Implicit Networks, Inc. v. VMWare, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:10-cv-00720
District Judge Susan Illston, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 23, 2016 at 1:19 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Implicit Networks, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine Kelly Lutton +1 650 839 5084 +1 650 839 5071 lutton@fr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hosie McArthur LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George F. Bishop +1 415 247 6000 +1 415 247 6001 gbishop@hosielaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Spencer Hosie +1 415 247 6000 +1 415 247 6001 shosie@hosielaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce J. Wecker +1 415 247 6000 +1 415 247 6001 bwecker@hosielaw.com
v.
Red Hat, Inc. Red Hat, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

VMware, Inc. VMware, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Gopivotal, Inc.

Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (63) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER RELATING CASES C-10-3365 SI AND C-14-2856 HRL.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/24/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/19/12, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 2/17/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/27/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/26/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 1/27/2012) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
      Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/18/12, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 2/17/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/27/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/26/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 1/27/2012) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: None
        ORDER granting (35) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:09-cv-00201-SI; granting (27) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:09-cv-05628-SI; granting (59) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:10-cv-00720-SI; granting (18) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:10-cv-03365-SI; granting (16) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:10-cv-03746-SI; granting (20) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:10-cv-03766-SI; granting (23) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:10-cv-03606-SI; 10-cv-4223-SI. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2010) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
          MOTION to Relate Case C10-4234 EDL filed by Implicit Networks, Inc.. (Bishop, George) (Filed on 10/5/2010) Modified on 10/6/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/05/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: None
            ORDER granting (32) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:09-cv-00201-SI; granting (24) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:09-cv-05628-SI; granting (56) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:10-cv-00720-SI; granting (11) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:10-cv-03365-SI; granting (12) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:10-cv-03606-SI (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2010) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: None
              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Implicit Networks, Inc. re 56 MOTION to Relate Case "ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-12" CORRECTED AND SUPPLEMENTAL CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Bishop, George) (Filed on 9/15/2010) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                MOTION to Relate Case "ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-12" filed by Implicit Networks, Inc.. (Bishop, George) (Filed on 9/14/2010) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 55 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Claims Against Defendant Red Hat, Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by Implicit Networks, Inc. (Bishop, George) (Filed on 9/2/2010) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
                    ORDER RELATING CASE. 10-3365, 10-3606. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2010) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER extending time to respond to complaint. Signed by Judge Illston on 8/27/10. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2010) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None
                        ORDER continuing cmc 9/10/10 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2010) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                          Proposed Order re 1 Complaint Extension of Time to Respond by Red Hat, Inc., VMWare, Inc.. (Mack, Shelley) (Filed on 8/25/2010) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                            STIPULATION re 1 Complaint for Extension of Time to Respond by Red Hat, Inc., VMWare, Inc.. (Mack, Shelley) (Filed on 8/25/2010) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                              STIPULATION "STIPULATED JOINT MOTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO RESET INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERRENCE" by Implicit Networks, Inc.. (Bishop, George) (Filed on 8/25/2010) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 48 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal "NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT VMWARE ONLY, PURSUANT TO RULE 41(a)(1)(A)(i)" by Implicit Networks, Inc. (Bishop, George) (Filed on 8/25/2010) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                  ERRATA by Implicit Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Errata CORRECTED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RUL 3-12)(Bishop, George) (Filed on 8/20/2010) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                    ORDER granting extenstion to repond to the complaint (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2010) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None
                                      ORDER continuing cmc to 8/27/10 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2010) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
                                        Proposed Order re 43 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants WMware and Red Hat Inc. to Respond to Complaint by Red Hat, Inc., VMWare, Inc.. (Mack, Shelley) (Filed on 7/28/2010) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
                                          STIPULATION re 1 Complaint to Extend Time for WMware and Red Hat, Inc. to Respond by Red Hat, Inc., VMWare, Inc.. (Mack, Shelley) (Filed on 7/28/2010) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
                                            STIPULATION TO RESET INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND [PROPOSED] ORDER by Implicit Networks, Inc.. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 7/28/2010) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
