Lowy et al v. Internal Revenue Service
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:10-cv-00767-SI

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 900 - Appeal of Fee Determination
  Entries (2) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 67 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
ORDER MODIFYING MARCH 30, 2011 ORDER (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
    LREF
    Blank 63 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
    ORDER DISMISSING CASE (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
      LREF

      Statistics

      This case has been viewed 103 times.

      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
      Space
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
       
      PlainSite
      Sign Up
      Need Password Help?