Apple Computer Inc. v. Burst.com, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:06-cv-00019
District Judge Marilyn H. Patel, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 1, 2017 at 2:36 AM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Apple, Inc. Apple, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas V Martini +1 858 678 5070 +1 858 678 5099 martini@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas A Brown +1 650 655 1300 +1 415 520 5609 brownn@gtlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ian B. Crosby +1 206 516 3880 icrosby@susmangodfrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Douglas Powers +1 650 802 3000 +1 650 802 3100 matthew.powers@weil.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Stotland Weiswasser +1 212 310 8022 +1 212 310 8007 elizabeth.weiswasser@weil.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer H. Wu +1 212 310 8683 +1 212 310 8007 jennifer.wu@weil.com
Apple, Inc. Apple, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas A Brown +1 650 655 1300 +1 415 520 5609 brownn@gtlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ian B. Crosby +1 206 516 3880 icrosby@susmangodfrey.com
No Logo Burst.com, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Heim, Payne & Chorush, L.L.P.

Toggle Switch Represented by Hosie McArthur LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce J. Wecker +1 415 247 6000 +1 415 247 6001 bwecker@hosielaw.com

Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

v.
No Logo Burst.com, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carr & Ferrell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Paul Grewe +1 650 812 3400 +1 650 812 3444 cgrewe@carrferrell.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Joseph Yorio +1 650 812 3400 +1 650 812 3444 yorio@carrferrell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Conley, Rose & Tayon, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael F. Heim +1 713 238 8000 +1 713 238 8008 mheim@conleyrose.com

Represented by Heim, Payne & Chorush, L.L.P.

Toggle Switch Represented by Hosie McArthur LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Spencer Hosie +1 415 247 6000 +1 415 247 6001 shosie@hosielaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce J. Wecker +1 415 247 6000 +1 415 247 6001 bwecker@hosielaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis Roca Rothgerber LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Colby Brian Springer +1 650 391 1394 +1 650 687 8492 cspringer@lrrlaw.com

Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Apple, Inc. Apple, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas A Brown +1 650 655 1300 +1 415 520 5609 brownn@gtlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ian B. Crosby +1 206 516 3880 icrosby@susmangodfrey.com
No Logo Burst.com, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Represented by Heim, Payne & Chorush, L.L.P.

Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

No Logo Realnetworks, Inc., Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert F. Kramer +1 415 848 4962 +1 415 848 4999 kramerr@howrey.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (207) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 205 Motion to Relate Cases C 06-0019 MHP and C 08-0023 WDB (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2008) (Entered: 01/24/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: None
    STIPULATION re 205 MOTION to Relate Case ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-12 STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 3-12, 7-11 AND 7-12 by Realnetworks, Inc.. (Kramer, Robert) (Filed on 1/10/2008) (Entered: 01/10/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: None
      MOTION to Relate Case ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-12 filed by Realnetworks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kramer, Robert) (Filed on 1/10/2008) (Entered: 01/10/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
        STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing all claims and counterclaims with prejudice; Each side to bear costs; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 12/4/2007. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2007) (Entered: 12/05/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: None
          STIPULATION and Order of Dismissal by Apple Inc., Burst.com, Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/3/2007) (Entered: 12/03/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER (NINETY-DAY CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL); Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 11/27/2007. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2007) (Entered: 11/28/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: None
              MOTION Vacate Dates Due To Settlement (Joint) filed by Apple Inc., Burst.com, Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 11/21/2007) (Entered: 11/21/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: None
                MOTION Clarification of Order on Motion to Change the Summary Judgment Schedule re 199 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION filed by Burst.com, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Change the Schedule# 2 Exhibit B Declaration of Spencer Hosie in Opposition to Apple's Motion to Change the Summary Judgment Schedule# 3 Proposed Order)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 11/15/2007) (Entered: 11/15/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 197 plaintiff's Motion changing summary judgment schedules as follows: Motions to be filed by 11/21/2007; Oppositions to be filed by 12/12/2007; Replies to be filed by 12/28/2007;withdrawing 184 186 188 plaintiff's Motions for Summary Judgment without prejudice; (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2007) (Entered: 11/15/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 11/12/2007, Entered: None
                    Declaration of Nicholas A. Brown in Support of 197 MOTION to Change the Summary Judgment Schedule in Light of the Court's November 8, 2007 Order filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 197 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 11/12/2007) (Entered: 11/12/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 11/12/2007, Entered: None
                      MOTION to Change the Summary Judgment Schedule in Light of the Court's November 8, 2007 Order filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 11/12/2007) (Entered: 11/12/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                        MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment of invalidity (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2007) (Entered: 11/08/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 192 plaintiff's Motion to Seal Documents in connection with Apple's partial motion for summary judgment re Latches and Invalidity (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2007) (Entered: 10/31/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: None
                            Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Apple Computer, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment of Invalidity For Indefiniteness or in the Alternative For Lack of Written Description by Apple Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/30/2007) (Entered: 10/30/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: None
                              Declaration of Nicholas A. Brown in Support of 192 MOTION to Seal Document filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 192 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/29/2007) (Entered: 10/29/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: None
                                MOTION to Seal Document filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/29/2007) (Entered: 10/29/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: None
                                  Declaration of Stephen Wicker in Support of 186 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Based on Lack of Enablement filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 186 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/29/2007) (Entered: 10/29/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: None
                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of 184 186] 188 by Apple Inc. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/29/2007) Modified on 10/30/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/29/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: None
                                      Declaration of Leeron G. Kalay in Support of 188 Apple's Motion For Partial Summary Judgment of Laches filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3a# 4 Exhibit 3b# 5 Exhibit 4# 6 Exhibit 5# 7 Exhibit 6# 8 Exhibit 7# 9 Exhibit 8# 10 Exhibit 9# 11 Exhibit 10# 12 Exhibit 11# 13 Exhibit 12# 14 Exhibit 13# 15 Exhibit 14# 16 Exhibit 15# 17 Exhibit 16# 18 Exhibit 17# 19 Exhibit 18# 20 Exhibit 19# 21 Exhibit 20# 22 Exhibit 21# 23 Exhibit 22# 24 Exhibit 23# 25 Exhibit 24# 26 Exhibit 25# 27 Exhibit 26# 28 Exhibit 27# 29 Exhibit 28# 30 Exhibit 29)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/29/2007) Modified on 10/30/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/29/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: None
