Site Update Solutions LLC v. Accor North America Inc et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 4:11-cv-03306
District Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2017 at 6:40 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Adobe Systems, Inc. Adobe Systems, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Adobe Systems Incorporated"
Unknown Role, Salon Internet, Inc.
Unknown Role, OMNITURE Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/14/2010 John M. Guaragna +1 512 457 7125 +1 512 457 7001 john.guaragna@dlapiper.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by YOUNG, PICKETT & LEE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Lee +1 903 794 1303 +1 903 794 5098 wlancelee@aol.com
Amazon.com, Inc. Amazon.com, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Unknown Role, Drugstore.com, Inc.
Unknown Role, Audible, Inc.

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by YOUNG, PICKETT & LEE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Lee +1 903 794 1303 +1 903 794 5098 wlancelee@aol.com
No Logo American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. Whitney Winston +1 202 429 3018 +1 202 429 3902 wwinston@steptoe.com
CBS Interactive, Inc. CBS Interactive, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Haltom & Doan

CNN Interactive Group, Inc. CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Haltom & Doan

No Logo Daily News, LP, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Jeffrey G. Homrig +1 650 802 3119 jeffrey.homrig@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2011 Patricia Young , +1 212 310 8458 patricia.young@weil.com
No Logo Deli Management, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Electronic Arts, Inc. Electronic Arts, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Jeffrey G. Homrig +1 650 802 3119 jeffrey.homrig@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2011 Patricia Young , +1 212 310 8458 patricia.young@weil.com
No Logo Enterprise Rent ACar Company, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Umar Arshad +1 571 203 2756 +1 202 408 4400 umar.arshad@finnegan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413
Facebook, Inc. Facebook, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Lee Stameshkin +1 650 843 5000 +1 650 849 7400 lstameshkin@cooley.com

Represented by The Dacus Firm, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Case LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heidi Lyn Keefe +1 650 213 0302 +1 650 213 8158 hkeefe@whitecase.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark R. Weinstein +1 650 213 0300 +1 650 213 8158 mweinstein@whitecase.com
No Logo Gannett Satellite Information Network, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Jeffrey G. Homrig +1 650 802 3119 jeffrey.homrig@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2011 Patricia Young , +1 212 310 8458 patricia.young@weil.com
No Logo Home Box Office, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Haltom & Doan

No Logo Hsn, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Ronald Lanser +1 312 460 5000 +1 312 460 7000 jlanser@seyfarth.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael R. Levinson +1 312 460 5000 +1 312 460 7000 mlevinson@seyfarth.com
Intuit, Inc. Intuit, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by YOUNG, PICKETT & LEE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Lee +1 903 794 1303 +1 903 794 5098 wlancelee@aol.com
LinkedIn Corporation LinkedIn Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by YOUNG, PICKETT & LEE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Lee +1 903 794 1303 +1 903 794 5098 wlancelee@aol.com
No Logo Myspace, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by YOUNG, PICKETT & LEE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Lee +1 903 794 1303 +1 903 794 5098 wlancelee@aol.com
NBC Universal, Inc. NBC Universal, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/12/2011 Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Jeffrey G. Homrig +1 650 802 3119 jeffrey.homrig@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2011 Patricia Young , +1 212 310 8458 patricia.young@weil.com
No Logo Newegg, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by Yarbrough - Wilcox, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/22/2011 Debra Elaine Gunter +1 903 595 3111 debby@yw-lawfirm.com
TERMINATED: 02/22/2011 Herbert A Yarbrough, III +1 903 595 3111 +1 903 595 0191 trey@yw-lawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by YOUNG, PICKETT & LEE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Lee +1 903 794 1303 +1 903 794 5098 wlancelee@aol.com
Nissan North America, Inc. Nissan North America, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hartline Dacus Barger Dreyer & Kern, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Joseph Cox +1 214 346 3713 +1 214 369 2118 jcox@hdbdk.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey Scott Patterson +1 214 369 2100 +1 214 369 2118 jpatterson@hdbdk.com
Overstock.com, Inc. Overstock.com, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bracewell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Aaron Shield +1 713 221 1115 +1 713 222 3225 chris.shield@bracewellgiuliani.com
Red Hat, Inc. Red Hat, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Jeffrey G. Homrig +1 650 802 3119 jeffrey.homrig@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2011 Patricia Young , +1 212 310 8458 patricia.young@weil.com
Sears, Roebuck & Company Sears, Roebuck & Company, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Sears Roebuck and Co"

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by YOUNG, PICKETT & LEE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Lee +1 903 794 1303 +1 903 794 5098 wlancelee@aol.com
Staples, Inc. Staples, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Jeffrey G. Homrig +1 650 802 3119 jeffrey.homrig@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2011 Patricia Young , +1 212 310 8458 patricia.young@weil.com
Target Corporation Target Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by YOUNG, PICKETT & LEE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Lee +1 903 794 1303 +1 903 794 5098 wlancelee@aol.com
Thomson Corporation Thomson Corporation, Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc"

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/06/2011 Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/06/2011 R Floyd Walker +1 512 542 8453 +1 512 236 3232 fwalker@velaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/06/2011 Jeffrey G. Homrig +1 650 802 3119 jeffrey.homrig@weil.com
TERMINATED: 01/06/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
TERMINATED: 01/06/2011 Patricia Young , +1 212 310 8458 patricia.young@weil.com
No Logo Ticketmaster LLC, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Haltom & Doan

No Logo Time Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/18/2011 Jeffrey G. Homrig +1 650 802 3119 jeffrey.homrig@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2011 Patricia Young , +1 212 310 8458 patricia.young@weil.com
Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Unknown Role, Green Dot Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Cordon Smith +1 310 543 2244 +1 310 543 2204 pi.law@verizon.net

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

No Logo Wyndham Worldwide Inc, Counter-Claimant

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by YOUNG, PICKETT & LEE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lance Lee +1 903 794 1303 +1 903 794 5098 wlancelee@aol.com
No Logo Accor North America, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Aweber Systems Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles J. Rogers, Jr. +2721 272 272 1000

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

CBS Corporation CBS Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "CBS Corp"

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/12/2011 Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/18/2010 Jeffrey G. Homrig +1 650 802 3119 jeffrey.homrig@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
TERMINATED: 02/23/2011 Patricia Young , +1 212 310 8458 patricia.young@weil.com
No Logo Cdw LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Findlay Craft, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger Brian Craft +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 bcraft@findlaycraft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Marshall O'Toole Gerstein Murray and Borun

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas L. Duston +1 312 474 6300 tduston@marshallip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin T Horton +1 312 474 6300 bhorton@marshallip.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

No Logo Choice Hotels International, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Cordon Smith +1 310 543 2244 +1 310 543 2204 pi.law@verizon.net

