document, Received Document, Received Document, Received Document, Proposed Order, 1628 MOTION in Limine, Proposed Order, Received Document, 1627 MOTION to Seal, Received Document, 1629 Declaration in Support, Received Document, Received Document, Proposed Order, Proposed Order, Received Document, Proposed Order, Received Document, Received Document, Received Document, Proposed Order (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2007) (Entered: 08/01/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1629 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
Declaration of Traci M. Keith in Support of 1627 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to File Under Seal Material in Connection with its Motions in Limine filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc.. (Related document(s) 1627 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2007) (Entered: 07/31/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1628 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None Motion in Limine
MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument regarding the Testimony of Edward J. Sincavage filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2007 02:00 PM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2007) (Entered: 07/31/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1627 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to File Under Seal Material in Connection with its Motions in Limine filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2007) (Entered: 07/31/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1626 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte Granting 1611 Bear, Stearns & Co. Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Material in Connection with its Reply Memorandum in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2007) (Entered: 07/30/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1625 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER Rescheduling 1568 , 1573 Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/24/2007. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2007) Modified on 7/25/2007 (cfe, Court Staff).** Modified entry on 7/31/2007 to unterminate motion #1568 and #1573 and link entry to motions ** (dhm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/24/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1624 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re 1623 Reply Memorandum (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2007) (Entered: 07/20/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1623 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: None
Reply Memorandum in support of 1607 RENEWED MOTION for Class Certification filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2007) (Entered: 07/20/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1622 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: None
Letter dated 7/17/2007 from Scott A. Fink. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2007) (Entered: 07/20/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1621 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re 1620 Notice (Other) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2007) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1620 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Submission of Proposed Jury Questionnaire for Mailing to Prospective Jurors by New York State Common Retirement Fund (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2007) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1619 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc. re Received Document, Received Document, 1615 MOTION to Seal, Received Document, 1616 Declaration in Support, Received Document, Received Document, Received Document, Received Document, 1617 Declaration in Opposition, Received Document, 1614 Errata, 1618 Declaration in Support, Proposed Order, Received Document (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2007) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1618 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
Declaration of Traci M. Keith re Reply Memorandum to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Blaine F. Nye and the Declaration of Edward J. Sincavage filed byBear Stearns and Company, Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2007) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1617 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Philip J. Wang in Opposition to 1607 RENEWED MOTION for class Certification filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc. (Related document(s) 1607 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2007) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1616 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
Declaration of Traci M. Keith in Support of 1615 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to File Under Seal filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc.. (Related document(s) 1615 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2007) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1615 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to File Under Seal filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2007) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1614 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ERRATA regarding Reply Memorandum in support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2007) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1613 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc. re Received Document, 1611 MOTION to Seal, Received Document, Received Document, Received Document, Received Document, Received Document, Proposed Order, 1612 Declaration in Support, (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2007) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1612 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: None
Declaration of Philip J. Wang in Support of 1611 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to File Under Seal Materials filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc. (Related document(s) 1611 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2007) Modified text on 7/16/2007 (dhm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/09/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1611 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: None
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to File Under Seal Materials filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2007) Modified text on 7/16/2007 (dhm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/09/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1610 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re Received Document, 1609 Declaration in Support, Received Document, Proposed Order, Received Document, 1608 MOTION to Seal, Received Document, Received Document (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2007) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1609 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: None
Declaration of David R. Stickney in Support of 1608 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Seal Materials filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (Related document(s) 1608 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2007) Modified text on 7/16/2007 (dhm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/09/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1608 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: None
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Seal Materials filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2007) Modified text on 7/16/2007 (dhm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/09/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1607 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None
CORRECTED NOTICE OF RENEWED MOTION for Class Certification filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2007 09:00 AM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2007) (Entered: 07/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1606 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None
Declaration of M. Richard Komins in Support of 1605 NOTICE OF RENEWED MOTION for Class Certification filed by New York City Pension Funds. (Related document(s) 1605 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2007) (Entered: 06/29/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1605 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF RENEWED MOTION for Class Certification filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2007 09:00 AM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2007) (Entered: 06/29/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1604 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc. re Received Document, 1603 Declaration in Support, Received Document, Received Document, Received Document, Received Document, Received Document, 1602 MOTION to Seal, Proposed Order, Received Document, Received Document, Received Document, Proposed Order, Proposed Order, Received Document, (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2007) (Entered: 06/25/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1603 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None
Declaration of Traci M. Keith in Support of 1602 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to File Under Seal Material in Connection with its Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Blaine F. Nye and the Declaration of Edward J. Sincavage, Motion to Strike Portions of the Report of Robert W. Berliner, and Daubert Motion to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of J. T. Atkins filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc. (Related document(s) 1602 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2007) (Entered: 06/25/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1602 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to File Under Seal Material in Connection with its Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dr. Blaine F. Nye and the Declaration of Edward J. Sincavage, Motion to Strike Portions of the Report of Robert W. Berliner, and Daubert Motion to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of J. T. Atkins filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2007) (Entered: 06/25/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1601 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None
Declaration of John Trevor Atkins in Support of 1591 (Redacted) Memorandum in Opposition to 1573 Bear Stearns' Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1595 FILED ON 6/19/2007(Related document(s) 1591 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2007) (Entered: 06/19/2007)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1600 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None
Declaration of Robert W. Berliner in Support of 1591 (Redacted) Memorandum in Opposition to 1573 Bear Stearns' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1595 FILED ON 6/19/2007 (Related document(s) 1591 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2007) (Entered: 06/19/2007)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1599 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: None
Declaration of David R. Stickney (Volume 4 of 4) in Support of 1591 (Redacted) Memorandum in Opposition to 1573 Bear Stearns' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1595 FILED ON 6/19/2007 (Related document(s) 1591 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2007) (Entered: 06/19/2007)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1598 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None
Declaration of David R. Stickney (Volume 3 of 4) in Support of 1591 (Redacted) Memorandum in Opposition to 1573 Bear Stearns' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1595 FILED ON 6/19/2007 (Related document(s) 1591 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2007) (Entered: 06/19/2007)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1597 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None
Declaration of David R. Stickney (Volume 2 of 4) in Support of 1591 (Redacted) Memorandum in Opposition to 1573 Bear Stearns' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1595 FILED ON 6/19/2007 (Related document(s) 1591 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2007) (Entered: 06/19/2007)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1596 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None
Declaration of David R. Stickney (Volume 1 of 4) in Support of 1591 (Redacted) Memorandum in Opposition to 1573 Bear Stearns' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1595 FILED ON 6/19/2007 (Related document(s) 1591 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2007) (Entered: 06/19/2007)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1595 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting 1592 Lead Plaintiff's Motion to File Under Seal Materials in Connection With its Memorandum in Opposition to Bear Stearns'Motion for Summary Judgment. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2007) (Entered: 06/19/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1594 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None