                                        MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Laches filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2007 02:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/29/2007) Modified on 10/30/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/29/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: None
                                          Declaration of Nicholas V. Martini in Support of 186 Plaintiff Apple's Motion For Summary Judgment of Invalidity Based on Lack of Enablement filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 14# 14 Exhibit 15# 15 Exhibit 16# 16 Exhibit 17# 17 Exhibit 18# 18 Exhibit 19# 19 Exhibit 20# 20 Exhibit 21# 21 Exhibit 22# 22 Exhibit 23)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/29/2007) Modified on 10/30/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/29/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Based on Lack of Enablement filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2007 02:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/29/2007) (Entered: 10/29/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: None
                                              Declaration of Jennifer H. Wu in Support of 184 Apple's Motion For Summary Judgment of Invalidity For Indefiniteness or in the Alternative For Lack of Written Description filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/29/2007) Modified on 10/30/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/29/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity For Indefiniteness or in the Alternative For Lack of Written Description filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2007 02:00 PM. (Attachments: *** # 1 Proposed Order FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 194 . *** )(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/29/2007) Modified on 10/30/2007 (ewn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/29/2007)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER modifying pretrial briefing schedules; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 10/15/2007. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2007) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank 182 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007 Court Filing
                                                    ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 178 plaintiff's Motion for attorney Elizabeth Stotland Weiswasser to appear Pro Hac Vice (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2007) (Entered: 10/12/2007)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 181 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007 Court Filing
                                                      ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 177 plaintiff's Motion for attorney Jennifer H Wu to appear Pro Hac Vice (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2007) (Entered: 10/12/2007)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 180 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007
                                                        STIPULATION Stipulated Request for An Order Changing Time by Apple Inc., Burst.com, Inc.. (Crosby, Ian) (Filed on 10/12/2007) (Entered: 10/12/2007)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 179 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007
                                                          ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM 171 Answer to to CounterClaim,, Counterclaim, Burst.com, Inc.'s, Answer to Apple Computer, Inc.'s Amended Counterclaim for Declaratory Judgment byBurst.com, Inc.. (Crosby, Ian) (Filed on 10/9/2007) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION for Admission of Attorney Elizabeth Stotland Weiswasser Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 34611011181) filed by Apple Inc.. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2007) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION for Admission of Attorney Jennifer H. Wu Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 34611011182) filed by Apple Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2007) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank 176 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007 Court Filing
                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to and including 10/9/2007 for defendnat to filed answer to plaintiff's amended answer to defendant's amended counterclaim; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 10/3/2007. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2007) (Entered: 10/04/2007)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 175 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007
                                                                  STIPULATION Stipulated Request for Order Changing Time by Burst.com, Inc., Apple Inc.. (Crosby, Ian) (Filed on 10/1/2007) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/18/07 before Judge Marilyn H. Patel. Court Reporter: Sahar McVickar. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2007) (Entered: 09/27/2007)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank 173 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 Court Filing
                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER allowing plaintiff to file amended answer; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 9/20/2007. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2007) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 172 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 166 plaintiff's Motion to Seal exhibits C and D to the declaration of Nicholas A Brown in support of plaintiff's motion to strike declaration (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2007) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 171 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007
                                                                          ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM Apple Computer, Inc.'s Amended Answer to Burst.com, Inc.'s Amended Counterclaim and Counterclaim For Declaratory Judgment, COUNTERCLAIM against all defendants byApple Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/19/2007) (Entered: 09/19/2007)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 170 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007
                                                                            STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Allowing Apple to File an Amended Answer by Apple Inc., Burst.com, Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/19/2007) (Entered: 09/19/2007)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 169 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007
                                                                              Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/18/2007 before Hon. Marilyn Hall Patel (Date Filed: 9/19/2007) re motions for summary judgment on invalidity (Court Reporter Sahar McVicker.) (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/19/2007) (Entered: 09/19/2007)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 168 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007
                                                                                Proposed Order re 164 MOTION to Strike 146 Declaration in Opposition, 150 Declaration in Opposition, 147 Declaration in Opposition MOTION to Strike 146 Declaration in Opposition, 150 Declaration in Opposition, 147 Declaration in Opposition by Apple Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/17/2007) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 167 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007
                                                                                  Declaration of Leeron G. Kalay in Support of 166 MOTION to Seal Document 165 Declaration in Support, filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 166 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/17/2007) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 166 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007
                                                                                    MOTION to Seal Document 165 Declaration in Support, filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/17/2007) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 165 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007
                                                                                      Declaration of Nicholas Brown in Support of 164 MOTION to Strike 146 Declaration in Opposition, 150 Declaration in Opposition, 147 Declaration in Opposition MOTION to Strike 146 Declaration in Opposition, 150 Declaration in Opposition, 147 Declaration in Opposition filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 164 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/17/2007) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 164 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007
                                                                                        MOTION to Strike 146 Declaration in Opposition, 150 Declaration in Opposition, 147 Declaration in Opposition filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/17/2007) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 163 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 162 Motion to allow equipment into courtroom for 9/18/2007; (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2007) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 162 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007