Represented by King & Kelleher LLP

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiley Rein LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin P. Anderson +1 202 719 7000 +1 202 719 7049 kanderson@wileyrein.com
No Logo Jasons Deli Corp, Defendant

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

No Logo Monster Worldwide, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/25/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven Robert Daniels +1 415 442 1000

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/25/2011 Bryan Donivan Atkinson +1 512 394 3000 +1 512 394 3001 bryan.atkinson@dechert.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin F. Boyce +1 650 813 4800 +1 650 813 4848 justin.boyce@dechert.com
TERMINATED: 05/25/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY William Bryan Farney +1 512 394 3010 +1 512 394 3001 bryan.farney@dechert.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert L. Masterson +1 215 994 2311 +1 215 655 2311 robert.masterson@dechert.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

No Logo Msnbc Interactive News, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/14/2010 Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/14/2010 Jeffrey G. Homrig +1 650 802 3119 jeffrey.homrig@weil.com
TERMINATED: 10/14/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
TERMINATED: 10/14/2010 Patricia Young , +1 212 310 8458 patricia.young@weil.com
No Logo OfficeMax, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Capshaw DeRieux, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III +1 903 233 4826 +1 903 236 8787 ccapshaw@capshawlaw.com
Space Elizabeth L DeRieux +1 903 233 4826 +1 903 236 8787 ederieux@capshawlaw.com
Salesforce.com, Inc. Salesforce.com, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Exacttarget, Inc.
Unknown Role, Ncino, LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aden Martin Allen +1 512 338 5437 +1 512 338 5499 aallen@wsgr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Jose Carlos Villarreal +1 512 338 5400 +1 512 338 5499 jvillarreal@wsgr.com
No Logo Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY John M. Guaragna +1 512 457 7125 +1 512 457 7001 john.guaragna@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaye Scholer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian K. Erickson +1 512 226 0480 berickson@dl.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

The Walt Disney Company, Inc. The Walt Disney Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "The Walt Disney Company"
Unknown Role, Dc Holdco Inc
Unknown Role, TWDC Holdco 613 Corp.
Unknown Role, TFCF America, Inc
Unknown Role, TFCF Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. Whitney Winston +1 202 429 3018 +1 202 429 3902 wwinston@steptoe.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

No Logo Ticketmaster Entertainment, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/26/2010 Neil J. McNabnay +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 mcnabnay@fr.com

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/12/2011 Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/01/2011 Jeffrey G. Homrig +1 650 802 3119 jeffrey.homrig@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
TERMINATED: 04/01/2011 Patricia Young , +1 212 310 8458 patricia.young@weil.com
Time Warner, Inc. Time Warner, Inc., Defendant

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Turner Broadcasting System, Inc. Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc"

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/12/2011 Christina Marie Von Der Ahe +1 415 773 4138 cvonderahe@orrick.com

Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/18/2010 Jeffrey G. Homrig +1 650 802 3119 jeffrey.homrig@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
TERMINATED: 08/18/2010 Patricia Young , +1 212 310 8458 patricia.young@weil.com
No Logo Site Update Solutions LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman, Suder & Cooke