Declaration of Blaine F. Nye, PhD in re 1592 filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2007) Modified on 6/18/2007 to link entry to document #1592 (dhm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/12/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1593 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None
Declaration of David R. Stickney in Support of 1592 Lead Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials in Connection with its Memorandum in Opposition to Bear Streans' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2007) Modified on 6/18/2007 to link entry to document #1592 (dhm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/12/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1592 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None
Administrative Motion of Lead Plaintiff, The New York State Commom Retirement Fund, to File Under Seal Materials in Connection With its Memorandum in Opposition to Bear Stearns'Motion for Summary Judgment filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2007 09:00 AM. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2007) (Entered: 06/12/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1591 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None
(Redacted) Memorandum in Opposition to 1573 Bear Stearns' Motion for Summary Judgment by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2007) Modified text on 6/19/2007 and linked entry to document #1573 (dhm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/11/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1590 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting 1589 Application of J. Christian Word to appear Pro Hac Vice (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2007) (Entered: 06/09/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1589 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: None
APPLICATION of J. Christian Word for leave to appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 54611001101) filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2007) (Entered: 06/09/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1588 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Firm Name filed by Arthur Andersen LLP (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2007) (Entered: 05/11/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1587 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER re 974 Amending the Court's 7/24/2003 Stipulation and Order Governing the Treatment of Confidential Information. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/4/2007. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2007) (Entered: 05/08/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1586 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: None
Declaration of Christopher B. Barry with Corrected Exhibits in Support of 1573 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc.. FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1583(Related document(s) 1573 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2007) (Entered: 05/07/2007)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1585 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE by McKesson HBOC Group re Amended Service List (Keenan, Richard) (Filed on 5/7/2007) (Entered: 05/07/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1584 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: None
Declaration of Jonathan M. Hoff with Corrected Exhibits (Volume 2 of 2) in Support of 1573 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc.. FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER # 1583 (Related document(s) 1573 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2007) (Entered: 05/03/2007)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1583 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
SEALING ORDER. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/3/07. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2007) (Entered: 05/03/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1582 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: None
Declaration of Jonathan M. Hoff with Corrected Exhibits (Volume 1 of 2) in Support of 1573 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc. FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1583 (Related document(s) 1573 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2007) (Entered: 05/03/2007)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1581 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/13/2007 before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2007) (Entered: 05/03/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1580 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc. re 1579 Errata, Received Document, Received Document (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2007) (Entered: 05/03/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1579 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ERRATA re material submitted in support of 1568 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2007) (Entered: 05/03/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1578 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: None
Declaration of Kevin P. Clarke in Support of 1573 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byBear Stearns and Company, Inc.. FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1572 FILED ON 5/2/2007. (Related document(s) 1573 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2007) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1577 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: None
Declaration of Jonathan M. Hoff (Volume 2 of 2) in Support of 1573 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc.. FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1572 FILED ON 5/2/2007. (Related document(s) 1573 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2007) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1576 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: None
Declaration of Jonathan M. Hoff (Volume 1 of 2) in Support of 1573 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byBear Stearns and Company, Inc.. FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1572 FILED ON 5/2/2007. (Related document(s) 1573 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2007) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1575 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: None
Declaration of Christopher B. Barry in Support of 1573 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byBear Stearns and Company, Inc.. FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1572 FILED ON 5/2/2007. (Related document(s) 1573 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2007) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1574 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: None
Declaration of Lars M. Hanan in Support of 1573 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byBear Stearns and Company, Inc.. FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1572, FILED ON 5/2/2007. (Related document(s) 1573 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2007) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1573 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2007 09:00 AM. FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #1572 FILED ON 5/2/2007.(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2007)Motion was terminated in error on 7/24/2007. Modified entry on 7/31/2007 to unterminate motion(dhm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/02/2007)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1572 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting 1566 Bear, Stearns & Co. Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials in Connection with Motion for Summary Judgment. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2007) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1571 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting lodged Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, granting lodged Motion to change hearing date. Motions will be heard on 7/27/2007. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2007) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1570 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None
Amended Notice of Hearing on 1568 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byBear Stearns and Company, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2007 09:00 AM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2007) (Entered: 04/27/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1569 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc. re Received Document, 1566 MOTION to Seal, Received Document, Received Document, Received Document, Proposed Order, 1568 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 1567 Declaration in Support,, Proposed Order, Received Document, Received Document (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2007) (Entered: 04/26/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1568 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION WITH MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF for Summary Judgment filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2007 09:00 AM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2007) (REDACTED VERSION)Motion was terminated on 7/24/2007 in error. Modified entry on 7/31/2007 to unterminate motion (dhm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/26/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1567 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: None
Declaration of John D. Minton in Support of 1566 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to File Under Seal Materials in Connection with its Motion for Summary Judgment Seal filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc.. (Related document(s) 1566 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2007) (Entered: 04/26/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1566 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: None
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to File Under Seal Materials in Connection with its Motion for Summary Judgment Seal filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2007) (Entered: 04/26/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1565 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None
STATEMENT IN RESPONSE to 1551 Letter by McKesson HBOC, Inc. and HBO & Company. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2007) (Entered: 04/23/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1564 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re 1563 Notice (Other) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2007) (Entered: 04/18/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1563 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re 1562 Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2007) (Entered: 04/18/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1562 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/13/2007. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2007) (dhm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/18/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1561 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/13/2007 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 4/13/2007) 1555 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund, 1554 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement with Arthur Andersen LLP filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (jg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/13/2007) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1560 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses in Connection with the Settlement with Arthur Andersen, LLP signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on April 13, 2007. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2007) (Entered: 04/13/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1559 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Approving Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/13/2007. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2007) (Entered: 04/13/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1558 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None
Joint Motion for Administrative Relief to Exceed Page Limitations, to Modify Briefing Schedule and to Change Hearing Date; Stipulation and (Proposed) Order filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc.. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2007) (Entered: 04/13/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1557 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re Proposed Order, Proposed Order, 1555 MOTION for Attorney Fees, Proposed Order, 1556 Declaration in Support,, 1554 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement with Arthur Andersen LLP (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2007) (Entered: 04/11/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1556 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: None