                                                                                            MOTION Request to Bring Certain Equipment into Courthouse for Purposes of Hearing on Summary Judgment Motion filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/10/2007) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 161 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 158 plaintiff's Motion to Seal exhibits D, O of declaration Nicholas A Brown in support of reply in support of second motion for summary judgment;(awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2007) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 160 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007
                                                                                                Proposed Order re 158 MOTION to Seal Document Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-10 and 79-5 by Apple Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/6/2007) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 159 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007
                                                                                                  Declaration of Leeron G. Kalay in Support of 158 MOTION to Seal Document Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-10 and 79-5 filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 158 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/6/2007) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 158 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007
                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal Document Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-10 and 79-5 filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/6/2007) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 157 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007
                                                                                                      Declaration of Nicholas A. Brown in Support of 156 Reply Memorandum filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A part 1# 2 Exhibit A part 2# 3 Exhibit A part 3# 4 Exhibit A part 4# 5 Exhibit A part 5# 6 Exhibit B part 1# 7 Exhibit B part 2# 8 Exhibit B part 3# 9 Exhibit C# 10 Exhibit D# 11 Exhibit E# 12 Exhibit F# 13 Exhibit G# 14 Exhibit H# 15 Exhibit I# 16 Exhibit J# 17 Exhibit K# 18 Exhibit L# 19 Exhibit M# 20 Exhibit N# 21 Exhibit O)(Related document(s) 156 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/6/2007) Modified on 9/18/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 156 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007
                                                                                                        Reply Memorandum re 124 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed byApple Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/6/2007) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 155 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007
                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 124 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity **Corrected Version** filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Related document(s) 124 ) (Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 8/30/2007) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 154 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting in part and denying in part 144 Motion to Seal; All documents listed except the referenced opposition; Pleadings, briefs, memorandua and not to be filed under seal. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2007) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 153 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007
                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 124 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Defendant Burst.com, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff Apple Computer, Inc.'s Second Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Related document(s) 124 ) (Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 8/29/2007) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 152 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007
                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Burst.com, Inc. re Defendant Burst.com, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff Apple Computer, Inc.'s Second Motion for Summary Judgment on Invalidity (and supporting documents) (Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 8/28/2007) (Entered: 08/28/2007)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 151 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007
                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Daniel J. Walker in Opposition to Apple Computer, Inc.'s Second Motion for Summary Judgment filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Exhibit 16# 17 Exhibit 17# 18 Exhibit 18# 19 Exhibit 19# 20 Exhibit 20# 21 Exhibit 21# 22 Exhibit 22# 23 Exhibit 23# 24 Exhibit 24# 25 Exhibit 25# 26 Exhibit 26# 27 Exhibit 27# 28 Exhibit 28# 29 Exhibit 29)(Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 8/28/2007) (Entered: 08/28/2007)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 150 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007
                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Richard Lang in Opposition to Second Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12)(Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 8/28/2007) (Entered: 08/28/2007)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 149 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007
                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Dr. Justin Douglas Tygar in Opposition to Apple's Second Motioin for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 8/28/2007) (Entered: 08/28/2007)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 148 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007
                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Bruce McFarlane in Opposition to Plaintiff Apple Computer, Inc.'s Second Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A# 2 Appendix B)(Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 8/28/2007) (Entered: 08/28/2007)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 147 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007
                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Allen Gersho in Opposition to Apple's Second Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 8/28/2007) (Entered: 08/28/2007)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 146 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007
                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Dr. Sheila Hemami in Opposition to Apple's Second Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3)(Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 8/28/2007) (Entered: 08/28/2007)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 145 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007
                                                                                                                              Declaration of Bruce Wecker in Support of 144 MOTION to Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-10 and 79-5 filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 144 ) (Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 8/28/2007) (Entered: 08/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 144 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007
                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-10 and 79-5 filed by Burst.com, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 8/28/2007) (Entered: 08/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 143 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME AS AGREED TO, AND DENYING REQUEST FOR PAGE LIMIT EXTENSION; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 8/28/2007. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2007) (Entered: 08/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 142 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007
                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Nicholas A. Brown In Support of Stipulation Extending Deadlines filed byApple Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/24/2007) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 141 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION re 124 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity and [Proposed] Order Granting Administrative Request to Exceed Page Limitations Governing Burst's Opposition to Apple's Second Motion For Summary Judgement of Invalidity and Extend Deadline For Apple's Reply by Apple Inc., Burst.com, Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/24/2007) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 140 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: 8/16/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER resetting hearing on motions for summary judgment to 9/18/2007 02:00 PM; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 8/10/2007. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2007) (Entered: 08/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 139 Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007
