AT&T Mobility LLC v. Bernardi
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:11-cv-03992
District Judge Charles R. Breyer, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 5, 2018 at 4:26 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

AT&T Mobility LLC AT&T Mobility LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald M. Falk +1 202 263 3000

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald M. Falk +1 650 331 2030 +1 650 331 2060 dfalk@mayerbrown.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Neukom +1 650 470 4500 +1 650 470 4570 John.Neukom@skadden.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Neukom +1 650 470 4500 +1 650 470 4570 John.Neukom@skadden.com
v.
No Logo Laura Barrett, Defendant
No Logo Leslie Bernardi, Defendant
Citation Section 09 U.S.C. § 1
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 101 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSALWITHOUT PREJUDICE, the $7,000 deposited with the court as security shall be refunded to ATTM. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/6/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
    LREF
    Blank 90 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER re 89 Stipulated Motion to Continue Case Management Conference filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Motions terminated: 89 Consent MOTION to Continue Stipulated Motion to Continue Case Management Conference filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Case Management Conference reset for 1/13/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/28/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
      LREF
      Blank 86 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 17 Motion to Compel; granting 20 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
        LREF
        Blank 80 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 53 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief; granting 59 Motion for Leave to File; granting 10 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
          LREF
          Blank 76 Filed: 10/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER for leave to file over-length reply re 69 Stipulation filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/7/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
            LREF
            Blank 68 Filed: 10/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER granting extension for relply bries, 17 MOTION to Compel Arbitration CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration I> Reply due by 10/4/2011; 20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Reply due by 10/4/2011.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/30/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
              LREF
              Blank 54 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting re 19 Stipulation For Leave To File Over-Length Memoranda filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/14/11. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
                LREF
                Blank 50 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER for extension of time to respond to complaint and stay of filing of substantive motions re 14 Stipulation filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/9/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
                  LREF
                  Blank 18 Filed: 9/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER staying arbitration. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/9/2011. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
                    CLERKS NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/2/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2011) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/2/11. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 6 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                        CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                          Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 8/29/2011) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
                            ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/25/2011. Case Management Conference set for 12/2/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Summons Issued
                              Summons Issued as to Laura Barrett, Leslie Bernardi. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
                                Certificate of Interested Entities by AT&T Mobility LLC identifying Other Affiliate AT&T Inc., Other Affiliate SBC Long Distance, LLC, Other Affiliate AT&T Mobility Corporation, Other Affiliate SBC Alloy Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate BellSouth Mobile Data, Inc., Other Affiliate T-Mobile USA Inc., Other Affiliate New BellSouth Cingular Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Deutsche Telekom AG for AT&T Mobility LLC. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
                                  COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Laura Barrett, Leslie Bernardi (Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 34611063431). Filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 97 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?