Joint Declaration of David R. Stickney and M. Richard Komins in Support of 1554 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement with Arthur Andersen LLP, and 1555 MOTION for Attorney Fees, filed byNew York State Common Retirement Fund. (Related document(s) 1555 , 1554 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2007) (Entered: 04/09/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1555 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION WITH MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT for an Award of Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses Related to the Settlement with Arthur Andersen LLP, filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. Motion Hearing set for 4/13/2007 09:00 AM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2007) (Entered: 04/06/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1554 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION WITH MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement with Arthur Andersen LLP filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. Motion Hearing set for 4/13/2007 09:00 AM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2007) (Entered: 04/06/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1553 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re 1552 Affidavit (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2007) (Entered: 04/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1552 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Steven D. Mueller re: A) Mailing of Andersen Settlement Notice and Claim Form; and B) Report on Exclusion Requests Received by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2007) (Entered: 04/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1551 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: None
Letter dated 3/26/2007 from Carlton Carden regarding continued objection to exclusion from Class-Claim 104412MK280. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2007) (Entered: 04/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1550 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Faruqi & Faruqi LLP. (letter does not specify the plaintiff Faruqi & Faruqi LLP represent, counsel is not listed on docket sheet)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2007) (Entered: 03/21/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1549 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None
Letter dated 2/26/2007 from Ralph D. Legg regarding proof of claim. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2007) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1548 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: None
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/26/2007 before Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 1/30/2007) re 1538 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. The Court granted the motion. The Court executed the order in open court. Hearing on final approval of settlement set for 4/13/2007 09:00 AM before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/30/2007) (Entered: 01/30/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1547 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte re 1538 Preliminarily Approving Settlement with Arthur Andersen LLP and Providing for Notice. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2007) (Entered: 01/26/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1546 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re Proposed Order,, Proposed Order (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2007) (Entered: 01/25/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1545 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change In Counsel by David J. Romanski to Amend Service List (Romanski, David) (Filed on 1/18/2007) (Entered: 01/18/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1544 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re 1543 Reply Memorandum (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2007) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1543 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: None
Reply Memorandum in Further Support of 1538 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2007) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1542 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Firm Name by Arthur Andersen (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2007) (Entered: 01/12/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1541 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: None
Memorandum in Objection to 1538 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2007) (Entered: 01/08/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1540 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re 1538 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, 1539 Stipulation, Proposed Order (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2006) (Entered: 12/21/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1539 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: None
STIPULATION and AGREEMENT of Settlement Between Lead Plaintiff and Defendant Arthur Andersen LLP by Lead Plaintiff New York State Common Retirement Fund. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2006) (Entered: 12/21/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1538 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION WITH MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2007 09:00 AM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2006) (Entered: 12/21/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1537 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re 1536 Notice of Change In Counsel (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2006) (Entered: 11/20/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1536 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance for New York State Common Retirement Fund (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2006) (Entered: 11/20/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1535 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER Dispositive Motions due by 4/25/2007. Motions in limine and Joint Pretrial Statment due by 7/30/2007. Jury Trial set for 9/10/2007 01:30 PM. Dispositive Motions Hearing set for 7/19/2007 09:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 8/30/2007 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/13/2006. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2006) (Entered: 11/20/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1534 Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re 1533 Letter, Proposed Order (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2006) (Entered: 11/02/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1533 Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: None
Letter dated 11/2/2006 from M. Richard Komins regarding Stipulation and Proposed Case Management Order No. 5. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2006) (Entered: 11/02/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1532 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: None
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to William F.Alderman at Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe. Mail returned as not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2006) (Entered: 08/28/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1531 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: None
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Jeffrey L. Bleich. Postal stamp indicates "Forwarding Order Expired". (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2006) (Entered: 08/22/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1530 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE by Charles W. McCall of entry of 1529 Order on Motion to Allow Defendants mcCall, Lapine, Pulido, and Any Other Similarly Situated Parties to Participate in Depositions. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2006) (Entered: 08/16/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1529 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting 1513 Motion to Prohibit Arthur Andersen from Barring McCall from Depositions. Defendants McCall, Lapine and Pulido, and any other similarly situated parties, may participate in all depositions in this case. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2006) (Entered: 08/14/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1528 Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: None
CLERK'S NOTICE re: Document #1524 E-Filed by defendant Arthur Andersen LLP in a case not designated for ECF. Clerk's Notice mailed to parties of record. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2006) (Entered: 08/10/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1527 Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jay M. Lapine re Proposed Order, 1525 Joinder, 1526 Declaration in Support (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2006) (Entered: 08/10/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1526 Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: None
Declaration of Marcus S. Topel in Support of 1525 Joinder in 1513 MOTION to Prohibit Arthur Andersen from Barring McCall from Depositions filed byJay M. Lapine. (Related document(s) 1525 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2006) (Entered: 08/10/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1525 Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: None
Joinder in 1513 MOTION to Prohibit Arthur Andersen from Barring McCall from Depositions by Jay M. Lapine. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2006) (Entered: 08/10/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1524 Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: None
Memorandum in Opposition MPAs in Opposition to Motion of Charles McCall to Prohibit Arthur Andersen from Barring McCall from Depositions filed byArthur Andersen. (Vick, Scott) (Filed on 8/10/2006) (Entered: 08/10/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1523 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark A. Pulido re 1522 Declaration in Support, 1521 Joinder (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2006) (Entered: 08/10/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1522 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: None
Declaration of Sima Saran Ahuja in Support of 1521 Joinder in 1513 MOTION to Prohibit Arthur Andersen from Barring McCall from Depositions filed byMark A. Pulido. (Related document(s) 1521 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2006) (Entered: 08/10/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1521 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: None
Joinder in 1513 MOTION to Prohibit Arthur Andersen from Barring McCall from Depositions by Mark A. Pulido. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2006) (Entered: 08/10/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1520 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE by Charles W. McCall of entry of 1519 Order on Motion to Shorten Time. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2006) (Entered: 08/10/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1519 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting 1514 Motion to shorten time for a motion to prohibit defendant Arthur Andersen from barring McCall from depositions. Opposition to motion shall be filed by 8/10/2006. The Court will rule on the papers without oral argument. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2006) (Entered: 08/10/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1518 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of Complaint in Consolidated Action C01-20713 RMW by Theodore H. Pacha, Barry C. Fitzpatrick, Ashfield & Co. Inc., Gary Rappaport, Richard Hall, Andrew Young, Morris Landzberg, Philip N. Kane, John Norman, Gustav Suess, Minna Suess, Henri Jacob, Debra Rappaport, City of Birmingham Retirement Fund, Charlie Hyatt, Jesse Paul, Jesus Garcia, Gary Wojkiewicz, Melissa Rappaport, Jerry Burger, Merrily Burger, Donald Schverak, William Morgan, Richard Rappaport (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2006) (Entered: 08/10/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1517 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Charles W. McCall re 1515 Declaration in Support,, 1516 Declaration in Support,, Proposed Order, 1513 MOTION to Prohibit Arthur Andersen from Barring McCall from Depositions, Proposed Order, 1514 MOTION to Shorten Time (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2006) (Entered: 08/10/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1516 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None
Declaration of Michael A. Zwibelman in Support of 1513 MOTION to Prohibit Arthur Andersen from Barring McCall from Depositions, 1514 MOTION to Shorten Time filed byCharles W. McCall. (Related document(s) 1513 , 1514 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2006) (Entered: 08/10/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1515 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None
Declaration of Anne S. Raish in Support of 1513 MOTION to Prohibit Arthur Andersen from Barring McCall from Depositions, 1514 MOTION to Shorten Time filed byCharles W. McCall. (Related document(s) 1513 , 1514 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2006) (Entered: 08/10/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1514 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None