                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Continuing Hearing On Apple's First And Second Motions For Summary Judgment of Invalidity by Apple Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/9/2007) (Entered: 08/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            MOTION for attorney Eric J. Enger leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611008524.) filed by Burst.com, Inc.. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2007) (Entered: 07/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 137 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER RESETTING HEARINGS on Motion 92 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF INVALIDITY BASED ON KRAMER AND AT&T PATENTS, 124 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity 119 MOTION to Strike the Declarations of Drs. Hemami and Gersho TO 9/12/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 7/20/2007. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2007) (Entered: 07/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 136 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting defendant's application for attorney Eric J Fager to appear pro hac vice; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 7/19/2007. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2007) (Entered: 07/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 135 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 129 parties' Motion to bring equipment for use in summary judgment motion hearing on 7/25/2007 (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2007) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 134 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of DANIEL J. WALKER IN SUPPORT OF BURST.COM INC.'S OPPOSITION TO APPLE COMPUTER, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE THE DECLARATIONS OF DRS. HEMAMI AND GERSHO in Support of 133 Memorandum in Opposition filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3)(Related document(s) 133 ) (Short, Floyd) (Filed on 7/16/2007) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 133 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition re 119 MOTION to Strike the Declarations of Drs. Hemami and Gersho filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Short, Floyd) (Filed on 7/16/2007) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 132 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing: Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment re Invalidity Hearing reset for 7/25/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2007) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 131 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007
                                                                                                                                                          Appendix re 124 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity (B: Gremillet & Tescher Claim Chart) filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 124 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 7/13/2007) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 130 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007
                                                                                                                                                            Appendix re 124 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity (A: Walter Claim Chart) filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 124 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 7/13/2007) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 129 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION TO BRING INTO THE FEDERAL COURTHOUSE CERTAIN EQUIPMENT AND MATERIALS FOR PURPOSES OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ARGUMENT filed by Apple Inc., Burst.com, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2007 02:30 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Grewe, Christopher) (Filed on 7/13/2007) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 128 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007
                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. (Martini, Nicholas) (Filed on 7/13/2007) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 127 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION re 125 Declaration in Support, filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Martini, Nicholas) (Filed on 7/13/2007) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 126 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007
                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Dr. Stephen B. Wicker in Support of 124 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 124 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 7/13/2007) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 125 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007
                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Leeron Kalay in Support of 124 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L)(Related document(s) 124 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 7/13/2007) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 124 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007
                                                                                                                                                                        Second MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2007 02:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 7/13/2007) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 123 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 121 defendant's Motion for attorney Daniel J Walker to appear Pro Hac Vice (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2007) (Entered: 07/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 122 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007
                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION re 119 MOTION to Strike the Declarations of Drs. Hemami and Gersho and [Proposed] Order by Apple Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 7/6/2007) (Entered: 07/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Admission of Attorney Daniel J. Walker Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 34611008004) filed by Burst.com, Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2007) (Entered: 07/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 120 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Nicholas A. Brown in Support of 119 MOTION to Strike the Declarations of Drs. Hemami and Gersho filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 119 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 7/3/2007) (Entered: 07/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 119 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike the Declarations of Drs. Hemami and Gersho filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 7/3/2007) (Entered: 07/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 118 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER REVISING SCHEDULING ORDER; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 6/21/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2007) (Entered: 06/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 117 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting request for increase page limit for filing of reply brief (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2007) (Entered: 06/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 116 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: 6/21/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Leeron Kalay in Support of 115 Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) 115 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/21/2007) (Entered: 06/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 115 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: 6/21/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply Memorandum re 92 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF INVALIDITY BASED ON KRAMER AND AT&T PATENTS filed byApple Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/21/2007) (Entered: 06/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 114 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: 6/20/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION re 113 MOTION Increase Page Limit of its Reply Brief For its Motion For Summary Judgment of Invalidity by Apple Inc. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/20/2007) Modified on 6/22/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 113 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: 6/20/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Increase Page Limit of its Reply Brief For its Motion For Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Apple Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/20/2007) Modified on 6/22/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 112 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and [Proposed] Revised Scheduling Order by Burst.com, Inc.. (Payne, Leslie) (Filed on 6/8/2007) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 111 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing: Plaintiff's Motion for Suumary Judgment re validity 92 set for 7/19/2007 02:30 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2007) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 110 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Ian Crosby in Support of 107 Response Burst.com, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff Apple Computer, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment on Invalidity Based on Kramer and Kepley Patents filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to I. Crosby Declaration# 2 Exhibit 2 to I. Crosby Declaration# 3 Exhibit 3 to I. Crosby Declaration# 4 Exhibit 4 to I. Crosby Declaration)(Related document(s) 107 ) (Crosby, Ian) (Filed on 6/7/2007) (Entered: 06/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 109 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Sheila Hemami in Support of 107 Response Burst.com, Inc's Opposition to Plaintiff Apple Computer, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment on Invalidity Based on Kramer and Kepley Patents filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to S. Hemami Declaration# 2 Exhibit B to S. Hemami Declaration# 3 Exhibit C to S. Hemami Declaration# 4 Exhibit D to S. Hemami Declaration# 5 Exhibit E to S. Hemami Declaration# 6 Exhibit F to S. Hemami Declaration# 7 Exhibit G to S. Hemami Declaration# 8 Exhibit H to S. Hemami Declaration# 9 Exhibit I to S. Hemami Declaration# 10 Exhibit J to S. Hemami Declaration# 11 Exhibit K to S. Hemami Declaration)(Related document(s) 107 ) (Crosby, Ian) (Filed on 6/7/2007) (Entered: 06/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 108 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Allen gersho in Support of 107 Response of Burst.com, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff Apple Computer, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment on Invalidity Based on Kramer and Kepley Patents filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to A. Gersho Declaration# 2 Exhibit B to A. Gersho Declaration# 3 Exhibit C to A. Gersho Declaration# 4 Exhibit D to A. Gersho Declaration# 5 Exhibit E to A. Gersho Declaration# 6 Exhibit F to A. Gersho Declaration (Part 1)# 7 Exhibit F to A. Gersho Declaration (Part 2)# 8 Exhibit G to A. Gersho Declaration# 9 Exhibit H to A. Gersho Declaration# 10 Exhibit I to A. Gersho Declaration (Part 1)# 11 Exhibit I to A. Gersho Declaration (Part 2)# 12 Exhibit J to A. Gersho Declaration# 13 Exhibit K to A. Gersho Declaration# 14 Exhibit L to A. Gersho Declaration# 15 Exhibit M to A. Gersho Declaration# 16 Exhibit N to A. Gersho Declaration# 17 Exhibit O to A. Gersho Declaration)(Related document(s) 107 ) (Crosby, Ian) (Filed on 6/7/2007) (Entered: 06/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 107 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition to 92 Plaintiff Apple Computer, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment on Invalidity Based on Kramer and Kepley Patents byBurst.com, Inc.. (Crosby, Ian) (Filed on 6/7/2007) Modified on 6/18/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 106 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/6/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel withdrawing 88 plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment re Non-Infringment without prejudice (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2007) (Entered: 06/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 105 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 88 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF NONINFRINGEMENT OF THE "STORED TIME COMPRESSED REPRESENTATION" LIMITATION Notice of Withdrawal of Motion For Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/5/2007) (Entered: 06/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 104 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLAIM CONSTRUCTION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR US PATENT NOS 4,963,995; 5,164,839; 5,057,932 AND 5,995,705; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 5/8/2007. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2007) (Entered: 05/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/8/07 before Judge Marilyn H. Patel. Court Reporter: James Yeomans. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2007) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 102 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: 2/9/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry: Claims Construction Hearing held on 2/8/2007 before Judge Marilyn Hall Patel. Defendant may respond to the document submitted to the Court during Mr. Stephens' presentation. Defendant is to respond to plaintiff's summary judgment motions within 30 days of the date of the filing of the Court's Order re: Claim Construction. Plaintiff is to reply within 2 weeks thereafter. The matter will be set for a hearing at 2:00 p.m on a date other than the court's standard Monday civil Law and Motions calendar. (Court Reporter Jim Yeomans.) (epb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/9/2007) (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/1/07 before Judge Marilyn H. Patel. Court Reporter: James Yeomans. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2007) (Entered: 02/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 100 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: 2/1/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry: Tutorial Hearing held on 2/1/2007 before Judge Marilyn Hall Patel (Date Filed: 2/1/2007). Claim construction hearing remains on the Court's calendar for 2/8/07, 9:00 a.m. Parties directed to confer and come to an agreement on the order of presentation of issues. Parties' experts should be present and available for the hearing. (Court Reporter Jim Yeomans.) (epb, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/1/2007) (Entered: 02/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 99 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/30/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 98 Motion re: Request to Bring into Courthouse Equipment and Materials. Parties to coordinate with Courtroom Deputy Butler (415) 522-3018. Signed by by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel 1/29/07. (epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2007) (Entered: 01/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 98 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: 1/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION TO BRING INTO THE FEDERAL COURTHOUSE CERTAIN EQUIPMENT AND MATERIALS FOR PURPOSES OF A TUTORIAL AND CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING filed by Apple Computer Inc., Burst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/26/2007) (Entered: 01/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 97 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: 1/25/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Joint Claim Construction Chart Grouped by Term filed by Burst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Howe, Micah) (Filed on 1/25/2007) (Entered: 01/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 96 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE - Hearing re: plaintiff's motions for summary judgment, previously set for 2/8/07 at 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco, is VACATED. The claim construction hearing REMAINS SET for 2/8/07 at 9:00 a.m. Hearing date for summary judgment motions will be set by the court at the 2/8/07 claim construction hearing, as well as the briefing schedule. (epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2007) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 95 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: 1/11/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition re 94 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Defendant and Counterclaimant Burst.com, Inc.'s Motion to Enlarge Time Within Which to Respond to Apple Computer, Inc.'s Motions for Summary Judgment filed byApple Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/11/2007) (Entered: 01/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 94 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: 1/8/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Defendant and Counterclaimant Burst.com, Inc.'s Motion to Enlarge Time Within Which to Respond to Apple Computer, Inc.'s Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Burst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Robert J. Yorio# 2 Proposed Order)(Yorio, Robert) (Filed on 1/8/2007) (Entered: 01/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 93 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Nicholas A. Brown in Support of 92 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF INVALIDITY BASED ON KRAMER AND AT&T PATENTS filed byApple Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) 92 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/4/2007) (Entered: 01/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 92 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment OF INVALIDITY BASED ON KRAMER AND AT&T PATENTS filed by Apple Computer Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2007 09:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/4/2007) (Entered: 01/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 91 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Seal Document 90 