Ralink Technology Corp. v. Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:11-cv-01549-EJD

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 4, 2017 at 4:14 PM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ralink Technology Corp, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by One East Main Street

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/24/2011 David L Anstaett +1 608 663 5408 +1 608 663 7499 DAnstaett@perkinscoie.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chris Allen Hivick +1 213 612 2462 chivick@orrick.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sten A. Jensen +1 202 339 8400 +1 202 339 8500 sjensen@orrick.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven John Routh +1 202 339 8400 +1 202 339 8500 srouth@orrick.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William H Wright, III +1 213 612 2478 +1 213 612 2499 wwright@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/24/2011 Christopher G. Hanewicz +1 608 663 7460 +1 608 663 7499 CHanewicz@perkinscoie.com
TERMINATED: 06/24/2011 Lissa Rose Koop +1 608 663 7460 +1 608 663 7499 lkoop@perkinscoie.com
TERMINATED: 06/24/2011 John S Skilton +1 608 663 7460 +1 608 663 7499 jskilton@perkinscoie.com
v.
No Logo Lantiq Deutschland GmbH, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Chadbourne & Parke, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/10/2012 Lisa Schapira +1 212 408 5478 +1 646 710 5478 lschapira@chadbourne.com

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Edward Kolassa +1 212 556 2130 +1 212 552 2222 skolassa@kslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/06/2011 James R Hannah +1 650 752 1700 +1 650 752 1800 jhannah@kramerlevin.com
TERMINATED: 10/06/2011 Lisa Kobialka +1 650 752 1700 +1 650 752 1810 lkobialka@kramerlevin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Whitman +1 212 257 4455 +1 212 612 3297 robert.whitman@mishcon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Murphy Desmond S.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brittany S. Ogden +1 608 257 7181 +1 608 257 4333 bogden@murphydesmond.com
Space J. Michael True +1 608 268 5630 +1 608 257 4333 MTrue@murphydesmond.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 145
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (117) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Granting (150 in 5:11-cv-00234-EJD) Notice of Substitution of Counsel. Attorney Lisa Schapira terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/10/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2012) Modified text on 4/13/2012 (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/10/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    Order Granting (88) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 5:11-cv-01549-EJD. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to consolidate is GRANTED. This action, 5:11-CV-1549, shall be consolidated with the primary case, 5:11-CV-00234. This action, 5:11-CV- 1549, shall be closed. All future documents shall be filed under the case number and caption of the primary case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Ralink Taiwan may file an amended answer and counter-complaint no later than 2/29/2012. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/1/2012. (ejdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2012) Modified text on 2/1/2012 (ecg, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/01/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 113 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
      STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 112 Stipulation filed by Ralink Technology Corp. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 10, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2012) (Entered: 01/10/2012)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
        STIPULATION and Proposed Protective Order by Ralink Technology Corp.. (Hivick, Chris) (Filed on 1/6/2012) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
          **** FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD *****Transcript of Proceedings held on September 9, 2011, before Judge Edward J. Davila. Court Reporter/Transcriber Georgina Galvan Colin, Telephone number (408) 888-6697. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/19/2012. (mz, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2011) Modified on 12/21/2011 (sp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/21/2011 (sp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/21/2011 (sp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/20/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
            Transcript of Proceedings held on November 15, 2011, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Georgina Galvan Colin, Telephone number (408) 888-6697. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/19/2012. (mz, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2011) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 109 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER DENYING RALINK TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF LANTIQ DEUTSCHLAN GMBH'S MOTION TO STRIKE by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 91 Ex Parte Application 92 MOTION to Strike (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011) Modified on 11/30/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/29/2011)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                CLERKS NOTICE of settlement Conference and Order. Settlement Conference set for 2/17/2012 09:30 AM. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2011) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/15/2011 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal (Date Filed: 11/15/2011) re 92 MOTION to Strike or Deny Ralink's Motion Styled "Ex Parte Application for an Order to Show Cause Re Contempt" and for Sanctions filed by Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH. The Court takes matter under submission; written order after hearing to be issued. (Court Reporter: Gina Galvan Colin.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/15/2011) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                    CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: On 10/21/2011, the parties appeared before Judge Edward J. Davila for a case management conference. The parties shall contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd by 11/21/2011 to schedule a court-connected mediation that will take place no later than 2/25/2012. The following schedule shall apply to this case: Tutorial and Claims Construction Hearing set for 5/22/2012 09:00 AM. Interim Case Management Statement due by 3/2/2012. Interim Case Management Conference set for 3/9/2012 10:00 AM. Fact Discovery cutoff 7/31/2012. Last Date for Filing Dispositive Motions due by 12/7/2012. Preliminary PRetrial Conference statement due 8/10/2012. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/17/2012 11:00 AM before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Expert Discovery cutoff due 11/21/2012. Please see Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/24/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/21/2011 before Judge Edward J. Davila (Date Filed: 10/21/2011). The Court to issue further scheduling order as to both cases. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/21/2011) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None
                        Order Granting 102 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Steven J. Routh. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 10/19/2011.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2011) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None
                          Order Granting 101 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Sten Jensen. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 10/19/2011.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2011) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Steven J. Routh( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611010580.) filed by Ralink Technology Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2011) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
                              MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Sten Jensen ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 54611010580.) filed by Ralink Technology Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2011) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
                                JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Ralink Technology Corp.. (Wright, William) (Filed on 10/14/2011) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                  Declaration of Michael Prinz Zu Lowenstein in Support of 97 Reply to Opposition/Response in Support of Motion to Strike filed byLantiq, Deutschland GmbH. (Related document(s) 97 ) (Schapira, Lisa) (Filed on 10/7/2011) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                    Declaration of Scott Kolassa in Support of 97 Reply to Opposition/Response (Supplemental) In Support of Motion to Strike filed byLantiq, Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 97 ) (Schapira, Lisa) (Filed on 10/7/2011) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                      REPLY (re 92 MOTION to Strike or Deny Ralink's Motion Styled "Ex Parte Application for an Order to Show Cause Re Contempt" and for Sanctions ) filed byLantiq, Deutschland GmbH. (Schapira, Lisa) (Filed on 10/7/2011) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER Granting Motion to Substitution of Attorney. Motions terminated: 94 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Attorney James R. Hannah and Lisa Kobialka terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/6/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2011) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None
                                          ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Schapira, Lisa) (Filed on 10/4/2011) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None
                                            MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH. (Schapira, Lisa) (Filed on 10/4/2011) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                                              RESPONSE (re 92 MOTION to Strike or Deny Ralink's Motion Styled "Ex Parte Application for an Order to Show Cause Re Contempt" and for Sanctions ) filed byRalink Technology Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Chris Hivick, # 2 Exhibit A to Hivick Decl.)