MOTION to Shorten Time re 1513 Motion to Prohibit Arthur Andersen from Barring McCall from Depositions filed by Charles W. McCall. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2006) (Entered: 08/10/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1513 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION WITH MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES to Prohibit Arthur Andersen from Barring McCall from Depositions filed by Charles W. McCall. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2006) (Entered: 08/10/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1512 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte re 1508 Amending the Court's December 29, 2003 Stipulation and Order Governing the Treatment of Confidential Information. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/12/2007 (dhm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/31/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1511 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/25/2005 before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2006) (Entered: 07/06/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1510 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Amending the Court's July 24, 2003 Stipulation and Order Governing the Treatment of Confidential Information. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/29/2006. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2006) (Entered: 06/29/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1509 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc., Arthur Andersen re Proposed Order (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2006) (Entered: 06/28/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1508 Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: None
UNOPPOSED MOTION to Amend the Court's December 29, 2003 Stipulation and Order governing the treatment of confidential information filed by Charles W. McCall. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2006) (Entered: 06/28/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1507 Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: None
UNOPPOSED SUBMISSION of proposed order to amend the Court's July 24, 2003 Stipulation and Order governing the treatment of confidential information by Charles W. McCall (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2006) (Entered: 06/28/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1506 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Whyte on 6/28/06. (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2006) (Entered: 06/28/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1505 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re Proposed Order, 1504 Statement of Facts (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2006) (Entered: 06/27/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1504 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None
Statement submitting Proposed Case Management Order No. 4 filed byNew York State Common Retirement Fund. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2006) (Entered: 06/26/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1503 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc. re 1494 Memorandum in Support (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2006) (Entered: 06/19/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1502 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re 1499 Case Management Statement (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2006) (Entered: 06/16/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1501 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 6/16/2006 before Judge Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 6/16/2006). Fact Discovery cutoff 8/18/2006. Last Day for Dispositive Motions 7/19/2007. Pretrial Conference set for 8/30/2007 02:00 PM. Trial set for 9/10/2007 01:30 PM.; Parties are to send in trial schedule by 6/23/2006. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/16/2006) (Entered: 06/16/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1500 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: None
JOINT SUPPLEMENTAL CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc., Arthur Andersen LLP. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2006) (Entered: 06/16/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1499 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: None
FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2006) (Entered: 06/16/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1498 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re 1497 Notice (Other) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2006) (Entered: 06/16/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1497 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of Time Change for Case Management Conference by New York State Common Retirement Fund (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2006) (Entered: 06/16/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1496 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: None
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Submission of Indictments Requested by Court filed by Arthur Andersen. (Vick, Scott) (Filed on 6/14/2006) (Entered: 06/14/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1495 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 5/19/2006 before Judge Ronald M. Whyte (Date Filed: 6/9/2006). Counsel advised the Court that Hawkins has been acquitted and McCall, Lapine are set for trial on 9/11/2006. Four individuals have plead guilty, but may assert the 5th. The parties are to brief the Court on the issue of when a defendant can no longer assert the 5th pending appeal. Parties are to provide the Court with copies of the indictments and plea agreements of the four individuals. Revised Case Management Statement due by 6/14/2006. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/16/2006 10:30 AM. (Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/9/2006) (Entered: 06/13/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1494 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM of Law in Further Support of Motion Requesting that the Court Refrain from Entering a Case Management Order During the Pendency of Bear Stearns' Appeal filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc.. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2006) (Entered: 06/12/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1493 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re 1492 Case Management Statement (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2006) (Entered: 06/09/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1492 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT OF lead plaintiff filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2006) (Entered: 06/09/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1491 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re 1490 Memorandum in Opposition (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2006) (Entered: 06/06/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1490 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: None
Opposition to 1481 MOTION that the Court Refrain from Entereing a Case Management Order During the Pendency of Bear Stearns' Appeal filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2006) (Entered: 06/06/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1489 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re 1488 Notice of Change of Address (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2006) (Entered: 06/06/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1488 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Address of Wallace A. Showman, filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2006) (Entered: 06/06/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1487 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/19/2006 before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2006) (Entered: 06/02/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1486 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/24/2006 before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2006) (Entered: 06/02/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1485 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: None
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (SUPPLEMENTAL) filed by Arthur Andersen. (Vick, Scott) (Filed on 6/2/2006) (Entered: 06/02/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1484 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE motion requesting that the court refrain from entering a case management order during the pendency of bear Stearn's Appeal with exhibits (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2006) (Entered: 05/25/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1483 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: None
CLERK'S NOTICE re: Documents E-Filed in a case not designated for ECF (Documents 1461 through 1475, electronically filed on 5/17/2006 by attorney Scott Vick for defendant Arthur Andersen, LLP) notice mailed to counsel (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2006) (dhm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/19/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1482 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: None
Declaration of Jonathan M. Hoff in Support of 1481 MOTION that the Court Refrain from Entereing a Case Management Order During the Pendency of Bear Stearns' Appeal filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (Related document(s) 1481 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2006) (Entered: 05/19/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1481 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: None
MOTION that the Court Refrain from Entereing a Case Management Order During the Pendency of Bear Stearns' Appeal filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2006) (Entered: 05/19/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1480 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re 1479 Notice of Hearing Case Management Conference (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2006) (Entered: 05/19/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1479 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of Setting Case Management Conference for 5/19/2006 at 10:30 AM filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2006) (Entered: 05/19/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1478 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs in the Pacha Action (C01-20713 RMW) Pursuant to Rule 41(a) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2006) (Entered: 05/18/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1477 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc., New York City Pension Funds re 1476 Status Report (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2006) (Entered: 05/18/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1476 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT by New York State Common Retirement Fund, Bear Stearns and Company, Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2006) (Entered: 05/18/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1475 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: None
EXHIBITS re 1461 Case Management Statement EXHIBIT P filed byArthur Andersen. (Related document(s) 1461 ) (Vick, Scott) (Filed on 5/17/2006) (Entered: 05/17/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1474 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: None
EXHIBITS re 1461 Case Management Statement EXHIBIT O filed byArthur Andersen. (Related document(s) 1461 ) (Vick, Scott) (Filed on 5/17/2006) (Entered: 05/17/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1473 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: None
EXHIBITS re 1461 Case Management Statement EXHIBIT N filed byArthur Andersen. (Related document(s) 1461 ) (Vick, Scott) (Filed on 5/17/2006) (Entered: 05/17/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1472 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: None
EXHIBITS re 1461 Case Management Statement EXHIBIT M filed byArthur Andersen. (Related document(s) 1461 ) (Vick, Scott) (Filed on 5/17/2006) (Entered: 05/17/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1471 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: None
EXHIBITS re 1461 Case Management Statement EXHIBIT L filed byArthur Andersen. (Related document(s) 1461 ) (Vick, Scott) (Filed on 5/17/2006) (Entered: 05/17/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1470 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: None
EXHIBITS re 1461 Case Management Statement EXHIBIT K filed byArthur Andersen. (Related document(s) 1461 ) (Vick, Scott) (Filed on 5/17/2006) (Entered: 05/17/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1469 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: None
EXHIBITS re 1461 Case Management Statement EXHIBITS H-I filed byArthur Andersen. (Related document(s) 1461 ) (Vick, Scott) (Filed on 5/17/2006) (Entered: 05/17/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1468 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: None
