Karasulu v. Red Hat, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:11-cv-02219
District Judge Edward M. Chen, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alev O. Karasulu, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosenlaw and Einschlag

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Barry Einschlag +1 650 949 2267 mbeinschlag@rosenlaw.com
v.
Red Hat, Inc. Red Hat, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Ellis Monach +1 415 268 7588 +1 415 268 7522 amonach@mofo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathaniel Bryan Sabri +1 415 268 6641 +1 415 268 7522 nsabri@mofo.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1125
Nature of Suit 840 - Property Rights: Trademark
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice by Alev O. Karasulu (Einschlag, Michael) (Filed on 8/5/2011) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
    CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Statement due by 8/26/2011. Case Management Conference set for 9/2/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2011) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
      Certificate of Interested Entities by Red Hat, Inc. (Monach, Andrew) (Filed on 7/29/2011) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
        Declaration of Endi S. Dewata in Support of 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed byRed Hat, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 11 ) (Monach, Andrew) (Filed on 7/29/2011) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
          Declaration of Hugeng Widjaja a/k/a Jim Yang in Support of 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed byRed Hat, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Related document(s) 11 ) (Monach, Andrew) (Filed on 7/29/2011) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
            MOTION to Dismiss filed by Red Hat, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/2/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 8/12/2011. Replies due by 8/19/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Monach, Andrew) (Filed on 7/29/2011) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
              CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2011. Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2011) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 8 Stipulation filed by Red Hat, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/24/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None
                  STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Red Hat, Inc.. (Sabri, Nathaniel) (Filed on 6/23/2011) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
                    CERTIFICATE of Service re Standing Orders by Michael Barry Einschlag on behalf of Alev O. Karasulu (Einschlag, Michael) (Filed on 6/22/2011) Modified on 6/23/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Alev O. Karasulu. Service waived by Red Hat, Inc. waiver sent on 5/9/2011, answer due 7/8/2011. (Einschlag, Michael) (Filed on 6/22/2011) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 5 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None
                        STANDING ORDERS (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alev O. Karasulu (Einschlag, Michael) (Filed on 5/9/2011) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                            REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding trademark infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                              ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/10/2011. Case Management Conference set for 8/17/2011 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                COMPLAINT (no process) against Red Hat, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611009615). Filed by Alev O. Karasulu. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 218 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?