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Corby R Vowell +1 817 334 0400 +1 817 334 0401 vowell@fsclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldstein, Faucett & Preberg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy Lynn Boone +1 713 877 1515 +1 713 877 1737 wboone@gviplaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward W Goldstein +1 713 877 1515 +1 713 877 1145 egoldstein@gliplaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward W Goldstein +1 713 877 1515 +1 713 877 1145 egoldstein@gliplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alisa Anne Lipski +1 713 877 1515 +1 713 877 1145 alipski@gliplaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (571) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION And Proposed Order To Dismiss All Claims Between Site Update Solutions LLC and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Without Prejudice. (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 12/5/2011) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 570 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None
    NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores Inc OF DECLINATION TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE (de Gyarfas, Victor) (Filed on 12/2/2011) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
      RESPONSE to Joint Response Regarding Reassignment to Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, Intuit Inc., Linkedin Corporation, Newegg Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Target Corporation. (Ou, Philip) (Filed on 12/2/2011) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 565 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Edward W. Goldstein. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None
          Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement by Choice Hotels International Inc. (King, Edward) (Filed on 11/29/2011) (Entered: 11/29/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 566 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER re Consent to Magistrate Judge Grewal. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/28/2011. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011) Modified on 11/29/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/28/2011)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
              MOTION of Edward W. Goldstein for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611067155.) filed by Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 560 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Tremayne Norris. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2011) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 559 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for John Caracappa. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2011) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Ou (Ou, Philip) (Filed on 9/30/2011) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 556 Motion to Continue (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2011) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                        MOTION of Tremayne Norris for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007649.) filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2011) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                          MOTION of John Caracappa for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007649.) filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2011) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory R Lyons (Lyons, Gregory) (Filed on 9/26/2011) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
                              Declaration of Elizabeth Stameshkin in Support of 556 Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference to December 15, 2011 filed byFacebook Inc.. (Related document(s) 556 ) (Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 9/21/2011) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None
                                Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference to December 15, 2011 filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 9/21/2011) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 554 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Paul A. Gennari. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Paul A. Gennari (Filing fee $275, receipt number 44611007512) filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(kcS, ) (Filed on 8/29/2011) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 550 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Joseph R. Lanser. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 549 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Matthew A. Werber. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Richard Heimbold (Heimbold, Michael) (Filed on 8/26/2011) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None
                                            MOTION of Joseph R. Lanser for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007503.) filed by HSN Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2011) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None
                                              MOTION of Matthew A. Werber for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007502.) filed by HSN Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2011) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 544 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for John Allen Yates. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2011) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 543 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Christopher Aaron Shield. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2011) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 542 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Christopher Schenck. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2011) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 541 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for John H. Barr. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2011) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION of John Allen Yates for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007480.) filed by Overstock.Com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION of Christopher Aaron Shield for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007480.) filed by Overstock.Com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION of Christopher Schenck for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007480.) filed by Overstock.Com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION of John H. Barr for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007480.) filed by Overstock.Com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011) Modified on 8/23/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 533 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Kevin P. Anderson. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2011) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 532 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Gregory Lyons. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2011) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS MONSTER WORLDWIDE, INC. WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 510 Motion to Dismiss (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2011) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS MYSPACE, INC. WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 509 Motion to Dismiss (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2011) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        Proposed Order re 510 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Monster Worldwide, Inc. with Prejudice. (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 8/19/2011) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          Proposed Order re 509 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Joint Motion to Dismiss MySpace, Inc.. (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 8/19/2011) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank 534 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/6/2011. Case Management Conference set for 10/13/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/19/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION of Kevin P. Anderson for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007458.) filed by Choice Hotels International Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2011) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION of Gregory R. Lyons for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007459.) filed by Choice Hotels International Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2011) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Christina Marie Von Der Ahe (Von Der Ahe, Christina) (Filed on 8/16/2011) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/16/11. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2011) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2011) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 8/12/2011) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Richard Mosko for Enterprise Holdings, Inc. (Mosko, Scott) (Filed on 8/12/2011) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (de Gyarfas, Victor) (Filed on 8/12/2011) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by HSN Inc. (Butler, Lawrence) (Filed on 8/12/2011) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence E. Butler (Butler, Lawrence) (Filed on 8/12/2011) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by CDW LLC. (Horton, Benjamin) (Filed on 8/12/2011) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc.. (Winston, R.) (Filed on 8/12/2011) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, Intuit Inc., Linkedin Corporation, MySpace Inc., Newegg Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Target Corporation. (Chaikovsky, Yar) (Filed on 8/12/2011) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Facebook Inc.. (Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 8/12/2011) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Overstock.Com Inc. (Pitha, Martin) (Filed on 8/12/2011) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Choice Hotels International Inc. (King, Edward) (Filed on 8/12/2011) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by CBS Corp, CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Staples Inc, Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc, Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc. (Reines, Edward) (Filed on 8/12/2011) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Martin Lukas Pitha (Pitha, Martin) (Filed on 8/12/2011) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge for Plaintiff Site Update Solutions, LLC.. (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 8/2/2011) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    CLERKS NOTICE re Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge due by August 12, 2011. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2011) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Proposed Order re 509 Joint MOTION to Dismiss MySpace, Inc. by MySpace Inc. (Chaikovsky, Yar) (Filed on 7/26/2011) Modified on 7/27/2011 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Dirk van Ausdall (van Ausdall, Dirk) (Filed on 7/26/2011) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Vincent King, Jr (King, Edward) (Filed on 7/26/2011) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Dismiss Monster Worldwide, Inc. with Prejudice filed by Site Update Solutions LLC, Worldwide Inc. Responses due by 8/2/2011. Replies due by 8/9/2011. (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 7/19/2011) Modified on 7/20/2011 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Joint Motion to Dismiss MySpace, Inc. with Prejudice filed by MySpace Inc. and Site Update Solutions LLC. Responses due by 8/1/2011. Replies due by 8/8/2011. (Chaikovsky, Yar) (Filed on 7/18/2011) Modified on 7/19/2011 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patent (cc: form mailed to register). (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  CLERKS NOTICE Acknowledging Receipt of Case Transfer from the Eastern District of Texas, Case No. 10-cv-151. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2011) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/22/2011. Case Management Conference set for 12/29/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 2:10-cv-00151. Case Electronically Transfered, copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 7/13/2011 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 502 Motion for Extension of Time to File Their Reply Claim Construction Brief 6/17/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/8/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 373 Motion to Change Venue. Accordingly, the court GRANTS Dfts motion to transfer venue to the Northern District of California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/8/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Reply Claim Construction Brief by Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INDEFINITENESS AS TO CLAIM 8 OF U.S. PATENT RE40,683 by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Corp, CDW LLC, CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company, Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Overstock.com Inc, Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Target Corporation, Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc, Time Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stein, David) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to 494 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Corp, CDW LLC, CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company, Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Overstock.com Inc, Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Target Corporation, Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc, Time Inc,>. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Stein, David) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to 494 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit /Declaration of V. de Gyarfas, # 2 Exhibit 1 to de Gyarfas Decl., # 3 Exhibit 2 to de Gyarfas Decl., # 4 Exhibit 3 to de Gyarfas Decl., # 5 Exhibit 4 to de Gyarfas Decl., # 6 Exhibit 5 to de Gyarfas Decl., # 7 Exhibit 6 to de Gyarfas Decl., # 8 Exhibit 7 to de Gyarfas Decl., # 9 Exhibit 8 to de Gyarfas Decl., # 10 Exhibit 9 to de Gyarfas Decl.)