EXHIBITS re 1461 Case Management Statement EXHIBIT G filed byArthur Andersen. (Related document(s) 1461 ) (Vick, Scott) (Filed on 5/17/2006) (Entered: 05/17/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1467 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: None
EXHIBITS re 1461 Case Management Statement EXHIBIT F filed byArthur Andersen. (Related document(s) 1461 ) (Vick, Scott) (Filed on 5/17/2006) (Entered: 05/17/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1466 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: None
EXHIBITS re 1461 Case Management Statement EXHIBIT E filed byArthur Andersen. (Related document(s) 1461 ) (Vick, Scott) (Filed on 5/17/2006) (Entered: 05/17/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1465 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: None
EXHIBITS re 1461 Case Management Statement EXHIBIT D filed byArthur Andersen. (Related document(s) 1461 ) (Vick, Scott) (Filed on 5/17/2006) (Entered: 05/17/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1464 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: None
EXHIBITS re 1461 Case Management Statement EXHIBIT C filed byArthur Andersen. (Related document(s) 1461 ) (Vick, Scott) (Filed on 5/17/2006) (Entered: 05/17/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1463 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: None
EXHIBITS re 1461 Case Management Statement EXHIBIT B filed byArthur Andersen. (Related document(s) 1461 ) (Vick, Scott) (Filed on 5/17/2006) (Entered: 05/17/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1462 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: None
EXHIBITS re 1461 Case Management Statement EXHIBIT A filed byArthur Andersen. (Related document(s) 1461 ) (Vick, Scott) (Filed on 5/17/2006) (Entered: 05/17/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1461 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: None
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ; DECLARATION OF SCOTT VICK filed by Arthur Andersen. (Vick, Scott) (Filed on 5/17/2006) (Entered: 05/17/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1460 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: None
CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2006 10:30 AM. Parties are to file a Status Report by 5/16/2006. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2006) (Entered: 05/11/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1459 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER RELATING CASE C06-2035 with C99-20743 RMW.. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/14/2006. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2006) (Entered: 05/02/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1458 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc. re 1457 Transcript Designation, (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2006) (Entered: 04/24/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1457 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc., for proceedings held on 3/25/2005, C/R: Lee-Anne Shortridge, 5/20/2005, C/R: Lee-Anne Shortridge, @/24/2006, C/R: Lee-Anne Shortridge before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2006) (Entered: 04/24/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1456 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: None
Response to 1451 MOTION to Reassign Case, Administrative Motion to Deem Case No. 06-02035 Related to Other McKesson Cases and Have it Reassigned to Hon. Ronald M. Whyte filed by McKesson HBOC, Inc., HBOC & Company. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2006) (Entered: 04/10/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1455 Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Richard A. Cohen. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/31/2006. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2006) (Entered: 04/07/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1454 Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER, The Cohen Action, C99-20916 RMW, shall be dismissed with prejudice as to plaintiff Richard A. Cohen only. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/31/2006. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2006) (Entered: 04/07/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1453 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: None
**DUPLICATE ENTRY**ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Related Case C06-2035 filed by Arthur Andersen. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2006) Modified text on 4/10/2006 (dhm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/05/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1452 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: None
Proposed Order re 1451 MOTION to Reassign Case Administrative Motion to Deem Case No. 06-02035 Related to Other McKesson Cases and Have it Reassigned to Hon. Ronald M. Whyte by Arthur Andersen. (Vick, Scott) (Filed on 3/31/2006) (Entered: 03/31/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1451 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: None
MOTION to Reassign Case Administrative Motion to Deem Case No. 06-02035 Related to Other McKesson Cases and Have it Reassigned to Hon. Ronald M. Whyte filed by Arthur Andersen. (Vick, Scott) (Filed on 3/31/2006) (Entered: 03/31/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1450 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 1442 ORDER APPROVING PLAN OF ALLOCATION, 1443 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL Filing fee $ 255, receipt number 5514228, filed by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2006) (Entered: 03/23/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1449 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: None
Letter dated 3/10/2006 from M. Richard Komins and David Stickney in response to the 3/8/2006 letter to the Court from Mr. Scott Vick, counsel for Arthur Andersen LLP. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2006) (Entered: 03/16/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1448 Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
Letter from Scott Vick dated 3-13-06 to Judge Whyte. (Vick, Scott) (Filed on 3/13/2006) (Entered: 03/13/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1447 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: None
Letter dated March 3, 2006 from M. Richard Komins requesting that the court set a case management conference to reset the trial date and vacated pretrial deadlines. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2006) (Entered: 03/10/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1446 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
Letter from Scott Vick dd. March 8, 2006 to Judge Whyte. (Vick, Scott) (Filed on 3/8/2006) (Entered: 03/08/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1445 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None
Letter dated 2/19/2006 from Steven J. Toups requesting that he be included in the Settlement Class. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2006) (Entered: 03/02/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1444 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEY'S FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES by Judge Ronald M. Whyte (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2006) (Entered: 02/24/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1443 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 2/24/2006. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2006) (Entered: 02/24/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1442 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER APPROVING PLAN OF ALLOCATION by Judge Ronald M. Whyte (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2006) (Entered: 02/24/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1441 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Whyte overruling objections to final settlement & approving settlement (Signed on 2/24/2006) (rmwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2006) (Entered: 02/24/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1440 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re 1439 Stipulation (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2006) (Entered: 02/23/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1439 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: None
AMENDMENT TO STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT OF SETTLEMENT BETWEEN LEAD PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS MCKESSON HBOC, INC. AND HBO & CO., filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund, McKesson HBOC, Inc., HBOC & Company. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2006) (Entered: 02/23/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1438 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: None
Letter dated 2/22/2006 from David Stickney and M. Richard Komins regarding Amendment To Stipulation And Agreement Of Settlement Between Lead Plaintiff And Defendants McKesson HBOC, Inc. and HBO & Co. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2006) (Entered: 02/23/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1437 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: None
CLERK'S NOTICE re: Documents E-Filed in a case not designated for ECF. (regarding document #1434 and 1435 posted by counsel for defendant Jay P. Gilbertson) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2006) (dhm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/23/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1436 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal in Consolidated Bea Action C00-20072 RMW Pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Carlos Bea, Sebastian Bea, Albert R. Rubey (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2006) (Entered: 02/22/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1435 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Grace A. Carter (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 2/10/2006) (Entered: 02/10/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1434 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Grace A. Carter (Carter, Grace) (Filed on 2/10/2006) (Entered: 02/10/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1433 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Charles M. Jacobs, Josephine A. Lamprey, Henry F. Nelson, Randolph W. Seed, Susan W. Jacobs, Alan D. Mello re 1432 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2006) (Entered: 02/02/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1432 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a) of Case No. C99-21192 RMW by Charles M. Jacobs, Josephine A. Lamprey, Henry F. Nelson, Randolph W. Seed, Susan W. Jacobs, Alan D. Mello (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2006) (Entered: 02/02/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1431 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Civil Case No. C01-20301 RMW Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a) by Kathryn J. Hess, E. Austin Hess, Richard A. Hess, Barbara H. Brubaker, Susan L. Keith (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2006) (Entered: 02/01/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1430 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re 1429 Notice (Other) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2006) (Entered: 01/25/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1429 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund of 1428 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2006) (Entered: 01/25/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1428 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: None
CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing on Lead Plaintiff's Motion or Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Plan of Allocation. Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2006 09:00 AM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2006) (Entered: 01/20/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1427 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McKesson HBOC, Inc., HBOC & Company re 1426 Response ( Non Motion ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2006) (Entered: 01/19/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1426 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: None
RESPONSE to 1411 Objections of Bear, Stearns & Co. to the Final Approval of Class ACtion Settlement by McKesson HBOC, Inc., HBOC & Company. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2006) (Entered: 01/19/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1425 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McKesson HBOC, Inc., HBOC & Company re 1423 Declaration in Support, 1424 Declaration in Support, 1422 Memorandum in Support (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2006) (Entered: 01/18/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1424 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: None
Declaration of Kristina Veaco in Support of 1422 Final Approval of Stipulation of Settlement and Opposition to Objections filed by McKesson HBOC, Inc., HBOC & Company. (Related document(s) 1422 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2006) (Entered: 01/18/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1423 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: None