Declaration in Support, filed by Apple Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/4/2007) (Entered: 01/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 90 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Leeron G. Kalay in Support of 88 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF NONINFRINGEMENT OF THE "STORED TIME COMPRESSED REPRESENTATION" LIMITATION filed byApple Computer Inc.. (Related document(s) 88 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/4/2007) (Entered: 01/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 89 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration in Support of 88 MOTION for Summary Judgment OF NONINFRINGEMENT OF THE "STORED TIME COMPRESSED REPRESENTATION" LIMITATION filed byApple Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4# 2 Exhibit 5# 3 Exhibit 6 Part 1# 4 Exhibit 6 Part 2# 5 Exhibit 6 Part 3# 6 Exhibit 6 Part 4# 7 Exhibit Part 5)(Related document(s) 88 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/4/2007) (Entered: 01/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 88 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment OF NONINFRINGEMENT OF THE "STORED TIME COMPRESSED REPRESENTATION" LIMITATION filed by Apple Computer Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2007 09:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/4/2007) (Entered: 01/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 87 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  *** CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 86 *** Declaration of Leslie Payne in Support of Burst.com, Inc.'s Reply Brief on Claim Construction filed byBurst.com, Inc., Burst.com, Inc., Burst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 27# 2 Exhibit Ex. 28# 3 Exhibit Ex. 29# 4 Exhibit Ex. 30# 5 Exhibit Ex. 31# 6 Exhibit Ex. 32# 7 Errata 33# 8 Exhibit Ex. 34-1# 9 Exhibit Ex. 34-2# 10 Exhibit Ex. 35# 11 Exhibit Ex. 36# 12 Exhibit Ex. 37# 13 Exhibit Ex. 38)(Short, Floyd) (Filed on 12/22/2006) Modified on 12/27/2006 (wv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 86 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 87 *** Declaration of Les Payne in Support of Burst's Reply Brief on Claim Construction filed byBurst.com, Inc., Burst.com, Inc., Burst.com, Inc.. (Short, Floyd) (Filed on 12/22/2006) Modified on 12/27/2006 (wv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 85 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reply Memorandum on Claim Construction filed byBurst.com, Inc., Burst.com, Inc., Burst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief pages 36-73)(Short, Floyd) (Filed on 12/22/2006) (Entered: 12/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 84 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/17/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: 80 MOTION to Seal Document. Exhibits A, B, C, D to Kalay Declaration to be filed under seal. Motions terminated: Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 12/12/06. (epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2006) (Entered: 12/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 83 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re 74 Declaration in Support, Exhibit DD filed byApple Computer Inc.. (Related document(s) 74 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/11/2006) (Entered: 12/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 82 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Computer Inc. re 71 Claim Construction Statement & Motion to Seal Document Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-10 & 79-5 (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/11/2006) (Entered: 12/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 81 Filed: 12/9/2006, Entered: 12/9/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration in Support of 80 MOTION to Seal Document Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-10 and 79-5 filed byApple Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 80 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/9/2006) (Entered: 12/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 80 Filed: 12/9/2006, Entered: 12/9/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal Document Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-10 and 79-5 filed by Apple Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/9/2006) (Entered: 12/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 79 Filed: 12/9/2006, Entered: 12/9/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS re 74 Declaration in Support, filed byApple Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L Part 1# 2 Exhibit L Part 2# 3 Exhibit L Part 3# 4 Exhibit L Part 4# 5 Exhibit L Part 5# 6 Exhibit L Part 6# 7 Exhibit L Part 7# 8 Exhibit L Part 8)(Related document(s) 74 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/9/2006) (Entered: 12/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 78 Filed: 12/9/2006, Entered: 12/9/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS re 74 Declaration in Support, filed byApple Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AA Part 1# 2 Exhibit AA Part 2# 3 Exhibit AA Part 3# 4 Exhibit BB# 5 Exhibit CC)(Related document(s) 74 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/9/2006) (Entered: 12/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 77 Filed: 12/9/2006, Entered: 12/9/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS re 74 Declaration in Support, filed byApple Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit R# 2 Exhibit S# 3 Exhibit T# 4 Exhibit U# 5 Exhibit V# 6 Exhibit W# 7 Exhibit X Part 1# 8 Exhibit X Part 2# 9 Exhibit Y# 10 Exhibit Z)(Related document(s) 74 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/9/2006) (Entered: 12/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 76 Filed: 12/9/2006, Entered: 12/9/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS M-Q filed byApple Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit M# 2 Exhibit N# 3 Exhibit O Part 1# 4 Exhibit O Part 2# 5 Exhibit O Part 3# 6 Exhibit O Part 4# 7 Exhibit P# 8 Exhibit Q Part 1# 9 Exhibit Q Part 2# 10 Exhibit Q Part 3)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/9/2006) (Entered: 12/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 75 Filed: 12/9/2006, Entered: 12/9/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re 74 Declaration in Support, filed byApple Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C Part 1# 2 Exhibit C Part 2# 3 Exhibit C Part 3# 4 Exhibit C Part 4# 5 Exhibit D Part 1# 6 Exhibit D Part 2# 7 Exhibit E# 8 Exhibit F# 9 Exhibit G# 10 Exhibit H# 11 Exhibit I# 12 Exhibit J# 13 Exhibit K)(Related document(s) 74 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/9/2006) (Entered: 12/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 74 Filed: 12/9/2006, Entered: 12/9/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Nicholas Brown filed byApple Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A Part 1# 2 Exhibit Exhibit A Part 2# 3 Exhibit Exhibit A Part 3# 4 Exhibit Exhibit A Part 4# 5 Exhibit Exhibit B Part 1# 6 Exhibit Exhibit B Part# 7 Exhibit Exhibit B Part 3# 8 Exhibit Exhibit B Part 4)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/9/2006) (Entered: 12/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 73 Filed: 12/9/2006, Entered: 12/9/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Leeron Kalay in Support of 71 Claim Construction Statement filed byApple Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 71 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/9/2006) (Entered: 12/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 72 Filed: 12/9/2006, Entered: 12/9/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Joel Halpern in Support of 71 Claim Construction Statement filed byApple Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 1# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Part 2)(Related document(s) 71 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/9/2006) (Entered: 12/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 71 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: 12/8/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT filed by Apple Computer Inc., Apple Computer Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/8/2006) (Entered: 12/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 70 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: 11/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS re 68 Declaration in Support, Exhibit 18 filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 19# 2 Exhibit 20# 3 Exhibit 21# 4 Exhibit 22# 5 Exhibit 23# 6 Exhibit 24# 7 Exhibit 25# 8 Exhibit 26)(Related document(s) 68 ) (Payne, Leslie) (Filed on 11/22/2006) (Entered: 11/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 69 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: 11/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS re 68 Declaration in Support, Exhibit 8 filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 9# 2 Exhibit 10# 3 Exhibit 11# 4 Exhibit 12# 5 Exhibit 13# 6 Exhibit 14# 7 Exhibit 16# 8 Exhibit 17)(Related document(s) 68 ) (Payne, Leslie) (Filed on 11/22/2006) (Entered: 11/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 68 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: 11/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Leslie V. Payne in Support of 66 Brief Defendant Burst.com, Inc.'s Opening Brief on Claim Construction filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) 66 ) (Payne, Leslie) (Filed on 11/22/2006) (Entered: 11/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 67 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: 11/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Dr. Sheila S. Hemami in Support of 66 Brief Defendant Burst.com, Inc.'s Opening Brief on Claim Construction filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Related document(s) 66 ) (Payne, Leslie) (Filed on 11/22/2006) (Entered: 11/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 66 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: 11/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Brief Defendant Burst.com, Inc.'s Opening Brief on Claim Construction filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Payne, Leslie) (Filed on 11/22/2006) (Entered: 11/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/10/06 before Judge Marilyn H. Patel. Court Reporter: Katherine A. Powell. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2006) (Entered: 11/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 64 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: 11/6/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DISCLOSURE OF CONFIDENTIAL SOURCE CODE. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 10/27/06. (Attachments: # 1 Order Approving and Modifying Stipulated Protective Order, Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 11/3/06)(epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2006) (Entered: 11/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 63 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION and [Proposed] Supplemental Protective Order Regarding Disclosure of Confidential Source Code by Burst.com, Inc.. (Short, Floyd) (Filed on 10/26/2006) (Entered: 10/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 62 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry: Pre-Claims Construction Hearing held on 10/10/2006 before Hon. Marilyn Hall Patel (Date Filed: 10/11/2006). (Court Reporter Katherine Powell.) (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/11/2006) (Entered: 10/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 61 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: 10/6/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Brian Bershad filed byBurst.com, Inc.. (Short, Floyd) (Filed on 10/6/2006) (Entered: 10/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 60 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: 10/6/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Lou Brucculeri Re: Brian Bershad filed byApple Computer Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/6/2006) (Entered: 10/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 59 Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: 10/3/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT (JOINT) filed by Apple Computer Inc., Apple Computer Inc., Apple Computer Inc., Apple Computer Inc., Apple Computer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Agreed Constructions# 2 Exhibit B - '995 Patent# 3 Exhibit C - '839 Patent# 4 Exhibit D - '932 Patent# 5 Exhibit E - '705 Patent)(Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/3/2006) (Entered: 10/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 58 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: 9/26/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Tutorial set for 2/1/2007 at 9:00 AM; Claims Construction Hearing set for 2/8/2207 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 2/26/2008 08:30 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Pretrial Conference set for 2/13/2008 02:30 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 9/26/2006. (Attachments: # 1)(awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2006) (Entered: 09/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 57 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/15/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION and [Proposed] Protective Order Regarding Disclosure of Confidential Materials by Burst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Short, Floyd) (Filed on 9/15/2006) (Entered: 09/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 56 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: 9/11/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and [Proposed] Case Management Order by Apple Computer Inc., Burst.com, Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/11/2006) (Entered: 09/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: 6/7/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM 52 Answer to to CounterClaim, Counterclaim Burst's Answer to Apple's Counterclaim Regarding U.S. Patent No. 5,057,932 byBurst.com, Inc.. (Short, Floyd) (Filed on 6/7/2006) (Entered: 06/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Admission of Attorney John M. Neukom Pro Hac Vice (Fee paid $210.00) filed by Burst.com, Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2006) (Entered: 05/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: 5/23/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting defendant's motion for attorney John M. Neukom to appear pro hac vice; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 5/22/2006. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2006) (Entered: 05/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 52 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: 5/18/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM, First COUNTERCLAIM against Burst.com, Inc., Burst.com, Inc., Burst.com, Inc. byApple Computer Inc., Apple Computer Inc., Apple Computer Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 5/18/2006) (Entered: 05/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 51 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: 5/16/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to 5/11/2006 for plaintiff to file a responsive pleading to amended answer and counterclaim; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 5/15/2006. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2006) (Entered: 05/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 50 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: 5/11/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration in Support of 49 Stipulation, TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS filed byApple Computer Inc., Apple Computer Inc., Apple Computer Inc.. (Related document(s) 49 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 5/11/2006) (Entered: 05/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 49 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: 5/11/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS by Burst.com, Inc., Apple Computer Inc., Apple Computer Inc., Burst.com, Inc., Burst.com, Inc., Apple Computer Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 5/11/2006) (Entered: 05/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 48 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: 5/10/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 46 plaintiff's Motion for attorney Garland T. Stephens to appear Pro Hac Vice (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2006) (Entered: 05/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Computer Inc. re 46 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Received Order (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2006) (Entered: 05/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Admission of Attorney Garland T. Stephens to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Fee $210.00, Receipt Number 3385338) filed by Apple Computer Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2006) (Entered: 05/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 45 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/8/2006 before Judge Marilyn Hall Patel (Date Filed: 5/9/2006); Claims Construction Hearing set for 2/8/2007 09:00 AM; Pre-Claim Construction Conference set for 10/10/2006 03:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Tutorial Hearing set for 1/31/2007 02:00 PM; (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/9/2006) (Entered: 05/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: 5/1/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Hosie for Burst.com, Inc. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 5/1/2006) (Entered: 05/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 43 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 4/28/2006 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT & Proposed Order filed by Apple Computer Inc., Burst.com, Inc.. (Short, Floyd) (Filed on 4/28/2006) (Entered: 04/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 42 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: 4/27/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED ANSWER to Apple's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Apple Computer Inc. byBurst.com, Inc.. (Short, Floyd) (Filed on 4/27/2006) (Entered: 04/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 41 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: 4/27/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 26 29 defendant's Motion for attorney Michah J. Howe to appear Pro Hac Vice (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2006) (Entered: 04/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: 4/27/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 25 28 defendant's Motion for attorney Leslie V. Payne to appear Pro Hac Vice, (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2006) (Entered: 04/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: 4/27/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 24 27 defendant's Motion for attorney Michael F. Heim to appear Pro Hac Vice (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2006) (Entered: 04/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: 4/27/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 35 30 defendant's Motion for attorney Parker C. Folse III to appear Pro Hac Vice (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2006) (Entered: 04/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: 4/27/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 31 34 defendant's Motion for attorney Ian B Crosby to appear Pro Hac Vice (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2006) (Entered: 04/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: 4/27/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 33 defendant's Motion for attorney Floyd G Short to appear Pro Hac Vice (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2006) (Entered: 04/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Admission of Attorney Parker C. Folse, III to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Fee $210.00, receipt number 3384819) filed by Burst.com, Inc.. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2006) (Entered: 04/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Admission of Attorney Ian B. Crosby to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Fee $210.00, receipt number 3384817) filed by Burst.com, Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2006) (Entered: 04/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Admission of Attorney Floyd G. Short to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Fee $210.00, receipt number 3384818) filed by Burst.com, Inc.. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2006) (Entered: 04/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 32 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: 4/25/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Floyd G. Short filed by Burst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 4/25/2006) (Entered: 04/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: 4/25/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Ian B. Crosby filed by Burst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 4/25/2006) (Entered: 04/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: 4/25/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Parker C. Folse, III filed by Burst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 4/25/2006) (Entered: 04/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Admission of Attorney Micah J. Howe to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Fee $210.00, Receipt Number 3384697) filed by Burst.com, Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2006) (Entered: 04/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Admission of Attorney Leslie V. Payne to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Fee $210.00, Receipt Number 3384698) filed by Burst.com, Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2006) (Entered: 04/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Admission of Attorney Michael F. Heim to appear in Pro Hac Vice filed by Burst.com, Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2006) (Entered: 04/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Micah J. Howe filed by Burst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 4/21/2006) (Entered: 04/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Leslie V. Payne filed by Burst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 4/21/2006) (Entered: 04/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Michael F. Heim filed by Burst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 4/21/2006) (Entered: 04/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: 4/17/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Interested Entities Defendant's Civil Local Rule 3-16 Certification (Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 4/17/2006) (Entered: 04/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: 4/17/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Original ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Apple Computer Inc. byBurst.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 4/17/2006) (Entered: 04/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR (mediation); Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 3/29/2006. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2006) (Entered: 03/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/28/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options (Yorio, Robert) (Filed on 3/28/2006) (Entered: 03/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/28/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Arbitration by Apple Computer Inc., Burst.com, Inc. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 3/28/2006) (Entered: 03/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/28/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 3/28/2006) (Entered: 03/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 3/24/2006, Entered: 3/24/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2006) (Entered: 03/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: 3/14/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER: Case Management Conference reset for 5/8/2006 04:00 PM; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 3/14/2006. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2006) (Entered: 03/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: 3/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Nicholas A. Brown in Support of 14 Stipulation TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed byApple Computer Inc.. (Related document(s) 14 ) (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 3/10/2006) (Entered: 03/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: 3/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Apple Computer Inc., Burst.com, Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 3/10/2006) (Entered: 03/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: 3/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Burst.com, Inc.. (Springer, Colby) (Filed on 3/10/2006) (Entered: 03/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/17/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to and including 3/20/06 for defendant to file responsive pleading; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 2/17/2006. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2006) (Entered: 02/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: 2/16/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION To Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Burst.com, Inc.. (Springer, Colby) (Filed on 2/16/2006) (Entered: 02/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Apple Computer Inc.. Burst.com, Inc. served on 1/6/2006, answer due 1/26/2006. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 2/3/2006) (Entered: 02/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: 1/27/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to and including 2/17/2006 for defendant to file responsive pleading; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/27/2006. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2006) (Entered: 01/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT by Burst.com, Inc.. (Yorio, Robert) (Filed on 1/26/2006) (Entered: 01/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE: Case Management Conference set for 4/3/2006 04:00 PM before the honorable Marilyn Hall Patel; Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/24/2006. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2006) (Entered: 01/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Marilyn H. Patel for all further proceedings. Judge James Larson no longer assigned to case.Signed by Executive Committee on 1/12/06. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2006) (Entered: 01/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: 1/11/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2006) (Entered: 01/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Apple Computer Inc.. (Brown, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/10/2006) (Entered: 01/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Interested Entities re 1 Complaint (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/19/2006 (ga, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/29/2006. Case Management Conference set for 4/5/2006 10:30 AM.. Signed by Judge James Larson on 1/4/06. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2006) (Entered: 01/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT /issued summons against Burst.com, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 250, receipt number 5513698.). Filed byApple Computer Inc.. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/19/2006 (ga, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 1/25/2006 (gba, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 1/25/2006 (gba, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 1/25/2006 (gba, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 1/25/2006 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 135 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?