(DeGyarfas, Victor) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores Inc of Service of Second Supplement to P.R. 3-3 Disclosures re Invalidity Contentions (DeGyarfas, Victor) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 496 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney William Bryan Farney; Bryan Donivan Atkinson and Steven Robert Daniels terminated as counsel of record for Monster Worldwide, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/25/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Monster Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Atkinson, Bryan) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 493 Motion for Leave to File. Walmart is granted leave to supplement its invalidity contentions and serve its Supplemental Invalidity Contentions on Plaintiff within two weeks of the entry of this Order.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/16/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiff Site Update Solutions, Inc.'s Opening CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Re40,683 Patent, # 2 Exhibit B - Amendment under 37 CRF 1.111, # 3 Exhibit C - '198 Patent, # 4 Exhibit D - 2nd Suppl Amd to Correct Defects in Reissue)(Lipski, Alisa) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Second MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Invalidity Contentions by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGyarfas, Victor) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 491 Defendant Red Hat, Inc. Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims Against Site Update Solutions, LLC. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/12/11. (mrm, ) (Entered: 05/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims Against Site Update Solutions, LLC by Red Hat, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Andrews, John) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, granting 488 MOTION to Dismiss Red Hat, Inc. filed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Red Hat, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/9/11. (mrm, ) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, granting 487 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. filed by Site Update Solutions LLC, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc. Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/6/11. (mrm, ) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Red Hat, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Dismiss Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert L Masterson for Monster Worldwide Inc. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-497) (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Justin F Boyce for Monster Worldwide Inc. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-497) (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 483 Motion to Stay Deadlines. D eadlines for Starwood for 30 days, up to 5/18/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/19/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadlines by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Site Update Solutions LLC Joint Claim Construction and Pre-Hearing Statement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael G Rhodes for Facebook Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 6-2774. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying 476 Motion to Vacate Claim Construction Dates Pending Disposition of Transfer Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/12/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 478 Motion to Stay Deadlines. Court GRANTS the Unopposed Motion and stays deadlines for Starwood for 14 days, up to and including 4/18/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/6/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadlines by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, NBC Universal Inc, Red Hat, Inc., Staples Inc, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc Request To Terminate Electronic Notification Of Filings (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposed MOTION to Vacate Claim Construction Dates Pending Disposition of Transfer Motion by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Interactive Inc., CDW LLC, CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Overstock.com Inc, Red Hat, Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Target Corporation, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by Wal-Mart Stores Inc (DeGyarfas, Victor) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Disclosure by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Interactive Inc., CDW LLC, CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company, Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Overstock.com Inc, Red Hat, Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Target Corporation, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc (Defendants' Notice of P.R. 4-2 Disclosure) (Andrews, John) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by Site Update Solutions LLC Notice of Compliance with P.R. 4-2 (Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 471 Motion to extend Patent Rule 4-2.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/24/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION To Extend Patent Rule 4-2 Deadline by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Corp, CDW LLC, CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company, Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Overstock.com Inc, Red Hat, Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Site Update Solutions LLC, Staples Inc, Target Corporation, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Andrews, John) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 469 Motion to Stay deadlines for Starwood for 14 days, up to and including April 4, 2011.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/22/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadlines for Defendant Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER - granting 467 Joint Motion to Postpone Claim Construction Related Deadlines. Claim Construction Hearing set for 8/3/2011 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. All other deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/14/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Continue JOINT MOTION TO POSTPONE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION-RELATED DEADLINES by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Corp, CDW LLC, CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company, Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Overstock.com Inc, Red Hat, Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Site Update Solutions LLC, Staples Inc, Target Corporation, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stein, David) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Overstock.com Inc, Red Hat, Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Target Corporation, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc re 373 MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) (Notice of Supplemental Authority) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 464 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Debra Elaine Gunter and Herbert A Yarbrough, III terminated as counsel for Newegg Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/22/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 2/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 02/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 462 Motion to Withdraw. Defendants CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group Inc., Daily News L.P., Electronic Arts Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network, Inc., Home Box Office Inc., NBC Universal, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., Staples, Inc., Time Inc., and Ticketmaster L.L.C., withdraws Patricia Young as counsel of record for these defts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/18/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Counsel of Record by CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Red Hat, Inc., Staples Inc, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Site Update Solutions LLC Notice of Compliance (Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 459 Motion to Stay Deadlines For Defendant Starwood. Deadlines for Starwood for 30 days, up to and including March 21, 2011.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/10/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadlines by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Disclosure by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Interactive Inc., CDW LLC, CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company, Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Overstock.com Inc, Red Hat, Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Target Corporation, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Inc NOTICE OF SERVICE OF P.R. 4-1 EXCHANGE OF PROPOSED TERMS AND CLAIM ELEMENTS FOR CONSTRUCTION (Stein, David) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by Site Update Solutions LLC of Service of Proposed Terms and Claim Elements for Construction. (Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores Inc re Service of Supplemental P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures (deGyarfas, Victor) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew A Werber for HSN Inc.(APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-263) (ehs, ) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 453 Motion for Leave to To Supplement Its Invalidity Contentions. Walmart is granted leave to supplement its invalidity contentions and serve its Supplemental Invalidity Contentions on Plaintiff within a week of the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/27/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File to Supplement Its Invalidity Contention by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(deGyarfas, Victor) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by HSN Inc -- Notice of Disclosure of P.R. 3-3 Invalidity Contentions and P.R. 3-4 Documentation -- (Thames, Earl) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, granting 450 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Deli Management, Inc. filed by Site Update Solutions LLC, and Deli Management, Inc. Deli Management, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/20/11. (mrm, ) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Dismiss Deli Management, Inc. by Deli Management, Inc., Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by Choice Hotels International Inc Pursuant to PR 3-3 and 3-4 (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Disclosure by Wal-Mart Stores Inc Notice of Service of P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures (deGyarfas, Victor) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company Notice of Compliance with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Disclosure by CDW LLC (Notice of Service of P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures) (Horton, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 438 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jeffrey G. Homrig terminated as counsel for Defendants CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group Inc., Daily News L.P., Electronic Arts Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network, Inc., Home Box Office Inc., NBC Universal, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., Staples, Inc., Time Inc., and Ticketmaster L.L.C.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/18/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 1/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, MySpace Inc., Newegg Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Target Corporation (Notice of Service of P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures) (Stein, David) (Entered: 01/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 1/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Red Hat, Inc., Staples Inc, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc (Notice of Service of P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures) (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Disclosure by Facebook Inc. Pursuant to PR 3-3 and 3-4 (Stameshkin, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by Overstock.com Inc Pursuant to PR 3-3 and 3-4 (Schenck, Christopher) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Caracappa, John) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by Monster Worldwide Inc Pursuant to PR 3-3 and 3-4 (Daniels, Steven) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Counsel of Record) by CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Red Hat, Inc., Staples Inc, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bret Bocchieri for HSN Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-221 (ch, ) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 434 Motion for Defendants to comply with P.R. 3-3 and P.R. 3-4. Deadline extended to 1/14/11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/11/11. (ehs, ) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 431 Motion Stay Deadlines for Defendant Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on January 10, 2011. (jml) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Comply with P.R. 3-3 and P.R. 3-4 by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Aweber Systems Inc, CBS Corp, CBS Interactive Inc., CDW LLC, CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Deli Management, Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company, Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., Intuit Inc., Jasons Deli Corp, LinkedIn Corporation, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Overstock.com Inc, Red Hat, Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc, Target Corporation, The Walt Disney Company, Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc, Time Warner, Inc.,, Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, granting 430 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Nissan North America, Inc. filed by Site Update Solutions LLC, Nissan North America Inc terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/7/11. (mrm, ) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, granting 427 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Thomson Reuters Holdings, Inc. filed by Site Update Solutions LLC; Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/6/11. (mrm, ) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadlines by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Dismiss Nissan North America, Inc. by Nissan North America Inc, Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, granting 428 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Wyndham Worldwide Corporation filed by Site Update Solutions LLC, Wyndham Worldwide Inc., Wyndham Worldwide Inc terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/5/11. (mrm, ) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Dismiss Wyndham Worldwide Corporation by Site Update Solutions LLC, Wyndham Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Dismiss Thomson Reuters Holdings, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC, Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Site Update Solutions LLC Notice of Firm Name Change for Edward W. Goldstein, Corby R. Vowell, Alisa A. Lipski and Wendy L. Boone (Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 12/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time in Which to Serve Initial Disclosures by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian) (Entered: 12/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 418 Motion for Joinder. Defendant Overstock.com, Inc. is joined in Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California (Dkt. 373).