Declaration of Thomas V. Christopher in Support of 1422 Final Approval of Stipulation of Settlement and Opposition to Objections filed by McKesson HBOC, Inc., HBOC & Company. (Related document(s) 1422 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2006) (Entered: 01/18/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1422 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES in Support of 1418 Final Approval of Class Action Settllement and OPPOSITION to 1411 Objections filed by McKesson HBOC, Inc., HBOC & Company. (Related document(s) 1418 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2006) (Entered: 01/18/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1421 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: None
Joint Declaration of David R. Stickney and M. Richard Komins in Support of 1418 MOTION Final Approval of Class Action Settllement and Plan of Allocations, and 1419 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (Related document(s) 1418 , 1419 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2006) (Entered: 01/18/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1420 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re Proposed Order, 1418 MOTION Final Approval of Class Action Settllement and Plan of Allocations, Proposed Order, 1419 MOTION for Attorney Fees, and 1421 Joint Declarations (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2006) Modified text on 1/18/2006 (dhm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/18/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1419 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES in Support of Application for an Award of Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Lead Plaintiff New York State Common Retirement Fund. Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2006 09:00 AM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2006) (Entered: 01/18/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1418 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW in support of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Plan of Allocations filed by Lead Plaintiff New York State Common Retirement Fund. Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2006 09:00 AM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2006) Modified text on 1/20/2006 (dhm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/18/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1417 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Baker Family Limited Partnership I, Mary P. Baker, Rusty Baker Family Limited Partnership, Diana Baker, Walter Pearson, Rex Ponthie, James R. Baker, Jr. As Trustee of the James R. Baker, Sr. & Mary Parker Baker Trust for the Benefit of the Baker Granchildren, James R. Baker, Jr. As Trustee of the Baker Family Trust for the Benefit of Diana Baker White and Sharon Baker Petrovsky, James R. Baker, Jr re 972 Second Amended Complaint, (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2006) (Entered: 01/06/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1416 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
Letter dated 12/28/2005 from Judge Ronald M. Whyte to Mr. Carlton Carden regarding Objection to Notice of Pendency and Proposed Settlement of Class Action Against McKesson HBOC and HBOC and HBO & Company/Definitions Used in This Notice (p.9) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2006) (Entered: 01/05/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1415 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: None
Letter dated 12/20/2005 from J. David Roberts regarding his Mckesson stock options. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2005) (Entered: 12/28/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1414 Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: None
Letter dated 12/18/2005 from Larry Greco regarding his Proof of Claim. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2005) (Entered: 12/28/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1413 Filed: 12/27/2005, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc. re 1411 Objection, 1412 Declaration in Support (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2005) (Entered: 12/28/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1412 Filed: 12/23/2005, Entered: None
Declaration of Jonathan M. Hoff in Support of 1411 Objections to Final Approval of Class Settlement filed byBear Stearns and Company, Inc. (Related document(s) 1411 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2005) (Entered: 12/27/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1411 Filed: 12/23/2005, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES in support of OBJECTIONS to Final Approval of Class Action Settlement by Bear Stearns and Company, Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2005) (Entered: 12/27/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1410 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte denying 1401 lead Plaintiff New York State Common Retirement Funds Motion to Change Time for Hearing. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2005) (Entered: 12/27/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1409 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
Declaration of Jonathan M. Hoff in Support of 1408 Opposition, filed byBear Stearns and Company, Inc.. (Related document(s) 1408 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2005) (Entered: 12/19/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1408 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
Opposition re 1404 MOTION for order prohibiting Bear Stearns & Co. Inc. from seeking injunctive relief in New York State Court to prevent consummation of the settlement filed byBear Stearns and Company, Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2005) (Entered: 12/19/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1407 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
Joinder in 1404 plaintiffs' MOTION for order prohibiting Bear Stearns & Co. Inc. from seeking injunctive relief in New York State Court to prevent consummation of the settlement by McKesson HBOC, Inc., HBOC & Company(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2005) (Entered: 12/19/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1406 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re 1404 MOTION for order prohibiting Bear Stearns & Co. Inc. from seeking injunctive relief in New York State Court to prevent consummation of the settlement, 1405 Declaration in Support,, Proposed Order, (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2005) (Entered: 12/19/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1405 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
Declaration of David R. Stickney in Support of 1404 MOTION for order prohibiting Bear Stearns & Co. Inc. from seeking injunctive relief in New York State Court to prevent consummation of the settlement filed byNew York State Common Retirement Fund. (Related document(s) 1404 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2005) (Entered: 12/19/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1404 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
MOTION for order prohibiting Bear Stearns & Co. Inc. from seeking injunctive relief in New York State Court to prevent consummation of the settlement filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2006 09:00 AM. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2005). (Entered: 12/19/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1403 Filed: 12/13/2005, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re 1401 MOTION to change time for hearing on lead plaintiff's motion, 1402 Declaration in Support,, Proposed Order (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2005) (Entered: 12/13/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1402 Filed: 12/13/2005, Entered: None
Declaration of Timothy A. Delange in Support of 1401 MOTION to change time for hearing on lead plaintiff's motion for order prohibiting Bear Stearns & Co. Inc. from seeking injunctive relief in New York State Court to prevent consummation of the settlement filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (Related document(s) 1401 ) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2005) (Entered: 12/13/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1401 Filed: 12/13/2005, Entered: None
MOTION to change time for hearing on lead plaintiff's motion for order prohibiting Bear Stearns & Co. Inc. from seeking injunctive relief in New York state court to prevent consummation of the settlement filed by New York State Common Retirement Fund. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2005) (Entered: 12/13/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1400 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re 1399 Notice of Change of Address (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2005) (Entered: 12/09/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1399 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Address by New York State Common Retirement Fund (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2005) (Entered: 12/09/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1398 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund re 1397 Notice (Other) (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2005) (Entered: 11/21/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1397 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE by New York State Common Retirement Fund of entry of 1396 Stipulation and Order, (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2005) (Entered: 11/21/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1396 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER Providing for Supplement Notice of Pendency and Proposed Settlement of Class Action Against McKesson HBOC, Inc. and HBO & Company, Annexed as Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/10/2005. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2005) (Entered: 11/18/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1395 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff New York State in 5:99-cv-20743 of notice of entry of order [1394-1] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/17/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1394 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE by Plaintiff New York State in 5:99-cv-20743 [1393-1] of entry of order [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/17/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1393 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Mag. Judge Patricia V. Trumbull denying defendant Bear Stearns & Co., Inc.'s motion for protective order [1378-1] ( Date Entered: 10/12/05) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/12/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1392 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE by defendant McKesson HBOC, Inc. in 5:99-cv-20743, defendant HBO & Company in 5:99-cv-20743 [1391-1] of entry of order [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/03/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1391 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND PROVIDING FOR NOTICE by Judge Ronald M. Whyte 1356 , 1353 , ( Date Entered: 9/29/05) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/29/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1390 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Bear Stearns & Co. in 5:99-cv-20743 of declaration [1389-1], reply [1388-1] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/27/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1389 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: None
DECLARATION by Jonathan M. Hoff on behalf of defendant Bear Stearns & Co. in 5:99-cv-20743 in support of reply in further support of motion for protective order [1388-1] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/27/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1388 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: None
REPLY by defendant Bear Stearns & Co. in 5:99-cv-20743 in support of motion for protective order [1378-1] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/27/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1387 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE by defendant Mark A. Pulido in 5:99-cv-20743 of change of firm address, telephone and facsimile numbers [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/26/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1386 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE by defendant Arthur Andersen in 5:99-cv-20743 to defendant Bear Stearns & Co. Inc.'s motion for protective order [1378-1] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/21/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1385 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE by Lead Plaintiff New York State Common Retirement Fund in 5:99-cv-20743 of declaration [1384-1], opposition [1383-1] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/21/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1384 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: None