                                              ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 7/29/10 at 11:30 a.m. Pacific time. Please take note that at the appointed time, all parties shall call 712-775-7300 and use access code 847955. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2010) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Implicit Networks, Inc.. (Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 7/23/2010) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) of Ret Hat, Inc. and WMware, Inc. (Mack, Shelley) (Filed on 7/23/2010) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Shelley Kay Mack for Defendants Red Hat, Inc. and WMware, Inc. (Mack, Shelley) (Filed on 7/22/2010) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                      ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options on behalf of VMware, Inc. (Lutton, Katherine) (Filed on 7/9/2010) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                        ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options on behalf of Red Hat, Inc. (Lutton, Katherine) (Filed on 7/9/2010) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                          ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for Implicit Networks, Inc. (Wecker, Bruce) (Filed on 7/9/2010) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                            ORDER extending time to respond (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                              STIPULATION Joint Motion and [Proposed] Order to Extend the Time for Defendants VMware, Inc. and Red Hat, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Implicit Networks, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., VMWare, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fraizer, Tamara) (Filed on 6/11/2010) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                ORDER continuing cmc to 7/30/10 at 3:00 pm (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  STIPULATION TO RESET INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND [PROPOSED] ORDER by Implicit Networks, Inc.. (Bishop, George) (Filed on 5/27/2010) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    ORDER granting extension (#27) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      ORDER granting extension (#28) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        STIPULATION Joint Motion and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time for Defendant VMware, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Implicit Networks, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., VMWare, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lutton, Katherine) (Filed on 5/11/2010) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                          STIPULATION Joint Motion and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time for Defendant Red Hat, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Implicit Networks, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., VMWare, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lutton, Katherine) (Filed on 5/11/2010) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            Certificate of Interested Entities by Red Hat, Inc. (Fraizer, Tamara) (Filed on 4/16/2010) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 6/18/2010 02:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2010) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                ORDER granting request for extension of time to respond to complaint re 17 . (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2010) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                  Certificate of Interested Entities by VMWare, Inc. (Fraizer, Tamara) (Filed on 3/31/2010) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    ORDER RELATING CASE to 09-1478. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Red Hat, Inc., VMWare, Inc. and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge. (Fraizer, Tamara) (Filed on 3/22/2010) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Robert John Kent, Jr as Counsel for Defendant VMware, Inc. (Kent, Robert) (Filed on 3/16/2010) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Tamara Fraizer as Counsel for Defendant VMware, Inc. (Fraizer, Tamara) (Filed on 3/16/2010) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Kelly Lutton as Counsel for Defendant VMware, Inc. (Lutton, Katherine) (Filed on 3/16/2010) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/31/2010
                                                                                              STIPULATION Joint Motion and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time for Defendant VMware, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Implicit Networks, Inc., VMWare, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lutton, Katherine) (Filed on 3/16/2010) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                RESPONSE in Support - VMWare, Inc. and Red Hat, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12 filed byRed Hat, Inc., VMWare, Inc.. (Kent, Robert) (Filed on 3/15/2010) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Implicit Networks, Inc. and Request For Reassignment to a United States District Judge. (Bishop, George) (Filed on 3/9/2010) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 12 Stipulated Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Dft Red Hat to Answer. Answer or response due by 5/14/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2010) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      CLERKS NOTICE To Dft Red Hat re: Consent or Declination to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Form due by 3/22/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2010) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Stipulated) filed by Red Hat, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lutton, Katherine) (Filed on 3/5/2010) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Robert John Kent, Jr as Counsel for Defendant Red Hat, Inc. (Kent, Robert) (Filed on 3/5/2010) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Tamara Fraizer as Counsel for Defendant Red Hat, Inc. (Fraizer, Tamara) (Filed on 3/5/2010) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Kelly Lutton as Counsel for Defendant Red Hat, Inc. (Lutton, Katherine) (Filed on 3/5/2010) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                CLERKS NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Form due by 3/17/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2010) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Implicit Networks, Inc.. VMWare, Inc. served on 2/22/2010, answer due 3/15/2010. (Bishop, George) (Filed on 2/24/2010) (Entered: 02/24/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Implicit Networks, Inc.. Red Hat, Inc. served on 2/22/2010, answer due 3/15/2010. (Bishop, George) (Filed on 2/24/2010) (Entered: 02/24/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent Infringement(cc: form mailed to register). (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2010) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 5/21/2010. Case Management Conference set for 5/28/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2010) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to Red Hat, Inc., VMWare, Inc.. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2010) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Certificate of Interested Entities and Persons by Implicit Networks, Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2010) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Red Hat, Inc., VMWare, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 34611042581). Filed by Implicit Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2010) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 298 times.

                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?