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/15/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 422 Motion for Extension of Time seeking an extension of time to serve its Initial Disclosures. Deadline extended to 12/27/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/14/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time in Which to Serve Initial Disclosures by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Disclosure by Monster Worldwide Inc of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Daniels, Steven) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by Choice Hotels International Inc of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 373 MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Red Hat, Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Target Corporation, Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc. (Stein, David) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Joinder in Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California by Overstock.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barr, John) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 416 Motion for Joinder to Join in Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California, dkt # 373 . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/7/10. (mrm, ) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Joinder in Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California (Dkt. 373) by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, granting 413 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Office Max, Inc. filed by Site Update Solutions LLC, Office Max Inc., Office Max Inc terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/3/10. (mrm, ) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/2/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Dismiss Office Max, Inc. by Office Max Inc, Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christopher Schenck for Overstock.com Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-146(ch, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2010: # 1 Confidential Information) (ch, ). (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Protective Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 373 MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) filed by Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff's Reply / ANSWER to 374 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of HSN, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 407 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Submit protective Order. The parties shall have until December 1, 2010 to submit an agreed Protective Order or the portions agreed and in dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/29/10. (ljw, ) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Protective Order by Wyndham Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stein, David) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 403 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Response due by 11/29/2010. Reply due by 12/8/2010.Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on November 24, 2010. (jml) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 402 Motion for Extension of Time to Extend Deadline. OfficeMax, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures due December 10, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on November 24, 2010. (jml) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by Site Update Solutions LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Amended Initial Disclosures (Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 373 MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) by Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery re Initial Disclosures by Office Max Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Dru Montgomery on behalf of American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. (Montgomery, M.) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. James W. Knowles, 909 ESE Loop 323, Suit 410, Tyler, Texas 75701, telephone number 903.534.3800 and fax number 903.534.3806, is hereby appointed as mediator in the above referenced case. Mediation shall be completed by December 4, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/18/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Site Update Solutions LLC Parties Notice of Agreement To A Mediator (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 396 Motion for extention of time to Submit Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/17/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION For Extension of Time of Submit Protective Order by Wyndham Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Lance) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 390 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Defendant Adobe Systems Incorporated will have through November 19, 2010 to serve its Initial Disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/15/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 383 Motion to serve its initial disclosures. Deadline extended to 11/26/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/15/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 382 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Defendant Monster Worldwide, Inc. will have through December 13, 2010 to serve its Initial Disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/15/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 11/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Disclosure by Adobe Systems Incorporated Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Stein, David) (Entered: 11/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Disclosure by Amazon.com Inc, Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, MySpace Inc., Newegg Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Target Corporation Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Stein, David) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery To Serve Initial Disclosures by Adobe Systems Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stein, David) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores Inc of Service of Initial Disclosures (deGyarfas, Victor) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by Site Update Solutions LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Compliance with Initial Disclosures (Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by CDW LLC Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Horton, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Disclosure by Overstock.com Inc /Defendant Overstock.Com, Inc.'s Notice of Initial Disclosures (Barr, John) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Red Hat, Inc., Staples Inc, Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc (Notice of Compliance With Local Rule 26(c)) (Andrews, John) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Disclosure by Facebook Inc. Regarding Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Stameshkin, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Deadline re Initial Disclosures by Office Max Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Rule 26(a)(1)) Initial Disclosures by Monster Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Daniels, Steven) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Disclosure by Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, granting 377 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Accor North America, Inc. filed by Site Update Solutions LLC, Accor North America Inc. Accor North America Inc terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/12/10. (mrm, ) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 376 Motion for Extension of Time seeking an extension of time to serve its Initial Disclosures. Defendant Starwood Hotels &Resorts Worldwide, Inc. will have through December 13, 2010 to serve its Initial Disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/12/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 375 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Choice Hotels International, Inc. has to service its Initial Disclosures to Plaintiff up to and including December 3, 2010.Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/12/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 11/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Dismiss Accor North America, Inc. by Accor North America Inc, Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 11/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 11/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time in Which to Serve Initial Disclosures by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 11/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 11/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Choice Hotels International Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 11/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            First Amended ANSWER to 182 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by HSN Inc.(Lanser, Joseph) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Red Hat, Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Target Corporation, Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13)(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, granting 369 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Salesforce.com, Inc. filed by Site Update Solutions LLC, Salesforce.com Inc. Salesforce.com Inc terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/29/10. (mrm, ) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's ANSWER to 321 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Red Hat, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiff's ANSWER to 319 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Dismiss Salesforce.com, Inc. by Salesforce.com Inc, Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 367 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Salesforce.com Inc deadline is extended to 11/5/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/25/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond (Fourth) to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by Salesforce.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Villarreal, Jose) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2012 09:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom. (jml) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Hearing:Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2012 09:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom. (jml) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/18/10, time to be set at a later date. Joinder of Parties due by 3/18/2011., Markman Hearing set for 7/13/2011 09:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/20/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER - The Court adopts the parties discovery provisions as outlined in the Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Conference (Dkt. No. 357).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/20/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Scheduling Conference held on 10/18/2010. (Jan Lockhart, ECRO.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney sign-in sheet) (jml) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 358 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant salesforce.com, inc. will have throughOctober 22, 2010 to answer,. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/18/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Brian Craft on behalf of Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company (Craft, Roger) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aden Martin Allen on behalf of Salesforce.com Inc (Allen, Aden) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Repond (Third) to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by Salesforce.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Villarreal, Jose) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Proposed Docket Control Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2010: # 2 Exhibit A - REVISED REMOVED THE PROPOSED OFF DOCKET CONTROL ORDER) (ch, ). (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron Gabriel Fountain on behalf of Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc (Fountain, Aaron) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 351 Motion to Dismiss Dft MSNBC Interactive News. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/14/2010. (sm, ) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Dwain Mazingo on behalf of HSN Inc (Mazingo, Jason) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Earl Glenn Thames, Jr on behalf of HSN Inc (Thames, Earl) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Wendy Lynn Boone on behalf of Site Update Solutions LLC (Boone, Wendy) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Agreed MOTION to Dismiss MSNBC Interactive News, LLC by Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiff's ANSWER to 302 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Wyndham Worldwide Corporation by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's ANSWER to 242 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff's ANSWER to 262 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Time, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's ANSWER to 261 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Ticketmaster L.L.C. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiff's ANSWER to 260 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Thomson Reuters Holdings, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff's ANSWER to 300 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Target Corporation by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff's ANSWER to 259 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Staples, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff's ANSWER to 298 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Sears, Roebuck and Co. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiff's ANSWER to 243 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Overstock.com, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's ANSWER to 267 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Nissan North America, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff's ANSWER to 278 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Deli Management, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's ANSWER to 296 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Newegg, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiff's ANSWER to 258 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim NBC Universal, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff's ANSWER to 294 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Myspace, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff's ANSWER to 292 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Linkedin Corporation by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff's ANSWER to 290 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Intuit, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiff's ANSWER to 255 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Home Box Office, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's ANSWER to 253 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Gannett Satellite Information Network, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff's ANSWER to 254 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Facebook, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's ANSWER to 241 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiff's ANSWER to 251 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Electronic Arts, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint 209 Amended Complaint,,, First Amended Answer by Monster Worldwide Inc. (Daniels, Steven) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff's ANSWER to 250 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Daily News L.P. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff's ANSWER to 249 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim CNN Interactive Group, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiff's ANSWER to 248 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim CBS Interactive Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's ANSWER to 288 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Amazon.com, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff's ANSWER to 286 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Adobe Systems Incorporated by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE -- Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2010 02:40 PM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on October 7, 2010. (jml) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Red Hat, Inc. (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant Red Hat, Inc.'s ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Red Hat, Inc..(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Walt Disney Company, Corporate Parent ABC Holding Company Inc. for American Broadcasting Companies, Inc.. (Caracappa, John) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc..(Caracappa, John) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Scott Andrews on behalf of Red Hat, Inc. (Andrews, John) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Haltom Doan on behalf of Red Hat, Inc. (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CDW LLC identifying Corporate Parent CDW Corporation of Delaware for CDW LLC. (Horton, Benjamin) Modified on 10/5/2010 to add Supplemental to docket entry per attorney (ehs, ). (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 314 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant salesforce.com, inc. will have through October 15, 2010 to answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/4/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by Salesforce.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Villarreal, Jose) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey G. Homrig on behalf of CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Home Box Office, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C. (Homrig, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christina Marie Von der Ahe on behalf of CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Home Box Office, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C. (Von der Ahe, Christina) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patricia Young on behalf of CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Home Box Office, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C. (Young, Patricia) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward R Reines on behalf of CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Home Box Office, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C. (Reines, Edward) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's ANSWER to 228 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim HSN, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Allen Yates on behalf of Overstock.com Inc (Yates, John) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2010 02:40 PM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (jml) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Choice Hotels International Inc identifying Corporate Parent None for Choice Hotels International Inc. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nissan North America Inc identifying Corporate Parent Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. for Nissan North America Inc. (Patterson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 265 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant salesforce.com, inc.s Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time in Which to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Defendant salesforce.com, inc. will have through October 1, 2010 to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/22/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wyndham Worldwide Inc identifying Other Affiliate Vanguard Windsor Funds for Wyndham Worldwide Inc. (Stein, David) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Wyndham Worldwide Inc.(Stein, David) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Target Corporation (Stein, David) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Target Corporation.(Stein, David) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sears Roebuck and Co identifying Corporate Parent Sears Holdings Corporation for Sears Roebuck and Co. (Stein, David) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Sears Roebuck and Co.(Stein, David) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Newegg Inc. (Stein, David) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Newegg Inc..(Stein, David) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MySpace Inc. identifying Corporate Parent News Corporation, Corporate Parent Fox Interactive Media for MySpace Inc.. (Stein, David) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by MySpace Inc..(Stein, David) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LinkedIn Corporation (Stein, David) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by LinkedIn Corporation.(Stein, David) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Intuit Inc. (Stein, David) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Intuit Inc..(Stein, David) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Amazon.com Inc (Stein, David) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Amazon.com Inc.(Stein, David) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated (Stein, David) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Adobe Systems Incorporated.(Stein, David) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Time Inc identifying Corporate Parent Time Warner, Inc., for Time Inc. (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ticketmaster L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Media Corporation, Corporate Parent Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. for Ticketmaster L.L.C.. (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Staples Inc (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by NBC Universal Inc identifying Corporate Parent General Electric Company, Corporate Parent Vivendi Universal, S.A. for NBC Universal Inc. (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MSNBC Interactive News, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Electric Company, Corporate Parent NBC Universal, Inc., Corporate Parent Microsoft Corporation, Corporate Parent Microsoft I LLC, Corporate Parent NBC Desktop, Inc., Corporate Parent NBC/IJV, Inc., Corporate Parent Vivendi Universal, S.A,. for MSNBC Interactive News, LLC. (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Deli Management, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Deli Management, Inc.. (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Deli Management, Inc..(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Home Box Office, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Time Warner, Inc., for Home Box Office, Inc.. (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CDW LLC identifying Corporate Parent VH Holdings, Inc. for CDW LLC. (Duston, Thomas) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc identifying Corporate Parent Gannett Co., Inc., Corporate Parent JP Morgan Chase and Co. for Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc. (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, by Choice Hotels International Inc.(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, by CDW LLC.(Duston, Thomas) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Electronic Arts Inc. (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Daily News LP (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CNN Interactive Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Time Warner, Inc.,, Corporate Parent Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., Corporate Parent Cable News Network, Inc. for CNN Interactive Group, Inc.. (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc.(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Nissan North America Inc.(Patterson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CBS Interactive Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CBS Corporation for CBS Interactive Inc.. (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by Salesforce.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Villarreal, Jose) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Accor North America Inc (Wynne, Richard) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, by Accor North America Inc.(Wynne, Richard) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Time Inc.(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Ticketmaster L.L.C..(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc.(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Staples Inc.(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by NBC Universal Inc.(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Facebook Inc. (Keefe, Heidi) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, and Affirmative Defenses by MSNBC Interactive News, LLC.(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Home Box Office, Inc..(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Facebook Inc..(Keefe, Heidi) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc.(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, by Office Max Inc.(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Electronic Arts Inc..(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Daily News LP.(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by CNN Interactive Group, Inc..(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by CBS Interactive Inc..(Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Monster Worldwide Inc (Daniels, Steven) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, by Monster Worldwide Inc.(Daniels, Steven) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Scott Andrews on behalf of CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Home Box Office, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C. (Andrews, John) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Haltom Doan on behalf of CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Home Box Office, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C. (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Second Amended ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Overstock.com Inc.(Barr, John) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.'s ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, [Third], COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Wal-Mart Stores Inc.(deGyarfas, Victor) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company.