DECLARATION by Timothy A. DeLange on behalf of Lead Plaintiff New York State Common Retirement Fund in 5:99-cv-20743 in support of opposition [1383-1] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/21/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1383 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: None
OPPOSITION by Lead Plaintiff New York State Common Retirement Fund in 5:99-cv-20743 to Bear Stearns & Co. Inc's motion for protective order [1378-1] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/21/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1382 Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: None
LETTER dated 9/19/05 from David Stickney and M. Richard Komins in for Lead Plaintiff New York State Common Retirement Fund in 5:99-cv-20743 re proposed order re preliminary appoving settlement and providing for notice (with exhibits) [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/20/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1381 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte re [1367-1] Overruling Objections to Second Revised Proposed Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal and Preliminarily Approving Settlement ( Date Entered: 9/9/05) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/09/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1380 Filed: 9/2/2005, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Bear Stearns & Co. in 5:99-cv-20743 of declaration [1379-1], motion for protective order [1378-1] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/06/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1379 Filed: 9/2/2005, Entered: None
DECLARATION by Jonathan M. Hoff on behalf of defendant Bear Stearns & Co. in 5:99-cv-20743 in support of motion for protective order [1378-1] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/06/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1378 Filed: 9/2/2005, Entered: None, Terminated: 10/12/2005 Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION before Mag. Judge Patricia V. Trumbull by defendant Bear Stearns & Co. in 5:99-cv-20743 for protective order with Notice set for 10/11/05 at 9:00 AM [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/06/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1377 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: None
REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT; Date of proceedings: 5/20/05 ( C/R: Lee-Anne Shortridge) [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/30/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1376 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE by defendant Albert J. Bergonzi in 5:99-cv-20743 of change of address and facsimile number [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/18/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1375 Filed: 6/5/2005, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE by McKesson HBOC, Inc. and HBO & Company in 5:99-cv-20743 of declaration [1374-1], response [1373-1] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/08/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1374 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: None
DECLARATION by Adrienne L. Taclas on behalf of McKesson HBOC, Inc. and HBO & Company in 5:99-cv-20743 re response [1373-1] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/08/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1373 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE by McKesson HBOC, Inc. and HBO & Company in 5:99-cv-20743 to opposition memorandum [1367-1] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/08/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1372 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff New York State in 5:99-cv-20743 of response [1371-1] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/08/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1371 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Lead Plaintiff New York State in 5:99-cv-20743 to Bear, Stearns & Co. Ic.'s opposition memorandum [1367-1] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/08/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1370 Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER setting briefing schedule for objections to second revised proposed judgment by Judge Ronald M. Whyte. By 7/29/05, Bear Stearns and Arthur Andersen may file objections of no more than 15 pages each to the latest revisions made to the Proposed Final Judgment. By 8/5/05, Lead Plaintiff and McKesson, may respond to the objections in briefs of no more than 15 pages each. ( Date Entered: 8/3/05) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/03/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1369 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Bear Stearns & Co. in 5:99-cv-20743 of declaration [1368-1], opposition memorandum [1367-1] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/29/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1368 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: None
DECLARATION by Kelvin D. Chen on behalf of defendant Bear Stearns & Co. in 5:99-cv-20743 in support of opposition memorandum [1367-1] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/29/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1367 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by defendant Bear Stearns & Co. in 5:99-cv-20743 in opposition to the "stipulation and proposed order substituting the form of proposed final judgment and order of dismissal, attached as Tab A, in place of the form that is accompanied the motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement; and preliminarily approving settlement as submitted" received [0-0] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/29/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1366 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE by Lead Plaintiff New York State Common Retirement Fund in 5:99-cv-20743 of stipulation and proposed order received [0-0] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/12/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1365 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES: ( C/R Lee-Anne Shortridge) ( Hearing Date: 5/20/05) Hearing before Judge Ronald M. Whyte addressing preliminary settlement approval issues. The Court heard oral argument from all parties and took this matter under submission. The Court to send out a written ruling to the parties. [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/07/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1364 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting motion for attorney Gregory Zimmer to appear pro hac vice . Fee status paid. [1360-1] ( Date Entered: 7/7/05) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/07/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1363 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting motion for attorney Karen L. Yen to appear pro hac vice . Fee status paid. [1359-1] ( Date Entered: 7/7/05) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/07/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1362 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting motion for attorney Kelvin Chen to appear pro hac vice . Fee status paid. [1358-1] ( Date Entered: 7/7/05) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/07/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1361 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Bear Stearns & Co. in 5:99-cv-20743 of order received [0-0], motion for attorney Gregory Zimmer to appear pro hac vice . Fee status paid. [1360-1], order received [0-0], motion for attorney Karen L. Yen to appear pro hac vice . Fee status paid. [1359-1], order received [0-0], motion for attorney Kelvin Chen to appear pro hac vice . Fee status paid. [1358-1] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/01/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1360 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/7/2005 Court Filing
APPLICATION before Judge Ronald M. Whyte by defendant Bear Stearns & Co. in 5:99-cv-20743 for attorney Gregory Zimmer to appear pro hac vice . Fee status paid. [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/01/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1359 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/7/2005 Court Filing
APPLICATION before Judge Ronald M. Whyte by defendant Bear Stearns & Co. in 5:99-cv-20743 for attorney Karen L. Yen to appear pro hac vice . Fee status paid. [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/01/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1358 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/7/2005 Court Filing
APPLICATION before Judge Ronald M. Whyte by defendant Bear Stearns & Co. in 5:99-cv-20743 for attorney Kelvin Chen to appear pro hac vice . Fee status paid. [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 07/01/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1357 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE by Plaintiffs Carlos Bea and Jacobs in 5:99-cv-20743 of change of address [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/30/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1356 Filed: 6/9/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION before Judge Ronald M. Whyte by Lead Plaintiff New York State in 5:99-cv-20743 for clarification , or reconsideration of order denying preliminary approval of partial settlement without prejudice with Notice set for 5/20/05 at 9:00 AM [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/15/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1355 Filed: 6/9/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by defendant Jay M. Lapine in 5:99-cv-20743 (no proposed order submitted) [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/15/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1354 Filed: 6/9/2005, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff New York State in 5:99-cv-20743 of order received [0-0], motion for clarification [1353-1], motion reconsideration of order denying preliminary approval of partial settlement without prejudice [1353-2] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/15/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1353 Filed: 6/9/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION before Judge Ronald M. Whyte by Lead Plaintiff New York State Common Retirement Fund in 5:99-cv-20743 for clarification , or reconsideration of order denying preliminary approval of partial settlement without prejudice [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/15/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1352 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Hector Figueroa re Subpoena in a civil case, letter and affidavit [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/02/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1351 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte denying motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement [1230-1] ( Date Entered: 5/25/05) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/25/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1350 Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN REPLY by defendant Bear Stearns & Co. in 5:99-cv-20743 to lead plaintiff and McKesson's responses to Bear Stearns' opposition to the revised notice of pendency and settlement of class action and the revised (proposed) final judgment and order of dismissal [1344-1], [1346-1] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/20/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1349 Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: None
REPLY by defendant Arthur Andersen in 5:99-cv-20743 OPPOSING Lead Plaintiff's "Revised" Settlment Documents [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/20/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1348 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE by defendant McKesson HBOC, Inc. and HBO & Company in 5:99-cv-20743 to Arthur Andersen LLP's objections to lead plaintiff's "Revised" Settlement Documents. [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/18/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1347 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant McKesson HBOC, Inc. and HBO & Company in 5:99-cv-20743 of response [1346-1] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/18/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1346 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE by defendant McKesson HBOC, Inc. and HBO & Company in 5:99-cv-20743 to Bear Stearns' opposition [1341-1] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/18/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1345 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE by Lead Plaintiff New York State in 5:99-cv-20743 of memorandum [1344-1] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/18/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1344 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Lead Plaintiff New York State in 5:99-cv-20743 further supporting motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement [1230-1] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/18/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1343 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant M. Christine Jacobs in 5:99-cv-20743 of declaration [1342-1], opposition memorandum [1341-1] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/09/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1342 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: None