(Wright, William) (Filed on 9/30/2011) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                MOTION to Strike or Deny Ralink's 91 Motion Styled "Ex Parte Application for an Order to Show Cause Re Contempt" and for Sanctions filed by Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 9/30/2011. Replies due by 10/7/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Scott Kolassa, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Proposed Order)(Hannah, James) (Filed on 9/16/2011) Modified on 9/20/2011,(link to motion.) (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                  Ex Parte Application re 85 Order on Motion to Compel filed by Ralink Technology Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Ex Parte Application, # 2 Affidavit of Chris Hivick, # 3 Exhibit A to Hivick Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B to Hivick Declaration, # 5 Exhibit C to Hivick Declaration)(Wright, William) (Filed on 9/12/2011) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                    REPLY (re 88 MOTION to Consolidate Cases or, in the Alternative, to Stay filed by Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Charles Lee in Support of # 2 Exhibit A to Decl of Charles Lee, # 3 Exhibit B to Decl of Charles Lee, # 4 Exhibit C to Decl of Charles Lee, # 5 Exhibit D to Decl of Charles Lee)(Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 9/6/2011) Modified text on 9/7/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                      RESPONSE (re 88 MOTION to Consolidate Cases or, in the Alternative, to Stay ) filed byRalink Technology Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Chris Hivick, # 2 Exhibit A to Hivick Decl., # 3 Exhibit B to Hivick Decl.)(Wright, William) (Filed on 8/30/2011) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION to Consolidate C11-234 EJD and C11-1549 EJD Cases or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Stay filed by Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH. Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 8/30/2011. Replies due by 9/6/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Scott Kolassa in Support thereof # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration, # 4 Proposed Order)(Kobialka, Lisa) (Filed on 8/16/2011) Modified on 8/18/2011,(counsel failed to properly select multiple motions.) (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          Transcript of Proceedings held on 07/26/2011, before Judge Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Irene L. Rodrguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 8/24/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/6/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/1/2011. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 8/3/2011) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                            LANTIQ DEUTSCHLAND GMBH'S ANSWER to Amended Complaint PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT byLantiq, Deutschland GmbH. (Hannah, James) (Filed on 7/29/2011) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF RALINK'S AMENDED MOTION TO (1) COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM DEFENDANT LANTIQ AND (2) ENFORCE SUBPOENA TO SANJAY KASTURIA by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 71 Motion to Compel (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2011) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/26/2011 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal (Date Filed: 7/26/2011) re 71 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant Lantiq and Enforce Subpoena to Sanjay Kasturia filed by Ralink Technology Corp. The Court takes matter under submission; written order after hearing to be issued. (Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/26/2011) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  Order Granting 81 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Scott Kolassa. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 7/15/2011.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    Order Granting 80 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert Whitman. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 7/15/2011.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Scott Kolassa ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611062026.) filed by Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/14/2011: # 1 Proposed Order) (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert Whitman ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611062028.) filed by Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          REPLY (re 71 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant Lantiq and Enforce Subpoena to Sanjay Kasturia ) filed byRalink Technology Corp.. (Hivick, Chris) (Filed on 7/12/2011) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            Declaration of JAMES HANNAH in Support of 77 Opposition/Response to Motion, DECLARATION OF JAMES HANNAH IN SUPPORT OF LANTIQ DEUTSCHLAND GMBH'S OPPOSITION TO RALINKS MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND ENFORCE SUBPOENA TO SANJAY KASTURIA filed byLantiq, Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Declaration of James Hannah, # 2 Exhibit B to Declaration of James Hannah, # 3 Exhibit C to Declaration of James Hannah, # 4 Exhibit D to Declaration of James Hannah, # 5 Exhibit E to Declaration of James Hannah, # 6 Exhibit F to Declaration of James Hannah, # 7 Exhibit G to Declaration of James Hannah)(Related document(s) 77 ) (Hannah, James) (Filed on 7/5/2011) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              RESPONSE (re 71 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant Lantiq and Enforce Subpoena to Sanjay Kasturia ) LANTIQ DEUTSCHLAND GMBH'S OPPOSITION TO RALINK'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM DEFENDANT LANTIQ AND ENFORCE SUBPOENA SO SANJAY KASTURIA filed byLantiq, Deutschland GmbH. (Hannah, James) (Filed on 7/5/2011) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                Order by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal denying 73 Motion to Shorten Time.(psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2011) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE by Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL (of attorneys Brittany Ogden, J. Michael True) (Hannah, James) (Filed on 6/28/2011) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    RESPONSE (re 73 MOTION to Shorten Time to hear Ralink's Motion to Compel filed June 21, 2011 ) filed byLantiq, Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of James Hannah, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit A-1, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H)(Hannah, James) (Filed on 6/27/2011) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION to Shorten Time to hear Ralink's Motion to Compel filed June 21, 2011 filed by Ralink Technology Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Christopher Hivick, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hivick, Chris) (Filed on 6/24/2011) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER Granting Withdrawal of Counsel 63 Notice (Other). Attorney Lisa Koop; John S. Skilton; David L. Anstaett and Christopher G. Hanewicz terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/24/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendant Lantiq and Enforce Subpoena to Sanjay Kasturia filed by Ralink Technology Corp.. Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 7/5/2011. Replies due by 7/12/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Christopher Hivick, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H)(Hivick, Chris) (Filed on 6/21/2011) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            Order by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal denying 67 Motion to Shorten Time. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT in Support re 67 MOTION to Shorten Time DECLARATION OF JAMES HANNAH IN SUPPORT OF LANTIQ DEUTSCHLAND GMBH'S OBJECTION TO RALINK TECHNOLOGY CORP's MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME filed byLantiq, Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Decl of James Hannah, # 2 Exhibit B to Decl. of James Hannah, # 3 Exhibit C to Decl. of James Hannah, # 4 Exhibit D to Decl of James Hannah, # 5 Exhibit E to Decl of James Hannah, # 6 Exhibit F to Decl of James Hannah, # 7 Exhibit G to Decl of James Hannah, # 8 Exhibit H to Decl of James Hannah)(Related document(s) 67 ) (Hannah, James) (Filed on 6/17/2011) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                RESPONSE (re 67 MOTION to Shorten Time ) LANTIQ DEUTSCHLAND GMBH'S OBJECTION TO RALINK TECHNOLOGY CORP.'S MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME filed byLantiq, Deutschland GmbH. (Hannah, James) (Filed on 6/17/2011) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MOTION to Shorten Time filed by Ralink Technology Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hivick, Chris) (Filed on 6/13/2011) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel Discovery and Enforce Subpoena to Sanjay Kasturia filed by Ralink Technology Corp.. Responses due by 6/27/2011. Replies due by 7/5/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hivick, Chris) (Filed on 6/13/2011) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/14/2011. Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose. The parties shall file a joint case management conference statement in each respective case docket on or before October 14, 2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2011) Modified on 9/7/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER RELATING CASE with 5:11-cv-00234-EJD Lantiq North America, Inc. et al v. Ralink Technology Corporation et al. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/4/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICEof Withdrawal of John Skilton, Christopher Hanewicz, David Anstaett and Lissa Koop as they are no longer affiliated with this matter. (Hanewicz, Christopher) (Filed on 5/4/2011) Modified on 5/9/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Chris Allen Hivick (Hivick, Chris) (Filed on 5/3/2011) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              CLERKS NOTICE: advising counsel of acknowledgment of receipt of case Ralink Technology v. Lantiq Deutschland GMBH C.A. No. 10-cv-688 from the District of Wisconsin (OUR CASE No. C11-1549)re transferred action. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2011) Modified text on 5/5/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/8/2011. Case Management Conference set for 7/15/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Western; Case Number 3:10-cv-00688. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    OPINION and ORDER granting 13 Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California; taking no action on 47 Motion to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6). Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 3/29/2011. (arw) Modified text on 5/5/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Certificate of Service by Plaintiff Ralink Technology Corp. (Hanewicz, Christopher) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 56 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Declaration of Bomin Wang filed by Plaintiff Ralink Technology Corp. in Opposition to re: 13 MOTION TO TRANSFER to Northern District of California (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: 3-10-11 Ralink Press Release, # 2 Exhibit 2: 3-8-10 Lantiq Press Release) (Hanewicz, Christopher) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 55 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Declaration of Steven J. Routh filed by Plaintiff Ralink Technology Corp. re: 13 MOTION TO TRANSFER to Northern District of California (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Lantiqs Initial Disclosures, # 2 Exhibit 2: 3-18-11 Email from Routh to Kolassa) (Hanewicz, Christopher) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 54 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Brief in Sur-Reply by Plaintiff Ralink Technology Corp. re: 13 MOTION TO TRANSFER to Northern District of California (Sealed Document) filed by Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH (Hanewicz, Christopher) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Ralink Technology Corp. re: 47 MOTION TO DISMISS Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH (Hanewicz, Christopher) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH, filed by Ralink Technology Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: U.S. Patent No. 5,394,116) (Anstaett, David) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 38 Motion to Strike by Plaintiff Ralink Technology Corp. Plaintiff may have until 3/23/2011 to file sur-reply brief. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 3/15/2011. (arw) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    Pretrial Conference Order: Amendments to the Pleadings due 5/16/2011. Motions Requesting Claims Construction due 7/15/2011. Claims Construction Responses due 8/5/2011. Claims Construction Hearing, if needed, set for 8/26/2011 at 9:00 AM. Dispositive Motions due 2/17/2012. Settlement Letters due 7/6/2012. Motions in Limine due 7/13/2012, Responses due 7/27/2012. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/2/2012 at 4:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 8/13/2012 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/4/2011. (arw) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 49 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Ralink Technology Corp. re: 40 Motion for Leave to File Supplement to Reply Brief (Sealed Document) filed by Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH (Hanewicz, Christopher) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Service by Defendant Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH (True, J.) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          MOTION TO DISMISS Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Defendant Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH. Brief in Opposition due 3/23/2011. Brief in Reply due 4/4/2011. (True, J.) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER setting briefing on 40 Motion for Leave to File Supplement to Reply Brief by Defendant Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH. Response due 3/7/2011. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 3/2/2011. (arw) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 39 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal by Defendant Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/2/2011. (arw) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Service by Defendant Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH (Ogden, Brittany) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Brief in Opposition by Defendant Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH re: 38 Motion to Strike Portions of Lantiq's Reply Brief and the Kasturia Declaration in Support of Defendant's Motion to Transfer by Ralink Technology Corp. (Ogden, Brittany) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 42 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Brittany S. Ogden filed by Defendant Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH in Support of 40 Motion for Leave to File Supplement to Reply Brief (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Answer from ND of CA case) (Ogden, Brittany) Modified exhibit description/text on 3/3/2011 (mmo/c). (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental Brief in Reply by Defendant Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH in Support of 13 MOTION TO TRANSFER to Northern District of California. (Ogden, Brittany) Modified docket text on 3/7/2011. (arw) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 40 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Motion for Leave to File Supplement to Reply Brief (Sealed Document) by Defendant Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Ogden, Brittany) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Seal 40 Motion for Leave to File Supplement to Reply Brief, 41 Supplemental Brief and 42 Declaration of Ogden by Defendant Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Ogden, Brittany) Modified docket relationships on 3/3/2011 (mmo/c). (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Motion to Strike 30 Portions of Lantiq's Reply Brief and 33 Kasturia Declaration in Support of Defendant's Motion to Transfer by Plaintiff Ralink Technology Corp. Response due 3/7/2011. (Hanewicz, Christopher) Modified docket relationships on 3/1/2011. (mmo) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Plaintiff Ralink Technology Corp. (Hanewicz, Christopher) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 29 Motion to Seal Defendant's Reply Documents in Support of Motion to Transfer by Defendant Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/24/2011. (arw) Modified text on 2/25/2011 (llj/c). (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Service by Defendant Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH (True, J.) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 34 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Supplemental Declaration of Scott Kolassa filed by Defendant Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH re: 13 MOTION TO TRANSFER to Northern District of California (Sealed Document) filed by Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Judicial Caseload Profile Report for the WD WI, # 2 Exhibit B - Judicial Caseload Profile Report for the ND Cal, # 3 Exhibit C - Federal Circuit's Caseload Analysis FY 2009 - FY 2010, # 4 Exhibit D - printout from Infineon Technologies' website, # 5 Exhibit E - printout from Texas Instruments' website, # 6 Exhibit F - excerpts from the file history of the European Patent counterpart of the '116 Patent, # 7 Exhibit G - printout of the LinkedIn public profile of Sajol Ghoshal, # 8 Exhibit H - prinout from the hotfrog.com USA Business Directory) (True, J.) Modified event on 2/23/2011 (mmo/c). (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 33 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Sanjay Kasturia filed by Defendant Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH re: 13 MOTION TO TRANSFER to Northern District of California (Sealed Document) filed by Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH (Sealed Document) (True, J.) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 32 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Supplemental Declaration of Dr. Bastian Arnold filed by Defendant Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH re: 13 MOTION TO TRANSFER to Northern District of California (Sealed Document) filed by Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH (Sealed Document) (True, J.) Modified event on 2/23/2011 (mmo/c). (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 31 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental Declaration of Imran Hajimusa filed by Defendant Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH re: 13 MOTION TO TRANSFER to Northern District of California (Sealed Document) filed by Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH (Sealed Document) (True, J.) Modified event on 2/23/2011 (mmo/c). (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 30 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Brief in Reply in Support re: 13 MOTION TO TRANSFER to Northern District of California (Sealed Document) filed by Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH (Sealed Document) (True, J.) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Seal Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer by Defendant Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (True, J.) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 24 Motion to Seal Ralink's Opposition to Motion to Transfer by Plaintiff Ralink Technology Corp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/11/2011. (arw) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 27 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Lissa R. Koop filed by Plaintiff Ralink Technology Corp. in Support of Ralink's Opposition to re: 13 MOTION TO TRANSFER to Northern District of California (Sealed Document) filed by Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Lantiq Career Web Page, # 2 Exhibit 2: Lantiq Products Web Page, # 3 Exhibit 3: Patent Assignment, # 4 Exhibit 4: WD Wis. Statistics, # 5 Exhibit 5: N.D. Cal. Statistics) (Hanewicz, Christopher) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 26 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Dingchung Jann filed by Plaintiff Ralink Technology Corp. in Support of Ralink's Opposition to re: 13 MOTION TO TRANSFER to Northern District of California (Sealed Document) filed by Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH (Hanewicz, Christopher) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 25 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Ralink Technology Corp. re: 13 MOTION TO TRANSFER to Northern District of California (Sealed Document) filed by Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH (Sealed Document) (Hanewicz, Christopher) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Seal 25 Ralink's Opposition to Motion to Transfer by Plaintiff Ralink Technology Corp. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Hanewicz, Christopher) Modified docket relationship on 2/14/2011. (mmo) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting and entering 22 Stipulation for extension of time to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/10/2011. (lak) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Stipulation for extension of time to answer, move or otherwise respond to 1 Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH. (True, J.) Modified docket relationship on 2/9/2011 (mmo). (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Appearance of Lissa R. Koop filed by Christopher G. Hanewicz for Plaintiff Ralink Technology Corp. (Hanewicz, Christopher) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 12 Motion to Seal Defendant's motion to transfer and supporting papers by Defendant Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/24/2011. (arw) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Service by Defendant Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH (True, J.) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 18 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Gary McNelly filed by Defendant Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH re: 13 MOTION TO TRANSFER to Northern District of California (Sealed Document) filed by Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH (Sealed Document) (True, J.) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 17 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Michael Thompson filed by Defendant Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH re: 13 MOTION TO TRANSFER to Northern District of California (Sealed Document) filed by Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH (Sealed Document) (True, J.) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 16 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Imran Hajimusa filed by Defendant Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH re: 13 MOTION TO TRANSFER to Northern District of California (Sealed Document) filed by Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH (Sealed Document) (True, J.) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 15 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Dr. Bastian Arnold filed by Defendant Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH re: 13 MOTION TO TRANSFER to Northern District of California (Sealed Document) filed by Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH (Sealed Document) (True, J.) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 14 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Scott Kolassa filed by Defendant Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH re: 13 MOTION TO TRANSFER to Northern District of California (Sealed Document) filed by Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1 - Complaint filed in Northern District of California (Part 1), # 2 Exhibit A-2 - Exhibit A,Patent #6,351,799 B1, to Complaint filed in Norther District of California, # 3 Exhibit A-3 - Exhibit B, Patent #7,061,904 B2, to Complaint filed in Norther District of California, # 4 Exhibit A-4 - Exhibit C, Patent #5,394,116, to Complaint filed in Northern District of California, # 5 Exhibit B - copy of printout from Ralink Technology Corp.'s website, # 6 Exhibit C - copy of printout from the California Secretary of State's business search website, # 7 Exhibit D - printout of US Courts website, # 8 Exhibit E - copy of prinout from the United States Courts website, # 9 Exhibit F - copy of printout from Lantiq DE's website, # 10 Exhibit G-1 - copy of printout of LinkedIn public profile of Ralink's Sr Acctg & HR Manager, # 11 Exhibit G-2 - copy of printout of LinkedIn public profile of Ralink's VP of Marketing, # 12 Exhibit G-3 - copy of printout of LinkedIn public profile of Ralink's Director of Sales, # 13 Exhibit G-4 - copy of printout of LinkedIn public profile of Ralink's Manager, Strategic Marketing and Business Development, # 14 Exhibit G-5 - copy of printout of LinkedIn public profile of Ralink's Marketing Manager, # 15 Exhibit H - copy of printout of tke LinkedIn public profile of Sanjay Kasturia, # 16 Exhibit I - copy of printout of a web article about Sanjay Kasturia, # 17 Exhibit J - copy of printout from Actiontec's website, # 18 Exhibit K - copy of printout from Tellabs' website, # 19 Exhibit L - copy of printout from Netgear;s website, # 20 Exhibit M - copy of printout from 2Wire's website) (True, J.) Modified some exhibit descriptions on 1/24/2011 (mmo). (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 13 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION TO TRANSFER to Northern District of California (Sealed Document) by Defendant Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH. Brief in Opposition due 2/11/2011. Brief in Reply due 2/22/2011. (True, J.) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion to Seal 13 Defendant's motion to transfer and its supporting papers by Defendant Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (True, J.) Modified docket relationship on 1/24/2011 (mmo). (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH (True, J.) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Appearance filed by J. Michael True for Defendant Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH (True, J.) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Status Report re: Service by Plaintiff Ralink Technology Corp. (Hanewicz, Christopher) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Appearance of Christopher Allen Hivick filed by Christopher G. Hanewicz for Plaintiff Ralink Technology Corp. (Hanewicz, Christopher) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Appearance of William H. Wright filed by Christopher G. Hanewicz for Plaintiff Ralink Technology Corp. (Hanewicz, Christopher) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Appearance of Sten Jensen filed by Christopher G. Hanewicz for Plaintiff Ralink Technology Corp. (Hanewicz, Christopher) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Appearance of Steven J. Routh filed by Christopher G. Hanewicz for Plaintiff Ralink Technology Corp. (Hanewicz, Christopher) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (arw) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons Issued as to Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH. (arw) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 113 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 112 Stipulation filed by Ralink Technology Corp. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on January 10, 2012. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Ralink Technology Corp. (Hanewicz, Christopher) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 109 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER DENYING RALINK TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF LANTIQ DEUTSCHLAN GMBH'S MOTION TO STRIKE by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 91 Ex Parte Application 92 MOTION to Strike or Deny Ralink's Motion Styled "Ex Parte Application for an Order to Show Cause Re Contempt" and for Sanctions, 91 Ex Parte Application re 85 Order on Motion to Compel Ex Parte Application re 85 Order on Motion to Compel ; denying 92 Motion to Strike 92 MOTION to Strike or Deny Ralink's Motion Styled "Ex Parte Application for an Order to Show Cause Re Contempt" and for Sanctions, 91 Ex Parte Application re 85 Order on Motion to Compel Ex Parte Application re 85 Order on Motion to Compel (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against Lantiq, Deutschland GmbH. (Filing Fee $350, receipt number 34690009230) filed by Ralink Technology Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: U.S. Patent No. 5,394,116, # 2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action, # 4 Summons) (Hanewicz, Christopher) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 41 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?