(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Time Inc served on 9/10/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent CT Corporation, answer due 10/1/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Ticketmaster L.L.C. served on 9/9/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent National Registered Agents Inc, answer due 9/30/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Home Box Office, Inc. served on 9/13/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent The Corporation Trust Co, answer due 10/4/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. CNN Interactive Group, Inc. served on 9/13/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent The Corporation Trust Co, answer due 10/4/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. CBS Interactive Inc. served on 9/10/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent Lawyers Incorpo. Svc. Co. answer due 10/1/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's ANSWER to 207 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiff's ANSWER to 200 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Nissan North America, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to CBS Interactive Inc., (Attachments: # 1 CNN Interactive Group Inc, # 2 Home Box Office Inc, # 3 Ticketmaster LLC, # 4 Time Inc)(ch, ) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Lance Lee (Lee, Lance) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 208 Motion for Leave and GRANTS in part the motion to extend deadline. Within 14 days, the dfts shall answer the third amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/7/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. ( Winston, R. Whitney ) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by HSN Inc identifying Corporate Parent HSN, Inc. for HSN Inc. (Lanser, Joseph) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                HSN, Inc.'s ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by HSN Inc.(Lanser, Joseph) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Red Hat, Inc..( Homrig, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 225 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline extended to 9/21/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/3/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 209 Amended Complaint,,, by Office Max Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Overstock.com Inc (Barr, John) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. ( Winston, R. Whitney ) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert Leo Burns, II for Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5586) (ehs, ) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's ANSWER to 170 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, Facebook, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff's ANSWER to 179 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Overstock.com, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's ANSWER to 175 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Red Hat, Inc. served on 8/12/2010 by CM RRR on Registered Agent CT Corporation System, answer due 9/2/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. served on 8/9/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent Corporation Service Co, answer due 8/30/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Umar Arshad for Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5578 (ch, ) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jeffrey C Totten for Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5578 (ch, ) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 210 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft CDW LLC deadline is extended to 9/7/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/19/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 206 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Accor North America Inc deadline is extended to 9/7/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/19/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 205 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Overstock,com Inc deadline is extended to 9/7/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/19/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 204 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft saleforce.com Inc deadline is extended to 9/7/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/19/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 182 Amended Complaint,,, by CDW LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Craft, Roger) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint against Accor North America Inc, Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CDW LLC, Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Deli Management, Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company, Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, MSNBC Interactive News, LLC, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Nissan North America Inc, Office Max Inc, Overstock.com Inc, Red Hat, Inc., Salesforce.com Inc, Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc, Target Corporation, Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc, Time Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Inc, Wyndham Worldwide Inc, CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Home Box Office, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C., filed by Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- US RE40,683)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company's ANSWER to 182 Amended Complaint,,, AND, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company.(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 182 Amended Complaint,,, by Accor North America Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 182 Amended Complaint,,, by Overstock.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yates, John) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Second Amended Complaint (Unopposed) by Salesforce.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Villarreal, Jose) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L Stameshkin on behalf of Facebook Inc. (Stameshkin, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 182 Amended Complaint,,, (Second Amended Complaint) by Choice Hotels International Inc.(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 199 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant OfficeMax to file its Answer is extended to August 31, 2010.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/18/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Nissan North America, Inc.s Original ANSWER to 182 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Nissan North America Inc.(Patterson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 182 Amended Complaint,,, by Office Max Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian K Erickson on behalf of Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc (Erickson, Brian) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 8/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by R Whitney Winston on behalf of American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. (Winston, R) (Entered: 08/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M Caracappa on behalf of American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. (Caracappa, John) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's ANSWER to 163 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark R Weinstein on behalf of Facebook Inc. (Weinstein, Mark) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Heidi Lyn Keefe on behalf of Facebook Inc. (Keefe, Heidi) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patricia Young on behalf of CBS Corp, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, MSNBC Interactive News, LLC, NBC Universal Inc, Staples Inc, Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc, Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc, Time Inc, Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc (Young, Patricia) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., (Attachments: # 1 Red Hat Inc)(ch, ) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 181 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/4/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christina Marie Von der Ahe on behalf of CBS Corp, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, MSNBC Interactive News, LLC, NBC Universal Inc, Staples Inc, Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc, Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc, Time Inc, Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc (Von der Ahe, Christina) (Entered: 08/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward R Reines on behalf of CBS Corp, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, MSNBC Interactive News, LLC, NBC Universal Inc, Staples Inc, Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc, Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc, Time Inc, Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc (Reines, Edward) (Entered: 08/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 177 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant salesforce.com, inc. will have through August 18, 2010 to answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/3/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 174 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stephen J Joncus terminated for Time Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/3/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 173 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stephen J Joncus terminated for Turner Broadcasting System Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/3/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 172 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stephen J Joncus terminated for Target Corp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/3/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 171 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stephen J Joncus terminated for Amazon.com Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/3/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint against Accor North America Inc, Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, CBS Corp, CDW LLC, Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Deli Management, Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company, Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, MSNBC Interactive News, LLC, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Nissan North America Inc, Office Max Inc, Overstock.com Inc, Salesforce.com Inc, Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc, Target Corporation, Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc, Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc, Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Inc, Wyndham Worldwide Inc, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., Time Warner, Inc.,, filed by Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- US RE40,683)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint and to Extend Defendants Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint re The Walt Disney Company. ( Winston, R. Whitney ) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  First Amended ANSWER to 107 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Overstock.com Inc.(Barr, John) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***REPLACES DOCUMENT # 170 WHICH WAS FILED IN ERROR***RESPONSE to 107 Amended Complaint,,, FACEBOOK'S ANSWER & COUNTERCLAIM by Facebook Inc.. (Dacus, Deron) Modified on 7/30/2010 (ehs, ). (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond (Unopposed) by Salesforce.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Villarreal, Jose) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company's ANSWER to 107 Amended Complaint,,, AND, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company.(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Defendant Time, Inc. by Time Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joncus, Stephen) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Defendant Turner Broadcasting Systems, Inc. by Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joncus, Stephen) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Defendant Target Corporation by Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joncus, Stephen) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Defendant Amazon.com Inc. by Amazon.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joncus, Stephen) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT # 178 ***FACEBOOK, INC.'S ANSWER to 107 Amended Complaint,,, AND, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Facebook Inc..(Dacus, Deron) Modified on 7/30/2010 (ehs, ). (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 168 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Neil J McNabnay terminated as counsel for deft Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/26/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gary Ray Sorden on behalf of Nissan North America Inc (Sorden, Gary) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Joseph Cox on behalf of Nissan North America Inc (Cox, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Scott Patterson on behalf of Nissan North America Inc (Patterson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey G. Homrig on behalf of CBS Corp, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, MSNBC Interactive News, LLC, NBC Universal Inc, Staples Inc, Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc, Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc, Time Inc, Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc (Homrig, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 107 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Wal-Mart Stores Inc.(deGyarfas, Victor) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Victor deGyarfas on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores Inc (deGyarfas, Victor) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant, Enterprise Rent-A-Car Co's Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Site Update Solutions LLC.( Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant Nissan North America, Inc's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Site Update Solutions LLC.( Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 152 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Accor North America Inc deadline is extended to 7/30/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/15/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 157 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. CDW LLC's deadline is extended to 7/30/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/15/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***REPLACES DOCUMENT # 155 WHICH WAS FILED IN ERROR ***Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 107 Amended Complaint by CDW LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Horton, Benjamin) Modified on 7/14/2010 (ehs, ). (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint re The Walt Disney Company. ( Winston, R. Whitney ) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT # 157 ***>Defendant's Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CDW LLC.