DECLARATION by Jacqueline D. Molnar on behalf of defendant Bear Stearns & Co. in 5:99-cv-20743 in support of opposition memorandum [1341-1] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/09/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1341 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by defendant Bear Stearns & Co. in 5:99-cv-20743 in opposition to Revised Notice of Pendency and Settlement of Class Action and the Revised (Proposed) Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/09/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1340 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR CONSIDERING PROPOSED SETTLEMENT REVISIONS by Judge Ronald M. Whyte The Court will hear argument on Revised Proposed Judgment on 5/20/05 at 9:00 AM. Should no ruling issue on 5/20/05, the Court will endeavor to issue a ruling as soon as possible after 6/9/05. ( Date Entered: 5/4/05) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/04/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1339 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME by defendant Charles W. McCall in 5:99-cv-20743 [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/27/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1338 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte vacating scheduling dates pending final disposition of settlement agreement [1276-1], re [1230-1] ( Date Entered: 4/27/05) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/27/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1337 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte staying deposition of defendant Richard Hawkins ( Date Entered: 4/27/05) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/27/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1336 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting motion to substitute attorney [1322-1] attorney Mark D. Lammers for Richard A. Hess in 5:99-cv-20743, attorney Mark D. Lammers for E. Austin Hess in 5:99-cv-20743, attorney Mark D. Lammers for Kathryn J. Hess in 5:99-cv-20743 and substituting in attorney David C. Anson ( Date Entered: 4/18/05) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/18/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1335 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte denying as moot, motion to submit recent decision in connection with objection to Magistrate Judge Trumbull's 6/24/04 order granting motion to compel McKesson to produce documents [1325-1] ( Date Entered: 4/15/05) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/15/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1334 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: None
DECLARATION by Michael A. Zwibelman on behalf of defendant Charles W. McCall in 5:99-cv-20743 re withdraw notice [1333-1] and Unopposed Request for Leave to Re-File Without Prejudice [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/12/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1333 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE by defendant Charles W. McCall in 5:99-cv-20743 withdrawing motion for protective order [1286-1] and UNOPPOSED REQUEST for leave to re-file without prejudice [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/12/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1332 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff New York State in 5:99-cv-20743 of notice of entry of order [1331-1] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/11/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1331 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE by Plaintiff New York State in 5:99-cv-20743 [1319-1] of entry of order [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/11/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1330 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE by Plaintiff New York State in 5:99-cv-20743 of notice of entry of order [1329-1] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/11/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1329 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE by Plaintiff New York State in 5:99-cv-20743 [1318-1] of entry of order [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/11/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1328 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE by defendant McKesson HBOC, Inc. in 5:99-cv-20743 [1320-1] of entry of order [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/11/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1327 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting McKesson HBOC, Inc.'s motion to submit recent decision supporting objection to Magistrate Judge Trumbull's 6/24/04 Order granting motion to compel defendant McKesson to produce documents ( Date Entered: 4/8/05) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/08/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1326 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant McKesson HBOC, Inc. and HBO & Company in 5:99-cv-20743 of order received [0-0], motion to submit recent decision in connection with objection to Magistrate Judge Trumbull's 6/24/04 order granting motion to compel dft McKesson to produce documents [1325-1] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/07/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1325 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/15/2005 Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION WITH MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES before Judge Ronald M. Whyte by defendant McKesson HBOC, Inc. and HBO & Company in 5:99-cv-20743 to submit recent decision in connection with objection to Magistrate Judge Trumbull's 6/24/04 order granting motion to compel dft McKesson to produce documents [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/07/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1324 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE by Kathryn J. Hess in 5:99-cv-20743, E. Austin Hess in 5:99-cv-20743, Richard A. Hess in 5:99-cv-20743, Barbara H. Brubaker in 5:99-cv-20743, Susan L. Keith in 5:99-cv-20743 of order received [0-0], motion to substitute attorney [1322-1] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/07/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1323 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE by Kathryn J. Hess in 5:99-cv-20743, E. Austin Hess in 5:99-cv-20743, Richard A. Hess in 5:99-cv-20743, Barbara H. Brubaker in 5:99-cv-20743, Susan L. Keith in 5:99-cv-20743 of attorney [1321-1] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/07/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1322 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: None, Terminated: 4/15/2005 Court Filing
MOTION before Judge Ronald M. Whyte by Kathryn J. Hess in 5:99-cv-20743, E. Austin Hess in 5:99-cv-20743, Richard A. Hess in 5:99-cv-20743, Barbara H. Brubaker in 5:99-cv-20743, Susan L. Keith in 5:99-cv-20743 to substitute attorney [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/07/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1321 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for Kathryn J. Hess in 5:99-cv-20743, E. Austin Hess in 5:99-cv-20743, Richard A. Hess in 5:99-cv-20743, Barbara H. Brubaker in 5:99-cv-20743, Susan L. Keith in 5:99-cv-20743 by David C. Anson [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/07/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1320 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte sustaing defendants objection to Magistrate Judge's denial of protective order; [1123-1], [1125-1], 1127 , 1136 , denying lead plaintiff's ex parte motion to enforce the Court's Amended Case Management Order. McKesson shall not be required to produce the Skadden Report to Lead Plaintiff or plaintiffs in the ERISA litigation. ( Date Entered: 4/4/05) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/04/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1319 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte denying motion to dismiss second amended complaint. [877-1] ( Date Entered: 4/4/05) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/04/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1318 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte denying motion for reconsideration of order granting in part and denying in part Bear Stearns' motion to dismiss third amended complaint. [900-1] ( Date Entered: 4/4/05) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 04/04/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1317 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: None
MINUTES: ( C/R Lee-Anne Shortridge) ( Hearing Date: 3/25/05) the motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement [1230-1] is submitted, the motion to modify trial and pretrial schedule [1276-1] is submitted. The Court to send out a written ruling to the parties. [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/31/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1316 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting motion for leave to file a brief as Amicus Curiae in support of McKesson HBOC and in opposition to motion to compel. [1114-1] ( Date Entered: 3/31/05) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/31/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1315 Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Mag. Judge Patricia V. Trumbull setting hearing on motion for protective order [1286-1] 10:00 4/12/05 ( Date Entered: 3/24/05) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/24/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1314 Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION before Judge Ronald M. Whyte by defendant Bear Stearns & Co. in 5:99-cv-20743 to strike memorandum of McKesson HBOC, Inc. regarding statement of recent decision in support of motion for preliminary approval of settlement [1308-1] with Notice set for 3/25/05 at 9:00 AM [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/24/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1313 Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ERRATA by defendant Arthur Andersen in 5:99-cv-20743 to Reply in support of motion to continue trial date and pretrial deadlines [1307-1] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/24/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1312 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Arthur Andersen in 5:99-cv-20743 of response [1303-1] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1311 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant McKesson HBOC, Inc. and HBO & Comapny in 5:99-cv-20743 of declaration [1310-1], reply [1309-1], memorandum [1308-1] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1310 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: None
DECLARATION by Karen Kennard on behalf of defendant McKesson HBOC, Inc. in 5:99-cv-20743 in support of reply [1309-1] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1309 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: None
REPLY by defendant McKesson HBOC, Inc. and HBO & Company in 5:99-cv-20743 to opposition to joint ex parte application of lead plaintiff and McKesson to suspend certain pretrial deadlines. [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1308 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by defendant McKesson HBOC, Inc. and HBO & Company in 5:99-cv-20743 regarding statement of recent decision in support of motion for preliminary approval of settlement. [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1307 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: None
REPLY by defendant Arthur Andersen in 5:99-cv-20743 in support of motion to continue trial and pretrial deadlines [1276-1] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1306 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Mag. Judge Patricia V. Trumbull granting joint request of defendant Charles W. McCall and defendant Arthur Anderson LLP to shorten time for motion for protective order, hearing on motion for protective order [1286-1] set for 10:00 3/22/05 ( Date Entered: 3/23/05) (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1305 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting joint ex parte application to suspend certain pretrial deadlines [1271-1] ( Date Entered: (cc: all counsel) [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/22/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1304 Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE of entry of order re joint request to shorten time by defendant Charles W. McCall in 5:99-cv-20743 [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/21/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1303 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: None
RESPONSE by defendant Arthur Andersen in 5:99-cv-20743 to motion for protective order [1286-1] [5:99-cv-20743] (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 03/21/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 799 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?