( Horton, Benjamin) Modified on 7/14/2010 (ehs, ). (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vishal Hemant Patel on behalf of Accor North America Inc (Patel, Vishal) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 107 Amended Complaint,,, by Choice Hotels International Inc.(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 107 Amended Complaint,,, by Accor North America Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Benjamin T Horton for CDW LLC. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5481(ch, ) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 146 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant salesforce.com, inc. will have through July 30, 2010 to answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/14/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 145 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. deadline for Monster Worldwide, Inc. to answer is extended to July 30, 2010.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/14/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 140 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline for HSN Inc to answer reset for 7/30/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/14/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 139 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John M Guaragna terminated as counsel for Adobe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/14/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Salesforce.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Villarreal, Jose) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to First Amended Complaint by Monster Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Atkinson, Bryan) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 134 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Facebook, Inc. to file an Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint is extended up to and including July 30, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/13/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 135 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline for Defendant OfficeMax is 8/12/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/13/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 133 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc.s will have through July 30, 2010 to answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/13/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 138 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. CBS, Daily News, EA, Gannet, MSNBC, NBC, Staples, Thomson, Time, Turner, and TicketMaster deadline is extended to 8/5/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/13/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to First Amended Complaint by HSN Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lanser, Joseph) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney John M. Guaragna by Adobe Systems Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 107 Amended Complaint,,, (Unopposed Motion For Extension Of Time To Respond To Plaintiff's Amended Complaint) by CBS Corp, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, MSNBC Interactive News, LLC, NBC Universal Inc, Staples Inc, Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc, Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc, Time Inc, Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Andrews, John) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Scott Andrews on behalf of CBS Corp, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, MSNBC Interactive News, LLC, NBC Universal Inc, Staples Inc, Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc, Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc, Time Inc, Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc (Andrews, John) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Haltom Doan on behalf of CBS Corp, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, MSNBC Interactive News, LLC, NBC Universal Inc, Staples Inc, Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc, Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc, Time Inc, Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 107 Amended Complaint,,, by Office Max Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 107 Amended Complaint,,, by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 107 Amended Complaint,,, or Otherwise Respond by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 129 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft OverStock.com Inc deadline is extended to 7/30/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/12/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 127 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft LinkedIn Corporation deadline is extended to 7/30/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/12/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Facebook Inc. (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 107 Amended Complaint,,, by Overstock.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order)(Yates, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/12/2010: # 2 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ). (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 107 Amended Complaint,,, by Overstock.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order)(Yates, John) Modified on 7/12/2010 (ch, ). (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 107 Amended Complaint,,, by LinkedIn Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lance Lee on behalf of LinkedIn Corporation (Lee, Lance) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David M Stein on behalf of Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, MySpace Inc., Newegg Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Target Corporation (Stein, David) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Yar R Chaikovsky on behalf of Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Newegg Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Target Corporation, Wyndham Worldwide Inc (Chaikovsky, Yar) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. MSNBC Interactive News, LLC served on 7/1/2010 by CM RRR on Registered Agent, Corporation Service Co, answer due 7/22/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Deli Management, Inc. served on 7/1/2010 by CM RRR c/o Registered Agent, CT Corporation System, answer due 7/30/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 118 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Adobe Systems, Incorporated, Amazon.com, Inc., Intuit, Inc., MySpace, Inc., Newegg, Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co., Target Corporation and Wyndham Worldwide, Inc. time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to July 30, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/9/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 119 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Jasons Deli Corp. and Deli Management, Inc.s time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to July 30, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/9/10. (ehs, ) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 107 Amended Complaint,,, by Deli Management, Inc., Jasons Deli Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 107 Amended Complaint,,, by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, Intuit Inc., MySpace Inc., Newegg Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Target Corporation, Wyndham Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lance Lee on behalf of Target Corporation (Lee, Lance) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lance Lee on behalf of Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, Intuit Inc., MySpace Inc., Newegg Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Wyndham Worldwide Inc (Lee, Lance) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Dru Montgomery on behalf of Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, Intuit Inc., MySpace Inc., Newegg Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Target Corporation, Wyndham Worldwide Inc (Montgomery, M.) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, Intuit Inc., MySpace Inc., Newegg Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Target Corporation, Wyndham Worldwide Inc (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Yar R Chaikovsky on behalf of MySpace Inc. (Chaikovsky, Yar) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Dru Montgomery on behalf of Deli Management, Inc. (Montgomery, M.) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of Deli Management, Inc. (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David M Stein on behalf of Deli Management, Inc. (Stein, David) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's ANSWER to 94 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Overstock.com, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Deli Management, Inc., (Attachments: # 1 MSNBC Interactive News LLC)(ch, ) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT against Accor North America Inc, Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, CBS Corp, CDW LLC, Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company, Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Nissan North America Inc, Office Max Inc, Overstock.com Inc, Salesforce.com Inc, Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc, Target Corporation, The Walt Disney Company, Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc, Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc, Time Inc, Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Inc, Wyndham Worldwide Inc, MSNBC Interactive News, LLC, Deli Management, Inc., filed by Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- US RE40,683)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David M Stein on behalf of Jasons Deli Corp (Stein, David) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Aaron Shield on behalf of Overstock.com Inc (Shield, Christopher) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Allen Yates on behalf of Overstock.com Inc (Yates, John) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Aweber Systems Inc.( Rogers, Charles) (Entered: 06/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph R Lanser for HSN Inc.(APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1- 5411)(ehs, ) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael R Levinson for HSN Inc.(APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5411) (ehs, ) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bryan Donivan Atkinson on behalf of Monster Worldwide Inc (Atkinson, Bryan) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Robert Daniels on behalf of Monster Worldwide Inc (Daniels, Steven) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Bryan Farney on behalf of Monster Worldwide Inc (Farney, William) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc served CMRR on 5/17/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Aweber Systems Inc served CMRR on 5/26/2010, answer due 6/16/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CDW LLC.(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Original ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Overstock.com Inc.(Barr, John) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Facebook, Inc.( Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 88 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. HSN, Inc deadline is extended to 7/15/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/2/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The Walt Disney Company.( Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Wyndham Worldwide Inc.( Stein, David) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David M Stein on behalf of Wyndham Worldwide Inc (Stein, David) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, Move or Otherwise Respond by HSN Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blair, Misty) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company.( Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Wyndham Worldwide Inc served on 5/13/2010 by CM RRR c/o CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service Co, answer due 6/3/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc served on 5/13/2010 by CM RRR c/o Lawyers Incorporaton Service Co, answer due 7/15/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Staples Inc served on 5/17/2010 by CM RRR c/o The Corporation Trust Co Corporation Trust Center, answer due 7/15/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Overstock.com Inc served on 5/17/2010 by CM RRR c/o Corporation Trust Center, answer due 6/7/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Office Max Inc served on 5/13/2010 by CM RRR c/o CSC Lawyers Incorporation Service Co, answer due 7/15/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Nissan North America Inc served on 5/13/2010 by CM RRR c/o Lexis Nexis Document Solutions Inc, answer due 7/15/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. NBC Universal Inc served on 5/17/2010 by c/o The Corporation Trust Company Corporation Trust Center, answer due 7/15/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. MySpace Inc. served on 5/17/2010 by CM RRR c/o The Corporation Trust Company Corporation Trust Center, answer due 7/15/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Monster Worldwide Inc served on 5/13/2010 by CM RRR c/o CSCS Lawyers Incorporating Service Co, answer due 7/15/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Intuit Inc. served on 5/13/2010 by CM RRR c/o Prentice-Hall Corporation System, answer due 7/15/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Facebook Inc. served on 5/13/2010 by CM RRR c/o CSC Lawyers Incorporation Service Co, answer due 6/3/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Choice Hotels International Inc served on 5/13/2010 by CM RRR c/o United States Corporation Co, answer due 7/15/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. CBS Corp served on 5/13/2010 by CM RRR c/o Lawyers Incorporating Svc Co, answer due 7/15/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Adobe Systems Incorporated served on 5/13/2010 by CM RRR c.o CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service Co, answer due 7/15/2010. (ehs, ) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Office Max Inc.( DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 394 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities